Cheetah Omni LLC v. Verizon Communications, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:09-cv-00260
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 9:25 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Grande Communications Networks, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed & Scardino LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/01/2010 Jeff R Johnson +1 512 474 2449 +1 512 474 2622 jjohnson@reedscardino.com
Verizon Business Network Services Inc. Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clyde Moody Siebman +1 903 870 0070 +1 903 870 0066 siebman@siebman.com
Verizon Communications, Inc. Verizon Communications, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC"

Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL K. WEBB +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 dwebb@winston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr. +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 dougmcswane@potterminton.com
No Logo Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Counter-Claimant
Verizon Services Corporation Verizon Services Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clyde Moody Siebman +1 903 870 0070 +1 903 870 0066 siebman@siebman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Verizon Communications, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caren K Khoo +1 908 559 5668 +1 908 766 6974 caren.khoo@verizon.com
No Logo Cheetah Omni, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Brooks Kushman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John S LeRoy +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 jleroy@brookskushman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Lewry +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 tlewry@brookskushman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C.J. Tuttle +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 rtuttle@brookskushman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Kendall Law Group LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elton Joe Kendall +1 214 744 3000 +1 214 744 3015 administrator@kendalllawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Grande Communications Networks, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed & Scardino LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/01/2010 Jeff R Johnson +1 512 474 2449 +1 512 474 2622 jjohnson@reedscardino.com
No Logo Gaynell C Methvin, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gaynell C Methvin +1 214 978 4999 +1 214 978 4044 gcmethvin@gmail.com
No Logo Robert W Faulkner, Mediator

Represented by JAMS

Toggle Switch Represented by Jams Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert W Faulkner +1 214 744 5267 +1 214 720 6010 rfaulkner@jamsadr.com
No Logo Intellectual Ventures Managment, L.L.C., Intervenor
No Logo Intellectual Ventures, Inc., Intervenor
Officially listed as "Intellectual Ventures Managment, LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dan Duncan Davison +1 214 855 8000 +1 214 855 8200 dan.davison@nortonrosefulbright.com
No Logo RICHARD D. EGAN, Technical Advisor

Represented by O'Keefe, Egan & Peterman LLP

No Logo Tellabs, Inc., Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Alan Dodd +1 214 981 3481 mdodd@sidley.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (502) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT. Parties shall take nothing and all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. All claims and counterclaims in the instant suit are DISMISSED in their entirety, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/01/12. cc:attys 5-02-12(mll, ) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 501 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 500 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and defts Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., and Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/14/11. cc:attys 10-14-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejuddice With Respect to Verizon by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
        Exhibit List: Verizon's FINAL INEQUITALBLE CONDUCT EXHIBIT LIST (rlf, ) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
          Exhibit List: Defendant, Verizon's FINAL LIST of Exhibits admitted at trial 3.14.2011 - 3.18.2011. (rlf, ) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
            Exhibit List: Cheetah's FINAL EXHIBIT LIST of Exhibits Admitted at Trial 3.14.2011 - 3.18.2011. (rlf, ) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
              Exhibit Lists: Defendant, Verizon's, Exhibit Lists Admitted at Trial 3.14.2011 - 3.18.2011. Main Document: Defendant's Exhibit List 1Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Exhibit List 2, # 2 Defendant's Exhibit List 3, # 3 Defendant's Exhibit List 4, # 4 Defendant's Exhibit List 5, # 5 Defendant's Final List(rlf, ) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                Exhibit Lists: Plaintiff, Cheetah's, Exhibit Lists Admitted at Trial 3.14.2011 - 3.18.2011. Main Document: Plaintiff's Exhibit List 1Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 2, # 2 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 3, # 3 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 4, # 4 Plaintiff's Final List)(rlf, ) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of POST-TRIAL MOTIONS HEARING held on 6/8/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kimberly Julian, Sunbelt Reporting,Telephone number: (713) 667-0763. (120 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2011. (tja, ) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION Regarding Prejudgment Interest by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Prejudgment Interest Calculation)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
                      NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC of Filing of Plaintiff's Post-Trial Motions Presentation Slides (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Claim Construction Slides, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Permanent Injunction Slides, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Exceptional Case Slides)(Le Roy, John) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        6.8.2011 Minute Entry - Post Verdict Motion Hearing: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Post-Verdict Motion Hearing held on 6/8/2011. (Court Reporter Kimberly Julian.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                          NOTICE by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                            NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC (Second Notice of New Authority Relevant to Dkt. #461-Verizon's Amended Proposed Findings and Conclusions Regarding Inequitable Conduct) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sanford case)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 467 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Motion for Finding of Exceptional Case and for Partial Fees and Expenses. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/01/11. cc:attys 6-02-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
                                NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC re 461 Sealed Document, Notice of New Authority Relevant to Dkt. #461 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Decision dated 5/25/11)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 486 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc. to 464 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc. (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 485 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                    SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 463 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 484 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                      SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 465 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Finding of Exceptional Case filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 462 SEALED MOTION AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 466 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50 (B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 (A) SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50 (B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 (A) SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50 (B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 (A) SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50 (B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 (A) SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50 (B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 (A) SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50 (B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 (A) filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13 - Excerpt from 3/17/11 PM Trial Transcript, # 2 Exhibit 14 - Excerpt from Campbell 3/4/11 Dep. Transcript, # 3 Exhibit 15 - Excerpt from 3/15/11 AM Trial Transcript, # 4 Exhibit 16 - Excerpt from 3/18/11 AM Trial Transcript, # 5 Exhibit 17 - Verizon Written Submission, # 6 Exhibit 18 - Excerpt from 3/14/11 AM Trial Transcript, # 7 Exhibit 19 - Excerpt from 3/15/11 PM Trial Transcript)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 481 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                                            SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 468 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Finding of Exceptional Case filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13-'836 patent p 1, # 2 Exhibit 14-Illinois protective order, # 3 Exhibit 15-Blumenthal deposition excerpts, # 4 Exhibit 16-UNDER SEAL-Page 1 from DTX_057)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 463 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3-31411 afternoon tr-cheetahvverizon, # 2 Exhibit 4-31411 morning tr-cheetahvverizon, # 3 Exhibit 5-31811 session.ptx, # 4 Exhibit 6-Smith and Nephew Inc v Arthrex Inc, # 5 Exhibit 7-Smith and Nephew Inc v Arthrex Inc, # 6 Exhibit 8-PTX 053, # 7 Exhibit 9-PTX 054, # 8 Exhibit 10-PTX 055, # 9 Exhibit 11-PTX 056, # 10 Exhibit 12-PTX 057, # 11 Exhibit 13-PTX 059, # 12 Exhibit 14-PTX 060, # 13 Exhibit 15-PTX 061, # 14 Exhibit 16-31711 morning session - cheetahvverizon, # 15 Exhibit 17-31711 afternoon session - cheetahvverizon, # 16 Exhibit 18-31511 morning session - cheetahvverizon)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 479 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Cheetah Omni LLC to 464 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3-excerpts from Dep. of Brian Gaffney 11-11-10)(Halan, John) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 462 SEALED MOTION AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C - Declaration of Mohammed Islam)(Halan, John) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 477 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                    SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to [DKT 466] SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50 (B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 (A) filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 475 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall have from 5-10-2011 to 6-06-2011 to mediate this matter. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/10/11. cc:attys 5-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Mediate by Cheetah Omni LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 474 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                          SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 468 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Finding of Exceptional Case filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit ZAA, # 28 Exhibit ZBB, # 29 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Sealed Legal Document 473 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                            SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Cheetah Omni LLC to 464 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 472 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                              SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 463 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 471 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION (DKT 462 - SEALED MOTION AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST) filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ugone, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 466 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50 (B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 (A) SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50 (B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 (A) SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50 (B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 (A) SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50 (B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 (A) SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50 (B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 (A) SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50 (B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 (A) filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - USPN 7522836, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Claim Construction 9-9-10 hearing Excerpt, # 4 Exhibit 3 - 3-14-11 AM Transcript Excerpt, # 5 Exhibit 4 - 3-15-11 AM Transcript Excerpt, # 6 Exhibit 5 - 3-15-11 PM Transcript Excerpt, # 7 Exhibit 6 - 3-17-11 AM Transcript Excerpt, # 8 Exhibit 7 - 3-17-11 PM Transcript Excerpt, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Doc. Req. #1 to Verizon, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Email string between LeRoy and Mathas re inspection, # 11 Exhibit 10 - LeRoy Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 11 - 3-16-11 AM Transcript Excerpt, # 13 Exhibit 12 - DataTreasury Corp. v. Wells Fargo and Co.)(Le Roy, John) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER that parties attend mediation within three weeks from the date of this order. Both parties shall have representatives with settlement authority in attendance. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/19/11. cc:attys 4-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees and Finding of Exceptional Case by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Reedhycalog UK v. Diamond Innovations, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Comparison between 3rd and 4th Invalidity Contentions, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Comparison between 3rd and 5th Contentions, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Table of Contents & List of Exhibits from Smith Report, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Page 290 from Smith Report, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Table of Contents from Smith Supplemental Report, # 8 Exhibit 7 - email from LeRoy to opposing counsel, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of John LeRoy, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Email to LeRoy re DTX112A,, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Verizon Slide, # 12 Exhibit 11 - N.D. Illinois Protective Order, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Verizon Opening Slide 14, # 14 Exhibit 13 - Calient Email, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Email from Mathas to LeRoy re Closing Slides)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Motion for Finding of Exceptional Case and for Partial Fees and Expenses by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 466 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50 (B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 (A) by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16 part 1, # 17 Exhibit 16 part 2, # 18 Exhibit 16 part 3, # 19 Exhibit 16 part 4, # 20 Exhibit 16 part 5, # 21 Exhibit 16 part 6, # 22 Exhibit 16 part 7, # 23 Exhibit 16 part 8, # 24 Exhibit 17 part 1, # 25 Exhibit 17 part 2, # 26 Exhibit 17 part 3, # 27 Exhibit 17 part 4, # 28 Exhibit 17 part 5, # 29 Exhibit 17 part 6, # 30 Exhibit 17 part 7, # 31 Exhibit 17 part 8, # 32 Exhibit 17 part 9, # 33 Exhibit 17 part 10, # 34 Exhibit 17 part 11, # 35 Exhibit 17 part 12, # 36 Exhibit 17 part 13, # 37 Exhibit 17 part 14, # 38 Exhibit 17 part 15, # 39 Exhibit 18, # 40 Exhibit 19, # 41 Exhibit 20, # 42 Exhibit 21, # 43 Exhibit 22, # 44 Exhibit 23, # 45 Exhibit 24, # 46 Exhibit 25, # 47 Exhibit 26, # 48 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees and Finding of Exceptional Case by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Reedhycalog UK v. Diamond Innovations, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Comparison between 3rd and 4th Invalidity Contentions, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Comparison between 3rd and 5th Contentions, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Table of Contents & List of Exhibits from Smith Report, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Page 290 from Smith Report, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Table of Contents from Smith Supplemental Report, # 8 Exhibit 7 - email from LeRoy to opposing counsel, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of John LeRoy, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Email to LeRoy re DTX112A, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Verizon Slide, # 12 Exhibit 11 - N.D. Illinois Protective Order, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Verizon Opening Slide 14, # 14 Exhibit 13 - Calient Email, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Email from Mathas to LeRoy re Closing Slides)(Le Roy, John) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Proposed Findings of Fact by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from 3-18-11 Trial Transcript, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts from Gaffney Deposition Transcript)(Halan, John) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-FTC Report, # 2 Exhibit 2-trial transcript excerpts 3-14-11)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 462 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  SEALED MOTION AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - Prejudgment Interest Calculation Statutory Rate (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 3 Exhibit B - Prejudgment Interest Calculation - Prime Rate (FILED UNDER SEAL))(Halan, John) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 461 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    Sealed Document. Verizon's Amended Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Regarding Its Inequitable Conduct Defenses and Counterclaims. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER denying as moot 175 Sealed Patent Motion to Strike and Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Rodney L Crawford. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/31/11. cc:attys 3-31-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER denying 431 Motion to Instruct on Verizon's Claim Constructions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/30/11. cc:attys 3-31-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Voir Dire Proceedings held on 3/7/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov, 85 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 3/18/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov, 189 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Afternoon Session Proceedings held on 3/17/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov, 275 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Morning Session Proceedings held on 3/17/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov, 135 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 454 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Sealed Transcript No. 2, 3/16/11. (sms, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 453 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Sealed Transcript. 3/16/11 Afternoon Session. (sms, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Afternoon Session Proceedings held on 3/16/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov, 190 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Morning Session Proceedings held on 3/16/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov, 123 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Afternoon Session Proceedings held on 3/15/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 169 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Morning Session Proceedings held on 3/15/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger. shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov, 150 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Afternoon Session Proceedings held on 3/14/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov, 152 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Morning Session Proceedings held on 3/14/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan/Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 150 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 446 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. SEALED Jury Questionnaires 1-8 (Attachments: # 1 Jury Questionnaires 9-17, # 2 Jury Questionnaires 18-25)(rlf, ) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER that all post-verdict motions be filed by 4-15-2011. The Court sets all post-verdict motions for Hearing on 6/8/2011 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-23-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 417 Sealed Motion for Reconsideration, and overruling 405 Order of the US Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 418 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 419 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER adopting 372 and 390 Orders of the US Magistrate Judge; overruling objections, and denying 396 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 401 Sealed Patent Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER adopting 407 Order of the US Magistrate Judge, and denying 412 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 440 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Sealed Document. JURY VERDICT (INCLUDES THE JURY FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE). (rlf, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 439 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                JURY VERDICT. (rlf, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 438 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  SEALED Jury Notes. (rlf, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Jury Instructions. (rlf, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      3.18.11 Minute Entry - Jury Trial - Day 5: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial completed on 3/18/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        3.17.11 Minute Entry - Jury Trial - Day 4: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 3/17/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        3.16.11 Minute Entry - Jury Trial - Day 3: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 3/16/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        3.15.11 Minute Entry - Jury Trial - Day 2: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 3/15/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        3.14.11 Minute Entry - Jury Trial - Day 1: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 3/14/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Opposed MOTION to Instruct on Verizon's Claim Constructions by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part 426 Sealed Motion for Sanctions and a Jury Instruction. GRANTED to the extent that the motion is consistent with the Court's ruling from the bench precluding any further testimony or argument regarding the 88-channel LC-based ROADM and instructing the jury to disregard the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/18/11. cc:attys 3-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION to Instruct on Verizon's Claim Constructions by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) Modified on 3/18/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 428 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 426 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions and Jury Instruction... filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 427 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE by Cheetah Omni LLC to 425 Sealed Patent Motion, filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Verizon 30(b)(6) Dep Notice, # 2 Exhibit B - CONFIDENTIAL - Wellbrock Dep. Trans. excerpt, # 3 Exhibit C - CONFIDENTIAL - Verizon Suppl. Response Interr. No. 9, # 4 Exhibit D - 3-15-11 Trial Trans. excerpt)(Lewry, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2011: # 5 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 426 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION for Sanctions and Jury Instruction by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CONFIDENTIAL - Wellbrock Dep. Trans. excerpt, # 2 Exhibit 2 - CONFIDENTIAL - Suppl. Interrog. Answer to No. 9, # 3 Exhibit 3 - CONFIDENTIAL - Suppl. Interrog. Answer to No. 12, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Crawford Dep. Trans. excerpt, # 5 Exhibit 5 - CoAdna Webpage, # 6 Exhibit 6 - CoAdna Press Release, # 7 Exhibit 7 - 3-15-11 AM Trial Tr. excerpt)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 425 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT MOTION (Verizon's Bench Brief Regarding the Availability of 88 Channel LC-Based Roadms) by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      HOTLINE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 03/15/11. cc:attys 3-16-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 405 Order, (Verizon's Opposition to Cheetah's Motion for Reconsideration of Order allowing Verizon to Pursue Defenses Under 35 USC 102(g) by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 398 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/14/11. cc:attys 3-14-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 421 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CONFIDENTIAL - Smith Report Excerpt, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Gaffney Transcript excerpt, # 3 Exhibit 3 - CONFIDENTIAL - Mossinghoff Amended Report excerpt, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Mossinghoff Transcript excerpt)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Findings of Fact by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 3/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of an Irrelevant Patent License and Verizon's Fios Revenues by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 03/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 3/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike and Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Rodney L. Crawford by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 03/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 417 Filed: 3/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION for Reconsideration and Objections to Magistrate's 3-9-11 Order Allowing Verizon to Pursue a Defense Under 35 USC 102(g) by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Verizon's 6th Suppl. Invalidity Contentions, # 3 Exhibit 2 - CONFIDENTIAL - Fabiny transcript excerpt, # 4 Exhibit 3 - CONFIDENTIAL - Blumenthal transcript excerpt)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 03/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Support re 398 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order Tellabs Identification of Trial Sensitive Information filed by Tellabs, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Dodd, Mark) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Jury Instructions by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Le Roy, John) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Le Roy, John) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Pretrial Witness Disclosures Witness List by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Molster, Charles) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration and Objections to Magistrate's March 9, 2011 Order Denying Verizon's Motion to Determine the Date of the Hypothetical Negotiation by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/10/11. cc:attys 3-10-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  3.7.11 Minute Entry - Jury Selection: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Selection held on 3/7/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Support re 398 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order - Stipulation by Verizon and Tellabs filed by Tellabs, Inc.. (Dodd, Mark) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 279 Motion in Limine 1: Verizon Should Not be Allowed to Offer Testimony, Evidence or Argument about Prior Art Other Than the Eight Trial Documents Listed at the 1-07-2011 Hearing; denying 376 Sealed Motion to Strike Verizon's Notice of Obviousness Combinations and To Enforce Verizon's 1-07-2011 and 2-17-2011 Stipulations Regarding Identification of Three Specific Obviousness Combinations. The Court will allow Verizon to present evidence regarding the Calient Diamondwave Switch and the Network Photonics product and/or system. The Court orders Verizon to make a relevant witness regarding each of these products available immediately and Cheetah is granted leave to conduct a two-hour deposition of each witness. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-09-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 394 Motion to Determine Date of the Hypothetical Negotiation. The Court finds that the required date of the hypothetical negotiation is just before the date of the issuance of the patent-in-suit, here 4-21-2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-09-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 164 Sealed Patent Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gerald J Mossinghoff; denying 166 Sealed Patent Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony on Infringement from Verizon's Expert Anthony Acampora; denying 171 Sealed Patent Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony on Obviousness, Indefiniteness and Enablement from Verizon's Expert David Smith. All motions are DENIED, with the caveat that Verizon's expert Gerald J Mossinghoff may only testify as to USPTO policy, practice and procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-09-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part 279 SEALED MOTION In Limine Nos. 1-4. Verizon may pursue its defense under 35 USC 102(g), but is precluded from presenting evidence in support of a defense under 35 USC 102(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-09-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that Verizon file a response to 398 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Tellabs, Inc.; Response due 3-10-2011 at 5:00 p.m. CST. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-09-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Verizon's Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Magistrate's February 22, 2011 Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation of Supplemental Authority in Support of Verizon's Motion to Determine the Date of the Hypothetical Negotiations (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 401 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT MOTION for Reconsideration and Objections to the Magistrate Judge's March 2, 2011 Report and Recommendation Denying Verizon's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Final Pretrial Conference held on 3/7/2011. (Court Reporter Christy Humphries.) (Attachments: (1) Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, ) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part 314 Sealed Patent Motion to Strike and Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Rodney L Crawford. The Court also grants Cheetah leave to file a supplemental report in light of this Order by 3-10-2011 at noon. Verizon is also granted leave to file a supplemental rebuttal report by 3-12-2011 noon. Cheetah is further ordered to provide Mr. Crawford for one-hour of additional deposition testimony after Cheetah files its supplemental report. Mr. Crawford's previous reports may not be used at trial unless the party seeking such use first approaches the bench to obtain permission. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/08/11. cc:attys 3-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Tellabs, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Illinois Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit Trial Exhibit List, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Dodd, Mark) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that parties meet and confer and file Joint Proposed Final Jury Instructions and a Joint Proposed Verdict Form by 3-10-2011; Jury instructions and verdict form due by 3/10/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/07/11. cc:attys 3-07-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 3/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration and Objections to Magistrate's February 22, 2011 Order by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 03/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AGREED ORDER granting 374 Sealed Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/04/11. cc:attys 3-04-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed MOTION to Determine the Date of the Hypthetical Negotiation by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC of Filing of Unopposed Amended Joint Juror Questionnaire (Attachments: # 1 Unopposed Amended Joint Juror Questionnaire)(Le Roy, John) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 376 SEALED MOTION to Strike Verizon's Notice of Obviousness Combinations and to Enforce Verizon's January 7 & February 17, 2011 Stipulations filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5 - Emails between counsel, 3-2-11, # 2 Exhibit 6 - Memorandum Opinion And Order)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC Of Agenda For March 7, 2011 Conference (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 167 Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement, be denied; 169 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Invalidity Issues of Anticipation, Obviousness, Indefiniteness and Enablement with Respect to Claim 9 and 11-14, be denied; 173 Motion for Summary Judgment on Verizon's Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven, be denied; and that 120 Motion to Dismiss or in the alternative, For Judgment on the Pleadings on Verizon defts' Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven, be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/02/11. cc:attys 3-03-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER approving the Unopposed Amended Joint Juror Questionnaire. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/02/11. cc:attys 3-03-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order by Cheetah Omni LLC, Intellectual Ventures Managment, L.L.C., Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 376 SEALED MOTION to Strike Verizon's Notice of Obviousness Combinations and to Enforce Verizon's January 7 & February 17, 2011 Stipulations filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation of Intent to Use Confidential Information of Third Parties (FILED JOINTLY) (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting trial times for all parties and issues. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/01/11. cc:attys 3-02-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 290 Motion to Seal Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/01/11. cc:attys 3-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC of Filing of Unopposed AMENDED Joint Juror Questionnaire (Le Roy, John) Modified on 3/2/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Pretrial Conference held on 2/17/2011. (Court Reporter Carla Sims.) (mjm, ) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC of filing of Joint Juror Questionnaire (Le Roy, John) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that to the extent any pretrial issues remain, the parties are to file an agenda with the Court by 3-03-2011. All items on the agenda will be heard at a second pretrial hearing; set Pretrial Hearing for 3/7/2011 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Verizon shall file a response re 376 SEALED MOTION to Strike Verizon's Notice of Obviousness Combinations and to Enforce Verizon's January 7 & February 17, 2011 Stipulations by 3-02-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/25/11. cc:attys 2-25-11(mll, ) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 379 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 364 Motion for Entry of an Order Regarding Use of Confidential Information at Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/25/11. cc:attys 2-25-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that pltf file a response to Intellectual Ventures Management's 374 Motion for Protective Order, by 2-28-2011, noon CST. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/24/11. cc:attys 2-24-11(mll, ) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 374 Opposed SEALED MOTION Third Party Intellectual Ventures Management Motion for Protective Order to Safegaurd Its Trade Secrets and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Verizon / Intellectual Ventures article, # 3 Exhibit 2- Verizon counterclaim Against TiVo, # 4 Exhibit 3 - USPN 5,401,344)(Lewry, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2011: # 5 Exhibit 3 Searchable) (mjc, ). (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 376 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION to Strike Verizon's Notice of Obviousness Combinations and to Enforce Verizon's January 7 & February 17, 2011 Stipulations by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - CONFIDENTIAL - Expert Report of David Smith, # 3 Exhibit 2 - List of Obviousness References Identified by Verizon, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Starry Starry Night webpage from Boston.com, # 5 Exhibit 4 - 1/7/11 Hearing Trasncripts Excerpt)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dan Duncan Davison on behalf of Intellectual Ventures Managment, L.L.C. (Davison, Dan) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposed SEALED MOTION Third Party Intellectual Ventures Management Motion for Protective Order to Safegaurd Its Trade Secrets and Brief in Support Thereof by Intellectual Ventures Managment, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Davison, Dan) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FOR 'IN CAMERA' INSPECTION (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER deferring in part, granting in part and denying in part 279 Sealed Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 281 Sealed Motion in Limine; granting 283 Motion in Limine; granting 285 Motion in Limine; denying 288 Sealed Patent Motion in Limine; granting 289 Sealed Motion in Limine; denying 292 Sealed Patent Motion in Limine; deferring in part and granting in part 293 Sealed Motion in Limine; denying 295 Sealed Patent Motion in Limine; denying 297 Sealed Patent Motion in Limine; denying 299 Sealed Motion in Limine; denying 301 Sealed Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/22/11. cc:attys 2-22-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation (Notice of Verizon's Obviousness Combinations) (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 370 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1-excerpts of Crawford 2d Supp. Expert Rpt, # 3 Exhibit 2-Ex.G to Crawford 2d Supp. Expert Rpt, # 4 Exhibit 3-Ex.F to Crawford 2d Supp. Expert Rpt, # 5 Exhibit 4-Ex.I to Crawford 2d Supp. Expert Rpt, # 6 Exhibit 5-excerpts from 1st Crawford Dep. Tr., # 7 Exhibit 6-excerpts from 2d Crawford Dep. Tr., # 8 Exhibit 7-excerpts from Campbell Supp. Expert Rpt, # 9 Exhibit 8-Infosint v. H. Lundbeck)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC Estimates of Time for Trial (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation of Estimated Trial Time (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TO Document # 318 , Plaintiff's Reply in Support. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TO Documents # 279 , 281 Sealed Motions in Limine, AND CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE TO 279 , 281 amd 283 Motions in Limine. PLEASE NOTE.*** (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal)(mjc, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/11/11. cc:attys 2-11-11(mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Entry of an Order Regarding Use of Confidential Information at Trial by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Cheetah's Proposed Order Language, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Verizon's Proposed Order Language)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 341 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/11/11. cc:attys 2-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 338 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/11/11. cc:attys 2-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 337 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/11/11. cc:attys 2-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 334 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/11/11. cc:attys 2-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 333 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/11/11. cc:attys 2-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 330 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/11/11. cc:attys 2-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 328 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/11/11. cc:attys 2-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 327 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/11/11. cc:attys 2-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 325 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/11/11. cc:attys 2-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 323 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/11/11. cc:attys 2-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 321 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/11/11. cc:attys 2-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 319 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/11/11. cc:attys 2-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 277 Motion to Compel Patent License Agreement Documents and Correspondence with Trial Witnesses. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/11/11. cc:attys 2-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 216 Proposed Pretrial Order, (Verizon's objections to Cheetah's Exhibit List) by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 349 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 281 SEALED MOTION In Limine No. 6 filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 281 SEALED MOTION In Limine Nos. 5-8 (VERIZONS OPPOSITION TO CHEETAHS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY FROM DRS. YOO AND BLUMENTHAL) filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                VERIZON'S SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to CHEETAH'S SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE #8 DKT281 (Verizon's Opposition to Cheetah's Motion in Limine to exclude testimony, argument, and evidence referring to inventor Islam or his company as a "patent troll" or similar characterization) filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 283 MOTION in Limine Nos. 9-10 (Verizon's Opposition to Cheetah's Motion in Limine No. 10 to Exclude testimony, evidence, or argument regarding Verizon's equitable Defenses in front of the jury) filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 345 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 279 SEALED MOTION In Limine Nos. 1-4 filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 344 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 281 SEALED MOTION In Limine No. 5 filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 283 MOTION in Limine Nos. 9-10 (Verizon's Opposition to Cheetah's Motion in Limine No. 9 to Exclude testimony, argument, or evidence pertaining to the timing of document production) filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 342 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 293 Opposed SEALED MOTION In Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Certain Irrelevant Patent Licenses, Certain Unsupported Cost Savings, And Verizon's FIOS And Overall Revenues filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CONFIDENTIAL Excerpt from Islam 5-26-10 Dep. Trans., # 2 Exhibit 2 - CONFIDENTIAL Excerpt from Islam 11-11-10 Dep. Trans., # 3 Exhibit 3 - CONFIDENTIAL Excerpt from Wellbrock Dep. Trans., # 4 Exhibit 4 - CONFIDENTIAL Excerpt from Templeton Dep. Trans., # 5 Exhibit 5 - Infosint v. Lundbeck, # 6 Exhibit 6 - CONFIDENTIAL excerpt from Crawford 2d Supplemental Expert Report)(Le Roy, John) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed SEALED MOTION Requesting to Seal Opposition to Verizon's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Certain Irrelevant Patent Licenses etc. and Exhibits by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 CONFIDENTIAL Opposition to Verizon's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Certain Irrelevant Patent Licenses etc., # 3 Exhibit 1 - CONFIDENTIAL Excerpt from Islam Dep. Trans., # 4 Exhibit 2 - CONFIDENTIAL Excerpt from Islam 30b6 Dep. Trans., # 5 Exhibit 3 - CONFIDENTIAL Excerpt from Wellbrock Dep. Trans., # 6 Exhibit 4 - CONFIDENTIAL Excerpt from Templeton Dep. Trans., # 7 Exhibit 6 - CONFIDENTIAL Excerpt from Crawford 2d Supplemental Expert Report)(Le Roy, John) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 340 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 285 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Willful Infringement Including any Imputation to Verizon of any Information its vendors or their suppliers had about Dr. Islam or his patents filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Verizon's Trial Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 2-excerpts from Ugone Supp. Rebuttal Expert Rpt)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 339 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 