Berger, et al v. Compaq Computer Corp, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:98-cv-01148
District Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gary Fruchter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brower Piven

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A.P. Brower +1 212 501 9000 +1 212 501 0300

Represented by Kohn Swift & Graf PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Krasner +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 krasner@whafh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey G. Smith +1 212 545 4740 +1 212 545 4653 smith@whafh.com
No Logo John Butler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Krasner +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 krasner@whafh.com
No Logo Lilia Mistetsky, Plaintiff
No Logo Mark A Salitan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Krasner +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 krasner@whafh.com
No Logo Mark Berger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218

Toggle Switch Represented by Brower Piven

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A.P. Brower +1 212 501 9000 +1 212 501 0300

Represented by Kohn Swift & Graf PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Krasner +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 krasner@whafh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey G. Smith +1 212 545 4740 +1 212 545 4653 smith@whafh.com
No Logo Michael A. Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Krasner +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 krasner@whafh.com
No Logo Stephen B Schroeder, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brower Piven

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A.P. Brower +1 212 501 9000 +1 212 501 0300

Represented by Kohn Swift & Graf PC

Toggle Switch Represented by THE LAW FIRM OF HARVEY GREENFIELD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED HARVEY GREENFIELD +1 212 949 5500

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Krasner +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 krasner@whafh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey G. Smith +1 212 545 4740 +1 212 545 4653 smith@whafh.com
v.
No Logo Benjamin Rosen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Wurtz +1 212 450 4548 + 212 450 5575

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Loyd Carter +1 713 758 2124 +1 713 615 5307 jcarter@velaw.com
Compaq Computer Corporation Compaq Computer Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Compaq Computer Corp"
Unknown Role, Navisite, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela T Bellizzi +1 212 450 4885 +1 212 701 5885
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S. Flynn +1 212 450 4000

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank S Moseley +1 212 450 4000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Wurtz +1 212 450 4548 + 212 450 5575

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Loyd Carter +1 713 758 2124 +1 713 615 5307 jcarter@velaw.com
No Logo Earl L Mason, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Wurtz +1 212 450 4548 + 212 450 5575

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Loyd Carter +1 713 758 2124 +1 713 615 5307 jcarter@velaw.com
No Logo Eckhard Pfeiffer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Wurtz +1 212 450 4548 + 212 450 5575

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Loyd Carter +1 713 758 2124 +1 713 615 5307 jcarter@velaw.com
No Logo Grefory E Petsch, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Wurtz +1 212 450 4548 + 212 450 5575

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Loyd Carter +1 713 758 2124 +1 713 615 5307 jcarter@velaw.com
No Logo J. DAVID CABELLO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Wurtz +1 212 450 4548 + 212 450 5575

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Loyd Carter +1 713 758 2124 +1 713 615 5307 jcarter@velaw.com
No Logo JoAnn Manns, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JoAnn Manns
No Logo John T Rose, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Loyd Carter +1 713 758 2124 +1 713 615 5307 jcarter@velaw.com
No Logo John W White, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Wurtz +1 212 450 4548 + 212 450 5575

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Loyd Carter +1 713 758 2124 +1 713 615 5307 jcarter@velaw.com
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L Lay"

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Wurtz +1 212 450 4548 + 212 450 5575

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Loyd Carter +1 713 758 2124 +1 713 615 5307 jcarter@velaw.com
No Logo Michael Heil, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Wurtz +1 212 450 4548 + 212 450 5575

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Loyd Carter +1 713 758 2124 +1 713 615 5307 jcarter@velaw.com
No Logo Michael Winkler, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Wurtz +1 212 450 4548 + 212 450 5575

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Loyd Carter +1 713 758 2124 +1 713 615 5307 jcarter@velaw.com
No Logo Robert J Manns, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Manns, Robert J.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J Manns +1 843 705 2443
No Logo Robert W Stearns, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Wurtz +1 212 450 4548 + 212 450 5575

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Loyd Carter +1 713 758 2124 +1 713 615 5307 jcarter@velaw.com
No Logo Rodney Schrock, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Wurtz +1 212 450 4548 + 212 450 5575

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Loyd Carter +1 713 758 2124 +1 713 615 5307 jcarter@velaw.com
No Logo Thomas J Perkins, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Wurtz +1 212 450 4548 + 212 450 5575

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Loyd Carter +1 713 758 2124 +1 713 615 5307 jcarter@velaw.com
No Logo CompuCom Systems, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenkens & Gilchrist, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tari L Williams +1 214 855 4500 +1 214 855 4300
No Logo Fred K Sondheimer, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bishop & Associates, PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W. Bishop +1 502 425 2600 +1 502 425 9115 firm@bishoplegal.net
No Logo Gerald Laskey, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bishop & Associates, PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W. Bishop +1 502 425 2600 +1 502 425 9115 firm@bishoplegal.net
No Logo John F Duane, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Yoes Law Firm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William H Yoes +1 409 833 2352 +1 409 838 5577 why@yoeslawfirm.com
No Logo Patrick Q Crow, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by 1490 Four Forest Plaza

