Silvercreek Mgt Inc v. Citigroup Inc Case has been remanded to Southern District of New York.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:03-cv-00815
District Judge Melinda Harmon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 3:37 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Plaintiff

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

No Logo Onyx Industrial Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Adam Prussin +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 HAPrussin@Pomlaw.Com
No Logo Pebble Limited Partnership, Plaintiff

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

No Logo Peeble Limited Partnership, Plaintiff

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Adam Prussin +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 HAPrussin@Pomlaw.Com
No Logo Silvercreek Ii Limited, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Adam Prussin +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 HAPrussin@Pomlaw.Com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sperling & Slater PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce S. Sperling +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 bss@sperling-law.com
No Logo Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Adam Prussin +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 HAPrussin@Pomlaw.Com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sperling & Slater PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce S. Sperling +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 bss@sperling-law.com
No Logo Silvercreek Management Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Carducci

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Adam Prussin +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 HAPrussin@Pomlaw.Com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sperling & Slater PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce S. Sperling +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 bss@sperling-law.com
v.
No Logo Andersen Co, Defendant
No Logo Andersen LLP, Defendant
No Logo Andersen Worldwide, Societe Cooperative, Defendant
No Logo Andrew S Fastow, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Andersen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Jacquin +1 415 358 3501 djacquin@nptadvisors.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo Arthur Andersen-Brazil, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Andersen-Puerto Rico, Defendant
Bank of America Corporation Bank of America Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bank of America Corp"
Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Capital Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua J. Fritsch

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Abrams +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 babrams@BlankRome.com
Barclays PLC Barclays PLC, Defendant
Unknown Role, Imperial Holly Corp
Unknown Role, Jcg Inc
Unknown Role, Candie's, Inc.
Unknown Role, Eott Energy LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua J. Fritsch

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Abrams +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 babrams@BlankRome.com
No Logo Benjamin S Neuhasen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo C E Andrews, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo Charles A LeMaistre, Defendant
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Chippac, Inc.
Unknown Role, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Unknown Role, Citibank, NA
Unknown Role, Keane, Inc.
Unknown Role, Macdermid Inc.
Unknown Role, CITICORP
Unknown Role, Imc Mortgage Co
Unknown Role, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Unknown Role, Pfs Services Inc
Unknown Role, Citicorp Banking Corp
Unknown Role, Intersil Holding Co
Unknown Role, Citigroup Holdings Co
Unknown Role, Cvc Partners LLC
Unknown Role, Ness Technologies Inc
Unknown Role, Primerica, Inc.
Unknown Role, Student Loan Corp
Unknown Role, Pacholder Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Salomon Inc
Unknown Role, Jones Energy, Inc.

Represented by Wilshire & Scott

Credit Suisse First Boston LLC Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence David Finder +1 713 547 2006 +1 713 236 5520 lawrence.finder@haynesboone.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence David Finder +1 713 547 2006 +1 713 236 5520 lawrence.finder@haynesboone.com
Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Danny D Rudloff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo David B Duncan, Defendant
No Logo David Michael C Odom, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rusty Hardin and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Hardin, Jr. +1 713 652 9000 +1 713 652 9800

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo David Stephen Goddard, Jr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rusty Hardin and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Hardin, Jr. +1 713 652 9000 +1 713 652 9800

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo Debra A Cash, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rusty Hardin and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Hardin, Jr. +1 713 652 9000 +1 713 652 9800

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo Deutsche Banc Alex. Brown Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenstein Fist & Ringold

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric D Wade +1 918 585 9211 +1 918 583 5617 ericw@rfrlaw.com
Deutsche Bank AG Deutsche Bank AG, Defendant
Unknown Role, Nrp, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sherwood Group, Inc.,
Unknown Role, Briazz, Inc.
Unknown Role, Dsl.net, Inc.
Unknown Role, Blockbuster, Inc.
Unknown Role, Korea Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Brazil Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Solv Ex Corp
Unknown Role, Newmark Homes Corp
Unknown Role, Comple Tel Europe Nv
Unknown Role, Doblique Inc
Unknown Role, Mesa Airlines Inc
Unknown Role, Emerson Radio Corp
Unknown Role, Emachines Inc /de/
Unknown Role, Rreef America L.l.c.
Unknown Role, Id Arizona Corp.

