Intellectual Ventures I LLC v. Nikon Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01025
District Judge Sue L. Robinson, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 13, 2018 at 12:48 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Intellectual Ventures, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Intellectual Ventures I LLC"

Represented by Desmarais LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 rpiergiovanni@farnanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C Spaccarotella +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 jspaccarotella@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 rpiergiovanni@farnanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com
v.
No Logo Nikon Americas Inc., Defendant

Represented by Ashby & Geddes, PA

No Logo Nikon Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Ashby & Geddes, PA

No Logo Nikon Imaging Japan Inc., Defendant

Represented by Ashby & Geddes, PA

No Logo Nikon, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Ashby & Geddes, PA

No Logo Sendai Nikon Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Ashby & Geddes, PA

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hiroyuki Hagiwara +81 036 259 3516 +81 036 259 3517 hiroyuki.hagiwara@ropesgray.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse J. Jenner +1 212 596 9019 +1 212 596 9090 jesse.jenner@ropesgray.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Radsch +1 212 841 0457 andrew.radsch@ropesgray.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence S. Rogers +1 212 596 9033 +1 212 596 9090 lrogers@fishneave.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart W. Yothers +1 212 596 9000 +1 212 596 9090 stuart.yothers@ropesgray.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (217) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s): see report for numbers. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation)(fms) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      AMENDED DEPOSITION ORDER re 212 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/20/2015. (nmfn) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        Deposition Order. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/17/2015.(Counsel may retrieve certified copies from the clerks office) (lih) (Main Document 213 replaced on 3/24/2015) (lih). (Entered: 03/19/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
          STIPULATION Regarding Amended Deposition Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
            STIPULATION regarding Deposition Order by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), # 2 (Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon))(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              MEMORANDUM ORDER re: claim construction. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/10/2015. (nmfn) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                Second Amended Deposition Order. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/3/2015. (Counsel may retrieve certified copies from the clerks office) (lih) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION regarding Second Amended Deposition Order by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Proposed Order), # 2 (Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon))(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER, Rescheduling Hearings (The In-Person Status Conference is rescheduled for 3/10/2015 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/2/2015. (nmfn) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Extend Deadlines for (1) Fact Discovery; (2) Final Invalidity Contentions; (iii) Supplementation of Discovery; (iv) Opening Expert Reports; (v) Answering Expert Reports; (vi) Reply Expert Reports to (i) April 27, 2015; (ii) April 10, 2015; (iii) April 10, 2015; (iv) May 12, 2015; (v) June 9, 2015; (vi) June 23, 2015 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 15-25); and (ii) Plaintiffs' Fifth Set of Requests for The Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 82-100) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Final Infringement Charts and Identification of Accused Products filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Marvell Semiconductor, Inc. filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Broadcom Corporation filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC on March 13, 2015 filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    SO ORDERED, re 198 Stipulation filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Inc., Nikon Corporation. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/19/15. (rwc) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                      STIPULATION regarding Amended Deposition Order by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), # 2 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon)(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Corporation's, Nikon Americas Inc.'s and Nikon Inc.'s Fifth Set of Requests for Documents and Things to Intellectual Ventures (Nos. 83-88) and Nikon Corporation's, Nikon Americas Inc.'s and Nikon Inc.'s Third Set of Interrogatories to Intellectual Ventures (Nos. 17-24) filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Deposition ORDER. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/6/2015. (lih) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Defendants' Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-10) filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
