United States of America et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10248
District Judge Patti B. Saris, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo T. Mark Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenspun Shapiro Davis & Leary PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Shapiro +1 703 684 1700 +1 703 591 7268 js@greenspunlaw.com
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie A. Oberembt +1 202 514 9472

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roslyn G. Pollack +1 215 875 3000 rpollack@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Fauci +1 617 748 3298 +1 617 748 3971 jeff.fauci@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara Healy Smith +1 617 748 3100 +1 617 748 3969 barbara.h.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marjory P. Albee +1 215 875 3064 +1 215 875 4604 malbee@bm.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shauna B. Itri +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4671 sitri@bm.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roslyn G. Pollack +1 215 875 3000 rpollack@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Breen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison W. Simon +1 954 874 1635 alisonsimon@breenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenspun Shapiro Davis & Leary PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Shapiro +1 703 684 1700 +1 703 591 7268 js@greenspunlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoboken Web Services, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/15/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carol A. Mager +1 215 640 3280 +1 215 640 3281 cmager@magergoldstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Prichard, Hawkins, McFarland & Young

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn W. MacTaggart +1 210 477 7419 +1 210 477 7469 gmactaggart@phmy.com
No Logo Zachary T. Bentley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenspun Shapiro Davis & Leary PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Shapiro +1 703 684 1700 +1 703 591 7268 js@greenspunlaw.com
v.
No Logo Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared T. Heck +1 312 469 7087 +1 312 665 9645 jtheck@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donoghue, Barrett & Singal, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Goldstein +1 617 720 5090 +1 617 720 5092 rgoldstein@dbslawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce A. Singal +1 617 720 5090 +1 617 720 5092 bsingal@dbslawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth A. Gastwirth +1 312 862 2464 +1 312 862 2200 seth.gastwirth@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miriam L. Lieberman +1 312 469 7334 mlieberman@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W. Reale +1 312 861 3452 +1 312 660 7970 jreale@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin Louis Roth +1 312 862 7170 +1 312 862 2200 martin.roth@kirkland.com
No Logo Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared T. Heck +1 312 469 7087 +1 312 665 9645 jtheck@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donoghue, Barrett & Singal, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Goldstein +1 617 720 5090 +1 617 720 5092 rgoldstein@dbslawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce A. Singal +1 617 720 5090 +1 617 720 5092 bsingal@dbslawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ceylan Ayasli Eatherton +1 312 469 7002
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth A. Gastwirth +1 312 862 2464 +1 312 862 2200 seth.gastwirth@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miriam L. Lieberman +1 312 469 7334 mlieberman@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W. Reale +1 312 861 3452 +1 312 660 7970 jreale@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin Louis Roth +1 312 862 7170 +1 312 862 2200 martin.roth@kirkland.com
No Logo Roxane Laboratories Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared T. Heck +1 312 469 7087 +1 312 665 9645 jtheck@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donoghue, Barrett & Singal, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Goldstein +1 617 720 5090 +1 617 720 5092 rgoldstein@dbslawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce A. Singal +1 617 720 5090 +1 617 720 5092 bsingal@dbslawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ceylan Ayasli Eatherton +1 312 469 7002
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth A. Gastwirth +1 312 862 2464 +1 312 862 2200 seth.gastwirth@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miriam L. Lieberman +1 312 469 7334 mlieberman@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W. Reale +1 312 861 3452 +1 312 660 7970 jreale@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin Louis Roth +1 312 862 7170 +1 312 862 2200 martin.roth@kirkland.com
No Logo Ben Venue Laboratories, Inc., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Donoghue, Barrett & Singal, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Goldstein +1 617 720 5090 +1 617 720 5092 rgoldstein@dbslawfirm.com
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (106) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 106 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER consolidating cases(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
    Letter to Christine Patch from Alison W. Simon enclosing a DVD containing the Notice of Filing of Declaration of Mark T. Jones with exhibits (Master Docket No. 6645, Subcategory Document No. 529). Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-12257-PBS, 1:05-cv-11084-PBS, 1:06-cv-11337-PBS, 1:07-cv-10248-PBS(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
      Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Martin L. Roth by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -)(Goldstein, Richard) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
        MOTION for Extension of Time to September 15, 2009 to September 22, 2009 For Filing Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Replies and Sur-replies (MD # 6491) by United States of America.(Lavine, Mark) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Common Law Fraud Cause of Action by United States of America. (Henderson, George) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None
            NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              Transcript of Status Hearing held on May 28, 2009, before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Lee A. Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 6/22/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Glenn W. MacTaggart by Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10248-PBS, 1:01-cv-12257-PBS(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ceylan A. Eatherton by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Singal, Bruce) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT in Support re 96 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions of Kansas Health Policy Authority and Memordanum in Support (Master Docket # 5697) MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions of Kansas Health Policy Authority and Memordanum in Support (Master Docket # 5697) (Master Docket 5698). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit J)(Reale, John) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                      MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions of Kansas Health Policy Authority and Memordanum in Support (Master Docket # 5697) by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc..(Reale, John) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                        NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Transcript of Status Conference held on November 13, 2008, before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Lee A. Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 12/8/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                            Opposition re 83 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Master Dkt. # 5680) filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Gortner, Eric) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Clarification re Order on Motion to Compel,, by United States of America.(Fauci, James) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Transcript of Motion Hearing held on October 28, 2008, before Judge Bowler. Court Reporter: Transcribed by Maryann Young at 508/384-2003. The Transcript may be purchased through Maryann Young, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 11/25/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
