COLLINS v. GRADALL INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00932
District Judge LOUIS H. POLLAK, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo MILTON COLLINS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF STEIN & TROIANI

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT P. STEIN +1 610 660 8700 rpstein@steinandtroiani.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MICHAEL J TROIANI +1 610 660 8700 mjtroiani@steinandtroiani.com
No Logo E, D C., Cross-Defendant
No Logo GRADALL INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED, Cross-Defendant
No Logo IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Jlg Industries, Inc., Cross-Defendant
Oshkosh Oshkosh, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY"
No Logo PR MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/12/2011 GARY S. WILLIAMS +1 215 627 3087 +1 603 334 7294 GaryS.Williams@LibertyMutual.com
No Logo TARGET PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL DAVID KREBBS +1 215 575 2793 dkrebbs@mdwcg.com
No Logo UNITED RENTALS, INC., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GERMAN GALLAGHER & MURTAGH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DEAN F. MURTAGH +1 215 545 7700 murtaghd@ggmfirm.com
No Logo IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC., Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by trial-lawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William A. Rubert +1 610 727 5016 wrubert@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
No Logo PR MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GARY S. WILLIAMS +1 215 627 3087 +1 603 334 7294 GaryS.Williams@LibertyMutual.com
No Logo UNITED RENTALS, INC., Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by GERMAN GALLAGHER & MURTAGH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DEAN F. MURTAGH +1 215 545 7700 murtaghd@ggmfirm.com
Target Corporation Target Corporation, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL DAVID KREBBS +1 215 575 2793 dkrebbs@mdwcg.com
No Logo UNITED RENTALS, INC., Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GERMAN GALLAGHER & MURTAGH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM J. D'ANNUNZIO +1 215 545 7700 dannunziow@ggmfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DEAN F. MURTAGH +1 215 545 7700 murtaghd@ggmfirm.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
  Entries (134) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
ORDER THAT FACT-BASED DISCOVERY DUE BY 4/17/2012., TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/18/2012 03:30 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 2/17/2012. 2/21/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lbs, ) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL: Status Conference held on 2/16/2012. (kk, ) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
      MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Leave to File Motin to Dimiss filed by GRADALL INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED.Brief, Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(TRABUCCO, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
        Praecipe to Withdraw Motion to Compel by UNITED RENTALS, INC.. (D'ANNUNZIO, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
          ORDER THAT A DISCOVERY HEARING SCHEDULE FOR 1/19/2012 AT 10:30 AM IN ROBERT N.C. NIX BUILDING BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 1/9/2012. 1/10/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kk, ) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None Motion to Compel
            MOTION to Compel Responses of Plaintiff to United Rentals' Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by UNITED RENTALS, INC..Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL.(D'ANNUNZIO, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
              STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 12/9/2011. 12/13/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kk, ) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE DISCOVERY CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR DECEMBER 8, 2011, AT 2:00 P.M. TO DISCUSS THE ISSUES RAISED IN THE ABOVE MENTIONED CORRESPONDENCE AND MOTION. PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL SHALL INITIATE THIS CONFERENCE CALL TO (215) 597-6079. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 11/17/11. 11/21/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED UNREP, E-MAILED.(mas, ) Modified on 11/22/2011 (afm, ). (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Protective Order filed by UNITED RENTALS, INC..Brief, Certification in Support of Protective Order and Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL.(D'ANNUNZIO, WILLIAM) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                    ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER (DOC. NO.124) IS GRANTED; A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE WHICH WAS SCHEDULED FOR 11/28/2011, IS CONTINUED, AND IT WILL NOW TAKE PLACE ON 2/16/2012 02:00 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL.; ALL FACT BASED DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/15/2012, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 11/2/2011. 11/2/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kk, ) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                      MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order filed by UNITED RENTALS, INC...Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL.(D'ANNUNZIO, WILLIAM) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                        ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PARTIES' MOTION TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER, THE JOINT MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER (DOC. NO. 122), IS GRANTED. FACT BASED DISCOVERY IS EXTENDED TO 11/17/2011. THE TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE WHICH WAS SCHEDULED FOR 8/23/2011, IS CONTINUED, AND IT WILL NOW TAKE PLACE ON 11/28/2011, AT 10:30 AM, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 8/8/2011.8/10/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED, AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(amas) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                          MOTION to Amend/Correct 94 Order,, Set Deadlines,, Set Hearings, filed by UNITED RENTALS, INC..Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL.(D'ANNUNZIO, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                            Response to Crossclaim of Defendant EDC by IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC. with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (RUBERT, WILLIAM) Modified on 6/1/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                              Disclosure by EDC.(TYLER, THOMAS) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                STIPULATION AND ORDER BY COUNSEL AND COUNSEL FOR ALL DEFENDANTS AND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS, THAT THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT, PR MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ONLY, BE DISMISSED AS A PARTY IN THIS SUBJECT LIGATION, WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS CLAIMS. ADDITIONALLY, THE THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT, PR MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP DID NOT OWN NOR DID IT HAVE ANY CARE, CUSTODY OR CONTROL OF THE PARTICULAR PROPERTY IDENTIFIED AS THE LOCATION OF PLAINTIFF'S DECEDENT'S ALLEGED INCIDENT, AT THE TIME OF SAID INCIDENT. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED EACH COUNSEL MAY EXECUTE THIS STIPULATION INDIVIDUALLY. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 5/12/2011. 5/13/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(amas) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BY ALL PARTIES TO THIS LITIGATION THAT ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS CLAIMS AGAINST THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT, OSHKOSH CORPORATION, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS ALSO AGREED THAT OCUNSEL FOR EACH PARTY MAY EXECUTE THIS STIPULATION SEPARATELY AND INDIVIDUALLY. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 5/12/2011. 5/13/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED, AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(amas) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                                    ORDER THAT THE THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE (DOC. NO.99) IS DENIED AS MOOT; THE PARTIES TWO STIPULATED ORDERS ATTACHED HEREIN IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 5/12/2011.5/12/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(kk, ) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(MENARD, STEPHEN) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal by PR MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (WILLIAMS, GARY) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEMAND FOR JUDGMENT OF SOLE LIABILITY FOUND IN THE CROSSCLAIM OF EDC AGAINST IWRIN & LEIGHTON, INC. IS STRICKEN WITH PREJUDICE; BY COUNSEL FOR EDC AND COUNSEL FOR IWRIN & LEIGHTON, INC. THAT PARAGRAPH NO.3 AND PARAGRAPH NO.5 OF EDC'S CROSSCLAIM IS AMENDED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 5/11/2011. 5/12/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS(kk, ) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEMAND FOR JUDGMENT OF SOLE LIABILITY FOUND IN THE CROSSCLAIM OF PR MONROE AGAINST IWRIN & LEIGHTON, INC. IS STRICKEN WITH PREJUDICE; BY COUNSEL FOR PR MONROE AND COUNSEL FOR IWRIN & LEIGHTON, INC. THE THE "WHEREFORE" CLAUSE OF PR MONROE'S CROSSCLAIM IS AMENDED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 5/11/2011. 5/12/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kk, ) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                              Response to the Crossclaim of Third Party Defendant PR Monroe Limited Partnership by TARGET CORPORATION. (KREBBS, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                STIPULATION Order - Amendment of Defendant Eilerson Development Corp., t/a EDC's Crossclaim Against Third Party Defendant Irwin & Leighton, Inc. by IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC.. (RUBERT, WILLIAM) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 5/10/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                  STIPULATION Order - Amendment of Third Party Defendant PR Monroe Limited Partnership's CrossClaim Against Third Party Defendant Irwin & Leighton, Inc. by IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC.. (RUBERT, WILLIAM) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 5/10/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Response of Third Paarty Plaintiff United Rentals (North America) Inc. to the Cross Claim of Third Party Defendant Target Corporation re 87 Answer to Third Party Complaint by UNITED RENTALS, INC.. (MURTAGH, DEAN) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Response of Third Party Plaintiff United Rentals (North America) Inc. to Cross Claim of Third Party Defendants JLG and Oshkosh Corporation re 84 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim,, by UNITED RENTALS, INC.. (MURTAGH, DEAN) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Response Third Party Plaintiff United Rentals (North America) Inc. Answer to Cross Claim of Third Party Defendant PR Monroe Limited Partnership re 97 Answer to Third Party Complaint by UNITED RENTALS, INC.. (MURTAGH, DEAN) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Response Defendant Third Party Plaintiff United Rentals (North Aamerica) Inc. Answer to Cross Claim of Defendant Eilerson Development Corp., t/a EDC re 77 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by UNITED RENTALS, INC.. (MURTAGH, DEAN) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE AMENDMENT OF THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT OF UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC. IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 5/2/2011. 5/3/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kk, ) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Response to Defendant Eilerson Development Copr. cross claim by PR MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (WILLIAMS, GARY) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                STIPULATION Order - Amendment of Third Party Complaint of United Rentals (North America), Inc. by IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC.. (RUBERT, WILLIAM) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 4/29/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Response to PR Monroe Limited Partnership Cross Claim by JLG INDUSTRIES, INC., OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY. (MENARD, STEPHEN) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Response to Irwin & Leighton, Inc. Crossclaim by JLG INDUSTRIES, INC., OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY. (MENARD, STEPHEN) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      ANSWER to 84 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim,, by IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC..(RUBERT, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION to Strike 77 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, 97 Answer to Third Party Complaint filed by IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(RUBERT, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Irwin & Leighton, Inc.'s ANSWER to 74 Third Party Complaint of United Rentals (North America), Inc, CROSSCLAIM against GRADALL INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED, JLG INDUSTRIES, INC., OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY by IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC..(RUBERT, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            PR Monroe Limited Partnership ANSWER to 74 Third Party Complaint of United Rentals by PR MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(WILLIAMS, GARY) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC. SHALL HAVE UNTIL 4/24/2011 TO FILE AN ANSWER TO THE THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 4/15/2011. 4/18/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kk, ) Modified on 4/20/2011 (kk, ). (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                AMENDED DOCUMENT by IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC.. Amended Stipulated Order. (RUBERT, WILLIAM) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 4/15/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  ORDER THAT THE DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 8/19/2011, A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 8/23/2011 10:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 4/11/2011. 4/13/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kk, ) Modified on 4/20/2011 (kk, ). (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL: Status Conference held on 4/11/2011. (kk, ) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC. SHALL HAVE UNTIL 4/24/2011 TO FILE AN ANSWER TO THE THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 4/7/2011. 4/7/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(kk, ) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        STIPULATION Stipulated Order by IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC.. (RUBERT, WILLIAM) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 4/7/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Response in Opposition re 87 Answer to Third Party Complaint Crossclaim of Target Corporation by JLG INDUSTRIES, INC., OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY. (MENARD, STEPHEN) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            ANSWER to 84 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim,, of Third Party Defendants JLG Industries and Oshkosh Corporation by TARGET CORPORATION.(KREBBS, DANIEL) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              ANSWER to 77 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Defendant, EDC by TARGET CORPORATION.(KREBBS, DANIEL) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                ANSWER to 74 Third Party Complaint of United Rentals by TARGET CORPORATION.(KREBBS, DANIEL) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Praecipe to Withdraw Complaint by MILTON COLLINS. (TROIANI, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/30/2011 (nd, ). (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    JLG Industries, Inc. and Oshkosh Corporation ANSWER to 77 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim EDC by JLG INDUSTRIES, INC., OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(MENARD, STEPHEN) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      JLG Industries, Inc. and Oshkosh Corporation ANSWER to 74 Third Party Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against EDC, GRADALL INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED, IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC., PR MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, TARGET PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT by JLG INDUSTRIES, INC., OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(MENARD, STEPHEN) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Acceptance of Service of Target Corporation-Served on 2/24/11 by UNITED RENTALS, INC.. (D'ANNUNZIO, WILLIAM) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Acceptance of Service of JLG Industries, Inc. - Served on 2/24/11 by UNITED RENTALS, INC.. (D'ANNUNZIO, WILLIAM) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Acceptance of Service of Irwin & Leighton, Inc. - Served on 2/24/11 by UNITED RENTALS, INC.. (D'ANNUNZIO, WILLIAM) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Acceptance of Service of PR Monroe Limited Partnership - Served on 2/24/11 by UNITED RENTALS, INC.. (D'ANNUNZIO, WILLIAM) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE IN-PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE WHICH WAS SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 28, 2011, IS CONTINUED, AND IT WILL NOW TAKE PLACE ON APRIL 11, 2011, AT 11:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 7 (COURT OF APPEALS COURTROOM), SECOND FLOOR, ROBERT N. C. NIX, SR. FEDERAL BUILDING, 900 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA 19107 TO DISCUSS THE STATUS OF THIS MATTER AND HOW BEST TO PROCEED TOWARDS ITS RESOLUTION. PLEASE REPORT TO MY CALL BOX ON THE SECOND FLOOR BEFORE PROCEEDING TO COURTROOM 7. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 3/16/11. 3/21/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED.(er, ) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT THE STAY ON DISCOVERY IN THIS MATTER IS LIFTED. AN IN-PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 3/28/2011, AT 10:30 AM, IN COURTROOM 7 (COURT OF APPEALS COURTROOM) TO DISCUSS THE STATUS OF THIS MATTER AND HOW BEST TO PROCEED TOWARDS ITS RESOLUTION. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 3/14/2011. 