DVI, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Delaware Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 03-12656
District Judge Mary F. Walrath, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2016 at 11:20 PM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Dennis Buckley, Trustee of the DVI Liquidating Trust, Trustee

Represented by Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD M. BECK +1 856 486 7900 +1 302 426 9193 rbeck@klehr.com

Represented by Monzack Mersky McLaughlin & Browder, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph J. Bodnar, Esq +1 302 652 5506 +1 320 213 2709 jbodnar@monlaw.com
Space Francis A. Monaco Jr. +1 302 656 8162 +1 302 656 2769 fmonaco@monlaw.com

Represented by Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin J. Mangan +1 302 252 4361 +1 302 661 7729 kmangan@wcsr.com
No Logo DVI, Inc., Debtor

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/02/2004 Michael P. Morton +1 302 426 1313 mpmpa@aol.com

Represented by Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/01/2005 Raymond Howard Lemisch +1 302 442 7010 +1 302 442 7012 rlemisch@beneschlaw.com
Space BRADFORD J. SANDLER +1 302 442 7010 +1 302 442 7012 bsandler@bfca.com

Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Carickhoff, Jr. +1 302 425 6400 +1 302 425 6464 carickhoff@blankrome.com

Represented by Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD M. BECK +1 856 486 7900 +1 302 426 9193 rbeck@klehr.com

Represented by Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephanie Ann Fox +1 302 425 5177 sf@maronmarvel.com

Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sherri Lynn Dahl +1 216 479 8480 sdahl@ssd.com
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Kaiser
Space Timothy Mehok

Represented by Anderson Kill & Olick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Andrew Rahl, Jr. +1 212 278 1482

Represented by Monzack Mersky McLaughlin & Browder, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph J. Bodnar, Esq +1 302 652 5506 +1 320 213 2709 jbodnar@monlaw.com
Space Francis A. Monaco Jr. +1 302 656 8162 +1 302 656 2769 fmonaco@monlaw.com

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael G. Busenkell +1 302 658 9200

Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Venditto +1 212 521 5400 +1 212 521 5450 mvenditto@reedsmith.com
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "United States Trustee"

Represented by BECKER, HADEED, KELLOGG, & BERRY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Klauder +1 703 256 1300
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (203) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 2798 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None
Order RE: Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order Confirming First Amended Joint Plan of Liquidation of DVI, Inc. et al. Signed in Court on 11/24/2004. (related document(s)2743, 2490, 2782 ) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1# 2 Exhibit A Part 2# 3 Exhibit A Part 3# 4 Exhibit A Part 4# 5 Exhibit A Part 5# 6 Exhibit A Part 6# 7 Exhibit A Part 7# 8 Exhibit A Part 8) (DKF, ) Modified SD Code on 5/31/2012 (SLM). (Entered: 11/24/2004)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
    Notice of Appearance And Request For Notices Filed by Ken Burton Jr (ALC, ) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3954 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None
      Claims Register in alphabetical and numerical order can be viewed upon request at the clerk's office. Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC fka Bankruptcy Services, LLC. (JRK) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3953 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
        HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Dennis Buckley, Trustee of the DVI Liquidating Trust, Dennis J. Buckley, Trustee of the DVI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 8/21/2009 at 02:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mangan, Kevin) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
          Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Papers Filed by Sovereign Bank (ALC, ) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2334 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: None
            Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules D, E, or F(03-12656-MFW) [misc,amdscha] ( 26.00). Receipt Number 1662881, amount $ 26.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/13/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 949 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: None
              Status Report (Report by AP Services, LLC of Staffing for the Period of October 1, 2003 Through October 31, 2003) Filed by AP Services, LLC * (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 12/05/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 948 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: None
                Amended Notice of Hearing Amended Notice of Hearing on the Motion of FUJIFILM Medical Systems U.S.A., Inc. to Compel Debtors to Assume or Reject Certain Servicing and Related Agreements Filed by FUJIFILM Medical Systems U.S.A., Inc. Hearing scheduled for 1/7/2004 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/30/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Werb, Duane) (Entered: 12/05/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
                  Letter Regarding Money Sent To Debtor Filed by Dr. W. Scott Miller, D.C. (ALC, ) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 947 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: None
                    Supplemental Certificate of Service (related document(s) 917 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 12/05/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 946 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: None
                      Supplemental Certificate of Service (related document(s) 920 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 12/05/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 945 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: None
                        Certificate of Service (related document(s) 928 , 917 , 929 , 919 , 920 , 925 , 926 , 927 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 12/05/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None
                          Motion to Appear pro hac vice Motion and Order for Admission pro hac vice for Debra A. Dandeneau of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP Filed by XL Capital Assurance, Inc. (Cobb, Richard) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 944 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: None
                            Order Authorizing and Approving Employment and Retention of Westwood Capital LLC and (B) the Terms of Engagement, Nunc Pro Tunc From September 4, 2003, as Financial Advisors to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (related document(s) 265 ) Order Signed on 12/2/2003. (LCN, ) (Entered: 12/05/2003)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None
                              Objection to Debtors' Cash Collateral Motion (D.I. 5) and Debtors' DIP Financing Motion (D.I. 77) (related document(s)5 ) Filed by Oregon Outpatient Surgery Center, LLC, Oregon Sports Medicine Associates and ESG Investment, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Hazeltine, William) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 943 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: None
