Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff, Plaintiff
Walker Truesdell Roth & Associates, Plaintiff Officially listed as "Walker, Truesdell, Roth & Associates, as Trustee for and on behalf of the Extended Stay Litigation Trust"
Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Defendant Officially listed as "Credit Suisse Securities US, a/k/a Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (as defined and named herein)"
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Motion for an Order (A) Limiting Service of Notice of Bar Date for Filing Claims And (B) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof (related document(s)2952) filed by Robert A. Wolf on behalf of Robert L. Geltzer. (Wolf, Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Motion for an Order (A) Limiting Service of Notice of Bar Date for Filing Claims And (B) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof filed by Robert A. Wolf on behalf of Robert L. Geltzer. with presentment to be held on 9/26/2014 (check with court for location) Objections due by 9/26/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Wolf, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment filed by Robert A. Wolf on behalf of Robert L. Geltzer. with presentment to be held on 12/27/2013 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 12/26/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Limiting Notice of Motion (A) Establishing Bar Dates for Filing Claims and (B) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof # 2 Exhibit A -- Proposed Order)(Wolf, Robert)
Docket Text: So Ordered Stipulation signed on 11/27/2013 Between Robert L. Geltzer as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Debtors and Blockbuster L.L.C. in connection with Certain Intellectual Property Matters (related document(s)2925). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment / Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order between Robert L. Geltzer as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Debtors and Blockbuster L.L.C. in connection with Certain Intellectual Property Matters (Presentment Date and Time: November 27, 2013 at 12:00 p.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time) Objection Date and Time: November 27, 2013 at 11:30 a.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time)) filed by Paul S. Hessler on behalf of Blockbuster L.L.C.. with presentment to be held on 11/27/2013 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hessler, Paul)
Docket Text: Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 10/29/2013 10:40AM RE: blockbuster L.L.C.s Motion of Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 363 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014 to Enforce Sale Orders Against Lojas Americanas N.A. (STATUS CONFERENCE ONLY). Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/28/2014. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/6/2013. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/20/2013. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/2/2013. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/28/2014. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Docket Text: Notice of Agenda / Agenda for October 29, 2013 (related document(s)2309) filed by Paul S. Hessler on behalf of Blockbuster L.L.C.. with hearing to be held on 10/29/2013 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Hessler, Paul)
Order signed on 9/24/2013 Authorizing the Retention of Squire Sanders (US) LLP as Special Litigation Counsel to the Trustee (Related Doc # 2911). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
Notice of Substitution of Attorney for Frederic Wein from Ryan M. Billings to Scott B. Fleming filed by Ryan Matthew Billings on behalf of Fredric Wein. (Billings, Ryan) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2910) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC. (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
Application to Employ Squire Sanders (US) LLP as Special Litigation Counsel filed by Robert A. Wolf on behalf of Robert L. Geltzer. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support # 2 Proposed Order) (Wolf, Robert) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
Statement / Eleventh and Final Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in their Capacity as Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period May 1, 2013 through July 16, 2013 filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC. (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
Application for Final Professional Compensation / Fourth Interim and Final Application for Compensation of Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred By PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Independent Auditors and Accounting Advisors to the Debtors for PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Auditor, period: 9/23/2010 to 7/16/2013, fee:$1,770,824.50, expenses: $23,575.50. filed by PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
Application for Final Professional Compensation / Final Fee Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP as Valuation Services Provider to the Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession for the Period of November 10, 2010 through January 31, 2011 for Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP, Other Professional, period: 11/10/2010 to 1/31/2011, fee:$363,777.50, expenses: $718.82. filed by Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP. (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
Application for Final Professional Compensation / Final Fee Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of Deloitte Tax LLP as Tax Advisor to the Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession for the Period of September 23, 2010 through April 30, 2011 for Deloitte Tax LLP, Other Professional, period: 9/23/2010 to 4/30/2011, fee:$582,765.00, expenses: $966.12. filed by Deloitte Tax LLP. (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
Amended Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Shawn M. Christianson on behalf of Oracle America, Inc.. (Christianson, Shawn) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
Letter dated 9/4/2013 addressed to Stephen Karotkin, of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, stating that CT Corporation System is NOT the registered agent for OfficeMax, Inc. filed by CT Corporation System. (Logue Togher, Claire) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
Letter Requesting Removal from EFC Notification List filed by M. David Graubard on behalf of Milestone Square Equities. (Graubard, M.) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Hearing regarding Motion of Blockbuster L.L.C. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 363 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014 to Enforce Sale Orders Against Lojas Americanas S.A. filed by Paul S. Hessler on behalf of Blockbuster L.L.C.. with hearing to be held on 10/29/2013 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Hessler, Paul) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/24/2013 at 11:00 AM at 80 Broad St., 4th Floor, USTM. (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 08/26/2013)
Affidavit of Service re Notice of Filing of Final Report and Account Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1019(5)(A)(ii) (related document(s)2897) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
Letter Notice of Change of Address for Halperin Battaglia Raicht, LLP filed by Ligee Gu on behalf of Halperin Battaglia Raicht, LLP. (Gu, Ligee) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
Application to Employ Squire Sanders (US) LLP as Special Litigation Counsel to Chapter 7 Trustee filed by Robert A. Wolf on behalf of Robert L. Geltzer. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert A. Wolf # 2 Proposed Order) (Wolf, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
Statement : Notice of Filing of Final Report and Account Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1019(5)(A)(ii) (related document(s)2880) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Douglas D. Herrmann filed by J. Gregory Milmoe on behalf of Lojas Americanas S.A.. (Milmoe, J.) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
Order signed on 8/14/2013 Authorizing the Retention of Davis, Graber, Plotzker & Ward, LLP as Accountant (Related Doc # 2887). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
Order signed on 8/14/2013 Authorizing the Retention of the Law Offices of Robert L. Geltzer as Attorney for the Trustee (Related Doc # 2886). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Hearing on Motion of Blockbuster L.L.C. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 363 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014 to Enforce Sale Orders Against Lojas Americanas S.A. filed by Paul S. Hessler on behalf of Blockbuster L.L.C.. with hearing to be held on 9/4/2013 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Hessler, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
Application for Final Professional Compensation for Ernst & Young LLP, Auditor, period: 12/9/2010 to 5/31/2011, fee:$451,205.36, expenses: $55.00. filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Peterson, Lars) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
Statement / Notice of Filing of Schedule of Unpaid Debts Incurred after the Filing of the Petition and Before Conversion of the Case filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 7/30/2013 for the Production and Exchange of Confidential Information. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/27/2013 at 11:00 AM at 80 Broad St., 4th Floor, USTM. (Cantrell, Deirdra). (Entered: 07/30/2013)
Application to Employ Davis, Graber, Plotzker & Ward, LLP as Accountant for the Trustee filed by Robert L. Geltzer on behalf of Robert L. Geltzer. (Attachments: # 1 Accountant's Affidavit) (Geltzer, Robert) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
Application to Employ Law Offices of Robert L. Geltzer as Attorney for the Trustee filed by Robert L. Geltzer on behalf of Robert L. Geltzer. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney's Affidavit) (Geltzer, Robert) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 07/16/2013 10:02AM RE: Fourth Interim and Final Application of Cooley, LLP Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Interim Period from December 1, 2011 through June 24, 2013 and the Final Period from October 1, 2010 Through June 24, 2013 for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, period: 10/1/2010 to 6/24/2013, fee: $2,762,738.00 expenses $69,118.44..et al.... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/16/2013. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 2872, 2856, 2873). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/25/2013. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/8/2013. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/19/2013. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/16/2013. (Ortiz, Carmen) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
Affidavit of Service re Order Pursuant to Section 1112(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 1017(f) and 1019 Converting Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases to Cases Under Chapter 7 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s)2880) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
Affidavit of Service re Agenda for July 16, 2013 Omnibus Hearing; to be held on July 16, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. (related document(s)2879) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
Order signed on 7/16/2013 Granting Applications for Allowance of Fourth Interim and Final Fee Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses(Related Doc #2873) for Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP, fees awarded: $1,582,278.75, expense awarded: $70,120.09, (Related Doc #2872)for Cooley, LLP, fees awarded: $41,630.50, expense awarded: $670.48. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
Order signed on 7/16/2013 Granting Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Cases to Cases Under Chapter 7 of the Bankruptcy Code. (Related Doc #2856) (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
Notice of Agenda / Agenda for July 16, 2013 Omnibus Hearing filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/16/2013 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Status Conference on Motion of Blockbuster L.L.C. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 363 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014 to Enforce Sale Orders Against Lojas Americanas S.A. filed by Paul S. Hessler on behalf of Blockbuster L.L.C.. (Hessler, Paul) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
Objection to Motion /Objection of the United States Trustee Regarding Applications for Final Compensation (related document(s)2872, 2873) filed by Brian Shoichi Masumoto on behalf of United States Trustee. (Masumoto, Brian) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
Affidavit of Service re Summary Sheet and Fourth Interim and Final Application of Cooley LLP, Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Interim Period from December 1, 2011 Through June 24, 2013 and the Final Period from October 1, 2010 Through June 24, 2013 (related document(s)2872) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
Affidavit of Service re 1) Summary Sheet and Fourth Interim and Final Application of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, Attorneys for the Debtors, for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred During (I) the Fourth Interim Compensation Period of December 1, 2011 through May 31, 2013, and (II) the Final Compensation Period of September 23, 2010 through July 16, 2013; and 2) Notice of Hearing on Fourth Interim and Final Fee Applications for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses (related document(s)2874, 2873) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