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Q Crow +1 972 980 4081
No Logo Proposed Liaison Cou, Movant
No Logo Hoeffner & Bilek, LLP, Consol Defendant

Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

No Logo The Bilek Law Firm, LLP, Consol Defendant

Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

No Logo Thomas E Bilek, Consol Defendant

Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

No Logo Irving Gingold, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irving Gingold
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (174) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/9/2009 Order on Motion to Transfer CaseCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 170 Motion to Transfer Case.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(esmith, ) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: 8/11/2009 Surreply to MotionCourt Filing
    SURREPLY to 170 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Judge Gilmore, filed by Lilia Mistetsky. (Buzbee, Anthony) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 Reply in Support of MotionCourt Filing
      REPLY in Support of 170 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Judge Gilmore, filed by Thomas E Bilek, The Bilek Law Firm, L.L.P., Hoeffner & Bilek, L.L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Marks, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/3/2009 Response to MotionCourt Filing
        RESPONSE to 170 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Judge Gilmore, filed by Lilia Mistetsky. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue and Consolidate)(Buzbee, Anthony) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Motion to Transfer CaseCourt Filing
          Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Judge Gilmore by Thomas E Bilek, The Bilek Law Firm, L.L.P., Hoeffner & Bilek, L.L.P., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/19/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Proposed Order to Transfer)(Merrill, William) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 1/7/2009 Letter of Agreement
            LETTER re: distribution of remaining funds by Compaq Computer Corp, filed.(emares, ) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Mail Returned Undeliverable
              Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney David A Brower re: 166 Order, filed. (sbyrum, ) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: 10/21/2008 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Harvey Greenfield re: 166 Order, filed. (lfilmore, ) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: 10/9/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                  FINAL SETTLEMENT DISTRIBUTION ORDER granting 164 Unopposed MOTION for Disbursement of Funds.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/9/2008 Letter
                    Letter from Thomas E. Bilek re: disbursement of remaining funds, filed. (ypippin, ) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Motion for Disbursement of Funds
                      Unopposed MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Mark Berger, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/22/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed order)(Bilek, Thomas) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                        Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Tari L Williams re: 162 Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds , filed. (mmarch, ) (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006 Order on Motion for Disbursement of FundsCourt Filing
                          ORDER Authorizing Final Disbursment of the Settlement Fund and Awarding Related Fees and Expenses to the Claims Administrator re: 161 Motion for Disbursement of Funds.( Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/18/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: 4/11/2006 Motion for Disbursement of Funds
                            Unopposed MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by all plaintiffs, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Smith)(Bilek, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Letter
                              Letter from Vinne Benedetto re: Payment of Class Action, filed. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Order on Motion for Entry of OrderCourt Filing
                                (Proposed) SETTLEMENT DISTRIBUTION ORDER granting the 154 Motion for Entry of Order .( Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore ) Parties notified.(psmith, ) (Entered: 09/23/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 158 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/5/2004 Document
                                  LETTER by JoAnn Manns, Robert J Manns requesting review of claim, filed, filed.(psmith, ) (Entered: 09/05/2004)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Exhibits
                                    EXHIBITS to the [156-1] Affidavit of Jeffrey Smith, filed. (Volumes I, II and III in two brown expandable folders) (psmith) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Affidavit
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Class Counsel Jeffrey Smith in support of [154-1] motion for entry of settlement distribution order , filed (psmith) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Affidavit
                                        AFFIDAVIT of Stephen J Cirami, filed (psmith) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Motion for Entry of Order
                                          MOTION for entry of settlement distribution order , by Mark Berger, Motion Docket Date 8/23/04 [154-1] motion , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 08/03/2004)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 USCA Order
                                            ORDER OF USCA (certified copy) Pursuant to appellant's unopposed motion this appeal is DISMISSED this 3rd day of February, 2003, see Fed.R.App.P. 42 (b) [150-1] appeal , filed CCA No. 03-20067 (mmapps) (Entered: 02/20/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Transcript Order Form - DKT-13
                                              Transcript request for the [150-1] appeal re: This to order a transcript of the Preliminary Approval Hearing held 6/25/02 & Final Approval Hearing held 11/01/02 by Ct Reporter: June Simon, filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 12/31/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Document
                                                STATEMENT of Issues to be Presented on Appeal by Patrick Q Crow (hlerma) (Entered: 12/31/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Notice of Appeal
                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL of [149-1] order, [148-1] order by Patrick Q Crow , filed. Fee Status: not paid (jdavenport) (Entered: 12/19/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 149 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Final JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                    FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, entered. Parties ntfd. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (psmith) (Entered: 11/25/2002)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting the [128-1] joint motion for attorney fees and compensation awards, entered; Parties notified. ( signed Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (psmith) (Entered: 11/25/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002 Exhibit