                                Order Authorizing and Approving (A) Employment and Retention of Houlihan Lokey Howard & Zukin Capital and (B) the Terms of Engagement, Nunc Pro Tunc from September 4, 2003, as Financial Advisors to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (related document(s) 265 ) Order Signed on 12/2/2003. (LCN, ) (Entered: 12/05/2003)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None
                                  Objection to Objection of U.S. Bank National Association to the Emergency Motion of Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Debtors-in-Possession to Obtain Posptetition Financing Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Secs. 105, 362, 364(c)(1), 364(c)(2) and 364(c)(3), (II) Granting Liens and Superpriority Claims, (III) Scheduling the Hearing on Debtors' Motion to Incur Such Financing On a Permanent and Final Basis Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 4001(c) and (IV) Approving the Form and Method of Notice Thereof and the Emergency Motion of Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral, (II) Providing Adequate Protection to Certain Prepetition Secured Creditors, (III) Authorizing the Debtors to Continue to Fund Loans to Existing Borrowers and Fund Needs of Special Purpose Vehicles, and (IV) Providing for Related Relief (related document(s)5, 77 ) Filed by U.S. Bank National Association (Mumford, Kerri) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 942 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                    Certification of Counsel (related document(s) 807 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None
                                      Objection to Debtors' Cash Collateral Motion (D.I. 5) and Debtors' DIP Financing Motion (D.I. 77) (related document(s)5 ) Filed by Intrepid USA, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Hazeltine, William) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 941 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Service Of The First Set Of Interrogatories And Requests For Production Of Documents Of The MRI Centers Of New England, Inc. And NorthWestern R.I. Imaging Center, LLC To Debtors Filed by MRI Centers of New England, Inc. and Northwestern R.I. Imaging Center, LLC (Bettinger, Wilmer) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None
                                          Objection to Debtors' Motion for Use of Cash Collateral and Related Relief and Emergency Motion for Approval of Postpetition Financing (related document(s)5, 77 ) Filed by FUJIFILM Medical Systems U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service and Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 940 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                            Certificate of Service (related document(s) 938 , 939 , 937 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None
                                              Omnibus Objection to TO DEBTORS? MOTIONS (I) FOR INTERIM USE OF CASH COLLATERAL [Docket No. 5] (II) TO OBTAIN POSTPETITION FINANCING [Docket No. 77], and (III) TO PERMIT DVI BUSINESS CREDIT CORPORATION TO CONTINUE TO PERFORM UNDER CERTAIN AGREEMENTS [Docket No. 78 (related document(s)5, 77, 78 ) Filed by FLEET NATIONAL BANK (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 939 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 8/25/03-9/30/03 (Revised) 03-12658 Filed by DVI, Inc. (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                  Notice of Appearance Notice of Entry of Appearance and Demand For Papers of Richard S. Cobb of Landis Rath & Cobb LLP and Debra A. Dandeneau and John J. Dedyo of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP Filed by XL Capital Assurance, Inc. (Cobb, Richard) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 938 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                    Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 8/25/03-9/30/03 (Revised) 03-12657 Filed by DVI, Inc. (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                      Affidavit (Supplemental) of David S. Heller in Support of Application of Debtors Pursuant to Sections 327(a) and 330 of the United States Bankruptcy Code for Authorization to Employ Latham & Watkins LLP as Attorneys for the Debtors (related document(s)14 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 937 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                        Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period 8/25/03-9/30/03 (Revised) 03-12656 Filed by DVI, Inc. (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                          Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers Filed by Inphact, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Allinson III, Elihu) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 936 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                            Certificate of Service (related document(s) 828 , 846 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                              Certification of Counsel Certification of Counsel Regarding Scheduling of Omnibus Hearing Dates Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 935 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                Objection to Motion To Approve Sale Of Certain Assets (related document(s) 807 ) Filed by Neotonus, Inc. (ALC, ) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                  Motion to Appear pro hac vice of James Stephenson of Faegre & Benson LLP Filed by U.S. Bank National Association (Mumford, Kerri) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 934 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                    Statement of Professionals' Compensation Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                      Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Michael Stewart of Faegre & Benson LLP Filed by U.S. Bank National Association (Mumford, Kerri) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 932 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                        Agreement Letter Agreement re: Amended and Restated DIP Credit Agreement (Executed) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS (Monaco Jr., Francis) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                          Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers Filed by FUJIFILM Medical Systems U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 931 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                            Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims Filed by State Of Michigan, Dept. Of Treasury (ALC, ) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                              Notice of Appearance and Demand for Service of Papers Filed by PresGar Companies (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Stratton, David) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 930 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                Notice of Hearing on the Motion of FUJIFILM Medical Systems U.S.A., Inc. to Compel Debtors to Assume or Reject Certain Servicing and Related Agreements Filed by FUJIFILM Medical Systems U.S.A., Inc. Hearing scheduled for 1/7/2004 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/12/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Werb, Duane) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                  Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael P. Massad, Jr. (related document(s)55 ) Order Signed on 