Morrison v. Zangpo
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-01945-EMC
District Judge Edward M. Chen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mark Morrison, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matt Kurilich +1 714 734 3715 +1 714 734 3716 mattkurilich@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ward S Clay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Morrison +1 360 221 0253 mark@markmorrisonlaw.com
v.
No Logo Uli Zangpo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Neil Jon Bloomfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neil Jon Bloomfield +1 415 454 2294 njbloomfield@njblaw.com
Office San Francisco
Filed 4/11/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand $705000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, E-Filing
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 ERRATA
ERRATA re [45] Affidavit in Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration (Declarationof Uli Zangpo) by Uli Zangpo. (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
    AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re [40] MOTION for Reconsideration (Declaration of Uli Zangpo) filed byUli Zangpo. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
      LREF
      Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
      AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re [40] MOTION fro Reconsideraion (Declaration of Steven Finkbine) filed byUli Zangpo. (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
        Memorandum in Opposition re [40] MOTION for Reconsideration filed byUli Zangpo. (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
          LREF
          Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Clerks Notice
          AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE - Opposition due 8/14/08 (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2008)
            LREF
            Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
            CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2008)
              LREF
              Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              MOTION for Relief from Stipulation and Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Binding Arbitration filed by Mark Morrison. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Mark Morrison, # (2) Affidavit Jim Sciaroni)(Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 8/1/2008) Modified on 8/4/2008 (slh, COURT STAFF).
                LREF
                Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying [8] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Revised Complaint; Denying [36] Defendant's Motion to Strike; and Referring Case to Mediation. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2008)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Motion Hearing
                  Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2008 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 7/24/2008) re [8] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Uli Zangpo. Defendants motion to dismiss is denied. Court will issue order.Plaintiff shall file motion for reconsideration re binding arbitration by 8/4/08. Case continued to: 10/15/08 at 2:30 p.m. for Further CMC (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/24/2008)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                    Set/Reset Hearings:, Set/Reset Deadlines: Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2008 02:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2008. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2008)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Proposed Order
                      Proposed Order re [36] Motion to Strike by Uli Zangpo. (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 7/18/2008) Modified on 7/21/2008 (slh, COURT STAFF).
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008, Terminated: 7/28/2008 Motion to Strike
                        MOTION/Request to Strike Document #33 filed by Uli Zangpo. (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 7/18/2008) Modified on 7/21/2008 (slh, COURT STAFF).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Certificate of Interested Entities
                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Uli Zangpo (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 7/16/2008)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Case Management Statement
                            CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mark Morrison, Uli Zangpo. (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 7/16/2008)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 ADR Phone Conference held
                              ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 7/14/08. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2008)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Declaration in Opposition
                                DECLARATION of Mark Morrison in Opposition to [9] Declaration in Support, [10] Proposed Order, [8] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction SECOND DECLARATION filed byMark Morrison. (Related document(s)[9], [10], [8]) (Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Reply to Opposition
                                  Reply to Opposition re [8] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Reply to Non-Opposition on Arbitration Referral filed byUli Zangpo. (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 7/9/2008)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                    (NEW ATTACHMENT For #30) ORDER re [28] First MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Mark Morrison, [30] Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/9/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2008)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying [28] Motion to Appear by Telephone (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2008)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 ADR Remark
                                        ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference has been rescheduled to 7/14/08 at 11:30 a.m. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Letter
                                          Letter from Paul L. Warren. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2008)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008, Terminated: 7/9/2008 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                            First MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Mark Morrison. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 7/3/2008)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                                              Set/Reset Hearings:, Set/Reset Deadlines: Case Management Conference reset for 7/23/2008 10:30 AM. Motion Hearing reset for 7/23/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2008. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2008)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part [11] Motion to Stay Discovery and [14] Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference; Setting Hearing on [8] Motion to Dismiss and Case Management Conference; and Conditionally Ordering Mandatory Arbitration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2008)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                  CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Uli Zangpo.. (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 6/30/2008)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
                                                    ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 7/14/08 at 9:30 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2008)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of
                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 6/25/2008)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3
                                                        NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 6/25/2008)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Declaration of Matt Kurilich in Support of re [21] Opposition to Motion to Extend Case Management Conference Filed by Plaintiff Mark Morrison. (Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                            Memorandum in Opposition to re [14] Defendant's Motion to Extend Case Management Conference Filed by Plaintiff Mark Morrison. (Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Response in Support
                                                              STATEMENT of Non-Opposition to re [11] Defendant's Motion to Stay and Request for Binding Arbitration Filed by Plaintiff Mark Morrison. (Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                Declaration of Matt Kurilich in Support of re [17] Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Filed by Plaintiff Mark Morrison. (Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                  Declaration of Mark Morrison in Support of re [17] Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Filed by Plaintiff Mark Morrison. (Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition to re [8] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Filed by Plaintiff Mark Morrison. (Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Proposed Order
                                                                      Proposed Order re [14] MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Uli Zangpo. (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                        Declaration of Neil Jon Bloomfield in Support of [14] MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed byUli Zangpo. (Related document(s)[14]) (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008, Terminated: 7/1/2008 Motion to Continue
                                                                          MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Uli Zangpo. (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 6/17/2008)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Proposed Order
                                                                            Proposed Order re [11] MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Discovery Pending Mandatory Arbitration by Uli Zangpo. (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 6/11/2008)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                              Declaration of Neil Jon Bloomfield in Support of [11] MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Discovery Pending Mandatory Arbitration filed byUli Zangpo. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[11]) (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 6/11/2008)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008, Terminated: 7/1/2008 Motion to Stay
                                                                                MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Discovery Pending Mandatory Arbitration filed by Uli Zangpo. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 6/11/2008)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Proposed Order
                                                                                  Proposed Order re [8] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Uli Zangpo. (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 6/11/2008)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                                    Declaration of Neil Jon Bloomfield in Support of [8] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byUli Zangpo. (Related document(s)[8]) (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 6/11/2008)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008, Terminated: 7/28/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Uli Zangpo. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 6/11/2008)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER re [6] Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/2/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                          STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. (Bloomfield, Neil) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Mark Morrison (Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                              CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark Morrison.. (Morrison, Mark) (Filed on 5/1/2008)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Morrison. Uli Zangpo served on 4/24/2008, answer due 5/14/2008. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Uli Zangpo. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 ADR Scheduling Order
                                                                                                    ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2008. Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2008 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # (1) EMC Standing Order, # (2) Case Management Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT (no process) against Uli Zangpo (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611018104). Filed by Mark Morrison. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2008: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Civil Cover Sheet) (slh, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                                                                                                        CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 586 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?