                                              Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Michael J. Farnan regarding re 193 Stipulation. (Farnan, Michael) Modified on 2/6/2015 (lih). (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                STIPULATION regarding Deposition Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that paragraph 7 of the court's patent scheduling order regarding "fact witnesses to be called at trial" is hereby revised to eliminate the entitlement to pretrial depositions. The language shall read as follows: 7. Fact Witnesses to be Called at Trial. Within one (1) month following the close of expert discovery, each party shall serve on the other parties a list of each fact witness (including any expert witness who is also expectedto give fact testimony) who has previously been disclosed during fact discovery and that it intends to call at trial. Within one (1) month of receipt of such fact witness list, each party shall serve a list of each rebuttal fact witness disclosed during fact discovery that it intends to call at trial. It is expected thatall such witnesses have been vetted during the fact discovery process. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/6/2015. (nmfn) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Sarah Waidelich as co-counsel. Reason for request: Withdrawing Appearance. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Deposition ORDER. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/30/2015. (lih) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                          STIPULATION regarding Deposition Order by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), # 2 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon)(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoena to MediaTek USA Inc. filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoenas to Sony Corporation of America filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tal Kedem - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren M. Nowierski - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 182 Declaration by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 1/21/2015 (lih). (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      [SEALED] DECLARATION of Andrew T. Radsch re 181 Reply Brief, by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 1/20/2015 (lih). (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        REPLY BRIEF re 164 MOTION to Stay Litigation with Respect to U.S. Patent Nos. 6,121,960, 5,712,870, and 6,754,195 until Final Resolution of Recently Instituted Inter Partes Reviews filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 1/20/2015 (lih). (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 176 Declaration by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-K)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 1/20/2015 (lih). (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Fifth Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A), 26(e) and Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoenas to Marvell Semiconductor filed by Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Deposition ORDER. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/9/2015. (lih) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  [SEALED] DECLARATION of Jeffrey S. Seddon re 175 Answering Brief in Opposition by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 1/9/2015 (lih). (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 164 MOTION to Stay filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/20/2015. (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 1/9/2015 (lih). (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      STIPULATION Concerning Depositions in Japan by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on December 22, 2014 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/7/2015. (vjg) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoena to Qualcomm Inc. filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            DECLARATION of Rachael S. Bacha re (254 in 1:13-cv-00473-SLR) Claim Construction Surreply Brief, (169 in 1:11-cv-01025-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Surreply Brief by Canon Inc., Canon Solutions America Inc., Canon U.S.A. Inc., Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M-Q)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 12/22/2014 (lih). (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding presentation of claim terms for the December 22, 2014 Claim Construction Hearing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SURREPLY BRIEF for the Wi-Fi Patents filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 12/22/2014 (lih). (Main Document 169 replaced on 12/22/2014) (fms). (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Andrew T. Radsch re 167 Claim Construction Surreply Brief by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N25-N30)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 12/22/2014 (lih). (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SURREPLY BRIEF on the Disputed Claim Terms of the Non-Wifi Patents filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 12/22/2014 (lih). (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 165 Opening Brief in Support, (Declaration of Andrew T. Radsch) by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        OPENING BRIEF in Support re 164 MOTION to Stay Litigation with Respect to U.S. Patent Nos. 6,121,960, 5,712,870, and 6,754,195 until Final Resolution of Recently Instituted Inter Partes Reviews filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/8/2015. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay Litigation with Respect to U.S. Patent Nos. 6,121,960, 5,712,870, and 6,754,195 until Final Resolution of Recently Instituted Inter Partes Reviews - filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding December 22, 2014 Joint Markman Hearing. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoena to ArcSoft Inc. by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nikon Corporation, Nikon Americas Inc., and Nikon Inc. on 1/5/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Martin Afromowitz re 156 Claim Construction Reply Brief by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 12/8/2014 (lih). (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Dan Schonfeld re 156 Claim Construction Reply Brief by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 12/8/2014 (lih). (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Sarah E. Waidelich re 156 Claim Construction Reply Brief by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P4, # 2 Exhibit P5, # 3 Exhibit P6, # 4 Exhibit P7)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 12/8/2014 (lih). (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION REPLY BRIEF filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Andrew C. Michaels re (154 in 1:11-cv-01025-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Reply Brief, (240 in 1:13-cv-00473-SLR) Claim Construction Reply Brief by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8, # 2 Exhibit 9)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 12/8/2014 (lih). (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              CLAIM CONSTRUCTION REPLY BRIEF for the Wi-Fi Patents filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 12/8/2014 (lih). (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Regarding the Construction of the Term "Variable Pixel Control," by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Balick, Steven) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 145 Declaration by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 14, # 2 Exhibit 15 - 16, # 3 Exhibit 17 - 24)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 12/1/2014 (lih). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 144 Claim Construction Answering Brief by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 12/1/2014 (lih). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Vijay Madisetti re (234 in 1:13-cv-00473-SLR) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (148 in 1:11-cv-01025-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Answering Brief by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 11/17/2014 (lih). (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Rachael S. Bacha re (234 in 1:13-cv-00473-SLR) Claim Construction Answering Brief, (148 in 1:11-cv-01025-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Answering Brief by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Exhibit F-L)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 11/17/2014 (lih). (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF for the Wi-Fi Patents filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 11/17/2014 (lih). (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re of Richard F. Ferraro 144 Claim Construction Answering Brief by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 11/17/2014 (lih). (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Woodward Yang, Ph.D. re 144 Claim Construction Answering Brief by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 11/17/2014 (lih). (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] DECLARATION of Andrew T. Radsch re 144 Claim Construction Answering Brief by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N1-N10, # 2 Exhibit N11-N15, # 3 Exhibit N16-N18, # 4 Exhibit N19-N24)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 11/17/2014 (lih). (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 13-14) and Nikon Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF re 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 1, 7, 12, 26, and 28-29 of U.S. Patent No. 6,121,960 filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc., Sendai Nikon Corporation. (Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 10/31/2014 (lih). (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Responses to Nikon's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6, 9-12) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 1, 7, 12, 26, and 28-29 of U.S. Patent No. 6,121,960 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/30/2014. (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 10/21/2014 (lih). (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Michael J. Seals filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Sarah E. Waidelich re 137 Claim Construction Opening Brief by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P1, # 2 Exhibit P2, # 3 Exhibit P3)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 10/20/2014 (lih). (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Tim A. Williams re (134 in 1:11-cv-01025-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (221 in 1:13-cv-00473-SLR) Claim Construction Opening Brief by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 10/20/2014 (lih). (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Andrew C. Michaels re (134 in 1:11-cv-01025-SLR-SRF) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (221 in 1:13-cv-00473-SLR) Claim Construction Opening Brief by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Part 1 of 5, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Part 2 of 5, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Part 3 of 5, # 7 Exhibit 4 - Part 4 of 5, # 8 Exhibit 4 - Part 5 of 5, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 10/20/2014 (lih). (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 134 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF for the Wi-Fi Patents filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 10/20/2014 (lih). (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Joint APPENDIX of Patents at Issue and File Wrappers by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J7, # 2 Exhibit J8, # 3 Exhibit J9, # 4 Exhibit J10, # 5 Exhibit J11, # 6 Exhibit J12 - Part 1 of 2, # 7 Exhibit J12- Part 2 of 2, # 8 Exhibit J13, # 9 Exhibit J14 - Part 1 of 2, # 10 Exhibit J14 - Part 2 of 2, # 11 Exhibit J15, # 12 Exhibit J16 - Part 1 of 6, # 13 Exhibit J16 - Part 2 of 6, # 14 Exhibit J16 - Part 3 of 6, # 15 Exhibit J16 - Part 4 of 6, # 16 Exhibit J16 - Part 5 of 6, # 17 Exhibit J16 - Part 6 of 6)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 10/20/2014 (lih). (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Joint APPENDIX of Wi-Fi Patents at Issue and File Wrappers by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J1, # 2 Exhibit J2, # 3 Exhibit J3, # 4 Exhibit J4, # 5 Exhibit J5 - Part 1 of 11, # 6 Exhibit J5 - Part 2 of 11, # 7 Exhibit J5 - Part 3 of 11, # 8 Exhibit J5 - Part 4 of 11, # 9 Exhibit J5 - Part 5 of 11, # 10 Exhibit J5 - Part 6 of 11, # 11 Exhibit J5 - Part 7 of 11, # 12 Exhibit J5 - Part 8 of 11, # 13 Exhibit J5 - Part 9 of 11, # 14 Exhibit J5 - Part 10 of 11, # 15 Exhibit J5 - Part 11 of 11, # 16 Exhibit J6 - Part 1 of 2, # 17 Exhibit J6 - Part 2 of 2)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 10/20/2014 (lih). (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 13-14) and (ii) Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 68-81) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Infringement Charts filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                CLAIM Construction Chart by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER: The mediation scheduled for 10/8/14 at 10:00 AM with Judge Thynge is cancelled. