Picken v. Multnomah County et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-00024-MO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 29, 2017 at 2:46 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Anny Ellen Picken, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina L. Dirks +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 christina.dirks@lasoregon.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa F. Evans +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 lisa.evans@lasoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Johnson +1 503 473 8310 +1 503 295 0676 ejohnson@oregonlawcenter.org
v.
No Logo Liv Elsa Jenssen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Multnomah County Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2011 David N. Blankfeld +1 503 988 3138 +1 503 988 3377 david.n.blankfeld@multco.us
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B. Andrew Jones +1 503 988 3138 +1 503 988 3377 andy.jones@multco.us
No Logo Multnomah County, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Multnomah County Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2011 David N. Blankfeld +1 503 988 3138 +1 503 988 3377 david.n.blankfeld@multco.us
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B. Andrew Jones +1 503 988 3138 +1 503 988 3377 andy.jones@multco.us
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 12-35337, re Notice of Appeal 38 . Appellant's motion to dismiss appeal is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). (sm) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
    Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit (fee waiver status selected) . Filed by Anny Ellen Picken. (Dirks, Christina) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      Judgment. Based on my Opinion and Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. Pending motions, if any, are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed on 4/5/12 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 36 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants motion for summary judgment 17 is GRANTED and Ms. Pickens motion for summary judgment 22 is DENIED. Because defendants motion for summary judgment has been granted, defendants alternative partial motion for summary judgment on actual damages need not be addressed. Signed on 4/5/12 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
          Supplemental Declaration of B. Andrew Jones Second Supplemental Declaration of B. Andrew Jones. Filed by Liv Elsa Jenssen, Multnomah County. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion 33 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (Jones, Bruce) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
            Supplemental Declaration of Liv Jenssen in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Liv Elsa Jenssen, Multnomah County. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion 33 .) (Jones, Bruce) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
              Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment 17 . Filed by Liv Elsa Jenssen, Multnomah County. (Jones, Bruce) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                Reply to Defendants' Response to Motion for Summary Judgment 22 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Anny Ellen Picken. (Dirks, Christina) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                  Declaration of Lisa Evans in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Anny Ellen Picken. (Related document(s): Response to Motion 30 .) (Dirks, Christina) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                    Response to Motion for Summary Judgment 17 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Anny Ellen Picken. (Dirks, Christina) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                      Supplemental Declaration of Heather McIntosh in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Liv Elsa Jenssen, Multnomah County. (Related document(s): Response to Motion 27 .) (Jones, Bruce) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                        Supplemental Declaration of B. Andrew Jones in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Liv Elsa Jenssen, Multnomah County. (Related document(s): Response to Motion 27 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (Jones, Bruce) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                          Response to Motion for Summary Judgment 22 . Filed by Liv Elsa Jenssen, Multnomah County. (Jones, Bruce) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                            Declaration of Gardner Ashmanskas in Support of of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Anny Ellen Picken. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 22 .) (Dirks, Christina) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                              Declaration of Anny Picken in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Anny Ellen Picken. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 22 .) (Dirks, Christina) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                Declaration of Christina Dirks in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Anny Ellen Picken. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 22 .) (Dirks, Christina) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                  Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Anny Ellen Picken. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 22 .) (Dirks, Christina) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                    Motion for Summary Judgment . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Anny Ellen Picken. (Dirks, Christina) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                      Declaration of B. Andrew Jones in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Liv Elsa Jenssen, Multnomah County. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 17 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6) (Jones, Bruce) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                        Declaration of Heather McIntosh in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Liv Elsa Jenssen, Multnomah County. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 17 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3) (Jones, Bruce) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                          Declaration of Liv Jenssen in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Liv Elsa Jenssen, Multnomah County. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 17 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 2) (Jones, Bruce) Modified on 10/27/2011 to correct a typo (tll). (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                            Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Liv Elsa Jenssen, Multnomah County. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 17 .) (Jones, Bruce) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                              Motion for Summary Judgment . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Liv Elsa Jenssen, Multnomah County. (Jones, Bruce) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                Joint ADR Report . Filed by Liv Elsa Jenssen, Multnomah County.(Jones, Bruce) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER: Granting Motion for a Protective Order 14 ). Signed on 7/14/11 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (cib) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Stipulated Motion for Protective Order. Filed by Anny Ellen Picken. (Dirks, Christina) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER: by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 12 . The following new deadlines are set: Discovery, including any expert disclosure, is to be completed by 9/27/2011. Rebuttal Expert disclosures, if any, by 10/27/2011. Dispositive Motions are due by 10/27/2011. Close of Expert Discovery by 11/28/2011. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/27/2011. (sm) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by Anny Ellen Picken. (Dirks, Christina) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney B. Andrew Jones is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney David N. BlankfeldFiled by All Defendants (Jones, Bruce) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement. Filed by Anny Ellen Picken. (Dirks, Christina) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman. Discovery is to be completed by 7/27/2011. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/26/2011. Pretrial Order is due by 8/26/2011. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (cib) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Answer to 2 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by Liv Elsa Jenssen, Multnomah County. (Blankfeld, David) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Liv Elsa Jenssen waiver sent on 1/28/2010. Filed by Anny Ellen Picken. (Dirks, Christina) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Multnomah County waiver sent on 1/28/2010. Filed by Anny Ellen Picken. (Dirks, Christina) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      Summons Issued as to Multnomah County Board of Commissioners, Liv Elsa Jenssen. (cib) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This action may go forward without the payment of fees or costs. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. '1915(d), the U.S. Marshal's Office is directed to serve the summons, complaint and any LR16.1(d) scheduling orders on the defendant pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(e). For each defendant named in the action, Plaintiff is responsible for 1) completing and submitting to the United States District Court, District of Oregon, Clerk's Office, 1000 SW 3rd Avenue, Room 740, Portland, Oregon 97204 an original and one copy of the summons for issuance by the Clerk. 2) providing the Clerk with a copy of the complaint for service; and 3) completing and submitting instructions for service of process on a form USM285 to the Clerk's Office. Summons forms and the USM285 may be obtained on request from the Clerk's Office. The Clerk is directed to issue summons in this case and to forward to the United States Marshal the papers received from the plaintiff for service of process, including the completed USM285 1 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (mr) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Plaintiff Anny Ellen Picken against Defendants Liv Elsa Jenssen and Multnomah County. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mr) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants motion for summary judgment 17 is GRANTED and Ms. Pickens motion for summary judgment 22 is DENIED. Because defendants motion for summary judgment has been granted, defendants alternative partial motion for summary judgment on actual damages need not be addressed. Signed on 4/5/12 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Plaintiff Anny Ellen Picken. (mr) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 465 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?