                                                        EXHIBIT LIST by Pltf Mark Berger, filed (fmremp) (Entered: 11/08/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002 Minute EntryCourt Filing
                                                          MINUTES OF SETTLEMENT HEARING held before Judge Gilmore on 11/1/02: Apps by Krasner/Smith/Bilek f/Pltf, Carter f/Deft, Jones f/Compag, Flynn f/CPQ, Slyne f/Pltfs, Ct Rptr - June Simon, Proposed Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice and Order Awarding Pltfs' Counsel's Fees, Costs and Expenses submit to court for consideration, filed (fmremp) (Entered: 11/08/2002)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER pursuant to L. R. 1, entered. Attorney Michael S Flynn may appear pro hac vice for Compaq Computer Corp. Parties ntfd. ( Signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (amaly) (Entered: 11/07/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 Objections
                                                              OBJECTION to Jeffrey G Smith's [140-1] declaration by Patrick Q Crow , filed. (amaly) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER pursuant to L. R. 1, entered. Attorney Angela T Bellizzi is admitted pro hac vice for Compaq Computer Corp. Parties ntfd. ( Signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (amaly) (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                  NOTICE of Intention To Appear and Be Heard, by John F Duane, Gerald Laskey , filed (psmith) (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Affidavit
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Julie M Sullivan, counsel for Mark Berger, et al regarding requests for exclusion, filed (2 volumes in brown expandex folders) (amaly) Modified on 10/30/2002 (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Affidavit
                                                                      DECLARATION of Jeffrey G Smith, counsel for Mark Berger, et al in support of final approval of settlement and plan of allocation, pltfs' [128-1] joint motion for attorney fees and compensation awards , filed (in brown expandex folder) (amaly) Modified on 10/30/2002 (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Supplement
                                                                        COMPENDIUM of unreported authorities cited in pltfs' [132-1] memorandum of law in support of the proposed class action settlement, pltfs' [131-1] memorandum of law in support of certification of this action for settlement purposes, pltfs' [129-1] support memorandum for motion for attorneys' fees and compensation awards by Mark Berger, et al filed. (in brown expandex folder) (amaly) Modified on 10/30/2002 (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Brief
                                                                          CORRECTION to [131-1] memorandum of law in support of certification of this action for settlement purposes by Mark Berger, et al, filed. (amaly) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Response
                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN RESPONSE by Mark Berger et al to [120-1] objection to proposed class action settlement, [122-1] objection to proposed class action settlement, [123-1] objection to proposed class action settlement, filed. (amaly) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Affidavit
                                                                              DECLARATION by Mark Levine, counsel for Mark Berger et al in support of pltfs' [128-1] joint motion for attorney fees and compensation awards , filed (amaly) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Supplement
                                                                                CONCISE SUMMARY of pltfs' [132-1] memorandum of law in support of the proposed class action settlement by Mark Berger, et al filed. (amaly) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Supplement
                                                                                  CONCISE SUMMARY of pltfs' [129-1] support memorandum of law on their joint application for attorneys' fees and compensation awards by Mark Berger, et al filed. (amaly) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Supplement
                                                                                    TABLE OF AUTHORITIES to pltfs' [132-1] memorandum of law in support of the proposed class action settlement by Mark Berger, et al, filed. (amaly) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of the proposed class action settlement by Mark Berger, et al, filed. (amaly) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of certification of this action for settlement purposes by Mark Berger, et al filed. (amaly) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Supplement
                                                                                          TABLE OF AUTHORITIES to pltfs' [129-1] support memorandum of law by Mark Berger, et al filed. (amaly) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Mark Berger, et al in support of pltfs' [128-1] joint motion for attorney fees and compensation awards , filed (amaly) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002, Terminated: 11/22/2002 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                              JOINT APPLICATION for attorney fees and compensation awards by Mark Berger, et al filed (amaly) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/25/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Compaq Computer Corp et al in support of proposed settlement , filed (sjones) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER pursuant to L. R. 1, Daniel W Kranser is admitted pro hac vice for Pltfs entered. Parties ntfd. ( Signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (sjones) (Entered: 10/24/2002)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Objection to Proposed Award of Attorneys Fees and of Intention to Appear Through Counsel At Fairness Hearing, by Fred K Sondheimer, filed (psmith) (Entered: 10/17/2002)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF INTENTION TO APPEAR AND BE HEARD by John F Duane and counsel, filed (amaly) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 Objections
                                                                                                        PRELIMINARY OBJECTIONS TO THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by John F Duane , filed. (amaly) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Objections
                                                                                                          OBJECTION to the fairness, reasonableness and adequacy of the proposed class settlement and to the reasonableness of class counsel attorneys' fees by Patrick Q Crow , filed. (amaly) (Entered: 10/01/2002)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Objection and of Intention To Appear Through Counsel At Fairness Hearing to Object to Proposed Award of Attorneys Fees, by Fred K Sondheimer , filed (psmith) (Entered: 10/01/2002)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Objections
