Caouette et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-01814-EMC
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 27, 2016 at 2:47 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Adolf Stehle, Plaintiff
No Logo Alfred Massotti, Plaintiff
No Logo Andrew Evans, Plaintiff
No Logo Andrew Harris, Plaintiff
No Logo Andrew Sutor, Plaintiff
No Logo Angela Flowers, Plaintiff
No Logo Anne Beasley, Plaintiff
No Logo Ardean Lowery, Plaintiff
No Logo Aubrey McBride, Plaintiff
No Logo Barbara Botkin, Plaintiff
No Logo Barbara King, Plaintiff
No Logo Barbara Lowry, Plaintiff
No Logo Barbara Ross, Plaintiff
No Logo Becky McBride, Plaintiff
No Logo Benjamin Hellard, Plaintiff
No Logo Bernard Clark, Plaintiff
No Logo Bernard Walker, Plaintiff
No Logo Betty Cantor, Plaintiff
No Logo Betty Cate, Plaintiff
No Logo Betty Cole , Plaintiff
No Logo Betty Greenburg, Plaintiff
No Logo Betty Ruth Gragg, Plaintiff
No Logo Beverly Adams, Plaintiff
No Logo Beverly Bell, Plaintiff
No Logo Beverly Renne, Plaintiff
No Logo Bonnie Carpenter, Plaintiff
No Logo Brenda Beach, Plaintiff
No Logo Brenda Maddox-Dolan, Plaintiff
No Logo Cannatella Rosie, Plaintiff
No Logo Carl Collins, Plaintiff
No Logo Carl Romano, Plaintiff
No Logo Carlton Cash, Plaintiff
No Logo Carolyn Mitchell, Plaintiff
No Logo Cecil Hale, Sr., Plaintiff
No Logo Cecil Shaw, Plaintiff
No Logo Charles Allard, Plaintiff
No Logo Charles Botkin, Plaintiff
No Logo Charles Broderick, Plaintiff
No Logo Charles Frazer, Plaintiff
No Logo Charlie Baker, Plaintiff
No Logo Charlotte Matousek, Plaintiff
No Logo Claire McNeely, Plaintiff
No Logo Clara Hatcher, Plaintiff
No Logo Clarence Zaborowski, Plaintiff
No Logo Claudine Hurtt, Plaintiff
No Logo Clyde Reece, Plaintiff
No Logo Colene Broderick, Plaintiff
No Logo Criag Lynn, Plaintiff
No Logo Dan Myers, Plaintiff
No Logo Daniel Ross, Plaintiff
No Logo Danny Miller, Plaintiff
No Logo Darlene Johnson, Plaintiff
No Logo David Booth, Plaintiff
No Logo DAVID DIXON, Plaintiff
No Logo David Egan, Plaintiff
No Logo David M. Mintzer, Plaintiff
No Logo Debbie Ann Moon, Plaintiff
No Logo Debra Leggett, Plaintiff
No Logo Delbert Amos, Plaintiff
No Logo Delia Gaitan, Plaintiff
No Logo Delmer White, Plaintiff
No Logo Delores Cook, Plaintiff
No Logo Deloris Rising, Plaintiff
No Logo Demetrius Johnson, Plaintiff
No Logo Denise Amspough, Plaintiff
No Logo Denise Casey, Plaintiff
No Logo Dennis Oster, Plaintiff
No Logo Diane Smith, Plaintiff
No Logo DONALD COLE, Plaintiff
No Logo Donald Dade, Plaintiff
No Logo Donna Carrop, Plaintiff
No Logo Donna Thatcher, Plaintiff
No Logo Dorothy Bell, Plaintiff
No Logo Dorothy Gibson, Plaintiff
No Logo Earline Brown, Plaintiff
No Logo Edward Murnane, Plaintiff
No Logo Elizabeth Abney, Plaintiff
No Logo Elizabeth Taylor, Plaintiff
No Logo Ellis, Charles, Plaintiff
No Logo Elvin Bowman, Plaintiff
No Logo Emily Brown, Plaintiff
No Logo Emily Cervantes, Plaintiff
No Logo Emmitt E. Montgomery, Plaintiff
No Logo Endonell Jones, Plaintiff
No Logo Ernest Brantley, Plaintiff
No Logo Ethel Smith, Plaintiff
No Logo Eugene Carter, Plaintiff
No Logo Evelyn L. Gillespie, Plaintiff
No Logo Faye Baker, Plaintiff
No Logo Felisha Owens, Plaintiff
No Logo Francisco Lynnoel, Plaintiff
No Logo Frank Fambrough, Plaintiff
No Logo Frank Ungerland, Plaintiff
No Logo Franklin Addison, Plaintiff
No Logo Gary Roberts, Plaintiff
No Logo George Allen, Plaintiff
No Logo George Marcin, Plaintiff
No Logo Geraldine MacLeroy, Plaintiff
No Logo Gilbert Vega, Plaintiff
No Logo Gloria Keppard, Plaintiff
No Logo Gregory McDaniel, Plaintiff
No Logo Hal Horton, Plaintiff
No Logo Herman Turner, Plaintiff
No Logo Howard Diamond, Plaintiff
No Logo Imogene McFatridge, Plaintiff
No Logo Jacalyn Longino, Plaintiff
No Logo Jacqueline Boston, Plaintiff
No Logo James Caouette, Plaintiff

Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marissa Christina Langhoff +1 949 234 6032 +1 949 429 0892 MLanghoff@napolibern.com
Space Kelly Ann McMeekin +1 310 536 1040 +1 310 496 0256
Space Hunter J Shkolnik +1 212 684 1880 +1 212 689 8156 hshkolnik@rheingoldlaw.com
No Logo James Dowdell, Plaintiff
No Logo James Harwood, Plaintiff
No Logo James Hutchens, Plaintiff
No Logo James Matousek, Plaintiff
No Logo James Moore, Plaintiff
No Logo James Wegscheider, Plaintiff
No Logo Jeffrey Noble, Plaintiff
No Logo Jerry Blocker, Plaintiff
No Logo Jerry Eidson, Plaintiff
No Logo Jerry Sloan, Plaintiff
No Logo Jesus Cervantes, Plaintiff
No Logo Jewel I. Taylor, Plaintiff
No Logo Jimmy D. Phillips, Plaintiff
No Logo Jimmy Morris, Plaintiff
No Logo Joan Pawlik, Plaintiff
No Logo Joanne Bryant, Plaintiff
No Logo JOHN BELL, Plaintiff
No Logo John M. Lemoine, Plaintiff
No Logo John Pineau, Plaintiff
No Logo Joyce Layne, Plaintiff
No Logo Judy Pendley, Plaintiff
No Logo Kay Webb, Plaintiff
No Logo Keith Dominguez, Plaintiff
No Logo Lacey Holton, Plaintiff
No Logo Larry Haas, Plaintiff
No Logo Laura Shaffer, Plaintiff
No Logo Linda Carter, Plaintiff
No Logo Linda Cody, Plaintiff
No Logo LINDA STEWART, Plaintiff
No Logo Lindy Garcia, Plaintiff
No Logo Lois Hembree, Plaintiff
No Logo Loney Carpenter, Plaintiff
No Logo Loreen V. Mathias, Plaintiff
No Logo Louis Cayia, Plaintiff
No Logo Louise Cerpa, Plaintiff
No Logo Luis Davila, Plaintiff
No Logo Lynn, William S., Plaintiff
No Logo Maggie Brewer, Plaintiff
No Logo Marcia Davis, Plaintiff
No Logo Margaret Miller, Plaintiff
No Logo Margaret Webb, Plaintiff
No Logo Marie Alvin, Plaintiff
No Logo Marilyn McQuiniff, Plaintiff
No Logo Martha Fair, Plaintiff
No Logo Marvinette Callahan, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary Ann Andrukaitis, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary Foster, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary L. Cauthen, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary Schawb, Plaintiff
No Logo Mi Lee, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Middleton, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Alvin, Plaintiff
No Logo Myra S. Moglowski, Plaintiff
No Logo Nancy Wade, Plaintiff
No Logo Neil Vader, Plaintiff
No Logo Leydig Voit & Mayer, Ltd., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Noel Smith"
No Logo Odell E. Clements, Plaintiff
No Logo Otis Hall, Plaintiff
No Logo Pam Carter, Plaintiff
No Logo Patricia Wilson, Plaintiff
No Logo Patrick Clark, Plaintiff
No Logo Patti Clark, Plaintiff
No Logo Paul O'Neal, Plaintiff
No Logo Paul Woods, Plaintiff
No Logo Paula Booth, Plaintiff
No Logo Paula Hague, Plaintiff
No Logo Pearlie Sykes, Plaintiff
No Logo Philip Bryan, Plaintiff

