USA v. Brugnara
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cr-00222-WHA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 15, 2018 at 5:35 PM DT (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M. Newman +1 415 436 6805 +1 415 436 6748 thomas.newman2@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Brugnara, Luke D., Defendant
Officially listed as "Luke D. Brugnara"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Howard Wine +1 415 621 2400 +1 415 575 9930 kenwine@hotmail.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Francisco
Filed 4/3/2008
County San Francisco
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-3
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(1) False Tax Return
Def Custody Status
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (551) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Transcript
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Transcript
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Supervised Release Revocation Hearing
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Judgment
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Docket Annotation
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Docket Annotation
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Docket Annotation
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Statement
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Return of Property/PostTrial
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Continue
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Quash
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Quash
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Quash
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Quash
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release from Custody
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Release from Custody
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Docket Call
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Revoke
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 12/21/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 12/13/2014, Entered: None Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release from Custody
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Criminal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Release from Custody
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Revoke
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Revoke
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Recusal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Bond Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None PS8
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 9/20/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Recusal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 9/14/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Revoke
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Bond Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None PS8
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Bond Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Order Setting Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Bond Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Inspect
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Inspect
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Bond Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Bond Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None CJA Appointment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None CJA Appointment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration DEFENDANTS MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER DENYING REVOCATION OF DETENTION ORDERS by Luke D. Brugnara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Catherine Barrett)(LeBlanc, Brandon) (Filed on 7/9/2014) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement re 319 Order by Luke D. Brugnara (Kane, Robert) (Filed on 7/9/2014) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE RE PHONE MESSAGE FROM ATTORNEY ROBERT KANE as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 7/7/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 06/11/14, before Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting; Tara Bauer, Telephone number (858) 453-7590; echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 11:47 - 12:36. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/23/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2014. (Related documents(s) 293 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 05/30/14, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting; Tara Bauer, Telephone number (858) 453-7590; echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 10:12 - 10:34. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/23/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2014. (Related documents(s) 293 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Erik G. Babcock appearing for Luke D. Brugnara (Babcock, Erik) (Filed on 7/2/2014) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 315 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document as to Luke D. Brugnara (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 314 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document as to Luke D. Brugnara (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 313 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document as to Luke D. Brugnara (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL OF COUNSEL by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara (Kingsley, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/1/2014) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 6/18/2014, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Pence, Telephone number (619) 587-0173, e-mail: james_pence@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2014. (Related documents(s) 292 ) (Pence, James) (Filed on 6/30/2014) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings (Excerpt - Testimony of Luke Brugnara Only) as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 6/17/2014, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Pence, Telephone number (619) 587-0173, e-mail: james_pence@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2014. (Related documents(s) 292 ) (Pence, James) (Filed on 6/30/2014) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DENYING 294 MOTION TO REVOKE DETENTION ORDERS as to Luke D. Brugnara (1).(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014). (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William Alsup:Motion Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 6/30/2014 re 294 MOTION to Revoke Magistrate Court Detention Orders filed by Luke D. Brugnara Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina.) (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 06/16/2014, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2014. (Related documents(s) 291 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 6/30/2014) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 06/03/2014, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2014. (Related documents(s) 291 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 6/30/2014) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins:Motion Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 6/27/2014 ; defendant's motion for reconsideration regarding detention held. Defendant remanded to custody. (Recording #FTR 9:59am-10:44am.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRELIMINARY ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DETENTION as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 6/27/2014. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 302 Response to Motion, UNITED STATES' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REVOKE DETENTION ORDERS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Sprague, William) (Filed on 6/26/2014) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara UNITED STATES' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REVOKE DETENTION ORDERS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Sprague, William) (Filed on 6/26/2014) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter James Pence (Sprague, William) (Filed on 6/26/2014) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Luke D. Brugnara re 295 MOTION for Reconsideration re Detention; [Proposed] Order filed by Luke D. Brugnara Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration Hearing re-set to 6/27/2014 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins.. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/26/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ** CANCELLED - REFILED AT DOCKET ENTRY #301. **TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter James Pence (Sprague, William) (Filed on 6/26/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (djc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration 295 . Hearing reset for 6/27/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara Opposition to Defendant's Last Minute Request to Schedule a Hearing Tomorrow (Sprague, William) (Filed on 6/26/2014) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE 295 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 6/26/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014). (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re Detention; [Proposed] Order by Luke D. Brugnara. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (LeBlanc, Brandon) (Filed on 6/26/2014) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Revoke Magistrate Court Detention Orders by Luke D. Brugnara. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2014 09:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(LeBlanc, Brandon) (Filed on 6/25/2014) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco (Sprague, William) (Filed on 6/25/2014) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter James Pence (Sprague, William) (Filed on 6/24/2014) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn (Sprague, William) (Filed on 6/24/2014) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William Alsup: Status Conference as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 6/24/2014. Further Status set for 6/30/2014 9:00 AM. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Luke Brugnara in Support of 284 Response by Luke D. Brugnara as to Luke D. Brugnara DECLARATION OF LUKE BRUGNARA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S CORRECTED ORDER REQUESTING INFORMATION FROM COUNSEL (LeBlanc, Brandon) (Filed on 6/24/2014) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE STATUS CONFERENCE as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 6/24/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014). (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE 286 DEFENSE COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 6/23/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014). (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney -- MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD; [PROPOSED] ORDER by BRANDON M. LeBLANC. by Luke D. Brugnara. (LeBlanc, Brandon) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara United States' Response to Court's Request for Information (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Sprague, William) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Luke D. Brugnara 277 Order -- DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S CORRECTED ORDER REQUESTING INFORMATION FROM COUNSEL (LeBlanc, Brandon) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings (Excerpt Only) as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 6/17/2014, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Pence, Telephone number (619) 587-0173, e-mail: james_pence@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2014. (Related documents(s) 281 ) (Pence, James) (Filed on 6/20/2014) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ** Correction: This is not a "daily trial" request, it is a request for a transcript from Court Reporter James Pence. **TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial (LeBlanc, Brandon) (Filed on 6/20/2014) Modified on 6/20/2014 (djc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter James Pence (Sprague, William) (Filed on 6/20/2014) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William Alsup: Evidentiary Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 6/18/2014. Witness Luke Brugnara continued. All received exhibits deposited in Clerk's Office. Status Conference set for 6/24/2014 9:00 AM. (Court Reporter James Pence.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William Alsup: Evidentiary Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 6/17/2014. Witness Luke Brugnara called. Further Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/18/2014 8:00 AM. (Court Reporter James Pence.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND NOTICE RE TRIAL SCHEDULE as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 6/19/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014). (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTED ORDER REQUESTING INFORMATION FROM COUNSEL AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 6/19/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014). (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *** PLEASE SEE DKT. NO. 277 FOR CORRECTED ENTRY *** ORDER REQUESTING INFORMATION FROM COUNSEL AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 6/19/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014). Modified on 6/19/2014 (whalc2, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 275 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William Alsup: Evidentiary Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 6/16/2014. Status Conference set for 6/17/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 274 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE RE PROPOSED TRIAL SCHEDULE as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 6/16/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014). (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 273 Filed: 6/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara United States' Objection to Motion to Vacate Hearing (Sprague, William) (Filed on 6/14/2014) (Entered: 06/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 272 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE 267 DEFENSE COUNSEL'S MOTION TO VACATE as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 6/13/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014). (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 271 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RELATING CASE No. 3:14cr306-VC. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 06/13/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement re 257 Notice of Related Case by Luke D. Brugnara -- DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENT'S NOTICE OF A RELATED CASE IN A CRIMINAL ACTION (LeBlanc, Brandon) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER VACATING PRELIMINARY HEARING SET FOR 6/16/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Cousins re 262 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 6/13/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 267 MOTION to Vacate -- DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE JUNE 16, 2014 EXPEDITED EVIDENTIARY HEARING by Luke D. Brugnara (LeBlanc, Brandon) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 267 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Vacate -- DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE JUNE 16, 2014 EXPEDITED EVIDENTIARY HEARING by Luke D. Brugnara. (LeBlanc, Brandon) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 4-29-2014, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2014. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion by Luke D. Brugnara -- DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING (LeBlanc, Brandon) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 06/12/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REQUESTING BRIEFING ON SHORTENED TIME RE: PRELIMINARY HEARING RE: 262 . Brugnara is ordered to respond to the motion to vacate by 2:00 p.m. on June 13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 06/12/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014). (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Vacate MOTION TO CLARIFY DETENTION ORDER AND TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sprague, William) (Filed on 6/12/2014) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins:hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 6/11/2014, remanded to custody. Preliminary Revocation Hearing set for 6/16/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Recording #11:47-12:36.) (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Warrant Returned Executed on 6/2/14 as to Luke D. Brugnara. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter James Pence (LeBlanc, Brandon) (Filed on 6/6/2014) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Debra Pas (LeBlanc, Brandon) (Filed on 6/6/2014) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Related Case in a Criminal Action by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara (Sprague, William) (Filed on 6/6/2014) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ORDER TO AUTHORIZED TRANSCRIBER TO PRODUCE TRANSCRIPT OF FTR RECORD as to Luke D. Brugnara re 246 Order. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 6/5/14. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE William Douglas Sprague appearing for USA. (Sprague, William) (Filed on 6/5/2014) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William Alsup: Supervised Release Revocation Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 6/3/2014. Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/16/2014 8:00 AM. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 253 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 6/4/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014). (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 5/20/2014, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Pence, Telephone number (619) 587-0173, e-mail: james_pence@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2014. (Pence, James) (Filed on 6/3/2014) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 4-29-2014, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2014. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 6/2/2014) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DETENTION ORDER as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/30/2014. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISREGARD. INCORRECT CASE. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014) Modified on 5/30/2014 (rhw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/30/2014 (rhw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley:Initial Appearance re Revocation of supervised release violation as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 5/30/2014. Defendant remanded to custody. AUSA's oral motion to unseal probation form 12--granted. Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing set for 6/3/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Recording #10:12-10:34.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 247 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Probation form 12 by Janie Zhuang as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge William H. Alsup on 5/29/2014 (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014) Modified on 5/30/2014 (rhw, COURT STAFF). (rhw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER TO AUTHORIZED TRANSCRIBER TO PRODUCE TRANSCRIPT OF FTR RECORD as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 5/29/14. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William Alsup: Status Conference as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 5/20/2014. (Court Reporter James Pence.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 244 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Cynthia Stier as to Luke D. Brugnara (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 5/20/2014) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William Alsup: Status Conference as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 4/29/2014. Status Conference set for 5/20/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Probation form 12 by Janie Zhuang as to Luke D. Brugnara for Report on Offender. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 4/29/14. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PAYMENT RECORD CARD : payment of special assess. in the amount of $300.00 paid on 4/14/14 on behalf of Luke D. Brugnara (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 239 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE as to Luke D. Brugnara (1).(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014). (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE [to April 29, 2014]. (LeBlanc, Brandon) (Filed on 4/9/2014) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 238 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING 232 MOTION FOR THE RETURN OF PERSONAL PROPERTY by Hon. William Alsup as to Luke D. Brugnara (1). (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014). (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Luke D. Brugnara re 234 Response to Motion, DEFENDANTS REPLY TO GOVERNMENTS RESPONSE TO HIS MOTION FOR THE RETURN OF PERSONAL PROPERTY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Luke Brugnara)(LeBlanc, Brandon) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER PERMITTING DEFENDANT TO FILE REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RETURN OF PERSONAL PROPERTY. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 12/27/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2013) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 232 MOTION for Return of Property/PostTrial DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR THE RETURN OF PERSONAL PROPERTY; [PROPOSED] ORDER, 233 Order, 234 Response to Motion, by Luke D. Brugnara [PROPOSED] ORDER PERMITTING DEFENDANT TO FILE REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RETURN OF PERSONAL PROPERTY (LeBlanc, Brandon) (Filed on 12/26/2013) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 232 MOTION for Return of Property/PostTrial DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR THE RETURN OF PERSONAL PROPERTY; [PROPOSED] ORDER (Attachments: # 1 A-C)(Bessette, Maureen) (Filed on 12/20/2013) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REQUESTING GOVERNMENT RESPONSE TO 232 MOTION FOR RETURN OF PERSONAL PROPERTY. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 12/4/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Return of Property/PostTrial DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR THE RETURN OF PERSONAL PROPERTY; [PROPOSED] ORDER by Luke D. Brugnara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(LeBlanc, Brandon) (Filed on 12/3/2013) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 231 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT on a Supervised Release Revocation in a Criminal Case as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 10/29/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William Alsup: Supervised Release Revocation Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 10/22/2013. Dft admits charges 3 and 4. Gov't dismissed charges 1, 2 and 5. Progress Report set for 4/22/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William Alsup:Supervised Release Revocation Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 10/8/2013 (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE OCTOBER 22 HEARING AND OCTOBER 30 EVIDENTIARY HEARING as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 10/9/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 227 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document as to Luke D. Brugnara (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins:I.D. of Counsel Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 9/18/2013, Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing set for 10/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Recording #2:08-2:17.) (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Luke D. Brugnara (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins: Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 9/11/2013. Defendant shall submit supplemental to financial affidavit at I.D. of Counsel Hearing set for 9/18/2013 01:30PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (FTR: 11:18am-11:53am.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013) Modified on 9/13/2013 (rhw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 223 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 221 Motion to Terminate Writ of Execution as to Luke D. Brugnara (1).(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 221 MOTION withdraw or otherwise Terminate Writ of Execution by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara (Norris, Raven) (Filed on 8/16/2013) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 221 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION withdraw or otherwise Terminate Writ of Execution by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Norris, Raven) (Filed on 8/16/2013) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Levy and writ of execution executed as to Luke D. Brugnara. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins:I.D. of Counsel Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 8/9/2013 ; defendant's request for appointment of counsel--denied. Attorney Appointment Hearing set for 9/11/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (Recording #FTR 9:59-10:16am/11:06-11:27am.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by Luke D. Brugnara to plaintiff's response 216 to request for recission, or clarification, of writ of execution/application writ of execution (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO RESCIND WRIT OF EXECUTION AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 215 Docket Annotation, 209 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Luke D. Brugnara as to Luke D. Brugnara (1). Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 7/29/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara Request for Rescission or Clarification (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Norris, Raven) (Filed on 7/25/2013) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST for recission, or clarification, of writ of execution/application writ of execution as to Luke D. Brugnara (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to plaintiff's response to defendant's request for appointment of provisional counsel by Luke D. Brugnara (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 207 Order, 186 MOTION Writ of Execution , 211 Docket Annotation, 210 Docket Annotation, 202 Order, (Norris, Raven) (Filed on 7/23/2013) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION (Parker, Charles) (Filed on 7/22/2013) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issued as to Luke D. Brugnara: Clerk's notice of execution and instructions to defendant (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issued as to Luke D. Brugnara: Writ of execution (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for reconsideration for appointment of provisional counsel by Luke D. Brugnara. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Court's order by Luke D. Brugnara (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 207 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION as to Luke D. Brugnara re 206 Proposed Order filed by USA, 205 Proposed Order filed by USA. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 7/18/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re 186 MOTION Writ of Execution by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara (Second Amended) (Norris, Raven) (Filed on 7/17/2013) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 186 MOTION Writ of Execution by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara of Writ of Execution for Issuance by Clerk (Second Amended) (Norris, Raven) (Filed on 7/17/2013) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 186 MOTION Writ of Execution by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara of Writ of Garnishment for Issuance by Clerk (Amended) (Norris, Raven) (Filed on 7/17/2013) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 186 MOTION Writ of Execution by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara (Amended) (Norris, Raven) (Filed on 7/17/2013) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION setting hearing date for 9/25/2013 as to Luke D. Brugnara re 200 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 7/8/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROVISIONAL APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Hon. William Alsup denying 199 Motion to Appoint Counsel as to Luke D. Brugnara (1).(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING IN PART APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 186 Motion Application for writ of execution as to Luke D. Brugnara (1).(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 199 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION for appointment of provisional counsel; request for judicial notice; declaration of Luke Brugnara, declaration of Robert Kane, request to dismiss title 12 based upon gross misconduct by Luke D. Brugnara. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler:Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 6/28/2013 ; defendant did not qualify for appointed counsel. Attorney Appointment (private) Hearing set for 8/9/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (Recording #10:23-10:37.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Charles William Parker appearing for USA. (Parker, Charles) (Filed on 6/20/2013) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler:Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 6/18/2013. Court provisionally appointed Brandon LeBlanc as counsel. Attorney Appointment Hearing and to submit financial affidavit set for 6/28/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (Recording #10:21-10:30.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas:ID of counsel hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara continued on 6/14/2013. Attorney Appointment Hearing set for 6/18/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (Recording #9:50-9:51.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler:Initial Appearance re Revocation of supervised release violation as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 6/10/2013. Appearance entered by Brandon Michael LeBlanc for Luke D. Brugnara on behalf of defendant. Attorney Appointment Hearing, submit financial affidavit and to set supervised release violation hearing before Judge Alsup set for 6/14/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. (Recording #10:30-10:42.