299 Opposed SEALED MOTION In Limine To Exclude Evidence Related To Secondary Considerations Including Evidence Of The Commercial Success Of Verizon's Accused System filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - ABC Beverage v. United States, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Pendergest-Holt v. Certain Underwriters, # 3 Exhibit 3 - CONFIDENTIAL Excerpt from Crawford 2nd Supplemental Expert Report)(Le Roy, John) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed SEALED MOTION to File Cheetah's Opp. to Verizon's Mtn In Limine to Exclude Evidence of Willful Infringement Including Any Imputation to Verizon of Any Information its Vendors or Suppliers Had About Dr. Islam or His Patents, and Ex. 2, Under Seal by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Cheetah's Opp to Verizon's Mtn In Limine to Exclude Evidence of Willful Infringement Including Any Imputation to Verizon of Any Information its Vendors or Suppliers Had About Dr. Islam or His Patents, # 3 Exhibit 2-excerpts from Ugone Supp. Rebuttal Expert Rpt)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed SEALED MOTION Requesting to Seal Opposition to Verizon's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to Secondary Considerations by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 CONFIDENTIAL Opposition to Verizon's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to Secondary Considerations, # 3 Exhibit 3 - CONFIDENTIAL Excerpt from Crawford 2d Supplemental Expert Report)(Le Roy, John) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 336 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 295 SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine to Restrict Evidence of a Reasonable Royalty to Evidence Showing the Claimed Technology's Value to Verizon over the Available non-infringing alternative filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-excerpts from Crawford 2d Supp. Expert Rpt)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 335 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 297 SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine to Limit Reasonable Royalty Evidence to a Hypothetical Negotiation Occurring before Verizon began the activity later alleged to Infringe filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - ABC Beverage v. United States, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Pendergest-Holt v. Certain Underwriters)(Le Roy, John) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed SEALED MOTION to File Cheetah's Opposition to Verizon's Motion In Limine to Restrict Evidence of a Reasonable Royalty to Evidence Showing The Claimed Technology's Value to Verizon Over The Available Non-Infringing Alternative (with Ex. 1 attached thereto) Under Seal by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Cheetah's Opposition to Verizon's Motion In Limine to Restrict Evidence of a Reasonable Royalty to Evidence Showing The Claimed Technology's Value to Verizon Over The Available Non-Infringing Alternative, # 3 Exhibit 1-excerpts from Crawford 2d Supp. Expert Rpt)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed SEALED MOTION Requesting to Seal Opposition to Verizon's Motion in Limine to Limit Reasonable Royalty Evidence to a Hypothetical Negotiation Occurring Before Verizon Began the Activity Later Alleged to Infringe by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 CONFIDENTIAL Opposition to Verizon's Motion in Limine to Limit Reasonable Royalty Evidence to a Hypothetical Negotiation Occurring Before Verizon Began the Activity Later Alleged to Infringe)(Le Roy, John) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 332 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 288 SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Prejudicial and Confusing Documents on Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 331 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 301 Opposed SEALED MOTION In Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Equipment And/Or Features Not Deployed In The Accused System filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CONFIDENTIAL Excerpt from Wellbrock Dep. Trans., # 2 Exhibit B - CONFIDENTIAL Tellabs RFQ Response, # 3 Exhibit C - CONFIDENTIAL Excerpt from Boduch Dep. Trans., # 4 Exhibit D - CONFIDENTIAL Finisar Document)(Le Roy, John) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Cheetah's Opposition to Verizon's Motion In Limine to Exclude Certain Prejudicial And Confusing Documents on Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List Under Seal by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Cheetah's Opposition to Verizon's Motion In Limine to Exclude Certain Prejudicial And Confusing Documents on Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 329 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 289 Opposed SEALED MOTION In Limine To Exclude Evidence Of An "Implied Royalty Rate" For The Cheetah-Grande License filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed SEALED MOTION Requesting to Seal Opposition to Verizon's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Equipment and/or Features Not Deployed in Accused System and Exhibits by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Opposition to Verizon's Motion In Limine to Exclude Evidence of Equipment and/or Features Not Deployed in the Accused System, # 3 Exhibit A - CONFIDENTIAL Excerpt from Wellbrock Dep. Trans., # 4 Exhibit B - CONFIDENTIAL Tellabs RFQ Response, # 5 Exhibit C - CONFIDENTIAL Excerpt from Boduch Dep. Trans., # 6 Exhibit D - CONFIDENTIAL Finisar Document)(Le Roy, John) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Cheetah's Opposition to Verizon's Motion In Limine to Exclude Evidence of an "Implied Royalty Rate" From The Cheetah-Grande License Under Seal by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Cheetah's Opposition to Verizon's Motion In Limine to Exclude Evidence of an "Implied Royalty Rate" From The Cheetah-Grande License)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 326 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 292 SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine to Preclude Dr. Larry Campbell from Testifying Beyond his expert report filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - ABC Beverage v. United States, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Pendergest-Holt v. Certain Underwriters, # 3 Exhibit 3 - CONFIDENTIAL Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Larry Campbell, # 4 Exhibit 4 - CONFIDENTIAL Excerpt from Campbell Dep. Trans.)(Le Roy, John) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed SEALED MOTION Requesting to Seal Opposition to Verizon's Motion In Limine re Dr. Larry Campbell and Certain Exhibits by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Opposition to Verizon's Motion In Limine to Preclude Dr. Larry Campbell from Testifying Beyond His Expert Report, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Larry Campbell, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt from Campbell Dep. Trans.)(Le Roy, John) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 295 SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine to Restrict Evidence of a Reasonable Royalty to Evidence Showing the Claimed Technology's Value to Verizon over the Available non-infringing alternative filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-excerpts from Crawford 2d Suppl. Expert Rpt.)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Cheetah's Opposition to Verizon's Motion In Limine to Restrict Evidence of a Reasonable Royalty to Evidence Showing The Claimed Technology's Value to Verizon Over The Available Non-Infringing Alternative (and Ex. 1 attached thereto) by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Cheetah's Opposition to Verizon's Motion In Limine to Restrict Evidence of a Reasonable Royalty to Evidence Showing The Claimed Technology's Value to Verizon Over The Available Non-Infringing Alternative)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 288 SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Prejudicial and Confusing Documents on Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Cheetah's Opposition to Verizon's Motion In Limine to Exclude Certain Prejudicial And Confusing Documents on Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Cheetah's Opposition to Verizon's Motion In Limine to Exclude Certain Prejudicial And Confusing Documents on Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 289 Opposed SEALED MOTION In Limine To Exclude Evidence Of An "Implied Royalty Rate" For The Cheetah-Grande License filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Cheetah's Opposition to Verizon's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of an "Implied Royalty Rate" From the Cheetah-Grande License Under Seal by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Cheetah's Opposition to Verizon's Motion In Limine To Exclude Evidence Of An "Implied Royalty Rate" From TheCheetah-Grande License)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 318 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 277 MOTION to Compel (1) Patent License Agreement Doucments and (2) Correspondence with Trial Witnesses, and Proposed Accelerated Briefing and Hearing Schedule MOTION to Compel (1) Patent License Agreement Doucments and (2) Correspondence with Trial Witnesses, and Proposed Accelerated Briefing and Hearing Schedule MOTION to Compel (1) Patent License Agreement Doucments and (2) Correspondence with Trial Witnesses, and Proposed Accelerated Briefing and Hearing Schedule MOTION to Compel (1) Patent License Agreement Doucments and (2) Correspondence with Trial Witnesses, and Proposed Accelerated Briefing and Hearing Schedule filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Intellectual Ventures website page)(Le Roy, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2011: # 2 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal) (mjc, ). (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 315 Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule For Verizon's Renewed Motion to Strike and Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Rodney L. Crawford. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/9/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 313 Motion to Seal Verizon's Renewed Motion to Strike and Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Rodney L. Crawford. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/9/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Verizon's Renewed Motion to Strike and Exclude the expert report and testimony of Rodney L. Crawford by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 314 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT MOTION (Verizon's Renewed Motion to Strike adn Exclude the expert report and testimony of Rodney L. Crawford by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Seal Verizon's Renewed Motion to Strike and Exclude the Expert Report and testimony of Rodney L. Crawford by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 300 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/08/11. cc:attys 2-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 298 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/08/11. cc:attys 2-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 296 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/08/11. cc:attys 2-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 294 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/08/11. cc:attys 2-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 291 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/08/11. cc:attys 2-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 287 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/08/11. cc:attys 2-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 286 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/08/11. cc:attys 2-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 282 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/08/11. cc:attys 2-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 280 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/08/11. cc:attys 2-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 275 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/08/11. cc:attys 2-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 273 Motion to Seal. Verizon can file its Opposition to pltf's Motion to Compel Patent License Agreement Documents and Correspondence with Trial Witnesses under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/07/11. cc:attys 2-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed SEALED MOTION In Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Equipment And/Or Features Not Deployed In The Accused System by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Siebman, Clyde) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2011: # 13 AuthorizationToSeal) (kls, ). (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Seal Motion In Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Equipment And/Or Features Not Deployed In The Accused System by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed SEALED MOTION In Limine To Exclude Evidence Related To Secondary Considerations Including Evidence Of The Commercial Success Of Verizon's Accused System by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Siebman, Clyde) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2011: # 4 AuthorizationToSeal) (kls, ). (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Seal Motion In Limine To Exclude Evidence Related To Secondary Considerations Including Evidence Of The Commercial Success Of Verizon's Accused System by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 297 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine to Limit Reasonable Royalty Evidence to a Hypothetical Negotiation Occurring before Verizon began the activity later alleged to Infringe by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Seal Verizon's MIL to Limit reasonable royalty evidence to a Hypothetical Negotiation Occurring before Verizon began the activity later alleged to infringe by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 295 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine to Restrict Evidence of a Reasonable Royalty to Evidence Showing the Claimed Technology's Value to Verizon over the Available non-infringing alternative by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Seal VZ's MIL to restrict evidence of a reasonable royalty evidence showing the claimed technologies value to Verizon's over the available non-infringing alternative by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed SEALED MOTION In Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Certain Irrelevant Patent Licenses, Certain Unsupported Cost Savings, And Verizon's FIOS And Overall Revenues by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Siebman, Clyde) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2011: # 9 AuthorizationToSeal) (kls, ). (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 292 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine to Preclude Dr. Larry Campbell from Testifying Beyond his expert report by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Seal Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Of Certain Irrelevant Patent Licenses, Certain Unsupported Cost Savings, And Verizon's FIOS And Overall Revenues by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Seal Verizon's Motion in Limine to Preclude Dr. Larry