Notice of Hearing on Fourth Interim and Final Fee Applications for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses (related document(s)2872, 2873) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/16/2013 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 7/9/2013, (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Application for Final Professional Compensation : Fourth Interim and Final Application of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, Attorneys for the Debtors, for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred During (I) the Fourth Interim Compensation Period of December 1, 2011 through May 31, 2013, and (II) the Final Compensation Period of September 23, 2010 through July 16, 2013 for Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, Debtor's Attorney, period: 9/23/2010 to 7/16/2013, fee:$9,481,872.00, expenses: $364,958.97. filed by Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP. with hearing to be held on 7/16/2013 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 7/9/2013, (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Final Application for Final Professional Compensation / Fourth Interim and Final Application of Cooley LLP, Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Interim Period from December 1, 2011 Through June 24, 2013 and the Final Period from October 1, 2010 Through June 24, 2013 for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, period: 10/1/2010 to 6/24/2013, fee:$2,762,738.00, expenses: $69,118.44. filed by Cooley LLP. with hearing to be held on 7/16/2013 (check with court for location) (Hershcopf, Cathy) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing Cancellation and Adjournment of Debtors' Motion, Pursuant to Section 1112(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 1017(f) and 1019, to Convert their Chapter 11 Cases to Cases Under Chapter 7 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s)2870) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Hearing Cancellation and Adjournment of Debtors Motion, Pursuant to Section 1112(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 1017(f) and 1019, to Convert their Chapter 11 Cases to Cases Under Chapter 7 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s)2856) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/16/2013 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
Affidavit of Service re 1) Ninth Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in their Capacity as Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period November 1, 2012 through January 31, 2013; and 2) Tenth Ninth Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in their Capacity as Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period February 1, 2013 through April 30, 2013 (related document(s)2866, 2867) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
Statement / Tenth Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in their Capacity As Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation And Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period February 1, 2013 Through April 30, 2013 filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC. (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
Statement /Ninth Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in their Capacity as Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period November 1, 2012 Through January 31, 2013 filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC. (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
Affidavit of Service re Order Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 for Approval of that Certain Stipulation for Compromise and Settlement among the Debtors and Tina Jean Cole and David W. Cole, Sr. (related document(s)2863) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
Order signed on 6/5/2013 Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of The Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 For Approval of That Certain Stipulation for Compromise and Settlement among The Debtors and Tina Jean Cole and David W. Cole, Sr. (Related Doc # 2852). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
Affidavit of Service re Notice of Cancellation of Hearing (related document(s)2860) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
Affidavit of Service re Certificate of No Objection (related document(s)2859) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
Statement / Notice of Cancellation of Hearing on June 5, 2013 (related document(s)2852) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
Notice of No Objection / Certificate of No Objection (related document(s)2852) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing and Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 1112(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 1017(f) and 1019, to Convert Their Chapter 11 Cases to Cases Under Chapter 7 of the Bankruptcy Code; to be Held on June 19, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern Time) (related document(s)2856) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Case to Chapter 7 / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 1112(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 1017(f) and 1019, to Convert Their Chapter 11 Cases to Cases Under Chapter 7 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/19/2013 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 6/12/2013, (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Notice of Hearing / Notice of Hearing on Motion of Blockbuster L.L.C. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 363 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014 to Enforce Sale Orders Against Lojas Americanas S.A. (related document(s)2309) filed by Paul S. Hessler on behalf of Blockbuster L.L.C.. with hearing to be held on 7/16/2013 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Hessler, Paul)
Docket Text: Order signed on 5/15/2013 Approving Stipuation and Agreement Between Debtors and Robert Anspaugh Partially Modifying Automatic Stay. (related document(s)2849) (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Docket Text: Motion to Approve / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 for Approval of that Certain Stipulation for Compromise and Settlement Among Debtors and Tina Jean Cole and David W. Cole, Sr. filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/5/2013 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 6/3/2013, (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of Blockbuster L.L.C. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 363 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014 to Enforce Sale Orders Against Lojas Americanas S.A. filed by Paul S. Hessler on behalf of Blockbuster L.L.C.. (Hessler, Paul)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Presentment of Proposed Order Approving Stipulation and Agreement Between Debtors and Robert Anspaugh Partially Modifying Automatic Stay (related document(s)2849) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Notice of Proposed Order Approving Stipulation and Agreement Between Debtors and Robert Anspaugh Partially Modifying Automatic Stay filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with presentment to be held on 4/26/2013 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re 1) Order Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 for Approval of that Certain Stipulation for Compromise and Settlement Between Debtors and Margaret Varbedian; and 2) Notice of Cancellation of Hearing on April 30, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time) (related document(s)2847, 2846) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Statement / Notice of Cancellation of Hearing on April 30, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. (related document(s)2834, 2846) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Order signed on 4/16/2013 for Approval of that Certain Stipulation for Compromise and Settlement Between Debtors and Margaret Varbedian (Related Doc # 2834). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Supplemental Affidavit of Steven Simms Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2014(a) (related document(s)2841) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit - Supplemental Affidavit of Steven Simms Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2014(a) filed by Cathy Hershcopf on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Hershcopf, Cathy)
Docket Text: (INCORRECT PDF FILE SUBMITTED, SEE DOCUMENT #2839 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Statement - Administrative Expense Claim - filed by City Of Waterbury. (Lopez, Mary) Modified on 3/20/2013 (Richards, Beverly).
Docket Text: Notice of No Objection / Certificate of No Objection (related document(s)2834) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing and Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 for Approval of that Certain Stipulation for Compromise and Settlement Between Debtors and Margaret Varbedian; to be Held on April 30, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern Time) (related document(s)2834) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Motion to Approve / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 for Approval of that Certain Stipulation for Compromise and Settlement Between Debtors and Margaret Varbedian filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 4/30/2013 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 3/15/2013, (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Eighth Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in their Capacity as Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period August 1, 2012 through October 31, 2012 (related document(s)2829) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Statement / Eighth Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in their Capacity as Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period August 1, 2012 Through October 31, 2012 filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen)
Docket Text: Stipulation and Scheduling Order signed on 12/11/2012 Regarding Motion of Blockbuster L.L.C. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 105(a) and 363 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014 to Enforce Sale Orders Against Lojas Americanas S.A. (related document(s)2309). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Stipulation and Order Between Debtors and Blockbuster L.L.C. in Connection With the Resolution of Certain Payment Matters (related document(s)2825) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: So Ordered Stipulation signed on 11/14/2012 Between Debtors and Blockbuster L.L.C. in Connection With the Resolution of Certain Payment Matters (related document(s)2823). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Between Debtors and Blockbuster L.L.C. in Connection With the Resolution of Certain Payment Matters (related document(s)2823) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Between Debtors and Blockbuster L.L.C. in Connection With the Resolution of Certain Payment Matters filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Seventh Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in their Capacity as Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period May 1, 2012 Through July 31, 2012 (related document(s)2821) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Statement /Seventh Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in their Capacity as Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period May 1, 2012 Through July 31, 2012 filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC. (Karotkin, Stephen)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Order Approving Stipulation and Agreement Between Debtors and DFS Services, LLC (related document(s)2803) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance /Notice of Change of Address with Respect to Claim No. 791 filed by David M. Blau on behalf of Ramco Liberty Square, L.L.C.. (Blau, David)
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance /Notice of Change of Address with Respect to Claim No. 5625 filed by David M. Blau on behalf of Northpointe Plaza Limited Partnership. (Blau, David)
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance /Notice of Change of Address with Respect to Claim No. 6538 filed by David M. Blau on behalf of Rolling Meadows 450, LLC. (Blau, David)
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance /Notice of Change of Address with Respect to Claim No. 4835 filed by David M. Blau on behalf of RLV Cocoa Commons, LP. (Blau, David)
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance /Notice of Change of Address with Respect to Claim No. 6439 filed by David M. Blau on behalf of Michigan-Newberry Associates, L.L.C.. (Blau, David)
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance /Notice of Change of Address with Respect to Claim No. 794 filed by David M. Blau on behalf of Market Plaza 450, LLC. (Blau, David)
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance /Notice of Change of Address with Respect to Claim No. 4881 filed by David M. Blau on behalf of Merchants 450, LLC. (Blau, David)
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance /Notice of Change of Address with Respect to Claim No. 793 filed by David M. Blau on behalf of Ramco-Gershenson Properties, L.P.. (Blau, David)
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance /Notice of Change of Address with Respect to Claim No. 5898 filed by David M. Blau on behalf of Shelby Creek, L.L.C.. (Blau, David)
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance /Notice of Change of Address with Respect to Claim No. 4834 filed by David M. Blau on behalf of Shelby Creek, L.L.C.. (Blau, David)
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance /Notice of Change of Address with Respect to Claim No. 6440 filed by David M. Blau on behalf of Pointe Plaza Limited Partnership. (Blau, David)
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance /Notice of Change of Address with Respect to Claim No. 5630 filed by David M. Blau on behalf of Pointe Plaza Limited Partnership. (Blau, David)
