USA v. DeChristopher
Criminal Case Utah District Court, Case No. 2:09-cr-00183
District Judge Dee Benson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tim DeChristopher, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Elizabeth Hunt +1 801 461 4300 elizabeth.hunt@comcast.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Ronald J. Yengich +1 801 355 0320 ronaldy333@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Patrick A. Shea

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Patrick A. Shea +1 801 582 0949 pas@patrickashea.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (92) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Blank 93
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
      Proposed Jury Instructions by Tim DeChristopher. (tls) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 89 Motion to Certify and Forward Supplemental Record of Proposed Jury Instructions as to Tim DeChristopher (1). Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 10/20/2011. (tls) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
          CLERK'S NOTICE OF ERROR as to Tim DeChristopher re 89 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct CERTIFY AND FORWARD SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD OF PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Description of error: Document has the wrong case number on it. Filers are reminded to ensure that all case information on documents matches that appearing at the top of each CM/ECF filing screen before submitting same. (alt) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
            Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct CERTIFY AND FORWARD SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD OF PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Tim DeChristopher. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Supplement, # 3 Supplement)(Hunt, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
              Please be advised the Record is complete for purposes of appeal as to Tim DeChristopher for USCA case number 11-4151 re 78 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (las) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Imposition of Sentence as to Tim DeChristopher held on July 26, 2011 before Judge DEE BENSON. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number (801) 328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/3/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2011. (jmr) Modified by removing restricted text on 12/12/2011 (rks). (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial-Volume I as to Tim DeChristopher held on February 28, 2011 before Judge DEE BENSON. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number (801) 328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/3/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2011. (jmr) Modified by removing restricted text on 12/12/2011 (rks). (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing as to Tim DeChristopher held on March 15, 2010 before Judge DEE BENSON. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number (801) 328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/3/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2011. (jmr) Modified by removing restricted text on 12/12/2011 (rks). (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume IV as to Tim DeChristopher held on March 3, 2011 before Judge DEE BENSON. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number (801) 328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/3/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2011. (jmr) Modified by removing restricted text on 12/12/2011 (rks). (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL-VOLUME II as to Tim DeChristopher held on MARCH 2, 2011 before Judge DEE BENSON. Court Reporter/Transcriber KELLY BROWN, HICKEN CSR, RPR, RMR, Telephone number 801-521-7238. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/3/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2011. (jmr) Modified by removing restricted text on 12/12/2011 (rks). (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial-Volume II as to Tim DeChristopher held on March 1, 2011 before Judge DEE BENSON. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number (801) 328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/3/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2011. (jmr) Modified by removing restricted text on 12/12/2011 (rks). (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing as to Tim DeChristopher held on September 25, 2009 before Judge DEE BENSON. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number (801) 328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/3/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2011. (jmr) Modified by removing restricted text on 12/12/2011 (rks). (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                              USCA Case Number as to Tim DeChristopher Case Appealed to Tenth Case Number 11-4151 for 78 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Tim DeChristopher. (jmr) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA as to Tim DeChristopher re 78 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (las) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by Tim DeChristopher Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 4681045985. Appeals to the USCA Tenth Circuit. (Yengich, Ronald) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    JUDGMENT as to Tim DeChristopher (1), Count(s) 1, 2, BOP 24 months. Supervised release 36 months. Standard conditions of release. Fine $10,000.00 SPA $200.00. Defendant Termed. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 7/27/2011. (rlr) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson: Dft present with cnsl and not in custody. Stmts made by cnsl, dft & Govt. Crt Adjudges:Sentence:Dft placed in the custody of the B.O.P for 24 months. Supervised release 36 months. Standard conditions of release. No special conditions. THE COURT FINDS that the defendant has the ability to pay a fine within the guideline range, pursuant to U.S.S.G. § 5E1.2(e). Therefore, a fine of $10,000 is imposed, which is due immediately, and shall be payable at a minimum rate of $200 per month, or as otherwise determined by the probation office. The Court waives the accrual of interest. Special assessment fee of $200.00, payable forthwith. The Court recomends that the defendant be placed at Englewood, CO., for family visitations. The Court informs the dft of his right to appeal within 14 days of entry of judgment. The dft is remanded to the custody of the USMS.Sentencing held on 7/26/2011 for Tim DeChristopher (1), Count(s) 1, 2, BOP 24 months. Supervised release 36 months. Standard conditions of release. Fine $10,000.00 SPA $200/00. Attorney for Plaintiff: John Huber and Scott Romney, Attorney for Defendant: Ron Yengich, Pat Shea and Elizabeth Hunt. Court Reporter: Ed Young. (reb) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                        Defendant's RESPONSE re 73 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report, 72 Sentencing Memorandum filed by Tim DeChristopher (Yengich, Ronald) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