Toggle Switch Represented by Linklaters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Byrne +1 212 903 9000 +1 212 903 9100 larry.byrne@linklaters.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenstein Fist & Ringold

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric D Wade +1 918 585 9211 +1 918 583 5617 ericw@rfrlaw.com
No Logo Donald Dreyfuss, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo Estate of Kenneth Lay, Defendant
No Logo Frank A Savage, Defendant
No Logo Gary B Goolsby, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo Gregory W Hale, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo Herbert S Winoker, Jr, Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "J P Morgan Chase & Co"

Represented by Mithoff Law Firm

JPMorgan Securities, Inc. JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, CHEMICAL BANKING CORP
Unknown Role, Peloton Resources Inc

Represented by Mithoff Law Firm

No Logo James A Friedlieb, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo Jeffrey K Skilling, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon M. Barrett +1 202 383 5308 +1 202 383 5414 sbarrett@omm.com
No Logo Jerome J Meyer, Defendant
No Logo Joe H Foy, Defendant
No Logo John A Urquhart, Defendant
No Logo John E Sorrells, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo JOHN E. STEWART, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo John H Duncan, Defendant
No Logo John Mendelsohn, Defendant
No Logo John V Derrick, Jr, Defendant
No Logo John Wakeham, Defendant
No Logo Joseph F Berardino, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth L Harrison, Defendant
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L Lay"
Kirkland & Ellis LLP Kirkland & Ellis LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kirkland & Ellis"
Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc. Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch & Co"
No Logo MICHAEL D. JONES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo Michael L Bennett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo Michael M Lowther, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rusty Hardin and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Hardin, Jr. +1 713 652 9000 +1 713 652 9800

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo Norman P Blake, Defendant
No Logo Paulo V Ferraz Pereira, Defendant
No Logo Pershing LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence David Finder +1 713 547 2006 +1 713 236 5520 lawrence.finder@haynesboone.com
No Logo Philip A Randall, Defendant
No Logo Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche, Defendant
No Logo Richard Buy, Defendant
No Logo Richard Causey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tekell, Book, Matthews & Limmer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Robert Mace +1 713 222 9542 +1 713 655 7727 bmace@tekellbook.com
No Logo Richard R Petersen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo Robert A Belfer, Defendant
No Logo Robert K Jaedicke, Defendant
No Logo Roger D Willard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rusty Hardin and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Hardin, Jr. +1 713 652 9000 +1 713 652 9800

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo Roman W McAlindon, Defendant
No Logo Ronnie C Chan, Defendant
No Logo Thomas H Bauer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rusty Hardin and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Hardin, Jr. +1 713 652 9000 +1 713 652 9800