                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS to Class Action Settlement, by Gerald Laskey , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 10/01/2002)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance, by Gerald Laskey , filed (psmith) (Entered: 10/01/2002)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 118 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: 8/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER denying Deft's [108-1] motion for leave to (file) reply to pltfs' supplemental memorandum and defts' opposition to renewed motion for class certification , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (sfedele) (Entered: 08/09/2002)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Administrative Transcript/RecordCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS for dates of 6/21/02 before Judge Vanessa Gilmore , filed. ( Court Rptr: June Simon) (amaly) (Entered: 07/03/2002)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 116 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE Set settlement hearing 2:30 11/1/02 before Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore , Set class members objections, papers and briefs due for 10/1/02 , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (amaly) (Entered: 07/01/2002)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/27/2002 Stipulation
                                                                                                                        STIPULATION re: settlement by Mark Berger, Compaq Computer Corp et al, filed. (amaly) (Entered: 06/27/2002)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/27/2002 Minute Entry
                                                                                                                          Minute entry: Settlement conference held. Apps: T Bilek, H Greenfield, J Smith, M Silverstein, P Spline, K Stern, A Bellizzi. terminated deadlines denying as moot Berger's [101-1] motion for class certification denying Schroeder's [103-1] motion with respect to class certification. The Stipulation of Settlement is pending before the Court. Final Settlement Hearing to be set at a later date. Ct Reporter: J Simon. (amaly) (Entered: 06/27/2002)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 Notice of SettingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing: reset settlement conference for 2:30 6/21/02 before Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore before Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 05/29/2002)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Mark Berger, Mark A Salitan in opposition to Stephen B. Schroeder's Order to Show Cause, filed (sguevara) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 111 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER the request for a Show Cause Order is DENIED, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) (Entered: 05/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to the Application Of Stephen Schroeder, by Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, filed. (psmith) (Entered: 05/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    REPLY by Stephen B Schroeder to pltfs' supplemental memorandum of law and [101-1] renewed motion for class certification; and defts' opposition to pltfs' [101-1] renewed motion for class certification, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 04/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002, Terminated: 8/6/2002 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to (file) reply to pltfs' supplemental memorandum and defts' opposition to renewed motion for class certification by Stephen B Schroeder, Motion Docket Date 5/6/02 [108-1] motion , filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 04/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Notice of SettingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on the Supplementyal Motion is CANCELLED terminated deadlines , Settlement conference for 2:00 5/31/02 before Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 05/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER reset supplemental motion/miscellaneous hearing 2:00 4/18/02 before Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore , entered; Parties notified. ( signed Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (ljackson) (Entered: 04/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason, et al, in opposition to Pltfs Renewed [101-1] motion for class certification , filed (psmith) (Entered: 03/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Lead Pltfs RESPONSE in opposition to Pltf Stephen Schroeder's Supplemental [103-1] motion with respect to class certification, by Berger, et al, filed (psmith) (Entered: 03/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/4/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION with respect to class certification by Stephen B Schroeder, Motion Docket Date 3/20/02 [103-1] motion , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 03/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/4/2002 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                  APPENDIX by Mark Berger to [101-1] renewed motion for class certification and supplemental memorandum of law , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 03/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/4/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                    RENEWED MOTION with supplemental memorandum in support for class certification by Mark Berger, Motion Docket Date 3/20/02 [101-1] motion , filed (hlerma) (Entered: 03/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/4/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                      Summary Of Pltf's Memorandum in Support of their Renewed Motion for Class Certification pursuant of Vanessa D. Gilmore's Procedures, No. 4G by Mark Berger , filed (hlerma) (Entered: 03/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that Pltfs file any supplemental motion they want the Court to consider on the class certification; the motion should adress only the issues raised in the opinion of the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals dated 7/25/01, w/in 20 days of the date of this order; Defts may have 20 days to respond; a hearing on the supplemental motion will take place on Friday, 4/19/02 at 2:30 pm before Judge Gilmore, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (fmremp) (Entered: 02/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002 USCA Opinion
                                                                                                                                                          Copy of USCA OPINION, filed. CCA No. 00-20875 (mmapps) (Entered: 01/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002 USCA Judgment
                                                                                                                                                            JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) 07/25/01 issued as mandate on 01/23/02 that the judgment of the District Court is VACATED, and the cause is REMANDED to the District Court for further proceedings in accordance with the opinion of this Court....FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff-appellee pay to defendants-appellants the costs on appeal to be taxed by the Clerk of this Court, , filed. CCA No. 00-20875 (mmapps) (Entered: 01/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002 USCA Per Curiam