                                          OBJECTION TO PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT by USA as to Tim DeChristopher (Huber, John) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 72 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Sentencing Memorandum
                                            SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Tim DeChristopher (Huber, John) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 71 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/12/2011 Sentencing Memorandum
                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM filed by Tim DeChristopher (rlr) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: 6/20/2011 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                ***AMENDED****NOTICE OF HEARING as to Tim DeChristopher (Notice generated by chambers) Sentencing set for 7/26/2011 03:00 PM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: 4/15/2011 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL VOLUME II as to Tim DeChristopher held on MARCH 2, 2011 before Judge DEE BENSON. Court Reporter/Transcriber KELLY BROWN, HICKEN CSR, RPR, RMR, Telephone number 801-521-7238. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/6/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2011. (jmr) Modified by removing restricted text on 7/14/2011 (rks). (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 67 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011 Jury Notes
                                                    **SEALED DOCUMENT** Jury Notes as to Tim DeChristopher (reb) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011 Jury Verdict
                                                      JURY VERDICT as to Tim DeChristopher (1) Guilty on Count 1,2. (reb) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011 Jury Instructions
                                                        Jury Instructions as to Tim DeChristopher (reb) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 64 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011 Jury List
                                                          **SEALED DOCUMENT** Jury List as to Tim DeChristopher (reb) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Sealed Legal Document 63 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011 Jury Panel Record
                                                            **SEALED DOCUMENT** Jury Panel Record as to Tim DeChristopher (reb) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011 Witness/Exhibit List
                                                              Exhibit and Witness List. (reb) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson: Jury seated at 8:45 a.m. Jury instructions read. Closing arguments heard. Jury excused at 10:30 a.m. for deliberations. Jury returned at 3:00 p.m. with a verdict of guilty on both counts. Jury polled. Jury thanked and excused. Sentencing set for 6/23/2011 at 1:30 p.m. Mr. DeChristopher will cont on release with all the previous conditions. Jury Trial as to Tim DeChristopher held on 3/3/2011 Attorney for Plaintiff: John Huber and Scott Romney, Attorney for Defendant: Ron Yengich, Pat Shea and Elizabeth Hunt. Court Reporter: Ed Young. (reb) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson: Jury seated at 8:45 a.m. Testimony of Kent Hoffman continues with defense cnsl. Govt resets. Opening statements by the defense. Defense presents its case in chief. Cnsl calls Michael Mielky, Tim DeChristopher as witnesses. Witnesses sworn, testimonies given and exhibits received. Defense rests. Govt recalls Dan Love as rebuttal, testimony given. Cross examinations. Govt rests its rebuttal case. Jury excused at 2:00 p.m.Jury Trial as to Tim DeChristopher held on 3/2/2011 Attorney for Plaintiff: John Huber and Scott Romney, Attorney for Defendant: Ron Yengich, Pat Shea and Elizabeth Hunt. Court Reporter: Ed Young. (reb) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson: Jury seated at 8:30 a.m. Opening statements made by the Govt. Govt presents its case in chief and calls Diane McComb, Theresa Catlin, Scott Swanson, Dan Love, Tina Brown and Kent Hoffman as witnesses. Witnesses sworn, testimony given and exhibits received. Cross examination by cnsl. Jury excused at 2:00 p.m. to return on 3/2/2011 at 8:30 a.m.Jury Trial as to Tim DeChristopher held on 3/1/2011 Attorney for Plaintiff: John Huber and Scott Romney, Attorney for Defendant: Ron Yengich, Pat Shea and Elizabeth Hunt. Court Reporter: Ed Young. (reb) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011 Voir DireCourt Filing
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson: Cnsl met with Crt to go over the jury questionnaire. Jury panel seated and sworn. Voir Dire completed. Panel of 12 jurors and 2 alternates selected and sworn. Jury excused at 6:30 pm to return on 3/1/2011 at 8:30 a.m.Voir Dire held on 2/28/2011 as to Tim DeChristopher Attorney for Plaintiff: John Huber and Scott Romney, Attorney for Defendant: Ron Yengich, Pat Shea and Elizabeth Hunt. Court Reporter: Ed Young. (reb) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Memorandum
                                                                        Defendant's MEMORANDUM Assertion of Rights to Confrontation, Due Process and a Fair Trial filed by Tim DeChristopher (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Referred Attachments)(Yengich, Ronald) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          TRIAL DECORUM ORDER as to Tim DeChristopher. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 2/25/2011. (rlr) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: 2/24/2011 Certificate of Compliance
                                                                            Tenth CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by USA as to Tim DeChristopher. (Huber, John) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: 2/24/2011 notice of filing
                                                                              JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE presented to and filled out by potential jurors re: 53 Juror Questionnaire Instructions as to Tim DeChristopher (rlr) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: 2/24/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE INSTRUCTIONS as to Tim DeChristopher. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 2/24/2011. (rlr) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/18/2011 Certificate of Compliance
