The Flintkote Company
Bankruptcy Case Delaware Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 04-11300
District Judge Judith K. Fitzgerald, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 30, 2017 at 12:00 AM EDT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Campbell & Levine, LLC, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Campbell & Levine, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen Campbell Davis +1 302 426 1900 kcampbell@camlev.com
Space Mark Thomas Hurford +1 302 426 1900 +1 302 425 9947 mhurford@camlev.com
No Logo The Flintkote Company, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Campbell & Levine, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Thomas Hurford +1 302 426 1900 +1 302 425 9947 mhurford@camlev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura Davis Jones +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 ljones@pszjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Sandra G.M. Selzer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandra G.M. Selzer

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William F. Taylor, Jr. +1 302 984 6300 +1 302 984 6399 wtaylor@mccarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/20/2009 Kathleen P. Makowski +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 kmakowski@pszjlaw.com
Space Scotta Edelen McFarland +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 smcfarland@pszyj.com
Space James E. O'Neill, III +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 joneill@pszyjw.com
No Logo The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curtis A. Hehn +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 chehn@pszjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen P. Makowski +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 kmakowski@pszjlaw.com
Space James E. O'Neill, III +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 joneill@pszyjw.com
No Logo The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Campbell & Levine, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Thomas Hurford +1 302 426 1900 +1 302 425 9947 mhurford@camlev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura Davis Jones +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 ljones@pszjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Sandra G.M. Selzer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandra G.M. Selzer

Toggle Switch Represented by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/20/2009 Kathleen P. Makowski +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 kmakowski@pszjlaw.com
Space Scotta Edelen McFarland +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 smcfarland@pszyj.com
Space James E. O'Neill, III +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 joneill@pszyjw.com
No Logo The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Campbell & Levine, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Thomas Hurford +1 302 426 1900 +1 302 425 9947 mhurford@camlev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura Davis Jones +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 ljones@pszjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Sandra G.M. Selzer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandra G.M. Selzer

Toggle Switch Represented by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/20/2009 Kathleen P. Makowski +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 kmakowski@pszjlaw.com
Space Scotta Edelen McFarland +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 smcfarland@pszyj.com
Space James E. O'Neill, III +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 joneill@pszyjw.com
No Logo The Garden City Group, Inc., Claims Agent

Toggle Switch Represented by The Garden City Group, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen Beth Shaer +1 631 470 6861 +1 631 940 6544 kenneth_freda@gardencitygroup.com
Space Jeffrey Stuart Stein +1 631 470 6834 +1 631 940 6554 jeff_stein@gardencitygroup.com
Nature of Suit 434 - Injunctive Relief
  Entries (5334) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6364
    LREF
    Blank 6363
      LREF
      Blank 6362
        LREF
        Blank 6361
          LREF
          Blank 6360
            LREF
            Blank 6359
              LREF
              Blank 6358
                LREF
                Blank 6357
                  LREF
                  Blank 6356
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6350
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6348
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Blank 6347
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6346
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Blank 6345
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6344
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6343
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6340
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6339
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Blank 6338
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6337
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6335
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6334
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6332
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6329
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6328
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6327
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6326
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6325
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6324
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6323
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Blank 6322
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 6321
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 6320
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6319
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6318
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6317
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6309
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Blank 6308
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6291
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6290
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6289
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Blank 6288
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6287
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6286
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Blank 6285
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 6284
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 6281
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6280
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6266 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Receipt of filing fee for Notice of Appeal (Ap)(04-11300-JKF) [appeal,ntcapl] ( 255.00). Receipt Number 5534399, amount $ 255.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6256 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Receipt of filing fee for Notice of Appeal (Ap)(04-11300-JKF) [appeal,ntcapl] ( 255.00). Receipt Number 5528817, amount $ 255.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6213 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Request for Transcript of hearing held on 9/26/2011 received. To obtain a copy of this transcript, contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber J&J Court Transcribers, Telephone number (609) 586-2311. (SG) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6154
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 6063
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6054
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6052
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6025
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6024
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6017
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6016
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 6013
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 6012
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6008
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6007
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5999
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5996
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5743
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5660
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5622
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5621
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5620
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5619
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5618
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5615
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5614
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5472 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Application for Compensation of Irell & Manella LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period October 1, 2010 to October 31, 2010 Filed by Irell & Manella LLP. Objections due by 12/1/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5471 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Application for Compensation of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period May 1, 2010 to July 31, 2010 Filed by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. Objections due by 11/30/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5470 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Revised Fee Application Request of The Law Office of Alan Pedlar for the Period September 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5385 , 5434 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5469 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Frantz Ward LLP for the Period August 1, 2010 through August 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5410 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5468 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Final Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Floor, Room 309, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5467 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Certification of Counsel Regarding Deposition Transcript Designations of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and Cross-Designations of the Plan Proponents Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5466 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Service -- Affidavit of Service Regarding (I) Notice of Appeal [D.I. 5462], and (II) Letter to The Honorable Judith K. Fitzgerald [D.I. 5465] (related document(s) 5462 , 5465 ) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited. (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5465 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Judith K. Fitzgerald (related document(s) 5425 ) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited. (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5464 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing on Professionals' Quarterly Fee Applications for the Twenty-Third Interim Period (November 1, 2009 through January 31, 2010) for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Pursuant to Section 331 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 4846 , 4881 , 4882 , 4883 , 4897 , 4909 , 4913 , 4916 , 4918 , 4926 , 4927 , 4929 , 4930 , 4932 , 4933 , 4938 , 5003 , 5031 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. Objections due by 12/13/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5463 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Receipt of filing fee for Notice of Appeal (Ap)(04-11300-JKF) [appeal,ntcapl] ( 255.00). Receipt Number 4926649, amount $ 255.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5462 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appeal . Fee Amount $255. (related document(s) 5425 ) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited. Appellant Designation due by 11/22/2010. (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5461 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Application for Compensation of of Snyder Miller Orton LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period October 1, 2010 to October 31, 2010 Filed by Snyder Miller Orton LLP. Objections due by 11/29/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5460 Filed: 11/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) 5455 ) Service Date 11/06/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5459 Filed: 11/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) 5454 ) Service Date 11/06/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5458 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Application for Compensation of Application for Compensation of WHSA's Month of October 2010 for the period October 1, 2010 to October 31, 210 Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. Objections due by 11/26/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Fee Detail) (Smith, Warren) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5457 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Interim Application for Compensation of (Twenty-Sixth) of The Law Office of Alan Pedlar for COmpensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period August 1, 2010 to October 31, 2010 Filed by The Law Office of Alan Pedlar. Objections due by 11/24/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5456 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Compensation of The Law Office of Alan Pedlar for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period October 1, 2010 to October 31, 2010 Filed by The Law Office of Alan Pedlar. Objections due by 11/24/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5455 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript regarding Hearing Held 10/26/2010 RE: Continued Confirmation. Hearing held in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 2/2/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber J & J Court Transcribers, Telephone number (609)586-2311.] (RE: related document(s) 5414 ). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/12/2010. Redaction Request Due By 11/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/6/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 2/2/2011. (BJM) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5454 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript regarding Hearing Held 10/25/2010 RE: Confirmation. Hearing held in Pittsburgh, Pennsyvlania. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 2/2/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber J & J Court Transcribers, Telephone number (609)586-2311.] (RE: related document(s) 5414 ). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/12/2010. Redaction Request Due By 11/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/6/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 2/2/2011. (BJM) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5453 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Snyder Miller & Orton LLP for the Period September 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5384 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5452 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Rule 2019 Statement Filed by Cascino Vaughan Law Offices. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Weaver, John) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5451 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding [Signed] Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Dates for 2011 (related document(s) 5447 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5450 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee and Expenses Invoice of Irell & Manella LLP for the Period September 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5383 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5449 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Compensation of Kelly C. Wooster for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period October 1, 2010 to October 31, 2010 Filed by Kelly C. Wooster. Objections due by 11/22/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5448 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Service -- Notice of List of Exhibits Introduced by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited at the Confirmation Hearing Related to the Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization in Respect to The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited (as Modified) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Affidavit of Service) (Miller, Stephen) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2010 (TMB). Modified to replace the image of Exhibit A on 11/3/2010 (TMB). (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5447 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MODIFIED Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Dates for 2011 (related document(s) 5422 ). Signed on 10/27/2010. (SAJ) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5446 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Application for Compensation of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period September 1, 2010 to September 30, 2010 Filed by Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Objections due by 11/22/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5445 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application for Compensation of Sidley Austin LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period September 1, 2010 to September 30, 2010 Filed by Sidley Austin LLP. Objections due by 11/18/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5444 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Quarterly Fee Application of Frantz Ward LLP for the Period May 1, 2010 through July 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5378 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5443 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Kelly C. Wooster for the Period September 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5380 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5442 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Douglas E. Ernst (Related Doc # 5408 ). Signed