                                                                                                                                                              Certified copy of PER CURIAM by USCA, the petition for panel rehearing is DENIED, the petition for rehearing en banc is also DENIED, filed. CCA No. 00-20875 (mmapps) (Entered: 01/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF USCA (certified copy) IT IS ORDERED that appellants motion for stay pending appeal is GRANTED , filed. (mmapps) (Entered: 02/09/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF USCA (certified copy) Feb 6, 2001 GRANTING appellant's motion for stay pending appeal, filed. (USCA #00-20875) (CRD ntfd) (bdaniel) (Entered: 02/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                    DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Mark Berger filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 01/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000 Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF by Compaq Computer Corp in support of [88-1] motion to stay of proceedings pending appeal of class , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 12/08/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX by Mark Berger to [89-1] response to Defts [88-1] motion to stay of proceedings pending appeal of class certification , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 12/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Thomas E. Bilek in opposition to Defts [88-1] motion to stay of proceedings pending appeal of class certification , filed (hlerma) (Entered: 12/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Mark Berger to [88-1] motion to stay of proceedings pending appeal of class certification , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 12/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/16/2000 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to stay of proceedings pending appeal of class certification by Compaq Computer Corp et al, Motion Docket Date 12/6/00 [88-1] motion , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 11/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/16/2000 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                APPENDIX Pursuant to Local Rule 4(I) by Compaq Computer Corp et al , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 11/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF USCA (certified copy) Oct 6, 2000 Granting the petition for leave to appeal, filed. (USCA #00-45) (bdaniel) (Entered: 10/13/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: 10/11/2000 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF USCA (faxed copy) Aug 8, 2000 Denying petition for writ of mandamus, filed. (USCA #00-20643) (bdaniel) (Entered: 10/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: 8/14/2000 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF USCA (certified copy) IT IS ORDERED that petitioners motion for leave to file reply memorandum in support of petition for writ of mandamus is GRANTED, filed. (mmapps) (Entered: 08/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: 7/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part, denying in part Pltf's [53-1] motion for class certification , entered; Parties notified. ( signed Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) (Entered: 07/18/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: 6/20/2000 Minute Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute entry: Telephone Conf. held in Chambers. Apps: Bilek, Wertz and Plunkett. Price Waterhouse to provide Pltf W/paper work consisting of tax returns; pension information ; custom duties & investements for the period of July 10/97 to March 6, 1998. terminated deadlines , Parties to notify status by 6/23/00 (hlerma) Modified on 06/20/2000 (Entered: 06/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/15/2000 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                            INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Mark Berger , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 06/15/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Pltf's [0-1] motion for Jeffrey G. Smith to appear pro hac vice pursuant to L. R. 1, entered. Parties ntfd. ( Signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) (Entered: 05/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/1/2000, Entered: 5/1/2000 Designation of Attorney in Charge
                                                                                                                                                                                                DESIGNATION by Mark Berger, Stephen B Schroeder, Gary Fruchter designating Thomas E. Bilek as attorney in charge, filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 05/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/20/2000, Entered: 4/21/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Pltf's [77-1] motion for continuance of class certification. Pltfs to immediately file a notice with Ct. designating lead counsel , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) (Entered: 04/21/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/20/2000, Entered: 4/21/2000, Terminated: 4/20/2000 Motion for Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION for continuance of class certification by Mark Berger, Motion Docket Date 5/10/00 [77-1] motion , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 04/21/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 4/19/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Pltf's [75-1] motion to extend page limit of pltfs' reply memorandum of law in support of motion for class certification , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) (Entered: 04/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 4/17/2000, Terminated: 4/19/2000 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION to extend page limit of pltfs' reply memorandum of law in support of motion for class certification by pltfs Mark Berger et al, Motion Docket Date 5/7/00 [75-1] motion , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 04/17/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 4/17/2000 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPENDIX filed by Mark Berger, Stephen B Schroeder, and Gary Fruchter to [53-1] motion for class certification. (fmremp) (Entered: 04/17/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 4/17/2000 Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY filed by Mark Berger, Stephen B Schroeder, and Gary Fruchter in support of [53-1] motion for class certification. (fmremp) (Entered: 04/17/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: 4/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Pltfs [0-1] motion for David A. P. Brower to appear pro hac vice pursuant to L. R. 1, entered. Parties ntfd. ( Signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) (Entered: 04/12/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Defts [69-1] motion for permission to file brief in excess of twenty pages , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) (Entered: 04/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 4/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Reset class certification hearing 2:30 4/21/00 before Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) (Entered: 04/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/3/2000, Terminated: 4/4/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION for permission to file brief in excess of twenty pages by Compaq Computer Corp et