Personal Audio, LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00432
District Judge Ron Clark, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 3:35 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Personal Audio LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Germer Gertz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Louis Germer +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 llgermer@germer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles W. Goehringer, Jr. +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 cwgoehringer@germer.com

Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

v.
No Logo Research In Motion Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Research in Motion Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by BECK REDDEN & SECREST LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe W. Redden, Jr. +1 713 951 3700 +1 713 951 3720 jredden@brsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Ernest Richardson +1 713 951 6284 +1 713 951 3720 mrichardson@brsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Parks +1 312 861 2000 +1 312 861 2200 mparks@kirkland.com
Research In Motion Ltd. Research In Motion Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BECK REDDEN & SECREST LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe W. Redden, Jr. +1 713 951 3700 +1 713 951 3720 jredden@brsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Ernest Richardson +1 713 951 6284 +1 713 951 3720 mrichardson@brsfirm.com
Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claudia Wilson Frost +1 713 276 7648 +1 713 276 7673 claudia.frost@pillsburylaw.com
Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd."

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claudia Wilson Frost +1 713 276 7648 +1 713 276 7673 claudia.frost@pillsburylaw.com
Samsung USA Samsung USA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Samsung Telecommunications America, LP"

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claudia Wilson Frost +1 713 276 7648 +1 713 276 7673 claudia.frost@pillsburylaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (148) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 147 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against HTC are dismissed with prejudice. HTC's counterclaims against Plaintiff are dismissed with prejudice. Attorney's fees and costs shall be borne by the party incurring the same. All pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/4/2013. (bjc) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp., Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 145 Motion for extension of time to file closing documents; new deadline is 4/4/2013. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/2/13. (tkd, ) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Settlement Documents by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp., Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER on Closing Documents. The parties are directed to submit all papers necessary for the closing of this case by 1/15/2013. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/10/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 143 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
            SEALED Sur-Reply in Opposition to 131 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Limit Access to Confidential Settlement Agreements to Outside-Counsel-Eyes Only filed by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Evan S. Day, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Day, Evan) Modified on 12/5/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 12/04/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 142 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
              SEALED SUR-REPLY in Opposition to 134 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel and for Additional Relief against HTC, filed by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick J. McKeever, # 2 Exhibit A)(McKeever, Patrick) Modified on 12/5/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                RESPONSE in Support re 131 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Limit Access to Confidential Settlement Agreements to Outside-Counsel-Eyes Only Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Compel filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 140 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                  SEALED PATENT REPLY Brief in Support of Its PATENT Motion re 131 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Limit Access to Confidential Settlement Agreements to Outside-Counsel-Eyes Only filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    NOTICE/LETTER to Judge Clark from Patrick McKeever re Notice of Supplemental Authority by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(McKeever, Patrick) Modified on 11/26/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 138 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 131 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Limit Access to Confidential Settlement Agreements to Outside-Counsel-Eyes Only filed by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Evan Day, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Day, Evan) Modified on 11/20/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held on 11/19/2012 before Judge Ron Clark: Markman Hearing AND Motion Hearing held re 131 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Limit Access to Confidential Settlement Agreements to Outside-Counsel-Eyes Only filed by Personal Audio, LLC, 135 MOTION for Emergency Consideration of Its Motion to Compel and for Additional Relief filed by Personal Audio, LLC. Written Orders will be entered. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2012: # 1 Court's Exhibit #1, # 2 Court's Exhibit #2) (fal, ). (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 136 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 134 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel and for Additional Relief against HTC filed by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Patrick McKeever ISO HTC Oppo, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnurer, John) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Emergency Consideration of Its Motion to Compel and for Additional Relief by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 11/7/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 134 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                            SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel and for Additional Relief against HTC by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 11/7/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              LETTER to Judge Clark re status of meet and confer regarding representative products by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp. (McKeever, Patrick) Modified on 11/6/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                LETTER to Judge Clark re status of meet and confer regarding representative products by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 11/6/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                  Opposed SEALED MOTION to Limit Access to Confidential Settlement Agreements to Outside-Counsel-Eyes Only by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick M. Arenz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 11/5/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