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance /Notice of Change of Address with Respect to Claim No. 4882 filed by David M. Blau on behalf of W&A-1, LLC. (Blau, David)
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance /Notice of Change of Address with Respect to Claim No. 5635 filed by David M. Blau on behalf of W&A-1, LLC. (Blau, David)
Docket Text: Notice of Appearance Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Karen C. Bifferato on behalf of Inland American Retail Management, LLC, Inland Commercial Property Management, Inc., Inland Continental Property Management, Inc., Inland Southwest Management, LLC, Inland US Management, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Bifferato, Karen)
Docket Text: Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 05/24/2012 10:04AM RE: Debtors Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified and Disputed Amount Claims). Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/5/2012. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 2586). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/14/2012. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/28/2012. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 9/7/2012. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/5/2012. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Docket Text: So Ordered Stipulation signed on 8/10/2012 by and between Attorneys for Debtors and Debtors in Possession and Attorney for Plaintiff Re:Approving Stipulation and Agreement Between Debtor and Nicolette Debibo Modifying Automatic Stay (related document(s)2358). (Ho, Amanda)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Sixth Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in their Capacity as Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period February 1, 2012 Through April 30, 2012 (related document(s)2793) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Statement / Sixth Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in their Capacity as Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period February 1, 2012 Through April 30, 2012 filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC. (Karotkin, Stephen)
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of Blockbuster L.L.C. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 363 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014 to Enforce Sale Orders Against Lojas Americanas S.A. filed by Paul S. Hessler on behalf of Blockbuster L.L.C.. (Hessler, Paul)
Docket Text: Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 06/27/2012 10:10AM RE: Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Case to Chapter 7; Motion of the United States Trustee to (i) Shorten the Notice Period and (ii) To Convert these Chapter 11 Cases to Cases Under Chapter 7. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 9/26/2012. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/5/2012. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 7/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 7/30/2012. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/26/2012. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Docket Text: Minute Order signed on 7/3/2012 Denying Motion of the United States Trustee to (I) Shorten the Notice Period and(II) Convert These Chapter 11 Cases to Cases Under Chapter 7 (the Motion). (Related Doc #1075) (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Agenda for June 27, 2012 Omnibus Hearing; to be Held on June 27, 2012 (related document(s)2786) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Notice of Agenda filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/27/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Certificate of Service of of Motin to file administrative claim out of time (related document(s)2251) filed by Warren S. Wolf on behalf of Warren Wolf. (Wolf, Warren)
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Motin to file administrative claim out of time (related document(s)2251) filed by Warren S. Wolf on behalf of Warren Wolf. (Wolf, Warren)
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of Blockbuster L.L.C. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(A) and 363 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014 to Enforce Sale Orders Against Lojas Americanas S.A. filed by Paul S. Hessler on behalf of Blockbuster L.L.C.. with hearing to be held on 7/26/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Hessler, Paul)
Docket Text: Statement / Notice of Filing of Master Service List as of June 1, 2012 filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Order (I) Authorizing and Approving Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts to the Assignee; (II) Authorizing Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts; (III) Allowing Agreed Upon Payment to Oracle; and (IV) Granting Related Relief (related document(s)2777) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing Regarding Motion of The United States Trustee to (I) Shorten the Notice Period and (II) to Convert these Chapter 11 Cases to Cases Under Chapter 7 (related document(s)2776) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Agenda for May 24, 2012 Omnibus Hearing (related document(s)2775) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Order signed on 5/29/2012 (I)Authorizing And Approving Assumption AndAssignment of Certain Executory Contracts To The Assignee; (II) AuthorizingRejection of Certain Executory Contracts;(III) Allowing Agreed Upon Payment To Oracle; And (IV) Granting Related Relief.(related document(s)2162) (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Docket Text: Notice of Hearing Regarding Motion of The United States Trustee to (I) Shorten the Notice Period and (II) to Convert these Chapter 11 Cases to Cases Under Chapter 7 (related document(s)1075) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/27/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Notice of Agenda filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/24/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of Blockbuster L.L.C. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(A) and 363 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014 to Enforce Sale Orders Against Lojas Americanas S.A. filed by Paul S. Hessler on behalf of Blockbuster L.L.C.. with hearing to be held on 6/26/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Hessler, Paul)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Cancellation of Hearing and Adjournment of Contested Matters (related document(s)2772) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Cancellation of Hearing and Adjournment of Contested Matters filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/24/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Fifth Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in Their Capacity as Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period November 1, 2011 Through January 31, 2012 (related document(s)2768) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Matrix / Notice of Filing of Master Service List as of May 1, 2012 filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Statement / Fifth Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in Their Capacity as Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period November 1, 2011 Through January 31, 2012 filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 04/19/2012 10:03AM RE: Debtors Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified and Disputed Amount Claims); Debtors Sixteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims, Amended and Superseded Claim, Satisfied Claims,Disputed Amount Claims, Undesignated Claims, and Misclassified Claims)..et al.... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/19/2012. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/27/2012. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 5/11/2012. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/21/2012. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/19/2012. (Villegas, Carmen)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Documents Served on April 19, 2012 (related document(s)2762, 2760, 2761, 2763) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Agenda for April 19, 2012 Omnibus Hearing (related document(s)2759) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Order signed on 4/19/2012 Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of The Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 for Approval of that Certain Settlement Agreement and Stipulation Among the Debtors and National Union Fire Insurance Company (Related Doc # 2724). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Order signed on 4/19/2012 Authorizing the Debtors to Make an Interim Distribution to Secured Noteholders and to Allowed Operating Period Claimants and to Retain KCC to Disburse Approved Distributions (Related Doc # 2727). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Second Order signed on 4/19/2012 Granting Debtors Sixteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims, Amended and Superseded Claim, Satisfied Claims, Disputed Amount Claims, Undesignated Claims, and Misclassified Claims)(Related Doc # 2647, 2693). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Second Order signed on 4/19/2012 Granting Debtors Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified and Disputed Amount Claims). Hearing on Exhibit 1 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 5/10/2012 at 10:00 AM (related document(s)2628, 2586). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Notice of Agenda filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 4/19/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Appearance and Request for Service filed on behalf of St. Charles Partnership, L.P. (related document(s)243) filed by E. Rebecca Case on behalf of St. Charles Partnership, L.P.. (Case, E.)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Transfer for ETG Capital Advisors, LLC re: Technimark, LLC (Claim Nos. 5665 & 5668) (related document(s)2756) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (CLAIMS AGENT CASES ONLY)
Docket Text: Transfer Agreement FRBP /Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Technimark, LLC(Claim No.5665, Amount 347,558.40); Technimark, LLC(Claim No.5668, Amount 150,000.00). To ETG Capital Advisors, LLC. filed by ETG Capital Advisors, LLC.(Cantrell, Deirdra)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Order Granting Applications for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred from February 1, 2011 Through November 30, 2011 (related document(s)2750) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Removal from Electronic and Noticing Matrix filed by Leroy E. Colombe on behalf of The Sullivan Family Limited Partnership. (Colombe, Leroy)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Documents Served on April 3, 2012 (related document(s)2744, 2748, 2747, 2742, 2745, 2746, 2743) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Cancellation of Hearing and Adjournment of Contested Matters (related document(s)2737) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Third Order signed on 4/3/2012 Granting Debtors' Fifteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims, Amended and Superseded Claims, and Misclassified Claims). (related document(s)2587) (Lopez, Mary)
Docket Text: Fourth Order signed on 4/3/2012 Granting Debtors' Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims). (related document(s)2408) (Lopez, Mary)
Docket Text: Fifth Order signed on 4/3/2012 Granting Debtors' Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims). (related document(s)2405) (Lopez, Mary)
Docket Text: Fifth Order signed on 4/3/2012 Granting Debtors' Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims). (related document(s)2404) (Lopez, Mary)
Docket Text: Fifth Order signed on 4/3/2012 Granting Debtors' Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims, Amended and Superseded Claims, and Duplicative Claims). (related document(s)2298) (Lopez, Mary)
Docket Text: Sixth Order signed on 4/3/2012 Granting Debtors Fifth Omnibus Objection To Claims (No Liability Claims). (related document(s)2297) (Lopez, Mary)
Docket Text: Agreed Order signed on 4/3/2012 Granting Debtors' Objection as Set Forth Herein to the Administrative Claim Filed by SBJ IP Holdings 1, LLC [Claim No. 6269] . (Related Doc # 2701) (Lopez, Mary)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service / Supplemental Affidavit of Service re Joint Motion for Entry of a Protective Order (related document(s)2725) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re (1) Certificate of No Objection; and (2) Notice of (I) Hearing Cancellation, (II) Proposed Entry of Orders on Uncontested or Settled Claims, and (III) Adjournment of Contested Matters (related document(s)2719, 2720) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Matrix / Notice of Filing of Master Service List as of April 2, 2012 filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Cancellation of Hearing and Adjournment of Contested Matters filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/10/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal / Notice of Withdrawal of (I) Renewed Motion of Hughes Network Systems, LLC for Entry of an Order Allowing and Compelling Immediate Payment of an Administrative Claim and (II) Claims Filed by Hughes Network Systems, LLC (related document(s)2537) filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Hughes Network Systems, LLC. (Donoho, Christopher)
Docket Text: Notice of Agenda filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 4/3/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service / Supplemental Affidavit of Service re Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 366 Terminating the Debtors Adequate Assurance Escrow Account (related document(s)2678) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service / Supplemental Affidavit of Service re Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 366 Terminating the Debtors Adequate Assurance Escrow Account (related document(s)2678) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of Blockbuster L.L.C. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(A) and 363 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014 to Enforce Sale Orders Against Lojas Americanas S.A. filed by Paul S. Hessler on behalf of Blockbuster L.L.C.. with hearing to be held on 5/10/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Hessler, Paul)