9/2/2003. (KPM, ) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 929 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                    Order Authorizing Latham & Watkins LLP to (A) Return a Fee Advance to the Debtors' Bankruptcy Estates and (B) Receive Future Fee Advances and/or Payments From the Non-Debtor European Businesses. (related document(s) 594 ) Signed in Court on 12/1/2003. (LCN, ) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                      Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott Berman and Steven B. Levine. (related document(s)56 ) Order Signed on 9/2/2003. (KPM, ) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 928 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                        Order Granting Debtors' Motion for Approval of Procedures for Payoff of, and Release of Obligations Under Progress Payment Contracts. (related document(s) 799 ) Signed in Court on 12/1/2003. (LCN, ) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                          Certificate of Service (related document(s)79 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 927 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                            Order Authorizing and Approving a Supplemental Employee Retention Program. (related document(s) 782 ) Signed in Court on 12/1/2003. (LCN, ) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                              Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by DVI, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 9/5/2003 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 926 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                Order Authorizing the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession to Consent to the Sale of Assets of Their Australian Non-Debtor Subsidiary to De Lage Landen PTY Limited. (related document(s) 691 ) Signed in Court on 12/1/2003. (LCN, ) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Emergency Motion to Authorize DVI BUSINESS CREDIT CORPORATION TO CONTINUE PERFORMING UNDER AGREEMENTS WITH DVI BUSINESS CREDIT RECEIVABLES CORP. III, CLARIFYING STATUS OF LOCKBOX ACCOUNTS ESTABLISHED IN CONNECTION THEREWITH, AUTHORIZING DVI BUSINESS CREDIT CORPORATION TO MAKE CAPITAL CONTRIBUTIONS OR LOANS TO DVI BUSINESS CREDIT RECEIVABLES CORP. III AND AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO ENTER INTO A FORBEARANCE AGREEMENT. Filed by DVI, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 9/5/2003 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 9/5/2003. (Attachments: 1 Notice 2 Exhibit A and B) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 925 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Order (Final) (I) Authorizing Debtors in Possession to Enter into and Obtain Credit Under the Amended and Restated Postpetition Financing Agreement with Goldman Sachs Credit Partners L.P. as Loan Agent, Administrative Agent and Lender and Ableco Finance LLC, as Loan Agent and Lender and (II) Reaffirming Liens and Superpriority Claims. (related document(s) 230 ) Signed in Court on 12/1/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (LCN, ) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Emergency Motion to Authorize (I) Debtors in Possession to Obtain Postpetition Financing Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105, 362, 364(c)(1), 364(c)(2), 364(c)(3) and 364(d), (II) Granting Liens and Superpriority Claims, (III) Scheduling the Hearing on the Debtors' Motion to Incur Such Financing on a Permanent and Final Basis Pursuant to FED.R.BANKR.P. 4001(c) and (IV) Approving the Form and Method of Notice Thereof Filed by DVI, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 9/5/2003 at 02:00 PM (check with court for location). Objections due by 9/4/2003. (Attachments: 1 Notice of Motion2 Exhibit A3 Exhibit B) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 924 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s) 900 , 913 ) (LCN, ) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Motion to Allow - Motion of Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession for an Order (I)(A) Establishing Bidding Procedures, (B) Approving Form of Purchase Agreement, (C) Approving Form and Manner of Notices, (D) Scheduling a Hearing Date to Consider Final Approval of Sale and Treatment of Contracts and Leases, and (E) Granting Related Relief; and (II)(A) Approving Sale Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, Interests and Encumbrances and (B) Authorizing the Assumption and Assignment and/or Sale of Certain Contracts and Leases Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Notice of Motion2 Schedule 1 to the Motion3 Exhibit A to the Motion: Asset Purchase Agreement) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 923 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl, Young & Jones & Weintraub P.C. as Counsel to the Chapter 11 Examiner, R. Todd Neilson, Nunc Pro Tunc. (related document(s) 812 ) Order Signed on 11/26/2003. (LCN, ) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance And Demand For Service Of Papers Filed by St. Lukes-Roosevelt Hospital Center (ALC, ) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 922 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Limited Objection to Sale Of Contract And/Or Assumption Or Assignment Thereof Filed by The Great Plains Laboratory, Inc. (ALC, ) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance Notice of Entry of Appearance and Demand for Notices and Papers Filed by U.S. Bank National Association (Landis, Adam) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 921 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim Filed by Berger Singerman, P.A. (Rich, Brian) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service (related document(s)52 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 920 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Order Authorizing and Approving Debtors' Rejection of an Unexpired Lease of Nonresidential Real Property with Tampa Medical Tower, LLC (Related Doc # 801 ) -Order Signed on 12/1/2003. (MDE, ) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Notice of Deposition Upon Oral Examination of Designated Representative of Fleet National Bank Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 919 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Order Approving Settlement Agreement By and Between DVI Strategic Partner Group, a Division of DVI Financial Services, Inc., College Hill Pet Clinic, Inc., and Kevin Ketring a/k/a Kevin D. Ketring (Related Doc # 800 ) -Order Signed on 12/1/2003. (MDE, ) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Notice of Deposition Upon Oral Examination of Joseph D'Angelo Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 918 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Order Authorizing and Approving Debtors' Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts and/or Unexpired Leases (Related Doc # 784 ) -Order Signed on 12/1/2003. (MDE, ) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of P. Sabin Willett. (related document(s)32 ) Order Signed on 8/28/2003 (KPM, ) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Debtor's Motion for an Order Authorizing and Approving (i) the Transfer and Sale of Certain Assets of the Debtor's Estate (ii) the Assumption and Assignment of All of Debtor's Rights, Title and Interest in and to that Certain Suite License Agreement With Eagles Stadium Operator, LLC; (iii) the Assumption and Assignment of All of Debtor's Rights and Interest in and to that Certain Letter Agreement By