Soverain Software LLC v. Amazon.com et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:04-cv-00528
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Soverain Software LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leo Merken +1 212 326 3631 +1 212 755 7306 leo.merken@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Seraphine +1 415 875 5892 +1 415 875 5700 jseraphine@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Georgia Yanchar +1 212 326 3939 +1 212 755 7306

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Robert Adamo +1 312 862 2671 +1 312 862 2200 kradamo@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas L Giannetti +1 212 596 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard H An +1 212 806 5984 +1 212 806 1291 ran@stroock.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth L Stein +1 212 806 5491 +1 212 806 1291 kstein@stroock.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Roth Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl R Roth +1 903 935 1665 +1 903 935 1797 cr@rothfirm.com
v.
Amazon.com, Inc. Amazon.com, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Amazon.com"
Unknown Role, Drugstore.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, Audible, Inc.

Represented by Amazon.com, Inc.

Represented by Christensen O'Connor Johnson Kindness PLLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Christopher Carraway +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5301 joseph.wasch@learn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Geringer +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5300 james.geringer@klarquist.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David McLeod +1 503 595 5300 +53595530 535 595 5301 richard.mcleod@klarquist.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D. Vandenberg +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5301 john.vandenberg@klarquist.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brooke Ashley-May Taylor +1 206 516 3880 +1 206 516 3883 btaylor@susmangodfrey.com
Gap, Inc. Gap, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Gap Inc"