3/17/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, AND E-MAILED; AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(amas) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint of EDC with Crossclaim against Third Party Defendants, CROSSCLAIM against OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY by EDC.(TYLER, THOMAS) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE M. FAITH ANGELL FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 3/7/2011. 3/8/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(kk, ) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT THE UNITED RENTALS' MOTION TO JOIN THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS (DOC. NO.31) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 3/7/2011. 3/8/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(kk, ) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC., JLG INDUSTRIES, INC., OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY, PR MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, TARGET CORPORATION, filed by UNITED RENTALS, INC..(kk, ) Modified on 2/25/2011 (kk, ). (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT IN LIGHT OF THE WITHDRAWAL OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT DOCKETS NOS. 22, 35, 40, AND 41, ARE DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 2/14/2011. 2/15/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED.(kk, ) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED ON 9/10/2010 (DOC. NO.21) OS WITHDRAWN; DEFENDANT UNITED RENTAL (NORTH AMERICA) INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS MISJOINED DEFENDANTS (DOC. NO.31) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 2/14/2011. 2/14/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED.(kk, ) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                to Withdraw Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by MILTON COLLINS. (TROIANI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 2/9/2011. 2/10/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED.(kk, ) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S PETITION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT (DOC. NO.15) IS WITHDRAWN WITH PREJUDICE; THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO STRIKE DOCKET NOS. 17 & 34 AS MOOT; dEFENDANT UNITED RENTALS INC.'S MOTION TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION TO THE USDC FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA (DOC. NO.31) IS WITHDRAWN WITH PREJUDICE; THE PARTIES STIPULATION (DOC. NO.68) IS ACCEPTED BY THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 2/9/2011. 2/10/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(kk, ) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Letter from WILLIAM J. D'ANNUNZIO TO HONORABLE JUDGE POLLAK RE:STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (kk, ) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Letter from WILLIAM A. RUBERT, ESQ TO HONORABLE JUDGE POLLAK RE: STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT (kk, ) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT IRWIN & LEIGHTON WILL RESPOND TO THE PROPOSED AGREEMENT BY 1/25/2011.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 1/21/2011. 1/21/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(kk, ) Modified on 1/21/2011 (kk, ). (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Letter from WILLIAM J. D'ANNUNZIO TO HONORABLE JUDGE LOUISE H. POLLAK RE: OUTSTANDING MOTIONS (kk, ) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK: Status Conference held on 1/6/2011. (kk, ) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM A. RUBERT on behalf of IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC. with Certificate of Service(RUBERT, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS E. TYLER on behalf of EDC (TYLER, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 21 Amended Complaint,, CROSSCLAIM against EDC, EDC, GRADALL INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED, GRADALL INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED, IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC., JLG INDUSTRIES, INC., OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY, TARGET PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT, UNITED RENTALS, INC., UNITED RENTALS, INC. by PR MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(WILLIAMS, GARY) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE STATUS HEARING CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/20/2010 IS HEREBY AGAIN RESCHEDULED FOR 1/6/2011 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 16-B BEFORE HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 12/13/2010. 12/15/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED BY CHAMBERS, E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPS.(kk, ) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT THE STATUS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/15/2010 IS HEREBY RESCHEDULED FOR 12/20/2010 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 16-B BEFORE HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK,ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 12/9/2010. 12/9/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kk, ) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 12/15/2010 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 16-B BEFORE HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 12/7/2010. 12/7/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED BY CHAMBERS.(kk, ) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT WILL BE DUE 14 DAYS AFTER THIS COURT ISSUES AN ORDER RULING UPON DEFENDANT UNITED RENTALS'S MOTION TO DISMISS MISJOINDED DEFENDANTS (DOC. NO. 31). SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 12/6/2010. 12/6/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(kk, ) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by TARGET PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KREBBS, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE JOINT PETITION IS GRANTED AND THE DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANT PR MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP IS SET ASIDE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT PR MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP SHALL HAVE UNTIL 12/22/10, TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. 21). SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 11/29/10. 