and Between Debtor and Tri-State; and (iv) Granting Related Relief (Related Doc # 783 ) -Order Signed on 12/1/2003. (MDE, ) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Julia Frost-Davies. (related document(s)30 ) Order Signed on 8/28/2003 (KPM, ) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 916 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) Westwood Capital's First Fee App (September 2003) (related document(s) 675 ) Filed by Westwood Capital, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Mangan, Kevin) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Filed by Angelo, Gordon & Co. (ALC, ) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection (No Order Required) re: Houlihan Lokey's First Fee App (September 2003) (related document(s) 676 ) Filed by Houlihan Lokey Howard & Zukin Financial Advisors, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Mangan, Kevin) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eleanor Heard Gilbane. (related document(s)31 ) Order Signed on 8/28/2003 (KPM, ) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Motion to Allow Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Authority to File an Omnibus Reply to Objections to the Motion of Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession for Entry of a Final Order (I) Authorizing Debtors-in-Possession to Enter into and Obtain Credit Under the Amended and Restated Post-Petition Financing Agreement with Goldman Sachs Credit Partners as Loan Agent, Administrative Agent and Lender and Abelco Finance LLC as Loan Agent and Lender, and (II) Reaffirming Liens and Superpriority Claims - THIS MOTION WAS ORIGINALLY FILED ON 11/26/2003 IN CASE NO. 03-12658. Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2003 at 11:30 AM (check with court for location). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Certificate of Service) (Monaco Jr., Francis) Modified on 12/1/2003 (Manley, Stacey). (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance And Request For Speical Notice Filed by General Electric Captial Business Asset Funding Corporation (ALC, ) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 913 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by DVI, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2003 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Approve the Rejection of Certain Severance Agreements Filed by DVI, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 10/3/2003 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 9/25/2003. (Attachments: 1 Notice 2 Exhibit A3 Proposed Form of Order 4 Certificate of Service) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 912 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Order Authorizing The Rentention & Employment of Nelson Elggren LLP of Which He Is a Member, as Accountant To The Chapter 11 Examiner, R. Todd Neilson, Nunc Pro Tunc (Related Doc # 811 ) Signed on 11/26/2003. (JSJ, ) (Entered: 11/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance Mark D. Collins of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. & Gary T. Holtzer of Weil Gotshal & Manges, LLP and Demand for Notices and Papers Filed by General Electric (Collins, Mark) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 911 Filed: 11/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Application for Compensation (Third) Filed by Latham & Watkins LLP Objections due by 12/19/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit # 3 Certificate of Service) (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Latham & Watkins LLP -Order Signed in Court (related document(s)20) on 8/27/2003 (MDE, ) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 910 Filed: 11/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Amended Certificate of Service (related document(s) 875 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Adelman Lavine Gold and Levin, A Professional Corporation Lawyers -Order Signed in Court (related document(s)16 ) on 8/27/2003 (MDE, ) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Authorize and Approve the Rejection of an Unexpired Lease With Dell-Lou's I & D, Inc. and the Abandonment of Certain Property Related Thereto Filed by DVI, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 1/7/2004 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/31/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Certificate of Service) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Order Authorizing (I) Payment of Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, Commissions, Vacation Pay and Employee Benefits, and (II) Reimbursement of Employee Business Expenses -Order Signed in Court (related document(s)11) on 8/27/2003 (MDE, ) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Application to Employ Heron Residential as Real Estate Broker Filed by DVI, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 1/7/2004 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/31/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A and B# 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Certificate of Service) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Order (WITH REVISIONS) Authorizing Debtors to Maintain Bank Accounts and Business Forms -Order Signed in Court (related document(s)7) on 8/27/2003 (MDE, ) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Withdrawal Notice of Withdrawal and Request for Termination of CM/ECF Notices Filed by Klehr, Harrison, HArvey, Branzburg & Ellers, LLP (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Kortanek, Steven) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Order (WITH REVISIONS) Authorizing Continued Use of Cash Management System -Order Signed in Court (related document(s)6) on 8/27/2003 (MDE, ) Modified on 8/29/2003 (MDE, ). (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 906 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance Filed by Rice, Rice and Gilbert, P.C. (ALC, ) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases (Case Nos. 03-12656, 03-12657 and 03-12658). An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases of DVI, Inc., DVI Financial Services, Inc., and DVI Business Credit Corporation. The docket in Case No. 03-12656 should b e consulted for all matters affecting the above-listed bankruptcy cases. Order Signed in Court (related document(s)2) on 8/27/2003 (MDE, ) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 905 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection to Emergency Motion of Debtors for an Order (A) Approving Break-Up Fee, (B) Approving Sale of Certain Assets of SPG, a Branch of Debtor DVI Financial Services, Inc. Located in Illinois, to Capital Crossing Bank Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, Interests and Encumbrances, and (C) Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into a Servicing Agreement with Capital Crossing Bank to Service Certain Leases (related document(s) 807 ) Filed by IFC Credit Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service) (Phillips, John) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s)52 ) (MDE, ) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Denying Debtors' Motion to Shorten Notice Period and to Approve Manner of Notice (Re: Debtors' Emergency Motion for an Order Authorizing Sale of the Assets of Their Singaporean Non-Debtor Subsidiary to De Lage Lander PTY Limited, and Authorizing DVI, Inc. to Enter Into a Purchase Agreement with De Lage Lander PTY Limited and Perform Certain Obligations Therein) (Related Doc # 874 ) -Order Signed on 11/26/2003. (MDE, ) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Scott