Campbell from Testifying beyond his expert report by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposed SEALED MOTION In Limine To Exclude Evidence Of An "Implied Royalty Rate" For The Cheetah-Grande License by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Siebman, Clyde) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2011: # 7 AuthorizationToSeal) (kls, ). (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 288 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Prejudicial and Confusing Documents on Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Seal Motion in Limine by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Seal Verizon's Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Prejudicial and Confusing Documents on Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Willful Infringement Including any Imputation to Verizon of any Information its vendors or their suppliers had about Dr. Islam or his patents by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Exhibit List (Verizons' Objections to Plaintiff's Exhibit List) by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation.. (McSwane, Douglas) Modified on 2/10/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine Nos. 9-10 by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2011: # 2 Certificate of Conference) (mjc, ). (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 282 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION For Filing Under Seal (Motions In Limine Nos. 5-8, Dkt. 281) by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1-excerpts from Crawford expert rpt, # 3 Exhibit 2-excerpts from Crawford suppl. expert rpt, # 4 Exhibit 4-excerpts from Crawford 2d suppl. expert rpt, # 5 Exhibit 6-excerpt from Ugone suppl. rebuttal expert rpt, # 6 Exhibit 7-excerpts from Islam deposition tr, # 7 Exhibit 10-excerpts from Smith expert rpt)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 281 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION In Limine Nos. 5-8 by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1-excerpts from Crawford expert rpt, # 3 Exhibit 2-excerpts from Crawford suppl. expert rpt, # 4 Exhibit 3-Uniloc USA v. Microsoft Corp., # 5 Exhibit 4-excerpts from Crawford 2d suppl. expert rpt, # 6 Exhibit 5-excerpts from 1/7/11 motion hgr tr, # 7 Exhibit 6-excerpts from Ugone suppl. rebuttal expert rpt, # 8 Exhibit 7-excerpts from Islam deposition tr, # 9 Exhibit 8-excerpts from Yoo deposition tr, # 10 Exhibit 9-excerpts from Blumenthal deposition tr, # 11 Exhibit 10-excerpts from Smith expert rpt)(Lewry, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2011: # 12 Certificate of Conference, # 13 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal) (mjc, ). (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 280 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION For Filing Under Seal (Motions In Limine Nos. 1-4, Dkt. 279) by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2-excerpts of Smith 2d suppl. rpt)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 279 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION In Limine Nos. 1-4 by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1-1/7/11 Hrg. Tr., # 3 Exhibit 2-excerpts from Smith 2nd suppl. rpt)(Lewry, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2011: # 4 Certificate of Conference, # 5 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal) (mjc, ). (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List Cheetah's Objections to Verizon's Trial Exhibits by Cheetah Omni LLC.. (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***REPLACES DOCUMENT 265 *** MOTION to Compel (1) Patent License Agreement Doucments and (2) Correspondence with Trial Witnesses, and Proposed Accelerated Briefing and Hearing Schedule by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 10/7/09 letter from LeRoy to Molster, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 12/10/09 letter from Blacha to LeRoy, # 3 Exhibit 3 - page from Verizon 10-K Annual Report, # 4 Exhibit 4 - email from Halan to Verizon counsel, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt from Yoo deposition, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpt from Blumenthal deposition, # 7 Exhibit 7 - email from Lewry to Verizon counsel, # 8 Exhibit 8 - 4/29/10 Yoo email re claim chart with 11 redacted attachments, # 9 Exhibit 9 - 10/21/10 letter from Cacovean to Blacha, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Blum v. Spectrum Restaurant Group, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Verizon revised supplemental privilege log, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas) Modified on 2/7/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***DISREGARD ENTRY - DOCKETED INCORRECTLY BY ATTORNEY*** Joint MOTION for Protective Order Governing Confidential Information at Trial by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Lewry, Thomas) Modified on 2/7/2011 (kls, ). (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Cheetah Omni LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Verizon's proposed order, # 2 Exhibit B - Cheetah's proposed order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 274 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT (DKT 265) MOTION to Compel (1) Patent License Agreement Doucments and (2) Correspondence with Trial Witnesses, and Proposed Accelerated Briefing and Hearing Schedule> filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Seal Verizon's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Patent License Agreement Documents and Correspondence with trial witnesses by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation of objections and counter designations to Cheetah's Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC of Service of Plaintiff's Objections to Verizon's Counter-Designations (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 259 Motion to Seal. Verizon can file its Surreply to Cheetah Omni LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/25/11. cc:attys 1-26-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 257 Motion to Seal. Verizon can file its Surreply in Opposition to Cheetah Omni LLC's Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/25/11. cc:attys 1-26-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 1/25/2011. (Court Reporter Carla Sims.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, ) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC of Service on 1-24-11 of Plaintiff's Objections and Counter-Designations to Verizon's Deposition Designations (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation Verizon's Objections and Counter Designations to Cheetah's Deposition Desigations (Attachments: # 1 Objections & Counterdesignations to Cheetah's Deposition Designations)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***PLEASE SEE ENTRY 277 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT*** MOTION to Compel (1) Patent License Agreement Doucments and (2) Correspondence with Trial Witnesses, and Proposed Accelerated Briefing and Hearing Schedule by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 10/7/09 letter from LeRoy to Molster, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 12/10/09 letter from Blacha to LeRoy, # 3 Exhibit 3 - page from Verizon 10-K Annual Report, # 4 Exhibit 4 - email from Halan to Verizon counsel, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt from Yoo deposition, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpt from Blumenthal deposition, # 7 Exhibit 7 - email from Lewry to Verizon counsel, # 8 Exhibit 8 - 4/29/10 Yoo email re claim chart with 11 redacted attachments, # 9 Exhibit 9 - 10/21/10 letter from Cacovean to Blacha, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Blum v. Spectrum Restaurant Group, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Verizon revised supplemental privilege log, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas) Modified on 2/7/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *** ENTRY REPLACES 260 *** SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 173 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Verizon's Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Verizon's Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Verizon's Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McSwane, Douglas) Modified on 1/24/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 254 Motion for Leave to File Surreply Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/24/11. cc:attys 1-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 252 Sealed Motion for Leave to file Exhibit under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/24/11. cc:attys 1-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 164 SEALED PATENT MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gerald J. Mossinghoff filed by Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              *** DISREGARD. LINKED TO INCORRECT MOTION. TO BE REFILED BY ATTORNEY. *** SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 120 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings on, the Verizon Defendants' Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings on, the Verizon Defendants' Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McSwane, Douglas) Modified on 1/24/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Seal Verizon's Surreply to Cheetah's MSJ on Verizon's 4th and 5th Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim counse 5-7 (Inequitable conduct) by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 258 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 171 SEALED PATENT MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony on Obviousness, Indefiniteness, and Enablement from Verizon's Expert David Smith filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Seal Verizon's surreply in Opposition to Cheetah's Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony on obviousness, Indefiniteness, and enablement from Verizon's expert David Smith by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 166 SEALED PATENT MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony on Infringement from Verizon's Expert Anthony Acampora filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 255 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Sur-Reply Brief Opposing Verizon's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Cheetah's Sur-Reply Brief Opposing Verizon's Motion For Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Under Seal by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 253 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 169 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the Invalidity Issues of Anticipation, Obviousness, Indefiniteness, and Enablement with Respect to Claims 9 and 11-14 of USPN 7,522,836 filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from Expert Report of David Smith (CONFIDENTIAL), # 2 Exhibit 7 - 1-17-11 Motion Hearings Transcript)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from Expert Report of David Smith (CONFIDENTIAL), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 244 Motion to Seal. Verizon can file its Reply to Cheetah Omni LLC's Brief Opposing Verizon's Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/19/11. cc:attys 1-20-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation (Verizon's Pretrial Witness Disclosures) (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC of Service of Pretrial Witness Address and Telephone Number Disclosure (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 7, 2011 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-590-1096. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. (16 pages) Redaction Request due 2/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2011. (rem, ) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation of Agenda for the Court Hearing on January 25, 2011 (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 246 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation of deposition designations (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Verizon's SEALED REPLY to Chettah's Response to Verizon's Motion for summary judgment for non-infringement filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Seal VZ's reply to Cheetah's Brief Opposing Verizon's MSJ for Non-infringement by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 173 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Verizon's Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Verizon's Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Verizon's Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7-US7145704, # 2 Exhibit 8-DARPA letter to Islam, # 3 Exhibit 9-Islam 5-26-10 dep excerpts, # 4 Exhibit 10-Assignment, # 5 Exhibit 11-Islam 11-4-10 dep excerpt, # 6 Exhibit 12-Technip Offshore Contractors v Williams Field Services, # 7 Exhibit 13-mpep_e8r8_0300)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 166 SEALED PATENT MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony on Infringement from Verizon's Expert Anthony Acampora filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC of Plaintiff, Cheetah Omni LLC's Deposition Designations (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 164 SEALED PATENT MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gerald J. Mossinghoff filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D-Realtime Data v. Packeteer, Inc.)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 235 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/18/11. cc:attys 1-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 171 SEALED PATENT MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony on Obviousness, Indefiniteness, and Enablement from Verizon's Expert David Smith filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Geoffrey P Eaton for Verizon Services Corporation (mll, ) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              VERIZONS' SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to CHEETAH'S SEALED PATENT MOTION (DKT169) for Partial Summary Judgment on the Invalidity Issues of Anticipation, Obviousness, Indefiniteness, and Enablement with Respect to Claims 9 and 11-14 of USPN 7,522,836 filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document (Motion to Seal Verizon's Opposition to Cheetah's MSJ on the Invalidity issues of Anticipation, Obviouslness, Indefiniteness, and enablement with respect to claims 9 and 11-14 of Patent '836 and exhibits) by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER approving 233 Stipulation, filed by Cheetah Omni LLC to withdraw sections V.A. and V.B. of Cheetah's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Invalidity Issues 169 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/14/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 233 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re 169 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the Invalidity Issues of Anticipation, Obviousness, Indefiniteness, and Enablement with Respect to Claims 9 and 11-14 of USPN 7,522,836 by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 223 Motion to Seal. Verizon can file its Opposition to pltf Cheetah Omni's Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gerald J Mossinghoff and Associated Exhibits under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/12/11. cc:attys 1-12-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 230 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/12/11. cc:attys 1-12-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Disclosures and Deposition Designations and Objections by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Halan, John) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 219 Motion to Seal Document. Verizon can file its Opposition to pltf Cheetah Omni LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment on Verizon's Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five - Seven (Inequitable Conduct) and Associated Exhibits under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/10/11. cc:attys 1-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 217 Motion to Seal Document. Verizon can file its Opposition to pltf Cheetah Omni's Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony on Infringement from Verizon's Expert Anthony Acampora and Associated Exhibits under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/10/11. cc:attys 1-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 215 Motion to Seal Document. Verizon can file its Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Regarding its Inequitable Conduct Defense and Associated Exhibits under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/10/11. cc:attys 1-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 210 Unopposed SEALED MOTION For Leave to File The Attached Exhibits Under Seal filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/10/11. cc:attys 1-11-11(mll, ) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 208 Sealed Motion to file Opposition to Cheetah's Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony on Obviousness, Indefiniteness, and Enablement from Verizon's Expert David Smith and Associated Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/10/11. cc:attys 1-11-11 (mll, ) Modified on 1/11/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 207 Motion to expand the number of documents and/or references on the parties' exhibit lists from 250 to 275 documents and/or references. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/10/11. cc:attys 1-11-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Seal (Opposition to Motion to Exclude Mossinghoff and Associated Exhibits) by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 1/7/2011 re 147 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File (MFL to Amend its Expert Report on Invalidity)Opposed MOTION for Leave to File (MFL to Amend its Expert Report on Invalidity) filed by Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, 134 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Invalidity Contentions filed by Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (mjm, ) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 221 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Regarding its Inequitable Conduct Defense (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 220 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 173 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Verizon's Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Verizon's Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Verizon's Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X)(Siebman, Clyde) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2011: # 25 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document (Opposition to Inequitable Conduct MSJ) by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 218 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 166 SEALED PATENT MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony on Infringement from Verizon's Expert Anthony Acampora filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Siebman, Clyde) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2011: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document (Opposition to Daubert Motion to Exclude Acampora and Associated Exhibits) by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Pretrial Order (Joint Final Pretrial Order) by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Cheetah's Witness List, # 2 Exhibit B-Verizon's Witness List, # 3 Exhibit C-Cheetah's Exhibit List, # 4 Exhibit D-Verizon's Exhibit List)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Associated Exhibits) by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 214 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 164 SEALED PATENT MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gerald J. Mossinghoff filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Siebman, Clyde) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2011: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 223 FOR CORRECT DOCUMENT.*** Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document (Opposition to Motion to Exclude Mossinghoff and Associated Exhibits by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) Modified on 1/11/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Cheetah's Proposed Jury Instructions and Proposed Form of Verdict, # 2 Exhibit 2-Verizon's Proposed Charge of the Court and Proposed Form of Verdict)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 211 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-US Pat. No. 7,522,836, # 2 Exhibit 2-Campbell deposition excerpts, # 3 Exhibit 3-Acampora excerpt, # 4 Exhibit 4-US Pat. 7,145,704, # 5 Exhibit 5-Fujitsu slideshow pages)(Lewry, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/10/2011: # 6 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed SEALED MOTION For Leave to File The Attached Exhibits Under Seal by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 3-excerpts of Acampora deposition, # 3 Exhibit 5-Fijitsu slideshow pages)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 209 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION 171 (RESPONSE TO SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony on Obviousness, Indefiniteness, and Enablement from Verizon's Expert David Smith) filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document (Mtn to seal Verizon's Opposition to Cheetah Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert David Smith) by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Expand the Number of Documents and/or References on the Parties' Exhibit Lists from 250 to 275 Documents and/or References by Cheetah Omni LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 201 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/7/2011. (gsg) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying as moot 134 Motion for Leave to File; denying as moot 147 Motion for Leave to File; denying as moot 193 Sealed Motion; denying as moot 203 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/7/2011. (gsg) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC of Request of Real lTime Reporting of Court Proceedings (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to file Supplemental Brief In Support of its Motion for Leave to Amend its Invalidity Contentions by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1 - to Supl Brief, # 3 Exhibit 2 - to Supl Brief, # 4 Exhibit 3 - to Supl Brief, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation (Notice of VZs' Request for Daily Transcripts) (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document (VZs' Unopposed Motion to File Documents under seal attached to its supplemental brief ISO its MFL to Amend its Invalidity Contentions) by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 197 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/6/2011. (gsg) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 199 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 197 Unopposed SEALED MOTION For Leave To File The Attached Exhibits Under Seal. (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 198 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 147 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File (MFL to Amend its Expert Report on Invalidity)Opposed MOTION for Leave to File (MFL to Amend its Expert Report on Invalidity) filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-11/8/10 email from Walton, # 2 Exhibit 2-excerpts from Blumenthal transcript, # 3 Exhibit 3-VZCH-CALIENT-0000366-428)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed SEALED MOTION For Leave To File The Attached Exhibits Under Seal by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-11/8/10 email from Walton, # 2 Exhibit 2-excerpts from Blumenthal transcript, # 3 Exhibit 3-VZCH-CALIENT-0000366-428)(Lewry, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2011: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 191 Motion for Leave to File. Verizon can file its Motion to Compel Deposition of Cheetah's Infringement Expert and Associated Exhibits under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/29/10. cc:attys 12-29-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 189 Motion to Seal. Verizon may file its Reply to Cheetah's Brief Opposing In Part Verizon's Motion for Leave to Amend its Expert Report on Invalidity and associated exhibits under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/28/10. cc:attys 12-29-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 187 Motion to Continue Hearing on Verizon's Motion to Supplement Invalidity Contentions. The hearing is reset to 1-07-2011 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/28/10. cc:attys 12-29-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 193 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION to Compel Deposition of Cheetah's Infringement Expert by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 193 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** Unopposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Deposition of Cheetah's Infringement Expert by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) Modified on 12/28/2010 (mll, ). (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Compel Deposition of Cheetah's Infringement Expert and Associated Exhibits Under Seal by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 190 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 147 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File (MFL to Amend its Expert Report on Invalidity) [VERIZONS REPLY TO CHEETAHS BRIEF OPPOSING IN PART VERIZONS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS EXPERT REPORT ON INVALIDITY] filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Seal [UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE VERIZON'S REPLY TO CHEETAH'S BRIEF OPPOSING IN PART VERIZON'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS EXPERT REPORT ON INVALIDITY UNDER SEAL] by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 134 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Invalidity Contentions filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit R - Declaration of Dr. Islam)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing on Verizon's Motion to Supplement Invalidity Contentions (Dkt.134) from 1/4/2011 to 1/6/2011 by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 174 Motion to Seal. Verizon can file its Motion to File Verizon's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Associated Exhibits under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/21/10. cc:attys 12-22-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 176 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/21/10. cc:attys 12-22-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 177 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/21/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 172 Sealed Patent Motion to File Expert Report Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/21/10. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 170 Sealed Patent Motion to File Expert Report Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/21/10. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 168 Sealed Patent Motion to File Expert Report Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/21/10. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 165 Sealed Patent Motion to File Expert Report Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/21/10. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 163 Sealed Patent Motion to File Expert Report Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/21/10. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 162 Motion to Seal Verizon's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Associated Exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/21/10. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Compel [VERIZON'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION] by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery [VERIZON'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE DEPOSITIONS OF DAVID SMITH, KEITH UGONE AND MOHAMMED ISLAM] by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 175 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT MOTION [VERIZON'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF RODNEY L. CRAWFORD] by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A(1), # 2 Exhibit A(2), # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C(1), # 5 Exhibit C(2), # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Seal [UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL VERIZONS MOTION TO STRIKE AND EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF RODNEY L. CRAWFORD] by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 173 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Verizon's Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - CONFIDENTIAL - Excerpt from Expert Report of David Smith, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Mossinghoff Deposition Transcript, # 4 Exhibit 3 - CONFIDENTIAL - Excerpt of Expert Report of Gearld Mossinghoff, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt from Gaffney Deposition, # 6 Exhibit 5 - USPN 7,522,836, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Office Action Dated 8/02/2007)(Lewry, Thomas) Modified on 3/30/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 172 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to File Attached Exhibits Under Seal by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - CONFIDENTIAL - Excerpt of Expert Report of David Smith, # 3 Exhibit 3 - CONFIDENTIAL - Excerpt of Expert Report of Gerald Mossinghoff)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 171 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony on Obviousness, Indefiniteness, and Enablement from Verizon's Expert David Smith by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - CONFIDENTIAL - Excerpt from Expert Report of David Smith)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 170 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to File Attached Exhibit Under Seal by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - CONFIDENTIAL - Excerpt from Expert Report of David Smith)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 169 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the Invalidity Issues of Anticipation, Obviousness, Indefiniteness, and Enablement with Respect to Claims 9 and 11-14 of USPN 7,522,836 by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - USPN 7,522,836, # 3 Exhibit 2 - CONFIDENTIAL - Excerpt from Expert Report of David Smith, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Dixit Reference, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Claim Construction Hearing Transcript, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Verizon Proposed Claim Construction)(Lewry, Thomas) Modified on 3/30/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 168 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to File Attached Exhibit Under Seal by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - CONFIDENTIAL - Excerpt from Expert Report of David Smith)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 167 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT MOTION [VERIZON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR NON-INFRINGEMENT] by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) Modified on 3/30/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 166 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony on Infringement from Verizon's Expert Anthony Acampora by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - USPN 7,522,836, # 3 Exhibit 2 - CONFIDENTIAL - Excerpt of Expert Report of Acampora, # 4 Exhibit 3- CONFIDENTIAL - Excerpt of Rough Draft of Acampora Deposition, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt of Markman Hearing Transcript)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 165 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to File Attached Exhibits Under Seal by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - CONFIDENTIAL - Excerpt of Expert Report of Acampora, # 3 Exhibit 3 - CONFIDENTIAL - Excerpt of Rough Draft of Acampora Deposition)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 164 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED PATENT MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gerald J. Mossinghoff by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - CONFIDENTIAL - Excerpt of Mossinghoff Expert Report, # 3 Exhibit B - Excerpt from Mossinghoff Deposition, # 4 Exhibit C - Revlon v. L'Oreal, 1997 WL 158281 (D.Del.))