11/30/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPS(dp, ) Modified on 12/2/2010 (kk, ). (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT WILL BE DUE 14 DAYS AFTER THIS COURT ISSUES AN ORDER RULING UPON DEFENDANT UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA)'S MOTION TO DISMISS MISJOINED (DEFENDANTS DOCKET NO. 31). SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 11/29/10. 11/30/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPS(dp, ) Modified on 12/2/2010 (kk, ). (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 21 Amended Complaint, filed by JLG INDUSTRIES, INC., OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY.Motion, Brief, Exhibit, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(MENARD, STEPHEN) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION to Set Aside Default filed by PR MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP.memorandum, certificate of service.(WILLIAMS, GARY) Modified on 11/24/2010 (nd, ). (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Uncontested Rule 21 Motion to Dismiss Misjoined Defendants, Amended Motion to Join Third-Party Defendendants and Motion to Transfer This Action to U.S.D.C. M.D. PA. Pursuant to 28 USCA 1404 by UNITED RENTALS, INC.. (MURTAGH, DEAN) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Uncontested Rule 21 Motion to Dismiss Misjoined Defendants, Amended Motion to Join Third-Party Defendants and Motion to Transfer this Action to U.S.D.C. M.D. PA. Pursuant to 28 USCA 1404 by UNITED RENTALS, INC.. (MURTAGH, DEAN) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE FULL DOCUMENT) Modified on 11/23/2010 (nd). (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Amended Complaint by MILTON COLLINS. (MICHAEL, TROIANI) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 11/23/2010 (nd, ). (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant Irwin & Leighton's ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses and Crossclaim with Verification and Certificate of Service, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC..(BELLINO APELIAN, LISA) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Default MILTON COLLINS against PR MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, Certificate of Service. (MICHAEL, TROIANI) Modified on 11/19/2010 (nd, ). (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Target Corporation by TARGET PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT.(KREBBS, DANIEL) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL DAVID KREBBS on behalf of TARGET PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT with Jury Demand(KREBBS, DANIEL) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MILTON COLLINS. TARGET PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT waiver sent on 11/3/2010, answer due 1/3/2011. (MICHAEL, TROIANI) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by SUSAN SMITH LLOYD on behalf of IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC.(LLOYD, SUSAN) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PR MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP.(WILLIAMS, GARY) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Withdrawal of 35 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by JLG INDUSTRIES, INC., OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY.Withdrawal of Reply to United Rentals Motion to Dismiss Misjoined Defendants, Motion to Join Third Party Defendants and Motion to Transfer.(MENARD, STEPHEN) Modified on 11/8/2010 (nd, ). (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Withdrawal of 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by JLG INDUSTRIES, INC., OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY.Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint.(MENARD, STEPHEN) Modified on 11/8/2010 (nd). (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Campbell re: served Summons and Amended Complaint upon PR Monroe Limited Partnership by Personal on 10/22/2010 (MICHAEL, TROIANI) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service by John Apynys re: served Summons and Complaint upon Gradall Industries, Inc. by Personal on 04/16/2010 (MICHAEL, TROIANI) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Hester re: served Summons and Complaint upon EDC by Personal on 04/19/2010 (MICHAEL, TROIANI) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by GARY S. WILLIAMS on behalf of PR MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (WILLIAMS, GARY) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION to Dismiss Misjoined Defendants Purusant to F.R.C.P. 21 filed by JLG INDUSTRIES, INC., OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support Of Reply Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(MENARD, STEPHEN) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 15 Petition to Remand to State Court filed by JLG INDUSTRIES, INC., OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(MENARD, STEPHEN) Modified on 10/19/2010 (nd, ). (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response (Amended) in Opposition to the Plaintiff's Petition to Remove by UNITED RENTALS, INC.. (MURTAGH, DEAN) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by UNITED RENTALS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(MURTAGH, DEAN) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Misjoined Defendants Purusant to F.R.C.P. 21 filed by UNITED RENTALS, INC..Brief and Certificate of Service.(MURTAGH, DEAN) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Disclosure by IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC..(BELLINO APELIAN, LISA) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by LISA BELLINO APELIAN on behalf of IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC. (BELLINO APELIAN, LISA) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY.(MENARD, STEPHEN) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Oshkosh Corporation with Certificate of Service by JLG INDUSTRIES, INC..(MENARD, STEPHEN) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THIS MATTER REMAINS STAYED AS TO DISCOVERY ONLY. DEFENDANT UNITED RENTALS, INC. SHALL FILE ITS MOTION TO DISMISS NO LATER THAN 10/12/10, AS DISCUSSED AT THE CONFERENCE. THE C;ERLS IS DIRECTED TO REMOVE THIS MATTER FROM MY DOCKET AND RETURN IT TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK FOR RESOLUTION OF ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 9/28/10. 