on 10/28/2010. (SAJ) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5441 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement of Professionals' Compensation And Expenses For The Quarter Ending September 2010 Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5440 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement of Professionals' Compensation And Expenses For Period Ending June 2010 Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5439 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement of Professionals' Compensation And Expenses For The Quarter Ending March 2010 Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5438 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation for August 2010 (related document(s) 5369 ) Filed by Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP. (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5437 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation for August 2010 (related document(s) 5368 ) Filed by James J. McMonagle. (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5436 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation for August 2010 (related document(s) 5344 ) Filed by Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5435 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection Certificate of No Objection to WHSA's September fee application Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. (Smith, Warren) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5434 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for Compensation of The Law Office of Alan Pedlar for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period for the period September 1, 2010 to September 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5385 ) Filed by The Law Office of Alan Pedlar. Objections due by 11/16/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5433 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monthly Application for Compensation of McCarter & English, LLP for the period September 1, 2010 to Saptember 30, 2010 Filed by McCarter & English, LLP. Objections due by 11/17/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Invoices# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Service List) (Taylor, William) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5432 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Application for Compensation of Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered for the period September 1, 2010 to September 30, 2010 Filed by Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered. Objections due by 11/15/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit C Part II# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Certificate of Service # 7 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5431 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation of Campbell & Levine, LLC for the period September 1, 2010 to September 30, 2010 Filed by Campbell & Levine, LLC. Objections due by 11/15/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit September 2010# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5430 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Application for Compensation of Frank/Gecker, LLP for the period September 1, 2010 to September 30, 2010 Filed by Frank/Gecker LLP. Objections due by 11/15/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit September 2010# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5429 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application for Compensation of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period July 1, 2010 to July 31, 2010 Filed by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. Objections due by 11/15/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Notice# 2 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5428 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order (1) Approving Stipulation of the Plan Proponents and of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and Certain of its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries to Exclude Testimony and Other Evidence Regarding the Number and Amount of Claims and Demands and (2) Denying Motion in Limine of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and Certain of its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries to Exclude Testimony and Other Evidence Regarding the Number and Amount of Claims and Demands Due to the Approval of the Stipulation. (Related Doc # 5419 , 5353 ) Order Signed on 10/26/2010. (Baker, Ramona) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5427 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DUPLICATE ENTRY Stipulation by and Between Plan Proponents and Certain London Market Companies (related document(s) 5221 , 5351 ). Signed on 10/25/2010. (SAJ) Modified on 11/3/2010 (Baker, Ramona). (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5426 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation By and Between Plan Proponents and Certain London Market Companies. Related to Doc. # 5221 , 5351 . Signed on 10/25/2010. (Baker, Ramona) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5425 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Amended Motion for Leave to File Out-of-Time Proof of Claim. Related to Doc 5172 , 5242 , 5347 , 5377 , 5397 , 5399 , 5420 . Signed on 10/25/2010. (Baker, Ramona) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5424 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service Regarding Stipulation of the Plan Proponents and Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited Relating to Motion in Limine of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and Certain of Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries to Exclude Testimony and Other Evidence Regarding the Number and Amount of Claims and Demands (related document(s) 5419 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5423 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service Regarding Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Granting in Part and Denying in Party Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Amended Motion for Leave to File Out-of-Time Proof of Claim (related document(s) 5420 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5422 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certification of Counsel Regarding 2011 Omnibus Hearing Order Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5421 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) 5411 ) Service Date 10/22/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5420 Filed: 10/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Amended Motion for Leave to File Out-Of-Time Proof of Claim (related document(s) 5172 , 5242 , 5347 , 5377 , 5397 , 5399 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5419 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation Between The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited, and Plan Proponents and Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited Relating to Motion in Limine of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and Certain of Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries to Exclude Testimony and Other Evidence Regarding the Number and Amount of Claims and Demands. (related document(s) 5353 , 5356 , 5388 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5418 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Schiff Hardin LLP for the Period August 1-31, 2010. (related document(s) 5333 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5417 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Sidley Austin LLP for the Period August 1-31, 2010. (related document(s) 5337 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5416 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Application for Compensation of Fee and Expense Invoice for the period September 1, 2010 to September 30, 2010. Filed by Schiff Hardin LLP. Objections due by 11/11/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5415 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service for service of Third Amended Notice of Final Agenda for Matters Scheduled for a Hearing October 25-27, 2010 and November 2, 2010 at 9:00 A.M. in Pittsburgh (related document(s) 5414 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5414 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (related document(s) 5392 , 5396 , 5405 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2010 at 09:00 AM at United States Bankruptcy Court - District of Western PA, Pittsburgh, PA. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5413 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit(s) // Notice of Selection of Trustees for The Flintkote Asbestos Trust Filed by James J. McMonagle, Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Affidavit of Service) (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5412 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period September 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 [The Flintkote Company] Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (Attachments: # 1 Operating Report pt 2# 2 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5411 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript regarding Hearing Held 10/18/2010 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/18/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber J & J Court Transcribers, Telephone number (609)586-2311.] (RE: related document(s) 5381 ). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/27/2010. Redaction Request Due By 11/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/22/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/18/2011. (BJM) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5410 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for Compensation of Frantz Ward LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period August 1, 2010 to August 31, 2010 Filed by Frantz Ward LLP. Objections due by 11/8/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5409 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of McCarter & English, LLP for the Period August 1-31, 2010 (related document(s) 5334 ) Filed by McCarter & English, LLP. (Taylor, William) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5408 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Douglas E. Ernst, Esq.. Receipt Number DEX006824, Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5407 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Authorizing Debots to File Certain Materials Under Seal (related document(s) 5349 ). Signed on 10/18/2010. (SAJ) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5406 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service Certificate of Service for Response Brief of Certain London Market Insurance Companies to Plan Proponents' Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Confirmation of the Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization In Respect of The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited (As Modified) (related document(s) 5387 ) Filed by Certain London Market Insurance Companies. (Shiner, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5405 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (related document(s) 5392 , 5396 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2010 at 09:00 AM at United States Bankruptcy Court - District of Western PA, Pittsburgh, PA. Objections due by 10/15/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5404 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Plan Plan Proponents' Opposition to Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Motion (related document(s) 5388 , 5391 , 5399 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5403 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Notice of Final Agenda for Matters Scheduled for Hearing October 25-27, 2010 and November 2, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. in Pittsburgh (related document(s) 5392 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5402 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Amended Notice of Final Agenda for Matters Scheduled for Hearing October 25, 2010 through October 27, 2010 and November 2, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. in Pittsburgh (related document(s) 5396 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5401 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for Transcript of hearing held on 10/18/2010 received. To obtain a copy of this transcript, contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber J&J Court Transcribers, Inc. Telephone number (609) 586-2311. (SG) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5400 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service -- Affidavit of Service Regarding (I) Order Granting Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Motion for Leave to (A) File a Reply and (B) Exceed the Page Limit for Replies with Respect Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Amended Motion for Leave to File Out-of-Time Proof of Claim [D.I. 5397], and (II) Reply in Support of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Amended Motion for Leave to File Out-Of-Time Proof of Claim [D.I. 5399] (related document(s) 5397 , 5399 ) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited. (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5399 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply in Support of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Amended Motion for Leave to File Out-Of-Time Proof of Claim (related document(s) 5172 , 5242 , 5347 , 5377 , 5397 ) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5398 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Joyce F. Noyes (Related Doc # 5386 ). Signed on 10/18/2010. (SAJ) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5397 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Motion for Leave to (A) File a Reply and (B) Exceed the Page Limit for Replies with Respect Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Amended Motion for Leave to File Out-of-Time Proof of Claim (related document(s) 5172 , 5242 , 5347 , 5377 ). Signed on 10/18/2010. (SAJ) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5396 Filed: 10/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (related document(s) 5392 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2010 at 09:00 AM at United States Bankruptcy Court - District of Western PA, Pittsburgh, PA. Objections due by 10/15/2010. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5395 Filed: 10/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Withdrawal of Incorrectly Named Document at Docket No. 5390 - Plan Proponent's Opposition to Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Regent Pacific Representatives in Respect of the Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited (related document(s) 5390 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5394 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Mark M. Maloney in Support of the Response of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited to Plan Proponents' Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Confirmation of the Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization in Respect of The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited (as Modified) (related document(s) 5393 ) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Affidavit of Service) (Monzo, Eric) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5393 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief -- Response of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited to Plan Proponents' Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Confirmation of the Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization in Respect of The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited (as Modified) (related document(s) 3784 , 3790 , 5220 , 5351 , 5352 ) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Monzo, Eric) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5392 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2010 at 09:00 AM at United States Bankruptcy Court - District of Western PA, Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5391 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply /Plan Proponent's Reply to Supplemental Objections to the Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization in Respect of the Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited (As Modified) (related document(s) 4328 , 5346 , 5352 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5390 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply /Plan Proponent's Opposition to Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Regent Pacific Representatives in Respect of the Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited (related document(s) 4328 , 5346 , 5352 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited, (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5389 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection Plan Proponents' Opposition to Motion in Limine of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and Certain of Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries to Exclude Certain Testimony of Regent Pacific Representatives in Respect of the Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited (related document(s) 5354 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited, (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5388 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection Plan Proponents' Opposition to Motion in Limine of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and Certain of Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries to Exclude Testimony and Other Evidence Regarding the Number and Amount of Claims and Demands (related document(s) 5353 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited, (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5387 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief Response Brief of Certain London Market Insurance Companies to Plan Proponents' Supplemental Memorandum of Law In Support of Confirmation of the Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization In Respect of the Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited (As Modified) (related document(s) 5221 , 5351 ) Filed by Certain London Market Insurance Companies. (Shiner, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5386 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Joyce F. Noyes, Esquire. Receipt Number DEX-006800, Filed by Everest Reinsurance Company, Mt. McKinley Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Certification of Joyce F. Noyes, Esquire) (Demmy, John) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5385 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Compensation of The Law Office of Alan Pedlar for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period September 1, 2010 to September 30, 2010 Filed by The Law Office of Alan Pedlar. Objections due by 11/4/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5384 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Compensation of Snyder Miller Orton LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period September 1, 2010 to September 30, 2010 Filed by Snyder Miller Orton LLP. Objections due by 11/3/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5383 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation of Irell & Manella LLP for the period September 1, 2010 to September 30, 2010 Filed by Irell & Manella LLP. Objections due by 11/2/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5382 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period September 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 [Flintkote Mines Limited] Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5381 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Floor, Room 309, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/1/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5380 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Compensation of Kelly C. Wooster for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period September 1, 2010 to September 30, 2010 Filed by Kelly C. Wooster. Objections due by 10/28/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5379 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee and Expense Invoice of Irell & Manella LLP for the Period August 1, 2010 through August 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5318 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5378 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for Compensation of Frantz Ward LLP for Compensation and for Reimbusement of Expenses for the period May 1, 2010 to July 31, 2010 Filed by Frantz Ward LLP. Objections due by 10/28/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5377 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Leave -- Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Motion for Leave to (A) File A Reply and (B) Exceed the Page Limit for Replies with Respect to Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Amended Motion for Leave to File Out-Of-Time Proof of Claim (related document(s) 5172 , 5242 , 5347 ) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Reply# 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Affidavit of Service) (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5376 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Blake, Cassels & Graydon LLP for the Period August 1, 2010 through August 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5315 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5375 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Hearing on Debtors' Motion for Order Authorizing Debtors to File Materials Under Seal and for Protections Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(D) (related document(s) 5349 , 5373 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Floor, Room 309, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/11/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5374 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Frantz Ward LLP for the Period July 1, 2010 through July 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5313 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5373 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Shortenting Time on the Debtors' Motion for Order Authorizing Debtors to File Materials Under Seal and for Protections (related document(s) 5350 ). Signed on 10/6/2010. (SAJ) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5372 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monthly Application for Compensation of Application of Compensation for WHSA's Month of September for the period to Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. Objections due by 10/26/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Detail) (Smith, Warren) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5371 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Deposition re: Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Grand LHN 1 Urban Renewal, LLC Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5370 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Service of (I) Debtor's First Set of interrogatories and request for Production of Documents to Grand LHN 1 Urban Renewal, LLC; and (II) Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Grand LHN 1 Urban Renewal, LLC Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit os Service and Service LIst) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5369 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monthly Application for Compensation of Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP for the period August 1, 2010 to August 31, 2010 Filed by Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP. Objections due by 10/25/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5368 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Application for Compensation of James J. McMonagle for the period August 1, 2010 to August 31, 2010 Filed by James J. McMonagle. Objections due by 10/25/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5367 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service for Pre-Trial Brief in Opposition to Confirmation of the Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization In Respect of Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Unlimited Dated August 5, 2010 (related document(s) 5346 ) Filed by Certain London Market Insurance Companies. (Shiner, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5366 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Quarterly Fee Application of Sidley Austin LLP for the Period May 1, 2010 through July 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5304 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5365 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Quarterly Fee Application of Snyder Miller & Orton LLP for the Period May 1, 2010 through July 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5305 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5364 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Quarterly Fee Application of Kelly C. Wooster for the Period May 1, 2010 through July 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5306 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5363 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Certificate of Service of Monthly Application for Compensation of Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered for the period August 1, 2010 to August 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5341 ) Filed by Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5362 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Certificate of Service of Monthly Application for Compensation of Frank/Gecker LLP for the period August 1, 2010 to August 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5342 ) Filed by Frank/Gecker LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5361 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Certificate of Service for Monthly Application for Compensation of Campbell & Levine, LLC for the period August 1, 2010 to August 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5343 ) Filed by Campbell & Levine, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5360 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Rule 2019 Statement Amended and Restated Verified Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 2019 filed by The David Law Firm, P.C. Exhibits have been scanned but may be accessed by parties who obtain court order authorizing access. Filed by The David Law Firm, P.C.. (Hurford, Mark) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5359 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Debtors' Motion for Order Authorizing Debtors to File Materials under Seal and for Protections Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) and Motion to Shorten Notice Periods (related document(s) 5349 , 5350 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5358 Filed: 10/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Service regarding (i) Supplemental Objection of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and Certain of Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries to the Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization (as Modified August 5, 2010) in Respect of the Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited, (ii) Motion in Limine of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and Certain of Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries to Exclude Testimony and Other Evidence Regarding the Number and Amount of Claims and Demands, (iii) Motion in Limine of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and Certain of Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries to Exclude Certain Testimony of Regent Pacific Representatives in Respect of the Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited, (iv) Declaration of Mark M. Maloney in Support of Supplemental Objection of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and Certain of Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries to the Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization (as Modified August 5, 2010) in Respect of the Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited, (v) Declaration of Mark M. Maloney and (vi) Declaration of Mark Maloney (related document(s) 5352 , 5353 , 5354 , 5355 , 5356 , 5357 ) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation. (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 10/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5357 Filed: 10/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Mark M. Maloney (related document(s) 5354 ) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H) (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 10/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5356 Filed: 10/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Mark M. Maloney (related document(s) 5353 ) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E) (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 10/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5355 Filed: 10/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration in Support --Declaration of Mark M. Maloney In Support of Supplemental Objection of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and Certain of Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries to the Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization (As Modified August 5, 2010) in Respect of the Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited (related document(s) 5352 ) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# (17) Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R# 19 Exhibit S# 20 Exhibit T# 21 Exhibit U# 22 Exhibit V# 23 Exhibit W# 24 Exhibit X# 25 Exhibit Y# 26 Exhibit Z# 27 Exhibit AA Part 1# 28 Exhibit AA Part 2# 29 Exhibit AA Part 3# 30 Exhibit BB# 31 Exhibit CC# 32 Exhibit DD# 33 Exhibit EE# 34 Exhibit FF# 35 Exhibit GG# 36 Exhibit HH) (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 10/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5354 Filed: 10/2/2010, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion in Limine of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and Certain of Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries to Exclude Certain Testimony of Regent Pacific Representatives in Respect of the Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion# 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 10/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5353 Filed: 10/2/2010, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion in Limine of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and Certain of Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries to Exclude Testimony and Other Evidence Regarding the Number and Amount of Claims and Demands Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion# 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 10/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5352 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Objection of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and Certain of Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries to the Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization (as Modified August 5, 2010) in Respect of the Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited (related document(s) 3784 , 3790 , 5220 ) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Part 2) (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 10/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5351 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum of Law re: Plan Proponent's Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Confirmation of the Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization in respect of the Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited (As Modified) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5350 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing Date and to Object or Respond for Debtors' Motion for Order Authorizing Debtors to File Materials Under Seal and for Protections Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(D) (related document(s) 5349 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Floor, Room 309, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/11/2010. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5349 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to File Under Seal Debtors' Motion for Order Authorizing Debtors to file materials Under Seal and for Protections Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(D) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Floor, Room 309, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/11/2010. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5348 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection re: Debtors' Opposition to Grand LHN 1 Urban Renewal, LLC's Motion Seeking Leave to File a late Proof Of Claim (related document(s) 5307 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Declaration A# 3 Exhibit B prt 1# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit B# 6 Declaration B# 7 Exhibit B# 8 Declaration C# 9 Exhibit D# 10 Declaration D# 11 Declaration D# 12 Exhibit D# 13 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5347 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection re: Plan Proponents' Opposition to Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Amended Motion for Leave to file Out-of-Time Proof of Claim (related document(s) 5172 , 5242 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Declaration C# 5 Declaration D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Declaration F# 8 Declaration G# 9 Declaration H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5346 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief Pre-Trial Brief in Opposition to Confirmation of the Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization in Respect of The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited dated August 5, 2010 (related document(s) 5220 , 5221 ) Filed by Certain London Market Insurance Companies. (Shiner, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5345 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP for the Period June 1, 2010 through June 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5302 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5344 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Application for Compensation of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period August 1, 2010 to August 31, 2010 Filed by Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Objections due by 10/20/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5343 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation of Campbell & Levine, LLC for the period August 1, 2010 to August 31, 2010 Filed by Campbell & Levine, LLC. Objections due by 10/20/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit August 2010# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5342 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Application for Compensation of Frank/Gecker LLP for the period August 1, 2010 to August 31, 2010 Filed by Frank/Gecker LLP. Objections due by 10/20/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit August 2010# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5341 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Application for Compensation of Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered for the period August 1, 2010 to August 31, 2010 Filed by Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered. Objections due by 10/20/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit C Part II# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Certificate of Service # 7 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5340 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Quarterly Fee Application Request of Schiff Hardin LLP for the Period May 1, 2010 Through July 31, 2010. (related document(s) 5299 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5339 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Snyder Miller & Orton LLP for the Period August 1-31, 2010. (related document(s) 5300 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5338 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding Quarterly Fee Application of the Law Office of Alan Pedlar for the Period May 1, 2010 - July 31, 2010. (related document(s) 5298 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited,. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5337 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Compensation of Monthly Fee and Expense Invoice for the period August 1, 2010 to August 31, 2010 Filed by Sidley Austin LLP. Objections due by 10/19/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5336 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection Regarding Quarterly Fee Application of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones & LLP for the Period Feburary 1, 2010 through April 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5293 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5335 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection to WHSA's August Fee Application. (related document(s) 5294 ) Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. (Smith, Warren) Modified on 9/29/2010 to add related document. (KPB). (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5334 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Application for Compensation of McCarter & English, LLP for the period August 1, 2010 to August 31, 2010 Filed by McCarter & English, LLP. Objections due by 10/18/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Invoices# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Service List) (Taylor, William) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5333 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application for Compensation of Schiff Hardin LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period August 1, 2010 to August 31, 2010 Filed by Schiff Hardin LLP. Objections due by 10/18/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5332 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Amended Quarterly Fee Application Request of Schiff Hardin LLP for the Period August 1, 2009 through October 31, 2009 (related document(s) 5287 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5331 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Schiff Hardin LLP for the Period July 1, 2010 through July 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5288 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5330 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection (No Order Requuired) Regarding Fee Application Request of Kelly C. Wooster for the Period August 1, 2010 through August 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5289 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5329 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection (No Order Reuired) Regarding Fee Application Request of The Law Office of Alan Pedlar for the Period August 1, 2010 through August 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5286 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5231 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal RE: Avivas Withdrawal With Prejudice of Claims, Opposition to Plan Confirmation, and Discovery (related document(s) 3776 , 5097 , 5099 , 5114 , 5155 , 5166 , 5168 , 5173 ) Filed by Aviva Insurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Kasprzak, Brian) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5230 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation of The Law Office of Alan Pedlar for the period July 1, 2010 to July 31, 2010 Filed by Law Offices of Alan Pedlar. Objections due by 8/31/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5229 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Blake, Cassels & Graydon LLP for the Period June 1-30, 2010. (related document(s) 5159 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5228 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Application for Compensation of Snyder Miller & Orton LLP for the period July 1, 2010 to July 31, 2010 Filed by Snyder Miller Orton LLP. Objections due by 8/30/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Certificate of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5227 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Compensation of Frantz Ward LLP for the period June 1, 2010 to June 30, 2010 Filed by Frantz Ward LLP. Objections due by 8/30/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5226 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monthly Application for Compensation of Kelly C. Wooster for the period July 1, 2010 to July 31, 2010 Filed by Kelly C. Wooster. Objections due by 8/30/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5225 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Application for Compensation of Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP for the period June 1, 2010 to June 30, 2010 Filed by Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP. Objections due by 8/30/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Zieg, Sharon) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5224 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monthly Application for Compensation of James J. McMonagle for the period June 1, 2010 to June 30, 2010 Filed by James J. McMonagle. Objections due by 8/30/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Zieg, Sharon) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5223 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Application for Compensation of Application of Compensation for WHSA's Month of July for the period july 1, 2010 to july 31, 2010 Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. Objections due by 8/26/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Fee Detail) (Smith, Warren) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5222 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization in Respect of the Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited (As Modified August 5, 2010) (related document(s) 5220 , 5221 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5221 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended Chapter 11 Plan /BLACKLINE Amended Joint Plan (Blacklined to show changes from plan filed on July 20, 2009 at Docket No. 4393) (related document(s) 4393 , 5220 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5220 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Chapter 11 Plan /Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization in Respect of The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited (As Modified August 5, 2010) (related document(s) 4393 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5219 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Compensation of Nossaman, LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period February 1, 2010 to February 28, 2010 Filed by Nossaman, LLP. Objections due by 8/25/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5218 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Compensation of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period May 1, 2010 to May 31, 2010 Filed by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. Objections due by 8/24/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5217 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee and Expenses Invoice of Irell & Manella LLP for the Period June 1, 2010 through June 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5175 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5216 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monthly Application for Compensation of Sidley Austin LLP for the period June 1, 2010 to June 30, 2010 Filed by Sidley Austin LLP. Objections due by 8/18/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5215 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Application for Compensation of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period June 1, 2010 to June 30, 2010 Filed by Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Objections due by 8/19/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5214 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Deposition of James J. McMonagle Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Monzo, Eric) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5213 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Deposition -- Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition (of Debtors) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Monzo, Eric) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5212 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Interim Application for Compensation of James J. McMonagle for the period August 1, 2009 to October 31, 2009 **AMENDED** (related document(s) 4719 ) Filed by James J. McMonagle. Hearing scheduled for 9/13/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 1/4/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Zieg, Sharon) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5211 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service regarding Notice of Deposition of Stephen W. Young, Notice of Deposition of Donald Oliver, Notice of Deposition of David J. Gordon, Notice of Deposition of Jeffrey J. Forestier and Notice of Deposition of Gary J. Sbona (related document(s) 5204 , 5205 , 5206 , 5207 , 5208 ) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited. (Monzo, Eric) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5210 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP for the Period April 1, 2010 through April 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5154 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5209 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Snyder Miller & Orton LLP for the Period June 1, 2010 through June 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5153 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5208 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Deposition of Gary J. Sbona Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited. (Monzo, Eric) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5207 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Deposition of Jeffrey J. Forestier Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited. (Monzo, Eric) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5206 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Deposition of David J. Gordon Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited. (Monzo, Eric) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5205 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Deposition of Donald Oliver Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited. (Monzo, Eric) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5204 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Deposition of Stephen W. Young Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited. (Monzo, Eric) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5203 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of the Law Office of Alan Pedlar for the Period June 1-30, 2010. (related document(s) 5144 , 5197 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5202 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of McCarter & English, LLP for the Period May 1-31, 2010 (related document(s) 5143 ) Filed by McCarter & English, LLP. (Taylor, William) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5201 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. Hearing scheduled for 9/13/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 8/27/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5200 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Extend /Debtors' Seventeenth Motion for an Order Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1452 and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 9006 and 9027 Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. Hearing scheduled for 9/13/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 8/27/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5199 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Certificate of No Objection Certificate of No Objection Regarding Document Number 5145 Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. (Smith, Warren) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5198 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Compensation of Frank/Gecker LLP for the period June 1, 2010 to June 30, 2010 Filed by Frank/Gecker LLP. Objections due by 8/16/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5197 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of The Law Office of Alan Pedlar for the Period June 1, 2010 through June 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5144 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5196 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Kelly C. Wooster for the Period June 1, 2010 through June 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5146 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5195 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Compensation of Campbell & Levine for the period June 1, 2010 to June 30, 2010 Filed by Campbell & Levine, LLC. Objections due by 8/16/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5194 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Compensation of Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered for the period June 1, 2010 to June 30, 2010 Filed by Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered. Objections due by 8/16/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit C - part 2# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Certificate of Service # 7 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5193 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for Compensation of Schiff Hardin LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period June 1, 2010 to June 30, 2010 Filed by Schiff Hardin LLP. Objections due by 8/16/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5192 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Service of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Subpoena Directed to Verus Claims Services, LLC Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Monzo, Eric) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5191 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Deposition -- Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition (of Verus Claims Services, LLC) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5190 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation of McCarter & English, LLP for the period June 1, 2010 to June 30, 2010 Filed by McCarter & English, LLP. Objections due by 8/12/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Invoices# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Service List) (Taylor, William) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5189 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 /Debtors' Motion for Order Approving Buyback Agreement and Release Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. Hearing scheduled for 9/13/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 8/27/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Declaration # 4 Proposed Form of Order # 5 Certificate of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5188 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation for May 2010 (related document(s) 5137 ) Filed by James J. McMonagle. (Zieg, Sharon) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5187 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation for May 2010 (related document(s) 5136 ) Filed by Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP. (Zieg, Sharon) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5186 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation for May 2010 (related document(s) 5129 ) Filed by Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. (Zieg, Sharon) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5185 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) 5179 ) Service Date 07/21/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5184 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. Hearing scheduled for 8/9/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5183 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Service /Notice of Filing Amendment to Plan Supplement to Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization (As Modified) (related document(s) 3826 , 4547 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5182 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Frantz Ward LLP for the Period May 1, 2010 through May 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5135 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5181 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Snyder Miller & Orton LLP for the Period May 1, 2010 through May 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5138 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5180 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 1, 2010 through June 30, 2010 Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5179 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript regarding Hearing Held 7/14/2010 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/18/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber J & J Court Transcribers, Telephone number (609)586-2311.] (RE: related document(s) 5171 ). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/26/2010. Redaction Request Due By 8/9/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/19/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/18/2010. (BJM) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5178 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Sidley Austin LLP for the Period May 1, 2010 through May 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5126 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5177 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Blake, Cassels & Graydon LLP for the Period May 1, 2010 through May 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5123 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5176 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding [Signed] Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Release by and Between the Flintkote Companies and Aviva Insurance Company of Canada (related document(s) 5173 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5175 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Compensation of Irell & Manella LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period June 1, 2010 to June 30, 2010 Filed by Irell & Manella LLP. Objections due by 8/3/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5174 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Transcript of hearing held on 7-14-2010 received. To obtain a copy of this transcript, contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, J & J Court Transcribers, at telephone number: 609-586-2311. (MPM) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5173 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Release by and Between the Flintkote Companies and Aviva Insurance Company of Canada (related document(s) 5097 , 5099 , 5114 , 5155 , 5166 , 5168 ) Order Signed on 7/14/2010. (LCo) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5172 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Leave --Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Motion for Leave to Allow Out of Time Filing of a Proof of Claim Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited. Hearing scheduled for 9/13/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 8/27/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Affidavit of Service) (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5171 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (related document(s) 5150 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Floor, Room 309, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5170 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Schiff Hardin LLP for the Period May 1, 2010 through May 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5117 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5169 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response RE: Aviva's Response to Imperial Tobacco's Objection to Debtors' Motion for an Order Approving Settlement (related document(s) 5097 , 5099 , 5114 , 5155 , 5166 ) Filed by Aviva Insurance Company of Canada (Kasprzak, Brian) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5168 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply Plan Proponents' Reply to ITCAN's Objection to Debtors' Motion for Order Approving Settlement with Aviva Insurance Company of Canada (related document(s) 5097 , 5099 , 5114 , 5155 , 5165 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5167 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 1, 2010 through June 30, 2010 Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (Attachments: # 1 MOR pt 2# 2 MOR pt 3# 3 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5166 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Aviva's Motion for Leave to File Response to Imperial Tobacco's Objection to Debtors' Motion for an Order Approving Settlement With Aviva. (Related Doc # 5162 , 5097 , 5155 ) Order Signed on 7/12/2010. (Baker, Ramona) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5165 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Motion for Leave to (A) File Reply and (B) Exceed Page Limit re ITCAN's Objection to Motion for Order Approving Settlement with Aviva Insurance Company of Canada (Related Doc # 5164 , 5097 , 5099 , 5114 , 5155 ) Order Signed on 7/12/2010. (Baker, Ramona) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5164 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Leave Plan Proponents' Motion for Leave to (A) File a Reply and (B) Exceed the Page Limit for Replies with Respect to ITCAN's Objection to Debtors' Motion for Order Approving Settlement with Aviva Insurance Company of Canada Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Floor, Room 309, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/9/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plan Proponents' Reply to Limited Objection ot ITCAN# 2 Exh. A to Reply [Interrogatories]# 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Certificate of Service) (O'Neill, James) Modified on 7/12/2010 (Baker, Ramona). Related to Doc # 5097 . 5099 , 5114 , 5155 (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5163 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Publication Regarding Debtors' Motion for Order Approving Settlement with Aviva Insurance Company of Canada (related document(s) 5097 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5162 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Leave RE: Aviva's Motion for Leave to File Response to Imperial Tobacco's Objection to Debtors' Motion for an Order Approving Settlement with Aviva Filed by Aviva Insurance Company of Canada. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., Wilmington, DE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Aviva's Motion for Leave to File Response to Imperial Tobacco's Objection to Debtors' Motion for an Order Approving Settlement with Aviva# 2 Exhibit - Attachment A# 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Certificate of Service) (Kasprzak, Brian) Modified on 7/12/2010 (Baker, Ramona). Related to Doc # 5097 , 5099 , 5114 , 5155 (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5161 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service (related document(s) 5149 ) Filed by Lipsitz & Ponterio, LLC. (Weaver, John) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5160 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Service /Amended Supplemental Witness List of Plan Proponents (related document(s) 4832 , 5151 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5159 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Compensation of Blake, Cassels & Graydon LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period June 1, 2010 to June 30, 2010 Filed by BLAKE, CASSELS & GRAYDON LLP. Objections due by 8/9/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5158 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service -- Corrected Affidavit of Service Regarding Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition (related document(s) 5157 ) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation. (Monzo, Eric) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5157 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Deposition -- Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition [Re: D.I. 5097] Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Monzo, Eric) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5156 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Service of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Regarding Debtors' Motion for Order Approving Settlement with Aviva Insurance Company of Canada (related document(s) 5097 , 5155 ) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation. (Monzo, Eric) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5155 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection -- Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Objection to Debtors' Motion for Order Approving Settlement with Aviva Insurance Company of Canada (related document(s) 5097 , 5098 , 5101 ) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Affidavit of Service) (Miller, Stephen) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5154 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monthly Application for Compensation of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP for the period April 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. Objections due by 7/28/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5153 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for Compensation of Snyder Miller Orton LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period June 1, 2010 to June 30, 2010 Filed by Snyder Miller Orton LLP. Objections due by 7/28/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5152 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Quarterly Certificate of No Objection Regarding Quarterly Fee Application of McCarter & English, LLP for the Period February 1, 2010 through April 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5109 ) Filed by McCarter & English, LLP. (Taylor, William) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5151 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Service /Supplemental Witness List of Plan Proponents (related document(s) 4832 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5150 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Floor, Room 309, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5149 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Rule 2019 Statement (Amended) Filed by Lipsitz & Ponterio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Weaver, John) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5148 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Quarterly Fee Application Request of Blake, Cassels & Graydon LLP for the Period February 1, 2010 through April 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5102 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5147 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee and Expense Invoice of Irell & Manella LLP for the Period May 1, 2010 through May 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5103 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5146 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Compensation of Kelly C. Wooster for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period June 1, 2010 to June 30, 2010 Filed by Kelly C. Wooster. Objections due by 7/26/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5145 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Application for Compensation of Application of Compensation for WHSA's Month of June for the period June 1, 2010 to June 30, 2010 Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. Objections due by 7/26/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Fee & Expense detail) (Smith, Warren) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5144 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Compensation of The Law Office of Alan Pedlar for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period June 1, 2010 to June 30, 2010 Filed by The Law Office of Alan Pedlar. Objections due by 7/26/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5143 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Application for Compensation of McCarter & English, LLP for the period May 1, 2010 to May 31, 2010 Filed by McCarter & English, LLP. Objections due by 7/26/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Invoices# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Service List) (Taylor, William) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5142 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Rule 2019 Statement Amended and Restated Verified Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 2019 filed by The David Law Firm, P.C. Exhibits have been scanned but may be accessed by parties who obtain court order authorizing access. Filed by The David Law Firm, P.C.. (Hurford, Mark) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5141 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Quarterly Fee Application of Frantz Ward LLP for the Period February 1, 2010 through April 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5093 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5140 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Pachuski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP for the Period March 1, 2010 through March 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5094 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5139 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Quarterly Fee Application of Sidley Austin LLP for the Period February 1, 2010 through April 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5091 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5138 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monthly Application for Compensation of Snyder Miller & Orton LLP for the period May 1, 2010 to May 31, 2010 Filed by Snyder Miller Orton LLP. Objections due by 7/20/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5137 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Application for Compensation of James J. McMonagle for the period May 1, 2010 to May 31, 2010 Filed by James J. McMonagle. Objections due by 7/20/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Zieg, Sharon) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5136 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monthly Application for Compensation of Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP for the period May 1, 2010 to May 31, 2010 Filed by Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP. Objections due by 7/20/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Zieg, Sharon) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5135 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Compensation of Frantz Ward LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period May 1, 2010 to May 31, 2010 Filed by Frantz Ward LLP. Objections due by 7/20/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5134 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of McCarter & English, LLP for the Period April 1 - 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5082 ) Filed by McCarter & English, LLP. (Taylor, William) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5133 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Kelly C. Wooster for the Period May 1, 2010 through May 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5081 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5132 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Application for Compensation of Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered for the period May 1, 2010 to May 31, 2010 Filed by Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered. Objections due by 7/19/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit C - Part 2# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Certificate of Service # 7 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5131 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monthly Application for Compensation of Campbell & Levine, LLC for the period May 1, 2010 to May 31, 2010 Filed by Campbell & Levine, LLC. Objections due by 7/19/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit May 2010# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5130 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monthly Application for Compensation of Frank/Gecker LLP for the period May 1, 2010 to May 31, 2010 Filed by Frank/Gecker LLP. Objections due by 7/19/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit May 2010# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5129 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Application for Compensation of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period May 1, 2010 to May 31, 2010 Filed by Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Objections due by 7/19/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Zieg, Sharon) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5128 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation for April 2010 (related document(s) 5077 ) Filed by Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP. (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5127 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation for April 2010 (related document(s) 5076 ) Filed by James J. McMonagle. (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5126 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Compensation of Sidley Austin LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period May 1, 2010 to May 31, 2010 Filed by Sidley Austin LLP. Objections due by 7/15/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5125 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Certificate of No Objection Certificate of No Objection Regarding WHSA's May Fee Application (related document(s) 5079 ) Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. (Smith, Warren) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5124 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of the Law Office of Alan Pedlar for the Period May 1, 2010 through May 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5078 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5123 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Compensation of Blake, Cassels & Graydon LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period May 1, 2010 to May 31, 2010 Filed by BLAKE, CASSELS & GRAYDON LLP. Objections due by 7/15/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5122 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Frantz Ward LLP for the Period April 1, 2010 through April 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5073 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5121 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding Quarterly Fee Application of Kelly C. Wooster for the Period February 1, 2010 through April 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5072 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5120 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection Regarding Quarterly Fee Application of Snyder Miller & Orton LLP for the Period February 1, 2010 through April 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5071 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5119 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara Kelley Keane of the Notice of Filing of the Fully Executed Copy of the Escrow Agreement, Exhibit B to the Settlement Agreement and the Original Signature of Aviva to the Settlement Agreement, Exhibit 1 to the Debtors' Motion for Order Approving Settlement with Aviva Insurance Company of Canada (related document(s) 5114 ) Filed by Garden City Group, Inc.. (Shaer, Karen) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5118 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation for April 2010 (related document(s) 5066 ) Filed by Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. (Zieg, Sharon) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5117 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application for Compensation of