                                                                                  Ninth CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by USA as to Tim DeChristopher. (Huber, John) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: 2/17/2011 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                    ***AMENDED***NOTICE OF HEARING as to Tim DeChristopher (Notice generated by chambers) Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2011 02:30 PM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: 2/17/2011 Witness List(Proposed)
                                                                                      PROPOSED WITNESS LIST by USA as to Tim DeChristopher (Huber, John) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: 2/15/2011 Certificate of Compliance
                                                                                        Eighth CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by USA as to Tim DeChristopher. (Huber, John) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 47 Motion to Amend/Correct as to Tim DeChristopher (1). The Indictment shall be amended to strike the citation to 16:3148 in paragraph 3, as reflected in government's exhibit 1. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 2/9/2011. (rlr) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Indictment To Correct Citation by USA as to Tim DeChristopher. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Romney, Scott) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 Certificate of Compliance
                                                                                              Seventh CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by USA as to Tim DeChristopher. (Huber, John) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/15/2010 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Tim DeChristopher. Time excluded from 12/13/2010 until 2/28/2011. Jury Trial RESET for 2/28/2011 08:30 AM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2011 11:00 AM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/5/2010. (ce) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                  ****AMENDED****NOTICE OF HEARING as to Tim DeChristopher (Notice generated by chambers) Jury Trial set for 12/13/2010 08:30 AM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. Jury Questionnaire will be on Friday, December 10th at 8:30 A.M. in the Jury room. (reb) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                                                                    WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Tim DeChristopher (Yengich, Ronald) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                      ***AMENDED***NOTICE OF HEARING as to Tim DeChristopher (Notice generated by chambers) 4 Day Jury Trial is RESCHEDULED for 9/13/2010 08:30 AM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: 4/7/2010 Certificate of Compliance
                                                                                                        Sixth CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by USA as to Tim DeChristopher. (Huber, John) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 4/5/2010 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson: Cnsl present. After arguments were heard and discussion held on Defendant's motion for discovery, Crt ruled: Denying the motion. Court made findings on the record and will issue an order.Motion Hearing as to Tim DeChristopher held on 3/15/2010 re 33 Defendant's MOTION for Discovery Regarding Claim of Selective Prosecution filed by Tim DeChristopher Attorney for Plaintiff: John Huber and Scott Romney, Attorney for Defendant: Ronald Yengich. Court Reporter: Ed Young. (reb) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER denying 33 Motion for Discovery as to Tim DeChristopher (1). Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 3/17/10 (alt) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: 3/16/2010 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                              ***AMENDED*** NOTICE OF HEARING as to Tim DeChristopher (Notice generated by chambers)3 Day Jury Trial set for 6/21/2010 08:30 AM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Tim DeChristopher re 33 Defendant's MOTION for Discovery Regarding Claim of Selective Prosecution (Yengich, Ronald) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Tim DeChristopher re 33 Defendant's MOTION for Discovery Regarding Claim of Selective Prosecution : (Notice generated by chambers) Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2010 11:00 AM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. The Jury Trial which was scheduled to begin on 3/15/2010 is VACATED. A new trial date will be set pending the resolution of the hearing scheduled on 3/15/2010 at 11:00 a.m. (reb) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Tim DeChristopher re 33 Defendant's MOTION for Discovery Regarding Claim of Selective Prosecution (Romney, Scott) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                      Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Support by Tim DeChristopher re 33 Defendant's MOTION for Discovery Regarding Claim of Selective Prosecution (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BLM Tables)(Yengich, Ronald) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                        Defendant's MOTION for Discovery Regarding Claim of Selective Prosecution filed by Tim DeChristopher. (Yengich, Ronald) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING as to Tim DeChristopher (Notice generated by chambers) Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2009 10:45 AM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 12 Motion in Limine as to Tim DeChristopher (1); as to Tim DeChristopher. Furthermore, because the evidence as proffered is insufficient as a matter of law to support a necessity defense, DeChristopher's request for an evidentiary hearing is DENIED. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/16/2009. (rlr) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Memorandum
                                                                                                                              Defendant's MEMORANDUM re: 29 Response (NOT to motion) filed by USA of Written Proffer of Choice of Evils Defense and Request for Evidentiary Hearing filed by Tim DeChristopher (Yengich, Ronald) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Response - not to Motion
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Defendant's Written Proffer (Doc.26) filed by USA as to Tim DeChristopher (Huber, John) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS by Tim DeChristopher re 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition. NOTE: The attachments to this document have not been scanned due to size, they have been placed on the shelf in the Clerk's office. (rlr) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Notice of Conventional Filing