                                    Personal Audio's Sur-Reply to 124 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Prange, David) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                      REPLY to 127 Claim Construction Brief, filed by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp.. (Schnurer, John) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                        CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp., and Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Prange, David) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                          RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel R. Burgess, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O)(Prange, David) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE by Personal Audio, LLC of Service of First Supplemented Infringement Contentions (Prange, David) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER appointing Dr. Frank Shipman as technical advisor to the court. Fees of the advisor will be taxed equally against the parties as costs of court. The parties are directed to deliver copies of listed documents to Dr. Shipman by 9/24/12. In addition, other documents are directed to be delivered to Dr. Shipman as they are filed per the Scheduling Order and Order Governing Markman (docs 105 and 121). Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/17/12. cc: Shipman(tkd, ) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                              OPENING MARKMAN BRIEF filed by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Declaration of Patrick J. McKeever, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G)(Schnurer, John) Modified on 9/14/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 122 Joint Motion to extend certain scheduling order deadlines. Deadlines listed herein have been extended. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 9/7/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER Governing Markman Hearing which is set for 10/11/2012 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/24/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER denying as moot and without prejudice 86 Sealed Motion to compel the HTC defendants to answer source code interrogatories. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/24/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 118 Joint Motion to dismiss pltf's claims against Motorola Mobility LLC with prejudice. Motorola's counterclaims against pltf are also dismissed with prejudice. Attorney's fees and costs will be borne by the party incurring same. Ordered that 87 Motion to Compel is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/22/12. (tkd, ) Modified on 8/23/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 115 Motion to dismiss pltf's claims against LG Electronics Inc and LG Electronics USA Inc with prejudice. The counterclaims of these defts against pltf are dismissed without prejudice. Attorney's fees and costs will be borne by the party incurring same. Finally ordered that pltf's 89 Motion to compel as to the LG defendants is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 8/16/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Joint CLAIM CONSTRUCTION and Prehearing Statement filed by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp., Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Prange, David) Modified on 8/16/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER on Closing Documents. The parties are directed to submit all papers necessary for the closing of this case as it pertains to deft Motorola Mobility Inc by 8/27/12. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/27/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 7/23/12. (mrp, ) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to 60 First Amended Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by High Tech Computer Corp, HTC America Inc, H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp. (Schnurer, John) Modified on 7/13/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Status Conference held on 7/6/2012. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER ON CLOSING DOCUMENTS. It is ordered that LG Electronics, Inc. and LG Electronics USA, Inc. ONLY shall submit to the court all papers necessary for the closing of this case as it pertains to these defendants by 8/20/12. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/21/12. (mrp, ) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 106 Joint Motion to extend deadline for exchange of privilege logs; new deadline is 10/16/12. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/15/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Service of Infringement Contentions by Personal Audio, LLC (Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 6/14/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                STATUS REPORT Update Regarding Protective Order by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Protective Order)(Schnurer, John) Modified on 6/13/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline for Exchange of Privilege Logs by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnurer, John) Modified on 6/12/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Docket call and Final Pretrial set for 12/2/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. Proposed Jury instructions and verdict form due by 11/18/2013. Jury Selection and Trial set for 12/3/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 11/11/2013. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/5/2012. (bjc) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 102 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Compel. The deadline for Motorola to respond to Personal Audio's motion to compel is extended to 6/15/12. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/4/12. (mrp, ) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Conference to 102 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 87 SEALED MOTION to Compel Motorola to Answer Source Code Interrogatories filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Williams, E Danielle) Modified on 6/5/2012 (bjc, ). (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 87 SEALED MOTION to Compel Motorola to Answer Source Code Interrogatories by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The deadline for the LG Defendants to respond to Personal Audio's motion to compel is extended to June 15, 2012. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/1/12. (mrp, ) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Isackson, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER regarding the possible appointment of Dr. Frank Shipman as a technical advisor to the Court. Any objections to this appointment should be lodged by 6/6/12. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/30/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting 95 Motion for leave to file under seal. The HTC defendants may file their response to pltf's motion to compel under seal. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/30/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Status Conference held on 5/29/2012. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 96 Filed: 5/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to 86 SEALED MOTION to Compel HTC to Answer Source Code Interrogatories filed by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick J McKeever, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M)(Schnurer, John) Modified on 5/29/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 05/28/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schnurer, John) Modified on 5/29/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 05/28/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael T Morlock on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Morlock, Michael) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Following the Case Management Conference by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Jones, Michael) Modified on 5/21/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Following The Case Management Conference by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick M. Arenz, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 5/21/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 90 Amended Motion for leave to file motions to compel under seal. Order also denying as moot 85 Motion for leave to file under seal. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 5/15/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Amended and Unopposed MOTION to File Under Seal by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 5/16/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 89 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION to Compel LG to Provide Complete Answers to Source Code Interrogatories by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      LETTER BRIEF by Personal Audio, LLC filed in Compliance with Court Order (Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 5/15/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 87 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION to Compel Motorola to Answer Source Code Interrogatories by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 86 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION to Compel HTC to Answer Source Code Interrogatories by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Arenz, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              LETTER BRIEF Identifying Claim Terms - filed in Compliance with the Court's April 13, 2012 Order by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Heartfield, J) Modified on 5/15/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 72 Counterclaim of HTC Corp., HTC America, Inc., and HTC (B.V.I.) Corp. filed by by Personal Audio, LLC.(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 12, 2012 before Judge Ron Clark. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/28/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2012. (clb, ) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Diana Marie Szego on behalf of LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Szego, Diana) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 71 Counterclaim filed by Personal Audio, LLC.(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 69 Counterclaim filed by Personal Audio, LLC.(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ron Clark: Status Conference held on 4/16/2012. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (fal, ) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER on 4/12/12 case management conference. By 5/3/12, the parties are directed to meet and confer re issues discussed and file any agreements or motions by 5/14/12. Letter briefs re claim constructions are due by 5/14/12. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/13/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Bufe, John) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Approved APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stacey E Stillman for LG Electronics USA Inc and LG Electronics Inc (Fee Paid). (tkd, ) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Bufe, John) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Request Termination of Electronic Notices by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frost, Claudia) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 60 Amended Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against Personal Audio, LLC by High Tech Computer Corp., HTC America Inc., H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp. (Schnurer, John) Modified on 4/9/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 60 Amended Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against Personal Audio, LLC by Motorola Mobility, Inc.(Williams, E Danielle) Modified on 4/9/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Approved APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Evan Skinner Day for H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp, HTC America Inc and High Tech Computer Corp (Fee Paid). (tkd, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 60 First Amended Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc..(Brooks, James) Modified on 4/4/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp. (Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST for Termination of Electronic Notices by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LP (Frost, Claudia) Modified on 4/2/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E Danielle Thompson Williams on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Approved APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick J McKeever for H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp. HTC America Inc. and High Tech Computer Corp. (Fee Paid) (tkd, ) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Approved APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney N Thane Bauz for H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp, HTC America Inc and High Tech Computer Corp (Fee Paid) (tkd, ) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 59 Motion for leave to amend the complaint. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/20/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Research in Motion Corp., Research in Motion, Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LP, filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 3/20/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend 1 Complaint by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Attachment - Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 3/20/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 57 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Pltf's claims against the three Samsung defendants, as well as counterclaims of the Samsung defendants against pltf, are dismissed with prejudice. Attorney's fees and costs will be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 3/19/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC with Prejudice by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and Additional Defenses by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LP.(Frost, Claudia) Modified on 2/10/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Frost, Claudia) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Telecommunications America, LP identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics America, Inc. for Samsung Telecommunications America, LP. (Frost, Claudia) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Frost, Claudia) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and Additional Defenses by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LP.(Frost, Claudia) Modified on 2/1/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 44 Counterclaim by Personal Audio, LLC.(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 1/24/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 41 Counterclaim by Personal Audio, LLC.(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 1/24/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 38 Counterclaim by Personal Audio, LLC.(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 1/23/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER governing proceedings. Rule 26(f) conference must occur by March 2, 2012. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 4/12/2012 10:30 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/8/2012. (bjc) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 40 Joint Motion for extension of time to answer. The deadline for Samsung defendants to answer or otherwise respond is 1/31/12. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/3/12. (tkd, ) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Personal Audio, LLC by HTC America Inc, High Tech Computer Corp, H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp.(Schnurer, John) Modified on 1/3/2012 (tkd, ). (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LG Electronics, Inc. (Isackson, Robert) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LG Electronics USA, Inc. (Isackson, Robert) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LG Electronics, Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Incs ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc..(Isackson, Robert) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Personal Audio, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arenz, Patrick) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Korn, Russell) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Personal Audio, LLC by Motorola Mobility, Inc..(Korn, Russell) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Research in Motion Corp., Research in Motion, Ltd. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 35 Joint Motion to dismiss, with prejudice, pltf's claims against defts Research in Motion Ltd and Research in Motion Corp, as well as the counterclaims of these defts against pltf. Attorney's fees and costs will be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/21/11. (tkd, ) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss Research in Motion Limited and Research in Motion Corporation With Prejudice by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James C Brooks on behalf of LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Brooks, James) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File answer. The LG Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Personal Audio LLC's complaint on or before December 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/2/2011. (bjc) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part 26 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer by HTC Corp, HTC (BVI) Corp and HTC America Inc. The HTC defendants are directed to answer or otherwise plead by 12/30/11. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/1/11. (tkd, ) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Routh on behalf of LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Routh, Steven) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Personal Audio, LLC. Motorola Mobility, Inc. waiver sent on 10/28/2011, answer due 12/27/2011. (tkd, ) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Isackson, Robert) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M Isackson on behalf of LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Isackson, Robert) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp. (Schnurer, John) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schnurer, John) Modified on 12/1/2011 (tkd, ). (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John P Schnurer on behalf of H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America Inc., High Tech Computer Corp. (Schnurer, John) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 20 and 21 Motions for extension of time to answer. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/28/11. (tkd, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Approved APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kal K Shah for Research in Motion Corp (Fee Paid). (tkd, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Approved APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael A Parks for Research in Motion Corp (Fee Paid). (tkd, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for LG Electronics, Inc and LG Electronics USA, Inc to Answer or Otherwise Respond, filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 11/23/2011 (tkd, ). (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for High Tech Computer Corp, H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp and HTC America Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond, filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 11/23/2011 (tkd, ). (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Approved APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Erik R Fuehrer for Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd and Samsung Telecommunications America LP (Fee Paid). (tkd, ) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Approved APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark D Fowler for Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd and Samsung Telecommunications America LP (Fee Paid). (tkd, ) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 15 Motion for extension of time to answer. The answers of defts Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Electronics America Inc and Samsung Telecommunications America LLC are due 12/30/11. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/4/11. (tkd, ) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 14 Motion for extension of time to answer. The answers of defts Research in Motion Ltd and Research in Motion Corp are due by 12/30/11. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 11/4/11. (tkd, ) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frost, Claudia) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement by Research in Motion Corp., Research in Motion, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LG Electronics USA, Inc..(filed by Plaintiff Attorney)( Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued and electroncially mailed to attorneys Lawrence Germer and Charles Goehringer, Jr. for service in case as to H.T.C. (B.V.I.) Corp., High Tech Computer Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(pkb, ) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued and electroncially mailed to attorneys Lawrence Germer and Charles Goehringer, Jr for service in case as to Motorola Mobility, Inc., Research in Motion Corp., Research in Motion, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es))(pkb, ) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re HTC America Inc.. (Filed for HTC America Inc. by PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY)( Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Personal Audio, LLC. LG Electronics USA, Inc and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served by certified mail on 10/12/2011, answer due 11/2/2011. (bjc) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Personal Audio, LLC. HTC America Inc and Samsung Telecommunications America, LP served by certified mail on 10/11/2011, answer due 11/1/2011. (bjc) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued and electronically mailed to attorneys Lawrence Germer and Charles Goehringer for service in case as to HTC America Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es))(pkb, ) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED and electronically mailed to attorneys Lawrence Germer and Charles Goehringer, Jr. for service in case as to LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (pkb, ) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued and electronically mailed to attorneys Lawrence Germer and Charles Goehringer, Jr for service in case as to LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (pkb, ) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joe W Redden, Jr on behalf of Research in Motion Corp. (Redden, Joe) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ernest Richardson on behalf of Research in Motion Corp. (Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3217134.), filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 251 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?