USA v. Wu et al
Criminal Case Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:09-cr-00321
District Judge Garr M. King, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Thongsouk Soutavong, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Evan Spencer Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Laurie Bender +1 503 241 7075 +1 503 241 1768 lbenderlaw@aol.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
DISMISSAL ORDER :Granting 137 Government's Motion to Dismiss as to Shengbao Wu (Deft #1), Thongsouk Soutavong (Deft #2), Hock Chee Khoo (Deft #3)Signed on 4/8/11 by Judge Garr M. King (mkk) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
    Letter as to Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo. This letter is a receipt for and the restitution obligation and it relates to the 32 UDS door kits that have been delivered to the Hoffman Group. The restitution obligation has been satisfied. (mja) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
      Motion to Dismiss Indictment filed by USA as to Defendant Shengbao Wu, Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Nyhus, Gregory) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF CHARGES as to Thongsouk Soutavong, and Hock Chee Khoo. Signed 4/1/11 by Judge Garr M. King. (mkk) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          Order as to Thongsouk Soutavong, and Hock Chee Khoo. The Court directs that the March 14, 2011 correspondence from Christopher Schatz to the Court is not to be copied or published by those individuals who received correspondence copies without further written order of the Court. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            Order Authorizing Appointed Counsel to Represent Mr. Soutavong in Ancillary Litigation as to Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong (2); IT IS ORDERED that Laurie Bender, attorney at law, is authorized to act as counsel pursuant to 18 USC 3006A(c) with respect to Mr. Soutavong's status as a member of JES Suppliers, LLC; (See 1-page Order for full text); by Judge Garr M. King; signed on 3/28/11. (kw) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              Scheduling Order as to Thongsouk Soutavong, and Hock Chee Khoo. Order - At the parties' request, the Court is setting a Plea Hearing for 4/1/2011 at 8:30AM in Portland Courtroom 9A, before Judge Garr M. King. The Status Conference set for 4/6/2011 is STRICKEN. The Oral Argument Hearing set for 4/19/2011 is STRICKEN. The 10-day Jury Trial set for 11/1/2011 is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by The Hoffman Group, LLC as to Shengbao Wu, Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo regarding Motion for Entry of Order After Hearing re Production and Distribution of Documents Produced Pursuant to Rule 17(c) Subpoenas Duces Tecum Motion for Entry of Order After Hearing re Production and Distribution of Documents Produced Pursuant to Rule 17(c) Subpoenas Duces Tecum 128 filed by Defendant Hock Chee Khoo (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to E, # 3 Exhibit F to J) (Thompson, Roy) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Scheduling Order as to Thongsouk Soutavong (2), and Hock Chee Khoo (1). Order - At the parties' request, the Court is setting a Hearing to discuss the status of the case for 4/6/2011 at 10:30AM in Portland Courtroom 9A, before Judge Garr M. King. The Hearing set for 3/23/2011 is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Scheduling Order as to Thongsouk Soutavong, and Hock Chee Khoo. Order - Setting a Hearing on Khoo's Motion for Entry of Order After Hearing re Production and Distribution of Documents Produced Pursuant to Rule 17(c) Subpoenas Duces Tecum 128 for 3/23/2011 at 11:00AM in Portland Courtroom 9A, before Judge Garr M. King. The Hoffman Group, LLC's Response is due by 3/21/2011. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Scheduling Order as to Thongsouk Soutavong and Hock Chee Khoo. Order - At the letter request of defendant Khoo, the Court is resetting the briefing schedule on Defendant Khoo's Motion to Dismiss 119 as follows: The government's response is due by 3/24/2011; the defendants' reply is due by 3/31/2011; and Oral Argument is scheduled for 4/19/2011 at 11:30AM, in Portland, Courtroom 9A, before Judge Garr M. King. The Oral Argument Hearing set for 4/5/2011 is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 126 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Opinion and Order as to Thongsouk Soutavong, and Hock Chee Khoo. I grant in part and deny in part defendants' Motion to Exclude Images of the Wu Laptop and External Hard Drive 34 , and Deny Defendants' Motion to Compel Government to Extend Use Immunity to Brian Emerson 40 by Judge Garr M. King signed on 3/1/2011. (mja) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                          OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Status Conference as to Defendant Shengbao Wu, Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo for date of 2/18/2011 before Judge Garr M. King, Court Reporter Bonita J. Shumway, telephone number 503-326-8188. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 3/7/2011. Redaction Request due 3/21/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2011. (Shumway, Bonita) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Scheduling Order as to Thongsouk Soutavong, and Hock Chee Khoo. Order - Setting a briefing schedule on the Defendant Khoo' Motion to Dismiss 119 as follows: The Government's response is due by 3/1/2011. Defendant's reply is due by 3/15/2011. Setting Oral Argument for 4/5/2011 at 11:30AM in Portland, Courtroom 9A, before Judge Garr M. King. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Minutes of Status Conference as to Thongsouk Soutavong and Hock Chee Khoo before Judge Garr M. King: Order - Resetting the 5-day Jury Trial to a 10-day Jury Trial from 3/8/2011 to 11/1/2011 at 09:00AM in Portland Courtroom 9A, before Judge Garr M. King. Counsel for defendants are directed to file waivers regarding speed trial. Pretrial motions are due by 3/25/2011. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Gregory Nyhus.Counsel Present for Defendant: Roy B. Thompson, Mark Hubert, Christopher Schatz, and Laurie Bender.(Court Reporter Bonita Shumway) (mja) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                ORDER - The Hoffman Group LLC's Motion to Modify Discovery 112 as to Thongsouk Soutavong (2) is DENIED as MOOT. Any issues not previously addressed by the Court may be raised at a later date. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Motion for Discovery