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo Vinson & Elkins LLP, Defendant
No Logo Wendy L Gramm, Defendant
No Logo William E Swanson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (193) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Other Notice
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Remand
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Reset
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 177 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Lawrence David Finder terminated.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(amwilliams, 4) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 172 Motion to Substitute Attorney.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins, 4) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 173 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ruth E. Harlow.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins, 4) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                              STATUS REPORT by Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek Management Inc, filed.(Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney H Adam Prussin re: 167 Order of Dismissal, filed. (mmapps, 4) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Stanley M Grossman as to Silvercreek Management Inc re: 167 Order of Dismissal, filed. (ccarnew, 3) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jacalyn D Scott re: 167 Order of Dismissal, filed. (sgonzalez, 5) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 166 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of JPMorgan Securities, Inc. and JP Morgan Chase & Co. and Bar Order (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rvazquez) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of JPMorgan Securities, Inc. and JP Morgan Chase & Co. and Bar Order by Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek Management Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/24/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Stanley M Grossman as to Silvercreek Management Inc re: 160 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (vcantu, 5) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                            Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Stanley M Grossman as to Silvercreek Limited Partnership re: 160 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (hler, 4)Re-noticed to new address. (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                              Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Stanley M Grossman as to Silvercreek Management Inc re: 160 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (hler, 4)Re-noticed to new address. (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Stanley M Grossman as to Silvercreek Management Inc re: 160 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (hler, 4)Address updated for Mr Grossman. (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney H Adam Prussin as to Silvercreek Management Inc re: 160 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (hler, 4) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 159 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard Warren Mithoff, Jr terminated.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rvazquez) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Richard Warren Mithoff to Withdraw as Attorney by J P Morgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/28/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mithoff, Richard) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        STATUS REPORT by Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek Management Inc, filed.(Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 157 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER. Status Report due within thirty days(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rvazquez) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 156 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from jscott@wsd-law.com on the account of Jacalyn D Scott. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 155 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Lawrence Byrne, counsel for Deutsche Bank AG, filed. (Byrne, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 154 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL AS TO BARCLAYS PLC AND BARCLAYS CAPITAL AND BAR ORDER granting 153 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re:, Barclay's Capital Inc and Barclay's PLC terminated(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: by Barclay's Capital Inc, Barclay's PLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order of Final Judgment and Dismissal)(Abrams, Barry) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 151 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 151 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Motions to Reopen Discovery by Barclay's Capital Inc, Barclay's PLC, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Banc Alex Brown Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, J P Morgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co, Pershing LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/21/2012. (Volker, Odean) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 150 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        REPLY Memorandum in Further Support to Deutsche Bank's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Docket No. 121), filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Wade, Eric) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 149 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPLY in Support of 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,, filed by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Pershing LLC. (Volker, Odean) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 148 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            REPLY in Support of 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,, filed by Barclay's Capital Inc, Barclay's PLC. (Abrams, Barry) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 147 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY in Support of 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,, filed by J P Morgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc.. (Youngwood, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                Joint REPLY in Support of 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,, filed by Barclay's Capital Inc, Barclay's PLC, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Banc Alex Brown Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, J P Morgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co, Pershing LLC. (Volker, Odean) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting 144 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Barclay's Capital Inc, Barclay's PLC, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Banc Alex Brown Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, J P Morgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co, Pershing LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/8/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Volker, Odean) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 143 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Opposition to Bank Defendants' Motions To Dismiss re: 140 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, 142 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, by Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek Management Inc, filed. (Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Corrected RESPONSE in Opposition to 135 MOTION to Dismiss 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,, Memorandum of Law in Support of Deutsche Bank's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Docket # 121) MOTION to Dismiss 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,, Memorandum of Law in Support of Deutsche Bank's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Docket # 121) MOTION to Dismiss 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,, Memorandum of Law in Support of Deutsche Bank's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Docket # 121), 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,, filed by Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek Management Inc. (Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Scott F. Hessell re: 140 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, filed.(Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition to 135 MOTION to Dismiss 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,, Memorandum of Law in Support of Deutsche Bank's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Docket # 121) MOTION to Dismiss 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,, Memorandum of Law in Support of Deutsche Bank's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Docket # 121) MOTION to Dismiss 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,, Memorandum of Law in Support of Deutsche Bank's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Docket # 121), 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,, filed by Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek Management Inc. (Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting 138 Motion to Amend.Pltf's responses to mtns to dismiss due by 12/05/11; Replies by 01/20/12; the Court will attempt to rule on the motions by 02/20/12. if appropriate, other motions, such as motions to reopen discovery shll be filed by 03/01/12 with responses by 03/21/12 and replies by 03/28/12. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 138 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION to Amend 127 Order,, by Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek Management Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/25/2011. (Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 137 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  JOINDER in 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,, Notice of Joinder and Joinder in Financial Institutions' Motions to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint (Docket No. 121), filed by Jeffrey K Skilling. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 121 Complaint,, by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed.(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,, Memorandum of Law in Support of Deutsche Bank's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Docket # 121) by Deutsche Bank AG, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/18/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Kiah Beverly-Graham in Support of Memorandum of Law in Support of Deutsche Bank's Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint (Docket #121), # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Wade, Eric) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Jonathan K. Youngwood in Support of JPMorgan Chase's Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (with Certificate of Service) re: 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Youngwood, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (with Certificate of Service) re: 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,, by Barclay's Capital Inc, Barclay's PLC, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua Fritsch)(Fritsch, Joshua) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 132 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (with Certificate of Service) re: 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,, by J P Morgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., filed.(Youngwood, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 131 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM re: 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,, by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Pershing LLC, filed.(Volker, Odean) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Joint MEMORANDUM in Support re: 129 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,, by Barclay's Capital Inc, Barclay's PLC, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Banc Alex Brown Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, J P Morgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co, Pershing LLC, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Odean Volker and Exhibit 1)(Volker, Odean) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Dismiss 121 Complaint,, by Barclay's Capital Inc, Barclay's PLC, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Banc Alex Brown Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, J P Morgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co, Pershing LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/18/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Volker, Odean) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 128 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 121 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Richard Causey, filed.(Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to the conference on 09/16/11, the Court ORDERS that the following new deadlines relating to the pltf's 121 Third Amended Complaint are in effect. Financial Institution defts' motion to dismiss by 09/27/11; individual defts' responsive pleadings by 09/30/11; Pltfs' responses to motions to dismiss by 11/14/11; Defts' replies by 12/09/11. The Court will attempt to resolve these motions by 01/16/12. If appropriate, tother motions, such as motions to reopen discovery, shall be filed by 01/30/12; Responses to these motions due by 02/20/12; Replies by 02/27/12.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 9/16/2011. Motions to be dismissed to be filed by 09/27/11; responses by 11/14/11; replies by 12/09/11. The Court anticipates ruling by 01/16/12. With reopening discovery, discovery motions are due by 01/30/12. Responses by 02/20/12 and replies by 02/27/12. (Scheduling Order to issue.) Appearances: See Attached For Appearances.(Court Reporter: Fred Warner), filed.(htippen, ) (htippen, ). (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 124 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 9/30/2011.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Third Amended Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 123 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 122 Motion for Extension of Time to move to dismiss or answer Silvercreek Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Answer due by 9/27/2011.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(arrivera, ) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss or Answer the Silvercreek Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Barclay's Capital Inc, Barclay's PLC, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Banc Alex Brown Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, J P Morgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co, Pershing LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/16/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Volker, Odean) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Barclay's Capital Inc, Barclay's PLC, Richard Buy, Richard Causey, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, John V Derrick, Jr, Deutsche Banc Alex Brown Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, Estate of Kenneth Lay, Andrew S Fastow, J P Morgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Kenneth L Lay, Merrill Lynch & Co, Pershing LLC, Jeffrey K Skilling filed by Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek Management Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A to C, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits D to E, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 120 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 109 Motion to Lift Stay; granting 109 Motion to Amend; granting 109 Motion for Hearing( Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon).(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 118 Agreed MOTION for Joel Androphy to Withdraw as Attorney, Attorney Joel M Androphy terminated.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Joel Androphy to Withdraw as Attorney by Deutsche Banc Alex Brown Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion by Berg & Androphy to Withdraw)(Wade, Eric) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Wade and Daniel K. Hedges on behalf of Deutsche Banc Alex Brown Inc, filed. (Wade, Eric) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 114 MOTION for Joshua J. Fritsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice,.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Support of 109 MOTION to Lift Stay MOTION to Amend MOTION for Status Hearing, filed by Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek Management Inc. (Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Joshua J. Fritsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barclay's Capital Inc, Barclay's PLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/18/2010. (Abrams, Barry) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 112 Motion for Leave to File Reply.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek Management Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/12/2010. (Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 109 MOTION to Lift Stay MOTION to Amend MOTION for Status Hearing, filed by Barclay's Capital Inc, Barclay's PLC, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Banc Alex Brown Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, J P Morgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co, Pershing LLC. (Abrams, Barry) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 109 MOTION to Lift Stay MOTION to Amend MOTION for Status Hearing filed by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Pershing LLC. (Volker, Odean) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Lift Stay, MOTION to Amend ( Motion Docket Date 7/16/2010.), MOTION for Status Hearing by Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek Management Inc, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Proposed 3d Am Compl, # 2 Continuation Ex. A to 3d Am Compl., # 3 Continuation Ex. B to 3d Am Compl., # 4 Continuation Ex. C to 3d Am Compl., # 5 Continuation Ex. D to 3d Am Compl., # 6 Continuation Ex. E to 3d Am Compl., # 7 Continuation Ex. F to 3d Am Compl., # 8 Continuation Ex. G to 3d Am Compl., # 9 Continuation Ex. H to 3d Am Compl., # 10 Continuation Ex. I to 3d Am Compl., # 11 Exhibit 2: Proposed Order)(Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 105 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(esmith, ) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 104 Bruce Sperling's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(dgould) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 103 Scott Hessell's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(dgould) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Eugene J. Frett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/19/2009. (Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Bruce S. Sperling to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/19/2009. (Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Scott F. Hessell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/19/2009. (Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 101 Agreed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Sperling & Slater, P.C. in place of Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy ; Agreed MOTION for Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy to Withdraw as Attorney, Attorney Bruce S. Sperling for Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership and Silvercreek II Limited added Attorney Aron K Liang and Steven Noel Williams terminated.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Sperling & Slater, P.C. in place of Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, Agreed MOTION for Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy to Withdraw as Attorney( Motion Docket Date 9/17/2009.) by Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Allowing Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel)(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 53 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,, with Jury Demand by Richard Causey, filed.(Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 02/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              OPINION AND ORDER denying 86 Defendan t Richard A. Causey's Motion to Dismiss. The Court ORDERS that Causey's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is DENIED.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 95 Second Amended Agreed MOTION for Expedited Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.,).(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(chorace) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  FINAL JUDGMENT and BAR ORDER.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended PROPOSED ORDER of Final Judgment and Dismissal as to Citigroup Inc. and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar Order re: 95 Agreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to ExpAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar Orders, filed.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION to Amend 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, andAgreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, andAgreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, andAgreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, andAgreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, andAgreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, andAgreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, andAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar Orders ( Motion Docket Date 7/9/2008.), Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar Orders, Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar Orders by Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, filed. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended PROPOSED ORDER of Final Judgment and Dismissal as to Citigroup Inc. and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar Order re: 93 Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, andAgreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, andAgreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, andAgreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, andAgreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, andAgreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, andAgreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, andAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar OrdersAgreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar Orders, filed.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION to Amend 91 Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney)Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney) ( Motion Docket Date 7/9/2008.), Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar Orders, Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar Orders by Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, filed. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice and for Entry of Final Judgment by Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Final Judgment and Bar Order)(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of, and for Entry of Orders of Dimissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney ( Motion Docket Date 7/7/2008.), Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Citigroup, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney by Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of Final Judgment and Dismissal as to Citigroup Inc. and Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (F/K/A Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.) and Bar Order)(Williams, Steven) Modified on 6/23/2008 (mrios, ). (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition to 86 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims, filed by Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Richard A. Causey re: 86 MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims, filed.(Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 53 Amended Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed.(Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This is a duplicate of 86 . MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims by Richard Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mharrison, ) Modified on 4/9/2008 (ltien, ). (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss State Law Claims by Richard Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Steven Williams re: Barbara Lyons removal from service list, filed. (jbradford, ) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Jeffrey Skilling's 83 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Answer due by 4/8/2008.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/27/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 80 Motion for Extension of Time. Jeffrey K. Skilling to answer by 3/9/2008.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 79 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints Responses due by 4/5/2008.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ltrevino, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2007. (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/19/2007. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Entry of Dismissal of USCA for the Fifth Circuit (certified copy) dated 10/24/07 re: 4799 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 06-20587. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties this appeal is dismissed,, filed. (dbiagas, ) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 76 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Answer due 12/10/2007. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/29/2007. (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 10/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals LETTER advising This supplemental designated record is due within 15 days. Document #1194 was already designated by the joint motion of parties granted on 8/21/07, and should be included in the first designated record, therefore this document should not be duplicated in the supplement. (USCA No. 06-20587), filed.(dbiagas, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2007 (dbiagas, ). (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order of USCA for the Fifth Circuit (copy) dated 08/21/07; USCA No. 06-20587. The joint motion of all parties to designate the following documents for the record on appeal is granted, filed.(dbiagas, ) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER of USCA for the FIFTH CIRCUIT dated 8/21/2007; USCA No. 06-20587. the joint motion of all parties to designate documents for the record on appeal is GRANTED., filed.(jdav, ) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints on or before 10/9/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/1/2007. (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Linklaters by Deutsche Bank AG, filed. (Byrne, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FINAL JUDGMENT as to Vinson & Elkins LLP.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 65 Motion for Entry of Order.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(bgoolsby, ) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Richard Causey's 63 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints until 08/09/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Deft Skilling's 64 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints on or before 07/11/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Partial Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.54(b) and Bar Order by Vinson & Elkins LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/3/2007. (Johnston, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2007. (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard Causey, filed.Motion Docket Date 4/25/2007. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals LETTER advising Motion to suspend briefing notice until record is complete is Granted. (USCA No. 06-20026), filed.(esmith, ) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 59 Agreed Motion Setting Briefing Schedule for Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' 2nd Amended Complaint. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED ORDER re: 59 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Setting Briefing Schedule For Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaints (Instr. Nos. 95 & 53)Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Setting Briefing Schedule For Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaints (Instr. Nos. 95 & 53), filed.(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Setting Briefing Schedule For Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaints (Instr. Nos. 95 & 53) by Arthur Andersen, Thomas H Bauer, Debra A Cash, David Stephen Goddard, Jr, Gary B Goolsby, Michael M Lowther, Benjamin S Neuhasen, David Michael C Odom, Richard R Petersen, John E Stewart, Michael L Bennett, William E Swanson, Michael D Jones, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2007. (Shepherd, George) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 57 Agreed Motion Setting Briefing Schedule For the Bank Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Pltffs' Second Amended Complaints.Silvercreek/ Bank Defts answer date extended to 04/02/07 and Pltf's time to file opposition is extended to 05/18/07; Reply deadline extended to 06/04/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION Setting Briefing Schedule for the Bank Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Deutsche Banc Alex Brown Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, Barclay's Capital Inc, Barclay's PLC, Merrill Lynch & Co, Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Pershing LLC, Onyx Industrial Services Inc, Citigroup Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/8/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion Setting Briefing Schedule)(Scott, Jacalyn) Modified on 2/22/2007 (sbyrum, ). (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF LAW FIRM NAME CHANGE by Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, filed. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Citigroup Inc's Unopposed Motion for Confidential Treatment of Certain Deposition Testimony of Susan D Abbott 42 Motion for Confidential Treatment.