Tessera, Inc v. Micron Technology Inc et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:05-cv-00094
Magistrate Judge John D. Love, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Magistrate Judge John D. Love
Last Updated April 2, 2017 at 4:42 AM EDT (8.1 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Kajeer Yar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kajeer Yar +1 918 292 8158 +1 918 292 8158 kyar@yarlawfirm.com
No Logo Micron Technology, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Kajeer Yar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kajeer Yar +1 918 292 8158 +1 918 292 8158 kyar@yarlawfirm.com
v.
Hitachi, Ltd. Hitachi, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Hitachi Cable America, Inc."
Officer/Director, Opnext, Inc.
Officer/Director, Western Digital Corp
Officer/Director, Bookham Technology Plc

Represented by Schwartz Junell Greenburg & Oathout, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Austin Schwartz +1 713 752 0017 +1 713 752 0327 dschwartz@sjgolaw.com
No Logo Infineon Technologies AG, Defendant

Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T Battaglia +1 202 408 4051 +1 202 408 4400 john.battaglia@finnegan.com

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GREGORY S. AROVAS , +1 212 446 4781 +1 212 446 4900 greg.arovas@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Michael Askew +1 213 680 8249 +1 213 680 8500 kevin.askew@kirkland.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexis Gorton +1 212 446 4887 +1 212 446 4900 agorton@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H Hong +1 213 680 8400 +1 213 680 8500 hhong@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn M Liberatore +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 kliberatore@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Perry-Campf +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 dperry-campf@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Robertson +1 312 861 2000 +8612 861 861 2200
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric L Shen +1 213 680 8400 +1 213 680 8500 eshen@kirkland.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS J. LANG +1 202 739 3000 +1 202 739 3001 tlang@morganlewis.com

Represented by Slater & Matsil LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Clark Knapp +1 972 732 1001 +1 972 732 9218 knapp@slater-matsil.com
Space Gregory Neugebauer +1 972 732 1001 +1 972 732 9218 neugebauer@slater-matsil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Wyse +1 972 732 1001 +1 972 732 9218 wyse@slater-matsil.com
No Logo Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Infineon Technologies North America Corp"

Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T Battaglia +1 202 408 4051 +1 202 408 4400 john.battaglia@finnegan.com

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GREGORY S. AROVAS , +1 212 446 4781 +1 212 446 4900 greg.arovas@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Michael Askew +1 213 680 8249 +1 213 680 8500 kevin.askew@kirkland.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexis Gorton +1 212 446 4887 +1 212 446 4900 agorton@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H Hong +1 213 680 8400 +1 213 680 8500 hhong@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn M Liberatore +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 kliberatore@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Perry-Campf +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 dperry-campf@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Robertson +1 312 861 2000 +8612 861 861 2200
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric L Shen +1 213 680 8400 +1 213 680 8500 eshen@kirkland.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS J. LANG +1 202 739 3000 +1 202 739 3001 tlang@morganlewis.com

Represented by Slater & Matsil LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Clark Knapp +1 972 732 1001 +1 972 732 9218 knapp@slater-matsil.com
Space Gregory Neugebauer +1 972 732 1001 +1 972 732 9218 neugebauer@slater-matsil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Wyse +1 972 732 1001 +1 972 732 9218 wyse@slater-matsil.com
No Logo Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Defendant

Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T Battaglia +1 202 408 4051 +1 202 408 4400 john.battaglia@finnegan.com

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GREGORY S. AROVAS , +1 212 446 4781 +1 212 446 4900 greg.arovas@kirkland.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexis Gorton +1 212 446 4887 +1 212 446 4900 agorton@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Perry-Campf +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 dperry-campf@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Robertson +1 312 861 2000 +8612 861 861 2200

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS J. LANG +1 202 739 3000 +1 202 739 3001 tlang@morganlewis.com

Represented by Slater & Matsil LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Clark Knapp +1 972 732 1001 +1 972 732 9218 knapp@slater-matsil.com
Space Gregory Neugebauer +1 972 732 1001 +1 972 732 9218 neugebauer@slater-matsil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Wyse +1 972 732 1001 +1 972 732 9218 wyse@slater-matsil.com
No Logo Qimonda Ag, Defendant

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Michael Askew +1 213 680 8249 +1 213 680 8500 kevin.askew@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H Hong +1 213 680 8400 +1 213 680 8500 hhong@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn M Liberatore +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 kliberatore@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Robertson +1 312 861 2000 +8612 861 861 2200
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric L Shen +1 213 680 8400 +1 213 680 8500 eshen@kirkland.com
No Logo Tessera, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Other Parties
No Logo Intervenor United States of America, Intervenor

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathanael M Cousins +1 312 861 2000 +8612 861 861 2200

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

No Logo Jan du Preez, Movant

Represented by Patterson & Sheridan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Robin Selinger +1 214 272 0957 +1 214 296 0246 jselinger@pattersonsheridan.com
No Logo Michael W. Sadler, Movant

Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Frank McNeil +1 214 651 5000 +1 214 651 5940 barry.mcneil@haynesboone.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline Kelley Shipchandler +1 214 651 5556 +1 214 200 0581 jacqueline.shipchandler@haynesboone.com
Rambus Inc. Rambus Inc., Movant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas N Tarnay +1 214 981 3388

Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shont E Miller +1 213 683 9523 +1 213 593 2823 millerse@mto.com
Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Movant
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co LTD"

Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond William Mort, III +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 rmort@dpelaw.com
No Logo Robert M Parker, Mediator

Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (626) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Page 1 Page 2

