STRUBE, INC. v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:10-cv-01588
District Judge MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Strube Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN PATRICK RIEDER +1 717 881 9332 riederlawoffice@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MEYERSON & O'NEILL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JACK MEYERSON +1 215 972 1376 +1 215 972 0277 jmeyerson@meyersonlawfirm.com
No Logo JOHN M. MCHUGH, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
No Logo MICHAEL B. DONLEY , Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "MR. ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
No Logo RAYMOND E. MABUS, JR., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
No Logo THE DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Air Force, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "THE UNITED STATES AIR FORCE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
No Logo THE UNITED STATES ARMY, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
No Logo THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
United States Marine Corps United States Marine Corps, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "THE UNITED STATES MARINE CORPS."

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
No Logo THE UNITED STATES NAVY, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo JOHN M. MCHUGH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JACQUELINE CHRISTINE ROMERO +1 215 861 8470 jacqueline.romero@usdoj.gov
No Logo MICHAEL B. DONLEY , Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JACQUELINE CHRISTINE ROMERO +1 215 861 8470 jacqueline.romero@usdoj.gov
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "MR. ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JACQUELINE CHRISTINE ROMERO +1 215 861 8470 jacqueline.romero@usdoj.gov
No Logo RAYMOND E. MABUS, JR., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JACQUELINE CHRISTINE ROMERO +1 215 861 8470 jacqueline.romero@usdoj.gov
No Logo THE DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JACQUELINE CHRISTINE ROMERO +1 215 861 8470 jacqueline.romero@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Air Force, Defendant
Officially listed as "THE UNITED STATES AIR FORCE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JACQUELINE CHRISTINE ROMERO +1 215 861 8470 jacqueline.romero@usdoj.gov
No Logo THE UNITED STATES ARMY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JACQUELINE CHRISTINE ROMERO +1 215 861 8470 jacqueline.romero@usdoj.gov
No Logo THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JACQUELINE CHRISTINE ROMERO +1 215 861 8470 jacqueline.romero@usdoj.gov
United States Marine Corps United States Marine Corps, Defendant
Officially listed as "THE UNITED STATES MARINE CORPS."

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JACQUELINE CHRISTINE ROMERO +1 215 861 8470 jacqueline.romero@usdoj.gov
No Logo THE UNITED STATES NAVY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JACQUELINE CHRISTINE ROMERO +1 215 861 8470 jacqueline.romero@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JACQUELINE CHRISTINE ROMERO +1 215 861 8470 jacqueline.romero@usdoj.gov
No Logo Strube Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN PATRICK RIEDER +1 717 881 9332 riederlawoffice@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MEYERSON & O'NEILL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JACK MEYERSON +1 215 972 1376 +1 215 972 0277 jmeyerson@meyersonlawfirm.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING THE STATUS OF SETTLEMENT IS SCHEDULED FOR 3/12/12 AT 3:00PM. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/7/12. ) 2/7/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, ) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/6/12. (gn, ) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
      ORDER THAT THE COURT'S 11/28/11 SCHEDULING ORDER IS VACATED. A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING THE STATUS OF THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IS SCHEDULED FOR 2/6/12 AT 4:00 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/23/11. 12/23/11 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO: Settlement Conference held on 12/6/11. (gn, ) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
          ORDER THAT THE COURT'S 5/24/11 SCHEDULING ORDER IS VACATED. ALL DISCOVERY IS DUE 4/16/12. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 5/11/2012. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/28/11. ) 11/29/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 12/1/2011 (gn, ). (Entered: 11/29/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
            NOTICE by STRUBE, INC., THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 21 Order, Set Hearings,, Filing of Joint Letter Requesting Modification of Order re Settlement Conference (BERMAN, AMANDA) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
              ORDER THAT I WILL HOLD A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON TUESDAY, DECEMBER 6, 2011 AT 2:00 P.M. INCOURTROOM 3I, THIRD FLOOR, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106.ALL COUNSEL AND PARTIES ARE TO REPORT TO THE CALL BOX FOR L. FELIPE RESTREPO, USMJ, BEFORE GOING TO THE COURTROOM. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 11/3/11. 11/4/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (er, ) Modified on 11/4/2011 (er, ). (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Schedule for Expert Discovery and Dispositive Motions filed by STRUBE, INC., THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(BERMAN, AMANDA) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                  ORDER THAT THE MOTION 18 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE DISCOVERY IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PARA 2 OF THE COUTT'S 5/23/11, SCHEDULING ORDER IS VACATED. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE 9/9/11. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/22/11. ) 8/22/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, ) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Sept. 9, 2011 filed by MICHAEL B. DONLEY, ROBERT M. GATES, RAYMOND E. MABUS, JR, JOHN M. MCHUGH, STRUBE, INC., THE DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, THE UNITED STATES AIR FORCE, THE UNITED STATES ARMY, THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, THE UNITED STATES MARINE CORPS., THE UNITED STATES NAVY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(BERMAN, AMANDA) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL PREVIOUS SCHEDULING ORDERS ARE VACATED. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 8/15/2011. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBER MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 12/16/11. RESPONSES TO MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBER MOTIONS, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 1/6/12. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/23/11. ) 5/24/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, ) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG: Status Conference held on 5/23/11. (gn, ) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                          ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11:00 A.M. ON MONDAY 5/23/2011, IN CHAMBERS, ROOM 7614. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/27/2011. 4/28/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                            ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM TO HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY MICHAEL E. KUNZ ON 4/25/2011. 4/25/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jcab) (Main Document 14 replaced on 4/28/2011) (fh, ). (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                              ORDER I HEREBY GRANT THE PARTIES' JOINT MOTION TO SET A REVISED SCHEDULE FOR DISCOVERY AS FOLLOWS: EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 12/15/2011. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 2/15/2012. MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 7/27/2012. PRE-TRIAL MEMORANDA DUE BY 6/29/2012. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 3/29/11. ) 3/29/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(gn, ) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                Joint MOTION Set Revised Schedule for Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings filed by MICHAEL B. DONLEY, ROBERT M. GATES, RAYMOND E. MABUS, JR, JOHN M. MCHUGH, STRUBE, INC., THE DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, THE UNITED STATES AIR FORCE, THE UNITED STATES ARMY, THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, THE UNITED STATES MARINE CORPS., THE UNITED STATES NAVY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(BERMAN, AMANDA) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                  Joint Filing of Stipulation Regarding Discovery Procedures by MICHAEL B. DONLEY, ROBERT M. GATES, RAYMOND E. MABUS, JR, JOHN M. MCHUGH, STRUBE, INC., THE DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, THE UNITED STATES AIR FORCE, THE UNITED STATES ARMY, THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, THE UNITED STATES MARINE CORPS., THE UNITED STATES NAVY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Procedures Stipulation)(BERMAN, AMANDA) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 2/7/2011 (nd). (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Hearing: JURY TRIAL SET FOR 9/10/2012, 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 15-A BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM. (rbh) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Filing of Joint Proposed Plan for Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Plan for Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings)(BERMAN, AMANDA) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
                                        ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE LATE HONORABLE THOMAS M. GOLDEN TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM. ( SIGNED BY MICHAEL E. KUNZ ON 8/10/10. ) 8/13/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 8/13/2010 (gn, ). (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                          Plaintiff ANSWER to 3 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by STRUBE, INC..(RIEDER, JOHN) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                            Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STRUBE, INC..(gn, ) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELINE CHRISTINE ROMERO on behalf of MICHAEL B. DONLEY, ROBERT M. GATES, RAYMOND E. MABUS, JR, JOHN M. MCHUGH, THE DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, THE UNITED STATES AIR FORCE, THE UNITED STATES ARMY, THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, THE UNITED STATES MARINE CORPS., THE UNITED STATES NAVY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Certificate of Service(ROMERO, JACQUELINE) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN PATRICK RIEDER on behalf of STRUBE, INC. with Certificate of Service(RIEDER, JOHN) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                  Defendants' ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against STRUBE, INC. by THE UNITED STATES AIR FORCE, THE UNITED STATES MARINE CORPS., THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MICHAEL B. DONLEY, JOHN M. MCHUGH, RAYMOND E. MABUS, JR, THE UNITED STATES ARMY, THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, THE UNITED STATES NAVY, THE DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, ROBERT M. GATES.(BERMAN, AMANDA) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint for MICHAEL B. DONLEY on 4/16/2010, answer due 6/15/2010; ROBERT M. GATES on 4/16/2010, answer due 6/15/2010; RAYMOND E. MABUS, JR on 4/16/2010, answer due 6/15/2010; JOHN M. MCHUGH on 4/16/2010, answer due 6/15/2010; THE DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY on 4/16/2010, answer due 6/15/2010; THE UNITED STATES AIR FORCE on 4/16/2010, answer due 6/15/2010; THE UNITED STATES ARMY on 4/16/2010, answer due 6/15/2010; THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE on 4/16/2010, answer due 6/15/2010; THE UNITED STATES MARINE CORPS. on 4/16/2010, answer due 6/15/2010; THE UNITED STATES NAVY on 4/16/2010, answer due 6/15/2010; THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA on 4/16/2010, answer due 6/15/2010. (gn, ) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                      COMPLAINT against MICHAEL B. DONLEY, ROBERT M. GATES, RAYMOND E. MABUS, JR, JOHN M. MCHUGH, THE DEFENSE LOGISTICS AGENCY, THE UNITED STATES AIR FORCE, THE UNITED STATES ARMY, THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, THE UNITED STATES MARINE CORPS., THE UNITED STATES NAVY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number PPE020754.), filed by STRUBE, INC..(jmv, ) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 247 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?