Berman, Esquire and Steven B. Levine, Esquire of Brown Rudnick Berlack Israels LLP Filed by Integral PET Associates, LLC, Integral Nuclear Associates, LLC, Nuclear Management, Inc., and thier affiliates (Bowden, William) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 903 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Denying Debtors' Motion to Shorten Notice Period and to Approve Form and Manner of Notice (Re: Debtors' Emergency Motion to Pay Stay Bonuses and Enter Into a Management Incentive Plan With Specified Turkish Employees) (Related Doc # 888 ) -Order Signed on 11/26/2003. (MDE, ) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Michael P. Massad, Jr. Filed by Intrepid USA, Inc. (Hazeltine, William) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 902 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit Notice of Filing of Revised DIP Budget (related document(s) 617 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John P. McNicholas, Esquire (Related Doc # 26) -Order Signed on 8/28/2003. (MDE, ) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 901 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection to Application of Arnold & Porter for Allowance of Administrative Expenses Claim for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 503 (Docket #819) (related document(s) 819 ) Filed by United States Trustee (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Schepacarter, Richard) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas R. Califano, Esquire(Related Doc # 25) -Order Signed on 8/28/2003. (MDE, ) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by DVI, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2003 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Hearing and Interim Order (related document(s)5, 50 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 9/5/2003 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 9/4/2003. (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony S. Traymore, Esquire (Related Doc # 847 ) -Order Signed on 11/25/2003. (MDE, ) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices and Service of Papers for Michael J. Lichtenstein, of Swidler Berlin Shereff Friedman, LLP(Certificate of Service) Filed by USCC Florida Acquisition Corporation, USCC Acquisition Corp., FROG OnCURE Southside, L.L.C., Jaxpet/Positech, L.L.C., Pointe West Oncology, LLC, and USCC Healthcare Management Corp. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jay L. Gottlieb, Esquire (Related Doc # 848 ) -Order Signed on 11/25/2003. (MDE, ) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Interim Order (I) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral, (II) Providing Adequate Protection to Certain Prepetition Secured Creditors, (III) Authorizing the Debtors to Continue to Fund Loans to Existing Borrowers and Fund Needs of Special Purpose Vehicles, and (IV) Providing for Related Relief Signed in Court (related document(s)5 ) on 8/27/2003 (LMC, ) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 897 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Susan G. Rosenthal, Esquire(Related Doc # 849 ) -Order Signed on 11/25/2003. (MDE, ) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices and Service of Papers Filed by Miracor Diagnostics, Inc. (McCullough, Bruce) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel L. Hollander, Esquire (Related Doc # 850 ) -Order Signed on 11/25/2003. (MDE, ) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Anthony Turek in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions and First Day Orders Filed by DVI, Inc. (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Michael V. Girello re: Joinder of U.S. Bank National Association, in its Individual Capacity, to the Objection of U.S. Bank National Association, as Securitization Trustee, to the Motion of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Leave to Commence Action on Behalf of Debtors' Estates (service list attached) (related document(s) 863 ) Filed by U.S. Bank National Association (Mumford, Kerri) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance Filed by FLEET NATIONAL BANK (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 894 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Michael V. Girello re: Preliminary Opposition of Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., XL Capital Assurance Inc., Harris Nesbitt Corp. and U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee, to the Emergency Motion of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Leave to Commence Adversary Proceeding on Behalf of the Debtors' Estates, and Request for an Order Authorizing Expedited Discovery and Setting an Evidentiary Hearing (service list attached) (related document(s) 868 ) Filed by Nomura Credit & Captial, Inc. (Cobb, Richard) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance re: Monzack and Monaco, P.A. Filed by Monack and Monaco, P.A. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Monaco Jr., Francis) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certification of Counsel Regarding Docket No. 812 - Application of Chapter 11 Examiner, R. Todd Neilson, for an Order Authorizing Him to Retain and Employ Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl, Young, Jones & Weintraub P.C. as Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc (related document(s) 812 ) Filed by R. Todd Neilson (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Certificate of Service and Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance re: Anderson Kill & Olick Filed by Monack and Monaco, P.A. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Monaco Jr., Francis) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certification of Counsel Regarding Docket No. 811 - Application of Chapter 11 Examiner, R. Todd Neilson, for an Order Authorizing Him to Retain and Employ Neilson Elggren LLP of Which He is a Member, as Accountant to the Examiner, Nunc Pro Tunc (related document(s) 811 ) Filed by R. Todd Neilson (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Certificate of Service and Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers Filed by Intrepid USA, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Service List) (Hazeltine, William) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certification of Counsel (related document(s) 750 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service (related document(s)6, 7, 29 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response to Motion Of Rreef America Reit Ii, Corp. G For Allowance And Immediate Payment Of Administrative Expenses Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 365(D)(3) And 11 U.S.C. Sec. 503(B) (related document(s) 598 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request of US Trustee to Schedule Section 341 Meeting of Creditors for October 3, 2003 at 10:30 a.m. Filed by United States Trustee. (Schepacarter, Richard) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection to -- Objection of Americorp Financial, Inc. to Sale of Certain Medical Equipment Leases (Re: D.I. 807) (related document(s) 807 ) Filed by Americorp Financial, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Leathem, Patrick) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service (related document(s)29, 9 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 888 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Shorten Time (Debtor's Motion to Shorten Notice Period and to Approve Form and Manner of Notice) (related document(s) 887 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service (related document(s)8, 29 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Emergency Motion to Authorize Debtors to Pay Stay Bonuses and Enter Into a Management Incentive Plan With Specified Turkish Employees Filed by DVI, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2003 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/28/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Certificate of Service) (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service (related document(s)18, 19, 20, 21, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 29, 1, 2, 3 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 886 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection (related document(s) 765 ) Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Bodnar, Joseph) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Certificate of Service (related document(s)29 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 883 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection to Debtors' Application For An Order Authorizing Debtors To Retain Brown & Bain, P.A. Nunc Pro Tunc As Special Litigation Counsel Filed by Individual A.R. - Secured Noteholders (ALC, ) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service (related document(s)29 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 882 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Limited Objection to Debtors' Motion For Approval Of Payoff Procedures (related document(s) 799 ) Filed by Magnetic Resonance Imaging (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (ALC, ) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Ron Jacobs in Support of Debtors' Motion for Order Authorizing Retention of Bankruptcy Services LLC as Official Noticing, Claims and/or Solicitation and Balloting Agent (related document(s)15 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 881 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection (related document(s) 801 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Amended Consolidated List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Filed by DVI, Inc. (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 880 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection (related document(s) 800 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection to Limited Objection of WestLB AG, New York Branch to Emergency Motion of Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral, (II) Providing Adequate Protection to Certain Prepetition Secured Creditors, (III) Authorizing the Debtors to Continue to Fund Loans to Existing Borrowers and Fund Needs of Special Purpose Vehicles, and (IV) Providing for Related Relief (related document(s)5 ) Filed by WestLB AG, New York Branch, as Administrative Agent (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (Noble, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 879 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection (related document(s) 784 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service (related document(s)27 ) Filed by USCC Florida Acquisition Corporation, USCC Acquisition Corp., FROG OnCURE Southside, L.L.C., Jaxpet/Positech, L.L.C., Pointe West Oncology, LLC, and USCC Healthcare Management Corp. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 878 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection (related document(s) 783 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Appear pro hac vice of P. Sabin Willett Filed by FLEET NATIONAL BANK (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection (related document(s) 782 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Eleanor Heard Gilbane Filed by FLEET NATIONAL BANK (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection to First Interim Verified Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period 8/25/03 through 9/30/03 (related document(s) 728 ) Filed by Adelman Lavine Gold and Levin, A Professional Corporation (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Julia Frost-Davies Filed by FLEET NATIONAL BANK (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Authorize the Filing of a Supplemental Memorandum (related document(s) 617 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law# 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Certificate of Service) (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing (related document(s)20, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 13, 15, 16, 17, 2 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 8/27/2003 at 04:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 874 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Shorten Time and Approve Manner of Notice (related document(s) 873 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection to Exemptions LIMITED OBJECTION OF NOMURA CREDIT &CAPITAL, INC. AND XL CAPITAL ASSURANCE, INC. TO EMERGENCY MOTION OF DEBTORS FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS (I) AUTHORIZING USE OF CASH COLLATERAL, (II)PROVIDING ADEQUATE PROTECTION TO CERTAIN PREPETITION SECURED CREDITORS, (III) AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO CONTINUE TO FUND LOANS TO EXISTING BORROWERS AND FUND NEEDS OF SPECIAL PURPOSE VEHICLES AND (IV) PROVIDING FOR RELATED RELIEF Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Certificate of Service) (Cobb, Richard) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 873 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Approve Sale of the Assets of Their Singaporean Non-Debtor Subsidiary to De Lage Lander PTY Limited, and Authorize DVI, Inc. to Enter Into a Purchase Agreement with De Lage Lander PTY Limited and Perform Certain Obligations Therein Filed by DVI, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2003 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/28/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Notice # 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Certificate of Service) (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response to Debtors' Emergency Motion for Use of Cash Collateral (related document(s)5 ) Filed by USCC Florida Acquisition Corporation, USCC Acquisition Corp., FROG OnCURE Southside, L.L.C., Jaxpet/Positech, L.L.C., Pointe West Oncology, LLC, and USCC Healthcare Management Corp. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B-Part I3 Exhibit B-Part II4 Exhibit C5 Exhibit D6 Exhibit E) (Phillips, John) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 872 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Limited Objection to Emergency Motion for an Order (A) Approving Break-Up Fee, (B) Approving Sale of Certain Assets to SPG and (C) Authorizing the Debtors to Enter into a Servicing Agreement with Capital Crossing Bank to Service Certain Leases (related document(s) 807 ) Filed by Konica Medical Imaging, Inc. (Brown, Charles) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Appear pro hac vice of John P. McNicholas, Esq. Filed by HSBC Bank USA (Rosner, Frederick) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 871 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WITHDRAWN ON 9/28/04 see docket #2419 Motion to Compel --Motion of Premier Lease and Loan Services Agency, Inc. and Global Premier Finance Company to Compel Turnover of Property Insurance Premiums Filed by Premier Lease and Loan Services Agency, Inc. and Global Premier Finance Company Hearing scheduled for 1/7/2004 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 12/31/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Affidavit of Service) (Thompson, Christina) Modified