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that Tessera comply with provisions Paragraph 34 of the 7/29/05 order is extended to 12/1/06 with respect to Micron and Infineon's Confidential Information. Infineon to comply with provisions Paragraph 34 of the 7/29/05 order is extended to 12/1/06 with respect to Micron and Tessera's Confidential Information. Micron to comply with provisions Paragraph 34 of the 7/29/05 order is extended to 12/1/06 with respect to Tessera's and Infineon's Confidential Information. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 10/30/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order Stipulation and Motion for Entry of Order Regarding Protective Order by Tessera, Inc, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 10/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 648 Motion for Protective Order . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 9/11/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 648 MOTION for Protective Order Modification filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shimamoto, Peter) (Entered: 09/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lisa Partain for Tessera, Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeanne M Heffernan for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Infineon Technologies AG and Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Love : Final Pretrial Conference held on 7/27/2006. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (mjm, ) (Entered: 08/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 642 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION INFINEON'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE CHRISTOPHER VELLTURO'S EXPERT OPINIONS CONCERNING LOST PROFITS AND REASONABLE ROYALTY by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 641 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION INFINEON'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE ALAN GORDON'S EXPERT OPINION CONCERNING WILLFULNESS AND ENHANCEMENT OF DAMAGES by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 640 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION INFINEON'S MOTION TO STRIKE ALAN GORDON'S EXPERT OPINIONS CONCERNING INVENTORSHIP AND INEQUITABLE CONDUCT by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 639 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION INFINEON'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY BY TESSERA'S EXPERT DR. JIANMIN QU CONCERNING THE "MOVABLE" LIMITATIONS by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that Pla Tersera, Inc may respond to the issues raised in Infineon's brief 637 no later than 8/1/06 but no further briefing will be considered. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 7/28/06. (djh, ) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None
BRIEF filed by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 07/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 636 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 464 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION Infineon's and Micron's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Tessera Claims Containing "Compliant" Limitations TESSERA, INC.'S SUR-REPLY TO INFINEON'S AND MICRON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF TESSERA'S CLAIMS CONTAINING "COMPLIANT" LIMITATION filed by Tessera, Inc. (Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 635 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp to 630 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, INFINEON'S OPPOSITION TO TESSERA'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF TESSERA'S OPPOSITION TO INFINEON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S CLAIMS FOR PRE-FILING DAMAGES UNDER 35 U.S.C. Section 287(a). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 634 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION To Strike Duplicative And Cumulative Expert Witnesses by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 633 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT SURREPLY to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 452 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Infineon's Motion for Summary Judgment on Tessera's Claim for Alleged Infringement Damages Based on Tessera's Agreements with Samsung and Hynix Surreply filed by Tessera, Inc. (Lowenstein, Nathan) Modified on 7/26/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 07/26/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 632 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 459 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment That Tessera May Not Collect Damages for Products Not Subject to U.S. Patent Law Surreply in support of Tessera's Opposition to the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Tessera, Inc. (Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Motions hearing held on July 14, 2006 at 9:05 a.m. before Judge John D Love. Court Reporter: Jan Mason. 191 pages (ehs, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2009: # 1 Part 2 of Transcript, # 2 Part 3 of Transcript) (ehs, ). (Entered: 07/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 630 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT Plaintiff Tessera Inc, Supplemental Brief in Support to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 444 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion For Summary Judgment On Tessera's Claims for Pre-Filing Damages Under Section 35 U.S.C. Section 287(A) filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Lowenstein Declaration# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B)(ch, ) (Entered: 07/25/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 628 Sealed Patent Tessera Unopposed Motion to File a Supplemental Brief and Related Documents in Support of Tessera's Opposition to Infineons Motion for Summary Judgment on Tesseras Claims for Pre-Filing Damages Under 35USC 287(a). Infineon shall have 5 days from 7/24/06 to file a brief of three pages, plus any attachments, in responses to Tesseras supplemental brief. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 7/25/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 628 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave To File A Supplemental Brief And Related Documents In Support Of Tessera's Opposition To Infineon's Motion For Summary Judgment On Tessera's Claims For Pre-Filing Damages Under 35 U.S.C. 287(a) by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Supplemental Brief# 3 Lowenstein Declaration# 4 Exhibit A# 5 Exhibit B)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 627 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 465 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE INVENTORSHIP -- DEFENDANTS' SURREPLY TO TESSERA'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS' DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIM REGARDING INVENTORSHIP filed by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/21/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2006 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mjm, ) (Entered: 07/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Love : Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/20/2006. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (mjm, ) (Entered: 07/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 624 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 452 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Infineon's Motion for Summary Judgment on Tessera's Claim for Alleged Infringement Damages Based on Tessera's Agreements with Samsung and Hynix filed by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 623 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 464 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION Infineon's and Micron's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Tessera Claims Containing "Compliant" Limitations filed by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 622 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 459 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment That Tessera May Not Collect Damages for Products Not Subject to U.S. Patent Law filed by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C# 2 Exhibit D# 3 Exhibit E)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP Defendants' Notice of Agreement Regarding Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Topic No. 18 (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Tessera, Inc Parties' Joint Statement Regarding (1) Agenda for Pretrial Conference; and (2) Alternative Proposals for Time Estimates (Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 619 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 615 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 551 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Sever Tessera's Patent Claims from its Non-Patent Claims Under FRCP 21, or, in the Alternative, for a Separate Trial Under FRCP 42(B) filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 618 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION - Motions in Limine by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(ehs, ) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 599 Sealed Patent Motion to exceed the page limit in Tessera Inc's Motions in Limine . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 7/18/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 616 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY BRIEF in support of PATENT Motion re 463 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION Infineon's and Micron's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Tessera Claims Containing "Movable" Limitations filed by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(ehs, ) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None
Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 551 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Sever Tessera's Patent Claims from its Non-Patent Claims Under FRCP 21, or, in the Alternative, for a Separate Trial Under FRCP 42(B) by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robertson, John) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Tessera, Inc of Compliance: Tessera's Objections to Defendants' Trial Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tessera's Objections to Defendants' Trial Exhibits (Part I)# 2 Exhibit Tessera's Objections to Defendants' Trial Exhibits (Part II))(Hoffman, Adam) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Disclosure by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(DeVasto, Diane) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 612 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION Micron's Motion in Limine To Bar Tessera From Introducing False Allegations That Micron Stole Alleged Tessera Confidential Information by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R# 19 Exhibit S# 20 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVasto, Diane) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 607 SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine To Preclude Tessera From Introducing Any Evidence Of, Or Referring To, Any Alleged Price-Fixing Conspiracy Of DRAM Chips. (Robertson, John) Modified on 7/18/2006 (mpv, ). (Entered: 07/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 608 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION MICRON'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATING TO JONES DAY REPRESENTATION IN OTHER LITIGATION by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 606 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine to Preclude Plaintiff From Using Royalty Evidence to Show Commercial Success to Support a Non-Obviousness Theory Based on Documents Withheld During Discovery as Well as References to FIndings in the ITC Investigation by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Newton, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Disclosure by Tessera, Inc Objections to Defendants Deposition Designations and Counter-Designations (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A# 2 Attachment B)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine To Exclude Irrelevant Documents Using Term "Compliant" by Micron Technology Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yar, Kajeer) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 602 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION INFINEON'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE TESSERA FROM OFFERING PURPORTED EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT THAT DEFENDANTS "MISUSED" TESSERA CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 601 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT Defendants' Notice of Compliance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(DeVasto, Diane) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 600 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 597 SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine to Exclude Evidence, Testimony and Argument Regarding 35 USC 271(F). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10 (Part 4)# 2 Exhibit 10 (Part 5)# 3 Exhibit 10 (Part 6)# 4 Exhibit 10 (Part 7)# 5 Exhibit 10 (Part 8)# 6 Exhibit 11# 7 Exhibit 12)(Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 599 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION to exceed the page limit in Tessera's Motions in Limine by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Attachment A# 3 Proposed Order re Motions in Limine)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 598 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 597 SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine to Exclude Evidence, Testimony and Argument Regarding 35 USC 271(F). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3# 2 Exhibit 4# 3 Exhibit 5# 4 Exhibit 6# 5 Errata 7# 6 Exhibit 8# 7 Exhibit 9# 8 Exhibit 10 (Part 1)# 9 Exhibit 10 (Part 2))(Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 597 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine to Exclude Evidence, Testimony and Argument Regarding 35 USC 271(F) by Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 1)# 3 Exhibit (Part 2)# 4 Exhibit (Part 3)# 5 Exhibit (Part 4)# 6 Exhibit (Part 5)# 7 Exhibit 1 (Part 5)# 8 Exhibit 1 (Part 7))(Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
***REPLACES #594*** SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine to Exclude Evidence, Testimony and Argment Regarding Advice of Counsel by Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Manuel Calderon# 2 Exhibit No. 1# 3 Exhibit No. 2# 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Newton, Michael) Modified on 7/18/2006 (mpv, ). (Entered: 07/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 595 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT DIRECTED TO TESSERA'S UNTIMELY THEORY SEEKING DAMAGES UNDER TESSERA'S CONTRACTS WITH SAMSUNG AND HYNIX by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR; PER ATTY; PLEASE IGNORE*** SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence, Testimony and Argument Regarding Advice of Counsel by Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Manuel Calderon# 2 Exhibit No. 1# 3 Exhibit No. 2# 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Newton, Michael) Modified on 7/18/2006 (mpv, ). (Entered: 07/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Love : Motion Hearing held on 7/14/2006 re 444 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion For Summary Judgment On Tessera's Claims for Pre-Filing Damages Under Section 35 U.S.C. Section 287(A) filed by Micron Technology Inc, 463 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION Infineon's and Micron's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Tessera Claims Containing "Movable" Limitations filed by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp, Qimonda AG, 465 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE INVENTORSHIP filed by Tessera, Inc, 466 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Equitable Estoppel and Implied License JEDEC Defenses filed by Tessera, Inc,. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (mjm, ) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp DEFENDANTS' IDENTIFICATION OF INVALIDITY DEFENSES PURSUANT TO 35 U.S.C. SECTION 282 (Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting deft's 583 Motion for leave to exceed the page limit in their reply in support of their motion for summary judgment of noninfringement of Tessera claims containing "Movable" limitations. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 7/14/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 572 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply briefs to motion referenced in this order. Responses due by 7/19/2006. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 7/14/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Hearing: Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/10/2006 09:30 AM in Ctrm 208 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg, ) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2006 01:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg, ) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 586 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
SEALED TRANSCRIPT of MOTION hearing held on July 7, 2006 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge John D Love. Court Reporter: Jan Mason. (ehs, ) (ehs, ). (Entered: 07/14/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 585 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 455 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Defendants' Obviousness Defense And Counterclaim of Patent Invalidity Based on Obviousness filed by Tessera, Inc. (Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 584 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 456 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Affirmative Defenses filed by Tessera, Inc. (Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 583 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMIT IN THEIR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF TESSERA CLAIMS CONTAINING "MOVABLE" LIMITATIONS; PROPOSED REPLY BRIEF by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re Motion to Exceed Page Limits# 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply Brief in Support of SJ Motion re "Moveable" Limitations# 3 Exhibit A to Proposed Reply Brief# 4 Exhibit B to Proposed Reply Brief# 5 Exhibit C to Proposed Reply Brief# 6 Exhibit D to Proposed Reply Brief)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Disclosure by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp Defendants' Notice of Compliance (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Defendants' Joint Deposition Designation List# 2 Exhibit B: Defendants' Joint Deposition Designations)(DeVasto, Diane) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 581 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 465 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE INVENTORSHIP filed by Tessera, Inc. (Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Disclosure by Tessera, Inc Response to Defendants' Joint Deposition Designation List (Attachments: # 1 Attachment - Tessera Designations)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 579 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 466 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Equitable Estoppel and Implied License JEDEC Defenses filed by Tessera, Inc. (Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 569 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages limits to their Reply in support of deft's joint Motion for Summary Judgment on Tessera's Claim for Pre-filing damages under 35 USC 287(a) . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 7/12/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None
Deft's Joint Exhibit List by Micron Technology Inc. (Attachments: # 1)(ehs, ) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 571 Motion to Amend exhibit list . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 7/12/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 575 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 551 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Sever Tessera's Patent Claims from its Non-Patent Claims Under FRCP 21, or, in the Alternative, for a Separate Trial Under FRCP 42(B) filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Errata 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Affidavit Stockinger# 28 Text of Proposed Order)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 574 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 444 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion For Summary Judgment On Tessera's Claims for Pre-Filing Damages Under Section 35 U.S.C. Section 287(A) Sur-reply filed by Tessera, Inc. (Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 573 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 511 SEALED PATENT MOTION INFINEON AND MICRON'S JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE REFERENCES IN DR. QU'S EXPERT REPORT TO UNTIMELY-DISCLOSED EXEMPLAR PRODUCTS AND TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY THEREON filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Attachment A - Hsieh Declaration# 3 Attachment B - Qu Declaration# 4 Exhibit 1# 5 Exhibit 2# 6 Exhibit 3# 7 Exhibit 4# 8 Exhibit 5# 9 Exhibit 6# 10 Exhibit 7# 11 Exhibit 8# 12 Exhibit 9# 13 Exhibit 10# 14 Exhibit 11# 15 Exhibit 12# 16 Exhibit 13# 17 Exhibit 14# 18 Exhibit 15# 19 Exhibit 16# 20 Exhibit 17# 21 Exhibit 18# 22 Exhibit 19# 23 Exhibit 20# 24 Exhibit 21# 25 Exhibit 22# 26 Exhibit 23# 27 Exhibit 24# 28 Exhibit 25# 29 Exhibit 26# 30 Exhibit 27# 31 Exhibit 28# 32 Exhibit 29# 33 Exhibit 30# 34 Exhibit 31)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None
Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply DEFENDANTS' EMERGENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEFS CONCERNING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS NOT SCHEDULED FOR ARGUMENT ON JULY 14, 2006 by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Amend/Correct Micron's Unopposed Motion to Amend its Previously Provided Exhibit List Filed With the Joint Pre-Trial Order by Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Technology Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit List - First Part# 2 Exhibit Amended Exhibit List - Second Part# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 570 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. (Lipner, Joseph) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Regarding the Joint Reply filed as Dkt #564 - SEALED by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathryn M Liberatore for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Qimonda AG and Infineon Technologies AG. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin M Askew for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Qimonda AG and Infineon Technologies AG. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric L Shen for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Qimonda AG and Infineon Technologies AG. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Helen H Hong for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Qimonda AG and Infineon Technologies AG. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None
***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, ATTY MUST REFILE WITHIN PAGE LIMITS OR FILE A MOTION.***SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 444 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion For Summary Judgment On Tessera's Claims for Pre-Filing Damages Under Section 35 U.S.C. Section 287(A) Defendants' Joint Reply filed by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Ziegelbein, Mark) Modified on 7/11/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 07/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
***REPLACES #562.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 554 Proposed Pretrial Order.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit B# 2 Exhibit Exhibit E# 3 Exhibit Exhibit H# 4 Exhibit Exhibit K-L (Part 1)# 5 Exhibit Exhibit K-L (Part 2))(Newton, Michael) Modified on 7/10/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 07/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY (REPLACED BY #563)***Proposed Pretrial Order Additional Attachments to Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit B# 2 Exhibit Exhibit E# 3 Exhibit Exhibit H# 4 Exhibit Exhibit K-L (Part 1)# 5 Exhibit Exhibit L (Part 2))(Newton, Michael) Modified on 7/10/2006 (sm, ). Modified on 7/10/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 07/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 559 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 511 SEALED PATENT MOTION INFINEON AND MICRON'S JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE REFERENCES IN DR. QU'S EXPERT REPORT TO UNTIMELY-DISCLOSED EXEMPLAR PRODUCTS AND TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY THEREON Responses due by 7/12/2006 at 12:00 noon CDT.. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 7/10/06. (poa, ) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Diane DeVasto on behalf of Micron Technology Inc (DeVasto, Diane) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 7/9/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 511 SEALED PATENT MOTION INFINEON AND MICRON'S JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE REFERENCES IN DR. QU'S EXPERT REPORT TO UNTIMELY-DISCLOSED EXEMPLAR PRODUCTS AND TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY THEREON by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 07/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 7/8/2006, Entered: None
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 554 Proposed Pretrial Order.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C# 2 Exhibit F# 3 Exhibit I# 4 Exhibit K/L (Part 3))(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 554 Proposed Pretrial Order.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit D# 3 Exhibit G# 4 Exhibit J)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 07/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR, ATTY MUST REFILE WITH CORRECT EVENT.***Proposed Pretrial Order Exhibits to #554 by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. B# 2 Exhibit Ex. E# 3 Exhibit Ex. H# 4 Exhibit Ex. K-L (Part 1)# 5 Exhibit Ex. K-L (Part 2))(Newton, Michael) Modified on 7/10/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 07/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Tessera, Inc Submission of Proposed Jury Instructions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A# 2 Exhibit Ex. B# 3 Exhibit Ex. C# 4 Exhibit Ex. D)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
Proposed Pretrial Order (Joint) by Tessera, Inc. (Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Love : Motion Hearing held on 7/7/2006 re 352 SEALED PATENT MOTION Micron Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Tessera, Inc.'s Remaining Antitrust Theory filed by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc,, 371 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defenants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action for Tortious Interference with Contractual Relations and/or Prospective Business Relations Due to Plaintiff's Failure to Bring the Claim filed by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp, 382 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT INFINEON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S REMAINING ANTITRUST CLAIM (COUNTS III AND IV) AND DEFENDANTS INFINEON'S AND MICRON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S TORTIOUS INTER filed by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp, Qimonda AG, 402 , SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT INFINEON'S CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S REMAINING ANTITRUST CLAIM (COUNTS III AND IV) AND DEFENDANTS INFINEON'S AND MICRON'S CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA&# filed by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (mjm, ) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
SECOND AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, amended pretrial deadlines set forth herein, including Motions due by 7/17/2006. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/7/2006. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2006 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love.. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 7/6/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 551 Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION to Sever Tessera's Patent Claims from its Non-Patent Claims Under FRCP 21, or, in the Alternative, for a Separate Trial Under FRCP 42(B) by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of D. Hutnyan# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Text of Proposed Order # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2006 (mll, ). (Entered: 07/03/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alexander Nguyen for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Qimonda AG and Infineon Technologies AG. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 549 Filed: 7/1/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 544 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R# 19 Exhibit S# 20 Exhibit T# 21 Exhibit U# 22 Exhibit V# 23 Exhibit W# 24 Exhibit X# 25 Exhibit Y# 26 Exhibit Z# 27 Exhibit AA# 28 Exhibit AB)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 548 Filed: 7/1/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 533 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 61# 2 Exhibit 62# 3 Exhibit 63# 4 Exhibit 64# 5 Exhibit 65# 6 Exhibit 66# 7 Exhibit 67# 8 Exhibit 68# 9 Exhibit 69# 10 Exhibit 70a# 11 Exhibit 70b# 12 Exhibit 70c# 13 Exhibit 70d# 14 Exhibit 70e# 15 Exhibit 70f# 16 Exhibit 70g# 17 Exhibit 71# 18 Exhibit 72# 19 Exhibit 73# 20 Exhibit 74)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 547 Filed: 7/1/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 533 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 41# 2 Exhibit 42# 3 Exhibit 43# 4 Exhibit 44# 5 Exhibit 45# 6 Exhibit 46# 7 Exhibit 47# 8 Errata 48# 9 Exhibit 49# 10 Exhibit 50# 11 Exhibit 51# 12 Exhibit 52# 13 Exhibit 53# 14 Exhibit 54# 15 Exhibit 55# 16 Exhibit 56a# 17 Exhibit 56b# 18 Exhibit 56c# 19 Exhibit 57# 20 Exhibit 58# 21 Exhibit 59# 22 Exhibit 60)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 546 Filed: 7/1/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 533 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 21# 2 Exhibit 22# 3 Exhibit 23# 4 Exhibit 24# 5 Exhibit 25# 6 Exhibit 26# 7 Exhibit 27# 8 Exhibit 28# 9 Exhibit 29# 10 Exhibit 30# 11 Exhibit 31# 12 Exhibit 32# 13 Exhibit 33# 14 Exhibit 34# 15 Exhibit 35# 16 Exhibit 36# 17 Exhibit 37# 18 Exhibit 38# 19 Exhibit 39# 20 Exhibit 40)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 545 Filed: 7/1/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 530 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 21# 2 Exhibit 22# 3 Exhibit 23# 4 Exhibit 24# 5 Exhibit 25# 6 Exhibit 26# 7 Exhibit 27# 8 Exhibit 28# 9 Exhibit 29# 10 Exhibit 30# 11 Exhibit 31# 12 Exhibit 32# 13 Exhibit 33# 14 Exhibit 34# 15 Exhibit 35# 16 Exhibit 36# 17 Exhibit 37# 18 Exhibit 38# 19 Exhibit 39# 20 Exhibit 40)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 07/01/2006)
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 544 Filed: 7/1/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 466 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Equitable Estoppel and Implied License JEDEC Defenses filed by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Suresh Sitarman# 2 Affidavit of John Kelly# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 543 Filed: 7/1/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 530 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (part 21a)# 2 Exhibit A (part 21b)# 3 Exhibit A (part 22)# 4 Exhibit A (part 23)# 5 Exhibit A (part 24)# 6 Exhibit A (part 25)# 7 Exhibit A (part 26)# 8 Exhibit A (part 27)# 9 Exhibit A (part 28)# 10 Exhibit A (part 29)# 11 Exhibit A (part 30)# 12 Exhibit A (part 31)# 13 Exhibit A (part 32))(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 07/01/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 542 Filed: 7/1/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 530 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 41# 2 Exhibit 42# 3 Exhibit 43# 4 Exhibit 44# 5 Exhibit 45# 6 Exhibit 46# 7 Exhibit 47# 8 Exhibit 48# 9 Exhibit 49# 10 Exhibit 50# 11 Exhibit 51# 12 Exhibit 52# 13 Exhibit 53# 14 Exhibit 54# 15 Exhibit 55# 16 Exhibit 56# 17 Exhibit 57# 18 Exhibit 58# 19 Exhibit 59# 20 Exhibit 60)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 07/01/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 541 Filed: 7/1/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 533 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Errata 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18a# 19 Exhibit 18b# 20 Exhibit 19# 21 Exhibit 20)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 540 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 530 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 07/01/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 539 Filed: 7/1/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 535 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K# 2 Exhibit L# 3 Exhibit M# 4 Exhibit N# 5 Exhibit O# 6 Exhibit P# 7 Exhibit Q# 8 Exhibit R# 9 Exhibit S# 10 Exhibit T# 11 Exhibit U# 12 Exhibit V# 13 Exhibit W# 14 Exhibit X# 15 Exhibit Y# 16 Exhibit Z# 17 Exhibit AA# 18 Exhibit BB# 19 Exhibit CC# 20 Exhibit DD# 21 Exhibit EE# 22 Exhibit FF# 23 Exhibit GG# 24 Exhibit HH# 25 Exhibit II# 26 Exhibit JJ# 27 Exhibit KK# 28 Exhibit LL# 29 Exhibit MM# 30 Exhibit NN# 31 Exhibit OO# 32 Exhibit PP# 33 Exhibit QQ# 34 Exhibit RR# 35 Exhibit SS# 36 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 538 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 530 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (part 11)# 2 Exhibit A (part 12)# 3 Exhibit A (part 13)# 4 Exhibit A (part 14)# 5 Exhibit A (part 15)# 6 Exhibit A (part 16)# 7 Exhibit A (part 17)# 8 Exhibit A (part 18)# 9 Exhibit A (part 19)# 10 Exhibit A (part 20))(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 07/01/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 537 Filed: 7/1/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 536 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit S# 2 Exhibit T# 3 Exhibit U# 4 Exhibit V# 5 Exhibit W# 6 Exhibit X)(Hattenbach, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/01/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 536 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 459 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment That Tessera May Not Collect Damages for Products Not Subject to U.S. Patent Law filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Lowenstein# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit G# 10 Exhibit H (Part 1)# 11 Exhibit H (Part 2)# 12 Errata I# 13 Exhibit j# 14 Exhibit K (Part 1)# 15 Exhibit K (Part 2)# 16 Exhibit K (Part 3)# 17 Exhibit K (Part 4)# 18 Exhibit L# 19 Exhibit M# 20 Exhibit N# 21 Exhibit O# 22 Exhibit P# 23 Exhibit # 24 Exhibit R)(Hattenbach, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 535 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 465 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE INVENTORSHIP filed by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 534 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 530 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (part 1)# 2 Exhibit A (part 2)# 3 Exhibit A (part 3)# 4 Exhibit A (part 4)# 5 Exhibit A (part 5)# 6 Exhibit A (part 6)# 7 Exhibit A (part 7)# 8 Exhibit A (part 8)# 9 Exhibit A (part 9)# 10 Exhibit A (part 10))(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 533 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 456 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Affirmative Defenses DEFENDANTS? RESPONSE TO TESSERA?S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS? AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 532 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 452 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Infineon's Motion for Summary Judgment on Tessera's Claim for Alleged Infringement Damages Based on Tessera's Agreements with Samsung and Hynix filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Pickett Declaration in Support of Tessera Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re Tessera's Claim for Damages Based on Samsung and Hynix Agreements# 2 Affidavit Lowenstein Declaration in Support of Tessera's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Tessera's Claim for Damages Based on the Samsung and Hynix Agreements# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit C-1# 7 Exhibit D# 8 Exhibit E# 9 Exhibit F# 10 Exhibit G# 11 Exhibit G-1# 12 Exhibit H# 13 Exhibit I# 14 Exhibit J# 15 Exhibit K# 16 Exhibit L# 17 Exhibit M# 18 Exhibit N# 19 Exhibit O# 20 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 531 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 529 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Errata 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Exhibit 27# 28 Exhibit 28# 29 Exhibit 29# 30 Exhibit 30# 31 Exhibit 31# 32 Exhibit 32# 33 Exhibit 33# 34 Exhibit 34# 35 Exhibit 35# 36 Exhibit 36# 37 Exhibit 37# 38 Exhibit 38# 39 Exhibit 39# 40 Exhibit 40# 41 Exhibit 41# 42 Exhibit 42# 43 Exhibit 43# 44 Exhibit 44# 45 Exhibit 45# 46 Exhibit 46# 47 Exhibit 47# 48 Exhibit 48a# 49 Exhibit 48b# 50 Exhibit 48c# 51 Exhibit 49# 52 Exhibit 50)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 530 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 463 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION Infineon's and Micron's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Tessera Claims Containing "Movable" Limitations filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Affidavit of Jianmin Qu# 3 Affidavit of Benjamin Hattenbach)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 529 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 464 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION Infineon's and Micron's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Tessera Claims Containing "Compliant" Limitations filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Affidavit of Benjamin Hattenbach)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 528 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 527 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order To Exceed Page Limit)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 527 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 352 SEALED PATENT MOTION Micron Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Tessera, Inc.'s Remaining Antitrust Theory, 402 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT INFINEON'S CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S REMAINING ANTITRUST CLAIM (COUNTS III AND IV) AND DEFENDANTS INFINEON'S AND MICRON'S CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA&# filed by Tessera, Inc. (Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 526 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 455 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Defendants' Obviousness Defense And Counterclaim of Patent Invalidity Based on Obviousness filed by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 283 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO MODIFY THE MARCH 15, 2006 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (DOCKET NO. 283) by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 524 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 371 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defenants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action for Tortious Interference with Contractual Relations and/or Prospective Business Relations Due to Plaintiff's Failure to Bring the Claim Tessera Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Opposition To Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Tessera's Fifth Cause Of Action On The Purported Ground That It Is Barred By The Statute of Limitations filed by Tessera, Inc. (Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 429 Sealed Patent Motion, granting 450 Sealed Patent Motion, granting in part and denying as moot in part 460 Sealed Patent Motion, granting 462 Sealed Patent Motion. Micron's motion challenging Tessera's claim of privilege 462 attached the sufficiency of Tessera's privilege log. Tessera countered that Micron's privilege log suffered from similar deficiencies and the parties agreed to resolve the dispute by the exchanging revised privilege logs by July 6, 2006. Any objections to these revised privilege logs must be sumbitted by July 11, 2006, and the Court will address any such objections at the July 14, 2006 summary judgment hearing. . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/29/06. (poa, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Tessera, Inc (Plaintiff's Notice of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Love : Motion Hearing held on 6/29/2006 re 429 SEALED PATENT MOTION TESSERA'S MOTION TO COMPEL INFINEON TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS WITHDRAWN OR WITHHELD UNDER AN UNSUPPORTED CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE filed by Tessera, Inc,, 460 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Micron to Complete Deposition of Steve Appleton and Allow Tessera to Depose Witnesses Newly Disclosed by Defendants filed by Tessera, Inc,, 462 SEALED PATENT MOTION Micron's Motion to Compel Tessera to Produce Documents Withheld Under An Unsupported Claim of Privilege filed by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, 450 SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave To Supplement Preliminary Infringement Contentions To Include Internal Codenames and Model Numbers Disclosed During Discovery filed by Tessera, Inc,. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (mjm, ) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 519 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 513 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, 514 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document,, 515 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document,, 516 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document,,, 517 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document,,, 518 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 55 (Part 1 of 14)# 2 Exhibit 55 (Part 2 of 14)# 3 Exhibit 55 (Part 3 of 14)# 4 Exhibit 55 (Part 4 of 14)# 5 Exhibit 55 (Part 5 of 14)# 6 Exhibit 55 (Part 6 of 14)# 7 Exhibit 55 (Part 7 of 14)# 8 Exhibit 55 (Part 8 of 14)# 9 Exhibit 55 (Part 9 of 14)# 10 Exhibit 55 (Part 10 of 14)# 11 Exhibit 55 (Part 11 of 14)# 12 Exhibit 55 (Part 12 of 14)# 13 Exhibit 55 (Part 13 of 14)# 14 Exhibit 55 (Part 14 of 14))(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 518 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 513 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, 515 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document,, 516 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document,,, 517 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9 (part 1 of 5)# 2 Exhibit 9 (Part 2 of 5)# 3 Exhibit 9 (Part 3 of 5)# 4 Exhibit 9 (Part 4 of 5)# 5 Exhibit 5 (Part 5 of 5)# 6 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 10)# 7 Exhibit 54 (Part 2 of 10)# 8 Exhibit 54 (Part 3 of 10)# 9 Exhibit 54 (Part 4 of 10)# 10 Exhibit 54 (Part 5 of 10)# 11 Exhibit 54 (Part 6 of 10)# 12 Exhibit 54 (Part 7 of 10)# 13 Exhibit 54 (Part 8 of 10)# 14 Exhibit 54 (Part 9 of 10)# 15 Exhibit 54 (Part 10 of 10))(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 517 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 513 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, 514 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document,, 515 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document,, 516 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 53# 2 Exhibit 56# 3 Exhibit 57# 4 Exhibit 58# 5 Exhibit 59# 6 Exhibit 60# 7 Exhibit 61# 8 Exhibit 62# 9 Exhibit 63# 10 Exhibit 64# 11 Exhibit 65# 12 Exhibit 66# 13 Exhibit 67)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 516 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 513 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, 514 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document,, 515 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 36# 2 Exhibit 37# 3 Exhibit 38# 4 Exhibit 39# 5 Exhibit 40# 6 Exhibit 41# 7 Exhibit 42# 8 Exhibit 43# 9 Exhibit 44# 10 Exhibit 45# 11 Exhibit 46# 12 Exhibit 47# 13 Exhibit 48# 14 Exhibit 49# 15 Exhibit 50# 16 Exhibit 51# 17 Exhibit 52)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 515 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 513 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, 514 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 19# 2 Exhibit 20# 3 Exhibit 21# 4 Exhibit 22# 5 Errata 23# 6 Exhibit 24# 7 Exhibit 25# 8 Exhibit 26# 9 Exhibit 27# 10 Exhibit 28# 11 Exhibit 29# 12 Exhibit 30# 13 Exhibit 31# 14 Exhibit 32# 15 Exhibit 33# 16 Exhibit 34# 17 Exhibit 35)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 514 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 513 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 10# 10 Exhibit 11# 11 Exhibit 12# 12 Exhibit 13# 13 Exhibit 14# 14 Exhibit 15# 15 Exhibit 16# 16 Exhibit 17# 17 Exhibit 18)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 513 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 444 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion For Summary Judgment On Tessera's Claims for Pre-Filing Damages Under Section 35 U.S.C. Section 287(A) filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Appendix Statement of Genuine Facts# 3 Lowenstein Declaration)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 06/28/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST INFINEON'S NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPT AND REAL TIME REPORTING OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/28/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 511 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION INFINEON AND MICRON'S JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE REFERENCES IN DR. QU'S EXPERT REPORT TO UNTIMELY-DISCLOSED EXEMPLAR PRODUCTS AND TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY THEREON by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/28/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 510 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY in support to re 506 Tessera's Motion for Leave to Supplement Preliminary Infringement Contentions to include internal codenames and model numbers disclosed during discovery filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 19# 2 Exhibit 20# 3 Exhibit 21# 4 Exhibit 22# 5 Exhibit 23# 6 Exhibit 24# 7 Exhibit 25)(ehs, ) (Entered: 06/28/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 506 Motion for Tessera to file reply in support of its motion for leave to supplement preliminary infringement contentions to include internal codenames and model numbers disclosed during discovery. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/28/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/28/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 508 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 371 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defenants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action for Tortious Interference with Contractual Relations and/or Prospective Business Relations Due to Plaintiff's Failure to Bring the Claim filed by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric Bakewell# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M# 15 Exhibit N# 16 Exhibit O# 17 Exhibit P# 18 Exhibit Q# 19 Exhibit R# 20 Exhibit S)(ehs, ) (Entered: 06/28/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 507 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 462 SEALED PATENT MOTION Micron's Motion to Compel Tessera to Produce Documents Withheld Under An Unsupported Claim of Privilege Micron's Reply In Support of Its Motion to Compel Tessera to Produce Documents Withheld Under an Unsupported Claim of Privilege filed by Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 506 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION To Exceed Page Limits re Reply in Support of Tessera's Motion for Leave to Supplement Preliminary Infringement Contentions by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Attachment A - Reply# 3 Exhibit 19# 4 Exhibit 20# 5 Exhibit 21# 6 Exhibit 22# 7 Exhibit 23# 8 Exhibit 24# 9 Exhibit 25)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 505 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 460 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Micron to Complete Deposition of Steve Appleton and Allow Tessera to Depose Witnesses Newly Disclosed by Defendants filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Supplemental declaration of Joseph M. Lipner)(Lipner, Joseph) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 504 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 429 SEALED PATENT MOTION TESSERA'S MOTION TO COMPEL INFINEON TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS WITHDRAWN OR WITHHELD UNDER AN UNSUPPORTED CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE filed by Tessera, Inc. (Lipner, Joseph) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 323 Motion to Compel and relief sought in 399 Tessera's second supplemental brief in support of it emergency motion to compel. Infineon may supplement its summary judgment motion regarding Tessera's 271(f) claim no later than 7/3/06, Tessera may supplement its response with briefing regarding this newly produced evidence no later than 7/10/06. Infineon to produce fully populated charts containing sales of non-memory BGA products sold in the US by 7/3/06 . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/27/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 492 Motion to exceed page limits in their reply in support of their motion for summary judgment on pltf's fifth cause of action for Tortious Interference with contractual relations. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/26/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 500 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT INFINEON'S SUR-REPLY TO TESSERA'S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL INFINEON TO IMMEDIATELY COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S MARCH 23, 2006 ORDER AND OTHER RELIEF. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/26/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Disclosure by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc (Rebuttal Witness List) (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 06/26/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 498 Filed: 6/24/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 429 SEALED PATENT MOTION TESSERA'S MOTION TO COMPEL INFINEON TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS WITHDRAWN OR WITHHELD UNDER AN UNSUPPORTED CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE INFINEON'S OPPOSITION TO TESSERA'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS filed by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David B. Perry-Campf# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 06/24/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 6/24/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 460 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Micron to Complete Deposition of Steve Appleton and Allow Tessera to Depose Witnesses Newly Disclosed by Defendants filed by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 496 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 460 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Micron to Complete Deposition of Steve Appleton and Allow Tessera to Depose Witnesses Newly Disclosed by Defendants and Cross Motion to Complete Deposition of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition and to Allow Micron to Depose Representative of Intel filed by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Diane Hutnyan# 2 Exhibit A to Declaration# 3 Exhibit B to Declaration# 4 Exhibit C to Declaration# 5 Exhibit D to Declaration# 6 Exhibit E to Declaration# 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 495 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 450 SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave To Supplement Preliminary Infringement Contentions To Include Internal Codenames and Model Numbers Disclosed During Discovery INFINEON AND MICRON'S JOINT OPPOSITION TO TESSERA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 06/23/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 494 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 352 SEALED PATENT MOTION Micron Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Tessera, Inc.'s Remaining Antitrust Theory filed by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix # 2 Declaration of David Ashmore# 3 Exhibit to David Ashmore Declaration)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 493 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 402 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT INFINEON'S CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S REMAINING ANTITRUST CLAIM (COUNTS III AND IV) AND DEFENDANTS INFINEON'S AND MICRON'S CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA&# filed by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix to Infineon's Reply in Support of Its Corrected Motion for Summary Judgment)(Robertson, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 06/23/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 492 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limits in Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action for Tortious Interference with Contractual Relations and/or Prospective Relations Due to Plaintiff's Failure to Bring the Claim Within the Statute of Limitations [Dkt #371] by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Reply Brief in Support# 2 Declaration of Eric Bakewell# 3 Exhibit A to Declaration# 4 Exhibit B to Declaration# 5 Exhibit C to Declaration# 6 Exhibit D to Declaration# 7 Exhibit E to Declaration# 8 Exhibit F to Declaration# 9 Exhibit G to Declaration# 10 Exhibit H to Declaration# 11 Exhibit I to Declaration# 12 Exhibit J to Declaration# 13 Exhibit K to Declaration# 14 Exhibit L to Declaration# 15 Exhibit M to Declaration# 16 Exhibit N to Declaration# 17 Exhibit O to Declaration# 18 Exhibit P to Declaration# 19 Exhibit Q to Declaration# 20 Exhibit R to Declaration# 21 Exhibit S to Declaration# 22 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 491 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 462 SEALED PATENT MOTION Micron's Motion to Compel Tessera to Produce Documents Withheld Under An Unsupported Claim of Privilege filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas C. Werner# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8)(Lipner, Joseph) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 388 Motion to compel production of documents regarding improperly altered evidence and for other related remedial action. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/23/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 489 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 388 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel the Production of Document Regarding Improperly Altered Evidence and for Other Related Relief Micron's Surreply in Support of its Opposition to Tessera's Motion filed by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark John Ziegelbein on behalf of Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc (Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Ray Jackson on behalf of Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc (Jackson, Thomas) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arthur P Licygiewicz on behalf of Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc (Licygiewicz, Arthur) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel, Matthew D. Kellam (Newton, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 391 Motion to Compel . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/22/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 411 Motion to Continue . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/21/06. (poa, ) (Entered: 06/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 459 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment That Tessera May Not Collect Damages for Products Not Subject to U.S. Patent Law, 463 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION Infineon's and Micron's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Tessera Claims Containing "Movable" Limitations, 464 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION Infineon's and Micron's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Tessera Claims Containing "Compliant" Limitations, 465 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE INVENTORSHIP, 466 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Equitable Estoppel and Implied License JEDEC Defenses, 452 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Infineon's Motion for Summary Judgment on Tessera's Claim for Alleged Infringement Damages Based on Tessera's Agreements with Samsung and Hynix, 444 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion For Summary Judgment On Tessera's Claims for Pre-Filing Damages Under Section 35 U.S.C. Section 287(A), 455 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Defendants' Obviousness Defense And Counterclaim of Patent Invalidity Based on Obviousness, 456 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Affirmative Defenses: Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2006 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg, ) (Entered: 06/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 411 MOTION to Continue INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG'S, INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES NORTH AMERICA CORP.'S AND QIMONDA AG'S MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE [REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE] filed by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/20/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp of Disclosure of Witnesses (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 06/20/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Motion hearing held on May 4, 2006 at 1:55 pm before Judge John D Love. Court Reporter: Jan Mason. 84 pages (ehs, ) (ehs, ). (Entered: 06/20/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Tessera's 474 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in its reply brief . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/20/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/20/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 477 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 475 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,,. (Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 06/20/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 476 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 475 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,,. (Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 06/20/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 475 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 474 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Tessera Inc.'s Reply To Infineon's Response (Docket No. 430) To Tessera's Second Supplemental Brief (Docket No. 399) In Support Of Its Emergency Motion To Compel Infineon To Immediately Comply With The Court's March 23, 2006 Order And Other Relief filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13# 2 Exhibit 15# 3 Exhibit 16# 4 Exhibit 17# 5 Exhibit 18# 6 Exhibit 19# 7 Exhibit 20# 8 Exhibit 21# 9 Exhibit 22)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 06/20/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Disclosure of Witnesses by Tessera, Inc (Stockinger, Trevor) Modified on 6/20/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 06/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc of Disclosure of Witnesses (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that the parties submit responses to the foregoing motions no later than 6/23/06 with replies to be submitted no later than 6/27/06. Further the Court sets the foregoing motions for hearing on 6/29/06 at the Federal Courthouse in Tyler, Tx at 9:30 am. The Court previously set Tessera's motion compel for hearing on 7/7/06 but in light of this most recent flurry of discovery motions, the Court is inclined to address all of the pending discovery disputes at the same hearing. This order modifies the Court's previous order to the extent it applied to Tessera's motion to compel. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/19/06. (djh, ) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Inspection of NEC SX Series 2 and 3 Flip Tab Carrier. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/19/06. (poa, ) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding certain Flex Circuit and Module Process change documents, dated 2/25/05 and/or 4/13/05 and a Celecstica PDIMM Failure Analysis report, dated 6/3/05 both authored by Staktek. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/19/06. (djh, ) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 468 Filed: 6/17/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 464 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION Infineon's and Micron's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Tessera Claims Containing "Compliant" Limitations. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/17/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 467 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 466 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Equitable Estoppel and Implied License JEDEC Defenses. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Errata 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Errata 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 06/17/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 466 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Equitable Estoppel and Implied License JEDEC Defenses by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 06/17/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 465 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE INVENTORSHIP by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Affidavit of Kenneth Weatherwax# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Errata B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit C-2# 7 Exhibit D# 8 Exhibit E# 9 Exhibit F# 10 Exhibit G# 11 Exhibit H-1# 12 Exhibit H-2# 13 Exhibit H-2-1# 14 Exhibit I# 15 Exhibit J)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/17/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION Infineon's and Micron's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Tessera Claims Containing "Compliant" Limitations by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION Infineon's and Micron's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Tessera Claims Containing "Movable" Limitations by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 462 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION Micron's Motion to Compel Tessera to Produce Documents Withheld Under An Unsupported Claim of Privilege by Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan# 2 Exhibit Tessera's Revised Privilege Log - Part One# 3 Exhibit Tessera's Revised Privilege Log - Part 2# 4 Exhibit Tessera's Revised Privilege Log - Part 3# 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 429 SEALED PATENT MOTION TESSERA'S MOTION TO COMPEL INFINEON TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS WITHDRAWN OR WITHHELD UNDER AN UNSUPPORTED CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 460 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Micron to Complete Deposition of Steve Appleton and Allow Tessera to Depose Witnesses Newly Disclosed by Defendants by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Lipner Declaration# 3 Exhibit Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit Exhibit G# 10 Exhibit Exhibit H# 11 Exhibit Exhibit I# 12 Exhibit Exhibit J# 13 Exhibit Exhibit K# 14 Exhibit Exhibit L# 15 Exhibit Exhibit M# 16 Exhibit Exhibit N)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment That Tessera May Not Collect Damages for Products Not Subject to U.S. Patent Law by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 458 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 411 MOTION to Continue INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG'S, INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES NORTH AMERICA CORP.'S AND QIMONDA AG'S MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Lowenstein Declaration# 2 Exhibit Lowenstein Declaration Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit Lowenstein Declaration Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit Lowenstein Declaration Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit Lowenstein Declaration Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit Lowenstein Declaration Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit Lowenstein Declaration Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit Lowenstein Declaration Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit Lowenstein Declaration Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit Lowenstein Declaration Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit Lowenstein Declaration Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit Lowenstein Declaration Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit Lowenstein Declaration Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit Lowenstein Declaration Exhibit M)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 457 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 388 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel the Production of Document Regarding Improperly Altered Evidence and for Other Related Relief filed by Tessera, Inc. (Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 456 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Affirmative Defenses by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Affidavit of Trevor Stockinger# 3 Exhibit 1# 4 Exhibit 2# 5 Exhibit 3# 6 Exhibit 4# 7 Exhibit 5# 8 Exhibit 6# 9 Exhibit 7)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 455 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Defendants' Obviousness Defense And Counterclaim of Patent Invalidity Based on Obviousness by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Affidavit of Trevor V. Stockinger# 3 Exhibit 1# 4 Exhibit 2# 5 Exhibit 3# 6 Exhibit 4# 7 Exhibit 5# 8 Exhibit 6# 9 Exhibit 7)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc re 452 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Infineon's Motion for Summary Judgment on Tessera's Claim for Alleged Infringement Damages Based on Tessera's Agreements with Samsung and Hynix to Join (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 417 Motion for Reconsideration and vacates its May 31 order # 406 as to documents states in this order . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/16/06. (ehs, ). Modified on 6/19/2006 (fnt, ). (Entered: 06/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 452 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Infineon's Motion for Summary Judgment on Tessera's Claim for Alleged Infringement Damages Based on Tessera's Agreements with Samsung and Hynix by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Roger D Taylor for Tessera, Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 450 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave To Supplement Preliminary Infringement Contentions To Include Internal Codenames and Model Numbers Disclosed During Discovery by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Attachment A - Supplement to PR 3-1(b) Listing# 3 Attachment B - Turner Declaration# 4 Exhibit 1# 5 Exhibit 2# 6 Exhibit 3# 7 Exhibit 4# 8 Exhibit 5# 9 Exhibit 6# 10 Exhibit 7# 11 Exhibit 8# 12 Exhibit 9# 13 Exhibit 10# 14 Exhibit 11# 15 Exhibit 12# 16 Exhibit 13# 17 Exhibit 14# 18 Exhibit 15# 19 Exhibit 16# 20 Exhibit 17# 21 Exhibit 18)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 417 MOTION for Reconsideration Micron's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's May 31, 2006 Order Concerning Production of Privileged Documents; and Memorandum in Support Thereof Tessera Inc.'s Sur-reply in Opposition to Micron's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's May 31, 2006 Order Concerning Production of Privileged Documents filed by Tessera, Inc. (Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: None
REPLY Memorandum in Support of Micron's re 417 MOTION for Reconsideration Micron's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's May 31, 2006 Order Concerning Production of Privileged Documents; and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Micron's 445 Motion for Leave to File a reply memorandum in support of its motion for partial reconsideration of the Court's May 31, 2006 Order concerning production of privileged documents. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/15/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 429 SEALED PATENT MOTION TESSERA'S MOTION TO COMPEL INFINEON TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS WITHDRAWN OR WITHHELD UNDER AN UNSUPPORTED CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE: Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2006 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love.ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 444 Dfts Motion for Summary Judgment. Hearing set for 7/20/06 at 9:00 a.m. during the Pre-trial conference. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/15/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's May 31, 2006 Order Concerning Production of Privileged Documents [Unopposed] by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Reply Memo# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 444 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion For Summary Judgment On Tessera's Claims for Pre-Filing Damages Under Section 35 U.S.C. Section 287(A) by Micron Technology Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit Exhibit G# 8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Newton, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR, ATTORNEY MUST REFILE AS A SEALED MOTION***. SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment On Tessera's Claims For Pre-Filing Damages Under Section 35 U.S.C. Section 287(A). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit Exhibit G# 8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Newton, Michael) Modified on 6/14/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 06/13/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 391 Emergency MOTION to Compel Based on NEC's Intentional Destruction of Prior Art and to Enforce Subpoenas Against NEC and Paul Helster filed by NEC USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Gabianelli Declaration# 2 Affidavit WInk Declaration# 3 Affidavit Niespolo Declaration# 4 Affidavit Kinney Declaration)(Maze, Gary) (Entered: 06/13/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting NEC's 432 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Responses due by 6/13/2006. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/12/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/13/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 440 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 436 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 101# 2 Exhibit 102# 3 Exhibit 103# 4 Exhibit 104# 5 Exhibit 105# 6 Exhibit 106# 7 Exhibit 107# 8 Exhibit 108# 9 Exhibit 109# 10 Exhibit 110# 11 Exhibit 111# 12 Exhibit 112# 13 Exhibit 113# 14 Exhibit 114# 15 Exhibit 115# 16 Exhibit 116# 17 Exhibit 117# 18 Exhibit 118# 19 Exhibit 119# 20 Exhibit 120# 21 Exhibit 121# 22 Exhibit 122# 23 Exhibit 123# 24 Exhibit 124# 25 Exhibit 125# 26 Exhibit 126# 27 Exhibit 127# 28 Exhibit 128# 29 Exhibit 129# 30 Exhibit 130# 31 Exhibit 131# 32 Exhibit 132# 33 Exhibit 133# 34 Exhibit 134# 35 Exhibit 135# 36 Exhibit 136# 37 Exhibit 137# 38 Exhibit 138# 39 Exhibit 139# 40 Exhibit 140# 41 Exhibit 141# 42 Exhibit 142# 43 Exhibit 143# 44 Exhibit 144# 45 Exhibit 145# 46 Exhibit 146# 47 Exhibit 147# 48 Exhibit 148# 49 Exhibit 149# 50 Exhibit 150# 51 Exhibit 151# 52 Exhibit 152# 53 Exhibit 153# 54 Exhibit 154# 55 Exhibit 155# 56 Exhibit 156# 57 Exhibit 157# 58 Exhibit 158# 59 Exhibit 159# 60 Exhibit 160# 61 Exhibit 161# 62 Exhibit 162# 63 Exhibit 163# 64 Exhibit 164# 65 Exhibit 165# 66 Exhibit 166# 67 Exhibit 167# 68 Exhibit 168# 69 Exhibit 169# 70 Exhibit 170# 71 Exhibit 171# 72 Exhibit 172# 73 Exhibit 173# 74 Exhibit 174# 75 Exhibit 175# 76 Exhibit 180# 77 Exhibit 176# 78 Exhibit 177# 79 Exhibit 178# 80 Exhibit 179# 81 Exhibit 181# 82 Exhibit 182# 83 Exhibit 183# 84 Exhibit 184# 85 Exhibit 185# 86 Exhibit 186# 87 Exhibit 187# 88 Exhibit 188# 89 Exhibit 189# 90 Exhibit 190)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/13/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 439 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 436 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Report of Expert# 2 Exhibit A - 1# 3 Exhibit A - 2# 4 Exhibit A 3-6# 5 Exhibit A - 7-8# 6 Exhibit A - 9-14# 7 Exhibit A - 15-20# 8 Exhibit A - 21-25)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 438 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 436 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 51# 2 Exhibit 52# 3 Exhibit 53# 4 Exhibit 54# 5 Exhibit 55# 6 Exhibit 56# 7 Exhibit 57# 8 Exhibit 58# 9 Exhibit 59# 10 Exhibit 60# 11 Exhibit 61# 12 Exhibit 62# 13 Exhibit 63# 14 Exhibit 64# 15 Exhibit 65# 16 Exhibit 66# 17 Exhibit 67# 18 Exhibit 68# 19 Exhibit 69# 20 Exhibit 70# 21 Exhibit 71# 22 Exhibit 72# 23 Exhibit 73# 24 Exhibit 74# 25 Exhibit 75# 26 Exhibit 76# 27 Exhibit 77# 28 Exhibit 78# 29 Exhibit 79# 30 Exhibit 80# 31 Exhibit 81# 32 Exhibit 82# 33 Exhibit 83# 34 Exhibit 84# 35 Exhibit 85# 36 Exhibit 86# 37 Exhibit 87# 38 Exhibit 88# 39 Exhibit 89# 40 Exhibit 90# 41 Exhibit 91# 42 Exhibit 92# 43 Exhibit 93# 44 Exhibit 94# 45 Exhibit 95# 46 Exhibit 96# 47 Exhibit 97# 48 Exhibit 98# 49 Exhibit 99# 50 Exhibit 100)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 437 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 436 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Exhibit 27# 28 Exhibit 28# 29 Exhibit 29# 30 Exhibit 30# 31 Exhibit 31# 32 Exhibit 32# 33 Exhibit 33# 34 Exhibit 34# 35 Exhibit 35# 36 Exhibit 36# 37 Exhibit 37# 38 Exhibit 38# 39 Exhibit 39# 40 Exhibit 40# 41 Exhibit 41# 42 Exhibit 42# 43 Exhibit 43# 44 Exhibit 44# 45 Exhibit 45# 46 Exhibit 46# 47 Exhibit 47# 48 Exhibit 48# 49 Exhibit 49# 50 Exhibit 50)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 436 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 402 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT INFINEON'S CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S REMAINING ANTITRUST CLAIM (COUNTS III AND IV) AND DEFENDANTS INFINEON'S AND MICRON'S CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA&#, 352 SEALED PATENT MOTION Micron Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Tessera, Inc.'s Remaining Antitrust Theory filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Text of Proposed Order # 3 Appendix Statement of Genuine Issues# 4 Affidavit of Craig Mitchell# 5 Affidavit of Charles Elder)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 435 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 417 MOTION for Reconsideration Micron's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's May 31, 2006 Order Concerning Production of Privileged Documents; and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Affidavit Elder Declaration# 3 Exhibit Elder Decl. Exh. A)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 434 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 371 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defenants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action for Tortious Interference with Contractual Relations and/or Prospective Business Relations Due to Plaintiff's Failure to Bring the Claim Opposition filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elder Declaration# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Affidavit Mitchell Declaration# 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
Tessera Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaim of Micron Technology, Inc. and Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. and Jury Demand by Tessera, Inc.(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 6/10/2006, Entered: None
Third Party MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by NEC USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maze, Gary) (Entered: 06/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 431 Filed: 6/10/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 430 Sealed Patent Document,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11 (Exhibit number not used)# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Affidavit Charles Almer# 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/10/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 430 Filed: 6/10/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT INFINEON'S RESPONSE TO TESSERA'S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL INFINEON TO IMMEDIATELY COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S MARCH 23, 2006 ORDER AND OTHER RELIEF. (Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/10/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 429 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION TESSERA'S MOTION TO COMPEL INFINEON TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS WITHDRAWN OR WITHHELD UNDER AN UNSUPPORTED CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Appendix Appendix A# 3 Appendix Appendix B# 4 Elder Declaration# 5 Exhibit Exhibit A to Elder Declaration# 6 Exhibit Exhibit B to Elder Declaration# 7 Exhibit Exhibit C to Elder Declaration# 8 Exhibit Exhibit D to Elder Declaration# 9 Exhibit Exhibit E to Elder Declaration# 10 Exhibit Exhibit F to Elder Declaration# 11 Exhibit Exhibit G to Elder Declaration# 12 Exhibit Exhibit H to Elder Declaration# 13 Rutherfurd Declaration# 14 Exhibit Exhibit A to Rutherfurd Declaration# 15 Exhibit Exhibit B to Rutherfurd Declaration# 16 Exhibit Exhibit C to Rutherfurd Declaration# 17 Osterrieth Declaration# 18 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Osterrieth Declaration)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 419 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Responses due by 6/12/2006. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/9/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Protective Order JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF THE ATTACHED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Staktek Holdings, Inc., Staktek Group L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Denko, J) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Scott Denko on behalf of Staktek Holdings, Inc., Staktek Group L.P. (Denko, J) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 425 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 388 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel the Production of Document Regarding Improperly Altered Evidence and for Other Related Relief filed by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - part 1# 2 Exhibit A - part 2# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding Certain Flex Circuit and Module Process Change Documents, dates 2/25/05, and/or 4/13/05, and a Celestica PDIMM Failure Analysis Report, Dated 6/3/05, Both Authored by Staktek. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/8/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order (Unopposed) by NEC USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order)(Maze, Gary) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/8/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/8/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 414 Agreed Motion to amend the 7/29/05 Protective Order. Protective order shall be amended as follows. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/8/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None
***REPLACES #418.***MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 417 MOTION for Reconsideration Micron's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's May 31, 2006 Order Concerning Production of Privileged Documents; and Memorandum in Support Thereof UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A ONE DAY EXTENSION OF THE DEADLINE TO FILE ITS RESPONSE by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) Modified on 6/8/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 06/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE.***.MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 417 MOTION for Reconsideration Micron's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's May 31, 2006 Order Concerning Production of Privileged Documents; and Memorandum in Support Thereof PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSED MOTION FOR A ONE DAY EXTENSION OF THE DEADLINE TO FILE ITS RESPONSE by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) Modified on 6/8/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 06/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Reconsideration Micron's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's May 31, 2006 Order Concerning Production of Privileged Documents; and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David A. Ashmore in Support of Micron's Motion# 2 Affidavit Declaration of Kevin Ryan in Support of Micron's Motion# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Protective Order JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF THE ATTACHED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER [AMKOR] by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE, ATTY IS GOING TO REFILE WITH CORRECT EVENT.***STIPULATION for a Protective Order Regarding Certain Flex Circuit and Module Process Change Documents, Dated February 25, 2005 and/or April 13, 2005, and a Celestica PDIMM Failure Analysis Report, Dated June 3, 2005, both Authored by Staktek by Staktek Group L.P.. (Denko, J) Modified on 6/8/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 06/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Protective Order JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF THE ATTACHED AGREED ORDER AMENDING THE JULY 29, 2005 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 410 Motion to Stay. Micron to file its motion for reconsideration no later than 6/7/06, Tessers to respond to Micron's motion no later than 6/9/06 . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/6/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Protective Order [ASAT] by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Continue INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG'S, INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES NORTH AMERICA CORP.'S AND QIMONDA AG'S MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Decl. of John M. Desmarais# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None
Emergency MOTION to Stay re 406 Order on Sealed Patent Motion Staying Court's May 31, 2006 Order Concerning Production of Privileged Documents by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 6/5/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 6/3/2006, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Protective Order [Advantest Corporation] by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 06/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Tessera, Inc re 398 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings of Submission of Second Amended Docket Control Order (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