Docket Text: Letter / Response to Letter dated February 18, 2012 to Vito Genna (related document(s)2707) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing and Debtors' Motion Pursuant to the Bid Procedures Order and the Sale Order Requesting Authority to Make an Interim Distribution to Secured Noteholders and to Allowed Operating Period Claimants and Retain KCC to Disburse Approved Distributions (related document(s)2727) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Joint Motion for Entry of a Protective Order (related document(s)2725) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Motion to Authorize / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to the Bid Procedures Order and the Sale Order Requesting Authority to Make an Interim Distribution to Secured Noteholders and to Allowed Operating Period Claimants and Retain KCC to Disburse Approved Distributions (related document(s)1723, 1223, 1602) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 4/19/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 4/12/2012, (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing and Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 for Approval of that Certain Settlement Agreement and Stipulation Among the Debtors and National Union Fire Insurance Company (related document(s)2724) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Motion to Approve / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of The Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 for Approval of that Certain Settlement Agreement and Stipulation Among the Debtors and National Union Fire Insurance Company filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 4/19/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 4/12/2012, (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Order Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 for Approval of that Certain Settlement Agreement and Stipulation Among the Debtors and Hughes Network Systems, LLC (related document(s)2722) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Order signed on 3/22/2012 Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 for Approval of that Certain Settlement Agreement and Stipulation Among the Debtors and Hughes Network Systems, LLC (Related Doc # 2674, 2537, 1785, 947). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Letter removing attorney from ECF notification list filed by Juandisha Harris on behalf of State Of Michigan, Department Of Treasury. (Harris, Juandisha)
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of (I) Hearing Cancellation, (II) Proposed Entry of Orders on Uncontested or Settled Claims, and (III) Adjournment of Contested Matters filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Statement / Certificate of No Objection (related document(s)2674) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Proofs of Claim Nos. 6020 and 6596 filed by Athelera LLC filed by Lara R. Sheikh on behalf of Athelera LLC. (Sheikh, Lara)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service / Supplemental Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing and Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 366 for Entry of an Order Terminating the Debtors' Adequate Assurance Escrow Account (related document(s)2646) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Debtors' Reply to the Response of Interactive Communications International, Inc. in Opposition to the Debtors' Fourteenth Objection to Claims (related document(s)2715) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Response : Debtors' Reply to the Response of Interactive Communications International, Inc. in Opposition to the Debtors' Fourteenth Objection to Claims (related document(s)2609, 2586) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/06/2012 10:10AM RE: Debtors' Motion for an Order Approving the Sale of Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets;Oracle America, Inc.'s Objection To The Debtors Notice of (I) Second Supplemental Executory Contract PAC Designation.. et al.... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 6/5/2012. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 2162, 2630, 947). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/14/2012. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 3/28/2012. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 4/9/2012. Transcript access will be restricted through 6/5/2012. (Villegas, Carmen)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Agenda for March 6, 2012 Hearing on Certain Contested Matters (related document(s)2706) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 02/28/2012 10:07am RE: Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of The Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 for Approval of that Certain Settlement Agreement and Stipulation Among the Debtors and Athelera LLC Martin Sosland; 214-746-7700 (2646) Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 366, for Entry of an Order Terminating the Debtors' Adequate Assurance Escrow Account Martin Sosland; 214-746-7700 (2292) Debtors' First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims, Duplicative Claims, Zero-Dollar Claims, and No Liability Claims) Adj. from 10/19/11; Adj. from 11/22/11; Adj. from 12/20/11; Adj. from 1/26/2012..et al..... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/29/2012. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 2298, 2642, 2404, 2511, 2299, 2292, 2647, 2293, 2297, 2407, 2648, 2587, 2646, 2405, 2408, 2406, 2586). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/7/2012. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 3/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 4/2/2012. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/29/2012. (Villegas, Carmen)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Joinder of Ray & Glick, Ltd. Special Counsel for Debtors, to Response of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP to Objection of the United States Trustee Regarding Application for Interim Compensation (related document(s)2705) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Debtors' Objection to the Administrative Claim Filed by SBJ IP Holdings 1, LLC [Claim No. 6269] (related document(s)2701) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Joinder and Response of Bloodworth Carroll, P.C. as Special Counsel to the Debtors to the Objection of the United States Trustee Regarding Applications for Interim Compensation (related document(s)2697) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of Blockbuster L.L.C. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 363 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014 to Enforce Sale Orders Against Lojas Americanas S.A. filed by Paul S. Hessler on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 4/3/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Hessler, Paul)
Docket Text: Notice of Agenda filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/6/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Response / Joinder of Ray & Glick, Ltd. Special Counsel for Debtors, to Response of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP to Objection of the United States Trustee Regarding Application for Interim Compensation (related document(s)2660, 2662) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of Ray & Glick, LTD.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Various Documents Served on February 29, 2012 (related document(s)2693, 2692, 2694, 2680, 2691, 2690, 2696) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Motion for Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Objection to the Administrative Claim Filed by SBJ IP Holdings 1, LLC [Claim No. 6269] with hearing to be held on 4/3/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 3/26/2012, filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc..(Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Documents Served on February 28, 2012 (related document(s)2682, 2681, 2683, 2687, 2679, 2677, 2678, 2685, 2686, 2684) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing and Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of The Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 for Approval of that Certain Settlement Agreement and Stipulation Among the Debtors and Hughes Network Systems, LLC (related document(s)2674) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Matrix / Notice of Filing of Master Service List as of March 1, 2012 filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Response / Joinder and Response of Bloodworth Carroll, P.C. as Special Counsel to the Debtors to the Objection of the United States Trustee Regarding Applications for Interim Compensation (related document(s)2660, 2662) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of Bloodworth Carroll, P.C.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Order signed on 2/28/2012 Authorizing the Debtors to Expand the Scope of Their Retention of Pricewaterhousecoopers, LLP as Accounting Advisors to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to February 2, 2012. (Related Doc # 2656), (Related Doc # [2695]). (Lopez, Mary)
Docket Text: Motion to Authorize / Debtors' Supplemental Application Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(a), 328(a), and 330, Fed R. Bankr. P. 2014(a) and 2016, and Local Bankruptcy Rules 2014-1 and 2016-1 for Authorization to Expand the Scope of their Retention of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP as Accounting Advisors to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to February 2, 2012 This is an Administrative Entry to Reflect Appropriate Event Code (related document(s)2656) filed by Martin A. Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Lopez, Mary)
Docket Text: Order signed on 2/28/2012 Granting Debtors Seventeenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Satisfied Claims) (Related Doc # 2648). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Order signed on 2/28/2012 Granting Debtors' Sixteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims, Amended and Superseded Claim, Satisfied Claims, Disputed Amount Claims, Undesignated Claims, and Misclassified Claims). Hearing on Exhibit 7 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 3/20/2012 at 10:00 AM (related document(s)2647). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Second Order signed on 2/28/2012 Granting Debtors' Fifteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims, Amended and Superseded Claims, and Misclassified Claims). Hearing on Exhibit 1 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 3/20/2012 at 10:00 AM (related document(s)2629, 2587). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Third Order signed on 2/28/2012 Granting Debtors' Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims and Satisified Claims) (Related Doc # 2511, 2572, 2633). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Third Order signed on 2/28/2012 Granting Debtors' Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims). Hearing on Exhibit 2 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 3/20/2012 at 10:00 AM (related document(s)2627, 2408, 2520) (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Agenda for February 28, 2012 Omnibus Hearing (related document(s)2672) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Various Documents Served on February 24, 2012 (related document(s)2665, 2667, 2670, 2662) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Fourth Order signed on 2/28/2012 Granting Debtors Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims, Duplicative Claims, and Satisfied Tax Claims) (Related Doc # 2407). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Fourth Order signed on 2/28/2012 Granting Debtors Tenth Omnibus Objection To Claims (Misclassified Claims) (Related Doc # 2406, 2517, 2570, 2625). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Fourth Order signed on 2/28/2012 Granting Debtors Ninth Omnibus Objection To Claims (Misclassified Claims). Hearing on Exhibit 2 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 3/20/2012 at 10:00 AM (related document(s)2624, 2569, 2516, 2405). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Fourth Order signed on 2/28/2012 Granting Debtors Eighth Omnibus Objection To Claims (Misclassified Claims). Hearing on Exhibit 2 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 3/20/2012 at 10:00 AM (related document(s)2404, 2623, 2568, 2515). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Fourth Order signed on 2/28/2012 Granting Debtors Seventh Omnibus Objection To Claims (Substantively Duplicative Claims, No Liability Claims, And Disputed Amount Claims) (Related Doc # 2299). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Fourth Order signed on 2/28/2012 Granting Debtors Sixth Omnibus Objection To Claims (No Liability Claims, Amended and Superseded Claims, and Duplicative Claims). Hearing on Exhibit 3 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 3/20/2012 at 10:00 AM (related document(s)2622, 2298, 2385, 2513). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Fifth Order signed on 2/28/2012 Granting Debtors Fifth Omnibus Objection To Claims (No Liability Claims). Hearing on Exhibit 2 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 3/20/2012 at 10:00 AM (related document(s)2512, 2621, 2566, 2297, 2384). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Second Order signed on 2/28/2012 Granting Debtors Second Omnibus Objection To Claims (Satisfied Tax Claims) (Related Doc # 2293, 2381). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Modified on 2/29/2012 to Attach Exhibit 1)(Richards, Beverly).