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/25/2005 David Aaron Nelson +1 312 876 7700 +1 312 993 9767 david.nelson@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/25/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. The Court is advised that the parties have stipulated and agreed throught their respective counsel pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(ii) and 41(c) that civil actions nos 6:04cv14 and 6:04cv528, including all claims and counter-claims, each be dismissed in its entirety with prejudice with each side bearing its own costs and attorneys' fees. Amazon.com; terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/31/05. (Entered: 08/31/2005)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal form executed by both parties by Soverain Software LLC. (Shentov, Ognjan) (Entered: 08/30/2005)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER payment to be promptly made to Danny Williams, technical consultant to the Court. Soverain, $18,539.61, Amazon.com, $18,539.60, Total $37,079.21 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/29/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Sealed Document +
        Sealed Document. Settlement Agreement (fnt, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2005 (fnt, ). (Entered: 08/10/2005)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Report of Mediation
          REPORT of Mediation by Michael Philip Patterson. Mediation result: settled(Patterson, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2005)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Protective OrderCourt Filing
            PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/25/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Motion for Protective Order
              Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Amazon.com, Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2005)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE by Amazon.com re 48 Markman Hearing Additional Authorities re: Claim Construction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Zachary, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 ~Notice (other)
                  NOTICE by Amazon.com re 48 Markman Hearing Submission of Demonstrative Exhibits used by Amazon.com, Inc. at the 6/30/05 Claim Construction Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Zachary, Michael) (Entered: 07/14/2005)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC re 48 Markman Hearing, 49 Transcript (Submission of demonstrative exhibits used by Soverain Software LLC at the Markman Hearing) (Merken, Leo) (Entered: 07/13/2005)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                      TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on June 30, 2005, 9:10 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Jan Mason. (fnt, ) (Entered: 07/12/2005)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Markman HearingCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis : Markman Hearing held on 6/30/2005. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (rlf, ) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE by Amazon.com of Joint Claim Construction Chart (Zachary, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2005)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/17/05. cc:attys 6-17-05 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/17/2005)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 41 MOTION Claim construction filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Merken, Leo) (Entered: 06/16/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed) by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit SOVERAIN?S REPLY BRIEF ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION PURSUANT TO PATENT RULE 4-5(c))(Merken, Leo) (Entered: 06/16/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re 41 MOTION Claim construction Of Laura H. Salisbury filed by Amazon.com. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K)(Zachary, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2005)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005 Response to Motion
                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 41 MOTION Claim construction filed by Amazon.com. (Zachary, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2005)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                      MOTION Claim construction by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Grimes Dec.# 2 Exhibit Index# 3 Exhibit Ex. A# 4 Exhibit Ex. B# 5 Exhibit Ex. C# 6 Exhibit Ex. D# 7 Exhibit Ex. E# 8 Exhibit Ex. F# 9 Exhibit Ex. G# 10 Exhibit Ex. H# 11 Exhibit Ex. I# 12 Exhibit Ex. J# 13 Exhibit Ex. K# 14 Exhibit Ex. L# 15 Exhibit Ex. M# 16 Exhibit Ex. N# 17 Exhibit Ex. O# 18 Exhibit Ex. P# 19 Exhibit Ex. Q# 20 Exhibit Ex. R# 21 Exhibit Ex. S# 22 Exhibit Ex. T# 23 Exhibit Ex. U# 24 Exhibit Ex. V)(Merken, Leo) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER, the parties are to provide Danny L. Williams, Technical Consultant,With Their Markman Briefs on Disk or CD Along With a Hard Copy. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/25/2005. (rvw, ) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Answer to Counterclaim
                                          Soverain Software LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Soverain Software LLC.(Seraphine, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER the Court hereby APPOINTS Danny L. Williams as technical consultant to the Court in this action with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendant and timely paid as billed re 34 Notice (Other) filed by Amazon.com,, 35 Notice (Other) filed by Soverain Software LLC, . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/25/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                              NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC Supplement to Notice Regarding Technical Advisors (Shentov, Ognjan) (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                NOTICE by Amazon.com Regarding Amazon.com's Submission Of Proposed Technical Advisors (Geringer, James) (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                  NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC of Submission of Proposed Technical Advisors (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Giannetti, Thomas) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                    NOTICE by Amazon.com Submission Of Proposed Technical Advisors (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Geringer, James) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael N Zachary for Amazon.com. (fnt, ) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Answer
                                                        First Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Amazon.com.(Geringer, James) (Entered: 04/14/2005)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                          NOTICE by Amazon.com Of Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Geringer, James) (Entered: 04/11/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Max Lalon Tribble, Jr on behalf of Amazon.com, Amazon.com (Tribble, Max) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Adatto Nelson on behalf of Amazon.com (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 03/28/2005)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                APPROVING STIPULATION AND ORDER, it is ORDERED that Soverain's Complaint against Gap and Gap's Counterclaims against Soverain are DISMISSED with prejudice, and that each party shall bear it's own attorney's fees, expenses and costs. The Gap Inc and The Gap Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/25/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 02/25/2005)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Stipulation
                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal Between Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC and The Gap, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC. (Giannetti, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2005)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Zapolsky for Amazon.com.Approved 2/7/05 (fnt, ) (Entered: 02/07/2005)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathryn M Sheehan for Amazon.com. Approved 2/7/05 (fnt, ) (Entered: 02/07/2005)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney J Christopher Carraway for Amazon.com. Approved 1/12/05 (fnt, ) Modified on 1/12/2005 (fnt, ). (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                          Soverain's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Amazon.com, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC.(Seraphine, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James E Geringer for Amazon.com. Approved 1/10/05(fnt, ) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John D Vandenberg for Amazon.com. Approved 1/10/05 (fnt, ) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer Seraphine for Soverain Software LLC. (fnt, ) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Barry R Satine for Soverain Software LLC. (fnt, ) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ognjan V Shentov for Soverain Software LLC. (fnt, ) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Leo Merken for Soverain Software LLC. (fnt, ) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas L Giannetti for Soverain Software LLC. (fnt, ) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/3/2005 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Amazon.com Notice of Initial Disclosures (McLeod, Richard) (Entered: 01/03/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/3/2005 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by The Gap Inc Notice of Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/03/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/3/2005 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC pursuant to Paragraph 1 of the Discovery Order (Giannetti, Thomas) (Entered: 01/03/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Israel Sasha Mayergoyz for The Gap Inc. (fnt, ) (Entered: 12/29/2004)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Amanda J Hollis for The Gap Inc. (fnt, ) (Entered: 12/29/2004)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Nelson for The Gap Inc. (fnt, ) (Entered: 12/29/2004)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Answer
                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Amazon.com.(Carraway, J) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon.com (Carraway, J) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Answer
                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by The Gap Inc.(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by The Gap Inc Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1 (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/10/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                              COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Amazon.com, The Gap Inc , filed by Soverain Software LLC.(ehs, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2004 (ehs, ). (Entered: 12/10/2004)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 Order Referring Case to MediatorCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Robert M Parker added as Mediator. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/9/04. (fnt, ) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Amended Pleadings due by 4/14/2005. Discovery due by 5/12/2005. Expert Witness List due by 12/20/2005. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/3/2006. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2006 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Selection set for 3/13/2006 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 3/13/2006 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/8/04. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/08/2004)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    DISCOVERY ORDER . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/7/04. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/08/2004)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                      ORDER severing US Patent Nos. 6,195,649 and 6,205,427 from 6:04cv14. All claims related to these patents shall proceed under 6:04cv528. Pltf shall file a complaint bringing its allegations as to these patents on or before 12/8/04. Deft shall file an answer on or before 12/22/04. (ehs, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2004 (ehs, ). (Entered: 12/03/2004)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 293 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?