Fraserside IP LLC v. Kovalchuk et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:12-cv-60931-RNS
District Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 2:03 PM EST (8.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Fraserside Ip LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by JAMES F. KAHN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chad Lorin Belville +1 480 203 5861 +1 602 297 6953 cbelville@azbar.org

Represented by Randazza Legal Group PLLC

Represented by Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Allan Fischer +1 321 356 0766 +1 305 397 2772 fischerlawpl@me.com
v.
No Logo ERA Technologies Ltd., Defendant

Represented by Boston Law Group PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Valentin David Gurvits +1 617 928 1804 +1 617 928 1802 vgurvits@bostonlawgroup.com

Represented by Ciampa Fray-Witzer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan M. Fray-Witzer +1 617 723 5630 +1 617 507 8043 Evan@Fray-Witzer.com

Represented by Pinkert & Marsh, P.a.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder jb@bradlegal.com
No Logo Extron Worldwide Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Boston Law Group PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Valentin David Gurvits +1 617 928 1804 +1 617 928 1802 vgurvits@bostonlawgroup.com

Represented by Ciampa Fray-Witzer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan M. Fray-Witzer +1 617 723 5630 +1 617 507 8043 Evan@Fray-Witzer.com

Represented by Pinkert & Marsh, P.a.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder jb@bradlegal.com
No Logo Igor Kovalchuk, Defendant

Represented by Boston Law Group PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Valentin David Gurvits +1 617 928 1804 +1 617 928 1802 vgurvits@bostonlawgroup.com

Represented by Law Office of Evan Fray-Witzer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan M. Fray-Witzer +1 617 723 5630 +1 617 507 8043 Evan@Fray-Witzer.com

Represented by Pinkert & Marsh, P.a.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder jb@bradlegal.com
No Logo John Does 1-100, Defendant