                                    First REPLY to Response to 71 First MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO SEARCH FOR AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Representative Transmittal Letters and Source Logs, # 2 Exhibit B - Sample Transmittal Letters)(Healy Smith, Barbara) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/14/2008 to Respond to Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc..(Gortner, Eric) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Roxane Defendants' Response to Objections to the September 26, 2008 Order by the Magistrate Judge by Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Relator's Reply)(Simon, Alison) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Leave to File Brief Reply (Unopposed) by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 - Reply to Roxane Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, # 2 Attachment 2 - Exhibit A to Reply Brief, # 3 Attachment 3 - Exhibit B to Reply Brief)(Healy Smith, Barbara) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Shauna B. Itri Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002157812. by Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Shauna Itri, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 83 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 3)(Fauci, James) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by United States of America.(Fauci, James) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Roxane Defendants' Response by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc. to 80 Objection, 78 Objection s to Magistrate Judge Bowler's Sept. 26, 2008 Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Gortner, Eric) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                    Opposition re 71 First MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO SEARCH FOR AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Gortner, Eric) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                      Objection to Order on Motion to Compel,,, by United States of America. (Healy Smith, Barbara) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/13/2008 03:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. Motions due by 6/26/2009; oppositions due 7/24/09. Hearing on Summary Judgment set for 9/23/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-12257-PBS, 1:05-cv-11084-PBS, 1:06-cv-11337-PBS, 1:07-cv-10248-PBS(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Objection to Order on Motion to Compel,,, by Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Simon, Alison) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Transcript of Motion Hearing held on July 29, 2008, before Judge Bowler. Court Reporter: Transcribed by Maryann Young at 508/384-2003. The Transcript may be purchased through Maryann Young, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 10/21/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Assented to MOTION to Continue Hearing to 10/27/2008 or in the alternative October 28 or 29, 2008 by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc..(Gortner, Eric) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Carol A. Mager and Certificate of Service (Mager, Carol) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/10/2008 to Respond to Motion to Compel re First Requests for the Production of Documents and Proposed Order by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc..(Gortner, Eric) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 71 First MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO SEARCH FOR AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Fauci, James) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        First MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO SEARCH FOR AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fauci, James) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Marjory P. Albee (Albee, Marjory) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Letter to Judge Saris from George B. Henderson, II. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Transcript of Status Conference held on July 24, 2008, before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Debra M. Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 8/22/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/1/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Their Joint Motion to Compel Production of Relator Ven-A-Care's Disclosure Statement and Any Subsequent Amendments by Roxane laboratories, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corp., Boehgringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Gortner, Eric) Modified on 7/23/2008 (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Letter to Judge Saris from James J. Fauci informing the Court that they have scheduled a mediation session on September 23, 2008. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 57 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Realtor Ven-A-Care's Disclosure Statement and Any Subsequent Amendments filed by Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Pollack, Roslyn) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        Opposition re 57 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Realtor Ven-A-Care's Disclosure Statement and Any Subsequent Amendments filed by United States of America. (Healy Smith, Barbara) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 7-3-2008 to File Response/Reply as to 57 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Realtor Ven-A-Care's Disclosure Statement and Any Subsequent Amendments, 58 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by United States of America, Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc..(Pollack, Roslyn) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 59 Cross MOTION for Clarification (Additional) or Modification of the Case Management Order filed by United States of America, Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc.. (Healy Smith, Barbara) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 53 MOTION to Expedite - Motion for Expedited Clarification of the Governing Case Management Orders and Memorandum in Support re 59 Roxane Defendants' Cross-Motion for Additional Clarification or Modification of the Case Management Order filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Heck, Jared) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                Cross MOTION for Clarification (Additional) or Modification of the Case Management Order by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc..(Heck, Jared) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 57 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Realtor Ven-A-Care's Disclosure Statement and Any Subsequent Amendments filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Reale, John) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Realtor Ven-A-Care's Disclosure Statement and Any Subsequent Amendments by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc..(Reale, John) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Joint MEMORANDUM in Support re 55 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Reale, John) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit [Proposed] Case Management Order)(Reale, John) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 53 MOTION to Expedite - Motion for Expedited Clarification of the Governing Case Management Orders filed by United States of America. (Healy Smith, Barbara) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION to Expedite - Motion for Expedited Clarification of the Governing Case Management Orders by United States of America.(Healy Smith, Barbara) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Seth A. Gastwirth by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Richard) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Reale on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc. (Reale, John) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Fauci on behalf of United States of America (Fauci, James) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Order to set briefing schedule in connection with the United States' Motion to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses, filed on February 11, 2008 by United States of America.