WPIX, Inc. et al v. IVI, Inc. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-07415
District Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald
Last Updated January 29, 2017 at 1:28 PM EST (8.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

CBS Broadcasting, Inc. CBS Broadcasting, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

CBS Corporation CBS Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "CBS Studios, Inc."

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo Cox Media Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Disney Enterprises, Inc. Disney Enterprises, Inc., Plaintiff
Officer/Director, DC Holdco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Infoseek Corp /de/
Officer/Director, Active Network, Inc.,
Officer/Director, A.b.c. Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC Holding CO Inc.
Officer/Director, ESPN Holding Company, Inc.
Officer/Director, Espn, Inc.
Officer/Director, Espn Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, ESPN Digital Media, Inc.

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo Fisher Broadcasting - Seattle Tv, L.l.c., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Fox Television Stations, Inc. Fox Television Stations, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

MLB Advanced Media, LP MLB Advanced Media, LP, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo NBC Studios, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo NBC Telemundo License Company, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo NBC Telemundo License LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

NBC Universal, Inc. NBC Universal, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball,, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo Public Broadcasting Service, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo Telefutura Network, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo Telemundo Network Group LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo The Cw Television Stations Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo Thirteen, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo Universal Network Television, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo Univision Television Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo Wgbh Educational Foundation, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo Wnet.org, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

No Logo Wpix, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

v.
No Logo Ivi, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Black Lowe & Graham, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen M. Bierman +1 206 381 3300 +1 206 381 3301 bierman@lowegrahamjones.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence D Graham +1 206 381 3300 +1381330 +13 381 3301 graham@blacklaw.com

Represented by Nissenbaum Law Group, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gavin Ira Handwerker +1 212 871 5711 +1 212 871 5712 gih@gdnlaw.com
No Logo Todd Weaver, Defendant

Represented by Black Lowe & Graham, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen M. Bierman +1 206 381 3300 +1 206 381 3301 bierman@lowegrahamjones.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence D Graham +1 206 381 3300 +1381330 +13 381 3301 graham@blacklaw.com

Represented by Nissenbaum Law Group, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gavin Ira Handwerker +1 212 871 5711 +1 212 871 5712 gih@gdnlaw.com
Other Parties
Electronic Frontier Foundation Electronic Frontier Foundation, Amicus Curiae

Represented by Law Offices Of Jennifer A. Klear

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Alison Klear +1 212 579 5943 jklear@klearlawfirm.com
No Logo Media Access Project, Amicus Curiae

Represented by Law Offices Of Jennifer A. Klear

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Alison Klear +1 212 579 5943 jklear@klearlawfirm.com
No Logo Open Technology Inititiave, Amicus Curiae

Represented by Law Offices Of Jennifer A. Klear

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Alison Klear +1 212 579 5943 jklear@klearlawfirm.com
No Logo Public Knowledge, Amicus Curiae

