Tomlinson v. Travelzoo Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-05531
District Judge George B. Daniels, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Douglas Tomlinson, Plaintiff

Represented by Kahn Gauthier Swick, LLC

Represented by Kahn Swick & Foti LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kim Elaine Miller +1 212 696 3730 +1 504 455 1498 kim.miller@ksfcounsel.com
No Logo Judy Wang, Plaintiff

Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ira Harwood +1 212 935 7400 +1 212 753 3630 rharwood@whesq.com

Represented by The Weiser Law Firm PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE BRETT DAVID STECKER +1 610 225 2677 +1 610 225 2678 bds@weiserlawfirm.com
No Logo Local 30, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Plaintiff

Represented by Kirby McInerney LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ira Michael Press +1 212 317 2300 +1 212 751 2540 ipress@kmslaw.com
v.
No Logo Christopher J. Loughlin, Defendant

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay B. Kasner , +1 212 735 2628 +1 917 777 2628 Jay.Kasner@skadden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SCOTT DAVID MUSOFF +1 212 735 7852 +1 917 777 7852 scott.musoff@skadden.com
No Logo Kelly Urso, Defendant

Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Selim Hakki +1 212 848 4924 +1 646 848 4924 ahakki@shearman.com
No Logo Ralph Bartel, Defendant

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay B. Kasner , +1 212 735 2628 +1 917 777 2628 Jay.Kasner@skadden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SCOTT DAVID MUSOFF +1 212 735 7852 +1 917 777 7852 scott.musoff@skadden.com
No Logo Travelzoo, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay B. Kasner , +1 212 735 2628 +1 917 777 2628 Jay.Kasner@skadden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SCOTT DAVID MUSOFF +1 212 735 7852 +1 917 777 7852 scott.musoff@skadden.com
No Logo Wayne Lee, Defendant

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay B. Kasner , +1 212 735 2628 +1 917 777 2628 Jay.Kasner@skadden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SCOTT DAVID MUSOFF +1 212 735 7852 +1 917 777 7852 scott.musoff@skadden.com
No Logo Holly Robbins, Movant

Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

No Logo Michael Robbins, Movant

Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

No Logo Steamfittters Local 449 Pension Fund, Movant

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

No Logo Travelzoo Investors Group, Movant

Represented by Kahn Swick & Foti LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kim Elaine Miller +1 212 696 3730 +1 504 455 1498 kim.miller@ksfcounsel.com
No Logo Jan Frazer, Lead Plaintiff

Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Uri Seth Ottensoser +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 ottensoser@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com
No Logo Michele Minnick, Lead Plaintiff

Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Uri Seth Ottensoser +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 ottensoser@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 61 Notice of Appeal filed by Michele Minnick, Jan Frazer USCA Case Number 13-1652. The parties have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 42.1. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 09/24/2013. (nd) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
    TRUE COPY ORDER of USCA as to 61 Notice of Appeal filed by Michele Minnick, Jan Frazer USCA Case Number 13-1652. The parties have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 42.1. The Stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 7/12/2013. (nd) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE: This action shall be dismissed without prejudice; and each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/7/2013) (ja) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF APPEAL from 59 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,, 60 Clerk's Judgment,. Document filed by Jan Frazer, Michele Minnick. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 60 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
          CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated March 29, 2013, Defendants' motions to dismiss are granted and the Consolidated and Amended Class Action Complaint is dismissed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 3/29/13) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-05531-GBD, 1:11-cv-06845-GBD(ml) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
            LREF
            Blank 59 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: Lead Plaintiffs Michele Minnick and Jan Frazer ("Plaintiffs") bring this consolidated class action on behalf of all those who purchased securities of Travelzoo Inc. ("Travelzoo") between March 16, 2011 and July 21, 2011 (the "Class Period"), against Travelzoo and several of its officers and board members (collectively, "Defendants") for securities law violations. Plaintiffs allege that Defendants violated Sections 10(b) (and Rule 10b-5 promulgated thereunder) and 20(a) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 by making materially misleading statements and omitting crucial facts about the impact of Travelzoo's newly-launched Local Deals Getaways ("Getaways") business on the company's core business growth and revenues. Defendants move to dismiss the Consolidated and Amended Class Action Complaint ("CAC") for failure to state a claim pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Section 9(b) of the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995 ("PSLRA"). Defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED. The Consolidated and Amended Class Action Complaint is DISMISSED. re: (44 in 1:11-cv-05531-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated and Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Kelly Urso, (41 in 1:11-cv-05531-GBD) MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated And Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Wayne Lee, Travelzoo Inc., Ralph Bartel, Christopher J. Loughlin. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/29/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-05531-GBD, 1:11-cv-06845-GBD(sac) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNCE proceeding held on 6/20/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-05531-GBD, 1:11-cv-06845-GBD(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNCE held on 6/20/2012 before Judge George B. Daniels. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/24/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-05531-GBD, 1:11-cv-06845-GBD(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNCE proceeding held on 6/20/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-05531-GBD, 1:11-cv-06845-GBD(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNCE held on 6/20/2012 before Judge George B. Daniels. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/20/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/30/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-05531-GBD, 1:11-cv-06845-GBD(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Scott D. Musoff dated 5/9/2012 re: counsel for Movant Travelzoo, Inc. and certain individual defendants respectfully requests that oral argument be scheduled for June 20, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: The oral argument is rescheduled to June 20, 2012 at 10:00 a.m.., ( Oral Argument set for 6/20/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/10/2012) (pl) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER: The May 10, 2012 oral argument in this matter is rescheduled to May 24, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. Oral Argument set for 5/24/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/30/2012) (rdz) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 52 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 41 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated And Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Ralph Bartel, Wayne Lee, Christopher J. Loughlin, Travelzoo Inc.. (Kasner, Jay) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                            DECLARATION of Joanna Shally in Support re: 44 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated and Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Kelly Urso. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Shally, Joanna) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 44 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated and Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Kelly Urso. (Hakki, Adam) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Scott D. Musoff dated 4/26/2012 re: counsel for defendants respectfully write to request, pursuant to Rule 2(C) of Your Honor's Individual Practices, an enlargement of the page limit from 10 to 14 pages for Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/27/2012) (pl) Modified on 4/27/2012 (pl). (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 48 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 44 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated and Amended Class Action Complaint., 41 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated And Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Michele Minnick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit INTRA-DAY TRADING CHART)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Joseph R. Seidman, Jr. dated 4/4/2012 re: Due to a scheduling conflict with the partner on the case, we respectfully request a one week extension of time, to April 11, 2012, to file a single 35-page omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to both of Defendants' Motions. Defendants do not object to these requests. In light of Lead Plaintiffs' proposed one-week extension, Defendants request that the due date for their reply memorandum be moved from April 26, 2012 to April 30, 2012. The current hearing date of May 10, 2012 would not be changed. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/4/2012) (djc) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                      DECLARATION of Joanna Shally in Support re: 44 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated and Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Kelly Urso. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Shally, Joanna) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 44 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated and Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Kelly Urso. (Hakki, Adam) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                          MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated and Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Kelly Urso.(Hakki, Adam) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                            DECLARATION of Scott D. Musoff in Support re: 41 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated And Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Ralph Bartel, Wayne Lee, Christopher J. Loughlin, Travelzoo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Kasner, Jay) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 41 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated And Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Ralph Bartel, Wayne Lee, Christopher J. Loughlin, Travelzoo Inc.. (Kasner, Jay) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated And Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Ralph Bartel, Wayne Lee, Christopher J. Loughlin, Travelzoo Inc.. Return Date set for 5/10/2012 at 10:00 AM.(Kasner, Jay) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jay B. Kasner dated 3/1/12 re: Counsel for Travelzoo, Inc. and certain individual defendants writes on behalf of Shearman & Sterling LLP as well, to request: With respect to the securities action (11 CV 5531), their clients request permission to file a single, 35-page opening memorandum of law in support of their motion to dismiss due on March 5, 2012. With respect to the derivative action (11 CV 6125), the (i) Company and other defendants we represent respectfully request permission to file a single, 35-page opening memorandum of law in support of their motion to dismiss, and (ii) the Audit Committee directors represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP respectfully request permission to file a single, 35-page opening memorandum of law in support of their motion. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/5/2012) (mro) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Ralph Bartel, Wayne Lee, Christopher J. Loughlin, Travelzoo Inc., Kelly Urso with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jan Frazer, Michele Minnick. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Douglas Tomlinson. (Attachments: # 1 part 2)(lmb) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Scott D. Musoff dated 11/15/2011 re: Pursuant to the Court's direction at the November 8, 2011conference, we write on behalf of all parties in the above-referenced matters' to respectfully submit proposed orders of consolidation for the Securities Action and the Derivative Action as well as a proposed briefing schedule for defendants' anticipated motions to dismiss or other response to the consolidated amended complaints. The parties respectfully propose the following briefing schedule, which in light of plaintiffs' request for sixty days to file consolidated amended complaints in the Securities Action and the Derivative Action so that they can complete their investigation. goes beyond the April 3, 2012 oral argument date tentatively scheduled by the Court. Plaintiffs request 60 days within which to file their complaints because they believe it is necessary for a thorough investigation. l. Lead Plaintiff in the Securities Action and Lead Counsel in the Derivative Action shall have until and including January 6, 2012 to file and serve consolidated amended complaints; 2. Defendants shall answer, move or otherwise respond with respect to the consolidated amended complaints by March 5, 2012; 3. Lead Plaintiff in the Securities Action and Lead Counsel in the Derivative Action shall file and serve oppositions to Defendants' motions by April 4, 2012; and 4. Defendants shall file and serve any reply papers by April 26, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. The oral argument is scheduled for May 10, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. ( Amended Pleadings due by 1/6/2012, Motions due by 3/5/2012, Responses due by 4/4/2012, Replies due by 4/26/2012.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/12/2011) (djc) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED CASES, APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVE LEAD COUNSEL granting (13) Motion to Consolidate Cases 1:11-cv-5531 (as Lead Case) with 1:11-cv-6845; denying (13) Motion to Appoint; granting (13) Motion to Appoint Counsel; in case 1:11-cv-05531-GBD. The above-captioned putative securities actions pending in this Judicial District are hereby consolidated for all purposes pursuant to the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, 15 U.S.C. § 78u-4, and Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The docket number for the Master File shall be Master File No. 11- cv-05531 (GBD). All counsel shall assist the Clerk of the Court by calling to the attention of the Clerk the filing or transfer of any case which might properly be consolidated with these Consolidated Actions. Every pleading filed in these Consolidated Actions shall bear the following caption: In re TravelZoo Inc. Securities Litigation. Purported class members Michele Minnick and Jan Fraser are hereby appointed as Lead Plaintiffs. Lead plaintiffs' selection of Bernstein Liebhard LLP as lead counsel ("Lead Counsel") is approved. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/23/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-05531-GBD, 1:11-cv-06845-GBD(tro) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 34 Motion for Jeffrey J. Ciarlanto to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Jeffrey J. Ciarlanto is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Judy Wang. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/7/2011) (mro) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 33 Motion for Brett D. Stecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Brett D. Stecker is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Judy Wang. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/7/2011) (mro) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Jeffrey J. Ciarlanto to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Judy Wang.(bwa) (pgu). (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Brett D. Stecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Judy Wang.(wb) (pgu). (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  RESPONSE in Support re: 19 MOTION to Appoint IUOE Local 30 Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Local 30, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO. (Press, Ira) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 11-cv-6845. MOTION to Appoint Travelzoo Investors Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel., 16 MOTION to Appoint Michele Minnick and Jan Frazer to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel., 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Local 30, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO. (Press, Ira) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 16 MOTION to Appoint Michele Minnick and Jan Frazer to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel.. Document filed by Jan Frazer, Michele Minnick. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        RESPONSE in Support re: 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 11-cv-6845. MOTION to Appoint Travelzoo Investors Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel.. Document filed by Travelzoo Investors Group. (Miller, Kim) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re: 19 MOTION to Appoint IUOE Local 30 Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 11-cv-6845. MOTION to Appoint Travelzoo Investors Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel., 9 MOTION to Appoint Michael Robbins and Holly Robbins to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., 16 MOTION to Appoint Michele Minnick and Jan Frazer to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel., 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Ralph Bartel, Wayne Lee, Christopher J. Loughlin, Travelzoo Inc.. (Kasner, Jay) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Response in Support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion. Document filed by Holly Robbins, Michael Robbins. (Ban, William) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              RESPONSE in Support re: 9 MOTION to Appoint Michael Robbins and Holly Robbins to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Holly Robbins, Michael Robbins. (Ban, William) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER: A conference in the above captioned matters will be held November 8, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. ( Status Conference set for 11/8/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/14/2011) (lmb) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Ralph Bartel, Wayne Lee, Christopher J. Loughlin, Travelzoo Inc. (Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Travelzoo Inc..(Kasner, Jay) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay B. Kasner on behalf of Ralph Bartel, Wayne Lee, Christopher J. Loughlin, Travelzoo Inc. (Kasner, Jay) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Ira M. Press in Support re: 19 MOTION to Appoint IUOE Local 30 Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Local 30, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Lead Plaintiff Press Release, # 2 Exhibit Certification, # 3 Exhibit Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit Firm Resume)(Press, Ira) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 19 MOTION to Appoint IUOE Local 30 Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Local 30, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO. (Press, Ira) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION to Appoint IUOE Local 30 Funds to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Local 30, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO.(Press, Ira) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              DECLARATION of Joseph R. Seidman, Jr. in Support re: 16 MOTION to Appoint Michele Minnick and Jan Frazer to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel.. Document filed by Jan Frazer, Michele Minnick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 16 MOTION to Appoint Michele Minnick and Jan Frazer to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel.. Document filed by Jan Frazer, Michele Minnick. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Michele Minnick and Jan Frazer to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Document filed by Michele Minnick, Jan Frazer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Kim E. Miller in Support re: 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 11-cv-6845. MOTION to Appoint Travelzoo Investors Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel.. Document filed by Travelzoo Investors Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Miller, Kim) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 11-cv-6845. MOTION to Appoint Travelzoo Investors Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel.. Document filed by Travelzoo Investors Group. (Miller, Kim) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION to Consolidate Cases 11-cv-6845., MOTION to Appoint Travelzoo Investors Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Document filed by Travelzoo Investors Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Kim) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Holly Robbins, Michael Robbins. (Ban, William) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Daniel E. Bacine in Support re: 9 MOTION to Appoint Michael Robbins and Holly Robbins to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Holly Robbins, Michael Robbins. (Ban, William) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION to Appoint Michael Robbins and Holly Robbins to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Holly Robbins, Michael Robbins. (Ban, William) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION to Appoint Michael Robbins and Holly Robbins to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Michael Robbins, Holly Robbins.(Ban, William) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Mario Alba Jr. in Support re: 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Steamfittters Local 449 Pension Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Notice, # 2 Exhibit B - Loss chart, # 3 Exhibit C - Cert, # 4 Exhibit D - Robbins Geller firm bio)(Alba, Mario) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Steamfittters Local 449 Pension Fund. (Alba, Mario) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Counsel., MOTION to Appoint Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Steamfittters Local 449 Pension Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order)(Alba, Mario) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Robert B. Weiser in Support re: 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 11-cv-6378, 11-cv-7019 and 11-cv-05531. MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead and Liasion Counsel.. Document filed by Judy Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Weiser Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Weiser Declaration)(Harwood, Robert) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 11-cv-6378, 11-cv-7019 and 11-cv-05531. MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead and Liasion Counsel.. Document filed by Judy Wang. (Harwood, Robert) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Consolidate Cases 11-cv-6378, 11-cv-7019 and 11-cv-05531., MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead and Liasion Counsel. Document filed by Judy Wang.(Harwood, Robert) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/8/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 21D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/12/2011) (js) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Ralph Bartel, Wayne Lee, Christopher J. Loughlin, Travelzoo Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 13611)Document filed by Douglas Tomlinson.(ama) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 249 times.

                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?