Docket Text: Fifth Order signed on 2/28/2012 Granting Debtors First Omnibus Objection To Claims (Amended And Superseded Claims, Duplicative Claims, Zero-Dollar Claims, And No Liability Claims)(Related Doc # 2292, 2380, 2508, 2563, 2620). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Order signed on 2/28/2012 Pursuant To Sections 105 and 363 of The Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 for Approval of That Certain Settlement Agreement and Stipulation Among The Debtors And Athelera LLC (Related Doc # 2642). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service / Supplemental Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing and Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 366 for Entry of an Order Terminating the Debtors' Adequate Assurance Escrow Account (related document(s)2646) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Joinder of Cooley LLP, Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, to Response of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP to Objection of the United States Trustee Regarding Applications for Interim Compensation (related document(s)2664) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Motion to Approve / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of The Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 for Approval of that Certain Settlement Agreement and Stipulation Among the Debtors and Hughes Network Systems, LLC filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/20/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 3/13/2012, (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Reply to Motion / Reply of Blockbuster L.L.C. to (a) Oracle America, Inc.'s Objection to the Debtors' Notice of (I) Second Supplemental Executory Contract PAC Designation (Exclusive of Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property Where the Debtor is the Lessee) and (II) Objection Deadline to Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Same to Purchaser or an Affiliate Thereof, and (b) Debtors' (I) Reply to Oracle's Objection to the Debtors' Second Assumption Notice and (II) to the Claim Amount Sought By the Oracle Proof of Claim filed by Paul S. Hessler on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Hessler, Paul)
Docket Text: Notice of Agenda filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Response and Joinder of Vinson & Elkins LLP to the Objection of the United States Trustee Regarding Applications for Interim Compensation (related document(s)2660, 2662) filed by Lance Mulhern on behalf of Vinson & Elkins LLP. (Mulhern, Lance)
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Certain Contested Matters filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/6/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Declaration in Support of Response by Creditor to Debtors' Seventeenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2668) filed by Howard S. Levy. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Docket Text: Response by Creditor to Debtors' Seventeenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2648) filed by Howard S. Levy. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Docket Text: Response of Chaiken Legal Group, P.C. to Objection of the United States Trustee Regarding Application for Interim Compensation filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Status Report / Debtors' Report on Chapter 11 Wind-Down Status filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Response / Joinder of Cooley LLP, Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, to Response of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP to Objection of the United States Trustee Regarding Applications for Interim Compensation (related document(s)2660, 2662) filed by Cathy Hershcopf on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Hershcopf, Cathy)
Docket Text: Response to Motion (related document(s)2648) filed by Victoria A. Reardon on behalf of State Of Michigan, Department Of Treasury. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) (Reardon, Victoria)
Docket Text: Response of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP to the U.S. Trustee's Objection to its Second and Third Interim Applications, as Attorneys for the Debtors, for Interim Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from February 1, 2010 Through November 30, 2011 (related document(s)2660) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Response to Motion (related document(s)2648) filed by Victoria A. Reardon on behalf of State Of Michigan, Department Of Treasury. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) (Reardon, Victoria)
Docket Text: Objection to Motion /Objection of the United States Trustee Regarding Applications for Interim Compensation (related document(s)2395, 2598, 2589, 2240, 2206, 2185, 2593, 2205, 2599, 2204, 1955, 2252, 2197, 2219, 2591) filed by Brian Shoichi Masumoto on behalf of United States Trustee. (Masumoto, Brian)
Docket Text: Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 01/26/2012 10:03AM RE: Debtors Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims; Debtors' First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims, Duplicative Claims, Zero-Dollar Claims, and No Liability Claims..et al... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 4/30/2012. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 2298, 2404, 2511, 2292, 2297, 2407, 2587, 2405, 2408, 2406, 2586). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/6/2012. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 2/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/1/2012. Transcript access will be restricted through 4/30/2012. (Villegas, Carmen)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service / Supplemental Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing and Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 366 for Entry of an Order Terminating the Debtors' Adequate Assurance Escrow Account (related document(s)2646) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Presentment of Debtors' Supplemental Application Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(a), 328(a), and 330, Fed R. Bankr. P. 2014(a) and 2016, and Local Bankruptcy Rules 2014-1 and 2016-1 for Authorization to Expand the Scope of Their Retention of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP as Accounting Advisors to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to February 2, 2012 (related document(s)2656) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Notice of Presentment of Debtors' Supplemental Application Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(a), 328(a), and 330, Fed R. Bankr. P. 2014(a) and 2016, and Local Bankruptcy Rules 2014-1 and 2016-1 for Authorization to Expand the Scope of their Retention of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP as Accounting Advisors to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to February 2, 2012 filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with presentment to be held on 2/24/2012 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 2/24/2012, (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' (I) Objection to Motion of Credera Enterprises Company and Gencorp Technologies Inc. for Allowance and Payment of "Sale Period" Administrative Claim and (II) Cross-Motion for Reclassification of Amounts Asserted Therein (related document(s)2652) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of Blockbuster L.L.C. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(A) and 363 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014 to Enforce Sale Orders Against Lojas Americanas S.A. filed by Paul S. Hessler on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/7/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Hessler, Paul)
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' (I) Objection to Motion of Credera Enterprises Company and Gencorp Technologies Inc. for Allowance and Payment of Sale Period Administrative Claim and (II) Cross-Motion for Reclassification of Amounts Asserted Therein (related document(s)2291, 2355) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re 1) Notice of Hearing and Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 366 for Entry of an Order Terminating the Debtors' Adequate Assurance Escrow Account; 2) Debtors' Sixteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims, Amended and Superseded Claim, Satisfied Claims, Disputed Amount Claims, Undesignated Claims, and Misclassified Claims); and 3) Debtors' Seventeenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Satisfied Claims) (related document(s)2647, 2648, 2646) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service / Supplemental Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing and Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of The Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 for Approval of that Certain Settlement Agreement and Stipulation Among the Debtors and Athelera LLC (related document(s)2642) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Credera & GenCorp's Notice of Motion and Reply in Support of Motion for Allowance and Payment of "Sale Period" Administrative Claim (related document(s)2291, 2539) filed by David W. Parham on behalf of Credera Enterprises Company. (Parham, David)
Docket Text: Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Seventeenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Satisfied Claims) with hearing to be held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 2/21/2012, filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc..(Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Sixteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims, Amended and Superseded Claim, Satisfied Claims, Disputed Amount Claims, Undesignated Claims, and Misclassified Claims) with hearing to be held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 2/21/2012, filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc..(Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Motion to Approve / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 366, for Entry of an Order Terminating the Debtors' Adequate Assurance Escrow Account filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 2/21/2012, (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing and Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of The Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 for Approval of that Certain Settlement Agreement and Stipulation Among the Debtors and Athelera LLC (related document(s)2642) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Adversary case 12-01040. Complaint against BB Liquidating Inc. . Nature(s) of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)) Filed by Robert Drake Wilcox on behalf of Culturenik Publishing, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit "A"# (2) Exhibit "B") (Wilcox, Robert)
Docket Text: Motion to Approve / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of The Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 and 9019 for Approval of that Certain Settlement Agreement and Stipulation Among the Debtors and Athelera LLC filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 2/21/2012, (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service / Supplemental Affidavit of Service re Debtors' (I) Reply to Oracle's Objection to the Debtors' Second Assumption Notice and (II) Objection to the Claim Amount Sought by the Oracle Proof of Claim (related document(s)2634) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Debtors' (I) Reply to Oracle's Objection to the Debtors' Second Assumption Notice and (II) Objection to the Claim Amount Sought by the Oracle Proof of Claim (related document(s)2634) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Second Order Granting Debtors' Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims and Satisfied Claims) (related document(s)2633) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of Blockbuster L.L.C. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(A) and 363 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014 to Enforce Sale Orders Against Lojas Americanas S.A. filed by Paul S. Hessler on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/16/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Hessler, Paul)
Docket Text: Matrix / Notice of Filing of Master Service List as of February 2, 2012 filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Amended Notice of Appearance (Notice of Change of Address) filed by Shawn M. Christianson on behalf of Oracle America, Inc.. (Christianson, Shawn)
Docket Text: Response / Debtors' (I) Reply to Oracle's Objection to the Debtors' Second Assumption Notice and (II) Objection to the Claim Amount Sought by the Oracle Proof Of Claim (related document(s)2162) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Second Order signed on 1/31/2012 Granting Debtors' Thirteenth Omnibus Objection To Claims (No Liability Claims And Satisfied Claims)(related document(s)2511, 2572). Hearing on Exhibit 2 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing on Second and Third Interim Applications for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses (related document(s)2630) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Various Documents Served on January 26, 2012 (related document(s)2622, 2628, 2626, 2624, 2629, 2621, 2625, 2627, 2623, 2620) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Notice of Hearing on Second and Third Interim Applications for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses (related document(s)2395, 2598, 2589, 2240, 2206, 2185, 2593, 2205, 2599, 2204, 1955, 2252, 2197, 2219, 2591) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 2/20/2012, (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Order signed on 1/26/2012 Granting Debtors' Fifteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims, Amended and Superseded Claims, and Misclassified Claims)(related document(s)2587). Hearing on Exhibit 4 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Order signed on 1/26/2012 Granting Debtors' Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims(Misclassified and Disputed Amount Claims)(related document(s)2586). Hearing on Exhibit 2 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Second Order signed on 1/26/2012 Granting Debtors' Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims) (related document(s)2408, 2520). Hearing on Exhibit 1 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Third Order signed on 1/26/2012 Granting Debtors Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims, Duplicative Claims, and Satisfied Tax Claims)(related document(s)2571, 2407, 2519). Hearing on Exhibit 1 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Third Order signed on 1/26/2012 Granting Debtors Tenth Omnibus Objection To Claims (Misclassified Claims)(related document(s)2570, 2517, 2406). Hearing on Exhibit 1 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Third Order signed on 1/26/2012 Granting Debtors Ninth Omnibus Objection To Claims (Misclassified Claims)(related document(s)2569, 2516, 2405). Hearing on Exhibit 1 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Third Order signed on 1/26/2012 Granting Debtors' Eighth Omnibus Objection To Claims (Misclassified Claims) (related document(s)2404, 2568, 2515). Hearing on Exhibit 2 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Third Order signed on 1/26/2012 Granting Debtors' Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims, Amended and Superseded Claims, and Duplicative Claims)(related document(s)2298, 2385, 2513). Hearing on Exhibit 2 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Fourth Order signed on 1/26/2012 Granting Debtors Fifth Omnibus Objection To Claims (No Liability Claims)(related document(s)2383, 2512, 2566, 2297). Hearing on Exhibit 2 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Fourth Order signed on 1/26/2012 Granting Debtors' First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims, Duplicative Claims, Zero-Dollar Claims, and No Liability Claims)(related document(s)2508, 2292, 2563, 2380). Hearing on Exhibit 2 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 2/28/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Response to Motion - Response in Opposition to Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2586) filed by Robert Drake Wilcox on behalf of Sign of the Times, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit "1") (Wilcox, Robert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Agenda for January 26, 2012 Omnibus Hearing (related document(s)2617) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Notice of Agenda filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/26/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Order signed on 1/24/2012 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Victoria A. Reardon, Esq. (Related Doc # 2608). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Debtors' (I) Objection to the Renewed Motion of Hughes Network Systems, LLC for Entry of an Order Allowing and Compelling Immediate Payment of an Administrative Expense Claim and (II) Cross-Motion for Reclassification of Amounts Asserted Therein (related document(s)2613) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Objection / Debtors' (I) Objection to the Renewed Motion of Hughes Network Systems, LLC for Entry of an Order Allowing and Compelling Immediate Payment of an Administrative Expense Claim and (II) Cross-Motion For Reclassification of Amounts Asserted Therein (related document(s)2537) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Debtors' Reply to Mary Hatcher's Response to the Debtors' 13th Omnibus Objection (related document(s)2610) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Order signed on 1/19/2012 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Dana Flanagan-McBeth, Esq. (Related Doc # 2604). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Response / Debtors' Reply to Mary Hatcher's Response to the Debtors' 13th Omnibus Objection (related document(s)2511, 2552, 2554) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Response By Interactive Communications International, Inc. in Opposition to Debtors' Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2586) filed by Christopher F. Graham on behalf of Interactive Communications International Inc.. (Graham, Christopher)
Docket Text: Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Victoria A. Reardon on behalf of State Of Michigan, Department Of Treasury. (Attachments: # (1) proposed Order# (2) Proof of Service) (Reardon, Victoria)
Docket Text: Omnibus Response to Motion to Debtors Fifteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2587) filed by Dana Flanagan-McBeth on behalf of California State Board of Equalization. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit SBE Response to Debtors Fifteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims# (2) Exhibit Exhibit B Part 2 Report of Field Audit# (3) Exhibit Exhibit C Billing and Refund Notice/Notice of Determination) (Flanagan-McBeth, Dana)
Docket Text: Response to Motion (related document(s)2587) filed by Victoria A. Reardon on behalf of State Of Michigan, Department Of Treasury. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) (Reardon, Victoria)
Docket Text: Response to Motion (related document(s)2586) filed by Victoria A. Reardon on behalf of State Of Michigan, Department Of Treasury. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) (Reardon, Victoria)
Docket Text: Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Dana Flanagan-McBeth on behalf of California State Board of Equalization. (Porter, Minnie) ($200.00 Filing Fee Paid, Receipt Number: 188532)Modified on 1/18/2012 (Porter, Minnie).