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/6/14. (cak) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Michael J. Seals filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File the Joint Claim Construction Statement With Respect to U.S. Patent Nos. 5,712,870, 6,754,195, and 6,977,944 to October 7, 2014 - filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 1, 7, 12, 26, and 28-29 of U.S. Patent No. 6,121,960 - filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 10/7/2014 (lih). (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Claim Construction Briefs to October 17, 2014 (Opening Brief); November 14, 2014 (Answering Brief); December 3, 2014 (Reply Brief); and December 19, 2014 (Sur-reply Brief) - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Nikon's Discovery Dispute Letter - re 122 Letter. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Tiffany Geyer Lydon regarding Nikon's discovery issues for October 2 discovery dispute teleconference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION Seeking to Extend the Deadline by Which the Parties Must File Their Joint Claim Construction Statement, by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Balick, Steven) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Supplemental Disclosure of Sales Figures for Accused Products filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLAIM Construction Chart by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file the Joint Claim Construction Statement with respect to U.S. Patent Nos. 5,712,870, 6,754,195 and 6,977,944 to September 24, 2014 - filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Disputes - filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file the Joint Claim Construction Statement to September 19, 2014 - filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon's Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Defendants' First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 11-12) and Nikon Corporation's, Nikon Americas Inc.'s and Nikon Inc.'s Fourth Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(a), 26(e) and Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiffs' Responses to Nikon's Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 13-16) and (ii) Plaintiffs' Responses to Nikon's Fourth Set of Requests for Documents and Things filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER- A Second Discovery Review Hearing is set for 1/29/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/22/2014. (lih) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' First Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice to Nikon Corporation, Nikon Americas Inc., And Nikon Inc. filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Concerning Depositions in Japan. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/5/2014. (lih) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SO ORDERED- re 108 STIPULATION Concerning Depositions in Japan. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/5/2014. (lih) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION Concerning Depositions in Japan by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Corporation's, Nikon Americas Inc.'s and Nikon Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories to Intellectual Ventures (Nos. 13-16) and Nikon Corporation's, Nikon Americas Inc.'s and Nikon Inc.'s Fourth Set of Requests for Documents and Things to Intellectual Ventures (Nos. 67-82) filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nikon Corporation, Nikon Americas Inc., and Nikon Inc. on 9/8/2014 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Disclosure of Sales Figures for Accused Products filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION requesting that client representatives be excused from participating in the August 18, 2014 discovery review conference (D.I. 95), by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Balick, Steven) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoena to Arcsoft, Inc. filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to 72 Amended Complaint by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION regarding Defendants' Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 7/2/2014 (fms). (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 11-12) filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Request for the Production of Documents and Things filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Corporation's, Nikon Americas Inc.'s and Nikon Inc.'s Third Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1)(A), 26(e) and Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER- A Discovery Review Hearing is set for 8/18/2014 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/24/2014. (lih) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intellectual Ventures' Initial Disclosure of Damages Model filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoena to CSR plc filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Request for the Production of Documents and Things filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 10/8/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/11/14. (cak) (Main Document 90 replaced on 6/12/2014) (cak). (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey Seddon - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Xiao Li as co-counsel.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Nikon's Third Set of Requests for Documents and Things filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarah Waidelich - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Infringement Charts filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Setting Patent Scheduling Conference: An In-Person Scheduling Conference is set for 4/16/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/26/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to Counsel from Judge Robinson regarding changes to the way the Court processes patent cases. (nmfn) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Corporation's, Nikon Americas Inc.'s and Nikon Inc.'s Core Technical Documents filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: 72 Amended Complaint (Answer to Second Amended Complaint) by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Corporation's, Nikon Americas Inc.'s and Nikon Inc.'s Third Set of Requests for Documents and Things to Intellectual Ventures (Nos. 57-66) filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Defendants' First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-10) filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Identification of Accused Products and Initial Asserted Patent Claims filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the second amended complaint to March 3, 2014 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,121,960; US RE43,700 E; US 6,221,686 B1; US 6,979,587 B2; US 7,365,298 B2; US 6,754,195 B2; US 5,712,870; US 6,977,944 B2 . (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.- filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(fms) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and Order regarding Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 7/3/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 7/3/2014. Discovery due by 3/13/2015. A Discovery Conference is set for 1/21/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A 2nd Discovery Conference is set for 7/21/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A Status Conference is set for 9/4/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson Dispositive Motions due by 7/3/2015. An Oral Argument is set for 9/18/2015 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 4/10/2015. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 5/8/2015. Claim Construction Reply Brief due by 5/22/2015. Claim Construction Surreply Brief due by 6/5/2015. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/20/2016 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A Jury Trial is set for 2/8/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/20/2013. (nmfn) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION regarding Amending the Scheduling Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to 23 Amended Complaint, by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION regarding Defendants' Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 5/22/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/16/13. (cak) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Nikon's Second Set of Requests for Documents and Things by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Corporation's, Nikon Americas Inc.'s and Nikon Inc.'s Second Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(1)(a), 26(e) and Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard and Notice of Subpoena to Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline to move to amend the pleadings to 12/20/2013 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Corporation's, Nikon Americas Inc.'s and Nikon Inc.'s Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Intellectual Ventures (Nos. 46-56) by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Protective Order) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Balick, Steven) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiffs' Responses to Nikon's First Set of Interrogatories Nos. 1-12 and (ii) Plaintiffs' Responses to Nikon's First Set of Requests for Documents and Things by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-10) by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-48) by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon's First Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Corporation's, Nikon Americas Inc.'s and Nikon Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Documents and Things to Intellectual Ventures (Nos. 1-45) and Nikon Corporation's, Nikon Americas Inc.'s and Nikon Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Intellectual Ventures (Nos. 1-12) by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Request for the Production of Documents and Things by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon's Initial Invalidity Contentions by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Corporation's, Nikon Americas Inc.'s and Nikon Inc.'s First Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(a), 26(e) and Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard and Nikon Corporation's, Nikon Americas Inc.'s and Nikon Inc.'s Core Technical Document Production Pursuant to the Scheduling Order and Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for Nikon to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 12/16/2013 at 08:30 AM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/28/13. (cak) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(1) and Paragraph 3 Initial Disclosures; and (ii) Plaintiffs' Identification of Accused Products and Initial Asserted Patent Claims by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Nikon Corporation's, Nikon Americas Inc.'s and Nikon Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A) and Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiffs' counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 5/28/2013 at 11:30 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/15/13. (cak) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Counts II and V of the Amended Complaint by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 12/3/2013. Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/2013. Discovery due by 7/23/2014. A Discovery Conference is set for 12/4/2013 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A Status Conference is set for 2/19/2014 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson Dispositive Motions due by 11/19/2014. An Oral Argument on claim construction and motions for summary jgm is set for 2/4/2015 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 9/17/2014. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 10/1/2014. Claim Construction Reply Brief due by 10/8/2014. Claim Construction Surreply Brief due by 10/15/2014. A Pretrial Conference is set for 4/15/2015 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A Jury Trial is set for 4/29/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/14/2013. (fms) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/9/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/17/2013. (nmfn) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nikon Americas Inc. for Nikon Inc.; Corporate Parent Nikon Corporation for Nikon Americas Inc.; Corporate Parent None for Corporate Parent or other affiliates for Nikon Corporation.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER to 23 Amended Complaint, by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 25 Motion to Dismiss as to personal jurisdiction ; granting 28 Motion to Dismiss as to joint infringement. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/1/2013. (nmfn) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/1/2013. (nmfn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/1/2013. (nmfn) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Justin P.D. Wilcox - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY BRIEF re 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Motion to Dismiss Amended Claims of Induced and Joint Infringement) filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY BRIEF re 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person or in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims for Induced and Joint Infringement filed by Sendai Nikon Corporation. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 34 Answering Brief in Opposition, of John Spaccarotella by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person or in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims for Induced and Joint Infringement filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/5/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 32 Answering Brief in Opposition, of John Spaccarotella by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Motion to Dismiss Amended Claims of Induced and Joint Infringement) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/5/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs to respond to Motions to Dismiss (D.I. 25 and D.I. 28) to 3/26/2012 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs to respond to Motions to Dismiss (D.I. 25 and D.I. 28) to 3/23/2012 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Motion to Dismiss Amended Claims of Induced and Joint Infringement) filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/22/2012. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Motion to Dismiss Amended Claims of Induced and Joint Infringement) - filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 26 Opening Brief in Support, (Declaration of Jiro Saito) by Sendai Nikon Corporation. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person or in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims for Induced and Joint Infringement filed by Sendai Nikon Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/22/2012. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person or in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims for Induced and Joint Infringement - filed by Sendai Nikon Corporation. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to March 5, 2012 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Corporation, Nikon Inc., Sendai Nikon Corporation. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Inc., Sendai Nikon Corporation, Nikon Corporation- filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION Extending Deadline to Amend Complaint by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs to file their Answering Briefs to: (i) Motion of Defendants Nikon Inc. and Nikon Amercias Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Induced and Joint Infringement (D.I. 14); and (ii) Motion of Defendants Sendai Nikon Corporation and Nikon Imaging Japan Inc. to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Induced and Joint Infringement (D.I. 16) to 2/10/2012 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John M. Desmarais, Alan S. Kellman, John C. Spaccarotella, Jonas R. McDavit, and Xiao Li of Desmarais LLP - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 17 Opening Brief in Support, (Declaration of Jiro Saito) by Nikon Imaging Japan Inc., Sendai Nikon Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 English Translation of Declaration)(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 17 Opening Brief in Support, (Declaration of Takao Nishioka) by Nikon Imaging Japan Inc., Sendai Nikon Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 English Translation of Declaration)(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person (or in the alternative, to dismiss induced and joint infringement claims) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person (or in the alternative, to dismiss induced and joint infringement claims) filed by Nikon Imaging Japan Inc., Sendai Nikon Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/3/2012. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person (or in the alternative, to dismiss induced and joint infringement claims) - filed by Nikon Imaging Japan Inc., Sendai Nikon Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPENING BRIEF in Support re 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Induced and Joint Infringement Claims) filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/3/2012. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Induced and Joint Infringement Claims) - filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jesse J. Jenner, Laurence S. Rogers, Hiroyuki Hagiwara, Stuart W. Yothers, and Andrew Radsch - filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Imaging Japan Inc., Nikon Inc., Sendai Nikon Corporation. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Nikon Imaging Japan Inc.. (fms) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Sendai Nikon Corporation. (fms) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the complaint to January 16, 2012 - filed by Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Imaging Japan Inc., Nikon Inc., Sendai Nikon Corporation. (Balick, Steven) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 8 Disclosure Statement by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint sent via Registered Mail pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(2)(C)(ii). Clerk's Office cover letter and Postal Receipts attached. (lid) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni re 5 Praecipe regarding service pursuant to Rule 4(f)(2)(C)(ii) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (lid) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRAECIPE filed by Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni on behalf of Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC requesting Clerk to issue Rule 4(f)(2)(C)(ii) service on Sendai Nikon Corporation and Nikon Imaging Japan Inc.. (lid) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. Nikon Americas Inc. served on 10/27/2011, answer due 11/17/2011. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,121,960; US 6,181,836 B1; US 6,221,686 B1; US 6,979,587 B2; US 7,733,368 B2;. (dmp, ) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dmp, ) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Nikon Americas Inc., Nikon Imaging Japan Inc., Nikon Inc., Sendai Nikon Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 311-965427.) - filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, ) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 392 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?