Schiff Hardin LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period May 1, 2010 to May 31, 2010 Filed by Schiff Hardin LLP. Objections due by 7/12/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidvit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) Modified text on 6/21/2010 (ALC). (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5116 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Blake, Cassels & Graydon LLP for the Period April 1, 2010 through April 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5055 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5115 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection re: Monthly Application for Compensation of Fees and Expenses for the period April 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Sidley Austin LLP (related document(s) 5057 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5114 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Service Notice of Filing of the Fully Executed Copy of the Escrow Agreement, Exhibit B to the Settlement Agreement and the Original Signature of Aviva to the SEttlement Agreement, Exhibit 1 to Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 /Debtor's Motion for Order Approving Settlement with Aviva Insurance Company of Canada (related document(s) 5097 , 5099 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Aviva Signature to Settlement# (2) Exhibit Executed Escrow Agreement) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5113 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection re:Interim Application for Compensation of Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of Schiff Hardin LLP as the Debtors' Special Litigation Counsel (Dividend Recovery Litigation) for the period February 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 [Twenty-Fourth Interim] (related document(s) 5058 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5112 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection re: Quarterly Application for Compensation of Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Special Counsel for the period February 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 - Twenty-Fourth Interim Period (related document(s) 5056 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5111 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2010 for Flintkote Mines Limited Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5110 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara Kelley Keane of the Notice of Debtors' Motion for Order Approving Settlement with Aviva Insurance Company of Canada (related document(s) 5104 ) Filed by Garden City Group, Inc.. (Shaer, Karen) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5109 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Quarterly Application for Compensation of McCarter & English, LLP for the period February 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by McCarter & English, LLP. Objections due by 7/6/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Invoices# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Service List) (Taylor, William) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5108 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Interim Application for Compensation of Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered for the period February 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered. Objections due by 7/6/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Certificate of Service # 6 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5107 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Interim Application for Compensation of Frank/Gecker LLP for the period February 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Frank/Gecker LLP. Objections due by 7/6/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit February 2010# 2 Exhibit March 2010# 3 Exhibit April 2010# 4 Certificate of Service # 5 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5106 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Interim Application for Compensation of Charter Oak Financial Consultants, LLC for the period February 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Charter Oak Financial Consultants, LLC. Objections due by 7/6/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5105 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Interim Application for Compensation of Campbell & Levine, LLC for the period February 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Campbell & Levine, LLC. Objections due by 7/6/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit February 2010# 2 Exhibit March 2010# 3 Exhibit April 2010# 4 Certificate of Service # 5 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5104 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Hearing re: Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 /Debtor's Motion for Order Approving Settlement with Aviva Insurance Company of Canada and [signed] Order Shortening Notice Period (related document(s) 5097 , 5099 , 5101 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Floor, Room 309, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/9/2010. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5103 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Application for Compensation of Irell & Manella LLP for the period May 1, 2010 to May 31, 2010 Filed by Irell & Manella LLP. Objections due by 7/6/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5102 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Quarterly Application for Compensation of Blake Cassels & Graydon LLP for the period February 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by BLAKE, CASSELS & GRAYDON LLP. Objections due by 7/6/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5101 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Shortening Time on the Debtors' Motion for Order Approving Settlement with Aviva Insurance Company of Canada. (Related Doc # 5098 , 5099 ) Order Signed on 6/15/2010. (Baker, Ramona) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5100 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara Kelley Keane of (i) Debtors' Motion for Order Approving Settlement with Aviva Insurance Company of Canada; and (ii) Debtors' Motion for Leave from Case Management Order and Order Shortening the Time for Notice of Time for Hearing Date and to Object or Respond to the Debtors' Motion for Order Approving Settlement with Aviva Insurance Company of Canada (related document(s) 5097 , 5098 ) Filed by Garden City Group, Inc.. (Shaer, Karen) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5099 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit(s) /Additional Signature Page to Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement to Debtor's Motion for Order Approving Settlement with Aviva Insurance Company of Canada (related document(s) 5097 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5098 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Shorten /Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 2002 and Del. Bankr. L.R. 9006-1(e) for Leave From Case Management Order and Order Shortening the Time for Notice of Time for Hearing Date and to Object or Respond to the Debtors' Motion for Order Approving Settlement With Aviva Insurance Company of Canada (related document(s) 5097 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Floor, Room 309, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/9/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5097 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 /Debtor's Motion for Order Approving Settlement with Aviva Insurance Company of Canada Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Floor, Room 309, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/9/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement# 2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order# 3 Exhibit 3 - Publication Notice# 4 Declaration of John H. Bay in Support) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5096 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection re: Application for Compensation of Schiff Hardin LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period April 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5050 ) Filed by Schiff Hardin LLP. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5095 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection re: Application for Compensation of of Irell & Manella LLP for COmpensation and for Reimbursement of Expeses for the period April 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5049 ) Filed by Irell & Manella LLP. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5094 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP for the period March 1, 2010 to March 31, 2010 Filed by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. Objections due by 7/1/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5093 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Quarterly Application for Compensation of Frantz Ward LLP for the period February 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Frantz Ward LLP. Objections due by 7/1/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5092 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2010 for The Flintkote Company Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (Attachments: # 1 May operating report (part 2of 2)# 2 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5091 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Compensation of Sdiley Austin LLP for the period February 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Sidley Austin LLP. Objections due by 6/30/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5090 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Order (THIRD AMENDED) Governing Discovery With Respect to Confirmation of Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization (as Modified) in Respect of The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited (related document(s) 5087 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5089 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Notice Regarding Change of Hearing Date. All Hearings Scheduled for July 12, 2010 are now on July 14, 2010 in Wilmington, DE (related document(s) 5088 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5088 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Regarding Change of Hearing Date. All Hearings Scheduled for July 12, 2010 are now on July 14, 2010 in Wilmington, DE. (SAJ) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5087 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order (THIRD AMENDED) Governing Discovery With Respect to Confirmation of Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization (as Modified) in Respect of The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited. Related to Doc # 4428 , 4970 Signed on 6/8/2010. (Baker, Ramona) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5086 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certification of Counsel Regarding Third Amended Order Governing Discovery With Respect to Confirmation of Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization (As Modified) In Respect of The Flintkote Company and Flintkote Mines Limited (related document(s) 4428 , 4970 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5085 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Quarterly Application for Compensation of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period February 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Objections due by 6/28/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D) (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5084 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Quarterly Application for Compensation of Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP for the period February 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP. Objections due by 6/28/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5083 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Quarterly Application for Compensation of James J. McMonagle for the period February 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by James J. McMonagle. Objections due by 6/28/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5082 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monthly Application for Compensation of McCarter & English, LLP for the period April 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by McCarter & English, LLP. Objections due by 6/28/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Invoices# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Service List) (Taylor, William) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5081 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for Compensation of Kelly C. Wooster for the period May 1, 2010 to May 31, 2010 Filed by Kelly C. Wooster. Objections due by 6/28/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5080 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Interim Application for Compensation of Monthly Fee Application of Compensation for WHSA's Twenty- Fourth Interim for the period February 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Fee & Expense Detail) (Smith, Warren) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5079 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Application for Compensation of Monthly Fee Application of Compensation for WHSA's Month of May for the period May 1, 2010 to May 31, 2010 Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. Objections due by 6/24/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Fee & Expense Detail) (Smith, Warren) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5078 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Compensation of Alan Pedlar for the period May 1, 2010 to May 31, 2010 Filed by The Law Office of Alan Pedlar. Objections due by 6/24/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5077 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Application for Compensation of Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP for the period April 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP. Objections due by 6/23/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Zieg, Sharon) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5076 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Application for Compensation of James J. McMonagle for the period April 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by James J. McMonagle. Objections due by 6/23/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Zieg, Sharon) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5075 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. (related document(s) 5063 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. Hearing scheduled for 6/7/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Floor, Room 309, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5074 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service Omnibus Order Approving Twenty-First Quarterly Fee Applications (related document(s) 5070 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5073 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Application for Compensation of Frantz Ward LLP for the period April 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Frantz Ward LLP. Objections due by 6/22/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5072 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Quarterly Application for Compensation of Kelly C. Wooster for the period February 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Kelly C. Wooster. Objections due by 6/22/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5071 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Quarterly Application for Compensation of Snyder Miller & Orton LLP for the period February 1, 29010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Snyder Miller Orton LLP. Objections due by 6/22/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5070 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OMNIBUS Order Approving Twenty-First Quarterly Fee Applications of Professionals for the Period May 1, 2009 - July 31, 2010 (related document(s) 4443 , 4462 , 4470 , 4483 , 4488 , 4498 , 4499 , 4501 , 4506 , 4507 , 4508 , 4509 , 4511 , 4512 , 4513 , 4522 , 4532 , 4997 ). Signed on 6/2/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (SAJ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5069 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Application for Compensation of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period November 1, 2009 to January 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5031 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5068 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection for Frantz Ward LLP for March 1-31, 2010 (related document(s) 5033 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5067 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monthly Certificate of No Objection Certificate of No Objection Regarding Docket Number 5027 Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. (Smith, Warren) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5066 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monthly Application for Compensation of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period April 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Objections due by 6/17/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5065 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding Quarterly Fee Application of The Law Office of Alan Pedlar for the Period February 1, 2010 through April 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5030 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5064 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of The Law Office of Alan Pedlar for the Period April 1, 2010 through April 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5029 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5063 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. Hearing scheduled for 6/7/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Floor, Room 309, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5062 