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(mmar, ) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Pershing LLC, Philip A Randall, Roman W McAlindon, Deutsche Banc Alex Brown Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, Barclay's Capital Inc, Barclay's PLC, Merrill Lynch & Co, Andersen Worldwide Societe Cooperative, Andersen Co, Arthur Andersen-Puerto Rico, Andersen LLP, Arthur Andersen-Brazil, Arthur Andersen, Joseph F Berardino, Thomas H Bauer, Debra A Cash, David Stephen Goddard, Jr, Gary B Goolsby, Michael M Lowther, Benjamin S Neuhasen, David Michael C Odom, Richard R Petersen, John E Stewart, Michael L Bennett, William E Swanson, Michael D Jones, Kenneth L Lay, Jeffrey K Skilling, Andrew S Fastow, Richard A Causey, Richard B Buy, Citigroup Inc, John V Derrick, Jr, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., J P Morgan Chase & Co filed by Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E1# 6 Exhibit E2# 7 Exhibit F1# 8 Exhibit F2# 9 Exhibit G1# 10 Exhibit G2# 11 Exhibit H1# 12 Exhibit H2# 13 Exhibit H3# 14 Exhibit H4# 15 Exhibit I1# 16 Exhibit I2# 17 Exhibit J)(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 32 Silvercreek's Motion for Leave to file Amended Complaints.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 44 Motion for Confidential Treatment.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mace, Carl) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to Defendant Vinson & Elkins only.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ealexander, ) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Barbara L. Lyons to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, Peeble Limited Partnership, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/29/2007. (mmar, ) (Entered: 01/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER re: 46 Notice of Dismissal, filed.(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Dismissal as to Vinson & Elkins by Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, filed. (Williams, Steven) (Entered: 01/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER re: 44 MOTION for Confidential Treatment of Certain Deposition Testimony of Peter Tufano, filed.(Bowen, James) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Confidential Treatment of Certain Deposition Testimony of Peter Tufano by J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., J P Morgan Chase & Co, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/9/2007. (Bowen, James) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPINION AND ORDER Denying Richard Causey's 36 MOTION to Stay Obligation to Respond to "opt-out" complaints during pendency of criminal proceedings.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Confidential Treatment of Certain Deposition Testimony of Susan D Abbott by Citigroup Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jason C. Rubenstein with Exhibits A and B# 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Confidential Treatment)(Scott, Jacalyn) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Lawrence Byrne, Lance Croffoot-Suede, Ruth E. Harlow, Joseph B. Schmit (Linklaters), counsel for Deutsche Bank AG, filed. (Byrne, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, Attorney George W Billy Shepherd, III for Thomas H Bauer and Debra A Cash added Attorney Russell Hardin, Jr terminated.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Entry of Dismissal of USCA for the Fifth Circuit (Certified copy) dated 10/16/06; USCA No. 06-20026. Appeal is Dismissed by Stipulation of the Parties, filed.(ghassan) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals LETTER advising of Corrected Memorandum to Counsel or Parties - Unopposed Motion to Suspend Briefing Until Record is Complete is Granted. Court to Complete Notice of Certified Supplemental Record on Appeal by Oct. 31, 2006. (USCA No. 06-20026), filed.(pcrawford, ) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals LETTER advising Judgment Issued as Mandate Only (USCA No. 06-20026), filed.(ghassan) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay Obligation to Respond to "Opt-Out" Complaints During Pendency of Criminal Proceedings by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/18/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jbradford, ) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 32 MOTION to Amend 4 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, filed by Arthur Andersen. (hlerma, ) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice in RESPONSE to 32 MOTION to Amend 4 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Banc Alex Brown Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, Barclay's Capital Inc, Barclay's PLC, Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, Citigroup Inc, and Citigroup Global Markets Inc, JPMorgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., J P Morgan Chase & Co. (swhite) (Entered: 09/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Prepared and forwarded disks of appellate record to Joseph Perez, priority overnight via FedEx, per request , filed.(jdavenport, ) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend 4 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/7/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint Second Amended Complaint# 2 Complaint Second Amended Complaint# 3 Exhibit A to Complaint A & B# 4 Exhibit B to Complaint A & B# 5 Exhibit C to Complaint A & B# 6 Exhibit D to Complaint A & B# 7 Exhibit E to Complaint A & B# 8 Exhibit F1 to Complaint B# 9 Exhibit F2 to Complaint B# 10 Exhibit G to Complaint B# 11 Exhibit G2 to Complaint B# 12 Exhibit H for Complaint B# 13 Errata H2 to Complaint B# 14 Exhibit H3 to Complaint B# 15 Exhibit H4 to Complaint B# 16 Exhibit I for Complaint B# 17 Exhibit I2 for Complaint B# 18 Exhibit J for Complaint B# 19 Exhibit K1 for Complaint B# 20 Exhibit K2 for Complaint B# 21 Exhibit K3 for Complaint B# 22 Exhibit K4 for Complaint B# 23 Exhibit K5 for Complaint# 24 Exhibit K6 for Complaint# 25 Exhibit K7 for Complaint# 26 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Amend# 27 Certificate of Service)(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 08/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The Opposed 28 Motion to Permit Silvercreek Pltfs to Opt Out of Citigroup and JP Morgan Settlements and to Remain in CIBC Settlement Class is DENIED .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(psmith, ) (Entered: 04/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint RESPONSE in Opposition to 28 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Opposed Motion to Permit Silvercreek Plaintiffs to Opt Out of Citigroup and JP Morgan Settlements and to Remain in CIBC Settlement Class and Request for Expedited Consideration; Declaration of Steven N. Williams, filed by Citigroup Inc, J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., J P Morgan Chase & Co. (Scott, Jacalyn) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting Motion for Expedited Consideration of 28 Opposed Mtn to Permit Silvercreek Pltfs to Opt Out of Citigroup and JP Morgan Settlements and to Remain in CIBC Class. Parties wishing to file a response shall respond by 04/11/06. .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 04/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION to Expedite Opposed Motion to Permit Silvercreek Plaintiffs to Opt Out of Citigroup and JP Morgan Settlements and to Remain in CIBC Settlement Class and Request for Expedited Consideration; Declaration of Steven N. Williams by Onex Industrial Partners Limited, Pebble Limited Partnership, Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/25/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Expedited Consideration of Opposed Motion to Permit Silvercreek Plaintiffs to Opt Out of Citigroup and JP Morgan Settlements and to Remain in CIBC Class# 2 Proposed Order Granting Opposed Motion to Permit Silvercreek Plaintiffs to Opt Out of Citigroup and JP Morgan Settlements and to Remain in CIBC Settlement Class)(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 04/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney John J McKetta, III re: 26 Order on Motion for Entry of Order , filed. (jbradford, ) (Entered: 03/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting 25 Unopposed Motion for Confidentiality Order Regarding Documents Produced by Silvercreek.