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re 1) Third Application of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, Attorneys for the Debtors, for Interim Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from July 1, 2011 Through November 30, 2011; and 2) Third Interim Application for Compensation of Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred by PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Independent Auditors and Accounting Advisors to the Debtors, for the Period July 1, 2011 Through November 30, 2011 (related document(s)2598, 2599) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Response to Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Fifteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims, Amended and Superseded Claims, and Misclassified Claims) (related document(s)2587) filed by Timothy T. Mitchell on behalf of Joseph W. Rybowicz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Portion of Motion #8 and Order #46# (2) Exhibit B Real Estate Incentive Plan# (3) Exhibit C Incentive Breakdown# (4) Exhibit D Email 6-2-2011) (Mitchell, Timothy)
Docket Text: Response to Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Fifteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims, Amended and Superseded Claims, and Misclassified Claims) (related document(s)2587) filed by Timothy T. Mitchell on behalf of Lyle B. Stanleigh. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Portion of Motion #8 and Order #46# (2) Exhibit B Real Estate Incentive Plan# (3) Exhibit C Incentive Breakdown# (4) Exhibit D Email 6-2-2011) (Mitchell, Timothy)
Docket Text: Response to Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Fifteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims, Amended and Superseded Claims, and Misclassified Claims) (related document(s)2587) filed by Timothy T. Mitchell on behalf of Karen Geer. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Portion of Motion #8 and Order #46# (2) Exhibit B Real Estate Incentive Plan# (3) Exhibit C Incentive Breakdown# (4) Exhibit D Email 6-2-2011) (Mitchell, Timothy)
Docket Text: Third Application for Interim Professional Compensation for PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Auditor, period: 7/1/2011 to 11/30/2011, fee:$4,827.50, expenses: $333.94. filed by PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Third Interim Application of Rothschild Inc. for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (related document(s)2591) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Third Interim Application of Cooley LLP, Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from July 1, 2011 Through November 30, 2011 (related document(s)2593) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert)
Docket Text: Third Application for Interim Professional Compensation Third Interim Application of Cooley LLP, Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period From July 1, 2011 Through November 30, 2011 for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, period: 7/1/2011 to 11/30/2011, fee:$75227.50, expenses: $1508.53. filed by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: # (1) Time Records) (Hershcopf, Cathy)
Docket Text: Third Application for Interim Professional Compensation for Rothschild Inc., Other Professional, period: 7/1/2011 to 11/30/2011, fee:$270,595.00, expenses: $0. filed by Rothschild Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re 1) Debtors' Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified and Disputed Amount Claims); and 2) Debtors' Fifteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims, Amended and Superseded Claims, and Misclassified Claims) (related document(s)2587, 2586) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason)
Docket Text: Opposition OF NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE TO DEBTORS FIFTEENTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIMS (related document(s)2587) filed by Neal S. Mann on behalf of New York State Department of Taxation And Finance. (Mann, Neal)
Docket Text: Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Fifteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims, Amended and Superseded Claims, and Misclassified Claims) with hearing to be held on 1/26/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 1/18/2012, filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc..(Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified and Disputed Amount Claims) with hearing to be held on 1/26/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 1/18/2012, filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc..(Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Transfer (Partial) for James B. Albers, Judith K. Burns, Elizabeth J. Armour, Marilyn K. Kiep re: High-Columbus Co. (Claim No. 1043) (related document(s)2558) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason)
Docket Text: Matrix / Notice of Filing of Master Service List as of January 3, 2012 filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)2581) filed by Michael James Edelman on behalf of DJM Realty Services, LLC, Retail Regroup Inc. d/b/a Retail Resource Group. (Edelman, Michael)
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Retail Resource Group and DJM Realty Services, LLC for Order (a) Allowing Administrative Expense Claims, (b) Compelling Dish Network Corporation to Pay Such Claims, and (c) Granting Related Relief (related document(s)2534) filed by Michael James Edelman on behalf of DJM Realty Services, LLC, Retail Regroup Inc. d/b/a Retail Resource Group. (Edelman, Michael)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Second Order Granting Debtors' Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) (related document(s)2568) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Documents Served on December 23, 2011 (related document(s)2565, 2561, 2571, 2567, 2569, 2566, 2570, 2572, 2563, 2564) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason)
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal filed by Jonathan L. Howell on behalf of TSCA-222 Limited Partnership, TSCA-229 Limited Partnership, Texas Plaza 303 Limited Partnership. (Howell, Jonathan)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Altair's Response in Opposition to Debtor's Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2511) filed by Benjamin H. Price on behalf of Americorp, Inc. dba Altair Global Relocation. (Price, Benjamin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re 1) Third Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in Their Capacity as Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period May 1, 2011 Through July 31, 2011; and 2) Fourth Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in Their Capacity as Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period August 1, 2011 Through October 31, 2011 (related document(s)2560, 2559) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason)
Docket Text: Order signed on 12/23/2011 Granting Debtors Thirteenth Omnibus Objection To Claims (No Liability Claims And Satisfied Claims) (related document(s)2511). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Second Order signed on 12/23/2011 Granting Debtors Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims, Duplicative Claims, and Satisfied Tax Claims)(related document(s)2407, 2519). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Second Order signed on 12/23/2011 Order Granting Debtors Tenth Omnibus Objection To Claims (Misclassified Claims) (related document(s)2517, 2406). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Second Order signed on 12/23/2011 Granting Debtors Ninth Omnibus Objection To Claims (Misclassified Claims)(related document(s)2516, 2405). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Second Order signed on 12/23/2011 Granting Debtors Eighth Omnibus Objection To Claims (Misclassified Claims)(related document(s)2404, 2515). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entry Modified on 12/28/2011 to Attach Correct PDF Files) (Richards, Beverly).
Docket Text: Third Order signed on 12/23/2011 Granting Debtors Seventh Omnibus Objection To Claims (Substantively Duplicative Claims, No Liability Claims, and Disputed Amount Claims)(related document(s)2299, 2379, 2514). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Third Order signed on 12/23/2011 Granting Debtors Fifth Omnibus Objection To Claims (No Liability Claims) (related document(s)2512, 2297, 2384) (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Third Order signed on 12/23/2011 Granting Debtors Fourth Omnibus Objection To Claims (Satisfied Tax Claims)(Related Doc # 2295, 2383, 2510) . (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Third Order signed on 12/23/2011 Granting Debtors Third Omnibus Objection To Claims (No Liability Claims and Satisfied Tax Claims)(related document(s)2294, 2509, 2382). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Third Order signed on 12/23/2011 Granting Debtors' First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims, Duplicative Claims, Zero-Dollar Claims, and No Liability Claims)(related document(s)2508, 2292, 2380). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Order signed on 12/23/2011 Approving Stipulation and Agreement Between Debtors and Estevan Muniz Lifting Automatic Stay Solely to Pursue Insurance Proceeds and for Other Related Relief (Related Doc # 2477). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Statement / Fourth Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in Their Capacity as Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period August 1, 2011 Through October 31, 2011 filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Statement / Third Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in Their Capacity as Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period May 1, 2011 Through July 31, 2011 filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC. (Sosland, Martin)
Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (CLAIMS AGENT CASES ONLY)
Docket Text: Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:High-Columbus Co.(Claim No.1043, Amount 28,965.80). To J. Albers, J. Burns, E. Armour, M. Kiep. filed by Brenda K. Bowers on behalf of High-Columbus Co..(Bowers, Brenda)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of (I) Hearing Cancellation, (II) Proposed Entry of Orders on Uncontested or Settled Claims, and (III) Adjournment of Contested Matters (related document(s)2556) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason)
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of (I) Hearing Cancellation, (II) Proposed Entry of Orders on Uncontested or Settled Claims, and (III) Adjournment of Contested Matters filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/26/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Withdrawal of Claim(s): (Administrative Claim No. 5913) filed by Anthony J Cichello on behalf of OCW Retail - Belmont LLC.(Cichello, Anthony)
Docket Text: Supplemental Declaration in Support of Response to Motion (Docket Number 2552) (related document(s)2511) filed by Michael J. Naporano on behalf of Mary Bell Hatcher. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Naporano, Michael)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Debtors 13th Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2511) filed by Michael J. Naporano on behalf of Mary Bell Hatcher. (Naporano, Michael)
Docket Text: Amended Response to Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims) (related document(s)2408) filed by Timothy T. Mitchell on behalf of Ben Kirkland. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Portion of Motion #8 and Order #46# (2) Exhibit B Real Estate Incentive Plan# (3) Exhibit C Incentive Breakdown# (4) Exhibit D Email 6-2-2011) (Mitchell, Timothy)
Docket Text: Response to Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims and Satisified Claims) (related document(s)2511) filed by Timothy T. Mitchell on behalf of Matthew J. Scow. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Portion of Motion #8 and Order #46# (2) Exhibit B Real Estate Incentive Plan# (3) Exhibit C Incentive Breakdown# (4) Exhibit D Email 6-2-2011) (Mitchell, Timothy)
Docket Text: Amended Response to Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims and Satisified Claims) (related document(s)2511) filed by Timothy T. Mitchell on behalf of Ben Kirkland. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Portion of Motion #8 and Order #46# (2) Exhibit B Real Estate Incentive Plan# (3) Exhibit C Incentive Breakdown# (4) Exhibit D Email 6-2-2011) (Mitchell, Timothy)
Docket Text: Response to Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims and Satisified Claims) (related document(s)2511) filed by Timothy T. Mitchell on behalf of Judy Fairfield. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Portion of Motion #8 and Order #46# (2) Exhibit B Real Estate Incentive Plan# (3) Exhibit C Incentive Breakdown# (4) Exhibit D Email 6-2-2011) (Mitchell, Timothy)