                                  Motion for Discovery MOTION TO MODIFY DISCOVERY ORDER (Dkt. 108) filed by The Hoffman Group, LLC as to Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibits A - F) (Thompson, Roy) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                    Scheduling Order as to Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo. Order - The Telephone Conference set for 2/9/2011 is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                      Scheduling Order as to Thongsouk Soutavong. Order - Upon receipt of a letter request from Roy Thompson dated 1/25/2011, the Order re Delivery of Discover-E Electronic Discovery to Bridge City Legal for Reproduction for Defense (#108) is stayed pending resolution of any privilege objections. Setting a Telephone Conference for 2/9/2011 at 10:00AM. The Court will initiate the call. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: 1/25/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                        Order as to Thongsouk Soutavong. Order - Re: Delivery of Discovery-E Electronic Discovery to Bridge City Legal for Reproduction for Defense. Ordered. by Judge Garr M. King signed on 1/24/2011. (mja) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/23/2011, Entered: 1/23/2011 Motion for Order
                                          Motion for Order Directing the Delivery of the Hoffman Group Discover-e Electronic Discovery to Bridge City Legal for Reproduction for Defense by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bender, Laurie) (Entered: 01/23/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011 Brief
                                            Brief by USA as to Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo regarding Motion to Exclude Images of the Wu Laptop and External Hard Drive (Evidentiary Hearing Requested) 34 filed by Defendant Hock Chee Khoo (Nyhus, Gregory) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Bill of Particulars
                                              Bill of Particulars filed by USA as to Shengbao Wu, Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo (Nyhus, Gregory) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Garr M. King - Denying the Motion to Quash Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum, 94 , filed by The Hoffman Group, LLC, as to Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong (2). (kb) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER - Granting the Government's Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Bill of Particulars 95 . Bill of Particulars is due by 1/7/2011 as to Shengbao Wu (1), Thongsouk Soutavong (2), Hock Chee Khoo (3). Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER - Granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Bill of Particulars 95 . Bill of Particulars is due by 1/7/2011 as to Shengbao Wu (1), Thongsouk Soutavong (2), Hock Chee Khoo (3). Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                      Motion for Extension of Time to submit bill of particulars filed by USA as to Defendant Shengbao Wu, Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Nyhus, Gregory) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: 12/17/2010 Motion to Quash
                                                        Motion to Quash Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum Oral Argument requested. filed by The Hoffman Group, LLC as to Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Quash, # 2 Attachment Declaration in Support, # 3 Exhibit A) (Thompson, Roy) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 Transcript of ProceedingsCourt Filing
                                                          OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Evidentiary Hearing as to Defendant Shengbao Wu, Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo for date of 11/16/2010 before Judge Garr M. King, Court Reporter Bonita J. Shumway, telephone number 503-326-8188. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 12/16/2010. Redaction Request due 12/30/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2011. (Shumway, Bonita) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            Order re Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoenas Duces Tecum 54 as to the Law Office of Hagen O'Connell filed by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong. Signed 11/17/10 by Judge Garr M. King. (mkk) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              Order re Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoenas Duces Tecum 54 to The Hoffman Group (THG) filed by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong. Signed 11/17/10 by Judge Garr M. King. (mkk) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                Order re Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum 54 to PayPal/E-Bay filed by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong. Signed 11/17/10 by Judge Garr M. King. (mkk) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 Clerk's List of Witnesses and Exhibits