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Attachments by Tim DeChristopher re 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition (Yengich, Ronald) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Tim DeChristopher re 12 MOTION in Limine (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Yengich, Ronald) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 17 Motion for Discovery as to Tim DeChristopher (1); granting 21 Motion for Discovery as to Tim DeChristopher (1). Based on the respective motions, the Court Orders that Counsel for both parties will provide the information on a date that will be determined. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 10/13/2009. (rlr) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson: Cnsl present along with the defendant. After arguments were heard, court deferred ruling on 12 Motion in Limine as to Tim DeChristopher and will allow Mr. Yengich to file a written proffer within 30 days. (1); Motion Hearing as to Tim DeChristopher held on 9/25/2009 re 12 MOTION in Limine filed by USA. Attorney for Plaintiff: John Huber and Scott Romney, Attorney for Defendant: Ronald Yengich. Court Reporter: Ed Young.(reb) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: 9/16/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Tim DeChristopher re 17 Defendant's MOTION for Discovery (Huber, John) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: 9/16/2009 Certificate of Compliance
                                                                                                                                              Fourth CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by USA as to Tim DeChristopher. (Huber, John) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Discovery by USA as to Tim DeChristopher. (Huber, John) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Tim DeChristopher re 12 MOTION in Limine (Huber, John) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/10/2009 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Tim DeChristopher re 17 Defendant's MOTION for Discovery, 12 MOTION in Limine : (Notice generated by chambers) Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2009 11:00 AM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Tim DeChristopher re 12 MOTION in Limine Re: Necessity Defense (Yengich, Ronald) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's MOTION for Discovery filed by Tim DeChristopher. (Yengich, Ronald) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Tim DeChristopher. Time excluded from 6/27/09 until 9/14/09. Motion terminated 15 Defendant's MOTION to Continue Jury Trial filed by Tim DeChristopher. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2009 08:30 AM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 6/24/09. (jwt) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's MOTION to Continue Jury Trial filed by Tim DeChristopher. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order to Continue Jury Trial)(Yengich, Ronald) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Tim DeChristopher (1). The deadline to file motions is extended to 6/26/09. The Court determines the delay caused by a continuance is excludable. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 6/8/09. (ce) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: 5/28/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Tim DeChristopher. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order to Extend Time to File Response)(Yengich, Ronald) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine by USA as to Tim DeChristopher. (Huber, John) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: 5/4/2009 Certificate of Compliance
                                                                                                                                                                    Third CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by USA as to Tim DeChristopher. (Huber, John) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Patrick A. Shea appearing for Tim DeChristopher (Shea, Patrick) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Elizabeth Hunt appearing for Tim DeChristopher as Co-Counsel (Hunt, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Tim DeChristopher. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 4/28/09. (asb) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge David Nuffer: Arraignment as to Tim DeChristopher (1) Count 1,2 held on 4/28/2009, Detention Hearing as to Tim DeChristopher held on 4/28/2009. Initial Appearance as to Tim DeChristopher held on 4/28/2009. Defendant present with retained counsel. Charging document read, rights and penalties explained. Court read the Indictment and the defendant entered a plea of NOT GUILTY.Pretrial Conference as to Tim DeChristopher held on 4/28/2009, Discovery due by 5/1/2009., Motions due by 5/22/2009., Plea Agreement due by 6/22/2009., Proposed Jury Instructions along with proposed voir dire questions 7/2/2009., 5 day Jury Trial set for 7/6/2009 08:30 AM before Judge Dee Benson.Government did not seek detention. Court set conditions of release.Court adjourned. Attorney for Plaintiff: John Huber & Scott Romney, Attorney for Defendant: Ron Yengich, Ret. Probation Officer: Greg Petersen. Court Reporter: Ed Young.(Time Start: 11:53:33, Time End: 12:03:46, Room 246.) (asb) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Certificate of Compliance
                                                                                                                                                                              Second CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by USA as to Tim DeChristopher. (Huber, John) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Certificate of Compliance
                                                                                                                                                                                First CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by USA as to Tim DeChristopher. (Huber, John) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Statement of Discovery Policy
                                                                                                                                                                                  GOVERNMENTS STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY POLICY by USA as to Tim DeChristopher (Huber, John) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ronald J. Yengich appearing for Tim DeChristopher (Yengich, Ronald) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 Summons IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      **SEALED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued in case as to Tim DeChristopher Initial Appearance set for 4/28/2009 11:45 AM in Room 477 before Magistrate Judge David Nuffer. (rlr) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        INDICTMENT as to Tim DeChristopher (1) count(s) 1, 2. Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (rlr) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 272 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?