Docket Text: Response to Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims and Satisified Claims) (related document(s)2511) filed by Timothy T. Mitchell on behalf of Nancy Demuth. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Portion of Motion #8 and Order #46# (2) Exhibit B Real Estate Incentive Plan# (3) Exhibit C Incentive Breakdown# (4) Exhibit D Email 6-2-2011) (Mitchell, Timothy)
Docket Text: Response to Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims and Satisified Claims) (related document(s)2511) filed by Timothy T. Mitchell on behalf of Michael Palmer. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Portion of Motion #8 and Order #46# (2) Exhibit B Real Estate Incentive Plan# (3) Exhibit C Incentive Breakdown# (4) Exhibit D Email 6-2-2011) (Mitchell, Timothy)
Docket Text: Response to Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims and Satisified Claims) (related document(s)2511) filed by Timothy T. Mitchell on behalf of Marc T. Comstock. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Portion of Motion #8 and Order #46# (2) Exhibit B Real Estate Incentive Plan# (3) Exhibit C Incentive Breakdown# (4) Exhibit D Email 6-2-2011) (Mitchell, Timothy)
Docket Text: Response to Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims and Satisified Claims) (related document(s)2511) filed by Timothy T. Mitchell on behalf of Karen Geer. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Portion of Motion #8 and Order #46# (2) Exhibit B Real Estate Incentive Plan# (3) Exhibit C - Incentive Breakdown# (4) Exhibit D Email 6-2-2011) (Mitchell, Timothy)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Debtors' Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims and Satisified Claims) (related document(s)2511) filed by Timothy T. Mitchell on behalf of Tracy Murphree. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Portion of Motion #8 and Order #46# (2) Exhibit B Real Estate Incentive Plan# (3) Exhibit C Incentive Breakdown# (4) Exhibit D Email 6-2-2011) (Mitchell, Timothy)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Debtors' Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims and Satisified Claims) (related document(s)2511) filed by Timothy T. Mitchell on behalf of David Counts. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Portion of Motion #8 and Order #46# (2) Exhibit B Real Estate Incentive Plan# (3) Exhibit C Incentive Breakdown# (4) Exhibit D Email 6-2-2011) (Mitchell, Timothy)
Docket Text: Opposition Of New York State Department of Taxation and Finance To Debtors' Thirteenth Omnibus Objection To Claims (related document(s)2511) filed by Neal S. Mann on behalf of New York State Department of Taxation And Finance. (Mann, Neal)
Docket Text: Supplemental Certificate of Service re: Reply of Credera Enterprises Company and Gencorp Technologie Inc. in Support of Motion for Allowance and Payment of "Sale Period" Administrative Claim (related document(s)2539) filed by David W. Parham on behalf of Credera Enterprises Company. (Parham, David)
Docket Text: Reply to Motion for Allowance and Payment of "Sale Period" Administrative Claim (related document(s)2291) filed by David W. Parham on behalf of Credera Enterprises Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of David Dobat) (Parham, David)
Docket Text: Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses / Renewed Motion Of Hughes Network Systems, LLC For Entry Of An Order Allowing And Compelling Immediate Payment Of An Administrative Claim for Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Other Professional, period: 2/25/2011 to 4/25/2011, fee:$474,945.13, expenses: $0.00.(related document(s)1785) filed by Christopher R. Donoho III. with hearing to be held on 12/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 12/13/2011, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Proposed Order# (2) Exhibit B- Declaration of Philip K O'Brien# (3) Exhibit C- Excerpts of Bid Procedures Hearing Transcript# (4) Exhibit D- March Invoices# (5) Exhibit E- Gross April Invoices) (Donoho, Christopher)
Docket Text: Notice of Motion to Set Hearing / Notice Of Renewed Motion Of Hughes Network Systems, LLC For Entry Of An Order Allowing And Compelling Immediate Payment Of An Administrative Claim filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Hughes Network Systems, LLC. with hearing to be held on 12/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 12/13/2011, (Donoho, Christopher)
Docket Text: Motion to Allow/Motion of Retail Resource Group and DJM Realty Services, LLC for Order (a) Allowing Administrative Expense Claims; (b) Compelling Dish Network Corporation to Pay Such Claims; and (c) Granting Related Relief filed by Michael James Edelman on behalf of DJM Realty Services, LLC, Retail Regroup Inc. d/b/a Retail Resource Group. with hearing to be held on 12/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 12/13/2011, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F) (Edelman, Michael)
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Adperio, Inc., for Leave to File a Late Administrative Claim (related document(s)2012) filed by Steven T. Mulligan on behalf of Adperio, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Pleading Declaration of Service)(Mulligan, Steven)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Debtors' Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims and Satisfied Claims) (related document(s)2511) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Documents Served on November 30, 2011 (related document(s)2512, 2508, 2509, 2521, 2516, 2517, 2513, 2514, 2510, 2519, 2515, 2520) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason)
Docket Text: Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by David W. Parham on behalf of Credera Enterprises Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Order) (Parham, David)
Docket Text: Certificate of Service (related document(s)2526) filed by Thomas R. Fawkes on behalf of SFN Professional Services LLC f/k/a Spherion Atlantic Enterprises LLC. (Fawkes, Thomas)
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal (related document(s)2193) filed by Thomas R. Fawkes on behalf of SFN Professional Services LLC f/k/a Spherion Atlantic Enterprises LLC. (Fawkes, Thomas)
Docket Text: Matrix / Notice of Filing of Master Service List as of December 1, 2011 filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Response / Reply of Blockbuster L.L.C. to Objection of Lojas Americanas S.A. to Motion of Blockbuster L.L.C. Pursuant to 11. U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 363 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9014 to Enforce Sale Orders Against Lojas Americanas S.A. (related document(s)2309, 2342) filed by Paul S. Hessler on behalf of Blockbuster L.L.C.. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Hessler, Paul)
Docket Text: Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Barry S. Glaser filed by Tally M. Wiener on behalf of Los Angeles County Treasurer and Tax Collector. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Wiener, Tally)
Docket Text: Order signed on 11/30/2011 Approving Consensual Extension of the Deadline Under Section 365(d)(4) of The Bankruptcy Code. (Related Doc #[2518]) (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Docket Text: Order signed on 11/30/2011 Granting Debtors' Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims)(related document(s)2408). Hearing on Claims Listed on Exhibit 2 (Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 12/20/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Order signed on 11/30/2011 Granting Debtors' Eleventh Omnibus Objecion to Claims (related document(s)2407). Hearing on Claims Listed on Exhibit 4 (Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 12/20/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Motion to Approve /Debtors' Motion for an Order Approving Consensual Extensions of the Deadline Under § 365(d)(4) of the Bankruptcy Code (This administrative entry was entered for docketing purposes) (related document(s)1596) filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Docket Text: Order signed on 11/30/2011 Granting Debtors' Tenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims)(related document(s)2406). Hearing on Claims Listed on Exhibit 2 (Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 12/20/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Order signed on 11/30/2011 Granting Debtors' Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims)(related document(s)2405). Hearing on Claims Listed on Exhibit 2 (Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 12/20/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Order signed on 11/30/2011 Granting Debtors' Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims)(related document(s)2404). Hearing on Claims Listed on Exhibit 2 (Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 12/20/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Second Order signed on 11/30/2011 Granting Debtors' Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Substantively Duplicative Claims, No Liability Claims, and Disputed Amount Claims) (related document(s)2299, 2379). Hearing on Claims Listed on Exhibit 3 (Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 12/20/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Second Order signed on 11/30/2011 Granting Debtors' Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims, Amended and Superseded Claims, and Duplicative Claims) (related document(s)2298, 2385). Hearing on Claims Listed on Exhibit 3 (Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 12/20/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Second Order signed on 11/30/2011 Granting Debtors' Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims) (related document(s)2297, 2384). Hearing on Claims Listed on Exhibit 2 (Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 12/20/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims and Satisified Claims) with hearing to be held on 12/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 12/13/2011, filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc..(Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Second Order signed on 11/30/2011 Granting Debtors' Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Satisfied Tax Claims)(related document(s)2383, 2295). Hearing on Claims Listed on Exhibit 2 (Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 12/20/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Second Order signed on 11/30/2011 Granting Debtors' Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims and Satisfied Tax Claims) (related document(s)2294, 2382). Hearing on Claims Listed on Exhibit 3 (Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 12/20/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Second Order signed on 11/30/2011 Granting Debtors First Omnibus Objection To Claims (Amended And Superseded Claims, Duplicative Claims, Zero-Dollar Claims, And No Liability Claims)(related document(s)2292, 2380). Hearing on Exhibit 2 (the Adjourned Claims) to be Held on 12/20/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Response of James I. and Ruth Chipokas to Debtor's 8th Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claim 4620) filed by Robert N. Michaelson on behalf of James I and Ruth Chipokas. (Michaelson, Robert)
Docket Text: Letter Notice of Change of Address and Numbers filed by Amish R. Doshi on behalf of AmREIT Casa Linda, LP, Oracle America, Inc.. (Doshi, Amish)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Cancellation of Hearing and Adjournment of Certain Contested Matters (related document(s)2492) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Re:Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims(MisClassified Claims) Relating to Claim 6130 (related document(s)2405) filed by Murray I. Weiner on behalf of Monument Market Place, Inc.. (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Docket Text: Opposition to Omnibus Objection to Claim Number 5536 filed by Berliner Cohen on behalf of Madelyn Bourdet. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Laura Palazzolo# (2) Certificate of Service) (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Docket Text: Amended Response to Motion Debtors' Eighth Omnibus Objection (Claim No. 5038) (related document(s)2404) filed by Kevin Evont Bowens on behalf of AZ PAV, LLC. (Bowens, Kevin)
Docket Text: Opposition to Debtor's Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2405) filed by Marvin A. Robon on behalf of NorthWest Ohio Properties, Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C) (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Re:Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No. 2209) (related document(s)2404) filed by Jane Cohen on behalf of Colonial Square Associates, L.P.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Re: Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2408) filed by Jeffrey M. Sachs on behalf of CJC Enterprises, LLC. (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Re:Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2404) filed by Howard S. Levy. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration) (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Re: Debtor's Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims Regarding Claim Number 4657 (related document(s)2404) filed by Conde T. Cox on behalf of Joe & Delores McCray Revocable Trust. (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Seventh Supplemental List of Ordinary Course Professionals (related document(s)2476) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason)