al, Motion Docket Date 4/23/00 [69-1] motion , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 04/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/3/2000 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPENDIX by Compaq Computer Corp et al to [67-1] opposition response , filed. (in brown folder) (hlerma) (Entered: 04/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/3/2000 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Compaq Computer Corp et al in opposition to [53-1] motion for class certification , filed (hlerma) (Entered: 04/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 3/22/2000 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of change of address by Atty Joseph C. Kohn for Mark Berger , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 03/22/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: 3/15/2000 Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            THIRD-PARTY OBJECTION to request for production of documents by CompuCom Systems, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 03/15/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that Defts' [55-1] motion for reconsideration of the Court's [47-1] order dated 12/22/99 is DENIED, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (fmremp) (Entered: 03/13/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/16/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoena For Deposition and Production of Documents, by Mark Berger , filed (psmith) (Entered: 02/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: 2/10/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER entered SETTING deadlines: lpltf expert witness list due 11/15/00; deft expert witness list due 12/15/00; discovery cutoff 3/15/01; dispositive and non-dispositive motions by 4/16/01; Joint Pretrial Order by deft to pltf by 7/17/01 and pltf to file by or before 7/20/01; docket call set for 1:30 on 8/1/01; SETTING Class Certification Hearing for 1:30 on 4/14/00 before Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore Parties notified. Trial Term: Sept 2001 by jury ( Signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) Modified on 02/22/2000 (Entered: 02/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM by Compaq Computer Corp in support of [55-1] motion for reconsideration of [47-1] order , filed (hlerma) (Entered: 02/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/20/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Scheduling conference before Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore held before Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore Ct Reporter: Anita Manley Apps: T. Bilek, J Carter and B Works. Scheduling Order Entered. Class Certification Hrg. set for April 14, 2000 at 2:30. (hlerma) (Entered: 02/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/27/2000, Entered: 1/27/2000 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Mark Berger in opposition to Deft's [55-1] motion for reconsideration of [47-1] order , filed (hlerma) (Entered: 01/27/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/26/2000, Entered: 1/26/2000 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER filed by Compaq Computer Corp, Eckhard Pfeiffer, Earl L Mason, John W White, Robert W Stearns, Michael Winkler, Thomas J Perkins, J David Cabello, Michael Heil, Grefory E Petsch, Kenneth L Lay, Benjamin Rosen, and Rodney Schrock to amended consolidated complaint. Added attorney William E Wurtz. (fmremp) (Entered: 01/26/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/20/2000, Entered: 1/20/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Compaq Computer Corp in support of [55-1] motion for reconsideration of [47-1] order , filed (hlerma) (Entered: 01/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/20/2000, Entered: 1/20/2000 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPENDIX by Compaq Computer Corp to [55-1] motion for reconsideration of [47-1] order , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 01/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/20/2000, Entered: 1/20/2000, Terminated: 3/10/2000 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for reconsideration of [47-1] order by Compaq Computer Corp, Motion Docket Date 2/9/00 [55-1] motion , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 01/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/20/2000, Entered: 1/20/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Mark Berger in support of [53-1] motion for class certification , filed (hlerma) (Entered: 01/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/20/2000, Entered: 1/20/2000, Terminated: 7/17/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for class certification by Mark Berger, Motion Docket Date 2/9/00 [53-1] motion , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 01/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate by Compaq Computer Corp et al , filed (hlerma) (Entered: 01/18/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/14/2000 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Report of Meeting and Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan by Mark Berger, Compaq Computer Corp et al , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 01/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/4/2000, Entered: 1/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Defts [49-1] motion to extend time to file answer. Set answer due for 1/25/00 for Roel Pieper, for Rodney Schrock, for Benjamin Rosen, for Andreas Barth, for Kenneth L Lay, for Grefory E Petsch, for Michael Heil, for J David Cabello, for Thomas J Perkins, for Michael Winkler, for Robert W Stearns, for John W White, for John T Rose, for Earl L Mason, for Eckhard Pfeiffer, for Compaq Computer Corp , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) Modified on 01/04/2000 (Entered: 01/04/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/30/1999, Entered: 12/30/1999, Terminated: 1/4/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION to extend time to file answer by defts Compaq Computer Corp et al, Motion Docket Date 1/19/00 [49-1] motion , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 12/30/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: 12/28/1999 Order for Initial Conference and DisclosureCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order setting Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference on 1:30 1/20/00 before Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore and Order to Disclose Interested Persons, filed. ( Signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) Party filing case notified. (fmremp) (Entered: 12/28/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying Deft's [28-1] motion to dismiss Pltfs consolidated amended complaint , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) (Entered: 12/22/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Compaq Computer Corp to [45-1] pltfs notice of supplemental case authority, filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 12/22/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: 12/9/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Supplemental Case Authority in Support of Pltfs Response to Defts' Motion to Dismiss , filed (hlerma) (Entered: 12/09/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/1/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of change of address for Curtis V Trinko atty for Gary Fruchter , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 