(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 163 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - CONFIDENTIAL - Excerpt of Mossinghoff Expert Report)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Seal [UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE VERIZON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT AND ASSOCIATED EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL] by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 147 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File (MFL to Amend its Expert Report on Invalidity)Opposed MOTION for Leave to File (MFL to Amend its Expert Report on Invalidity) filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Thomas A. Lewry, # 3 Exhibit A-excerpts from Expert Report of David Smith, # 4 Exhibit B-excerpts from Elby deposition, # 5 Exhibit C-excerpts from Defs' Invalidity Contentions, # 6 Exhibit D-excerpts from Defs' 3rd Suppl. Invalidity Contentions, # 7 Exhibit E-Dr. Smith list of references)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 156 Motion to Seal. Verizon can file its Reply in Support of its Invalidity Contentions and Associated exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/14/10. cc:attys 12-14-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 157 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/14/10. cc:attys 12-14-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 158 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 134 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Invalidity Contentions filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Verizons' Reply ISO its MFL to Amend its Invalidity Contentions by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Seal Verizon's Reply ISO its Motion Seeking Leave to Amend its Invalidity Contentions by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Authority to Seal): 151 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,.. (Lewry, Thomas) Modified on 12/3/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 154 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 131 Motion to Dismiss. The Court dismisses Verizon's defenses and counterclaims relating to the 704 patent without prejudice. The Court enters Partial Judgment of Non-Infringement with respect to the 704 patent. Each party will bear its own costs, expenses, and attys' fees with respect to the claims and counterclaims related to the 704 patent. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/02/10. cc:attys 12-02-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 150 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/02/10. cc:attys 12-02-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation of Compliance of serving rebuttal expert reports (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 151 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 147 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File (MFL to Amend its Expert Report on Invalidity)Opposed MOTION for Leave to File (MFL to Amend its Expert Report on Invalidity) filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Verizon's 1/15/10 Invalidity Contentions, # 2 Exhibit B-Email from Jackson to Brooks Kushman, # 3 Exhibit C-Verizon's 5/14/10 2d Suppl. Invalidity Contentions, # 4 Exhibit D-6/2/10 Lewry letter, # 5 Exhibit E-6/25/10 email re Meet & Confer, # 6 Exhibit F-Verizon's 7/9/10 3rd suppl. Invalidity Contentions, # 7 Exhibit G-Verizon's 9/20/10 4th suppl. Invalidity Contentioons, # 8 Exhibit H-Verizon's 10/15/10 5th suppl. Invalidity Contentions, # 9 Exhibit I-Email from Sharifi, # 10 Exhibit J-Verizon's 10/15/10 suppl. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures, # 11 Exhibit K-Confidential Bykerk Dep. Transcript Excerpts, # 12 Exhibit L-Elby Dep. Transcript Excerpts, # 13 Exhibit M-Vengsarkar Dep. Transcript Excerpts, # 14 Exhibit N-Blumenthal Dep. Transcript Excerpts, # 15 Exhibit O-Islam 11/4/10 Dep. Transcript Excerpts, # 16 Exhibit P-'836 Patent, # 17 Exhibit Q-Cummins-Allison Brief)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 150 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION For Leave to File The Attached Exhibit Under Seal by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit K-Confidential-Bykerk Dep. Transcript Excerpts)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Rebuttal Trial Witness List by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Rebuttal Witness List by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed MOTION for Leave to File (MFL to Amend its Expert Report on Invalidity) by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Charkow Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Blumenthal Depo Transcript, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 145 Stipulation for Extension of Time filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/30/10. cc:attys 11-30-10(mll, ) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re 134 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Invalidity Contentions for extension of time to oppose Verizon's motion by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER vacating in part 143 Order regarding the filing of summary judgment and Daubert motions. The parties are not required to submit letter briefs in advance of filing summary judgment and Daubert motions as explained in the first two paragraphs of the previous order. However, the limitations on motions in limine, exhibits and deposition designations are still effective. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/24/10. cc:attys 11-24-10(mll, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that prior to filing any summary judgment motion, parties must submit letter briefs seeking permission to file the motion; prior to filing any motions to strike or Daubert Motions, the parties must submit letter briefs seeking permission to file the motion; each side is limited to 10 disputed motions in limine; each side is limited to designating 250 exhibits for trial absent a showing of good cause; each side is limited to designating no more than 10 hours of deposition testimony for use at trial absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/23/10. cc:attys 11-24-10(mll, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 140 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/22/10. cc:attys 11-22-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Trial Witness List by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Cheetah Omni LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Trial Witness List by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION Concerning Authenticity of Documents by Cheetah Omni LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 136 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/16/10. cc:attys 11-16-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (extension of time to designate and serve rebuttal expert witness reports and expert discovery) by Cheetah Omni LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $682.50 to Richard Egan for services rendered and expenses incurred through 11-01-2010 as Technical Advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $1,365.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/10/10. cc:attys 11-10-10(mll, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Invalidity Contentions by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DISREGARD ENTRY - TO BE REFILED TO REPLACE EXHIBIT 1 - SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 134*** MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Charkow, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) Modified on 11/10/2010 (kls, ). (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 132 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER construing the disputed terms in U.S. Patent Nos. 7,145,704 and 7,522,836. For the ease of reference, the Court's claim interpretations are set forth in a table attached to this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/9/10. (mjc, ) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulation of Dismissal regarding claims and counterclaims related to the '704 Patent) by Cheetah Omni LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 120 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings on, the Verizon Defendants' Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings on, the Verizon Defendants' Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC re 120 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings on, the Verizon Defendants' Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings on, the Verizon Defendants' Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order: Tivo, Inc. v. Verizon Communications, Inc., et al, Civil Action No. 09-257)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER vacating 127 Order requiring parties to pay Michael McLemore for services rendered. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/27/10. cc:attys 10-28-10(mll, ) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      VACATED PER 128 ORDER ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $6,875.00 to Michael McLemore for services rendered and expenses incurred through 10-25-2010 as the technical advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $13,750.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/27/10. cc:attys 10-27-10(mll, ) Modified on 10/28/2010 (mll, ). (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 120 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings on, the Verizon Defendants' Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings on, the Verizon Defendants' Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Memorandum Opinion And Order, of July 22, 2010, in Acqis LLC v. Appro International, Inc., Case No. 6:09 CV 148)(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER to pay technical advisor Richard Egan $18,179.26 by Nov. 1 for services rendered, with Plaintiffs to pay one half, $9,089.63, and Defendants, collectively, to pay one half, $9,089.63. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/18/10. (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. This provisional claim construction opinion construes the disputed terms in US Patent Nos 7,145,704 and 7,522,836. The Court will issue a Memorandum Opinion and Order at a later date. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/15/10. cc:attys 10-15-10(mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 120 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings on, the Verizon Defendants' Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings on, the Verizon Defendants' Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2010: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation of Service of Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation of Service of Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, for Judgment on the Pleadings on, the Verizon Defendants' Fourth and Fifth Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim Counts Five-Seven (Inequitable Conduct) by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Tuttle, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). Modified on 3/30/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 118 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/15/10. cc:attys 9-16-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Markman Hearing held on 9/9/2010. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (mjm, ) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc. (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to 109 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9 - Proposed claim construction comparison chart)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 112 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Response to Cheetahs Proposed Claim Constructions Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/23/10. (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 113 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc. to 109 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, Part 1, # 8 Exhibit G, Part 2, # 9 Exhibit G, Part 3, # 10 Exhibit G, Part 4, # 11 Exhibit G, Part 5, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N, # 19 Exhibit O)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Its Memorandum Of Law In Response To Cheetah's Proposed Claim Constructions Under Seal by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 110 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted between pltf and deft Grande Communications are DISMISSED with prejudice. All costs, expenses and atty fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/19/10. cc:attys 8-19-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice With Respect to Grande by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - USPN 7145704, # 2 Exhibit 2 - USPN 7522836, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 7/3/08 Non-Final Rejection, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Suzuki USPN 5654812, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Dictionary.Reference.com, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Microsoft Computer Dictionary, # 7 Exhibit 7 - YourDictionary.com, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Newton Telecom Dictionary)(Le Roy, John) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 107 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Cheetah and Grande Communications are STAYED until 8-31-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/03/10. cc:attys 8-03-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines Applicable to Claims Involving Defendant Grande Communications Networks LLC f/k/a Grande Communications Networks, Inc. by Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason S Charkow for Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2010: # 1 Exhibit) (mll, ). (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 103 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/23/10. cc:attys 7-23-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. The Markman Hearing remains set on 9-09-2010 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/22/10. cc:attys 7-22-10(mll, ) Modified on 7/22/2010 (mll, ). (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT PURSUANT TO PATENT LOCAL RULE 4-3 filed by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to 86 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Verizon by Cheetah Omni LLC.