***VACATED PER ORDER # 453 ***ORDER granting 309 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel. Court orders Dfts to produce the documents designated for production herein within five (5) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/31/06. (ch, ) Modified on 6/16/2006 (ehs, ). (Entered: 05/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES NORTH AMERICA CORP., AND QIMONDA AG TO TESSERA'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp.(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 404 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 402 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT INFINEON'S CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S REMAINING ANTITRUST CLAIM (COUNTS III AND IV) AND DEFENDANTS INFINEON'S AND MICRON'S CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA&#. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31# 2 Exhibit 32# 3 Exhibit 33# 4 Exhibit 34# 5 Exhibit 35# 6 Exhibit 36# 7 Exhibit 37# 8 Exhibit 38# 9 Exhibit 39 - Part 1# 10 Exhibit 39 - Part 2# 11 Exhibit 39 - Part 3# 12 Exhibit 39 - Part 4# 13 Exhibit 39 - Part 5# 14 Exhibit 40# 15 Exhibit 41# 16 Exhibit 42# 17 Exhibit 43# 18 Exhibit 44# 19 Exhibit 45# 20 Exhibit 46# 21 Exhibit 47# 22 Exhibit 48# 23 Exhibit 49# 24 Exhibit 50# 25 Exhibit 51# 26 Exhibit 52# 27 Exhibit 53# 28 Exhibit 54)(Robertson, John) (Entered: 05/26/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 648 MOTION for Protective Order Modification Micron's Opposition to Tessera's Motion for Modification of Protective Order and Request for Extension of Time to Comply with Obligation to Return and Destroy Documents filed by Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc(a Delaware corporation), Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc(an Idaho corporation), Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter from Stacy Baim to Steven Rizzi - 8/30/06# 2 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order in 2:05-cv-094 (JDL)# 3 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order in 2:05-cv-319 (JDL)# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 653 Response in Opposition to Motion,.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 653 Response in Opposition to Motion,.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 653 Response in Opposition to Motion,.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 653 Response in Opposition to Motion,.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 653 Response in Opposition to Motion,.. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 648 MOTION for Protective Order Modification filed by Hynix Semiconductor, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Non-Party Hynix Semiconductor's Opposition to Tessera's Motion to Modify Protective Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 648 MOTION for Protective Order Modification filed by Hitachi Cable America, Inc., Hitachi Cable Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Richard) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 649 Agreed Motion of Dismissal with Prejudice and Final Judgment.. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 8/31/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 648 MOTION for Protective Order Modification INFINEON'S RESPONSE TO TESSERA'S MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF PROTECTIVE ORDER, AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH OBLIGATION TO RETURN OR DESTROY DOCUMENTS filed by Qimonda AG, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C# 2 Exhibit D# 3 Exhibit E# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Dismiss re Infineon by Tessera, Inc. Responses due by 9/15/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order Modification by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Text of Proposed Order (Interim)# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Shimamoto, Peter) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT granting 646 Motion to Dismiss deft Micron Technology, Inc. and Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 8/11/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Joint motion to dismiss by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles William Pugh for Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc.APPROVED (poa, ) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 403 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 402 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT INFINEON'S CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S REMAINING ANTITRUST CLAIM (COUNTS III AND IV) AND DEFENDANTS INFINEON'S AND MICRON'S CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 402 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT INFINEON'S CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S REMAINING ANTITRUST CLAIM (COUNTS III AND IV) AND DEFENDANTS INFINEON'S AND MICRON'S CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE CLAIM (COUNT V) by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Statement of Material Facts in Support of Summary Judgment Motion# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Robertson, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 05/26/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 395 Motion for Leave to File a corrected motion for summary judgment and corrected statement of material facts. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/26/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/26/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum In Support Thereto by Advantest America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Yuri Momrita# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Armstrong, Mark) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 399 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT Tessera's Second Supplemental Brief In Support Of Its Emergency Motion To Compel Infineon To Immediately Comply With The Court's March 23, 2006 Order; For Associated Additional Relief; And Request For Expedited Resolution, Compliance With The Agreements Reached At The May 4 Discovery Hearing, Contempt Finding, And Sanctions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Attachment A - Hsieh Declaration# 3 Exhibit 1# 4 Exhibit 2# 5 Exhibit 3# 6 Exhibit 4# 7 Exhibit 5# 8 Exhibit 6# 9 Exhibit 7# 10 Exhibit 8# 11 Exhibit 9# 12 Exhibit 10# 13 Exhibit 11# 14 Exhibit 12# 15 Attachment B - Turner Declaration)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER amending docket control order, deadlines set forth herein. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/25/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting MOTION Hearing for 7/7/06 at 9:30 am. Hearing on Motion 352 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Tessera, Inc.'s Remaining Antitrust Theory 371 Defenants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action for Tortious Interference with Contractual Relations and/or Prospective Business Relations Due to Plaintiff's Failure to Bring the Claim, 382 Defendant INFINEON'S Motion for summary judgment onTESSERA'S remaining Antitrust claim (COUNTS III AND IV) and defendant's INFINEON'S and MICRON'S motion for summary judgment on TESSERA'S TORTIOUS INTER:, Denying motion 374 and granting motion 390 . Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2006 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love.. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/25/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE*** ORDER granting 394 Motion to shorten response time for Micron's emergency motion to enforce subpoenas. Response due 5/30/06 by 4:00 pm . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/25/06. (ehs, ) Modified on 5/25/2006 (ehs, ). (Entered: 05/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CORRECTED STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robertson, John) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None
MOTION To Shorten Response Time For Micron's Emergency Motion to Enforce Subpoenas Against NEC and Paul Helster and to Compel Based on NEC's Intentional Destruction of Prior Art re 391 Emergency MOTION to Compel Based on NEC's Intentional Destruction of Prior Art and to Enforce Subpoenas Against NEC and Paul Helster by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newton, Michael) Additional attachment(s) (Cert of COnference) added on 5/25/2006 (sm, ). Modified on 5/25/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 05/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 391 Emergency MOTION to Compel Based on NEC's Intentional Destruction of Prior Art and to Enforce Subpoenas Against NEC and Paul Helster, 392 Additional Attachments to Main Document,,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 21# 2 Exhibit 22# 3 Exhibit 23# 4 Exhibit 24# 5 Exhibit 25# 6 Exhibit 26# 7 Exhibit 27# 8 Exhibit 28# 9 Exhibit 29# 10 Exhibit 30# 11 Exhibit 31# 12 Exhibit 32# 13 Exhibit 33# 14 Exhibit 34# 15 Exhibit 35# 16 Exhibit 36# 17 Exhibit 37# 18 Exhibit 38# 19 Exhibit 39# 20 Exhibit 40)(Newton, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 391 Emergency MOTION to Compel Based on NEC's Intentional Destruction of Prior Art and to Enforce Subpoenas Against NEC and Paul Helster.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kajeer Yar# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 11# 13 Exhibit 12# 14 Exhibit 13# 15 Exhibit 14# 16 Exhibit 15# 17 Exhibit 16# 18 Exhibit 17# 19 Exhibit 18# 20 Exhibit 19)(Newton, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None
Emergency MOTION to Compel Based on NEC's Intentional Destruction of Prior Art and to Enforce Subpoenas Against NEC and Paul Helster by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newton, Michael) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 05/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Pending Summary Judgment Motions and To Set Schedule Regarding These Motions (Unopposed) by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 05/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William C Price for Micron Technology Inc and Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 388 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel the Production of Document Regarding Improperly Altered Evidence and for Other Related Relief by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jonathan Steinberg in Support of Tessera's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Regarding Improperly Altered Evidence and for Other Related Relief# 2 Exhibit No. 1 to Steinberg Declaration# 3 Exhibit No. 2 to Steinberg Decl.# 4 Exhibit No. 3 to Steinberg Decl.# 5 Exhibit No. 4 to Steinberg Decl.# 6 Exhibit No. 5 to Steinberg Decl.# 7 Exhibit No. 6 to Steinberg Decl.# 8 Exhibit No. 7 to Steinberg Decl.# 9 Exhibit No. 8 to Steinberg Decl.# 10 Exhibit No. 9 to Steinberg Decl.# 11 Exhibit No. 10# 12 Exhibit No. 11 to Steinberg Decl.# 13 Exhibit No. 12 to Steinberg Decl.# 14 Exhibit No. 13 to Steinberg Decl.# 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 387 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT (ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT) EXHIBIT 39 TO {#382} DEFENDANT INFINEON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S REMAINING ANTITRUST CLAIM (COUNTS III AND IV) AND DEFENDANTS INFINEON'S AND MICRON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARYJUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE CLAIM (COUNT V). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 39-Part 1# 2 Exhibit 39 - Part 2# 3 Exhibit 39 - Part 3# 4 Exhibit 39 - Part 4# 5 Exhibit 39 - Part 5)(Robertson, John) Modified on 5/22/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 05/19/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 374 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO DEFENDANTS' SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS filed by Tessera, Inc. (Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Tessera, Inc by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc.(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 384 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 382 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT INFINEON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S REMAINING ANTITRUST CLAIM (COUNTS III AND IV) AND DEFENDANTS INFINEON'S AND MICRON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S TORTIOUS INTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31# 2 Exhibit 32# 3 Exhibit 33# 4 Exhibit 34# 5 Exhibit 35# 6 Exhibit 36# 7 Exhibit 37# 8 Exhibit 38# 9 Exhibit 39# 10 Exhibit 40# 11 Exhibit 41# 12 Exhibit 42# 13 Exhibit 43# 14 Exhibit 44# 15 Exhibit 45# 16 Exhibit 46# 17 Exhibit 47# 18 Exhibit 48# 19 Exhibit 49# 20 Exhibit 50# 21 Exhibit 51# 22 Exhibit 52# 23 Exhibit 53# 24 Exhibit 54)(Robertson, John) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 383 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 382 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT INFINEON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S REMAINING ANTITRUST CLAIM (COUNTS III AND IV) AND DEFENDANTS INFINEON'S AND MICRON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S TORTIOUS INTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22-Part 1# 23 Exhibit 22-Part 2# 24 Exhibit 23# 25 Exhibit 24# 26 Exhibit 25# 27 Exhibit 26# 28 Exhibit 27# 29 Exhibit 28# 30 Exhibit 29# 31 Exhibit 30)(Robertson, John) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 382 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT INFINEON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S REMAINING ANTITRUST CLAIM (COUNTS III AND IV) AND DEFENDANTS INFINEON'S AND MICRON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON TESSERA'S TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE CLAIM (COUNT V) by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts# 2 Affidavit Syri Declaration# 3 Affidavit Buchner Declaration# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Robertson, John) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 374 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO DEFENDANTS' SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS AND COUNTER-PROPOSAL filed by Qimonda AG, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robertson, John) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
HOTLINE ORDER - Re: "Hotline" Hearing Pursuant to Local Rule CV 26(g) Held on 5/16/06 as said herein. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/17/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon Bentley Hyland on behalf of Micron Technology Inc (Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed Personal Server by Tessera, Inc. Qimonda AG served on 5/10/2006, answer due 5/30/2006. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying as moot 340 Motion for Protective Order, denying as moot 341 Motion to Compel, granting 349 Sealed Patent Motion for leave to file second amended complaint. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/16/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 376 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 309 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Infineon and Micron to Produce ADT Documents Withheld Under An Alleged Joint Defense or Common Interest "Privilege" Micron's Response to Tessera's Submission Regarding ADT Documents Logged by Defendants for In-Camera Review filed by Micron Technology Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER entered that Tessera may have until 5/24/06 to respond to Dfts motion for summary judgment regarding Tessera's anti-trust claims 352 , and Dft's must respond to Tessera's emergency motion for extension of time to file its responses to Dft's summay judgment motions 374 by 5/18/06 as said herein. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/15/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO DEFENDANTS' SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Tessera, Inc re 309 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Infineon and Micron to Produce ADT Documents Withheld Under An Alleged Joint Defense or Common Interest "Privilege" TESSERA'S SUBMISSION REGARDING ADT DOCUMENTS LODGED BY DEFENDANTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW (Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 05/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Melissa R McCormick for Tessera, Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 371 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION Defenants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action for Tortious Interference with Contractual Relations and/or Prospective Business Relations Due to Plaintiff's Failure to Bring the Claim Within the Statute of Limitations by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts# 2 Appendix A# 3 Appendix B# 4 Hutnyan Declaration# 5 Exhibit A to Hutnyan Declaration# 6 Exhibit B to Hutnyan Declaration# 7 Exhibit C to Hutnyan Declaration# 8 Exhibit D to Hutnyan Declaration# 9 Exhibit E to Hutnyan Declaration# 10 Exhibit F to Hutnyan Declaration# 11 Exhibit G to Hutnyan Declaration# 12 Exhibit H to Hutnyan Declaration# 13 Exhibit I to Hutnyan Declaration# 14 Exhibit J to Hutnyan Declaration# 15 Exhibit K to Hutnyan Declaration# 16 Errata L to Hutnyan Declaration# 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/10/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
AGREED FORM OF ORDER entered as to motions number 171 and 178 regarding the discovery issues addressed during the March 21, 2006 motion hearing. Ruling set forth herein. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/10/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1# 2 Exhibit A-2# 3 Exhibit B-1# 4 Exhibit B-2# 5 Exhibit B-3# 6 Exhibit C-1# 7 Exhibit C-2# 8 Exhibit C-3# 9 Exhibit D-1# 10 Exhibit D-2# 11 Exhibit D-3# 12 Exhibit E-1# 13 Exhibit E-2# 14 Exhibit E-3)(Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 05/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding certain licenses between Infineon Technologies AG and Rambus Inc.. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/10/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: None
STIPULATION STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN LICENSES BETWEEN INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG AND RAMBUS INC. by Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 05/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: None
Joint MOTION Entry of Agreed Form of Order regarding March 21, 2006 Motion Hearing by Tessera, Inc, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re Discovery Issues addressed at 3/21/06 Hearing)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric James Bakewell for Micron Technology Inc and Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nicholas Stanley Shantar for Micron Technology Inc and Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Love : Motion Hearing held on 5/4/2006 re 309 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Infineon and Micron to Produce ADT Documents Withheld Under An Alleged Joint Defense or Common Interest "Privilege" filed by Tessera, Inc, 340 MOTION for Protective Order INFINEON'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(c) TO PROHIBIT TESSERA'S NOTICED DEPOSITIONS OF DR. ZIEBART, AND MESSRS. FISCHL AND LOH filed by Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp,, 341 MOTION to Compel Infineon to Produce Certain Employees for Deposition and Accompanying Brief filed by Tessera, Inc, 349 SEALED PATENT MOTION TESSERA, INC.S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT JOINING QIMONDA AG AS A DEFENDANT filed by Tessera, Inc,, 323 Emergency MOTION to Compel Infineon to Immediately Comply with the Court's March 23, 2006 Order; To Disclose The Physical Properties of The Accused Products; For Associated Additional Relief; And Request For Expedited Resolution filed by Tessera, Inc,. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (mjm, ) (Entered: 05/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Adam S Hoffman for Tessera, Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/04/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of Tessera, Inc (Race, Deborah) (Entered: 05/04/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 349 SEALED PATENT MOTION TESSERA, INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT JOINING QIMONDA AG AS A DEFENDANT: Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2006 01:30 PM (TYLER) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/3/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that parties pay expenses incurred through 3/31/06 by the technical advisor, David Weaver as set forth herein. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/3/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 5/2/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 357 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT INFINEON'S SURREPLY TO TESSERA'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL INFINEON TO IMMEDIATELY COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S MARCH 23, 2006 ORDER; TO DISCLOSE THE PHYSICAL PROPERTIES OF THE ACCUSED PRODUCTS; FOR ASSOCIATED ADDITIONAL RELIEF. (Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 356 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 309 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Infineon and Micron to Produce ADT Documents Withheld Under An Alleged Joint Defense or Common Interest "Privilege" filed by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hawxhurst# 2 Exhibit A to Hawxhurst Declaration# 3 Exhibit B to Hawxhurst Declaration# 4 Declaration of Ashmore# 5 Exhibit A to Ashmore Declaration# 6 Exhibit B to Ashmore Declaration# 7 Declaration of Masters)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 355 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 309 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Infineon and Micron to Produce ADT Documents Withheld Under An Alleged Joint Defense or Common Interest "Privilege" filed by Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Julian Brew# 2 Affidavit of Eric L. Shen# 3 Affidavit of Sarretta McDonough# 4 Affidavit of Robert M. Masters# 5 Exhibit A# 6 Exhibit B# 7 Exhibit C# 8 Exhibit D# 9 Exhibit E# 10 Exhibit F# 11 Exhibit G# 12 Exhibit H# 13 Exhibit I# 14 Exhibit J# 15 Exhibit K# 16 Exhibit L# 17 Exhibit M# 18 Exhibit N# 19 Exhibit O# 20 Exhibit P# 21 Exhibit Q# 22 Exhibit R# 23 Exhibit S# 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 354 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT Tessera's Opposition to Infineon's Motion for a Protective Order to Prohibit Tessera's Noticed Depositions of Dr. Ziebart and Messrs. Fischl & Loh (Docket # 340). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1# 2 Exhibit No. 2# 3 Exhibit No 3# 4 Exhibit No. 4# 5 Exhibit No. 5# 6 Exhibit No. 6# 7 Exhibit No. 7# 8 Exhibit No. 8# 9 Exhibit No. 9# 10 Exhibit No. 10# 11 Exhibit No. 11# 12 Exhibit No. 12# 13 Exhibit No. 13# 14 Exhibit No. 14# 15 Exhibit No. 15# 16 Exhibit No. 16# 17 Exhibit No. 17# 18 Exhibit No. 18# 19 Exhibit No. 19# 20 Exhibit No. 20# 21 Exhibit No. 21# 22 Affidavit Declaration of Nathan Lowenstein In Support of Tessera's Opposition to Infineon's Motion for a Protective Order)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chong S Park on behalf of Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp (Park, Chong) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 352 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION Micron Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Tessera, Inc.'s Remaining Antitrust Theory by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A-1# 2 Appendix A-2# 3 Declaration of Gerald Hawxhurst# 4 Exhibit A to Hawxhurst Declaration# 5 Exhibit B to Hawxhurst Declaration# 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 341 MOTION to Compel Infineon to Produce Certain Employees for Deposition and Accompanying Brief filed by Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Robert Robertson on behalf of Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp (Robertson, John) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 349 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION TESSERA, INC.?