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 03/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Entry of Confidentiality Order re: Documents Produced by Slivercreek by Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Peeble Limited Partnership, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(hlerma, ) (Entered: 03/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 20 Motion for Confidential Treatment of Certain Deposition Exhibits of Eric Hage.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(bthomas, ) (Entered: 01/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 19 Motion for Confidential Treatment of Certain Exhibits and Testimony of Bryn Joynt.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ltien, ) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting admission pro hac vice as to David A Carducci for Silvercreek Management Company Inc.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ltien, ) (Entered: 01/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 18 Motion for Confidential Treatment of Certain Exhibits and Testimony of Robert Kittel.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ltien, ) (Entered: 12/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Confidential Treatment of Certain Deposition Exhibits Marked at the Deposition of Eric Hage by Citigroup Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/4/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel Levi with Exhibits A and B# 2 Proposed Order)(Scott, Jacalyn) (Entered: 12/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Confidential Treatment of certain exhibits and testimony of Bryn Joynt by Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, Peeble Limited Partnership, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/3/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ckrus, ) (Entered: 12/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Confidential Treatment of Certain Exhibits and Testimony of Robert Kittel by all plaintiffs, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/6/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting the 16 Motion for Confidential Treatment of Certain Exhibits and Testimony of Louis Morwick. The deposition testimony and exhibits identified in Exhibit A to Silvercreek's Motion shall be deemed "Confidential" in accordance with the Court's July 2, 2004 Confidentiality Order for Deposition Testimony and Exhibits .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(psmith, ) (Entered: 11/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Confidential Treatment of Certain Exhibits and Testimony of Louise Morwick by Silvercreek Management Inc, Silvercreek Limited Partnership, Silvercreek II Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/9/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER DENYING 11 Motion to Extend Date to Opt Out of Settlements.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(rwestmoreland, ) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER re: 11 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Opt Out of Class Action Settlement, filed.(Williams, Steven) Modified on 5/6/2005 (kmurphy, ). (Ref CA H 01-3624 #3427) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION in support re: 11 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Opt Out of Class Action Settlement by all plaintiffs, filed.(Williams, Steven) Modified on 5/6/2005 (kmurphy, ). (Ref CA H 01-3624 #3426) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION in support re: 11 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Opt Out of Class Action Settlement by all plaintiffs, filed.(Williams, Steven) Modified on 5/6/2005 (kmurphy, ). (Ref CA H 01-3624 #3425) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Opt Out of Class Action Settlement by all plaintiffs, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/17/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(Williams, Steven) Modified on 5/6/2005 (kmurphy, ). (Ref CA H 01-3624 #3424) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Copy of ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to deft Roman W McAlindon (#1293 in H.01-3624), entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ddarneille) (Entered: 03/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Copy of ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to deft Philip A Randall (#1279 in H.01-3624), entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ddarneille) (Entered: 03/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION pursuant to order entered 12/12/01 in H.01-3624, this member case is consolidated into lead case H.01-3624; Silvercreek pltfs' [6-1] motion for additional time in which to serve the summons and complaint upon individuals defts is granted (120 days), entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ddarneille) (Entered: 03/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of consolidation by Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche, filed. (ddarneille) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2006 (tthompson, ). (Entered: 03/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for additional time in which to serve the summons and complaint upon individuals defts; declaration of Steven N Williams by Pltfs Silvercreek Mgt Inc, Silvercreek Ltd Part, Silvercreek II Ltd, Onyx Industrial Svcs and Peeble Ltd, Motion Docket Date 3/27/03 [6-1] motion , filed. (fmremp) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2006 (tthompson, ). (Entered: 03/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certified True Copy of Conditional MDL Transfer Out Order from the MDL Panel...transferring action from the USDC, SDNY to the Southern District of Texas [entered, ptys ntfd SDNY] (fmremp) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2006 (tthompson, ). (Entered: 03/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by Silvercreek Mgt Inc, Silvercreek Ltd Part, Silvercreek II Ltd, Onyx Industrial Svcs, Peeble Ltd amending [1-1] complaint against all original named defts except David B Duncan, Donald Dreyfus, James Friedlieb, Roger d Willard, Gregory Hale, John Sorrels, Danny Rudloff, C E Andrews and Kirkland & Ellis, filed. [entry date 2/27/03 SDNY] (Placed a brown expandable folder) (fmremp) Modified on 03/16/2003 Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2006 (tthompson, ). (Entered: 03/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of case assignment to Judge Gerard E Lynch; copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to attorney(s) of record: H Adam Prussin, Stanley M Grossman [entry dated 12/16/02 SDNY] (fmremp) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2006 (tthompson, ). (Entered: 03/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE by Pltfs SilverCreek Mgmt, etals, filed (fmremp) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2006 (tthompson, ). (Entered: 03/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF SECTION 15 OF THE SECURITIES ACT, VIOLATIONS OF SECTION 11 OF THE SECURITIES ACT, Negligent Misrepresentation, Fraud and Deceit, Violation of Section 10(B) and 20(A) of The Securities Exchange Act, filed Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c); Filing Fee $150.00, Receipt #455382 [Entry date SDNY 11/12/02] Silvercreek II Ltd, Onyx Industrial Svcs, Peeble Ltd filed; (fmremp) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2006 (tthompson, ). (Entered: 03/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 290 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?