                                                                  Clerk's List of Witnesses and Exhibits as to Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo (mja) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                    Minutes of Evidentiary Hearing before Judge Garr M. King as to Thongsouk Soutavong and Hock Chee Khoo. Order - As to Defendant Khoo's Motion to Exclude Images of the Wu Laptop and External Hard Drive 34 , a short brief containing closing argument is due by 1/14/2011 Defendant Khoo's Motion to Compel Government to Extend Use Immunity to Brian Emerson 40 is taken under advisement this date. Defendant Khoo's Motion for Bill of Particulars 42 is GRANTED. The Government shall file its Bill of Particulars for attorneys' eyes only by 12/20/2010. Defendant Khoo's Motion for Discovery Pursuant to Rule 16(a)(1)(E)(i), or Issuance of Third-party Subpoenas Duces Tecum (FRCP 17(c) 44 is GRANTED. The defendants shall submit a proposed form of order. Defendant Khoo's Motion to Strike Surplusage from the Indictment 46 is DENIED but the indictment will not go to the jury. Defendant Khoo's Motion for Release of Brady Materials and Cooperation Agreements, and Satisfaction of Prosecutors Duty of Inquiry and Henthorn Review 48 is GRANTED. Defendant Khoo's Motion for Specification of Evidence Government Intends to Use at Trial 50 is GRANTED and an Evidentiary Hearing will be set at a later date. Defendant's Khoo's Motion for Order Directing Government to Provide Rule 404(b) Notice Sixty Days in Advance of Trial 51 is GRANTED. Defendant Khoo's Motion or Production of Federal Rule of Evidence 16(a)(1)(G) Statement(s) of Expert Witness(es) No Later than Sixty Days Prior to Trial 52 is GRANTED. Defendant Khoo's Motion for Setting of Second Motions Filing Date, and for Reservation of Opportunity to File Rule 12.1, 12.2, and 12.3 Notices 53 is GRANTED. Filing date to be set at a later time. Defendant Khoo's Motion for Joinder in Co-Defendant Soutavong's Pre-Trial Motions (Docket Nos. 54, 55, 56, 58, and 59) 62 is GRANTED. Defendant Soutavong's Motion for Authorization to The Issuance of Third Party Subpoena Duces Tecum 54 is GRANTED. Formal order to follow. Defendant Soutavong's Motion for Joinder In Motions of Co-Defendant Hock Chee Khoo - Docket #'s 34, 35, 36, 37, 38, 39, 40, 41, 42, 43, 44, 45, 46, 47, 48, 49, 50, 51, 52, and 53 57 is GRANTED. Defendant Soutavong's Motion for Disclosure and Production of Information and Documents 58 is GRANTED as stated on the record. Defendant Soutavong's Motion for Discovery - Pretrial Identification of F.R.E. 801 (d)(2) Statements and Determination of Admissibility 59 is GRANTED and an Evidentiary Hearing will be set at a later date. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Gregory Nyhus.Counsel Present for Defendant: Laurie Bender, Ruben Iniguez and Christopher Schatz.(Court Reporter Bonita Shumway) (mja) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                      Response to Motion by Thongsouk Soutavong regarding Motion for Authorization, 54 filed by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong, Motion for Discovery 59 filed by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong, Motion for Joinder 57 filed by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong, Motion for Disclosure 58 filed by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong (Bender, Laurie) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                        Response to Motion by USA as to Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo regarding Motion for Order 52 filed by Defendant Hock Chee Khoo (Nyhus, Gregory) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                          Response to Motion by USA as to Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo regarding Motion for Order 50 filed by Defendant Hock Chee Khoo, Motion for Discovery 59 filed by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong (Nyhus, Gregory) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                            Response to Motion by USA as to Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo regarding Motion for Order 51 filed by Defendant Hock Chee Khoo (Nyhus, Gregory) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                              Response to Motion by USA as to Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo regarding Motion for Release of Brady Materials 48 filed by Defendant Hock Chee Khoo (Nyhus, Gregory) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                Response to Motion by USA as to Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo regarding Motion to Strike 46 filed by Defendant Hock Chee Khoo (Nyhus, Gregory) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                  Response to Motion by USA as to Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo regarding Motion for Bill of Particulars 42 filed by Defendant Hock Chee Khoo (Nyhus, Gregory) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                    Response to Motion by USA as to Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo regarding Motion to Compel 40 filed by Defendant Hock Chee Khoo (Nyhus, Gregory) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                      Response to Motion by USA as to Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo regarding Motion for Order 34 filed by Defendant Hock Chee Khoo (Nyhus, Gregory) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        Order as to Thongsouk Soutavong, and Hock Chee Khoo. Order - Granting the government's oral request for an extension of time. Government's responses are due by 10/11/2010. Defendants' replies are due by 11/1/2010. No further extension will be granted without affecting the hearing date. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER - Granting the Government's Motion Motion for Extension of Time to file Responses and Continue Hearing 64 as to Thongsouk Soutavong (2), and Hock Chee Khoo (3). The Suppression Hearing set for 9/30/2010 is STRICKEN and RESET to 11/16/2010 at 09:30AM in Portland Courtroom 9A, before Judge Garr M. King. Government's Responses are due by 10/1/2010. Replies are due by 10/22/2010. The 12/6/2010 Status Conference is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                            Motion for Extension of Time to file responses and continue hearing filed by USA as to Defendant Shengbao Wu, Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Nyhus, Gregory) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              AMENDED Scheduling Order as to Thongsouk Soutavong and Hock Chee Khoo. Order - Setting Oral Argument on the pending motions for 9/30/2010 at 09:00AM in Portland, Courtroom 9A, before Judge Garr M. King. The Government's responses are due by 8/18/2010. Defendants may file replies by 9/8/2010. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                Motion for Discovery - Pretrial Identification of F.R.E. 801 (d)(2) Statements and Determination of Admissibility Oral Argument requested. by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong. (Bender, Laurie) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                  Motion for Disclosure and Production of Information and Documents Oral Argument requested. by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong. (Bender, Laurie) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                    Motion for Joinder In Motions of Co-Defendant Hock Chee Khoo - Docket #'s 34, 35, 36, 37, 38, 39, 40, 41, 42, 43, 44, 45, 46, 47, 48, 49, 50, 51, 52, and 53 by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong. (Bender, Laurie) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support of Motion by Thongsouk Soutavong regarding Motion for Authorization to The Issuance of Third Party Subpoena Duces Tecum 54 filed by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C - JES R00325 - 328, # 2 Exhibit D - Vertical Door Litigation, # 3 Exhibit E - Internet websites from China) (Bender, Laurie) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                        Declaration by Laurie Bender regarding Motion for Authorization to The Issuance of Third Party Subpoena Duces Tecum 54 filed by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong (Bender, Laurie) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Motion for Authorization
                                                                                                          Motion for Authorization to The Issuance of Third Party Subpoena Duces Tecum Oral Argument requested. by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Final Electronic Discovery Outline, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Drew Hoffman) (Bender, Laurie) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010 Response(generic)
                                                                                                            Response to 32 , 30 filed by USA as to Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo Status Report Re: Discovery (Nyhus, Gregory) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Scheduling Order as to Thongsouk Soutavong and Hock Chee Khoo. Order - At the defendants' request, Pretrial Motions are due by 6/1/2010. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 Order on Motion to Continue / ResetCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER - Granting Defendant Soutavong's Motion for Joinder in Co-defendant's Motion to Reset Trial Date, Designate Case as Complex 25 . Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/10/2010 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                  Motion for Joinder in Co-defendant's Motion to Reset Trial Date, Designate Case as Complex, and Set Status Hearing by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration) (Bender, Laurie) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/10/2010 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    Minutes of Status Conference before Judge Garr M. King as to Thongsouk Soutavong (2), and Hock Chee Khoo (3). Granting Defendant Khoo's Motion to Reset Trial Date, Designate Case As Complex, And Set Status Hearing 20 and Defendant Soutavong's oral Motion to Reset Trial Date. The 5-day Jury Trial set for 2/23/2010 is STRICKEN and RESET to 3/8/2011 at 09:00AM in Portland, Courtroom 9A, before Judge Garr M. King. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this continuance constitutes excludable delay to 3/8/2011, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, 3161(h)(8)(A). The Court specifically finds, in granting the motion, that the ends of justice are served by taking such action and outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. In support of this finding, the Court further finds that the requested delay, for purposes of further investigation and the complexity of the case, is reasonable and necessary such that the time is properly excludable according to law. The defendants shall file a status reports with the court on 4/6/2010 and on 8/10/2010. The Government shall respond within 10 days of of the filing of those reports. Order - Setting a Status Conference for 12/6/2010 at 09:30AM in Portland, Courtroom 9A, before Judge Garr M. King.Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Gregory Nyhus.Counsel Present for Defendant: Christopher Schatz, Ruben Iniguez and Laurie Bender.