In re: High-Tech Employee Antitrust Litigation
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:11-cv-02509-LHK
District Judge Lucy H. Koh, presiding

Tags
Last Updated November 10, 2017 at 6:20 PM ST (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brandon Marshall, Plaintiff

Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean Michael Harvey +1 510 874 1000 dharvey@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Phyllis Nussbaum +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 848 7745

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Anthony Barile, III +1 646 722 8500 +1 646 722 8501 pbarile@gelaw.com

Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by nussbaumpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda P. Nussbaum +1 212 702 7053 +1 212 681 0300 lnussbaum@nussbaumpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saveri Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Gerard Beebe Dallal +1 415 500 6800 jdallal@saverilawfirm.com
Space Andrew M Purdy +1 415 500 6800 +1 415 395 9940 apurdy@saverilawfirm.com
Space Kevin Edward Rayhill +1 415 500 6800 +1 415 395 9940 krayhill@saverilawfirm.com
Space Joseph R. Saveri +1 415 500 6800 +1 415 500 6803 jsaveri@saverilawfirm.com

Represented by University of San Francisco

No Logo Daniel Stover, Plaintiff

Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean Michael Harvey +1 510 874 1000 dharvey@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Phyllis Nussbaum +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 848 7745

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Anthony Barile, III +1 646 722 8500 +1 646 722 8501 pbarile@gelaw.com

Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by nussbaumpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda P. Nussbaum +1 212 702 7053 +1 212 681 0300 lnussbaum@nussbaumpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saveri Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Gerard Beebe Dallal +1 415 500 6800 jdallal@saverilawfirm.com
Space Andrew M Purdy +1 415 500 6800 +1 415 395 9940 apurdy@saverilawfirm.com
Space Kevin Edward Rayhill +1 415 500 6800 +1 415 395 9940 krayhill@saverilawfirm.com
Space Joseph R. Saveri +1 415 500 6800 +1 415 500 6803 jsaveri@saverilawfirm.com

Represented by University of San Francisco

No Logo Deserae Ryan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Markham Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Janine R Menhennet +1 858 792 5600 +1 858 792 5655 jmenhennet@markham-law.com
No Logo Mark Fichtner, Plaintiff

Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean Michael Harvey +1 510 874 1000 dharvey@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Phyllis Nussbaum +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 848 7745

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Anthony Barile, III +1 646 722 8500 +1 646 722 8501 pbarile@gelaw.com

Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by nussbaumpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda P. Nussbaum +1 212 702 7053 +1 212 681 0300 lnussbaum@nussbaumpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saveri Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Gerard Beebe Dallal +1 415 500 6800 jdallal@saverilawfirm.com
Space Andrew M Purdy +1 415 500 6800 +1 415 395 9940 apurdy@saverilawfirm.com
Space Kevin Edward Rayhill +1 415 500 6800 +1 415 395 9940 krayhill@saverilawfirm.com
Space Joseph R. Saveri +1 415 500 6800 +1 415 500 6803 jsaveri@saverilawfirm.com

Represented by University of San Francisco

No Logo Michael Devine, Plaintiff

Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean Michael Harvey +1 510 874 1000 dharvey@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Phyllis Nussbaum +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 848 7745

Toggle Switch Represented by Girard Gibbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel C. Girard +1 415 981 4800 +1 415 981 4846 dcg@girardgibbs.com
Space Elizabeth Antonia Kramer +1 415 981 4800 eak@girardgibbs.com
Space Christina H Sharp +1 415 981 4800 +1 415 981 4846 chc@girardgibbs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Anthony Barile, III +1 646 722 8500 +1 646 722 8501 pbarile@gelaw.com

Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by nussbaumpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda P. Nussbaum +1 212 702 7053 +1 212 681 0300 lnussbaum@nussbaumpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saveri Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Jennifer Leebove +1 415 500 6800 +1 415 500 6803 lleebove@saverilawfirm.com
Space Kevin Edward Rayhill +1 415 500 6800 +1 415 395 9940 krayhill@saverilawfirm.com

Represented by University of San Francisco

No Logo Siddharth Hariharan, Plaintiff

Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean Michael Harvey +1 510 874 1000 dharvey@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Phyllis Nussbaum +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 848 7745

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Anthony Barile, III +1 646 722 8500 +1 646 722 8501 pbarile@gelaw.com
Space Robert G. Eisler +1 302 622 7000 +1 302 622 7100 reisler@gelaw.com

Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by nussbaumpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda P. Nussbaum +1 212 702 7053 +1 212 681 0300 lnussbaum@nussbaumpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saveri Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Gerard Beebe Dallal +1 415 500 6800 jdallal@saverilawfirm.com
Space Andrew M Purdy +1 415 500 6800 +1 415 395 9940 apurdy@saverilawfirm.com
Space Kevin Edward Rayhill +1 415 500 6800 +1 415 395 9940 krayhill@saverilawfirm.com
Space Joseph R. Saveri +1 415 500 6800 +1 415 500 6803 jsaveri@saverilawfirm.com

Represented by University of San Francisco

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
v.
Adobe Systems, Inc. Adobe Systems, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Salon Internet, Inc.
Officer/Director, OMNITURE Inc.

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Toggle Switch Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Addy VanNest +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 rvannest@kvn.com
Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Addy VanNest +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 rvannest@kvn.com

Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Google, Inc. Google, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald M. Falk +1 202 263 3000

Toggle Switch Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cody Shawn Harris +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 charris@kvn.com
Space Eugene Morris Paige +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 EMP@kvn.com
Space Daniel Edward Purcell +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 dpurcell@keker.com
Space Justina Kahn Sessions +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 jsessions@keker.com
Space Robert Addy VanNest +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 rvannest@kvn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SARAH E. REYNOLDS +1 312 701 7644 sreynolds@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Butler Evans +1 650 331 2000 +1 650 331 2060 eevans@mayerbrownrowe.com
Space Donald M. Falk +1 650 331 2030 +1 650 331 2060 dfalk@mayerbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee H. Rubin +1 650 331 2037 +1 650 331 2060 lrubin@mayerbrownrowe.com
Space Anne M Selin +1 650 331 2000 +1 650 331 2060 aselin@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Owen, Wickersham & Erickson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward David Johnson +1 650 331 2000 +1 650 331 2064 wjohnson@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TWO PALO ALTO SQUARE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward David Johnson +1 650 331 2000 +1 650 331 2064 wjohnson@mayerbrown.com
Intel Corporation Intel Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Intel Corp."
VMware, Inc. Officer/Director, VMware, Inc.
Officer/Director, Clearwire Corp
Officer/Director, New Clearwire CORP
Officer/Director, Intel Capital (cayman) Corp
Officer/Director, Synacor, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cloudera, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vuzix Corp
Officer/Director, Intel Pacific Inc
Officer/Director, Wind River Systems, Inc.

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by George M Garvey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bethany Woodard Kristovich +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 Bethany.Kristovich@mto.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Addy VanNest +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 rvannest@kvn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P Mittelbach +1 213 683 9166 john.mittelbach@mto.com
Space Steven M Perry +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 steven.perry@mto.com
Space Bradley Stuart Phillips +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 brad.phillips@mto.com
Space Gregory P. Stone +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 gregory.stone@mto.com
Intuit, Inc. Intuit, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

No Logo Lucasfilm Ltd., Defendant

Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Pixar Pixar, Defendant

Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

No Logo Attorney Palm Inc., In Re:
No Logo Brad Greenspan, Appellant
No Logo Chris Eubank, Movant
No Logo Christopher Donnelly, Movant
No Logo Greg Garrison, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogue & Belong

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tyler Jay Belong +1 619 238 4720 +1 619 270 2534 tbelong@hoguebelonglaw.com
No Logo Robert Arriaga, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogue & Belong