Represented by Law Offices Of Jennifer A. Klear

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Alison Klear +1 212 579 5943 jklear@klearlawfirm.com
Attributes
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Timeline
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION #13,1906 that 1. Defendants, their affiliated companies, and all of their officers, directors. agents, servants, and employees, and all natural and corporate persons in active concert or participation or in privity with any of them (collectively, the "Enjoined Persons") ARE HEREBY PERMANENTLY RESTRAINED AND ENJOINED from (l) directly or indirectly transmitting or making available to mobile devices or over the Internet, by any means, any audiovisual work in which any Plaintiff owns a copyright, and/or (2) infringing any of Plaintiffs' exclusive rights under Section 106 (1)-(5) of the Copyright Act in such works. 2. Defendants are liable for damages for infringing Plaintiffs' exclusive rights under sections 106 (1)-(5) of the Copyright Act, including, but not limited to, through the streaming over mobile telephone systems and/or the Internet the broadcast television programming in which Plaintiffs own copyrights. Accordingly, Defendants shall pay Plaintiffs $10,000,000 (US) (hereinafter "Judgment Amount"). 3. Defendants shall be jointly and severally liable for the payment of the Judgment Amount. 4. Violation of this Stipulated Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction shall expose Defendants and all other persons bound by this Stipulated Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction to all applicable penalties, including contempt of Court. 5. All claims and defenses in this action are hereby resolved by this Stipulated Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction. 6. This Court shall retain continuing jurisdiction over the Parties and the action for purposes of enforcing this Stipulated Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction and/or enforcing the Parties' Settlement Agreement. 7. All parties are to bear their own costs. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/07/13) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(ml) Modified on 10/8/2013 (ml). (Entered: 10/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: 11/20/2012 USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 62 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to this Court's Order, entered on April 19, 2011, Plaintiffs may post a cash deposit with the Clerk of the Court in the amount of $10,000.00 in lieu of a bond. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/2/11) (rjm) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: 5/10/2011 Order on Motion to File Amicus BriefCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 31 NOTICE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PARTICIPATE AMICI. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/10/2011) (jpo) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: 5/10/2011 Order on Motion to Transfer CaseCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1404 AND TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION. ENDORSEMENT: Denied on the record at oral argument on February 2, 2011. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/10/2011) (jpo) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: 4/19/2011 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 37 Motion to Stay. Plaintiffs are hereby ordered to post a bond in accordance with this opinion within one week. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/18/11) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (cd) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: 3/28/2011 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by IVI, Inc..(Bierman, Ellen) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 57 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by IVI, Inc.. Related document: 42 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed by NBC Universal, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Fox Television Stations, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Telefutura Network, WNET.ORG, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television, LLC, THIRTEEN, WPIX, Inc., NBC Telemundo License LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Cox Media Group, Inc., NBC Studios, Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Public Broadcasting Service, Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Univision Television Group, Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, CBS Broadcasting Inc., The CW Television Stations Inc..(Bierman, Ellen) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: 3/22/2011 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 37 MOTION to Stay re: 35 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,.. Document filed by IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver. (Handwerker, Gavin) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: 3/22/2011 Declaration in Support of Motion
DECLARATION of Todd Weaver in Support re: 37 MOTION to Stay re: 35 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,.. Document filed by IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver. (Handwerker, Gavin) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 37 MOTION to Stay re: 35 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,. Corrected. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Telemundo License LLC, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, WPIX, Inc.. (Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
DECLARATION of Steven Segaller in Opposition re: 37 MOTION to Stay re: 35 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Telemundo License LLC, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, WPIX, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
DECLARATION of Martin P. Messinger in Opposition re: 37 MOTION to Stay re: 35 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Telemundo License LLC, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, WPIX, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
DECLARATION of Marsha L. Reed in Opposition re: 37 MOTION to Stay re: 35 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Telemundo License LLC, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, WPIX, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
DECLARATION of Jane Sunderland in Opposition re: 37 MOTION to Stay re: 35 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Telemundo License LLC, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, WPIX, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
DECLARATION of Jaime Rodriguez in Opposition re: 37 MOTION to Stay re: 35 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Telemundo License LLC, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, WPIX, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
DECLARATION of Carly Seabrook in Opposition re: 37 MOTION to Stay re: 35 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Telemundo License LLC, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, WPIX, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
