PC Drivers Headquarters 1 Inc et al v. Lodsys LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-01099
District Judge Lynn Adelman, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 5:21 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PC Drivers Headquarters 1 Inc, Plaintiff
No Logo PC Drivers Headquarters 1Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Renee L Zipprich +1 312 876 1700 +1 312 627 2302

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Cox Smith - Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David G Henry +1 214 462 6439 +1 866 593 1933 dghenry@dykema.com
No Logo Pc Drivers Headquarters, LP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Renee L Zipprich +1 312 876 1700 +1 312 627 2302

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David G Henry +1 214 462 6439 +1 866 593 1933 dghenry@dykema.com
v.
No Logo Lodsys, LLC, Defendant
Unknown Role, Lodsys Holdings, LLC
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/10/12. (cc: all counsel)(dm) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (Joint) by Lodsys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olejniczak, Aaron)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/10/12 granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Lodsys LLC answer due 5/9/2012. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lodsys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olejniczak, Aaron)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
          SUMMONS Returned Executed by PC Drivers Headquarters 1 Inc, PC Drivers Headquarters LP. Lodsys LLC served on 3/19/2012, answer due 4/9/2012. (Henry, David)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
            REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Henry, David)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, David)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Lodsys LLC. (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron T Olejniczak on behalf of Lodsys LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Aaron T. Olejniczak and Ryann H. Beck (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                    DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, David)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (jcl)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                        COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by PC Drivers Headquarters 1, Inc., PC Drivers Headquarters, LP. ( Filing Fee PAID $350 receipt number 0757-1399882) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Zipprich, Renee)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 522 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?