11/01/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/6/1999 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION OF NEW AUTHORITY by Compaq Computer Corp in support of [28-1] motion to dismiss Pltfs consolidated amended complaint , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 10/06/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/4/1999, Entered: 10/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Defts [41-1] motion for permission to file reply brief in excuess of ten pages , entered; Parties notified. signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) (Entered: 10/04/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999, Terminated: 10/4/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION for permission to file reply brief in excuess of ten pages by Compaq Computer Corp, Motion Docket Date 10/20/99 [41-1] motion , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 09/30/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPENDIX of Supplemental Authorities by Compaq Computer Corp to , filed. (hlerma) Modified on 10/20/2000 (Entered: 09/30/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999 Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM by Compaq Computer Corp in support of [28-1] motion to dismiss Pltfs consolidated amended complaint , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 09/30/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/12/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Defts [35-1] motion to Extend Page Limit of Pltf's Response to Deft's Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint for Violation of the Securities Laws. Pltfs shall have additional pages in excess of the 20 page limit for their response to Defts motion to dismiss. , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) (Entered: 08/13/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/10/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPENDIX by Mark Berger to [35-1] motion to Extend Page Limit of Pltf's Response to Deft's Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint for Violation of the Securities Laws , filed. (hlerma) Modified on 10/20/2000 (Entered: 08/11/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/10/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Mark Berger in support of [35-1] motion to Extend Page Limit of Pltf's Response to Deft's Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint for Violation of the Securities Laws , filed (hlerma) (Entered: 08/11/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/10/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999, Terminated: 8/12/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Page Limit of Pltf's Response to Deft's Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint for Violation of the Securities Laws by Mark Berger, Motion Docket Date 8/30/99 [35-1] motion , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 08/11/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Defts [29-1] motion for permission to file brief in excess of twenty pages. Within five days of the date of this order , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) (Entered: 06/21/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/18/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPENDIX by Compaq Computer Corp to Supplemental Authorities , filed. (hlerma) Modified on 10/20/2000 (Entered: 05/19/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/18/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of Defts' Motion to Dismiss by Compaq Computer Corp , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 05/19/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/18/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST by Mark Berger for expedited hrg. on their amended motion to compel , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 05/19/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/18/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Concise Summary of Argument pursuant to Local Rule 4(G) in Support of Defts Motion to Dismiss by Compaq Computer Corp , filed (hlerma) (Entered: 05/19/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/18/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999, Terminated: 6/18/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION for permission to file brief in excess of twenty pages by Compaq Computer Corp, Motion Docket Date 6/7/99 [29-1] motion , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 05/19/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/18/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999, Terminated: 12/21/1999 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to dismiss Pltfs consolidated amended complaint by Compaq Computer Corp, Motion Docket Date 6/7/99 [28-1] motion , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 05/19/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: 3/17/1999 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT for Violiaton of Federal Securities Laws by Mark Berger, Stephen B Schroeder , amending [1-1] complaint , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 03/17/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/9/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of change of address by Mark Berger , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 02/09/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [6-1] motion for appointment of lead pltfs, approval of the proposed lead pltfs selection of counsel. Class members Mark Berger, John Butler,Philip T. Ziegler, John H. Pressley, Robert Fishbein, Alexander Chwick, Robert Defibaugh, John and Carol Pedranghelu, Sid Cash, Gary Fruchter, Bnos Rochel, Mindy Aber, Mark A. Salitan, Mohammed Y. Najam, Henry Chaker, Ron Nabhan, Donald Margolin, Dr. Allen Johnston, Nasser Fazlulahi, Benjamin Schulman, Bagher R. Harandi, Ronald G. Klentz, Edward Steudtner, Louis Niwoke, Amir Sabetian, Aline Demin, Nick Kolokithis, Lilia Mistetsky, Sam D. Samuels, Frank Pisco, Paul J. Giorgi, Farhad A Dehghan, Steve Pfeffer,Kenneth and Sandra Joe, Ming's Inc., Michael A.Brown and Vibhuti Mehta are APPOINTED to serve as Lead Pltfs for the class of purchasers of Compaq securities between 7/10/97 and March 6, 1998, inclusive. The law firms of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP and Stull Stull & Brody are appointed as co-lead counsel for the class and the law firm of Hoeffner, Bilek & Eidman, LLP is appointed as liason counsel. Thomas E. Bilek shall serve as attorney-in-charge , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (fmremp) (Entered: 01/15/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [8-1] motion for appointment of Harvey Greenfield as co-lead counsel denying [8-2] motion for entry of order directing an auction be held for co-lead counsel appointments , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (fmremp) (Entered: 01/15/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION granting pltfs' and class members' [6-2] motion to consolidate related cases, entered; 98-1148, 98-1751, 98-1816, 98-2160 and 98-1901 are consolidated for all pre-trial and trial purposes. All other securities class action cases that are subsequently filed against Compaq Computer Corp which arise out of the same nucleus of operative facts may be consolidated upon motion of the parties. The caption of the consolidated actions shall be Berger et al v. Compaq Computer Corp et al. All pleadings shall be filed under 98-1148. The terms of this order shall not have the effect of making any person a party to any action in which he has not been named. All other cases referenced are administratively closed. Within sixty days of entry of this order or the order appointing lead pltfs and lead counsel, lead pltfs shall have leave to file and serve a consolidated amended complaint on counsel for defts. Deft shall answer the consolidated complaint within sixty days after its service. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (ltien) (Entered: 12/24/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/13/1998, Entered: 11/13/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Civil Action No. H-98-1901 shall be consolidated into Civil Action No. 98-1148. Civil Action No. H-98-1901 is administratively closed and all pleadings, motions, responses, or other documentation shall be filed under Consolidated Civil Action H-98-1148 , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (fmremp) (Entered: 11/13/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: 11/4/1998 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Compaq Sharholder Group's [20-1] response to Stephen B. Schroeder's Request for Oral Hrg. by Stephen B Schroeder , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 11/04/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/26/1998, Entered: 10/26/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Compaq Shareholder Group to Stephen B. Schroeder's request for oral hearing, filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 10/26/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/20/1998, Entered: 10/21/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [15-1] motion to extend time to respond to objection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz to Appointment as Co-Lead Counsel , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (fmremp) (Entered: 10/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/20/1998, Entered: 10/21/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [12-1] motion for Harvey Greenfield to appear pro hac vice , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) (Entered: 10/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/19/1998, Entered: 10/20/1998 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Harvey Greenfield In Response To Opposition Of Wolf Haldenstein, filed (psmith) (Entered: 10/20/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by Compaq Computer Corp to Motion of Harvey Greenfield for Extension of time to Reply , filed. (hlerma) Modified on 10/19/1998 (Entered: 10/19/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/13/1998, Terminated: 10/20/1998 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to extend time to respond to objection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz to Appointment as Co-Lead Counsel by Stephen Schroeder, Motion Docket Date 11/2/98 [15-1] motion , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 10/13/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998 Minute Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute entry of Scheduling Conference: terminated deadlines (Ct Reporter: H. Chester) App: Greenfield f/pltf and Schroeder and Goforth f/deft. Scheduling order entered. (fmremp) Modified on 09/21/1998 (Entered: 09/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Daniel W. Krasner, Esq. in opposiiton to Re: [8-1] motion for appointment of Harvey Greenfield as co-lead counsel, and [8-2] motion for entry of order directing an auction be held for co-lead counsel appointments , filed (hlerma) (Entered: 09/18/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/16/1998, Terminated: 10/20/1998 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Harvey Greenfield to appear pro hac vice by Stephen B Schroeder, Motion Docket Date 10/6/98 [12-1] motion , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 09/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/10/1998, Entered: 9/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Compaq Computer Corp. [9-1] motion for Frank S. Moseley and William E. Wurtz to appear pro hac vice , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) (Entered: 09/10/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/9/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998 Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT DISCOVERY/Case Management Plan by Mark Berger, Compaq Computer Corp , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 09/09/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/8/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998, Terminated: 9/10/1998 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Frank S. Moseley to appear pro hac vice , Motion Docket Date 9/28/98 [9-1] motion , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 09/09/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/4/1998, Terminated: 1/15/1999 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for appointment of Harvey Greenfield as co-lead counsel , or in the alternative for entry of order directing an auction be held for co-lead counsel appointments by Stephen B Schroeder, Motion Docket Date 9/24/98 [8-1] motion, 9/24/98 [8-2] motion , filed. (ltien) (Entered: 09/04/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/17/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Proposed Liaison Cou in support of [6-1] motion for appointment of lead pltfs, approval of the proposed lead pltfs selection of counsel, [6-2] motion to consolidate cases with 98cv1816 , filed (hlerma) Modified on 10/20/2000 (Entered: 06/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/17/1998, Terminated: 1/15/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for appointment of lead pltfs, approval of the proposed lead pltfs selection of counsel , and to consolidate cases with 98cv1816 by Proposed Liaison Cou , Motion Docket Date 7/6/98 [6-1] motion, 7/6/98 [6-2] motion , filed. (hlerma) (Entered: 06/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/12/1998, Entered: 6/12/1998 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Regarding Discovery Motions, Motions for Summary Judgment and Analogous Motions to Dismiss , entered. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) (Entered: 06/12/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/29/1998, Entered: 4/30/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER reset pretrial and scheduling conference for 1:30 9/18/98 , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Vanessa D. Gilmore ) (hlerma) (Entered: 04/30/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: 4/28/1998 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL, entered; Judge Lee H Rosenthal stands recused in this case. Deadlines in scheduling orders continue in effect. Court settings are vacated. Case is reassigned to Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Lee H. Rosenthal ) (ltien) (Entered: 04/28/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/16/1998, Entered: 4/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER for conf set initial pretrial and scheduling conference for 8:30 9/25/98 before Judge Lee H. Rosenthal , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Lee H. Rosenthal ) (bchurchill) (Entered: 04/20/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/16/1998, Entered: 4/20/1998 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 477466 (bchurchill) (Entered: 04/20/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?