DECLARATION of Christopher Scott Morrow in Opposition re: 37 MOTION to Stay re: 35 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Telemundo License LLC, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, WPIX, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 37 MOTION to Stay re: 35 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Telemundo License LLC, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, WPIX, Inc.. (Zimroth, Peter) Modified on 3/21/2011 (ldi). (Entered: 03/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: 3/15/2011 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on February 2, 2011 12:15 p.m. before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (ajc) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: 3/14/2011 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Telemundo License LLC, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, WPIX, Inc..(Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on February 2, 2011 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Document filed by IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver.(Handwerker, Gavin) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Amended Complaint
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver.Document filed by CBS Broadcasting Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., WPIX, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, Disney Enterprises, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, The CW Television Stations Inc., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., THIRTEEN, The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Universal Network Television, LLC, Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Public Broadcasting Service, WNET.ORG, NBC Universal, Inc., Telemundo Network Group LLC, Telefutura Network, NBC Studios, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Univision Television Group, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., NBC Telemundo License LLC, Open 4 Business Productions LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. Related document: 1 Complaint,,, filed by NBC Universal, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Fox Television Stations, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Telefutura Network, WNET.ORG, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television, LLC, THIRTEEN, NBC Telemundo License Company, WPIX, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., NBC Studios, Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Public Broadcasting Service, Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Univision Television Group, Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, CBS Broadcasting Inc., The CW Television Stations Inc. (mro) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2011: # 1 Exhibits 1-7, # 2 Exhibits 8-41, # 3 Exhibits 42-80, # 4 Exhibits 81-100, # 5 Exhibits 101-113 Part 1, # 6 Exhibits 101-113 Part 2) (ama). (Entered: 03/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: 3/9/2011 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER, that Plaintiffs may file a First Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/7/2011) (lnl) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 37 MOTION to Stay re: 35 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,.. Document filed by IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver. (Handwerker, Gavin) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Declaration in Support of Motion
DECLARATION of Ellen M. Bierman in Support re: 37 MOTION to Stay re: 35 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,.. Document filed by IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- PC Magazine, # 2 Errata 2- Cisco IPTV Headend)(Handwerker, Gavin) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Declaration in Support of Motion
DECLARATION of Stephen Graham in Support re: 37 MOTION to Stay re: 35 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,.. Document filed by IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver. (Handwerker, Gavin) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Motion to Stay
MOTION to Stay re: 35 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,. Document filed by IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver.(Handwerker, Gavin) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Notice of Appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL from 35 Memorandum Order. Document filed by IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 930693. (nd) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 35 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Thus, plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction is granted and it is hereby ORDERED that defendants and their officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys who receive actual notice of this injunction by personal service or otherwise, and all other persons who are in active concert or participation with any of them who receive actual notice of this injunction by personal service or otherwise, are hereby ENJOINED from infringing by any means, directly or indirectly, any of plaintiffs exclusive rights under Section 106(1)-(5) of the Copyright Act, including but not limited to through the streaming over mobile telephone systems and/or the Internet of any of the broadcast television programming in which any plaintiff owns a copyright.. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/22/2011) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jpo) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
LREF
Blank 34 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011 Certificate of Service Other
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion for Leave to File Amici with supporting Declaration, motion and proposed Amici brief, Rule 7.1 Statement, and Appearance served on WPIX, Inc., ivi, Inc., and Todd Weaver on 1/31/2011. Document filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation, Media Access Project, Open Technology Inititiave, Public Knowledge. (Klear, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
LREF
Blank 33 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Amicus Curiae Appearance
Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Jennifer Alison Klear on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation, Media Access Project, Open Technology Inititiave, Public Knowledge.(Klear, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. no Corporate Parent. Document filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation, Media Access Project, Open Technology Inititiave, Public Knowledge.(Klear, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Motion to File Amicus Brief
MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by Public Knowledge, Electronic Frontier Foundation, Media Access Project, Open Technology Inititiave. Return Date set for 2/2/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer A. Klear in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amici (10 Civ. 07415) (NRB), # 2 Motion for Leave to File Amici (10 Civ. 07415)(NRB), # 3 Exhibit Amici Brief in Support of Defendants (10 Civ. 07415)(NRB))(Klear, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 30 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 CROSS MOTION to Transfer Case and.CROSS MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver. (Handwerker, Gavin) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
DECLARATION of Christopher Scott Morrow in Opposition re: 18 CROSS MOTION to Transfer Case and.CROSS MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WPIX, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 28 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 18 CROSS MOTION to Transfer Case and.CROSS MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WPIX, Inc.. (Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