on 9/30/2004 (ALC, ). (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Thomas R. Califano, Esq. Filed by HSBC Bank USA (Rosner, Frederick) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Complaint by The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of DVI, Inc., et al on behalf of DVI Inc. et al. against U.S. Bank National Association, f/k/a First Trust National Association as trustee, Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., Fairway Finance Corporation, Harris Nesbitt Corp. a/k/a BMO Nesbitt Curns Corp.. Receipt Number cc, Fee Amount $150 Nature of Suit: 434 (Injunctive Relief). (Bodnar, Joseph) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance and Demand for Service of Papers Filed by HSBC Bank USA (Rosner, Frederick) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 869 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection to Motion of the MRI Centers of New England, Inc. and Northwestern R.I. Imaging Center, LLC for Order Compelling the Debtor, DVI Financial Services, Inc., to Assume or Reject Certain Equipment Leases and Schedules and for Relief from the Automatic Stay (related document(s) 803 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Certificate of Service) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance Filed by Integral PET Associates, LLC, Integral Nuclear Associates, LLC, Nuclear Management, Inc., and thier affiliates (Bowden, William) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 868 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection to (Preliminary Opposition of Nomura Credit & Capital, Inc., XL Capital Assurance Inc., Harris Nesbitt Corp. and U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee, to the Emergency Motion of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Leave to Commence Adversary Proceeding on Behalf of the Debtors' Estates, and Request for an Order Authorizing Expedited Discovery and Setting an Evidentiary Hearing) (related document(s) 737 ) Filed by Nomura Credit & Captial, Inc. (Cobb, Richard) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance Filed by Intrepid USA, Inc. (Wilson, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service (related document(s) 807 ) Filed by United States Trustee (Schepacarter, Richard) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Authorize Motion of the Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 363 for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Employment of AP Services, LLC as Crisis Managers to the Debtors and Thereby Designate Mark Toney as Chief Executive Officer of the Debtors Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit C-Proposed Form of Order) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 866 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection to OBJECTION OF AD HOC SECURITIZATION HOLDERS COMMITTEE TO MOTION OF OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS FOR LEAVE TO COMMENCE ACTION ON BEHALF OF THE DEBTORS ESTATES AGAINST U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AND OTHER DEFENDANTS EFFECTIVE NUNC PRO TUNC TO NOVEMBER 4, 2003 (RELATED DOCUMENT 737) (related document(s) 737 ) Filed by Ad Hoc Securitization Holders' Committee (Whalen Jr., Thomas) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Appear pro hac vice Motion for an Order Granting Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Latham & Watkins LLP Filed by Bradford J. Sandler (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 865 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response to Motion of Western PA Surgery Center, Wexford Branch, LLC for an Order Granting Relief from the Automatic Stay to Terminate Agreement for "Cause" Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 362(d)(1) (related document(s) 776 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Certificate of Service) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application to Employ/Retain Debtors' Application for Order Authorizing the Retention of UBS Securities LLC as Financial Advisors to the Debtors Filed By DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order)(Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 864 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection to Motion for Leave to Commence Action on Behalf of the Debtors' Estates Against US Bank National Association and Other Defendants Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to November 4, 2003 (related document(s) 737 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Allow Debtors to Employ and Compensate Professionals in the Ordinary Course of Business Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 863 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joinder of U.S. Bank National Association, in its Individual Capacity, to the Objection of U.S. Bank National Association, as Securitization Trustee, to the Motion of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Leave to Commence Action (related docs. 737 , 858 ) Filed by U.S. Bank National Association (Mumford, Kerri) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Extend Time Motion of Debtors Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1007(c) for Entry of Order Granting Additional Time for Filing Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Statement of Financial Affairs, and Schedule of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to Motion of USCardiovascular Incorporated to Compel DVIFS to Assume or Reject Master Lease Agreement and Other Related Agreements With USCardiovascular Filed by US Bank Portfolio Services, a Division of Lyon Financial Services Inc. (Cornell, L.) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Appear pro hac vice Motion for an Order Granting Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Adelman Lavine Gold and Levin, A Professional Corporation Filed by Bradford J. Sandler (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 861 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection to Limited Objection of U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, To The Motion of The MRI Centers of New England, Inc. and Northwestern R.I. Imaging Center, LLC For Order Compelling The Debtor, DVI Financial Services, Inc. To Assume or Reject Certain Equipment Leases and Schedules and For Relief From The Automatic Stay (related document(s) 803 ) Filed by US Bank National Association (Schiltz, Todd) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application to Employ/Retain Debtors' Motion for Order Authorizing Retention of Bankruptcy Services LLC as Official Noticing, Claims and/or Solicitation and Balloting Agent Filed By DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order)(Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection to Limited Objection of U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, To The Motion For Approval of Procedures For Payoff Of, and Release of Obligations Under, Progress Payment Contracts (related document(s) 799 ) Filed by US Bank National Association (Schiltz, Todd) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Employ/Retain Application of the Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession Pursuant to Sections 327(A) and 330 of the United States Bankruptcy Code for Authorization to Employ and Retain Latham & Watkins LLP as Attorneys for the Debtors Filed By DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order)(Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection to Motion of USCardioVascular Incorporated For An Order To Compel DVIFS To Assume Or Reject Master Lease Agreement And Other Related