(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to 87 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Grande by Cheetah Omni LLC.(Tuttle, Robert) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 96 Motion for seven-day Extension of Time, through and including July 19, 2010, to respond to the Second Amended Counterclaims of Defendants. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/12/2010. (kls, ) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 95 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. It is therefore ORDERED that the Parties shall have through July 19, 2010 in which to file the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/12/2010. (kls, ) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER appointing Richard D Egan as the Court's Technical Advisor in this action, with his costs to be assessed equally between pltf and defts and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/12/10. cc:attys 7-12-10(mll, ) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 2nd Amended Counterclaims of Defendants (Dkt. 86 and 87) by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation Joint Submission of Proposed Technical Advisor (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Caren K Khoo for Verizon Services Corporation (mll, ) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 91 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall have up to and including 7-08-2010 to comply with the deadline to submit proposed technical advisors for the Court's consideration. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/01/10. cc:attys 7-02-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Submission of Proposed Technical Advisors by Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Leonard Charles Suchyta for Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC,Verizon Services Corporation. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 88 Motion to Amend/Correct. The current mediation completion deadline is extended to 7-13-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/29/10. cc:attys 6-30-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 48 Order Regarding Mediation by Cheetah Omni LLC, Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to 53 Amended Complaint (Second), COUNTERCLAIM and Defenses against Cheetah Omni LLC by Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second Amended ANSWER to 53 Amended Complaint (Second), COUNTERCLAIM against Cheetah Omni LLC by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC.(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC (Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance With P.R. 4-2 Disclosures) (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation (NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 4-2 DISCLOSURES) (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 82 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/07/10. cc:attys 6-08-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation (Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures) (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 79 Motion to Substitute Mediator. Cheetah and Grande Communications shall mediate with Gaynell C Methvin on 5-17-2010. The Hon Robert Faulkner shall remain the mediator for the mediations between Cheetah and the other defendants in this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/06/10. cc:attys 5-07-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Substitute Party (Mediator) by Cheetah Omni LLC, Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 77 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/30/10. cc:attys 4-30-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Cheetah Omni LLC, Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Verizon Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 74 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeff R Johnson terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/01/10. cc:attys 3-01-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher John Rourk on behalf of Grande Communications Networks, Inc., (Rourk, Christopher) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Jeff Johnson by Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jeff) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  (Cheetah's Answer to Grande'sAmended Counterclaim) ANSWER to 70 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Cheetah Omni LLC.(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (Cheetah's Answer to Verizon's Amended Counterclaim) ANSWER to 71 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Cheetah Omni LLC.(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to 53 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Cheetah Omni LLC by Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC. (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint DEFENSES AND, COUNTERCLAIM TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cheetah Omni LLC by Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,.(Jackson, John) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Grande Communications Networks, Inc., re 47 Order Notice of Compliance with Local Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 and Paragraph 2 of the Discovery Order (Jackson, John) (Entered: 01/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 66 Motion for Extension of Time. Defts shall have to 1-22-2010 to add inequitable conduct allegations to the pleadings without first obtaining leave of Court. Thereafter, it will be necessary for defts to obtain leave of Court to add inequitable conduct allegations to the pleadings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/14/10. cc:attys 1-14-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Plead Inequitable Conduct Without Obtaining Leave of Court by Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 61 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 60 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY*** NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC re 60 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Filing Answer to Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses (Lewry, Thomas) Modified on 12/14/2009 (kls, ). (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY*** NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC re 61 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Filing Answer to Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses (Lewry, Thomas) Modified on 12/14/2009 (kls, ). (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          VERIZONS ANSWER to 53 Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Cheetah Omni LLC by Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC.(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 53 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM and DEFENSES against Cheetah Omni LLC by Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,.(Jackson, John) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Cheetah Omni LLC of Initial and Discovery Order Disclosures (Le Roy, John) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Grande Communications Networks, Inc., (Jackson, John) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC (Initial Disclosures) (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott C Walton for Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC and Verizon Communications, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Monika M Blacha for Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC and Verizon Communications, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter C McCabe, III for Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC and Verizon Communications, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against all defendants, filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US Patent 7145704, # 2 Exhibit B - US Patent 7522836)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Cheetah Omni LLC of Service on Defendants of Disclosures Pursuant to PR 3-1 and 3-2 (Le Roy, John) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 49 Motion regarding Electronic Document Production Format. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/04/09. cc:attys 11-04-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Joint MOTION Entry of Agreed Order re 49 Joint MOTION Concerning Electronic Document Production Format by Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,. (Jackson, John) Modified on 11/4/2009 (mjc, ). (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION Concerning Electronic Document Production Format by Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC, Cheetah Omni LLC, Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Siebman, Clyde) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2009: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/28/09. cc:attys 10-29-09(mll, ) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/28/09. cc:attys 10-29-09(mll, ) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC of filing JOINT AGREED Case Management Statement (Le Roy, John) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Le Roy, John) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Le Roy, John) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall file a Proposed Docket Control Order and a Discovery Order by 10-23-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/20/09. cc:attys 10-20-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Verizon Services Corporation, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Enterprise Delivery LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Cheetah Omni LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 10-19-2009. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 10-19-2009 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus pltf's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 10-09-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/07/09. cc:attys 10-08-09(mll, ) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry -- 10.5.09 Status Conference for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love: Status Conference held on 10/5/2009. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, ) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Halan on behalf of Cheetah Omni LLC (Halan, John) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dan K Webb for Verizon Communications, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kurt A Mathas for Verizon Communications, Inc. Fee pd., 6-1-19386. Approved 9/22/09. (mjc, ) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles B Molster, III for Verizon Communications, Inc. Fee pd., 6-1-19387. Approved 9/22/09. (mjc, ) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Answer to Grande Communication Networks, Inc.'s Amended Counterclaims and Affirmative Defense / ANSWER to 31 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Cheetah Omni LLC.(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's Answer To Verizon's Counterclaims And Affirmative Defense / ANSWER to 28 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Cheetah Omni LLC.(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting Status Conference for 10/5/2009 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/10/09. cc:attys 9-10-09(mll, ) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM and DEFENSES against Grande Communications Networks, Inc., by Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,.(Jackson, John) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Verizon Communications, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Cheetah Omni LLC re 5 Order, Request for Scheduling Conference (Le Roy, John) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Cheetah Omni LLC by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Cheetah's ANSWER to 15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Grande Communications Networks, Inc. by Cheetah Omni LLC.(Le Roy, John) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement And Demand For Jury Trial against all defendants, filed by Cheetah Omni LLC.(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/19/09. cc:attys 8-20-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint by Cheetah Omni LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint For Patent Infringement And Demand Fur Jury Trial, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/11/09. cc:attys 8-11-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, or Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John S Le Roy on behalf of Cheetah Omni LLC (Le Roy, John) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas A Lewry on behalf of Cheetah Omni LLC (Lewry, Thomas) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Augustine Phillips on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc. (Phillips, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Grande Communications Networks, Inc., AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Jackson, John) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Communications, Inc..( Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Grande Communications Networks, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent Grande Communications Holdings, Inc. for Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against Cheetah Omni LLC by Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,.(Jackson, John) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Communications, Inc..( Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Verizon Communications, Inc. on 6/30/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 7/20/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Grande Communications Networks, Inc., on 6/15/2009, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeff R Johnson on behalf of Grande Communications Networks, Inc., (Johnson, Jeff) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Verizon Communications, Inc. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elton Joe Kendall on behalf of Cheetah Omni LLC (Kendall, Elton) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Returned Unexecuted by Cheetah Omni LLC as to Verizon Communications, Inc. (gsg) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Grande Communications Networks, Inc.,.( Jackson, John) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Jackson on behalf of Grande Communications Networks, Inc., (Jackson, John) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by Cheetah Omni LLC. The Court ORDERS the Plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining Defendant's answer or motion. The notice shall include a list of any pending motions to dismiss or transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/15/2009. (kls, ) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Cheetah Omni LLC (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Verizon Communications, Inc., Grande Communications Networks, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service on defts. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 588 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?