DECLARATION of CHRISTOPHER SCOTT MORROW in Support re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WPIX, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 26 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WPIX, Inc.. (Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 17 Motion for Robert Alan Garrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Counsel shall forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of Court. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/26/10) (djc) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 24 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
DECLARATION of Ellen M. Bierman, Esq. in Opposition re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EX4 (excerpts HR 94-1476), # 2 Exhibit EX5 (56 FR 31580), # 3 Exhibit EX6 (57 FR 3284), # 4 Exhibit EX7 (iCrave Complaint)), # 5 Exhibit EX8 (SOA Companies), # 6 Exhibit EX9 (Bayland), # 7 Exhibit EX10 (Consolidated), # 8 Exhibit EX11 (Arkwest Communications), # 9 Exhibit EX12 (Allendale), # 10 Exhibit EX13 (Surewest), # 11 Exhibit EX14 (United Communications), # 12 Exhibit EX15 (Sky Angel Decision), # 13 Exhibit EX16 General instructions, # 14 Exhibit EX17 (SHVERA), # 15 Exhibit EX18 FCC database)(Handwerker, Gavin) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
DECLARATION of Stephen Graham in Opposition re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EX2 (internet by FCC), # 2 Exhibit EX3 FCC email)(Handwerker, Gavin) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 22 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
DECLARATION of Todd Weaver in Opposition re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EX1 (Hulu - Screenshots (Portrait)))(Handwerker, Gavin) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
LREF
Blank 21 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver. (Handwerker, Gavin) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 CROSS MOTION to Transfer Case and.CROSS MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver. (Handwerker, Gavin) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
DECLARATION of Todd Weaver in Support re: 18 CROSS MOTION to Transfer Case and.CROSS MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Handwerker, Gavin) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Motion to Transfer Case
CROSS MOTION to Transfer Case and., CROSS MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Document filed by IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver.(Handwerker, Gavin) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
MOTION for Robert Alan Garrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WPIX, Inc..(mbe) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: 10/18/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Lawrence D. Graham and Ellen M. Bierman are admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants ivi, Inc. and Todd Weaver, in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. granting 14 Motion for Lawrence D. Graham and Ellen M. Bierman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/14/10) (rjm) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Certificate of Service Other
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WPIX, Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
MOTION for Lawrence D. Graham and Ellen M. Bierman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver.(mro) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
DECLARATION of Eric Meyrowitz in Support re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WPIX, Inc.. (Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
DECLARATION of Jaime Rodriguez in Support re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WPIX, Inc.. (Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
DECLARATION of Stephen Segaller in Support re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WPIX, Inc.. (Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
DECLARATION of Eric Brass in Support re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WPIX, Inc.. (Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
DECLARATION of Therese M. Weiler in Support re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WPIX, Inc.. (Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
DECLARATION of Martin D. Franks in Support re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WPIX, Inc.. (Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
DECLARATION of Benjamin N. Pyne in Support re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WPIX, Inc.. (Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
DECLARATION of Christopher Scott Morrow in Support re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WPIX, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6 Part 1, # 7 Exhibit 6 Part 2, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9 Part 1, # 11 Exhibit 9 Part 2, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11)(Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WPIX, Inc.. (Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WPIX, Inc..(Zimroth, Peter) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Judge Paul A. Crotty is no longer assigned to the case. (ldi) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/29/2010 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Tribune Broadcasting Company; Tribune Broadcasting Holdco, LLC; Tribune Company; Disney Enterprises, Inc.; The Walt Disney Company; CBS Corporation; National Amusements, Inc.; CBS Corporation; General Electric Corporation; Vivendi, S.A.; NBC Universal Inc.; Cox Enterprises, Inc.; Fisher Communications, Inc.; News Corportion; Tribune Broadcasting Company; Tribune Broadcasting Holdco, LLC; PTI Holdings, Inc.; Univision Communication, Inc.; Broadcast Media Partners Holdings, Inc.; Univision Communication Inc.; Univision Networks & Studios, Inc.; Broadcast Media partners Holdings, Inc.; WNET.ORG; as Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., Fox Television Stations, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBC Studios, Inc., NBC Telemundo License Company, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The CW Television Stations Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, WNET.ORG, WPIX, Inc.(ama) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/29/2010 Complaint
COMPLAINT against IVI, Inc., Todd Weaver. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 916291)Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., Tribune Television Holdings, Inc., CBS Studios, Inc., THIRTEEN, WPIX, Inc., WGBH Educational Foundation, Universal Network Television, LLC, The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Disney Enterprises, Inc., Tribune Television Northwest, Inc., Public Broadcasting Service, WNET.ORG, NBC Universal, Inc., Office Of The Commissioner Of Baseball, Telefutura Network, Telemundo Network Group LLC, NBC Studios, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Telemundo License Company, Univision Television Group, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Fox Television Stations, Inc., Fisher Broadcasting-Seattle TV, L.L.C., The CW Television Stations Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5-28, # 6 Exhibit 29-55)(ama) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 235 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?