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 193 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Luke D. Brugnara to 190 plaintiff's response (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition by Luke D. Brugnara re 189 Probation form 12 (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Returned Executed on 6/6/13 as to Luke D. Brugnara (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Response to Court's May 31, 2013 Order by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 188 Order, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Raven Norris, # 2 Declaration of Manik Bowie, # 3 Proof of Service)(Norris, Raven) (Filed on 6/5/2013) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Probation form 12 by Jennifer J. James as to Luke D. Brugnara for supervised release violation.. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 6/3/13. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION as to Luke D. Brugnara re 186 MOTION Writ of Execution filed by USA. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 5/31/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition by Luke D. Brugnara re 186 application for writ of execution (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2013) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Writ of Execution by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Manik Bowie, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Cas Mar, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Application for Writ of Execution, # 4 Proposed Order Proposed Writ of Execution, # 5 Proposed Order Proposed Clerk's Notice for Issuance by Clerk of Court)(Norris, Raven) (Filed on 5/23/2013) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William Alsup:Motion Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 4/9/2013 re 180 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release MOTION TO MODIFY SUPERVISED RELEASE CONDITIONS filed by USA (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 184 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF SUPERVISED RELEASE by Hon. William Alsup granting 180 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Luke D. Brugnara (1).(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM COURT ORDER by Hon. William Alsup granting 182 Motion as to Luke D. Brugnara (1).(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION re 178 Order MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM COURT ORDER and [proposed] ORDER by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 3/29/2013) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 180 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release MOTION TO MODIFY SUPERVISED RELEASE CONDITIONS, 179 Withdrawal of Motion (Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 3/29/2013) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release MOTION TO MODIFY SUPERVISED RELEASE CONDITIONS by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Declaration Thomas Newman)(Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 3/29/2013) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WITHDRAWAL of Motion by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara NOTICE OF WITHDRAW (Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 3/29/2013) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 178 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE REQUEST FOR SEALING as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 3/28/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER SETTING HEARING RE MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF SUPERVISED RELEASE as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 3/28/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE REQUIREMENT TO COMPLY WITH TERMS OF SUPERVISED RELEASE as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 2/25/13. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR as to Luke D. Brugnara re 174 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 1/2/13. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE MOTION TO CORRECTCLERICAL ERROR by Hon. William Alsup denying 173 Motion for Reconsideration as to Luke D. Brugnara (1).(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for reconsideration Rule 36 motion to correct clerical error by Luke D. Brugnara. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 172 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR OR TO HOLD EVIDENTIARY HEARING denying 169 Motion to Correct Restitution as to Luke D. Brugnara (1); denying 171 Motion to Correct Restitution as to Luke D. Brugnara (1). Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 12/5/12. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to correct clerical error by Luke D. Brugnara. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara RESPONSE TO MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR OR TO HOLD EVIDENTIARY HEARING (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 11/14/2012) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to correct clerical error or to hold evidentiary hearing and supporting memorandum of points and authorities by Luke D. Brugnara. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 168 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 136 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 167 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel as to Luke D. Brugnara(lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 166 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Luke D. Brugnara re 136 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment -judgment of this Court entered Oct. 27, 2011 takes effect this date (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 165 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 136 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Recording as to Luke D. Brugnara's case numbers CR08-0222 WHA (JCS) and CR08-0236 MMC(JCS) held on March 5, 2010, before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Transcriber Stacy Wegner, Email address: smwtyping@yahoo.com; Telephone number: (859) 539-2802. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2011.(djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 163 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELEASE/BAIL PENDING APPEAL denying 156 Motion as to Luke D. Brugnara (1). Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on March 28, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 162 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Kay Brugnara in Support of 156 MOTION Release/Bail Pending Appeal by Luke D. Brugnara as to Luke D. Brugnara (Kane, Robert) (Filed on 3/22/2011) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 161 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibits D by Luke D. Brugnara re 156 MOTION Release/Bail Pending Appeal (Kane, Robert) (Filed on 3/22/2011) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 160 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibits C.4 by Luke D. Brugnara re 156 MOTION Release/Bail Pending Appeal, 157 Exhibits, 159 Exhibits, 158 Exhibits (Kane, Robert) (Filed on 3/22/2011) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 159 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibits C.3 by Luke D. Brugnara re 156 MOTION Release/Bail Pending Appeal, 157 Exhibits, 158 Exhibits (Kane, Robert) (Filed on 3/22/2011) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 158 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibits C.2 by Luke D. Brugnara re 156 MOTION Release/Bail Pending Appeal, 157 Exhibits (Kane, Robert) (Filed on 3/22/2011) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 157 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibits C.1 by Luke D. Brugnara re 156 MOTION Release/Bail Pending Appeal (Kane, Robert) (Filed on 3/22/2011) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Release/Bail Pending Appeal by Luke D. Brugnara. Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Alsup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B)(Kane, Robert) (Filed on 3/22/2011) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 155 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of USCA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 143 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 136 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 4/27/10, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar Bartlett, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_bartlett@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2011.(Bartlett, Sahar) (Filed on 3/3/2011) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Recording (2:04-2:16) as to Luke D. Brugnara held on May 26, 2010, before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Transcriber Stacy Wegner, Email address: smwtyping@yahoo.com; telephone number: (858) 539-2802. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2011.(djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Recording (9:31-10:12) as to Luke D. Brugnara held on May 26, 2010, before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Transcriber Stacy Wegner, Email address: smwtyping@yahoo.com; telephone number: (858) 539-2802. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2011.(djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 136 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 150 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of USCA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 143 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 136 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          USCA ORDER: re the court will not entertain Mr. Brugnara's Sept. 20, 2010 pro se motion for bail pending appeal and his Oct. 29, 2010 pro se supplemental motion. New counsel may submit appropriate motions, etc. as to Luke D. Brugnara (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 143 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. Government's motion for voluntary dismissal is granted. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of USCA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 143 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 136 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER of USCA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 143 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 136 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 05/24/2010, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2010.(Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 144 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    USCA Memorandum as to Luke D. Brugnara re 143 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 136 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 134 Amended Judgment, 126 Judgment in a Criminal Case. Filing fee waived, Government. Appeal Record due by 7/23/2010. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Luke D. Brugnara for proceedings held on 5/24/10, 4/27/10, 5/26/10 (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          USCA Memorandum as to Luke D. Brugnara re 136 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE Vacating Status Conference and Bond Hearing on 6/18/10 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING 138 Motion/ Ex Parte Application to Extend Time To Surrender to Facility Designated by BOP as to Luke D. Brugnara (1). Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 06/14/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Ex Parte Application TO EXTEND TIME TO SURRENDER TO FACILITY DESIGNATED BY BOP by Luke D. Brugnara. (Getz, Brian) (Filed on 6/14/2010) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pretrial Services Form 8 by Rich Sarlatte as to Luke D. Brugnara for Court's information. Bond hearing set for 6/18/10 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 06/09/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by Luke D. Brugnara re 134 Amended Judgment, 126 Judgment in a Criminal Case. Filing fee $ 455 paid, receipt number 34611046611. Appeal Record due by 7/6/2010. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William H. Alsup:Sentencing held on 5/24/2010 for Luke D. Brugnara (1), Count(s) 1s-3s, custody for 30 months on each count to run concurrently, 1 yr supervised release, with conditions, $1,904,625.35 restitution, $50,000 fine, $300 special assessment; Count(s) 1, 2-3, dismissed--defendant sentenced on superseding charges;Count(s) 4s, dismissed on Government's motion. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED JUDGMENT as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg on 5/28/10. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to Judge Alsup from Luke D. Brugnara (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to Judge Alsup from Luke D. Brugnara (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RELEASE ORDER as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/26/10. (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Luke D. Brugnara (1) $1,000,000.00 secured by deed of trust. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/26/10. (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero:Bond Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 5/26/2010 Bond Hearing set for 6/18/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero.Govt request to lift stay granted. Deft to be released Sunday 5/30/10, to custodian Kate Brugnara. (Tape #2:04-2:16.) (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero:Motion Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 5/26/2010, Bond as to Luke D. Brugnara (1) $1,000,000,000.00 (stayed for 24hrs) Bond Hearing and Status Hearing set for 6/18/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (Court Reporter FTR 9:31-10:12) (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealing Order - General Order 54 as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William H. Alsup on 5/25/10. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JUDGMENT in a Criminal Case as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William H. Alsup on 5/25/10. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 125 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Luke D. Brugnara RESPONSE TO THE ADDENDUM TO THE PRESENTENCE REPORT FILED BY THE FEDERAL PROBATION OFFICER (Getz, Brian) (Filed on 5/21/2010) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING denying 118 Motion for Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara (1). Signed by Judge Hon. William H. Alsup on May 20, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 123 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION AMENDED STATUS OF SENTENCING by Luke D. Brugnara. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Getz, Brian) (Filed on 5/19/2010) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 117 Motion for Release from Custody as to Luke D. Brugnara (1). Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 05/19/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 121 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION STATUS OF SENTENCING by Luke D. Brugnara. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Getz, Brian) (Filed on 5/19/2010) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Luke D. Brugnara (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 119 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Luke D. Brugnara re 110 Government's Sentencing Memorandum (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by Luke D. Brugnara. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Release from Custody by Luke D. Brugnara. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 116 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document as to Luke D. Brugnara (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 115 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document as to Luke D. Brugnara (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 114 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document as to Luke D. Brugnara (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 113 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document as to Luke D. Brugnara (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW GUILTY PLEA denying 85 Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty as to Luke D. Brugnara (1); denying 104 Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty as to Luke D. Brugnara (1). Signed by Judge Hon. William H. Alsup on May 3, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Luke D. Brugnara (Getz, Brian) (Filed on 4/30/2010) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 110 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara (Attachments: # 1 Nelson Declaration, # 2 Crowther Declaration, # 3 Tonna Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Schedule 1, # 5 Exhibit Schedule 2a-2g, # 6 Exhibit Schedule 3, # 7 Exhibit Schedule 4, # 8 Exhibit Schedule 10, # 9 Exhibit Schedule 11, # 10 Exhibit Schedule 12, # 11 Exhibit Schedule 13, # 12 Exhibit Schedule 14, # 13 Exhibit Schedule 15, # 14 Exhibit Schedule 16, # 15 Exhibit Schedule AMT)(Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 4/28/2010) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William H. Alsup: Motion Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 4/27/2010 re 85 MOTION to Withdraw Plea of Guilty filed by Luke D. Brugnara. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Luke D. Brugnara REPLY TO UNITED STATES' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL OF GUILTY PLEA (Getz, Brian) (Filed on 4/23/2010) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 104 Supplemental MOTION to Withdraw Plea of Guilty (Attachments: # 1 Nelson Declaration, # 2 Crowther Declaration, # 3 Newman Declaration)(Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 4/19/2010) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: ContinuedDetention Hearing and Continued Motion Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 4/16/2010 re 94 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order of Detention filed by Luke D. Brugnara. Motion DENIED. Dft Remanded to USM pending sentencing. (Tape #FTR: 10:52-11:02.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 105 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document as to Luke D. Brugnara (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental MOTION to Withdraw Plea of Guilty by Luke D. Brugnara. (Attachments: # 1 Transcript 1, # 2 Transcript 2, # 3 Transcript 3, # 4 Transcript 4, # 5 Transcript 5, # 6 Transcript 6, # 7 Transcript 7, # 8 App. for Plea of Guilty- 8, # 9 App. for Plea of Guilty- 9)(Getz, Brian) (Filed on 4/13/2010) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero:Detention Hearing and re 94 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order of Detention filed by Luke D. Brugnara held on 4/9/10. Cont'd Detention Hearing and Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (Tape #FTR 10:43 to 11:00.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in support of reconsideration of order of detention by Luke D. Brugnara (Getz, Brian) (Filed on 4/2/2010) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 101 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document as to Luke D. Brugnara (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: ContinuedDetention Hearing and Motion Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 3/26/2010 re 94 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order of Detention filed by Luke D. Brugnara. Continued Detention Hearing and Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (Tape #FTR 10:33 to 11:02.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ALLOWING FILING UNDER SEAL as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/26/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)**NOTE: Application was filed in CR08-0236 MMC (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO WITHDRAW REQUEST FOR MENTAL COMPETENCY DETERMINATION by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 93 MOTION U.S.' REQUEST FOR MENTAL COMPETENCY DETERMINATION OF DEFENDANT (Bessette, Maureen) (Filed on 3/22/2010) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero:Detention Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 3/12/2010. Continued Detention Hearing and Motion Hearing (Docket No. 94) set for 3/26/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (Tape #FTR 10:36 to 10:59.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 94 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order of Detention (Attachments: # 1 Second Declaration of Roy Torres, # 2 Third SA Martins Decl., # 3 Attachment A, # 4 Attachment B, # 5 Attachment C, # 6 Attachment D, # 7 Attachment E, # 8 Attachment F, # 9 Attachment G, # 10 Attachment H, # 11 Attachment I, # 12 Attachment J, # 13 Attachment K, # 14 Attachment L, # 15 Attachment M, # 16 Attachment N, # 17 Attachment O, # 18 Attachment P, # 19 Attachment Q, # 20 Attachment R, # 21 Attachment)(Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 3/11/2010) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW GUILTY PLEAgranting 91 Motion to Strike as to Luke D. Brugnara (1). Signed by Judge Hon. William H. Alsup on March 11, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration of Order of Detention by Luke D. Brugnara. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Getz, Brian) (Filed on 3/11/2010) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION U.S.' REQUEST FOR MENTAL COMPETENCY DETERMINATION OF DEFENDANT by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1, 2, 3 and 4, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 6 and 7)(Bessette, Maureen) (Filed on 3/10/2010) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO REMAND as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/09/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike & for Scheduling Order by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2010 02:00 PM. (Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 3/8/2010) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William H. Alsup: Motion Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 3/2/2010 re 79 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Declarations in Support Thereof; and Proposed Order filed by Luke D. Brugnara. Sentencing set for 5/4/2010 02:00 PM before Hon. William H. Alsup. (Court Reporter Christine Triska.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara GRANTING GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO REMAND DEFENDANT (Bessette, Maureen) (Filed on 3/5/2010) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero:Bond Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 3/5/2010. Gov't Motion for Remand - Granted. Detention Hearing set for 3/12/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (Tape #FTR 10:51 to 11:29.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 86 Memorandum in Opposition,,, U.S.' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CONDITIONS OF RELEASE (Bessette, Maureen) (Filed on 3/4/2010) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara U.S.' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CONDITIONS OF RELEASE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit Attachment B, # 3 Exhibit Attachment C, # 4 Exhibit Attachmetn C(2), # 5 Exhibit Attachment D, # 6 Exhibit Attachment E, # 7 Exhibit Attachment F, # 8 Exhibit Attachment G, # 9 Exhibit Exhibits 3 thru 6, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 7-1, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 7-1A, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 7-2, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 7-3, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 7-4, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 7-4(2), # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 9(2), # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Bessette, Maureen) (Filed on 3/4/2010) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw Plea of Guilty ;Declarations in Support Thereof; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Proposed Order by Luke D. Brugnara. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Getz, Brian) (Filed on 3/4/2010) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 11-03-09, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Connie McCarthy Kuhl, Telephone number 415-431-2020. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2010.(ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 9-01-09, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Connie McCarthy Kuhl, Telephone number 415-431-2020. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2010.(ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY granting 79 Motion to Substitute Attorney. as to Luke D. Brugnara (1). Signed by Judge Hon. William H. Alsup on March 3, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Luke D. Brugnara ; AND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BRIAN H GETZ IN SUPPORT THEREOF (Getz, Brian) (Filed on 3/1/2010) Modified on 3/2/2010 (lsk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara re 79 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Declarations in Support Thereof; and Proposed Order (Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 2/25/2010) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Substitute Attorney Declarations in Support Thereof; and Proposed Order by Luke D. Brugnara. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Getz, Brian) (Filed on 2/24/2010) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pretrial Services Form 8 by Rich Sarlatte as to Luke D. Brugnara for bail review hearing. Bond Hearing set for 3/5/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/22/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pretrial Services Form 8 by Amaryllis Gonzalez as to Luke D. Brugnara to modify condition of release that dft shall attend mental health counseling as directed by PTS. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/22/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 01/26/2010, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2010.(Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 2/18/2010) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TABACK as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William H. Alsup on February 5, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William H. Alsup:Change of Plea Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 1/26/2010, Plea entered by Luke D. Brugnara (1) Guilty Count 1s-3s. Sentencing set for 5/4/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Alsup. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Luke D. Brugnara (1) $250,000 unsecured. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/18/10. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero:Detention Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 1/28/2010. (Tape #FTR 2:06 to 2:33.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE of Referral to Probation as to Luke Brugnara. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Permission to Enter Plea of Guilty and ORDER Accepting PLEA as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William H. Alsup on 1/26/10. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte:Arraignment as to Luke D. Brugnara (1) Count 1s-3s,4s held on 1/25/2010 plead not guilty, Status Conference set for 1/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Tape #10:47-10:49.) (lsk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Luke D. Brugnara (1) count(s) 1s-3s, 4s. (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Adversary Complaint), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Email with Artwork))(Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 1/6/2010) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine #6 RE: VINDICTIVE OR SELECTIVE PROSECUTION by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara. (Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 1/6/2010) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine #5 RE: DISPROVING DEDUCTIONS by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara. (Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 1/6/2010) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine #4 RE: EXCLUSION OF EVIDENCE by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara. (Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 1/6/2010) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine #3 RE: PUNISHMENT by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara. (Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 1/6/2010) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine #2 RE: LEGAL ARGUMENTS by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara. (Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 1/6/2010) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine #1 RE: GOOD FAITH by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara. (Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 1/6/2010) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL BRIEF by USA as to Luke D. Brugnara (Newman, Thomas) (Filed on 1/6/2010) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING ATTORNEY TABACK'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William H. Alsup on November 5, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2009) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William H. Alsup: Motion Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 11/3/2009. Motion is denied. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William H. Alsup: Motion Hearing as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 11/3/2009. Motion to withdrawal is denied. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document as to Luke D. Brugnara (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 55 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document as to Luke D. Brugnara (rhw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER TO ALLOW EX PARTE MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD TO BE FIXED UNDER SEAL and ordering defense counsel to serve notice of motion as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William H. Alsup on October 26, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2009) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. William H. Alsup: Status Conference as to Luke D. Brugnara held on 9/22/2009. Court granted the defendant's request to continue the trial date. Jury Trial set for 3/1/2010 07:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2010 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER as to Luke D. Brugnara: Jury Trial set for 3/1/2010 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Hon. William Alsup on 9/23/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER EXCLUDING TIME as to Luke D. Brugnara. Signed by Judge Hon. William H. Alsup on September 11, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 421 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?