9/29/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(dp, ) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL: Telephone Conference held on 9/28/10 (dp, ) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEMAND for Trial by Jury by IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC.. (LLOYD, SUSAN) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN SMITH LLOYD on behalf of IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC. (LLOYD, SUSAN) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by JLG INDUSTRIES, INC., OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY.Brief, Affidavit, Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(MENARD, STEPHEN) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against EDC, GRADALL INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED, UNITED RENTALS, INC., JLG INDUSTRIES, INC., OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY, IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC., TARGET PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT, PR MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, filed by MILTON COLLINS.(dp, ) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL: Telephone Conference held on 8/16/10 (dp, ) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT THIS MATTER REMAINS STAYED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT, HOWEVER PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 9/15/10. A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/28/2010 02:00 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 8/16/10. 8/17/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(dp, ) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MUST RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S PETITION TO REMOVE TO STATE COURT PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C.A NO LATER THAN 8/6/10. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 8/2/10. 8/6/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(dp, ) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 Petition to Remand to State Court filed by UNITED RENTALS, INC., Brief, Certificate of Service. (MURTAGH, DEAN) Modified on 8/6/2010 (nd, ). (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT THE MATTER REMAINS STAYED UNTIL 8/12/2010, HOWEVER PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A MOTION FOR REMOVAL DURING THIS TIME PERIOD. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 8/16/2010 AT 11:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL SHALL INITIATE THIS CONFERENCE CALL TO (215) 597-6079. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 7/13/2010. 7/14/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(kp, ) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Petition to Remand to State Court filed by MILTON COLLINS, Certificate of Service. (MICHAEL, TROIANI) Modified on 7/16/2010 (nd). (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE M.FAITH ANGELL: Telephone Conference held on 7/13/10 (dp, ) Modified on 7/16/2010 (dp, ). (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF IS GRANTED LEAVE OF COURT TO ADD JLG INDUSTRIES, INC. OSHKOSH CORPORATION COMPANY; IRWIN & LEIGHTON, INC.; TARGET PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT ; AND P.R. MONROE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AS DEFENDANTS.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 7/6/10. 7/7/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(dp, ) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Complaint filed by MILTON COLLINS..Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL.(STEIN, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/12/10 (dp, ) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT ALL DISCOVERY IN THIS MATTER REMAINS STAYED UNTIL 7/12/10, HOWEVER, PLAINTIFF MAY FILE A MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT DURING THIS TIME PERIOD. A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 7/13/10, AT 10:30AM TO DISCUSS THE STATUS OF THIS MATTER AND HOW BEST TO PROCEED TOWARDS ITS RESOLUTION.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 5/12/10. 5/13/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, EMAILED, AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(dp, ) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint of United Rentals, Inc. and United Rentals (North America) Inc. With Affirmative Defenses and Cross-Claims Against Gradall Industries, Inc. and EDC, CROSSCLAIM against UNITED RENTALS, INC. by UNITED RENTALS, INC., UNITED RENTALS, INC..(MURTAGH, DEAN) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by UNITED RENTALS, INC., UNITED RENTALS, INC..(MURTAGH, DEAN) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by DEAN F. MURTAGH on behalf of UNITED RENTALS, INC., UNITED RENTALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(MURTAGH, DEAN) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT A PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/12/2010 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 3/10/10. 3/12/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND FAXED.(dp, ) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE M. FAITH ANGELL, MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT PURPOSES, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: UTILIZATION OF FRCP 16 MANAGEMENT PROCEDURES; RESOLUTION OF DISCOVERY DISPUTES & REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS, ETC. & SEEKING THE CONSENT OF THE PARTIES FOR FINAL RESOLUTION OF THE CASE BY FINAL JUDGMENT BY THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN ACCORDANCE WITH 28 USC SECTION 636(c) & LRCP 72.1 III(b), ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 3/8/2010. 3/9/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED; AND MAILED TO UNREPS.(md) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by UNITED RENTALS, INC..(jeb, ) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GRADALL INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED.(jeb, ) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by EDC.(jeb, ) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against EDC, GRADALL INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED, UNITED RENTALS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number PPE018616.), filed by MILTON COLLINS.(jeb, ) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 343 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?