Represented by Boston Law Group PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Valentin David Gurvits +1 617 928 1804 +1 617 928 1802 vgurvits@bostonlawgroup.com
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Office Ft Lauderdale
Filed 5/16/2012
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Cause Unknown
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Broward
Terminated 2/20/2013
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags AOR,CLOSED,MOTREF
Timeline
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: 2/20/2013 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/20/2013. (lk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: 2/19/2013, Terminated: 2/20/2013 Motion to Dismiss
Joint MOTION to Dismiss [1] Complaint,,, with Prejudice by Fraserside IP LLC. Responses due by 3/8/2013 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement)(Fischer, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 33 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: 2/14/2013 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Clerks Notice to Filer re [32] Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re [27] Memorandum, [26] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [1] Complaint,,, . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013, Terminated: 2/20/2013 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [26] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [1] Complaint,,, by Fraserside IP LLC. Responses due by 3/4/2013 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Fischer, Jason) Modified Relief on 2/14/2013 (ls).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None set motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
Reset Deadlines as to [26] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [1] Complaint . Responses due by 2/13/2013 (tp)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: 2/12/2013 Order on Motion for Clerks Entry of Default
ORDER by Clerk of Non-Entry of Default re [24] Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to ERA Technologies Ltd. Reason: Responsive pleading (i.e. Motion for Extention of Time to File Answer to Complaint, Motion to Dismiss Complaint, etc) has been filed Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 2/12/2013. (dm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 30 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: 2/12/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
ORDER denying [14] Motion for Alternate Service and granting in part [15] Motion for Enlargement of Time for Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 2/12/2013. (nmz)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER Granting [28] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff must respond to [26] by February 13, 2013. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 2/11/2013. (rm00)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013, Terminated: 2/11/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re [26] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [1] Complaint,,, by Fraserside IP LLC. Responses due by 2/28/2013 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Fischer, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013 Memorandum
MEMORANDUM in Support re [26] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [1] Complaint,,, by ERA Technologies Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Iowa Order - Fraserside v Kovalchuk, # (2) Exhibit Affidavit of Kovalchuk, # (3) Exhibit ICANN Registrar, # (4) Exhibit Segpay.com Screenshot, # (5) Exhibit Segpay.com Screenshot2)(Bradley, John) Modified on 1/24/2013 (ls).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013, Terminated: 2/20/2013 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [1] Complaint,,, by ERA Technologies Ltd.. Responses due by 2/11/2013 (Bradley, John) Modified on 1/24/2013 (ls).
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by ERA Technologies Ltd. of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss (Bradley, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013, Terminated: 2/12/2013 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to ERA Technologies Ltd. by Fraserside IP LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Fischer, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [14] MOTION for Alternate Service filed by Fraserside IP LLC. Motions referred to Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 1/8/2013. (lk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by Fraserside IP LLC re [1] Complaint,,, of Filing Proof of Service (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service of Complaint and Summons upon ERA Technologies Ltd.)(Fischer, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012 Notice of Striking
NOTICE of Striking [19] Summons Returned Executed filed by Fraserside IP LLC by Fraserside IP LLC (Fischer, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Clerks Notice to Filer re [19] Summons Returned Executed. Document Not Captioned; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. (ls)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: 12/19/2012 Summons Returned Executed
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Fraserside IP LLC. ERA Technologies Ltd. served on 7/30/2012, answer due 8/20/2012. (Fischer, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: 11/19/2012 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling ReportCourt Filing
Order Requiring Discovery and scheduling conference and requiring a Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/19/2012. (lk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: 11/6/2012 Order Reassigning/Transferring CaseCourt Filing
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 11/5/12. Judge Kenneth A. Marra no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 11/2/2012. (lk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: 11/2/2012 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Clerks Notice to Filer re [13] Response to Order to Show Cause. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (ls)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/2/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION for Extension of Time for Service by Fraserside IP LLC. Responses due by 11/19/2012 (ls)(See Image at DE #[13])
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/1/2012, Terminated: 2/12/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION for Alternate Service by Fraserside IP LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Fischer, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/1/2012 Response to Order to Show Cause
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re [12] Order to Show Cause by Fraserside IP LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Declaration of Process Server, # (2) Exhibit B - Return of Service from Prior Action)(Fischer, Jason) Modified to add missing event [15] motion for enlargement of time for service on 11/2/2012 (ls).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: 10/12/2012 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for failure to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Show Cause Response due by 11/1/2012. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 10/12/2012. (ir)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: 8/8/2012 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
ORDER Granting [10] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 8/6/2012. (jua)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: 7/31/2012 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Val Gurvits and Evan Fray-Witzer. Filing Fee $ 150.00. Receipt # 2845. (ksa)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: 7/27/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Francis Bradley on behalf of ERA Technologies Ltd., Extron Worldwide Corporation, Igor Kovalchuk (Bradley, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: 6/1/2012 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
ENDORSED ORDER granting Chad Belville [7] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/1/2012. (ir)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/31/2012 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Chad Belville. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 39555. (ksa)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: 5/21/2012 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling ReportCourt Filing
Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/21/2012. (ir)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: 5/21/2012 Bar Letter
Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Chad Belville, mailing date May 21, 2012. (ksa)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: 5/17/2012 Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to ERA Technologies Ltd., Extron Worldwide Corporation, Igor Kovalchuk. (jua)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: 5/17/2012 Form AO 120/121
FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (jua)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: 5/17/2012 Judge AssignmentCourt Filing
Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra (jua)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: 5/16/2012 Complaint
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-4738567, filed by Fraserside IP LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1- Compete Analysis, # (2) Exhibit 2- Alexa Site Ranking, # (3) Exhibit 3- WhoIs for DrTuber.com, # (4) Exhibit 4- DrTuber Partner Content Program, # (5) Exhibit 5- DrTuber Premium Pages, # (6) Exhibit 6- DrTuber Privacy Policy, # (7) Exhibit 7- DrTuber Terms of Use, # (8) Exhibit 8- DrTuber Webmaster Program, # (9) Exhibit 9- DrTuber Join Form, # (10) Exhibit 10- SegPay Contact Page, # (11) Exhibit 11- DrTuber Static Pages, # (12) Civil Cover Sheet, # (13) Summon(s) for Defendant Kovalchuk, # (14) Summon(s) for Defendant ERA Technologies Ltd., # (15) Summon(s) for Defendant Extron Worldwide Corporation)(Fischer, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 312 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?