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT JOINING QIMONDA AG AS A DEFENDANT by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order [Agreed and Stipulated] by Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Tessera, Inc, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin Yoshiwo Teruya for Micron Technology Inc and Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER entered that 237 Motion had been resolved by the 3/21/06 discovery hearing, but one issue required the courts attention. The remaining issued raised in the motion have been resolved by agreement of the parties, and the court entered a stipulated order 296 reflecting that agreement. Accordingly Tessera's motion 237 is now completely resolved. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/26/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/26/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 340 MOTION for Protective Order INFINEON'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(c) TO PROHIBIT TESSERA'S NOTICED DEPOSITIONS OF DR. ZIEBART, AND MESSRS. FISCHL AND LOH, 341 MOTION to Compel Infineon to Produce Certain Employees for Deposition and Accompanying Brief: Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2006 1:30 PM in (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Court orders Tessera and Infineon to file responses no later than 5/1/06. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/26/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/26/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 323 Emergency MOTION to Compel Infineon to Immediately Comply with the Court's March 23, 2006 Order; To Disclose The Physical Properties of The Accused Products; For Associated Additional Relief; And Request For Expedited Resolution, 309 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Infineon and Micron to Produce ADT Documents Withheld Under An Alleged Joint Defense or Common Interest "Privilege": Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2006 1:30 PM in (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love.. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/26/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/26/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory F Corbett for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Infineon Technologies AG and Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP. APPROVED (poa, ) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Benjamin R Ostapuk for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Infineon Technologies AG and Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP.APPROVED (poa, ) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel Infineon to Produce Certain Employees for Deposition and Accompanying Brief by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1# 2 Exhibit No. 2# 3 Exhibit No. 3# 4 Exhibit No. 4# 5 Exhibit No. 5# 6 Exhibit No. 6# 7 Exhibit No. 7# 8 Exhibit No. 8# 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order INFINEON'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(c) TO PROHIBIT TESSERA'S NOTICED DEPOSITIONS OF DR. ZIEBART, AND MESSRS. FISCHL AND LOH by Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Edward Donovan# 2 Affidavit of Peter Fischl# 3 Affidavit of Kin Wah Loh# 4 Affidavit of Wolfgang Ziebart# 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 323 Emergency MOTION to Compel Infineon to Immediately Comply with the Court's March 23, 2006 Order; To Disclose The Physical Properties of The Accused Products; For Associated Additional Relief; And Request For Expedited Resolution filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 04/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 297 Motion for Protective Order by non-party Hynix. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/24/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 337 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 336 Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12)(Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 04/24/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 323 Emergency MOTION to Compel Infineon to Immediately Comply with the Court's March 23, 2006 Order; To Disclose The Physical Properties of The Accused Products; For Associated Additional Relief; And Request For Expedited Resolution filed by Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Pease, Thomas) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 332 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to pltf's motion to compel. Responses due by 5/1/2006. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/21/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
REPLY in support re 297 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Hynix Semiconductor, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Keith Slenkovich)(ehs, ) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 331 Motion for Leave to extend time for non-party Hynix Semiconductor, Inc. to file reply to pltf's response to Hynix's motion for protective order. Deadline set for 4/19/06 to reply to doc #310. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/21/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 309 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Infineon and Micron to Produce ADT Documents Withheld Under An Alleged Joint Defense or Common Interest "Privilege" by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 04/20/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion for Leave and Extension of Time for Non-Party Hynix Semiconductor, Inc. to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Hynix's Motion for Protective Order by Hynix Semiconductor, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment - Hynix's Reply in Support of its Motion for Protective Order# 2 Declaration of Slenkovich in Support of Mtn for Protective Order# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that deft's Infineon Tech AG, Infineon Tech Richmond, Infineon Tech N. Am to respond to Tessera's motion #323 by 4/21/06 . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/18/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: None
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 323 Emergency MOTION to Compel Infineon to Immediately Comply with the Court's March 23, 2006 Order; To Disclose The Physical Properties of The Accused Products; For Associated Additional Relief; And Request For Expedited Resolution.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Z)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 04/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David K Djavaherian for Tessera, Inc. (poa, ) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Edward C Donovan for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Infineon Technologies AG and Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP.APPROVED(poa, ) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 179 Motion for Protective Order by Rambus Inc . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/17/06. (poa, ) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 191 Sealed Motion to Compel Documents . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/13/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 324 Filed: 4/15/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 323 Emergency MOTION to Compel Infineon to Immediately Comply with the Court's March 23, 2006 Order; To Disclose The Physical Properties of The Accused Products; For Associated Additional Relief; And Request For Expedited Resolution. (Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 04/15/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 179 Third Party MOTION for Protective Order filed by Rambus Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Tarnay, Thomas) (Entered: 04/14/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
***FILED IN WRONG CASE PLEASE IGNORE*** Supplemental PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/13/06. (ehs, ) Modified on 5/5/2006 (ehs, ). (Entered: 04/13/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 319 Motion for Protective Order, granting 319 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark S Armstrong, James M Smith terminated . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/13/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/13/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order to withdraw protective order, MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Advantest America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Mark) (Entered: 04/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER amending stipulated Protective Order regarding protected information of Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. and Motorola Inc. - amended to permit disclosure of Protected Materials as set forth herein. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/12/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER withdrawing 281 Motion to Compel, granting 286 Motion to Withdraw motion to compel . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/11/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 292 Motion for entry of stipulated order. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/11/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - following terms shall apply to specified documents of third party Advantest America, Inc. as set forth herein. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/11/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Micron Tech and Micron Semiconductor's motion for leave to file their supplementary brief in opposition to non-party Rambus Inc's motion for protective order. Brief deadline set for 4/14/06. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/11/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 200 Protective Order Regarding Protected Information of Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. and Motorola Inc. by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 311 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 310 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 297 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Affidavit Stockinger Declaration# 3 Exhibit Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit Exhibit G# 10 Exhibit Exhibit H# 11 Exhibit Exhibit I# 12 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 309 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Infineon and Micron to Produce ADT Documents Withheld Under An Alleged Joint Defense or Common Interest "Privilege" by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Elder Declaration and Exhibits# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 04/06/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 293 MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support Thereto filed by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 04/06/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Protective Order [Stipulated] by Tessera, Inc, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Advantest America, Inc., Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 04/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alexis Gorton for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Infineon Technologies AG and Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Terry L Tang for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Infineon Technologies AG and Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David B Perry-Campf for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Infineon Technologies AG and Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney F Christopher Mizzo for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Infineon Technologies AG and Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 302 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to file its Supplementary Brief in Opposition to Rambus' Motion for Protective Order by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Brief in Opp# 2 Declaration of Diane Hutnyan# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 04/04/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp Consenting to Location of Trial (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alexander F Wiles for Tessera, Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/30/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kenneth Weatherwax for Tessera, Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/30/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 3/21/06 @ 1:37 p.m. in Tyler, Tx before Honorable US Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter: Jan Mason. (156 pages) (ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2009: # 1 Pages 51 - 100, # 2 Pages 101 - 156) (ch, ). (Entered: 03/30/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order by Hynix Semiconductor, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Keith Slenkovich# 2 Ex A to Decl# 3 Ex B to Decl# 4 Ex C to Decl# 5 Ex D to Decl# 6 Ex E to Decl# 7 Ex F to Decl# 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 03/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER entered to resolve certain discovery disputes between Tessera and Infineon as set forth herein. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 3/23/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 3/22/06. (poa, ) (Entered: 03/22/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Love : Motion Hearing held on 3/21/2006 re 191 SEALED MOTION filed by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp,; 178 SEALED MOTION filed by Tessera, Inc,; 179 Third Party MOTION for Protective Order filed by Rambus Inc.; 171 SEALED MOTION; 237 SEALED MOTION filed by Tessera, Inc,. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (mjm, ) (Entered: 03/22/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support Thereto by Advantest America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit James M. Smith# 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Keith Hardwick# 3 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order)(Armstrong, Mark) (Entered: 03/22/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: None
Amended MOTION entry of stipulated order re 288 Stipulation, 289 Notice (Other) Amended request for the entry of a stipulated order re Document number 237, Tessera's motion to compel the production of key Infineon engineering, financial and business documents by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 03/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on 1/12/06 @ 9:32 a.m. in Tyler, Texas before Honorable Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter: Jan Mason. (101 pages) (ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2009: # 1 Pages 51 - 101) (ch, ). (Entered: 03/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 237 MOTION to Compel Production of Key Infineon Engineering, Financial and Business Documents filed by Tessera, Inc. (Lowenstein, Nathan) Modified on 3/21/2006 (ehs, ). (Entered: 03/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Tessera, Inc (Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
STIPULATION by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Lowenstein, Nathan) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by Micron Technology Inc. (Yar, Kajeer) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw 281 MOTION to Compel Production of Transcripts and Exhibits from FTC Proceeding by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 285 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
SEALED ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: [175 ] SEALED MOTION to seal Motion to compel - Exhibit #2 to Declaration of Trevor V Stockinger in Support of Tessera's Motion to Compel Resposes to Tessera's Interrogatory Nos. 2,5-6,8, 11, 12, 14, 15, 17, 19-23, 28, 29 and 43 (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by Tessera, Inc. (Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Amended Docket Conrol Order Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/30/2006. Jury Selection set for 8/7/2006 9:00 AM in (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Trial set for 8/14/2006 9:00 AM in (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2006 9:00 AM in Ctrm 353 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 3/15/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT Statement Regarding Matters Still At Issue Re March 21, 2006 Discovery Hearing by Tessera, Inc. (Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 03/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: None
WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #316 - MOTION to Compel Production of Transcripts and Exhibits from FTC Proceeding by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Trevor V. Stockinger# 2 Affidavit Declaration of Charles E. Elder# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stockinger, Trevor) Modified on 4/12/2006 (ehs, ). (Entered: 03/15/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 237 SEALED MOTION: Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2006 1:30 PM in (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Should the parties come to an agreement resolving the issues presented in Tessera's motion 237 they shall notify the Court no later that 2 pm on 3/20/06. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 3/15/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/15/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nathan Lowenstein for Tessera, Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/15/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John T Battaglia for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Infineon Technologies AG and Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/15/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER finding as moot 265 Motion for Leave to File, granting in part and denying in part motion 212 . Deadline changes are set forth herein . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 3/6/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Infineon's agreed motion to extend deadline to file response to Tessera's motion to compel production of Key Infineon Engineering, Financial and Business Documents. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 3/6/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 270 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Tessera's Motion to Compel Production of Key Infineon Engineering, Financial and Business documents . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 3/6/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding documents produced pursuant to subpoena to Hynix Semiconductor America Inc. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 3/6/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 268 Motion to Continue. Case reset to 3/21/06 at 1:30 pm . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 3/6/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Agreed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Response to Tessera's Motion to Compel Production of Key Infineon Engineering, Financial and Business Documents by Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 03/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Tessera, Inc, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Continue Hearing by Tessera, Inc, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 265 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Regarding the Previously Filed Motion for Extension of Expert Report and Other Related Pre-Trial Deadlines filed by Tessera, Inc. (Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Regarding the Previously Filed Motion for Extension of Expert Report and Other Related Pre-Trial Deadlines by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Micron's Reply in Support of Their Motion for Extension of Expert Report and Other Related Deadlines# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: None
STIPULATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING A CERTAIN LICENSE AGREEMENT AND RELATED LETTER AGREEMENT BETWEEN STAKTEK GROUP L.P. AND INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES A.G. by Staktek Group L.P.. (Denko, J) (Entered: 03/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacqueline Kelley Shipchandler on behalf of Michael W. Sadler (Shipchandler, Jacqueline) (Entered: 03/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Tessera, Inc of proposed stipulated protective order regarding documents produced pursuant to subpoena to Hynix Semiconductor America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 03/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER withdrawing 217 Sealed Motion, granting 260 Motion to Withdraw Tessera's Motion to Compel Micron to Produce Technical Databases . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 3/1/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Compel Micron to Produce Technical Databases by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 02/28/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that payment to Technical Advisor David Weaver of Vinson & Elkins, Austin, Tx for Service through 1/31/06 be made by Plaintiffs and Defendants by 3/24/06, to the address and Invoice Number as shown herein. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/27/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 249 Tessera's Motion to Seal Exhibit A to the Stockinger Declaration in Support of Tessera's opposition to Michael Sadlers motion for protection order. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/27/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 251 Motion to Intervene . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/27/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 207 Motion for Protective Order, denying 233 Motion for Protective Order . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/24/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 243 Motion to Seal Exhibit K to Elder Declaration in Support of Tesseras Opposition to Jan du Preez's Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/24/06. (ch, ) . (Entered: 02/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Intervene (Unopposed) by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1)(Cousins, Nathanael) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None