(Oberembt, Laurie) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 47 MOTION to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 2)(Oberembt, Laurie) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses by United States of America.(Oberembt, Laurie) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by United States of America.(Oberembt, Laurie) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 11, 2008 to Respond to Defendants' Answers to Complaint by United States of America.(Healy Smith, Barbara) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Miriam L. Lieberman by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Goldstein, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2008: # 2 Main Document) (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 31, 2008 to Respond to Defendants' Answers to Complaint by United States of America.(Healy Smith, Barbara) (Entered: 12/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Heck, Jared) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation.(Heck, Jared) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Roxane laboratories, Inc..(Heck, Jared) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting in part and denying in part 14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the United States' Complaint filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Roxane laboratories, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., 20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Relator Ven-A-Care's Amended Complaint filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Roxane laboratories, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Carol A. Mager Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1708417. by Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Marjory P. Albee Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1708389. by Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Roslyn G. Pollack Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1689336. by Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc..(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Protective Order by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Proposed Protective Order)(Healy Smith, Barbara) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Judge Patti B. Saris : CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER entered. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Order to Enter Case Management Order by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Healy Smith, Barbara) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Healy Smith on behalf of United States of America (Healy Smith, Barbara) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by United States of America of Recent United States District Court Decision Regarding the Statute of Limitations Issue Raised in the Roxane Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the United States' Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1)(Oberembt, Laurie) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on June 20, 2007 before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Lee A. Marzilli. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/345-6787 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Relator Ven-A-Care's Amended Complaint filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Singal, Bruce) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Motion re 14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the United States' Complaint filed by United States of America. (Oberembt, Laurie) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Helen E. Witt by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Helen Witt)(Goldstein, Richard) (Entered: 05/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Patti B. Saris : CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER entered re 16 Joint MOTION for Order to Enter Proposed Case Management Order filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Roxane laboratories, Inc., United States of America, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Relator Ven-A-Care's Amended Complaint filed by Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc.. (Thomas, Susan) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the United States' Complaint filed by all defendants. (Goldstein, Richard) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the United States' Complaint filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3, Part 1# 4 Exhibit 3, Part 2# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5)(Gobena, Gejaa) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Relator Ven-A-Care's Amended Complaint filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Richard) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Dismiss Relator Ven-A-Care's Amended Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc..(Goldstein, Richard) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Patti Saris : ORDER entered; re 17 MOTION to Amend 2 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Complaint by Adopting United States' Complaint filed by Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc., (Filo, Jennifer) Modified on 4/25/2007 to correct Judge (Filo, Jennifer). (Entered: 04/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION Entry of Proposed Case Management Order by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc., Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend 2 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Complaint by Adopting United States' Complaint by Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Order to Enter Proposed Case Management Order by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc., United States of America, Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Richard) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the United States' Complaint filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C (Part 1)# 4 Exhibit C (Part 2)# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E)(Goldstein, Richard) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss the United States' Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc..(Goldstein, Richard) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Goldstein, Richard) (Entered: 03/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Goldstein, Richard) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Goldstein, Richard) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation. (Goldstein, Richard) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jared Heck by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Richard) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Eric Gortner by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Richard) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce A. Singal on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc. (Singal, Bruce) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Goldstein on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc. (Goldstein, Richard) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Patti B. Saris added. Judge Morris E. Lasker no longer assigned to case. (Howarth, George) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Morris E. Lasker : ORDER entered transfering case to MultiDistrict Litigation proceeding No. 1456 before Judge Ssris (Howarth, George) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Transfer Case and Notice of Related Case to MDL No. 1456 by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henderson, George) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Ven-A-Care of the Florida Keys, Inc. of Filing Redacted Complaints (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Original Redacted Complaint# 2 Exhibit Redacted First Amended Complaint# 3 Exhibit Redacted Second Amended Complaint# 4 Exhibit Redacted Third Amended Complaint)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane laboratories, Inc. , filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edge, Eugenia) Modified on 3/8/2007 (Diskes, Sheila). (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?