ISwitch, LLC v. T-Mobile USA, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00119
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 7:08 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Iswitch, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
v.
No Logo Research In Motion Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Research In Motion Ltd. Research In Motion Ltd., Defendant

Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. All claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims in the instant suit are DISMISSED in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/03/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 67 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by Plaintiff in this case are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and all counterclaims asserted by Defendants TMobile USA, Inc., Research In Motion Limited and Research In Motion Corporation are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear their own fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/03/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION to Dismiss by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Larson, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2013: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 05/28/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 65 Motion to Extend the Deadline to Submit Closing Papers to 5/29/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/9/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
          Unopposed MOTION to Extend the Deadline for Submitting Closing Papers Second Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline for Submitting Closing Papers by ISwitch, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Larson, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 62 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for filing closing papers in this case is extended to 5-08-2013. All deadlines are stayed to 5-08-2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/02/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Submit) Closing Papers by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Everingham, Charles) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by T-Mobile USA, Inc. of Firm Name Change (Larson, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER that parties submit closing documents no later than 5-01-2013 so that the case can be removed from Court's docket. All deadlines are stayed up to and including 5-01-2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/01/13. cc:attys 4-01-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                      Unopposed MOTION to Stay Certain Deadlines With All Defendants by ISwitch, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward on behalf of ISwitch, LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF P. R. 3-4(a) AND DISCOVERY ORDER DISCLOSURES (Everingham, Charles) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd., T-Mobile USA, Inc. DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF P. R. 3-3 & 3-4(b) DISCLOSURES (Everingham, Charles) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by T-Mobile USA, Inc. Under Paragraph 2(B) Of The Discovery Order (Larson, Matthew) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ISwitch, LLC Under Paragraph 2(B) Of The Discovery Order (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 52 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Dislosures Pursuant to Discovery Order. The deadline to serve disclosures pursuant to Paragraph 2(B) of the Court's September 7, 2012 Discovery Order (dkt #44) is extended from October 22, 2012 to November 6, 2012. This is a text only order and no document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/23/12. (mjm) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO DISCOVERY ORDER by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Everingham, Charles) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. [Initial Disclosures] (Borgman, Steven) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by ISwitch, LLC of Disclosure Under Paragraph 1 of the Discovery Order (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Everingham, IV on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Everingham, Charles) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ISwitch, LLC under Paragraph 2(c) of the Discovery Order (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Layn R. Phillips added as Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/07/12. cc:attys 9-07-12(mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Jury Selection set for 11/3/2014 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 11/10/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 8/29/2013 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/07/12. cc:attys 9-07-12(mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/07/12. cc:attys 9-07-12(mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/07/12. cc:attys 9-07-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/07/12. cc:attys 9-07-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Layn Phillips, filed by ISwitch, LLC. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, E-Discovery Order, and Protective Order by ISwitch, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit Discovery Order, # 3 Exhibit Docket Control Order, # 4 Exhibit ESI Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE by ISwitch, LLC of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER setting Scheduling/Status Conference for 9/7/2012 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/09/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/08/12. cc:attys 8-09-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 8/6/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Clutter, Patrick) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert John Needham on behalf of T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Needham, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Christopher Nelson on behalf of T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Nelson, Mark) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Michael Schuster on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Schuster, William) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea M Houston on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Houston, Andrea) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristen Paris Foster on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Foster, Kristen) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER setting Status Conference for 8/6/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/13/12. cc:attys 6-14-12(mll, ) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE by ISwitch, LLC OF REQUEST FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      RESPONSE to 22 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. by ISwitch, LLC. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE to 19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Defendants Research in Motion Ltd. and Research in Motion Corp. by ISwitch, LLC. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew P Larson for T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (pkb, ) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kirk R Ruthenberg for T-Mobile USA, Inc. (pkb, ) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH for T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against ISwitch, LLC by T-Mobile USA, Inc..(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 22 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against ISwitch, LLC by T-Mobile USA, Inc..(Jones, Michael) Modified on 5/23/2012 (gsg). (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Klein, Eric) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED AND RESEARCH IN MOTION CORPORATION'S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against ISwitch, LLC by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd..(Klein, Eric) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re T-Mobile USA, Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Defendants Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd..( Klein, Eric) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re T-Mobile USA, Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Iftikhar Ahmed on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Ahmed, Iftikhar) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Joseph Klein on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Klein, Eric) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirt S O'Neill on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (O'Neill, Kirt) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cono A Carrano on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Carrano, Cono) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David B Weaver on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Weaver, David) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven R Borgman on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Borgman, Steven) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William L. LaFuze on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (LaFuze, William) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of ISwitch, LLC (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of ISwitch, LLC (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of ISwitch, LLC (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ISwitch, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Kingfisher Fund VI LP for ISwitch, LLC. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Issued as to Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd., T-Mobile USA, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of ISwitch, LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd., T-Mobile USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3483679.), filed by ISwitch, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - United States Patent No. 7,225,334)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 176 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?