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation of Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered for the period April 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered. Objections due by 6/17/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit C Part II# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Certificate of Service # 7 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5061 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Application for Compensation of Frank/Gecker, LLP for the period April 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Frank/Gecker LLP. Objections due by 6/17/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit April 2010# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5060 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Application for Compensation of Campbell & Levine, LLC for the period April 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Campbell & Levine, LLC. Objections due by 6/17/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit April 2010# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Davis, Kathleen) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5059 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Service of Notice of Increase in Hourly Rates Filed by Schiff Hardin LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5058 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Interim Application for Compensation of Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as the Debtors' Special Litigation Counsel (Dividend Recovery Litigation) for the period February 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 [Twenty-Fourth Interim] Filed by Schiff Hardin LLP. Objections due by 6/16/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5057 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Application for Compensation of Fees and Expenses for the period April 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Sidley Austin LLP. Objections due by 6/17/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5056 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Quarterly Application for Compensation of Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Special Counsel for the period February 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 - Twenty-Fourth Interim Period Filed by Irell & Manella LLP. Objections due by 6/16/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5055 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Application for Compensation of Fees and Expenses for the period April 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by BLAKE, CASSELS & GRAYDON LLP. Objections due by 6/18/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5054 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Snyder Miller & Orton LLP for the Period April 1-30, 2010 (related document(s) 5026 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5053 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Kelly C. Wooster for the Period April 1, 2010 through April 30, 2010 (related document(s) 5025 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5052 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certification of Counsel With Respect To Spreadsheet Summary Of All Fees Paid Within Each Category By Professional And Period For Twenty-First Quarterly Fee Applications Of Professionals Governied By The Fee Auditor Order Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5051 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certification of Counsel with Respect to Proposed Omnibus Order Approving Twenty-First Quarterly Fee Applications of Professionals Governed by the Fee Auditor Order (related document(s) 4443 , 4462 , 4470 , 4483 , 4488 , 4498 , 4499 , 4501 , 4506 , 4507 , 4508 , 4509 , 4511 , 4512 , 4513 , 4522 , 4532 , 4997 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5050 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Compensation of Schiff Hardin LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period April 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Schiff Hardin LLP. Objections due by 6/10/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5049 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for Compensation of of Irell & Manella LLP for COmpensation and for Reimbursement of Expeses for the period April 1, 2010 to April 30, 2010 Filed by Irell & Manella LLP. Objections due by 6/10/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5048 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of McCarter & English, LLP for the Period March 1-31, 2010 (related document(s) 5018 ) Filed by McCarter & English, LLP. (Taylor, William) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5047 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Rule 2019 Statement Amended. Exhibits have not been scanned but may be accessed by parties who obtain Court order authorizing access. Filed by Baron & Budd, P.C.. (Harper, Ann) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5046 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Fee Auditor's Report Fee Auditor's Final Report Regarding the Fee Application of Those Fee Applications with No Fee Or Expense Issues for the Twenty First Interim Period Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. (Smith, Warren) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5045 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Fee Auditor's Report Fee Auditor's Final Report Regarding the Fee Application of McCarter & English for the Twenty First Interim Period Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. (Smith, Warren) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5044 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Sidley Austin LLP for the Period March 1, 2010 through March 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5016 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5043 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP for the Period February 1, 2010 through February 28, 2010 (related document(s) 5012 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5042 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing on Professionals' Quarterly Fee Applications for the Twenty-First Interim Period (May 1, 2009 through July 31, 2009) for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Pursuant to Section 331 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 4443 , 4462 , 4470 , 4483 , 4488 , 4498 , 4499 , 4501 , 4506 , 4507 , 4508 , 4509 , 4511 , 4512 , 4513 , 4522 , 4532 , 4997 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. Objections due by 6/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5041 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation for March 2010 (related document(s) 5010 ) Filed by Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5040 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation for March 2010 (related document(s) 5009 ) Filed by Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP. (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5039 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation for March 2010 (related document(s) 5008 ) Filed by James J. McMonagle. (Harron, Edwin) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5038 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee and Expense Invoice of Irell & Manella LLP for the Period March 1, 2010 through March 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5011 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5037 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 2010 for The Flintkote Company Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Monthly Operating Report Pt 2# 2 Monthly Operating Report Part 3# 3 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5036 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 2010 for Flintkote Mines Limited Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5035 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Blake, Cassels & Graydon LLP for the Period March 1, 2010 through March 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5004 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5034 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection Regarding Quarterly Fee Application Request of Blake, Cassels & Graydon LLP for the Period November 1, 2009 through January 31, 2010 (related document(s) 5003 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5033 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Application for Compensation of Fees and Expenses for the period March 1, 2010 to March 31, 2010 Filed by Frantz Ward LLP. Objections due by 5/31/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5032 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Schiff Hardin LLP for the Period March 1-31, 2010 (related document(s) 4999 ) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5031 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Compensation of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for the period November 1, 2009 to January 31, 2010 Filed by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. Objections due by 5/31/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4915 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/10/2010 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certification of Counsel with Respect to Proposed Omnibus Order Approving Twentieth Quarterly Fee Applications of Professionals Governed by the Fee Auditor Order (related document(s)[4226], [4246], [4279], [4280], [4284], [4285], [4286], [4287], [4298], [4299], [4300], [4303], [4305], [4306], [4307], [4308], [4309], [4310], [4325]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4914 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/10/2010 Notice of Deposition(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Deposition -- Corrected Notice of Deposition of Eric Bower Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service) (Miller, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4913 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/10/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Quarterly Application for Compensation Notice of 23rd Quarterly Interim Fee Application Request of McCarter & English, LLP for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Counsel to the Flintkote Company for the Period November 1, 2009 through January 31, 2010 (related document(s)[4763], [4853], [4907]) Filed by McCarter & English, LLP. Objections due by 3/30/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Invoices# (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Certificate of Service # (4) Service List) (Taylor, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4912 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: 3/9/2010 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Notice of Service of Discovery Material [Debtors' Amended Responses and Objections to Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Debtors Regarding Objection] Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4911 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Monthly Application for Compensation for January 2010 Filed by Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP. Objections due by 3/29/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Zieg, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4910 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Monthly Application for Compensation for January 2010 Filed by James J. McMonagle. Objections due by 3/29/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Zieg, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4909 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Interim Application for Compensation Application for Compensation of WHSA's Twenty-Third Interim Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Fee Detail) (Smith, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4908 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Monthly Application for Compensation Application for Compensation of WHSA's February Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. Objections due by 3/29/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Fee Detail) (Smith, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4907 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Monthly Application for Compensation Notice of Monthly Fee and Expense Invoice of McCarter & English, LLP for the Period January 1, 2010 through January 31, 2010 Filed by McCarter & English, LLP. Objections due by 3/29/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Invoices# (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Certificate of Service # (4) Service List) (Taylor, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4906 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Service -- Supplemental Designation of Fact Witnesses by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited for Hearing on Confirmation of Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization (related document(s)[4393], [4830]) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service) (Miller, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4905 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010 Response (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Response of Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited to Debtors' Motion for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 363 Authorizing Purchase of a Real Property Parcel in Canton, GA and Rights Associated with Related Lease Agreement (related document(s)[4862]) Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service) (Miller, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4904 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010 Response (A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Response RE: Aviva's Response to Debtors' Motion for An Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363 Authorizing Purchase of A Real Property Parcel In Canton, GA and Rights Associated With Related Lease Agreement Filed by Aviva Insurance Company of Canada (related document(s)[4862]). (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Kasprzak, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4903 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection Regarding Quarterly Fee Application of the Law Office of Alan Pedlar for the Period November 1, 2009 through Janaury 31, 2010 (related document(s)[4846]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4902 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: 3/4/2010 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certification of Counsel with Respect to Spreadsheet Summary of All Fees Paid Within Each Category by Professional and Period for Twentieth Quarterly Fee Applications of Professionals Governed by the Fee Auditor Order Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4901 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: 3/4/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Monthly Application for Compensation for the Period of January 1, 2010 through January 31, 2010 Filed by Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered. Objections due by 3/18/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit C Part II# (5) Exhibit D# (6) Certificate of Service # (7) Service List) (Davis, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4900 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: 3/4/2010 Notice of Withdrawal of Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Withdrawal of Monthly Application for Compensation for the Period of January 1, 2010 through January 31, 2010 (related document(s)[4892]) Filed by Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered. (Davis, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4899 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: 3/4/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of The Law Office of Alan Pedlar for the Period January 1, 2010 through January 31, 2010 (related document(s)[4845]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4898 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: 3/4/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Frantz Ward LLP for the Period January 1, 2010 through January 31, 2010 (related document(s)[4844]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4897 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: 3/4/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Application for Compensation (Twenty-Third) of Irell & Manella LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for November 1, 2009 through January 31, 2010 Filed by Irell & Manella LLP. Objections due by 3/24/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4896 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: 3/3/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Application for Compensation of Kelly C. Wooster for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for February 1, 2010 through February 28, 2010 Filed by Kelly C. Wooster. Objections due by 3/23/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4895 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: 3/3/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of McCarter & English, LLP for the Period December 1-31, 2009 (related document(s)[4853]) Filed by McCarter & English, LLP. (Taylor, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4894 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Notice of Deposition(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice of Deposition of Kevin Latchford Filed by Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited and certain of its wholly-owned subsidiaries including, without limitation, Genstar Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Miller, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4893 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Kevin C. Maclay (Related Doc # [4879]). Signed on 3/2/2010. (SAJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4892 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Monthly Application for Compensation for the Period of January 1, 2010 through January 31, 2010 Filed by Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered. Objections due by 3/18/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit C Part II# (5) Exhibit D# (6) Certificate of Service # (7) Service List) (Davis, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4891 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Monthly Application for Compensation for the Period of January 1, 2010 through January 31, 2010 Filed by Frank/Gecker LLP. Objections due by 3/18/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit January 2010# (2) Certificate of Service # (3) Service List) (Davis, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4890 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Monthly Application for Compensation for the Period of January 1, 2010 through January 31, 2010 Filed by Campbell & Levine, LLC. Objections due by 3/18/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit January 2010# (2) Certificate of Service # (3) Service List) (Davis, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4889 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Application for Compensation of Sidley Austin LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for January 1, 2010 through January 31, 2010 Filed by Sidley Austin LLP. Objections due by 3/18/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4888 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Monthly Certificate of No Objection Certificate of No Objection Regarding Docket Number 4841 Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. (Smith, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4887 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Snyder Miller & Orton LLP for the Period January 1, 2010 through January 31, 2010 (related document(s)[4842]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4886 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: 2/25/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Monthly Application for Compensation for January 2010 Filed by Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. Objections due by 3/17/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Harron, Edwin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4885 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: 2/25/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Application for Compensation of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for January 1, 2010 through January 31, 2010 Filed by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. Objections due by 3/17/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4884 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: 2/24/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application of Kelly C. Wooster for the Period January 1, 2010 through January 31, 2010 (related document(s)[4837]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4883 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Application for Compensation (Twenty-Third Interim) of Schiff Hardin LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursment of Expenses for November 1, 2009 through January 31, 2010 Filed by Schiff Hardin LLP. Objections due by 3/15/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4882 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Application for Compensation (Twenty-Third) of Kelly C. Wooster for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for November 1, 2009 through January 31, 2010 Filed by Kelly C. Wooster. Objections due by 3/15/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4881 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Application for Compensation of Snyder Miller Orton LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for November 1, 2009 through January 31, 2010 Filed by Snyder Miller Orton LLP. Objections due by 3/15/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4880 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Rule 2019 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Rule 2019 Statement Amended. Exhibits have not been scanned but may be accessed by parties who obtain Court order authorizing access. Filed by Baron & Budd, P.C.. (Harper, Ann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4879 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/23/2010 Motion to Appear pro hac vice (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Kevin C. Maclay of the law firm of Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered. Receipt Number DEX003271, Filed by Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants. (Hurford, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4878 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 Fee Auditor's Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Fee Auditor's Report Fee Auditor's Final Report Regarding Legal Anlysis System's First Interim Fee Application Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit exhibit 1) (Smith, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4877 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Monthly Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period January 1, 2010 Through January 31, 2010 Filed by Schiff Hardin LLP. Objections due by 3/11/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4876 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Application for Compensation of Irell & Manella LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for January 1, 2010 through January 31, 2010 Filed by Irell & Manella LLP. Objections due by 3/11/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4875 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010 Notice of Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Notice of Hearing on Professionals' Quarterly Fee Applications for the Twentieth Interim Period (February 1, 2009 through April 30, 2009) for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Pursuant to Section 331 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s)[4226], [4246], [4279], [4280], [4284], [4285], [4286], [4287], [4298], [4299], [4300], [4303], [4305], [4306], [4307], [4308], [4309], [4310], [4325]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. Hearing scheduled for 3/22/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4874 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Frantz Ward LLP for the Period December 1, 2009 through December 31, 2009 (related document(s)[4826]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4873 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Sidley Austin LLP for the Period December 1, 2009 through December 31, 2009 (related document(s)[4833]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4872 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation for December 2009 (related document(s)[4821]) Filed by Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. (Zieg, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4871 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation for December 2009 (related document(s)[4820]) Filed by Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP. (Zieg, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4870 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation for December 2009 (related document(s)[4819]) Filed by James J. McMonagle. (Zieg, Sharon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4869 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certificate of Service Regarding the January 2010 Monthly Operating Report of Flintkote Mines Limited (related document(s)[4865]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4868 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP for the Period December 1, 2010 through December 31, 2010 (related document(s)[4827]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4867 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of Blake Cassels & Graydon LLP for the Period Decmeber 1, 2009 through December 31, 2009 (related document(s)[4797]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (Jones, Laura Davis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4866 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Fee Auditor's Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Fee Auditor's Report Fee Auditor's Combined Final Report Regarding Those Fee Applications With No Fee Or Expense Issues for the 20th Interim Period Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. (Smith, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4865 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 Operating Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period January 2010 of Flintkote Mines Limited Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4864 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding [signed] (Sixteenth) Order Extending the Period within which the Debtors May Remove Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1452 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9027 (related document(s)[4855]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4863 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding [Signed] Order Approving Seventeenth Order Extending Debtors' Exclusive Periods in Which to File a Chapter 11 Plan and to Solicit Votes Thereon (related document(s)[4856]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4862 Filed: 2/13/2010, Entered: 2/13/2010 Motion to Authorize (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Motion to Authorize Purchase of a Real Property Parcel in Canton, GA and Rights Associated With Related Lease Agreement Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 363 Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. Hearing scheduled for 3/22/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Floor, Room 309, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 3/5/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Notice # (2) Exhibit A - Order# (3) Exhibit B - Part 1# (4) Exhibit B - Part 2# (5) Exhibit B - Part 3# (6) Declaration of David J. Gordon in Support# (7) Affidavit of Service and Service List) (Makowski, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4861 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Service of Notice of Deposition of Debtors Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) Filed by Aviva Insurance Company of Canada. (Kasprzak, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4860 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 Operating Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period January 1-31, 2010 Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (Attachments: # (1) MOR - part 2# (2) Affidavit with service list) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4859 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Application for Compensation of Irell & Manella LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for December 1, 2009 through December 31, 2009 (related document(s)[4794]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4858 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Application for Compensation of Schiff Hardin LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for December 1, 2009 through December 31, 2009 (related document(s)[4789]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4857 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Notice of Service of Discovery Material Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4856 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Approving Seventeenth Order Extending Debtors' Exclusive Periods in Which to File a Chapter 11 Plan and to Solicit Votes Thereon (related document(s)[4747], [4849]). Signed on 2/9/2010. (SAJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4855 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Approving Sixteenth Order Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions (related document(s)[4748], [4848]). Signed on 2/9/2010. (SAJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4854 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. Hearing scheduled for 2/16/2010 at 09:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Floor, Room 309, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4853 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Monthly Application for Compensation Notice of Monthly Fee and Expense Invoice of McCarter & English, LLP for the Period December 1, 2009 through December 31, 2009 Filed by McCarter & English, LLP. Objections due by 3/1/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Invoices# (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Certificate of Service # (4) Service List) (Taylor, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4852 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice of Service of Discovery Material Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4851 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Notice of Service for Second Set Discovery Response to ITCAN Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Hurford, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4850 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Service of Response and Objection to Imperial Tobacco Canada Limited's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to James J. McMonagle, as the Future Claimants Representative, Regarding Objection to Plan Confirmation Filed by James J. McMonagle. (Harron, Edwin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4849 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Seventeenth Motion for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1121(d) Extending Debtors' Exclusive Periods in Which to File a Chapter 11 Plan and to Solicit Votes Thereon (related document(s)[4747]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4848 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Sixteenth Motion for an Order Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1452 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9027 (related document(s)[4748]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4847 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection (NO Order Required) Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Frantz Ward LLP for the Perio November 1, 2009 through November 30, 2009 (related document(s)[4785]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4846 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Application for Compensation (Twenty-Thrid) of The Law Office of Alan Pedlar for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for November 1, 2009 through January 31, 2010 Filed by The Law Office of Alan Pedlar. Objections due by 3/1/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4845 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Application for Compensation of The Law Office of Alan Pedlar for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for January 1, 2010 through January 31, 2010 Filed by The Law Office of Alan Pedlar. Objections due by 3/1/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4844 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Application for Compensation of Frantz Ward LLP for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for January 1, 2010 through January 31, 2010 Filed by Frantz Ward LLP. Objections due by 2/28/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4843 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 Rule 2019 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Rule 2019 Statement Verified Statement in Connection with the Representation of Creditors as Required by F.R.B.P. Rule 2019 filed by Scott and Scott, Ltd. Exhibits have been scanned but may be accessed by parties who obtain court order authorizing access. Filed by Scott & Scott, Ltd.. (Hurford, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4842 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Monthly Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period January 1, 2010 Through January 31, 2010 Filed by Snyder Miller Orton LLP. Objections due by 2/25/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service and Service List) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4841 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Monthly Application for Compensation Application of Compensation for WHSA's January Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. Objections due by 2/25/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Fee Detail) (Smith, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4840 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Court Order Rescheduling April 12, 2010 Hearing to April 19, 2010 in Delaware (related document(s)[4839]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4839 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Court's Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Date Change - Hearings Scheduled for April 12, 2010 in Wilmington, DE have been moved to April 19, 2010 in Wilmington, DE (SAJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4838 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: 2/3/2010 Fee Auditor's Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Fee Auditor's Report Fee Auditor's Final Report Regarding Snyder Miller and Orton's 20Q Fee Application Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. (Smith, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4837 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: 2/3/2010 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Application for Compensation of Kelly C. Wooster for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for January 1, 2010 through January 31, 2010 Filed by Kelly C. Wooster. Objections due by 2/23/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service & Service List) (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4836 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: 2/3/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Regarding Fee Application Request of The Law Office of Alan Pedlar for the Period Decmeber 1, 2010 through December 31, 2010 (related document(s)[4778]) Filed by The Flintkote Company, Flintkote Mines Limited. (O'Neill, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4835 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Monthly Certificate of No Objection Certification of No Objection Regarding Docket Number 4773 Filed by Warren H. Smith & Associates, P.C.. (Smith, Warren)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 543 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?