Additional Attachments to Main Document: 248 Response in Opposition to Motion.. (Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Exhibit A of Stockinger Declaration in Support of Opposition to Michael Sadler's Motion for Protective Order by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 233 MOTION for Protective Order by Michael W. Sadler filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Roger Knapp for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Infineon Technologies AG and Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP. APPROVED (poa, ) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen Wyse for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Infineon Technologies AG and Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP.APPROVED (poa, ) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory Neugebauer for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Infineon Technologies AG and Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP. APPROVED (poa, ) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 212 MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Extending Certain Discovery and Pre-trial Deadlines filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibits 2-3# 4 Exhibits 4-9)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Exhibit K of Opposition to Jan du Preez's Motion for Protective Order by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 207 Third Party MOTION for Protective Order and for Expedited Consideration filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Support re 233 MOTION for Protective Order, 207 Third Party MOTION for Protective Order and for Expedited Consideration filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Nathanael Cousins in support)(Cousins, Nathanael) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - Court orders Tessera to respond to Michael W Sadler's motion for protective order no later than 12 pm (noon) on 2/23/06. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/22/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order by Michael W. Sadler. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Barry F. McNeil# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McNeil, Barry) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying as moot 175 Motion to Seal, denying as moot 196 Motion to Seal . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/21/06. (poa, ) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 227 Motion to Seal Tessera's motion to compel and the accompanying brief and exhibits. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/21/06. (poa, ) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 224 Motion to Seal . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/21/06. (poa, ) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 2/20/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Micron Technology Inc Notice of Subpoena of Thirdy Party (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 02/20/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 217 SEALED MOTION, 191 SEALED MOTION: Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2006 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Micron has until 2/28/06 to respond, and Tessera reply deadline set for 3/3/06. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/17/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that Tessera respond to non-party Jan du Preez's expedited motion for protective order by 2/24/06. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/17/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter Shimamoto for Tessera, Inc.APPROVED (poa, ) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Tessera's unopposed motion to file Tessera's motion to compel responses to Tessera's interrogatory nos. 2,5-6,8,11,12,14,15,17,19-23,28,29 and 31-43 and accompanying exhibits under seal. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/17/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 219 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages to Tessera's motion to compel resposes to Tessera's interrogatory Nos 2,5-6,8,11,12,14,15,17,19-23,28,29 and 31-43 . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/17/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles E Elder for Tessera, Inc. (poa, ) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Edward Hsieh for Tessera, Inc. (poa, ) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that Planitiff is to respond to this motion 212 no later than 2/23/06, and any party that desires to file further briefing on this motion must first obtain leave from the Court. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/16/05. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 210 Motion to Seal Tessera's Motion to Compel Micron To Produce Technical Databases and related exhibits. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/15/06. (poa, ) (Entered: 02/15/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Extending Certain Discovery and Pre-trial Deadlines by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 02/14/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Motion To Compel Micron To Produce Technical Databases, and exhibits by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 02/14/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 205 Motion to Seal exhibits to its opposition to deft's motion to compel production of documents and information withheld under the settlement privilege. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/13/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/14/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: None
Third Party MOTION for Protective Order and for Expedited Consideration by Jan du Preez. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Donald C. Klawiter)(Selinger, Jerry) Proposed Order added on 2/14/2006 (mpv, ). Modified on 2/14/2006 (mpv, ). (Entered: 02/13/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 179 Third Party MOTION for Protective Order filed by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Gerald E. Hawxhurst# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/13/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Exhibits To Tessera's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Compel Production Of Documents And Information Withheld Under The Settlement Privilege by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 02/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge John D. Love for all further proceedings. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/9/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 192 Motion for Leave to File, finding as moot 194 Motion for Leave to File 177 is stricken. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/7/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding Protected information of Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. and Motorola Inc. as set forth herein. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/6/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Tessera's re 197 Motion to file its opposition to deft's motion to compel responses to deft's interrogatory Nos. 1-3,7,9-12,15,18,20,22,25,27-30 and 31 . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/6/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Tessera, Inc.'s 178 Motion to file its motion to compel responses to Tessera's Interrogatory Nos. 2,5-6,8,11,12,14,15,17,19-23,28,29 and 31-43. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 2/6/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Tessera's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stockinger, Trevor) (Entered: 02/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: None
AMENDED RESPONSE to Motion re 192 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Response to Tessera's Reply Regarding Construction of "Compliant" filed by Tessera, Inc. (Turner, Ellisen) Modified on 2/6/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendants' Surreply Regarding Construction of "Compliant" by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Defendants' Proposed Surreply Regarding Construction of "Compliant"# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 02/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: None
FILED IN ERROR - PLEASE IGNORE - ATTY WILL REFILE A CORRECTED DOCUMENT - RESPONSE to Motion re 192 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Response to Tessera's Reply Regarding Construction of "Compliant" filed by Tessera, Inc. (Turner, Ellisen) Modified on 2/3/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Response to Tessera's Reply Regarding Construction of "Compliant" by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 02/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - Court has received a bill representing services rendered and expenses through 12/31/05 by technical advisor. Payment should be made by 2/25/06 with reference Client/Matter Number USD600 and Invoice Number 25171084. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 1/31/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Tessera, Inc re 172 Order, Joint Notice of Compliance Regarding Submission of Prosecution Histories (Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 01/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE by Tessera, Inc re 168 Order, Tessera's Consent To Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge John D. Love (Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 01/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp re 168 Order, DEFENDANTS' JOINT CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN D. LOVE (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 01/30/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Shont E Miller for Rambus Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/30/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: None
Third Party MOTION for Protective Order by Rambus Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Rajwani, Catherine) (Entered: 01/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: None
BRIEF filed Reply to MICRON AND INFINEON'S RESPONSE TO TESSERA'S SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by Tessera, Inc. (Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 01/26/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Tessera's 171 Motion to file motion to compel responses . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 1/26/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/26/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Tessera's Motion to Compel Responses to Tessera's Interrogatories and Accompanying Exhibits by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None
Supplemental submission regarding Claim Construction filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(ehs, ) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 173 Supplemental Submission Regarding Claim Construction MICRON AND INFINEON'S RESPONSE TO TESSERA'S SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Albritton, Eric) Modified on 1/25/2006 (ehs, ). (Entered: 01/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER the parties to jointly submit to the Court and to the technical advisor the complete prosecution histories of the patents in suit and any related Tessera patents that the parties relied upon in their Markman briefing no later than 1/31/06. To the extent possible, the prosecution histories should be submitted on compact disc (CDR) as searchable, pdf files. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 1/24/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 166 Motion for Leave to File supplemental submission regarding claim construction. Defts are ordered to respond to the supplemental submission by 1/24/06, deft to respond to submission #167 regarding parties' failed attempt to agree on a construction of "terminal" by 1/24/06. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 1/23/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT MICRON AND INFINEON'S SUBMISSION REGARDING CONSTRUCTION OF "TERMINAL" by Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that the parties choosing to proceed before the US Magistrate Judge to make that election within 10 days of the date of this order. If the parties choose not to consent, they need not communicate that decision to the court. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 1/18/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT regarding Parties' Meet and Confer about Construction of "Terminal" by Tessera, Inc. (Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 01/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Submission Regarding Claim Construction by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tessera's Supplemental Submission Regarding Claim Construction# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 01/13/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Love : Markman Hearing held on 1/12/2006. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (mjm, ) (Entered: 01/13/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER finding as moot 123 Motion to Compel, granting 161 Motion to Withdraw #123 motion to compel. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 1/12/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding a Patent License between ASML Masktools, Inc. and Micron Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 1/12/06. (ehs, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 01/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None
STIPULATION [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Protected Information of Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. and Motorola Inc. by Tessera, Inc. (Turner, Ellisen) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2006 (sm, ). (Entered: 01/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw 123 MOTION to Compel Micron To Comply With PR 3-4 And Respond To Interrogatory No. 13 by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 01/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order Agreed Motion for Stipulated Protective Order Regarding A Patent License Between ASML Masktools, Inc. and Micron Technology, Inc. by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 128 Motion to Withdraw . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 1/6/06. (ehs, ) Modified on 1/10/2006 (ehs, ). (Entered: 01/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 155 Motion for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Chart. Deadline set for 1/4/06 . Signed by Judge John D. Love on 1/5/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Tessera, Inc (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL proceedings to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/4/06. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/04/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File P.R. 4-5(d) Claim Construction Chart by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 01/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: None
BRIEF filed Tessera's Reply Claim Construction Brief by Tessera, Inc. (Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 12/29/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by Tessera, Inc Joint Notice of Estimated Time Requested for Markman Hearing (Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 12/29/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 123 MOTION to Compel Micron To Comply With PR 3-4 And Respond To Interrogatory No. 13: Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2006 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (rlf, ) (Entered: 12/29/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None
BRIEF filed DEFENDANTS' JOINT RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R# 19 Exhibit S# 20 Exhibit T# 21 Exhibit U# 22 Exhibit V# 23 Exhibit W# 24 Exhibit X)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/22/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: None
BRIEF filed Opening Claim Construction Brief by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 12/15/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 144 Motion to Seal Opening Claim Construction Brief. Tessera is directed to electronically file its Opening Claim Construction Brief within (1) day from the date of this order 12/16/05 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/15/05. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/15/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 144 MOTION to Seal Opening Claim Construction Brief and Exhibits 12-14 filed by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 12/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 144 MOTION to Seal Opening Claim Construction Brief and Exhibits 12-14 filed by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Tessera's Motion to File Under Seal)(Yar, Kajeer) (Entered: 12/09/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 123 MOTION to Compel Micron To Comply With PR 3-4 And Respond To Interrogatory No. 13 (Sur-Reply in Opposition) filed by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None
FILED IN ERROR - PLEASE IGNORE - BRIEF filed Opening Claim Construction Brief (Lodged with Request to Seal) by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Turner, Ellisen) Modified on 12/9/2005 (sm, ). (Entered: 12/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Opening Claim Construction Brief and Exhibits 12-14 by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 12/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER appointing David Weaver of Vinson & Elkins in Austin, Texas as technical advisor to the court. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/8/05. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 123 MOTION to Compel Micron To Comply With PR 3-4 And Respond To Interrogatory No. 13 filed by Tessera, Inc. (Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 12/02/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc Submission of Technology Tutorial (Yar, Kajeer) (Entered: 12/02/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP, Infineon Technologies North America Corp Notice of Submission of a Techology Tutorial (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/01/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by Tessera, Inc of Submission of Technology Tutorial (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 12/01/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that parties file any objections to Mr. David Weaver being appointed as technical advisor in this case on or before 12/6/05. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/30/05. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/30/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 136 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None
FILED UNDER SEAL - Supplement to Appendix A re 132 MOTION to Supplement to Appendix A to Joint Claim Construction Statement filed by Tessera, Inc. (ehs) (Entered: 11/28/2005)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 132 Motion for Leave to supplement Appendix A to Joint Claim Construction Statement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/05. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/05. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/25/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 123 MOTION to Compel Micron To Comply With PR 3-4 And Respond To Interrogatory No. 13 filed by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc, Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Yar, Kajeer) Proposed Order added on 11/29/2005 (mpv, ). Modified on 11/29/2005 (mpv, ). (Entered: 11/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Supplement to Appendix A to Joint Claim Construction Statement by Tessera, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Supplement to Appendix A of PR 4-3 Chart)(Turner, Ellisen) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order [Agreed and Stipulated] regarding a Patent License Between Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. and Micron Technology, Inc. by Micron Technology Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER amending 129 Motion to Amend/Correct is set forth herein. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/23/05. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None
Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Orders and to Modify Docket Control Orders (Unopposed Motion) by Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw 124 MOTION to Amend/Correct Micron's Unopposed Motion to Amend Protective Orders and Modify Docket Control Orders by Micron Technology Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John M Desmarais for Infineon Technologies North America Corp; Infineon Technologies AG and Infineon Technologies Richmond, LP. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/17/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 232 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?