(Court Reporter Nancy Walker) (mja) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      AMENDED Scheduling Order as to Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo. Order - Setting a Status Conference on Defendant Khoo's Motion to Continue / Reset Trial Date, Designate Case As Complex, And Set Status Hearing 20 for 2/10/2010 at 10:00AM in Portland, Courtroom 9A, before Judge Garr M. King. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Scheduling Order as to Thongsouk Soutavong, Hock Chee Khoo. Order - Setting a Status Conference on Defendant Khoo's Motion to Continue / Reset Trial Date, Designate Case As Complex, And Set Status Hearing 20 for 2/10/2010 at 10:00PM in Portland, Courtroom 9A, before Judge Garr M. King. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Order on Motion to Continue / ResetCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER - Granting Defendants' Motions to Continue Trial Date 16 & 18 as to Thongsouk Soutavong (2) and Hock Chee Khoo (3). The 5-day Jury Trial set for 11/17/2009 is STRICKEN and RESET to 2/23/2010 at 09:00AM in Portland, Courtroom 9A, before Judge Garr M. King. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this continuance constitutes excludable delay to 2/23/2010, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, 3161(h)(8)(A). The Court specifically finds, in granting the motion, that the ends of justice are served by taking such action and outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. In support of this finding, the Court further finds that the requested delay, for purposes of further investigation, is reasonable and necessary such that the time is properly excludable according to law. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/13/2009 Motion to Continue / Reset
                                                                                                                            Motion to Continue / Reset by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong. (Bender, Laurie) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: 10/2/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER - Granting Defendants' Motion to Continue Pretrial Motions Deadline 13 and 14 as to Thongsouk Soutavong (2); and Hock Chee Khoo (3). Pretrial motions are due by 11/17/2009. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King (mja) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 Motion to Continue / Reset
                                                                                                                                Unopposed Motion to Continue / Reset Pretrial Motions Deadline by Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong. (Bender, Laurie) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Trial Management OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Trial Management Order as to Thongsouk Soutavong (Deft #2) Signed 9/10/09 by Judge Garr M. King. (mkk) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                    Summons Returned Executed on 8/20/09. as to Thongsouk Soutavong (mkk) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Order Setting Conditions of Release as to Defendant Thongsouk Soutavong (Deft #2). Signed 9/9/09 by Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (mkk) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney Laurie Bender for Thongsouk Soutavong. Signed 9/10/09 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (Effective date 9/2/09) (mkk) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 1-First / Initial Criminal Master MinutesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Minutes of Proceedings:First Appearance before Magistrate Judge Dennis J. Hubel as to Thongsouk Soutavong (Deft #2) and Hock Chee Khoo (Deft #3) held on 9/9/2009. Arraignment held on counts as to Thongsouk Soutavong (Deft #2) Counts 1,2-5,6-8 and Hock Chee Khoo (Deft #3) Counts 1,2-5. Defendants waived reading of the Indictment. Defendants advised of rights. Not guilty pleas entered. Order that Motions are due in 21 days and Discovery is due in 10 days. Order Defendant Soutavong (Deft #2) appearing with CJA appointed counsel Laurie Bender and Defendant Khoo (Deft #3) appearing with Federal Public Defender Ruben Iniguez. Detention Hearing held as to Thongsouk Soutavong (Deft #2) and Hock Chee Khoo (Deft #3) Defendants' Location-Custody status is: Released on conditions. (See separate orders). 5-Day Jury Trial is set for 11/17/2009 at 09:00AM in Judge King's Courtroom before Judge Garr M. King.ORDER Defendant Khoo (Deft #3) shall submit a financial affidavit to the Court.Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Greg Nyhus.Counsel Present for Defendant: Lori Bender for Defendant Soutavong & Ruben Iniguez for Defendant Khoo.(Court Reporter FTR/Kathleen Bartholomew)Courtroom Deputy: Kathleen Bartholomew. (mkk) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                            Summons Returned Executed on 8/21/09, as to Thongsouk Soutavong. (mkk) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Case Assignment NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Garr M. King. (mkk) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                Indictment as to Shengbao Wu (Deft #1), Thongsouk Soutavong (Deft #2), and Hock Chee Khoo (Deft #3) count 1 - 18 USC 371 CONSPIRACY; counts 2-5 - 18 USC 1343 WIRE FRAUD; Thongsouk Soutavong (Deft #2) counts 6-8 - 18 USC 1832(2) THEFT OF TRADE SECRETS; Shengbao Wu (Deft #1) counts 9-13 - 18 USC 1832(2) and 1837(2) THEFT OF TRADE SECRETS; Shengbao Wu (Deft #1) counts 14-15 - 18 USC 1030(a)(4) FRAUD AND RELATED ACTIVITY IN CONNECTION WITH COMPUTERS; AND FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS. (mkk) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 273 times.

                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?