MOBLEY v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01437-BAH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 12, 2016 at 5:30 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SHARIF MOBLEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Security Counselors

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kelly Brian McClanahan +1 301 728 5908 +1 240 681 2189 kel@nationalsecuritylaw.org
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Javier M. Guzman +1 202 616 1761 +1 202 514 8780 javier.guzman2@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judson Owen Littleton +1 202 305 8714 +1 202 616 8470 Judson.O.Littleton@usdoj.gov
Space Indraneel Sur +1 202 305 7662 +1 202 616 8470 indraneel.sur@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/30/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to opposition to motion re 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Fee Petition (Nunc Pro Tunc) filed by SHARIF MOBLEY. (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/30/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
    RESPONSE re 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Fee Petition (Nunc Pro Tunc) filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Fee Petition (Nunc Pro Tunc) by SHARIF MOBLEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting Defendant's 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 8, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
          REPLY to opposition to motion re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/29/2012, Entered: None
            RESPONSE re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SHARIF MOBLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 04/29/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Ex Parte, In Camera Filing by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Bies Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                  Vaughn Index As Corrected. (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                    ENTERED IN ERROR.....Vaughn Index. (Littleton, Judson) Modified on 4/2/2012 (znmw, ). (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT of Paul P. Colborn by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Clarification by SHARIF MOBLEY re 21 Notice (Other), 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Ex Parte, In Camera Filing by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER regarding briefing schedule. The defendant shall file a Vaughn Index and motion for summary judgment by March 28, 2012. The plaintiff shall file his opposition to the motion for summary judgment on or before April 11, 2012. The defendant shall file a reply within seven days of the filing of the plaintiff's opposition brief. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 7, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                NOTICE Joint Statement Regarding Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, SHARIF MOBLEY re 16 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Statement by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, SHARIF MOBLEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER denying 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The parties shall confer and file a joint report in accordance with footnote 3 of the Court's Standing Order, ECF No. 6, by March 5, 2012. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 27, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 15 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 27, 2012. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of New Factual Developments and Request for Expedited Consideration by SHARIF MOBLEY re 11 Memorandum in Opposition, 12 Reply to opposition to Motion, 10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Crider Declaration)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Judson Owen Littleton on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Indraneel Sur (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sur, Indraneel) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by SHARIF MOBLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sur, Indraneel) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by SHARIF MOBLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sur, Indraneel) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Indraneel Sur on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Javier M. Guzman (Sur, Indraneel) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 6, 2011. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Javier M. Guzman on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/24/2011, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/24/2011., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/24/2011. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/23/2011.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit U.S. Attorney General, # 2 Exhibit U.S. Attorney)(rdj) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Complaint using Counsel's Address by SHARIF MOBLEY "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge John D. Bates on August 1, 2011. (rdj) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding defendant's 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 8, 2012. (lcbah1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SHARIF MOBLEY "Leave to file without Prepayment of Cost GRANTED without prejudice" by Judge John D. Bates on August 1, 2011.(rdj) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 27, 2012. (lcbah1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by SHARIF MOBLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?