Stratton v. Texas Air National Guard
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00024
District Judge Sam Sparks, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2018 at 2:47 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Janet Stratton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Brien Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kerry Vincent O'Brien +1 512 415 7095 +1 512 328 6911 ko@obrienlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & McKay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alicia Ana Wilde +1 512 346 1607 +1 512 519 7140 aawpc@austin.rr.com
v.
No Logo Craig R. McKinley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel M. Castillo +1 512 916 5858 +1 512 916 5854 daniel.castillo@usdoj.gov
No Logo John F Nichols, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel M. Castillo +1 512 916 5858 +1 512 916 5854 daniel.castillo@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael B. Donley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Secretary, Department of the Air Force Alyson A. Berg +1 559 497 4000 +1 559 497 4099 alyson.berg@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of the Air Force Daniel M. Castillo +1 512 916 5858 +1 512 916 5854 daniel.castillo@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of the Air Force Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Secretary, Department of the Air Force Ryan B Parker +1 202 514 4336 +1 202 616 8470 ryan.parker@usdoj.gov
No Logo National Guard Bureau, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel M. Castillo +1 512 916 5858 +1 512 916 5854 daniel.castillo@usdoj.gov
No Logo Texas Air National Guard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel M. Castillo +1 512 916 5858 +1 512 916 5854 daniel.castillo@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Air Force, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Abourezk Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daneta Wollmann +3423 342 342 3616 daneta@rushmore.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Poyner & Spruill LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith Harrison Johnson +1 919 783 1013 +1 919 783 1075 kjohnson@poynerspruill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel M. Castillo +1 512 916 5858 +1 512 916 5854 daniel.castillo@usdoj.gov
Space Mark R. Conrad +1 415 436 7025 +1 415 436 6748 mark.conrad@usdoj.gov
Space Karen Grohman +1 505 224 1503 +1 505 346 7296 karen.grohman@usdoj.gov
Space Richard M. Pence, Jr. +1 501 340 2626 richard.pence@usdoj.gov
Space C. Scott Spear +1 202 305 1593 +1 202 514 8865 scott.spear@usdoj.gov
Space Mark A. Vargo USASD.ECFBounceback@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw, ) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw, ) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Oral Argument on All Pending Matters/Motion Hearing held on 5/29/2012 re 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Minute entry documents are not available electronically). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.) (kkc, ) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alicia Ana Wilde on behalf of Janet Stratton Plaintiff (Wilde, Alicia) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
          REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Michael B. Donley, Craig R. McKinley, National Guard Bureau, John F Nichols, Texas Air National Guard, United States Air Force, re 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant John F Nichols, Defendant Michael B. Donley, Defendant Texas Air National Guard, Defendant Craig R. McKinley, Defendant National Guard Bureau, Defendant United States Air Force (Castillo, Daniel) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER setting Oral Arguments on All Pending Matters for 5/29/2012 02:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw, ) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
              RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Janet Stratton, re 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant John F Nichols, Defendant Michael B. Donley, Defendant Texas Air National Guard, Defendant Craig R. McKinley, Defendant National Guard Bureau, Defendant United States Air Force (Wilde, Alicia) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Michael B. Donley, Craig R. McKinley, National Guard Bureau, John F Nichols, Texas Air National Guard, United States Air Force. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Declarations, # 3 Exhibits, # 4 Proposed Order)(Castillo, Daniel) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet Stratton. Michael B. Donley served on 2/22/2012, answer due 4/23/2012. (klw, ) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet Stratton. Craig R. McKinley served on 2/16/2012, answer due 4/16/2012. (klw, ) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet Stratton. National Guard Bureau served on 2/17/2012, answer due 3/9/2012. (klw, ) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet Stratton. Texas Air National Guard served on 2/23/2012, answer due 3/15/2012. (klw, ) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet Stratton. Civl Clerk Melissa Allbright (for Michael B. Donley) served on 2/16/2012, answer due 4/16/2012. (klw, ) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet Stratton. United States Air Force served on 2/23/2012, answer due 4/23/2012. (klw, ) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet Stratton. Process Clerk Melissa Albright (for United States Air Force) served on 2/16/2012, answer due 4/16/2012. (klw, ) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet Stratton. John F Nichols served on 2/23/2012, answer due 3/15/2012. (klw, ) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                  Summons Issued as to Michael B. Donley, Craig R. McKinley, National Guard Bureau, John F Nichols, Texas Air National Guard, United States Air Force. (klw, ) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Janet Stratton. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Supplement, # 3 Supplement, # 4 Supplement, # 5 Supplement)(Wilde, Alicia) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                      Summons Issued as to Michael B. Donley. (tdk, ) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Janet Stratton. (Wilde, Alicia) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                          COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0542-4230738), filed by Janet Stratton. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilde, Alicia) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 190 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?