Docket Text: Notice of No Objection Filed on Behalf of MRI Contract Staffing, Inc (related document(s)2251) filed by Warren S. Wolf on behalf of Warren Wolf. (Wolf, Warren)
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Cancellation of Hearing and Adjournment of Certain Contested Matters filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Notice of Cancellation of Hearing and Further Adjournment of Contested Matter (related document(s)2439) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason)
Docket Text: Order signed on 11/18/2011 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Robert Drake Wilcox, Esq. (Related Doc # 2445). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal Of Application Of Florida Power Corporation d/b/a Progress Energy Florida For Payment Of Administrative Expenses [Docket No. 1846] (related document(s)1846) filed by Jessica G. Berman on behalf of Florida Power Corporation d/b/a Progress Energy Florida. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Berman, Jessica)
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal Of Application Of Carolina Power & Light Company d/b/a Progress Energy Carolinas, LLC For Payment Of Administrative Expenses [Docket No. 1844] (related document(s)1844) filed by Jessica G. Berman on behalf of Carolina Power & Light Company d/b/a Progress Energy Carolinas, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Berman, Jessica)
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal Of Application Of Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC For Payment Of Administrative Expenses [Docket No. 1841] (related document(s)1841) filed by Jessica G. Berman on behalf of Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Berman, Jessica)
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal Of Request Of Georgia Power Company For Payment Of Administrative Expenses [Docket No. 1839] (related document(s)1839) filed by Jessica G. Berman on behalf of Georgia Power Company. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Berman, Jessica)
Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal Of Application Of American Electric Power For Payment Of Administrative Expenses [Docket No. 1843] (related document(s)1843) filed by Jessica G. Berman on behalf of American Electric Power. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Berman, Jessica)
Docket Text: Order signed on 11/17/2011 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan L. Howell, Esq. (Related Doc # 2423). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Matthew B. Heimann on behalf of Estevan Muniz. with hearing to be held on 12/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law# (2) Exhibit A# (3) Exhibit B# (4) Exhibit C# (5) Certificate of Service) (Heimann, Matthew)
Docket Text: Statement / Notice of Seventh Supplemental List of Ordinary Course Professionals (related document(s)360) filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen)
Docket Text: Response to Motion and objection (related document(s)2404) filed by David A. Greer on behalf of Birchwood Mall Associates. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proof of claim w/ statement of account) (Greer, David)
Docket Text: Response In Opposition to Debtors' Ninith Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2405) filed by Sean P. O'Brien on behalf of c/o Sean P. o"Brien Smiths Food & Drug Centers. with hearing to be held on 11/22/2011 (check with court for location) Objections due by 11/15/2011, (O'Brien, Sean)
Docket Text: Reply to Motion / Triangle 17 Center LLC's Reply to Debtors' Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) Relating to Claim Number 6322 (related document(s)2405) filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of Triangle 17 Center LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit "A") (Donovan, J.)
Docket Text: Reply to Motion / Fort Lee Plaza LLC's Reply to Debtors' Eight Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) Relating to Claim Number 6323 (related document(s)2404) filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of Fort Lee Plaza LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit "A") (Donovan, J.)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Opposition Reponse to Debtor's Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2405) filed by Lori V. Vaughan on behalf of Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Vaughan, Lori)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Response To Debtors Ninth Omnibus Objection To Claims As Managing Agent for Sandhills Shopping Center LLC (Store 37012) filed by Deborah L. Fletcher on behalf of Primax Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A - Administrative Proof of Claim# (2) Pleading Certificate of Service) (Fletcher, Deborah)
Docket Text: Response to Motion (Ninth Omnibus Objection) as to Claim 6016 (related document(s)2405) filed by William J. Levant on behalf of Newport Plaza Associates. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Termination Letter# (2) Exhibit B - Rejection Notice# (3) Certificate of Service# (4) Proposed Order) (Levant, William)
Docket Text: Response to Motion / Response to Debtors' TWELFTH Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2408) filed by Christopher Loizides on behalf of Stanley Security Solutions, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/22/2011 (check with court for location) (Attachments: # (1) Cetificate of Service) (Loizides, Christopher)
Docket Text: Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Ronald White filed by Ronald White. (Cantrell, Deirdra) ($200.00 Filing Fee Paid , Receipt Number: 188115)Modified on 11/17/2011 (Porter, Minnie).
Docket Text: Orde signed on 11/15/2011r Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of William J. Levant, Esq. (Related Doc # 2429). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica)
Docket Text: Response to Motion - Response of Heritage Intercontinental Limited Partnership to Debtors' Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2404) filed by Shawn Randall Fox on behalf of Heritage Intercontinental Limited Partnership. (Fox, Shawn)
Docket Text: Response to Motion BY TULLER SQUARE NORTHPOINTE, LLC TO DEBTORS NINTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIMS filed by Robert N. Michaelson on behalf of TULLER SQUARE NORTHPOINTE, LLC. with hearing to be held on 11/22/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 11/15/2011, (Michaelson, Robert)
Docket Text: Response to Motion By CARRIAGE PLACE AND DUBLIN OAKS LIMITED TO DEBTORS EIGHTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIMS filed by Robert N. Michaelson on behalf of Carriage Place and Dublin Oaks Limited. with hearing to be held on 11/22/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 11/15/2011, (Michaelson, Robert)
Docket Text: Affidavit of Service re Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 363, 364 and 365 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, 6003, 6004, 6006, 9008 and 9014 Authorizing and Approving the Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to the Assignee (related document(s)2427) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason)
Docket Text: Opposition of Milestone Square Equities (Claim NO. 6191) to Motion to Reclassify Administration Claim with Exhibit A (Proof of Administration Claim) and Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2405) filed by M. David Graubard on behalf of Milestone Square Equities. (Graubard, M.)
Docket Text: Response to Motion to the Debtors Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Stephen W. Spence on behalf of McGill Development Limited Partnership No. 3. with hearing to be held on 11/22/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 11/15/2011, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Certificate of Service) (Spence, Stephen)
Docket Text: Response to Debtors' Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) filed by Christina M. Thompson on behalf of Inland Continental Property Management, Inc., Inland Southwest Management, LLC, Inland US Management, LLC. with hearing to be held on 11/22/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 11/15/2011, (Thompson, Christina)
Docket Text: Opposition Response to Debtors' Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Tally M. Wiener on behalf of Los Angeles County Treasurer and Tax Collector. (Wiener, Tally)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Response in Opposition to Debtors' Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (re: Claims 4712, 4717, and 4718) (related document(s)2405) filed by Jonathan L. Howell on behalf of TSCA-222 Limited Partnership, TSCA-229 Limited Partnership, Texas Plaza 303 Limited Partnership. (Howell, Jonathan)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Debtors' Eighth Omnibus Objection (Claim No. 5038) (related document(s)2404) filed by Kevin Evont Bowens on behalf of AZ PAV, LLC. (Bowens, Kevin)
Docket Text: Response to Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2405) filed by David A. Hill, Jr. on behalf of Lexham Street Retail LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Lease Excerpts# (2) Exhibit B - Additional Documents) (Hill, Jr., David)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Debtors' Eighth Omnibus Objection (Claim No. 5483) (related document(s)2404) filed by Craig B. Fry on behalf of Duane W Metzger. with hearing to be held on 11/22/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Fry, Craig)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Frederic M. Wein's Response to Debtor's Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2406) filed by Ryan Matthew Billings on behalf of Fredric Wein. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2011 (check with court for location) Reply due by 11/15/2011, (Billings, Ryan)
Docket Text: Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Robert Drake Wilcox on behalf of Robert Drake Wilcox. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Order) (Wilcox, Robert)
Docket Text: Response to Debtors' Tenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2406) filed by Michael J. Small on behalf of Lelyn Lakeview Properties, L.P.. (Small, Michael)
Docket Text: Response to Motion (related document(s)2405) filed by Frank J. Wright on behalf of Prescott Interests, Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - E) (Wright, Frank)
Docket Text: Response to Motion WJG Realty Trust to Debtors' (related document(s)2406) filed by John C. LaLiberte on behalf of Blockbuster, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/22/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Reply due by 11/15/2011, (LaLiberte, John)
Docket Text: Response to Motion The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company LLC (related document(s)2405) filed by John C. LaLiberte on behalf of Block & Co., Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/22/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Reply due by 11/15/2011, (LaLiberte, John)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Giant Food Stores, LLC (related document(s)2404) filed by John C. LaLiberte on behalf of Blockbuster, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Reply due by 11/15/2011, (LaLiberte, John)
Docket Text: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Cancellation of Hearing and Further Adjournment of Contested Matter filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin)
Docket Text: Statement Verified Statement of Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2019 filed by Jonathan L. Howell on behalf of TSCA-222 Limited Partnership, TSCA-229 Limited Partnership, Texas Plaza 303 Limited Partnership. (Howell, Jonathan)
Docket Text: Response to Motion for Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2405) filed by David S. Barritt on behalf of LaSalle National Trust n/k/a Chicago Land Trust Company as Trustee. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Barritt, David)
Docket Text: Response to Motion fo Eith Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2404) filed by Michael D. Brofman on behalf of Alrose Hampton Bays, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Wilbur Breslin# (2) Affidavit of Service) (Brofman, Michael)
Docket Text: Response to Motion Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.'s Response to Debtors' Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2405) filed by Mark Minuti on behalf of Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Certificate of Service) (Minuti, Mark)