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tyler Jay Belong +1 619 238 4720 +1 619 270 2534 tbelong@hoguebelonglaw.com
Palm Inc. Palm Inc., Miscellaneous
Officer/Director, Palmsource, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Patrick Smith +1 415 442 1000 +1 415 442 1001 bpsmith@morganlewis.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Office San Jose
Filed 5/23/2011
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County San Francisco
Terminated 9/2/2015
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
511-cv-02509-LHK
Related Cases
512-cv-01262-LHK, 514-cv-04062-LHK, 514-cv-04203-LHK, 514-cv-04422-LHK, 514-cv-04592-LHK
Other Court Cases 14-16528[Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals], RG 11574066[Alameda County Superior Court]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,CLOSED,CONSOL,E-Filing,PRVADR,ProSe,RELATE
  Entries (1332) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1115 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: 12/8/2015 Notice (Other)
NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1114 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015 Certificate of Interested Entities
    Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google Inc.. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1113 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: 9/2/2015 OrderCourt Filing
      FINAL JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/2/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015) **THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THE CASE FILES** Modified on 9/3/2015 (sms, COURT STAFF).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1112 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: 9/2/2015 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part (1068) Motion for Attorney's Fees; granting in part and denying in part (1072) Motion for Attorney's Fees; granting in part and denying in part (1075) Motion for Attorney's Fees in case 5:11-cv-02509-LHK (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1111 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: 9/2/2015 Order on Motion for SettlementCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting (1087) Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1110 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Notice of Change of Address
            NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph R. Saveri (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: 7/24/2015 Status Report
              Supplemental Status Report Regarding Further Communications with Certain Class Member Objectors by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Dean M. Harvey)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 7/24/2015) Modified text on 7/28/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1108 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: 7/24/2015 Statement
                The Joseph Saveri Law Firm's Supplemental Submission Regarding Its Lodestar by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/24/2015) Modified text on 7/28/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1107 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER TO FILE BILLING RECORDS SUPPORTING LODESTAR CALCULATION FOR THE JOSEPH R. SAVERI LAW FIRM, INC. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/20/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1106 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT REGARDING FURTHER COMMUNICATIONS WITH CERTAIN CLASS MEMBER OBJECTORS by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1105 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Status Report
                      Class Counsel's Joint Supplemental Submission Regarding Fees and Costs by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 7/20/2015) Modified text on 7/20/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1104 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: 7/16/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                        ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [1103] Motion for Extension of Time to File (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1103 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: 7/16/2015, Terminated: 7/16/2015 Extension of Time to File Document
                          First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Submission Regarding Attorneys' Fees filed by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri in Support of Motion to Extend Time, # (2) Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1102 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Transcript Order
                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Kimberly Thorpe. (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1101 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                              Transcript of Proceedings held on July 9, 2015, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kimberly Thorpe, Telephone number 408 761-5673. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [1097] Transcript Order, [1098] Transcript Order, [1099] Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 8/3/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2015. (Related documents(s) [1097], [1098], [1099]) (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1100 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Transcript Order
                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google Inc. for Court Reporter Kimberly Thorpe. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1099 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: 7/10/2015 Transcript Order
                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Intel Corp. for Court Reporter Kimberly Thorpe. (Kristovich, Bethany) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1098 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 Transcript Order
                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover for Court Reporter Kimberly Thorpe. (Harvey, Dean) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1120 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1097 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 Transcript Order
                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Siddharth Hariharan for Court Reporter Kimberly Thorpe. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1119 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Response
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 1096 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 Motion Hearing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Motion Hearing held on 7/9/2015 re: [1087], [1072], [1068], and [1075] from 2:27-4:12PM and 4:38-4:58PM. Hearing held. The Court hears arguments from counsel. Two objectors speak at the hearing. Hearing is concluded. Courtroom Deputy: Stacy Sakamoto. Court Reporter: Kimberly Thorpe. Representing Plaintiffs: Attorney Daniel C. Girard (Plaintiff Devine); Attorneys Kelly Dermody, Brendan Patrick Glackin, Dean Michael Harvey, Anne Brackett Shaver, and Joseph R. Saveri (all other Plaintiffs). Representing Defendants: Attorney Gregory P. Stone (Intel); Attorneys George Riley and Christina Joanne Brown (Apple); Attorneys Lee H. Rubin, Robert Addy Van Nest, and Justina Kahn Sessions (Google); and, Attorney David Craig Kiernan (Adobe). (This is a text-only notice; there is no document associated with this entry.) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2015) Modified on 7/9/2015 (sms, COURT STAFF).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1118 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1095 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                Declaration of Kenneth Jue in Support of [1093] Reply to Opposition/Response filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Related document(s)[1093]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1117 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  Order Requiring Hourly Rate Justification for Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/10/16. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1094 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                    Declaration of Dean M. Harvey in Support of [1093] Reply to Opposition/Response filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G)(Related document(s)[1093]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1116 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/23/2016, before Judge Koh. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, telephone number Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (319 in 5:14-cv-04062-LHK) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/13/2016. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 9/14/2016) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1093 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                        REPLY (re [1075] MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards ) filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1092 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                          REPLY in Support of ( [1068] MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award ) filed by Michael Devine. (Girard, Daniel) (Filed on 6/29/2015) Modified text on 6/30/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1115 Unknown Document Type
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1091 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Joinder
                                                              Joinder re [1087] MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Michael Devine. (Girard, Daniel) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1114 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1090 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                  Declaration of Dean M. Harvey in Support of [1087] MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Related document(s)[1087]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 1113 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1089 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                      Declaration of Kenneth Jue in Support of [1087] MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P)(Related document(s)[1087]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 1112 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1088 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Proposed Order
                                                                          Proposed Order re [1087] MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement [Proposed] Final Judgment and Dismissal by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1111 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1087 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015, Terminated: 9/2/2015 Settlement
                                                                              MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 6/29/2015. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1110 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1086 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015 Affidavit
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Kenneth Jue, on behalf of Settlement Administrator, Regarding Compliance With Notice Requirements by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 1109 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1085 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                      Supplemental Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri in Support of [1072] MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards filed by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 2), # (2) Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 2), # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5)(Related document(s)[1072]) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/21/2015) Modified text on 5/22/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1108 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1084 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: 5/19/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                                                          NOTICE by Adobe Systems Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 1107 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1083 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                              Declaration of Kelly M. Dermody in Support of [1075] MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3 (Part 1), # (4) Exhibit 3 (Part 2), # (5) Exhibit 4 (Part 1), # (6) Exhibit 4 (Part 2), # (7) Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit 6 (Part 1), # (9) Exhibit 6 (Part 2), # (10) Exhibit 7, # (11) Exhibit 8 (Part 1), # (12) Exhibit 8 (Part 2), # (13) Exhibit 8 (Part 3), # (14) Exhibit 8 (Part 4), # (15) Exhibit 8 (Part 5), # (16) Exhibit 8 (Part 6), # (17) Exhibit 8 (Part 7), # (18) Exhibit 9, # (19) Exhibit 10, # (20) Exhibit 11, # (21) Exhibit 12)(Related document(s)[1075]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 1106 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1082 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                  Declaration of Dean M Harvey in Support of [1075] MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Related document(s)[1075]) (Glackin, Brendan) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 1105 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1081 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                      Declaration of James J. Sabella in Support of [1075] MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4a, # (5) Exhibit 4b)(Related document(s)[1075]) (Glackin, Brendan) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 1104 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1080 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                          Declaration of Brendan P. Glackin in Support of [1075] MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit F)(Related document(s)[1075]) (Glackin, Brendan) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1103 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1079 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                              Declaration of Brian Fitzpatrick in Support of [1075] MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Related document(s)[1075]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 1102 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1078 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                  Declaration of Daniel Stover in Support of [1075] MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards filed byDaniel Stover. (Related document(s)[1075]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1101 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1077 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                      Declaration of Mark Fichtner in Support of [1075] MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards filed byMark Fichtner. (Related document(s)[1075]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1100 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1076 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                          Declaration of Siddharth Hariharan in Support of [1075] MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Related document(s)[1075]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 1099 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1075 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015, Terminated: 9/2/2015 Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards filed by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 5/21/2015. Replies due by 6/29/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 1098 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1074 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Eric L. Cramer in Support of [1072] MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D (Part 1 of 4), # (5) Exhibit D (Part 2 of 4), # (6) Exhibit D (Part 3 of 4), # (7) Exhibit D (Part 4 of 4), # (8) Exhibit E)(Related document(s)[1072]) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 1097 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1073 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri in Support of [1072] MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of William B. Rubenstein, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4 (Part 1 of 2), # (5) Exhibit 4 (Part 2 of 2), # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6)(Related document(s)[1072]) (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1096 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1072 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015, Terminated: 9/2/2015 Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                          Co-Lead Counsel Joseph Saveri Law Firm's MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards filed by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 5/21/2015. Replies due by 5/28/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/7/2015) Modified text on 5/11/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1095 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1071 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re [1068] MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award by Michael Devine. (Girard, Daniel) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1094 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1070 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Michael Devine in Support of [1068] MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award filed byMichael Devine. (Related document(s)[1068]) (Girard, Daniel) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1093 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1069 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Daniel C. Girard in Support of [1068] MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award filed byMichael Devine. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Related document(s)[1068]) (Girard, Daniel) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1092 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1068 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015, Terminated: 9/2/2015 Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award filed by Class Representative Michael Devine. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2015 01:30 PM before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 5/21/2015. Replies due by 5/28/2015. (Girard, Daniel) (Filed on 5/7/2015) Modified text on 5/11/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1091 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1067 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: 5/5/2015 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [1066] Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1090 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1066 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: 5/5/2015, Terminated: 5/5/2015 Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Robert G. Eisler ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9497218.) filed by Class Plaintiffs. (Eisler, Robert) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1089 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1065 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: 4/29/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Siddharth Hariharan of Change of Firm Affiliation (Nussbaum, Linda) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1088 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1064 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: 4/21/2015 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Siddharth Hariharan for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1087 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1063 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WITHDRAW LETTER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/30/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1086 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1062 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter received by the Court from individual objecting to proposed Settlement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/27/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1085 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1061 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA as to [972] Notice of Appeal filed by Brad Greenspan. Pursuant to Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to file opening brief. This order served on the district court shall constitute the mandate of this court. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1084 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1060 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google Inc. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1083 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1059 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on 3-2-15, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [1056] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2015. (Related documents(s) [1056]) (las, ) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1082 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1058 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Harvey, Dean) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1081 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1057 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1080 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1056 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Michael Devine for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1079 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Calendar amended: re [1054] - Final Approval Hearing set for 7/9/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1078 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1055 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/3/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1077 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1054 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015 Order on Motion for SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [1032] Motion for Preliminary Approval (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1076 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1053 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER SEALING TRANSCRIPT PORTION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/2/2015. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1075 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1052 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [1037] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1074 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1051 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Hearing re Motion for Preliminary Approval of a Class Action, ECF No. [1032], held on 3/2/2015 from 2:10-2:52PM. An Order regarding today's proceedings will be filed. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Courtroom Deputy: Stacy Sakamoto. Representing Plaintiffs: Attorneys Kelly M. Dermody, Brendan Patrick Glackin, Dean Michael Harvey, and Anne Brackett Shaver for Plaintiffs Fitchner, Hariharan, Stover, and the Class; Attorneys Joseph R. Saveri and James Gerard Beebe Dallal as Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel; and, Attorney Daniel C. Girard on behalf of Plaintiff Devine. Representing Defendants: Attorney David Khernan on behalf of Adobe; Attorneys Robert A. Van Nest and Justina Kahn Sessions on behalf of Google, Inc.; Attorney Lee Rubin also on behalf of Google, Inc.; Attorney Gregory P. Stone on behalf of Intel Corporation; and, Attorney George A. Riley on behalf of Apple. (This is a text-only minute order; there is no document associated with this entry.) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/2/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1073 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1050 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter received by the Court from individual objecting to proposed Settlement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/2/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1072 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1049 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: 2/6/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Apple Inc. re [1047] Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Notice of Filing Revised Redacted Documents in Response to Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Unseal (Attachments: # (1) Dermody Declaration and Exhibit A, # (2) Harris Declaration and Exhibit A)(Tubach, Michael) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1071 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1048 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: 2/3/2015, Terminated: 3/23/2015 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of USCA: Petitioners unopposed motion to dismiss the petition for a writ of mandamus pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) is hereby GRANTED. The parties will bear their own costs. PETITION DISMISSED. A copy of this order served on the district court shall constitute the mandate of this court. USCA #14-72745 (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1070 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1047 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: 1/30/2015 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part [991] Administrative Motion to Unseal (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1069 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1046 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: 1/28/2015 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE EXPERT DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting (91) in case 5:14-cv-04062-LHK. Associated Cases: 5:14-cv-04062-LHK, 5:11-cv-02509-LHK, 5:12-cv-01262-LHK, 5:14-cv-04203-LHK, 5:14-cv-04422-LHK, 5:14-cv-04592-LHK, 5:14-cv-04634-LHK (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1068 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1045 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: 1/27/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Mailing of Letter to Attorneys General Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1715 (Tubach, Michael) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1067 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1044 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: 1/26/2015 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING UPCOMING CALENDARED EVENTS. Pursuant to this Notice, the 2/11/2015 Case Management Conference (ECF No. [1022]) is hereby vacated. Furthermore, the pending Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (ECF No. [1032]) shall now be heard on Monday, March 2, 2015 at 2:00 P.M. in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before the Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only notice; there is no document associated with this entry.) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1066 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Calendar amended, re [1043] Order: Pre-Trial Conference and Trial dates vacated. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1065 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1043 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: 1/23/2015 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [1042] Stipulation (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1064 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1042 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: 1/22/2015, Terminated: 1/23/2015 Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES filed by Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1063 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1041 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joinder re [1032] MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof and Request for Modification of Settlement Notice by Michael Devine. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael Devine in support of Joinder)(Girard, Daniel) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1062 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1040 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration in Support of [1039] Brief, re PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Related document(s)[1039]) (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1061 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1039 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief re [1032] MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s)[1032]) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1060 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1038 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Dean M. Harvey in Support of [1037] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Exhibit C and Attachment 1 to the Settlement Agreement filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7)(Related document(s)[1037]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1059 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1037 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015, Terminated: 3/2/2015 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Exhibit C and Attachment 1 to the Settlement Agreement filed by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1058 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1036 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Daniel Stover in Support of [1032] Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Related document(s)[1032]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 1/15/2015) Modified on 1/16/2015 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1057 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1035 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Siddharth Hariharan in Support of [1032] Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Related document(s)[1032]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 1/15/2015) Modified on 1/16/2015 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1056 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1034 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Mark Fichtner in Support of [1032] Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Related document(s)[1032]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 1/15/2015) Modified on 1/16/2015 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1055 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1033 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Kelly M. Dermody In Support of ([1032]) Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 1/15/2015) Modified on 1/16/2015 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1054 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1032 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015, Terminated: 3/3/2015 Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 1/29/2015. Replies due by 2/5/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 1/15/2015) (Hearing Date Approved - sms, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/16/2015 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1053 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1031 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING TRIAL START DATE IN ECF NO. [986]. The Parties shall take note that jury selection and trial will commence on Friday, April 10, 2015 rather than Thursday, April 9, 2015. The following court days (17) are reserved for trial: 4/10/2015, 4/13/2015, 4/14/2015, 4/17/2015, 4/20/2015, 4/21/2015, 4/24/2015, 4/27/2015, 4/28/2015, 5/1/2015, 5/4/2015, 5/5/2015, 5/8/2015, 5/11/2015, 5/12/2015, 5/15/2015, and 5/18/2015. All trial days begin at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only notice; there is no document associated with this entry.) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1052 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Date terminated, re [1031]: 4/9/2015 date removed from the case calendar. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1051 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1030 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying as moot [1019] Motion for Leave to File (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1050 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1029 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re [991] Administrative Motion to Unseal All Papers Associated with Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Declaration of Robert A. Van Nest in Support of Sealing Papers Filed in Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Motion to Compel (Redacted), # (2) Motion to Compel (Unredacted/Highlighted), # (3) Opposition (Redacted), # (4) Opposition (Unredacted/Highlighted), # (5) Reply (Redacted), # (6) Reply (Unredacted/Highlighted))(Related document(s)[991]) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1049 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1028 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' SUR-SUR REPLY. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/26/2014. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1048 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1027 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover re [1023] Order on Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1047 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1026 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: 11/20/2014 Order on Motion to Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order denying [1001] Motion to Relate Case (Arriaga). Signed by Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 11/20/2014. A copy of this Order will be posted in the Arriaga, 14-CV-04656-NC, docket. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1046 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1025 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Order on Motion to Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER [1003] RELATING case Ryan et al. v. Microsoft Corporation, 14-CV-04634-EJD, to In re: High-Tech Employee Antitrust Litigation, 11-CV-02509-LHK. Pursuant to the Order, the Ryan case is re-assigned to the Hon. Lucy H. Koh and all future filings will bear her initials. See Order for additional details. A copy of this Order shall be filed in the Ryan docket. Signed by Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 11/19/2014. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1045 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1024 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh deferring ruling on [991] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1044 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1023 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting [990] Motion for Leave to File.(lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1043 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1022 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 11/18/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1042 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearing re [1022]: Case Management Conference now set for 2/11/2015 at 2:00PM; and, Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2015 at 1:30PM. Both events to take place in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1041 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1021 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement REGARDING DOCUMENT ADMISSIBILITY AND AUTHENTICATION by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1040 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1020 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Sanjay Mohan Nangia for Microsoft Corporation (Nangia, Sanjay) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1039 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1019 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014, Terminated: 12/8/2014 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Motion for Administrative Relief to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related (re [1003] MOTION to Relate Case) filed by Deserae Ryan. (Related document(s)[1003]) (Menhennet, Janine) (Filed on 11/13/2014) Modified text on 11/14/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1038 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1018 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1037 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1017 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: 11/11/2014 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting [1012] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1036 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1016 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: 11/11/2014 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting [1011] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1035 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1015 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: 11/11/2014 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting [1010] Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1034 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1014 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re [1003] MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byMicrosoft Corporation. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1033 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1013 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Microsoft Corporation. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 11/10/2014) Modified text on 11/12/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1032 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1012 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014, Terminated: 11/11/2014 Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (w/ Certificate of Good Standing) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9062048.) filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Tewell, Candice) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1031 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1011 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014, Terminated: 11/11/2014 Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (w/ Certificates of Good Standing) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9062016.) filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Maguire, Robert) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1030 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1010 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014, Terminated: 11/11/2014 Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (w/ Certificate of Good Standing) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9061949.) filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Rummage, Stephen) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1029 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Allison Ann Davis and Notice of Appearance (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1028 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1008 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Victoria L. Weatherford as Counsel for Defendant (Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1027 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1007 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RELATING CASE Wentworth v. Lucasfilm LTD., LLC et al., 3:14-CV-4422, to In re: High-Tech Employee Antitrust Litigation, 5:11-CV-02509. Pursuant to the Order, the Wentworth case is re-assigned to the Hon. Lucy H. Koh and all future filings will bear her initials. See Order for additional details. A copy of this Order will be filed in the Wentworth docket. Signed by Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 10/28/2014. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1026 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1006 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting [1005] Stipulation.(lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1025 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1005 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014, Terminated: 10/27/2014 Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [1003] MOTION to Relate Case filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Schenck, Matthew) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1024 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1004 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Schenck and Fred Plevin on behalf of Microsoft Corp. (Schenck, Matthew) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1023 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1003 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014, Terminated: 11/19/2014 Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Relate Case filed by Deserae Ryan. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Janine R. Menhennet, # (2) Proposed Order)(Menhennet, Janine) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1022 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1002 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Order on Motion to Relate CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting [1000]. It is hereby ordered that 14-CV-04592-NC, Garrison v. Oracle Corporation, is related to In re: High-Tech Employee Antitrust Litigation, 11-CV-02509. Pursuant to the Order, the Garrison case is re-assigned to the Hon. Lucy H. Koh and all future filings will bear her initials. See Order for additional details. A copy of this Order will be filed in the Garrison docket. Signed by Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 10/22/2014.(sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1021 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1001 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014, Terminated: 11/20/2014 Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Relate Case filed by Robert Arriaga. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Belong, Tyler) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1020 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1000 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014, Terminated: 10/22/2014 Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Relate Case filed by Greg Garrison. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Belong, Tyler) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: 10/14/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COUNSEL POSTED DOCUMENT IN WRONG CASE NOTICE of Appearance of Ari Cherniak by Julian Ari Hammond (Hammond, Julian) (Filed on 10/14/2014) Modified on 10/24/2014. Docket No. 998 and 999 in Case No.5:11-cv-02509-LHK were incorrectly filed. These documents should have been filed in related Case No. 5:14-cv-04203-LHK. (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 998 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: 10/14/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COUNSEL POSTED DOCUMENT IN WRONG CASE NOTICE of Appearance of Polina Pecherskaya by Julian Ari Hammond (Hammond, Julian) (Filed on 10/14/2014) Modified on 10/24/2014. Docket No. 998 and 999 in Case No.5:11-cv-02509-LHK were incorrectly filed. These documents should have been filed in related Case No. 5:14-cv-04203-LHK. (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 997 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RELATING CASE Cano v. Pixar et al, 5:14-CV-04203-PSG, to In re: High-Tech Employee Antitrust Litigation, 5:11-CV-02509. Pursuant to the Order, the Cano case is re-assigned to the Hon. Lucy H. Koh and all future filings will bear her initials. See Order for additional details. A copy of this Order will be filed in the Cano docket. Signed by Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 10/6/2014. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 996 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014, Terminated: 10/7/2014 Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Relate Case filed by Georgia Cano. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Sklaver, Steven) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 995 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RELATING 3:14-CV-04062, Nitsch v. Dreamworks, to 5:11-CV-02509, In re: High-Tech Employee Antitrust Litigation. Pursuant to the Order, the Nitsch case is re-assigned to the Hon. Lucy H. Koh and all future filings will bear her initials. See Order for additional details. A copy of this Order has been filed in the Nitsch case, Doc. 12. (Signed by Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 9/23/14.) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 994 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION to ( [991] Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Unseal All Papers Associated with Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel ) filed by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 9/23/2014) Modified text on 9/24/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1013 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 993 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014 USCA OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA. This petition for a writ of mandamus raises issues that warrant a response. Accordingly, within 21 days after the date of this order, the real parties in interest shall file a response. The district court, within 21 days after the date of this order, may file a response if it so desires. Petitioners may file a reply within 10 days after service of the response(s). The petition, response(s) and any reply are referred to a merits panel for oral argument. Upon completion of briefing, the Clerk shall place this petition for writ of mandamus on the next available calendar. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court and District Judge Lucy Koh. USCA #14-72745 (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1012 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 992 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION to ( [990] ADMINISTRATE MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPLICATION OF THE PER SE STANDARD ) filed by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 9/22/2014) Modified text on 9/23/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1011 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 991 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014, Terminated: 1/30/2015 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to Unseal All Papers Associated with Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel)(Harvey, Dean) (Filed on 9/19/2014) Modified text on 9/24/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1010 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 990 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: 9/18/2014, Terminated: 11/19/2014 Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPLICATION OF THE PER SE STANDARD filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to Admin Motion, # (2) Exhibit B to Admin Motion, # (3) Exhibit C to Admin Motion, # (4) Exhibit D to Admin Motion, # (5) Exhibit E to Admin Motion)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 9/18/2014) Modified text on 9/19/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 989 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014, Terminated: 9/23/2014 Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Relate Case Nitsch v. DreamWorks Animation SKG, Inc., No. 14-cv-4062-VC filed by Robert A. Nitsch, Jr. (Dubner, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1008 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 988 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs Reply in Support of [830] Motion for Application of the Per Se Standard filed by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Glackin, Brendan) (Filed on 9/12/2014) Modified on 9/15/2014 linking entry to document #830 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1007 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 987 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: 9/11/2014 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Lisa Janine Cisneros NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Cisneros, Lisa) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1006 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearing, re Order [986]. A further Case Management Conference is set for 11/19/2014 at 2:00 PM; a Pretrial Conference is set for 12/19/2014 at 1:30 PM; and, Jury Selection/Trial is set for 4/9/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. See Written Order for additional deadlines. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1005 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 986 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 9/8/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1004 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 985 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Class Counsel and Non-Settling Defendants' Joint Report REgarding Trial Date by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 9/8/2014) Modified text on 9/9/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1003 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 984 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: 9/5/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CORRESPONDENCE TO THE COURT. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 9/5/14. (lhklc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1002 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 983 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: 9/4/2014 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified text on 9/5/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1001 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 982 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: 9/4/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON PROPOSED TRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 9/4/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1000 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 981 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: 9/3/2014 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 999 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 980 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014, Terminated: 3/23/2015 USCA Appeal Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 54611014973 re [972] Notice of Appeal filed by Brad Greenspan (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 998 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 979 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying [971] Motion to Intervene. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 997 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 978 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting [925] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 996 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearing re [974] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Further Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 995 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 977 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: 8/11/2014, Terminated: 3/23/2015 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of USCA as to [972] Notice of Appeal filed by Brad Greenspan. Order to show cause docket fee due. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 994 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 975 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: 8/11/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Michael Purdy (Purdy, Andrew) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 993 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 976 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: 8/11/2014 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      USCA Case Number 14-16528 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for [972] Notice of Appeal filed by Brad Greenspan. The schedule is set as follows: Fee due from Appellant Brad Greenspan on 08/07/2014. Transcript ordered by 09/08/2014. Transcript due 10/06/2014. Appellant Brad Greenspan opening brief due 11/17/2014. Appellees Adobe Systems, Inc., Apple Inc., Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Google Inc., Siddharth Hariharan, Intel Corporation, Brandon Marshall and Daniel Stover answering brief due 12/17/2014. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (Attachments: # (1) USCA Time Schedule Order)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 992 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 974 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: 8/8/2014 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying [920] Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Adobe, Apple, Google, and Intel. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 991 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 973 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: 8/7/2014, Terminated: 3/23/2015 Appeal Fee Payment Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 990 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 972 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: 8/7/2014, Terminated: 3/23/2015 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Brad Greenspan. Appeal of Order on Motion to Intervene [954] (APPEAL FEE NOT PAID.) (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 989 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 971 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Intervene filed by Christopher Donnelly. Responses due by 8/7/2014. Replies due by 8/14/2014. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 988 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 970 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: 7/23/2014 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Paula L. Blizzard as Counsel for Defendant Lucasfilm Ltd (Blizzard, Paula) (Filed on 7/23/2014) Modified text on 7/24/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 987 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 969 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [956] Notice (Other), Kahn Ex. 2 filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Harvey Ex. 58, # (2) Exhibit Harvey Ex. 63, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. K, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. L, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. M, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. S)(Related document(s)[956]) (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 986 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 968 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re [956] Notice (Other), Cisneros Exhibit YY filed byPixar. (Related document(s)[956]) (Richardson, Chinue) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 985 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 967 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [956] Notice (Other), Leamer Expert Report (October 2012) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Leamer Expert Report (October 2013), # (2) Exhibit Leamer Expert Report (December 2013))(Related document(s)[956]) (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 984 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 966 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [956] Notice (Other), Cisneros Exhibit 711 filed byLucasfilm Ltd.. (Related document(s)[956]) (Richardson, Chinue) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 983 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 965 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [956] Notice (Other), filed byIntuit Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros FF, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros PP, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros 2135, # (4) Exhibit Kahn 7, # (5) Exhibit Shaver J)(Related document(s)[956]) (Tonelli, Roberta) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 982 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 964 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re [956] Notice (Other), of Filing Revised Redacted Documents in Response to Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion to Seal filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros KKK, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros U, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros V, # (4) Exhibit Becker Report, # (5) Exhibit Stiroh Report, # (6) Exhibit Google MSJ, # (7) Exhibit MSJ 32, # (8) Exhibit MSJ 35, # (9) Exhibit MSJ 36, # (10) Exhibit Harvey 86)(Related document(s)[956]) (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 981 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 963 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [956] Notice (Other), of Filing Revised Redacted Documents in Response to Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion to Seal filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 472, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros 608, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros 614, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros 626, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros 1741)(Related document(s)[956]) (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 980 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 962 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [956] Notice (Other), filed byAdobe Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 416, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros 2486 Part 1 of 3, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros 2486 Part 2 of 3, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros 2486 Part 3 of 3, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros 2487, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros 2800, # (7) Exhibit Cisneros A, # (8) Exhibit Cisneros C, # (9) Exhibit Cisneros D, # (10) Exhibit Cisneros F, # (11) Exhibit Harvey 41, # (12) Exhibit Harvey 43)(Related document(s)[956]) (Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 979 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 961 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [956] Notice (Other), Harvey Ex. 143 - REDACTED filed byIntel Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Harvey Ex. 145 - REDACTED, # (2) Exhibit Harvey Ex. 146 - REDACTED, # (3) Exhibit Harvey Ex. 150 - REDACTED, # (4) Exhibit Harvey Ex. 153 - REDACTED, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. 