JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
Federal Court Proceeding District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. Unknown

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 7, 2018 at 4:45 PM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Judicial Watch, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Judicial Watch, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/10/2013 Julie B. Axelrod +1 202 646 5172 +1 202 646 5199 jaxelrod@judicialwatch.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ramona Raula Cotca +1 202 646 5172 +1 202 646 5199 rcotca@judicialwatch.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Orfanedes +1 202 646 5172 +1 202 646 5199 porfanedes@judicialwatch.org
v.
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
Officially listed as "FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen McCoy Elliott +1 202 305 8177 stephen.elliott@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 06/18/2013 Judson Owen Littleton +1 202 305 8714 +1 202 616 8470 Judson.O.Littleton@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Powell +1 202 514 9836 +1 202 616 8202 amy.powell@usdoj.gov
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen McCoy Elliott +1 202 305 8177 stephen.elliott@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 06/18/2013 Judson Owen Littleton +1 202 305 8714 +1 202 616 8470 Judson.O.Littleton@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Powell +1 202 514 9836 +1 202 616 8202 amy.powell@usdoj.gov
  Entries (82) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Modify
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Processing Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Ramona Raula Cotca on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Processing Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Attorney Julie B. Axelrod terminated. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines in Light of Lapse in Appropriations by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Amy E. Powell on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Judson Littleton (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT (jointly filed) by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 16 the parties' joint motion to modify the schedule for future proceedings. See text for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/2/2013. (lcjdb4) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Proposed Order by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE re 16 Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order for Future Proceedings as to Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order for Future Proceedings as to Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER governing release of non-exempt responsive records. See text of order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/30/2012. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Proposed Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, JUDICIAL WATCH, INC., U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ERRATA by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Schedule filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, JUDICIAL WATCH, INC., U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Schedule)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, JUDICIAL WATCH, INC., U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing parties to confer and to submit a proposed briefing schedule for the filing of dispositive motions by not later than August 13, 2012. See text of order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/23/2012. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 07/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS served on 6/11/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/8/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/08/12. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/8/2012. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/8/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (4) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Julie B. Axelrod on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0090-2956831) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 55 times.

                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?