Agreements With USCardioVascular (related document(s) 629 ) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Certificate of Service) (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Mail Notices Motion for Entry of Order Establishing Notice and Service Requirements Filed By DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order)(Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection to Objection of U.S. Bank National Association, as Securitization Trustee To The Motion of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors For Leave To Commence Action on Behalf of The Debtors' Estate Against U.S. Bank National Association and Other Defendants Effective Nunc Pro Tunc To November 4, 2003 (related document(s) 737 ) Filed by U.S. Bank National Association (Schiltz, Todd) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Approve Motion of Debtors for Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Chapter 11 Professionals and Committee Members Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit in Connection with Debtors' Motion to Allow Debtors to Employ and Compensate Professionals in the Ordinary Course of Business Filed by Grim, Biehn & Thatcher (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Pay Employee Wages Motion for Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 105(a) and 363(b) Authorizing (I) Payment of Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, Commissions, Vacation Pay and Employee Benefits, and (II) Reimbursement of Employee Business Expenses Filed By DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order)(Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Compensation (Second) (October 2003) Filed by Anderson Kill & Olick, PC Objections due by 12/15/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment October 2003 Invoices# 2 Declaration # 3 Service List) (Bodnar, Joseph) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Authorize Motion of Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession for an Order Authorizing Continuation of Intercompany Transactions and According Superpriority Status to All Postpetition Intercompany Claims Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response to Motion of USCardiovascular Incorporated to Compel DVIFS to Assume or Reject Master Lease Agreement and Other Related Agreements with USCardiovascular Filed by US Bank Portfolio Services, a Division of Lyon Financial Services Inc. (Cornell, L.) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (1) Prohibiting Utility Companies From Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services for Pre-Petition Invoices and (2) Establishing Procedures for Determining Requests for Additional Adequate Assurance Filed By DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A-Utility Companies2 Exhibit B-Bridge Order3 Exhibit C-Proposed Form of Order)(Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to the Motion of the MRI Centers of New England, Inc., and Northwestern R.I. Imaging Center, LLC, for an Order Compelling the Debtor, DVI Financial Services, Inc., to Assume or Reject Certain Equipment Leases and Schedules and For Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by US Bank Portfolio Services, a Division of Lyon Financial Services Inc. (Cornell, L.) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Authorize Debtors' Motion for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 105(a), 541 and 507(a)(8) Authorizing Debtors to Pay Pre-Petition Sales and Use Taxes and Franchise Taxes Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Proposed Form of Order) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 853 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection to -- Objection of Premier Lease and Loan Services Agency, Inc. and Global Premier Finance Company to Motion for an Order Approving Sale of Certain Assets of S.P.G. and Authorizing Debtors to Enter Into a Servicing Agreement (Re: D.I. 807) (related document(s) 807 ) Filed by Premier Lease and Loan Services Agency, Inc. and Global Premier Finance Company (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Thompson, Christina) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Authorize Motion of the Debtors for Authorization to Maintain Existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Proposed Form of Order) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection to to the Emergency Motion of the Debtors and Debtors-in-possession for an Order (A) Approving Break-up Fee, (B) Approving Sale of Certain Assets of SPG, a Branch of Debtor DVI Financial Services, Inc. Located in Illinois, to Capital Crossing Bank Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, Interests and Encumbrances, and (C) Authorizing the Debtors to Enter into a Servicing Agreement with Capital Crossing Bank to Service Certain Leases (Docket No. 807) (related document(s) 807 ) Filed by United States Trustee (Schepacarter, Richard) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Authorize Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing Continued Use of Cash Management System Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Compensation (October 2003) Filed by Houlihan Lokey Howard & Zukin Financial Advisors, Inc. Objections due by 12/10/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Bodnar, Joseph) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral Emergency Motion of Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral, (II) Providing Adequate Protection to Certain Prepetition Secured Creditors, (III) Authorizing the Debtors to Continue to Fund Loans to Existing Borrowers and Fund Needs of Special Purpose Vehicles, and (IV) Providing for Related Relief Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - Interim Order2 Exhibit 1 - Interim Cash Budget) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Appear pro hac vice Rachel L. Hollander, Esquire, Filed by US Bank Portfolio Services, a Division of Lyon Financial Services Inc. (Cornell, L.) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application to Employ Application Pursuant to Sections 327 and 328 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 2014 for an Order Authorizing Debtors and Debtors-In -Possession to Employ Adelman Lavine Gold and Levin, a Professional Corporation as Attorneys Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Appear pro hac vice Susan G. Rosenthal, Esquire, Filed by US Bank Portfolio Services, a Division of Lyon Financial Services Inc. (Cornell, L.) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Consolidated List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Filed by DVI, Inc. (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Appear pro hac vice Jay L. Gottleib Filed by US Bank Portfolio Services, a Division of Lyon Financial Services Inc. (Cornell, L.) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Joint Administration Motion for Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1015(b) Filed by DVI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 847 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Appear pro hac vice Anthony S. Traymore Filed by US Bank Portfolio Services, a Division of Lyon Financial Services Inc. (Cornell, L.) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition , Certification of Resolutions and List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims. Receipt Number 067971, Fee Amount $830. Filed by DVI, Inc.. (Sandler, Bradford) Modified on 8/26/2003 (BJM). (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 632 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?