398 - REDACTED, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. 399 - REDACTED, # (7) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. 400 - REDACTED)(Related document(s)[956]) (Sergi, Gregory) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 978 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 960 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re [956] Notice (Other), of Filing Revised Redacted Documents in Response to Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion to Seal filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros R, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros S, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros T, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros V, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros W)(Related document(s)[956]) (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 977 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 959 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [956] Notice (Other), Expert Report of David Lewin - REDACTED filed byIntel Corp.. (Related document(s)[956]) (Sergi, Gregory) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 976 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 958 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [956] Notice (Other), Expert Reports of Manning, Hallock and Marx filed byAdobe Systems Inc., Apple Inc., Google Inc., Intel Corp., Intuit Inc., Lucasfilm Ltd., Pixar. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Hallock (5-10-13), # (2) Exhibit Hallock (10-27-13), # (3) Exhibit Marx (12-11-13))(Related document(s)[956]) (Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 975 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 957 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [956] Notice of Filing Revised Redacted Documents in Response to [953] Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion to Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 608, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros 614, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros 674, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros 1606, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros 1609, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros 2426)(Related document(s)[956]) (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 7/11/2014) Modified on 7/14/2014 linking entry to document #953 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 974 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 956 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Revised Redacted Documents in Response to [953] Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion to Seal by Adobe Systems Inc., Apple Inc., Google Inc., Intel Corp., Intuit Inc., Lucasfilm Ltd., Pixar (Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 7/11/2014) Modified on 7/14/2014 linking entry to document #953 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 973 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 955 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: 7/8/2014 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re [952] Motion to Intervene, by Chris Eubank, Gary Nelson, Brad Greenspan (Elliott-Jones, Cathy) (Filed on 7/8/2014) Modified on 7/14/2014 linking entry to document #952 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 972 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 954 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: 7/8/2014 Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying [952] Motion to Intervene. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 971 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 953 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: 7/7/2014 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [687], [725], [877], [884], [885], [896] Motions to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document; granting in part and denying in part [773], [790] Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 970 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 952 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: 7/7/2014, Terminated: 7/8/2014 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene for Recusal, 60(a), and FRCP 2521 filed by Chris Eubank. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 7/21/2014. Replies due by 7/28/2014. (Elliott-Jones, Cathy) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 969 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 951 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Class Member Deepti Yadlapalli in Support of Proposed Settlement . (Harvey, Dean) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 968 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 950 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: 7/1/2014 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Class Member Paul Richards in Support of Proposed Settlement. (Harvey, Dean) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 967 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 949 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 6/30/2014 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from class member Richard Kuo. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 966 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 948 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings held on 6-19-14, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [942] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2014. (Related documents(s) [942]) (las, ) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 965 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 947 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Final Judgment (Intuit, Pixar, and Lucasfilm). Signed by Lucy H. Koh. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 964 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 946 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Intel Corp. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Mittelbach, John) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 963 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 945 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google Inc. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 962 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 944 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Michael Devine for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 961 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 943 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google Inc. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 960 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 942 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Harvey, Dean) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 959 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 941 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Adobe Systems Inc. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 958 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 939 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 957 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 940 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/19/2014 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 6/19/2014) re [920] MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Siddharth Hariharan, Mark Fichtner, Daniel Stover. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 956 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 938 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: 6/12/2014 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re [920] MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement ) filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 955 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 937 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014, Terminated: 6/20/2014 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION Requesting Entry of Amended Final Judgment filed by Intuit Inc.. Responses due by 6/23/2014. Replies due by 6/30/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Amended Final Judgment)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 954 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 936 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FINAL JUDGMENT (Defendants Lucasfilm, Pixar, and Intuit). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 935 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: 6/6/2014, Terminated: 6/9/2014 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT CONSENT MOTION Requesting that Judgment be Set Out in a Separate Document filed by Lucasfilm Ltd., Pixar. Responses due by 6/20/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment)(Henn, Emily) (Filed on 6/6/2014) Modified text on 6/9/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 934 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: 6/5/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition to ( [920] MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement )filed by Michael Devine. (Girard, Daniel) (Filed on 6/5/2014) Modified text on 6/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 933 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: 6/3/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Mailing of Letter to Attorneys General Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1715 by Adobe Systems Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to Notice of Mailing of Letter to Attorneys General)(Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 6/3/2014) Modified text on 6/4/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 932 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: 5/27/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Antonia Kramer (Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 931 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Christina H Sharp (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 930 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Girard (Girard, Daniel) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 929 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying without prejudice [559], [565], [830], [855] Pretrial Motions; granting [738],[789], [843], [867], [878], [879] Administrative Motions to File Under Seal (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 928 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014 Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting [919] Stipulation Regarding Substitution of Counsel for Michael Devine. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 927 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: 5/22/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Dean M. Harvey in Support of [925] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7)(Related document(s)[925]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 926 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: 5/22/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re [925] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 925 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: 5/22/2014, Terminated: 8/13/2014 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 924 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: 5/22/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Daniel Stover in Support of [920] MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Related document(s)[920]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 923 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: 5/22/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Siddharth Hariharan in Support of [920] MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Related document(s)[920]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 922 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: 5/22/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Mark Fichtner in Support of [920] MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Related document(s)[920]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 921 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: 5/22/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Kelly M. Dermody in Support of [920] MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byMark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6)(Related document(s)[920]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 920 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: 5/22/2014, Terminated: 8/8/2014 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 6/5/2014. Replies due by 6/12/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 919 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: 5/22/2014, Terminated: 5/23/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [918] Notice of Substitution of Counsel, [917] Notice of Substitution of Counsel REGARDING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL filed by Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 918 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: 5/22/2014 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Kelly M. Dermody AND CONSENT ORDER (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: 5/22/2014 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Kelly M. Dermody AND CONSENT ORDER (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 916 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: 5/16/2014 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting [718] Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Awards. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: 5/16/2014 Order on Motion for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting [809] Motion for Settlement. (Attachments: # (1) List of Opt-Outs). (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: 5/16/2014 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letters received by the Court from individuals objecting to proposed Settlement. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 912 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: 5/8/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF IN CAMERA SUBMISSION OF DETAILED TIME RECORDS by Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover re [718] MOTION for Attorney Fees, Reimbursement Of Expenses, And Incentive Awards, [809] MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlements (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified text on 5/8/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 911 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: 5/7/2014 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google Inc. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 910 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: 5/7/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 5-1-14, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2014. (Related documents(s) [908]) (las, ) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: 5/6/2014 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Adobe Systems Inc. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Harvey, Dean) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re [809] MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlements, [905] Proposed Order [CORRECTED] by Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Harvey, Dean) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 906 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re [718] MOTION for Attorney Fees, Reimbursement Of Expenses, And Incentive Awards by Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 905 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re [809] MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlements by Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 5/5/2014) Modified text on 5/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 913 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: 5/15/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/1/2014 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 5/1/2014) re [809] MOTION for Settlement; [718] MOTION for Attorney Fees, Reimbursement Of Expenses, And Incentive Awards filed by Michael Devine, Siddharth Hariharan, Mark Fichtner, Daniel Stover. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/1/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Vacating Pretrial and Trial Dates and Setting Preliminary Approval Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/25/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearing re [904] Order (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 903 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Anne B. Shaver in Support of [902] Notice (Other), filed byMichael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Related document(s)[902]) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 902 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover Notice of Update Regarding Motions for Final Approval, Attorneys Fees and Costs, and Service Awards (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 901 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Requesting Removal from Docket. (Pletcher, Anna) (Filed on 4/24/2014) Modified on 4/25/2014 Attorney Anna Pletcher and party United States of America were added to the docket on 4/26/2013 when counsel posted the Transcript Order (document no. 412) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Kelly Dermody, Lieff Cabraser; Robert Van Nest, Keker & Van Nest; Joseph Saveri, Saveri Law Firm to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: 4/22/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike CORRECTION OF DOCKET [822-8] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: 4/22/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike CORRECTION OF DOCKET [821-10] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 897 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: 4/22/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Errata and Errata to Certain Filings Related to Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike (ECF Nos. 838-2; 825-8; 821-10; 822-8; 807; and 860-1 by Google Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Harvey 112, # (2) Exhibit Harvey 122)(Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/22/2014) Modified text on 4/23/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: 4/22/2014, Terminated: 7/7/2014 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: 4/21/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re [889] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motions in Limine by Google Inc.. (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 894 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: 4/21/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Anne M. Selin in Support of [889] Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motions in Limine filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s)[889]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/21/2014) Modified text on 4/22/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: 4/21/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Christina Brown in Support of [889] Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motions in Limine filed by Apple Inc.. (Related document(s)[889]) (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 4/21/2014) Modified text on 4/22/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: 4/21/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Gregory M. Sergi in Support of [889] Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motions in Limine filed by Intel Corp.. (Related document(s)[889]) (Sergi, Gregory) (Filed on 4/21/2014) Modified text on 4/22/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: 4/21/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Roberta D. Tonelli in Support of [889] Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motions in Limine filed by Intuit Inc.. (Related document(s)[889]) (Tonelli, Roberta) (Filed on 4/21/2014) Modified text on 4/22/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: 4/21/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Lin W. Kahn in Support of [889] Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motions in Limine filed by Adobe Systems Inc.. (Related document(s)[889]) (Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 4/21/2014) Modified text on 4/22/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: 4/21/2014, Terminated: 4/21/2014 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendants' Joint Response to [879] Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motions in Limine filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Shaver Ex. 1- REDACTED, # (2) Exhibit Shaver Ex. 1- SEALED, # (3) Exhibit Plaintiffs' Opp'n to Motions In Limine- REDACTED, # (4) Exhibit Plaintiffs' Opp'n to Motions In Limine- SEALED, # (5) Exhibit Shaver Ex. 278- REDACTED, # (6) Exhibit Shaver Ex. 278- SEALED, # (7) Exhibit Shaver Ex. 279- REDACTED, # (8) Exhibit Shaver Ex. 279- SEALED, # (9) Exhibit Shaver Ex. 281A- REDACTED, # (10) Exhibit Shaver Ex. 281A- SEALED, # (11) Exhibit Shaver Ex. 80- REDACTED, # (12) Exhibit Shaver Ex. 80- SEALED)(Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/21/2014) Modified on 4/22/2014 incorrect selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 888 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: 4/21/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re [879] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [879-15] filed byMichael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Related document(s)[879]) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: 4/18/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE (re [830] MOTION Application of the Per Se Standard ) Defendants' Joint Response filed byIntel Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Sergi Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 3-27-2014 Hearing, # (3) Exhibit Leamer Depo Excerpts, # (4) Exhibit Marx Depo Excerpts)(Sergi, Gregory) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 886 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: 4/18/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Errata and Errata to Revised Redacted Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Lin W. Kahn in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motion for Class Certification by Adobe Systems Inc. re [737] Notice of Filing Revised Redacted Documents in Response to Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motions to Seal , (Attachments: # (1) Errata)(Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 4/18/2014) Modified text on 4/18/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 885 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: 4/18/2014, Terminated: 7/7/2014 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Re: ECF 737-9 filed by Adobe Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014, Terminated: 7/7/2014 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. Responses due by 5/1/2014. Replies due by 5/8/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 883 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION to ( [855] Defendants' JOINT MOTION in Limine ) Correction of Docket # [880] filed by Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/17/2014) Modified text on 4/18/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 882 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014, Terminated: 4/17/2014 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION to [855] Defendants' JOINT MOTIONS in Limine Correction of Docket # [879-2] filed by Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/17/2014) Modified on 4/18/2014 counsel posted document using incorrect event type and failed to linke entry to related document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 881 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Anne B. Shaver in Support of [880] Opposition/Response to Motion Defendants' Joint Motions In Limine filed byMichael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit 1-9, # (3) Exhibit 10, # (4) Exhibit 11, # (5) Exhibit 12, # (6) Exhibit 13-19, # (7) Exhibit 80, # (8) Exhibit 166, # (9) Exhibit 278, # (10) Exhibit 279, # (11) Exhibit 281A, # (12) Exhibit 449, # (13) Exhibit 637, # (14) Exhibit 648, # (15) Exhibit 650, # (16) Exhibit 653, # (17) Exhibit 1871)(Related document(s)[880]) (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 880 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***PURSUANT TO ORDER [953] DOCUMENT REMOVED. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #[883]. *** RESPONSE (re [855] MOTION in Limine Defendants' Joint Motions in Limine ) filed byMichael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/17/2014) Modified on 4/18/2014 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 880 replaced on 7/10/2014) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/10/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 879 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014, Terminated: 5/23/2014 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Anne B. Shaver, # (2)*** PURSUANT TO ORDER [953] DOCUMENT REMOVED. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #[882]. *** , Exhibit Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motions In Limine - Redacted , # (3) Exhibit Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motions In Limine, # (4) Exhibit A, # (5) Exhibit 1, # (6) Exhibit 2, # (7) Exhibit 3, # (8) Exhibit 4, # (9) Exhibit 5, # (10) Exhibit 6, # (11) Exhibit 7, # (12) Exhibit 8, # (13) Exhibit 9, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Exhibit 14, # (16) Exhibit 15, # (17) Exhibit 16, # (18) Exhibit 17, # (19) Exhibit 18, # (20) Exhibit 19, # (21) Exhibit 80, # (22) Exhibit 278 - Redacted, # (23) Exhibit 278, # (24) Exhibit 279 - Redacted, # (25) Exhibit 279, # (26) Exhibit 281A, # (27) Exhibit 637, # (28) Exhibit 1871)(Shaver, Anne) (Filed on 4/17/2014) Modified on 4/18/2014 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/10/2014) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/10/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 878 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: 4/15/2014, Terminated: 5/23/2014 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted Version of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, # (2) Unredacted Version of Declaration of Cody S. Harris in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, # (3) Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to Decl. of Cody Harris ISO Defs. Oppo)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: 4/15/2014, Terminated: 7/7/2014 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Cisneros, Lisa) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re [867] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Application of the Per Se Standard by Google Inc.. (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Anne M. Selin in Support of [867] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Application of the Per Se Standard filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s)[867]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 874 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Christina Brown in Support of [867] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Application of the Per Se Standard filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s)[867]) (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 873 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Gregory M. Sergi in Support of [867] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Application of the Per Se Standard filed byIntel Corp.. (Related document(s)[867]) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 872 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Lin W. Kahn in Support of [867] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Application of the Per Se Standard filed byAdobe Systems Inc.. (Related document(s)[867]) (Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 871 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [867] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Application of the Per Se Standard filed byIntel Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros Ex 6 - SEALED, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros Ex 7 - REDACTED, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros Ex 7 - SEALED, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros Ex 8 - REDACTED, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros Ex 8 - SEALED, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros Ex 10 - REDACTED, # (7) Exhibit Cisneros Ex 10 - SEALED)(Related document(s)[867]) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Roberta D. Tonelli in Support of [867] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Application of the Per Se Standard filed byIntuit Inc.. (Related document(s)[867]) (Tonelli, Roberta) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 869 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [867] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Application of the Per Se Standard filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. 5 - SEALED)(Related document(s)[867]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 868 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re [867] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Application of the Per Se Standard filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. 2925 - SEALED (part 1 of 2), # (2) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. 2925 - SEALED (part 2 of 2), # (3) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. 2928- REDACTED, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. 2928- SEALED)(Related document(s)[867]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014, Terminated: 5/23/2014 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Regarding Filings Related to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Application of the Per Se Standard filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. 2924 - REDACTED, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. 2924- SEALED, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. 2926- REDACTED, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. 2926- SEALED, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. 2927- REDACTED, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. 2927- SEALED)(Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 866 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [825, #8] [825, #9] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 19 - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 865 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [841] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 864 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [807] [807, #1] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 389 - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 863 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [838, #2], [838, #3] [838, #4] [838, #5] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Stiroh Expert Report (Part 1) - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Stiroh Expert Report (Part 2) - Unredacted, # (3) Exhibit Stiroh Expert Report (Part 3) - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [843] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [860], [860 #1] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros JJJ - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[843]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 861 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [828, #10], [828, #11] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Harvey 86 (Part 2) - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Harvey 86 (Part 3) - Unredacted, # (3) Exhibit Harvey 86 (Part 4) - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Harvey 86 (Part 5) - Unredacted, # (5) Exhibit Harvey 86 (Part 6) - Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit Harvey 86 (Part 7) - Unredacted, # (7) Exhibit Harvey 86 (Part 8) - Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit Harvey 86 (Part 9) - Unredacted, # (9) Exhibit Harvey 86 (Part 10) - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) ***PURSUANT TO ORDER [953] DOCUMENT REMOVED.***Exhibit Cisneros JJJ - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros DDD - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros DDD - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/14/2014) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/10/2014) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/10/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: 4/11/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike by Google Inc.. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: 4/11/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. J - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. K - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. K - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. L - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. L - Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. M - Redacted, # (7) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. M - Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. N - Redacted, # (9) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. N - Unredacted, # (10) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. Q - Redacted, # (11) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. Q - Unredacted, # (12) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. S - Redacted, # (13) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. S - Unredacted, # (14) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. T - Redacted, # (15) Exhibit Cisneros Ex. T - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Christina Brown in Support of [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s)[790]) (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Leaner Report Oct. 2012 - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Leamer Report Dec. 2012 - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Leaner Report Dec 2012 - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Leamer Report May 2013 - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Leamer Report May 2013 - Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit Leamer Report July 2013 - Redacted, # (7) Exhibit Leamer Report July 2013 - Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit Leamer Report Oct. 2013 - Redacted, # (9) Exhibit Leamer Report Oct. 2013 - Unredacted, # (10) Exhibit Leamer Report Dec 2013 - Readcted, # (11) Exhibit Leamer Report Dec. 2013 - Unredacted, # (12) Exhibit Leamer Depo. Ex 114)(Related document(s)[790]) (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014, Terminated: 5/23/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTIONS in Limine filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 4/17/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/10/2014) Modified text on 4/18/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Gregory M. Sergi in Support of [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntel Corp.. (Related document(s)[790]) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 853 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisernos 1856 - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Cisernos 1858 - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Cisernos 1858 (part 1 of 2) - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Cisernos 1858 (part 2 of 2) - Unredacted, # (5) Exhibit Cisernos 1859 - Redacted, # (6) Exhibit Cisernos 1859 - Unredacted, # (7) Exhibit Cisernos 2249 - Redacted, # (8) Exhibit Cisernos 2249 - Unredacted, # (9) Exhibit Cisernos 2262 - Redacted, # (10) Exhibit Cisernos 2262 - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntel Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Talley Depo Excpt - SEALED)(Related document(s)[790]) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntel Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Murphy Supp Rpt (June 2013) - SEALED)(Related document(s)[790]) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Anne M. Selin in Support of [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisernos 1855 (Part 8 of 11) - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Cisernos 1855 (9 of 11) - Unredacted, # (3) Exhibit Cisernos 1855 (Part 10 of 11) - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Cisernos 1855 (Part 11 of 11) - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntel Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Murphy Rpt (Nov 2012) Pt 1 - SEALED, # (2) Exhibit Murphy Rpt (Nov 2012) Pt 2 - REDACTED, # (3) Exhibit Murphy Rpt (Nov 2012) Pt 2 - SEALED)(Related document(s)[790]) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 847 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisernos 1855 (Part 2 of 11) - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Cisernos 1855 (Part 3 of 11) - Unredacted, # (3) Exhibit Cisernos 1855 (Part 4 of 11) - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Cisernos 1855 (Part 5 of 11) - Unredacted, # (5) Exhibit Cisernos 1855 (Part 6 of 11) - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntel Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Murphy Rpt (Nov 2013) - SEALED)(Related document(s)[790]) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 845 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisernos 268 - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Cisernos 278 - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Cisernos 278 - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Cisernos 279 - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Cisernos 279 - Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit Cisernos 861 - Redacted, # (7) Exhibit Cisernos 861 - Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit Cisernos 1130 - Redacted, # (9) Exhibit Cisernos 1130 - Unredacted, # (10) Exhibit Cisernos 1376 - Redacted, # (11) Exhibit Cisernos 1376 - Unredacted, # (12) Exhibit Cisernos 1854 - Redacted, # (13) Exhibit Cisernos 1854 - Unredacted, # (14) Exhibit Cisernos 1855 (Part 1 of 4) - Redacted, # (15) Exhibit Cisernos 1855 (Part 2 of 4) - Redacted, # (16) Exhibit Cisernos 1855 (Part 3 of 4) - Redacted, # (17) Exhibit Cisernos 1855 (Part 4 of 4) - Redacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 844 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntel Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Lewin Rpt - SEALED, # (2) Exhibit Lewin Supp Rpt - REDACTED, # (3) Exhibit Lewin Supp Rpt - SEALED)(Related document(s)[790]) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 843 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014, Terminated: 5/23/2014 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lisa J. Cisneros, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 182, # (11) Exhibit 2924, # (12) Exhibit 2925, # (13) Exhibit 2926, # (14) Exhibit 2927, # (15) Exhibit 2928)(Glackin, Brendan) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 842 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntel Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Snyder Rpt - SEALED, # (2) Exhibit Talley Rpt - REDACTED, # (3) Exhibit Talley Rpt - SEALED)(Related document(s)[790]) (Stone, Gregory) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 841 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. NOTE: MAIN DOCUMENT FILE APPEARS TO BE CORRUPTED AND HAS BEEN LOCKED PENDING REVIEW. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Betsey Becker Expert Report Attachments - Unredacted (Part 1), # (2) Exhibit Betsey Becker Expert Report Attachments - Unredacted (Part 2), # (3) Exhibit Betsey Becker Expert Report Attachments - Unredacted (Part 3), # (4) Exhibit Betsey Becker Expert Report Exhibits - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Betsey Becker Expert Report Exhibits - Unredacted (Part 1), # (6) Exhibit Betsey Becker Expert Report Exhibits - Unredacted (Part 2), # (7) Exhibit Betsey Becker Expert Report Exhibits - Unredacted (Part 3), # (8) Exhibit Betsey Becker Expert Report Exhibits - Unredacted (Part 4))(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014) Modified on 4/11/2014 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 840 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Harvey 68 - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Harvey 69 - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Harvey 69 - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Harvey 70 - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Harvey 70 - Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit Harvey 71 - Redacted, # (7) Exhibit Harvey 71 - Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit Harvey 72 - Redacted, # (9) Exhibit Harvey 72 - Unredacted, # (10) Exhibit Harvey 73 - Redacted, # (11) Exhibit Harvey 73 - Unredacted, # (12) Exhibit Harvey 74 - Redacted, # (13) Exhibit Harvey 74 - Unreacted, # (14) Exhibit Harvey 75 - Redacted, # (15) Exhibit Harvey 75 - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 839 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Betsey Becker Expert Report - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Betsey Becker Expert Report Appendices - Redacted (Part 1), # (3) Exhibit Betsey Becker Expert Report Appendices - Redacted (Part 2), # (4) Exhibit Betsey Becker Expert Report Appendices - Unredacted (Part 1), # (5) Exhibit Betsey Becker Expert Report Appendices - Unredacted (Part 2), # (6) Exhibit Betsey Becker Expert Report Appendices - Unredacted (Part 3))(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 838 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 1609 - Unredacted, # (2)***PURSUANT TO ORDER [953] DOCUMENT REMOVED.***, # (3) Exhibit Lauren Stiroh Expert Report - Unredacted (Part 1), # (4) Exhibit Lauren Stiroh Expert Report - Unredacted (Part 2), # (5) Exhibit Lauren Stiroh Expert Report - Unredacted (Part 3))(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014) Modified on 4/11/2014 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/10/2014) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/10/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 837 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Harvey 58 - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Harvey 59 - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Harvey 59 - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Harvey 60 - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Harvey 60 - Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit Harvey 61 - Redacted, # (7) Exhibit Harvey 61 - Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit Harvey 62 - Redacted, # (9) Exhibit Harvey 62 - Unredacted, # (10) Exhibit Harvey 63 - Redacted, # (11) Exhibit Harvey 63 - Unredacted, # (12) Exhibit Harvey 64 - Redacted, # (13) Exhibit Harvey 64 - Unredacted, # (14) Exhibit Harvey 66 - Redacted, # (15) Exhibit Harvey 66 - Unredacted, # (16) Exhibit Harvey 67 - Redacted, # (17) Exhibit Harvey 67 - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Brown, Christina) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Roberta D. Tonelli in Support of [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntuit Inc.. (Related document(s)[790]) (Tonelli, Roberta) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 18 - Unredacted (Part 1), # (2) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 18 - Unredacted (Part 2), # (3) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 18 - Unredacted (Part 3), # (4) Exhibit Harvey 87 - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Harvey 87 - Unredacted (Part 1), # (6) Exhibit Harvey 87 - Unredacted (Part 2), # (7) Exhibit Harvey 87 - Unredacted (Part 3))(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Lin W. Kahn in Support of [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byAdobe Systems Inc.. (Related document(s)[790]) (Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 833 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Lisa J. Cisneros in Support of [830] MOTION Application of the Per Se Standard filed byMichael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) *** PURSUANT TO ORDER [953] DOCUMENT REMOVED *** PLEASE SEE DOCKET #[871]. *** , # (11) Exhibit 166, # (12) Exhibit 182, # (13) Exhibit 223, # (14) Exhibit 597, # (15) Exhibit 1871, # (16) Exhibit 2923, # (17) Exhibit 2924, # (18) Exhibit 2925, # (19) Exhibit 2926, # (20) Exhibit 2927, # (21) Exhibit 2928)(Related document(s)[830]) (Glackin, Brendan) (Filed on 4/10/2014) Modified on 4/15/2014 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 10 replaced on 7/10/2014) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/10/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byAdobe Systems Inc., Apple Inc., Google Inc., Intel Corp., Intuit Inc., Lucasfilm Ltd., Pixar. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Manning 10-28-13 - SEALED, # (2) Exhibit Marx 12-11-13 - REDACTED, # (3) Exhibit Marx 12-11-13 - SEALED, # (4) Exhibit Hallock 5-10-13 - REDACTED, # (5) Exhibit Hallock 5-10-13 - SEALED, # (6) Exhibit Hallock 10-27-13 - REDACTED, # (7) Exhibit Hallock 10-27-13 - SEALED, # (8) Exhibit Hallock Dep 6-7-13 - REDACTED, # (9) Exhibit Hallock Dep 6-7-13 - SEALED, # (10) Exhibit Shaw Dep 7-3-13 - REDACTED, # (11) Exhibit Shaw Dep 7-3-13 - SEALED)(Related document(s)[790]) (Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 831 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 1741 - Unredacted (Part 1), # (2) Exhibit Cisneros 1741 - Unredacted (Part 2), # (3) Exhibit Harvey 91 - Redacted (Part 1), # (4) Exhibit Harvey 91 - Redacted (Part 2), # (5) Exhibit Harvey 91 - Redacted (Part 3), # (6) Exhibit Harvey 91 - Redacted (Part 4), # (7) Exhibit Harvey 91 - Redacted (Part 5), # (8) Exhibit Harvey 91 - Unredacted, # (9) Exhibit Harvey 92 - Redacted, # (10) Exhibit Harvey 92 - Unredacted (Part 1), # (11) Exhibit Harvey 92 - Unredacted (Part 2), # (12) Exhibit Harvey 92 - Unredacted (Part 3), # (13) Exhibit Harvey 93 - Redacted, # (14) Exhibit Harvey 93 - Unredacted (Part 1), # (15) Exhibit Harvey 93 - Unredacted (Part 2))(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014, Terminated: 5/23/2014 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Application of the Per Se Standard filed by Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 4/18/2014. Replies due by 4/24/2014. (Glackin, Brendan) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Daniel Stover Regarding Motions in Limine (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 828 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 172 - Unredacted (Part 1), # (2) Exhibit Cisneros 172 - Unredacted (Part 2), # (3) Exhibit Cisneros 1606 - Redacted (Part 1), # (4) Exhibit Cisneros 1606 - Redacted (Part 2), # (5) Exhibit Cisneros 1606 - Unredacted (Part 1), # (6) Exhibit Cisneros 1606 - Unredacted (Part 2), # (7) Exhibit Cisneros 1606 - Unredacted (Part 3), # (8) Exhibit Cisneros 1606 - Unredacted (Part 4), # (9) Exhibit Harvey 86 - Redacted, # (10) Exhibit Harvey 86 - Unredacted (Part 1), # (11) Exhibit Harvey 86 - Unredacted (Part 2))(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 827 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Harvey 94 - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Harvey 96 - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Harvey 96 - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Harvey 98 - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Harvey 98 - Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit Harvey 101 - Redacted, # (7) Exhibit Harvey 101 - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 826 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Harvey 124 - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Evans 1 - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Evans 1 - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Kahn 3)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 825 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Google Motion for Summary Judgment Brief - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 15 - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 15 - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 16 - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 16 - Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 17 - Redacted, # (7) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 17 - Unredacted, # (8) ***PURSUANT TO ORDER [953] DOCUMENT REMOVED.*** Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 19 - Redacted, # (9) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 19 - Unredacted, # (10) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 32 - Redacted, # (11) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 32 - Unredacted, # (12) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 33, # (13) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 34 - Redacted, # (14) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 34 - Unredacted, # (15) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 35 - Redacted, # (16) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 35 - Unredacted, # (17) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 36 - Redacted, # (18) Exhibit Google MSJ Exhibit 36 - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014) (Attachment 8 replaced on 7/10/2014) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/10/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 824 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Joint and Individual Motions for Summary Judgment [Redacted] filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s)[790]) (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 823 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Harvey 129 - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Harvey 130 - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Harvey 130 - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Harvey 131 - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Harvey 131 - Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit Harvey 132 - Redacted, # (7) Exhibit Harvey 132 - Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit Harvey 133 - Redacted, # (9) Exhibit Harvey 133 - Unredacted, # (10) Exhibit Harvey 134 - Redacted, # (11) Exhibit Harvey 134 - Unredacted, # (12) Exhibit Harvey 135 - Redacted, # (13) Exhibit Harvey 135 - Unredacted, # (14) Exhibit Harvey 136 - Redacted, # (15) Exhibit Harvey 136 - Unredacted, # (16) Exhibit Harvey 137 - Redacted, # (17) Exhibit Harvey 137 - Unredacted, # (18) Exhibit Harvey 138 - Redacted, # (19) Exhibit Harvey 138 - Unredacted, # (20) Exhibit Harvey 139 - Redacted, # (21) Exhibit Harvey 139 - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Harvey 118 - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Harvey 119 - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Harvey 119 - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Harvey 120 - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Harvey 120 - Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit Harvey 121 - Redacted, # (7) Exhibit Harvey 121 - Unredacted, # (8)***PURSUANT TO ORDER [953] DOCUMENT REMOVED.*** Exhibit Harvey 122 - Redacted, # (9) Exhibit Harvey 122 - Unredacted, # (10) Exhibit Harvey 123 - Redacted, # (11) Exhibit Harvey 123 - Unredacted, # (12) Exhibit Harvey 125 - Redacted, # (13) Exhibit Harvey 125 - Unredacted, # (14) Exhibit Harvey 126 - Redacted, # (15) Exhibit Harvey 126 - Unredacted, # (16) Exhibit Harvey 127 - Redacted, # (17) Exhibit Harvey 127 - Unredacted, # (18) Exhibit Harvey 128 - Redacted, # (19) Exhibit Harvey 128 - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014) (Attachment 8 replaced on 7/10/2014) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/10/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Harvey 103 - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Harvey 106 - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Harvey 106 - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Harvey 108 - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Harvey 108 - Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit Harvey 110 - Redacted, # (7) Exhibit Harvey 110 - Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit Harvey 111 - Redacted, # (9) Exhibit Harvey 111 - Unredacted, # (10)***PURSUANT TO ORDER [953] DOCUMENT REMOVED.*** Exhibit Harvey 112 - Redacted, # (11) Exhibit Harvey 112 - Unredacted, # (12) Exhibit Harvey 113 - Redacted, # (13) Exhibit Harvey 113 - Unredacted, # (14) Exhibit Harvey 114 - Redacted, # (15) Exhibit Harvey 114 - Unredacted, # (16) Exhibit Harvey 115 - Redacted, # (17) Exhibit Harvey 115 - Unredacted, # (18) Exhibit Harvey 117 - Redacted, # (19) Exhibit Harvey 117 - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014) (Attachment 10 replaced on 7/10/2014) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/10/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 820 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Harvey 76 - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Harvey 77 - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Harvey 77 - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Harvey 78 - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Harvey 78 - Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit Harvey 80 - Redacted, # (7) Exhibit Harvey 80 - Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit Harvey 85 - Redacted, # (9) Exhibit Harvey 85 - Unredacted, # (10) Exhibit Harvey 89 - Redacted, # (11) Exhibit Harvey 89 - Unredacted, # (12) Exhibit Harvey 90 - Redacted, # (13) Exhibit Harvey 90 - Unredacted, # (14) Exhibit Harvey 95 - Redacted, # (15) Exhibit Harvey 95 - Unredacted, # (16) Exhibit Harvey 97 - Redacted, # (17) Exhibit Harvey 97 - Unredacted, # (18) Exhibit Harvey 100 - Redacted, # (19) Exhibit Harvey 100 - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros U - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros V - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros V - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros W - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros W - Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros X - Redacted, # (7) Exhibit Cisneros X - Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit Cisneros Z - Redacted, # (9) Exhibit Cisneros Z - Unredacted, # (10) Exhibit Cisneros BB - Redacted, # (11) Exhibit Cisneros BB - Unredacted, # (12) Exhibit Cisneros CC - Redacted, # (13) Exhibit Cisneros CC - Unredacted, # (14) Exhibit Cisneros DD - Redacted, # (15) Exhibit Cisneros DD - Unredacted, # (16) Exhibit Cisneros JJ - Redacted, # (17) Exhibit Cisneros JJ - Unredacted, # (18) Exhibit Cisneros LL - Redacted, # (19) Exhibit Cisneros LL - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 818 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 2422 - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros 2425 - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros 2425 - Unredacted (Part 1), # (4) Exhibit Cisneros 2425 - Unredacted (Part 2), # (5) Exhibit Cisneros 2425 - Unredacted (Part 3), # (6) Exhibit Cisneros 2425 - Unredacted (Part 4), # (7) Exhibit Cisneros 2425 - Unredacted (Part 5), # (8) Exhibit Cisneros 2426 - Redacted, # (9) Exhibit Cisneros 2426 - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 1618 - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros 1625 - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros 1625 - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros 1629 - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros 1629 - Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros 1753 - Redacted, # (7) Exhibit Cisneros 1753 - Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit Cisneros 2362 - Redacted, # (9) Exhibit Cisneros 2362 - Unredacted (Part 1), # (10) Exhibit Cisneros 2362 - Unredacted (Part 2), # (11) Exhibit Cisneros 2362 - Unredacted (Part 3), # (12) Exhibit Cisneros 2362 - Unredacted (Part 4), # (13) Exhibit Cisneros 2364 - Redacted, # (14) Exhibit Cisneros 2364 - Unredacted (Part 1), # (15) Exhibit Cisneros 2364 - Unredacted (Part 2), # (16) Exhibit Cisneros 2364 - Unredacted (Part 3), # (17) Exhibit Cisneros 2366 - Redacted, # (18) Exhibit Cisneros 2366 - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike [Ex. 1304 Redacted] filed byPixar. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1304 Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit 1306 Redacted, # (3) Exhibit 1306 Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit 1307 Redacted, # (5) Exhibit 1307 Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit 1308 Redacted, # (7) Exhibit 1308 Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit 1309 Redacted, # (9) Exhibit 1309 Unredacted, # (10) Exhibit 2356 Redacted, # (11) Exhibit 2356 Unredacted (Part 1), # (12) Exhibit 2356 Unredacted (Part 2), # (13) Exhibit XX Redacted, # (14) Exhibit XX Unredacted, # (15) Exhibit YY Redacted, # (16) Exhibit YY Unredacted, # (17) Exhibit ZZ Redacted, # (18) Exhibit ZZ Unredacted, # (19) Exhibit AAA Redacted, # (20) Exhibit AAA Unredacted, # (21) Exhibit BBB Redacted, # (22) Exhibit BBB Unredacted, # (23) Exhibit CCC Redacted, # (24) Exhibit CCC Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Richardson, Chinue) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntuit Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Harvey 157 - SEALED, # (2) Exhibit Harvey 159 - REDACTED, # (3) Exhibit Harvey 159 - SEALED)(Related document(s)[790]) (Tonelli, Roberta) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 650 - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros 653 - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros 653 - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros 660 - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros 660 - Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros 666 - Redacted, # (7) Exhibit Cisneros 666 - Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit Cisneros 667 - Redacted, # (9) Exhibit Cisneros 667 - Unredacted, # (10) Exhibit Cisneros 668 - Redacted, # (11) Exhibit Cisneros 668 - Unredacted, # (12) Exhibit Cisneros 674 - Redacted, # (13) Exhibit Cisneros 674 - Unredacted, # (14) Exhibit Cisneros 872 - Redacted, # (15) Exhibit Cisneros 872 - Unredacted, # (16) Exhibit Cisneros 1600 - Redacted, # (17) Exhibit Cisneros 1600 - Unredacted, # (18) Exhibit Cisneros 1613 - Redacted, # (19) Exhibit Cisneros 1613 - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntuit Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 2739 part 7 - SEALED, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros 2739 part 8 - SEALED, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros 2740 - REDACTED, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros 2740 part 1 - SEALED, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros 2740 part 2 - SEALED, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros 2740 part 3 - SEALED, # (7) Exhibit Cisneros 2743 - REDACTED, # (8) Exhibit Cisneros 2743 - SEALED, # (9) Exhibit Cisneros 2744 - REDACTED, # (10) Exhibit Cisneros 2744 - SEALED)(Related document(s)[790]) (Tonelli, Roberta) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 812 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re [809] MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlements by Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Brandon Marshall, Daniel Stover. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byAdobe Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Harvey 34 - SEALED, # (2) Exhibit Harvey 35 - REDACTED, # (3) Exhibit Harvey 35 - SEALED, # (4) Exhibit Harvey 37 - REDACTED, # (5) Exhibit Harvey 37 - SEALED, # (6) Exhibit Harvey 41 - REDACTED, # (7) Exhibit Harvey 41 - SEALED, # (8) Exhibit Harvey 42 - REDACTED, # (9) Exhibit Harvey 42 - SEALED, # (10) Exhibit Harvey 43 - REDACTED, # (11) Exhibit Harvey 43 - SEALED, # (12) Exhibit Harvey 44 - REDACTED, # (13) Exhibit Harvey 44 - SEALED, # (14) Exhibit Harvey 45 - REDACTED, # (15) Exhibit Harvey 45 - SEALED, # (16) Exhibit Harvey 47 - REDACTED, # (17) Exhibit Harvey 47 - SEALED, # (18) Exhibit Harvey 48 - REDACTED, # (19) Exhibit Harvey 48 - SEALED, # (20) Exhibit Harvey 49 - REDACTED, # (21) Exhibit Harvey 49 - SEALED, # (22) Exhibit Harvey 50 - REDACTED, # (23) Exhibit Harvey 50 - SEALED, # (24) Exhibit Harvey 51 - REDACTED, # (25) Exhibit Harvey 51 - SEALED, # (26) Exhibit Harvey 52 - REDACTED, # (27) Exhibit Harvey 52 - SEALED, # (28) Exhibit Harvey 53 - REDACTED, # (29) Exhibit Harvey 53 - SEALED, # (30) Exhibit Harvey 54 - REDACTED, # (31) Exhibit Harvey 54 - SEALED Part 1, # (32) Exhibit Harvey 54 - SEALED Part 2, # (33) Exhibit Harvey 189 REDACTED, # (34) Exhibit Harvey 189 SEALED)(Related document(s)[790]) (Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Anne Shaver in Support of [809] MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlements filed byMichael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Brandon Marshall, Daniel Stover. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5)(Related document(s)[809]) (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 809 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014, Terminated: 5/16/2014 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlements; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Michael Devine, Mark Fichtner, Siddharth Hariharan, Brandon Marshall, Daniel Stover. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 4/24/2014. Replies due by 5/1/2014. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 4/10/2014) Modified text on 5/6/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 808 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntuit Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 2738 - SEALED, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros 2739 part 1 - REDACTED, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros 2739 part 2 - REDACTED, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros 2739 part 1 - SEALED, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros 2739 part 2 - SEALED, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros 2739 part 3 - SEALED, # (7) Exhibit Cisneros 2739 part 4 - SEALED, # (8) Exhibit Cisneros 2739 part 5 - SEALED)(Related document(s)[790]) (Tonelli, Roberta) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) ***PURSUANT TO ORDER [953] DOCUMENT REMOVED.***Exhibit Cisneros 389 - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros 471 - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros 471 - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros 472 - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros 472 - Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros 608 - Redacted, # (7) Exhibit Cisneros 608 - Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit Cisneros 614 - Redacted, # (9) Exhibit Cisneros 614 - Unredacted, # (10) Exhibit Cisneros 616 - Redacted, # (11) Exhibit Cisneros 616 - Unredacted, # (12) Exhibit Cisneros 621 - Redacted, # (13) Exhibit Cisneros 621 - Unredacted, # (14) Exhibit Cisneros 626 - Redacted, # (15) Exhibit Cisneros 626 - Unredacted, # (16) Exhibit Cisneros 635 - Redacted, # (17) Exhibit Cisneros 635 - Unredacted, # (18) Exhibit Cisneros 648 - Redacted, # (19) Exhibit Cisneros 648 - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/10/2014) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/10/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 806 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike [Ex. 129 Redacted] filed byPixar. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 129 Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit 134 Redacted, # (3) Exhibit 134 Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit 172 Redacted, # (5) Exhibit 172 Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit 177 Redacted, # (7) Exhibit 177 Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit 178 Redacted, # (9) Exhibit 178 Unredacted, # (10) Exhibit 179 Redacted, # (11) Exhibit 179 Unredacted, # (12) Exhibit 180 Redacted, # (13) Exhibit 180 Unredacted, # (14) Exhibit 420 Redacted, # (15) Exhibit 420 Unredacted, # (16) Exhibit 421 Redacted, # (17) Exhibit 421 Unredacted, # (18) Exhibit 424 Redacted, # (19) Exhibit 424 Unredacted, # (20) Exhibit 947 Redacted, # (21) Exhibit 947 Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Richardson, Chinue) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 173 - Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros 175 - Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros175 - Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros 176 - Redacted, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros 176 - Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros 190 - Redacted, # (7) Exhibit Cisneros 190 - Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit Cisneros 192 - Redacted, # (9) Exhibit Cisneros 192 - Unredacted, # (10) Exhibit Cisneros 200 - Redacted, # (11) Exhibit Cisneros 200 - Unredacted, # (12) Exhibit Cisneros 201 - Redacted, # (13) Exhibit Cisneros 201 - Unredacted, # (14) Exhibit Cisneros 204 - Redacted, # (15) Exhibit Cisneros 204 - Unredacted, # (16) Exhibit Cisneros 278 - Redacted, # (17) Exhibit Cisneros 278 - Unredacted, # (18) Exhibit Cisneros 279 - Redacted, # (19) Exhibit Cisneros 279 - Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Selin, Anne) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byAdobe Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 2487 - SEALED Part 1, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros 2487 - SEALED Part 2, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros 2501 - REDACTED, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros 2501 - SEALED, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros 2800 - REDACTED, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros 2800 - SEALED, # (7) Exhibit Cisneros 2812 - REDACTED, # (8) Exhibit Cisneros 2812 - SEALED, # (9) Exhibit Cisneros 2823 - REDACTED, # (10) Exhibit Cisneros 2823 - SEALED, # (11) Exhibit Cisneros 2825 - REDACTED, # (12) Exhibit Cisneros 2825 - SEALED, # (13) Exhibit Cisneros A - REDACTED, # (14) Exhibit Cisneros A - SEALED, # (15) Exhibit Cisneros B - REDACTED, # (16) Exhibit Cisneros B - SEALED, # (17) Exhibit Cisneros C - REDACTED, # (18) Exhibit Cisneros C - SEALED, # (19) Exhibit Cisneros D - REDACTED, # (20) Exhibit Cisneros D - SEALED, # (21) Exhibit Cisneros F - REDACTED, # (22) Exhibit Cisneros F - SEALED)(Related document(s)[790]) (Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntuit Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 2362 part 1 - SEALED, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros 2362 part 2 - SEALED, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros 2362 part 3 - SEALED, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros 2364 - REDACTED, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros 2364 part 1 - SEALED, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros 2364 part 2 - SEALED, # (7) Exhibit Cisneros 2364 part 3 - SEALED, # (8) Exhibit Cisneros 2364 part 4 - SEALED, # (9) Exhibit Cisneros 2366 - REDACTED, # (10) Exhibit Cisneros 2366 - SEALED)(Related document(s)[790]) (Tonelli, Roberta) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike [Ex. 945 Redacted] filed byLucasfilm Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 945 Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit 959 Redacted, # (3) Exhibit 959 Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit 2084 Redacted, # (5) Exhibit 2084 Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit 2088 Redacted, # (7) Exhibit 2088 Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit 2092 Redacted, # (9) Exhibit 2092 Unredacted, # (10) Exhibit 2094 Redacted, # (11) Exhibit 2094 Unredacted, # (12) Exhibit 2096 Redacted, # (13) Exhibit 2096 Unredacted, # (14) Exhibit 2100 Redacted, # (15) Exhibit 2100 Unredacted, # (16) Exhibit RR Redacted, # (17) Exhibit RR Unredacted, # (18) Exhibit SS Redacted, # (19) Exhibit SS Unredacted, # (20) Exhibit TT Redacted, # (21) Exhibit TT Unredacted, # (22) Exhibit UU Redacted, # (23) Exhibit UU Unredacted, # (24) Exhibit VV Redacted, # (25) Exhibit VV Unredacted, # (26) Exhibit WW Redacted, # (27) Exhibit WW Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Richardson, Chinue) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byAdobe Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 2486 - REDACTED Part 2, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros 2486 - REDACTED Part 3, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros 2486 - SEALED Part 1, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros 2486 - SEALED Part 2, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros 2486 - SEALED Part 3, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros 2486 - SEALED Part 4)(Related document(s)[790]) (Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntuit Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 1107 - SEALED, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros 1760 - REDACTED, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros 1760 - SEALED, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros 1761 - REDACTED, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros 1761 - SEALED, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros 2135 - REDACTED, # (7) Exhibit Cisneros 2135 Part 1 of 2 - SEALED, # (8) Exhibit Cisneros 2135 Part 2 of 2 - SEALED, # (9) Exhibit Cisneros 2140 - REDACTED, # (10) Exhibit Cisneros 2140 - SEALED, # (11) Exhibit Cisneros 2142 - REDACTED, # (12) Exhibit Cisneros 2142 - SEALED)(Related document(s)[790]) (Tonelli, Roberta) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byAdobe Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros 210 - SEALED, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros 211 - REDACTED, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros 211 - SEALED, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros 212 - REDACTED, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros 212 - SEALED, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros 214 - REDACTED, # (7) Exhibit Cisneros 214 - SEALED, # (8) Exhibit Cisneros 216 - REDACTED, # (9) Exhibit Cisneros 216 - SEALED, # (10) Exhibit Cisneros 300 - REDACTED, # (11) Exhibit Cisneros 300 - SEALED, # (12) Exhibit Cisneros 303 - REDACTED, # (13) Exhibit Cisneros 303 - SEALED, # (14) Exhibit Cisneros 416 - REDACTED, # (15) Exhibit Cisneros 416 - SEALED, # (16) Exhibit Cisneros 1158 - REDACTED, # (17) Exhibit Cisneros 1158 - SEALED, # (18) Exhibit Cisneros 1159 - REDACTED, # (19) Exhibit Cisneros 1159 - SEALED, # (20) Exhibit Cisneros 1160 - REDACTED, # (21) Exhibit Cisneros 1160 - SEALED, # (22) Exhibit Cisneros 1250 - REDACTED, # (23) Exhibit Cisneros 1250 - SEALED)(Related document(s)[790]) (Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntel Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2043 (UNREDACTED), # (2) Exhibit 2356 (REDACTED), # (3) Exhibit 2356, PT. 1 (UNREDACTED), # (4) Exhibit 2356, PT. 2 (UNREDACTED), # (5) Exhibit 2356, PT. 3 (UNREDACTED), # (6) Exhibit HH (REDACTED), # (7) Exhibit HH (UNREDACTED))(Related document(s)[790]) (Mittelbach, John) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntuit Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cisneros MM - SEALED, # (2) Exhibit Cisneros PP - REDACTED, # (3) Exhibit Cisneros PP - SEALED, # (4) Exhibit Cisneros QQ - REDACTED, # (5) Exhibit Cisneros QQ - SEALED, # (6) Exhibit Cisneros 912 - REDACTED, # (7) Exhibit Cisneros 912 - SEALED, # (8) Exhibit Cisneros 914 - REDACTED, # (9) Exhibit Cisneros 914 - SEALED)(Related document(s)[790]) (Tonelli, Roberta) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntel Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) 2030, PT. 3 (UNREDACTED), # (2) 2030, PT. 4 (REDACTED), # (3) 2030, PT. 4 (UNREDACTED), # (4) 2031 (REDACTED), # (5) 2031 (UNREDACTED), # (6) 2033 (REDACTED), # (7) 2033 (UNREDACTED), # (8) 2035 (REDACTED), # (9) 2035 (UNREDACTED))(Related document(s)[790]) (Mittelbach, John) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntel Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) 399 (UNREDACTED), # (2) 400 (REDACTED), # (3) 400 (UNREDACTED), # (4) 478 (REDACTED), # (5) 478 (UNREDACTED), # (6) 781 (REDACTED), # (7) 781 (UNREDACTED), # (8) 2030, PT. 1 (REDACTED), # (9) 2030, PT. 1 (UNREDACTED), # (10) 2030, PT. 2 (REDACTED), # (11) 2030, PT. 2 (UNREDACTED))(Related document(s)[790]) (Mittelbach, John) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike [Ex. 8 Redacted] filed byLucasfilm Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 8 Unredacted, # (2) Exhibit 163 Redacted, # (3) Exhibit 163 Unredacted, # (4) Exhibit 170 Redacted, # (5) Exhibit 170 Unredacted, # (6) Exhibit 171 Redacted, # (7) Exhibit 171 Unredacted, # (8) Exhibit 359 Redacted, # (9) Exhibit 359 Unredacted, # (10) Exhibit 360 Redacted, # (11) Exhibit 360 Unredacted, # (12) Exhibit 690 Redacted, # (13) Exhibit 690 Unredacted, # (14) Exhibit 710 Redacted, # (15) Exhibit 710 Unredacted, # (16) Exhibit 711 Redacted, # (17) Exhibit 711 Unredacted (Part 1), # (18) Exhibit 711 Unredacted (Part 2), # (19) Exhibit 715 Redacted, # (20) Exhibit 715 Unredacted, # (21) Exhibit 727 Redacted, # (22) Exhibit 727 Unredacted, # (23) Exhibit 728 Redacted, # (24) Exhibit 728 Unredacted, # (25) Exhibit 729 Redacted, # (26) Exhibit 729 Unredacted, # (27) Exhibit 730 Redacted, # (28) Exhibit 730 Unredacted)(Related document(s)[790]) (Richardson, Chinue) (Filed on 4/10/2014) Modified on 4/10/2014 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/10/2014 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntel Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 150 (UNREDACTED), # (2) Exhibit 152 (REDACTED), # (3) Exhibit 152 (UNREDACTED), # (4) Exhibit 153 (REDACTED), # (5) Exhibit 153 (UNREDACTED), # (6) Exhibit 391 (REDACTED), # (7) Exhibit 391 (UNREDACTED), # (8) Exhibit 393 (REDACTED), # (9) Exhibit 393 (UNREDACTED), # (10) Exhibit 398 (REDACTED), # (11) Exhibit 398 (UNREDACTED))(Related document(s)[790]) (Mittelbach, John) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntel Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 148, PT. 2 (REDACTED), # (2) Exhibit 148, PT. 1 (UNREDACTED), # (3) Exhibit 148, PT. 2 (UNREDACTED), # (4) Exhibit 148, PT. 3 (UNREDACTED), # (5) Exhibit 148, PT. 4 (UNREDACTED), # (6) Exhibit 148, PT. 5 (UNREDACTED), # (7) Exhibit 148, PT. 6 (UNREDACTED), # (8) Exhibit 148, PT. 7 (UNREDACTED), # (9) Exhibit 148, PT. 8 (UNREDACTED), # (10) Exhibit 149 (REDACTED), # (11) Exhibit 149 (UNREDACTED))(Related document(s)[790]) (Mittelbach, John) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re [790] Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byIntel Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 140 (UNREDACTED), # (2) Exhibit 142 (REDACTED), # (3) Exhibit 142, PT. 1 (UNREDACTED), # (4) Exhibit 142, PT. 2 (UNREDACTED), # (5) Exhibit 143 (REDACTED), # (6) Exhibit 143 (UNREDACTED), # (7) Exhibit 145 (REDACTED), # (8) Exhibit 145 (UNREDACTED), # (9) Exhibit 146 (REDACTED), # (10) Exhibit 146 (UNREDACTED))(Related document(s)[790]) (Mittelbach, John) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014, Terminated: 7/7/2014 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion to Seal Materials in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions and Defendants' Motion to Strike filed by Google Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 4,540 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?