Represented by Audet & Partners, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Caleb Ezrin +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 jezrin@audetlaw.com
No Logo Philip Moss, Plaintiff
No Logo Phyllis Rosenthal, Plaintiff
No Logo Raphael Cerpa, Plaintiff
No Logo Ravy Vanny, Plaintiff
No Logo Readie Shelton, Plaintiff
No Logo Rebecca Diamond, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert A. Hanson, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Bennett, Plaintiff
No Logo ROBERT BROWN, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Cook, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert MacLeroy, Plaintiff
No Logo Roger Dove, Plaintiff
No Logo Roger Pearman, Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald Griffin Sr., Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald Heilman, Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald Kramer, Plaintiff
No Logo Ronnie Brown, Plaintiff
No Logo Roseann Kramer, Plaintiff
No Logo Roy Fitch, Plaintiff
No Logo Ruth Coffey, Plaintiff
No Logo Sally Cooksey, Plaintiff
No Logo Sam Hall, Plaintiff
No Logo Sandra Bennett, Plaintiff
No Logo Shirley J. Hampton, Plaintiff
No Logo Stanley Looney, Plaintiff
No Logo Steven Jacobson, Plaintiff
No Logo Susan Stewart, Plaintiff
No Logo Susan Willis, Plaintiff
No Logo Terry Hurtt, Plaintiff
No Logo Theodore Adams, Plaintiff
No Logo Thera Looney, Plaintiff
No Logo Theresa Thomas, Plaintiff
No Logo Thomas Badell, Plaintiff
No Logo Thomas Bourrette, Plaintiff
No Logo Thomas Davis, Plaintiff
No Logo Tina Cash, Plaintiff
No Logo Toni Edwards, Plaintiff
No Logo Vernon Medlock, Plaintiff
No Logo Vertus Corkerin, Plaintiff

Represented by Hersh & Hersh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Etheredge Burton +1 415 441 5544 +1 415 441 7586 mburton@hershlaw.com
No Logo Veryl Manion, Plaintiff
No Logo Victoria Edge, Plaintiff
No Logo Virginia Burke, Plaintiff
No Logo W. A. Postell, Plaintiff
No Logo Wesley Thomas Moon, Plaintiff
No Logo Wilbur Brown, Plaintiff
No Logo William Longino, Plaintiff
No Logo William Pendley, Plaintiff
No Logo William Smallwood, Plaintiff
No Logo Willie Butler, Jr., Plaintiff
No Logo Willie Leggett, Plaintiff
No Logo Wilma Hutchens, Plaintiff
No Logo Zora Jackson, Plaintiff
v.
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Defendant

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Baker +1 415 471 3100 +1 415 471 3400 michael.baker@aporter.com
Space Maurice Abraham Leiter +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4199 maurice.leiter@aporter.com
Space Jeremy Michael McLaughlin +1 415 471 3297 +1 415 471 3400 jeremy.mclaughlin@aporter.com
Space Steven G Reade

Represented by Law Offices of RYAN Z. WATTS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anna K Thompson +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 anna.thompson@aporter.com

Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah A. Good +1 415 983 1314 +1 415 983 1200 sarah.good@pillsburylaw.com
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
Other Parties
County Of Santa Clara County Of Santa Clara, Third Party Plaintiff

Represented by Kiesel Boucher & Larson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Robert Kiesel +1 310 854 4444 +1 310 854 0812 kiesel@kbla.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Timeline
  Entries (85) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 75 Motion to Relate Case; denying 76 Motion to Relate Case; denying 77 Motion to Relate Case; denying 78 Motion to Relate Case (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Relate Case NOTICE OF RELATED CASE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-12; ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Ardean Lowery. (Ezrin, Joshua) (Filed on 6/13/2013) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Relate Case NOTICE OF RELATED CASE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-12; ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Elizabeth Abney. (Ezrin, Joshua) (Filed on 6/13/2013) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Relate Case NOTICE OF RELATED CASE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-12; ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Franklin Addison. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua C. Ezrin, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ezrin, Joshua) (Filed on 5/28/2013) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Relate Case filed by Beverly Adams, Theodore Adams, Charles Allard, George Allen, Marie Alvin, Michael Alvin, Delbert Amos, Denise Amspough, Mary Ann Andrukaitis, Thomas Badell, Charlie Baker, Faye Baker, Brenda Beach, Anne Beasley, Beverly Bell, Dorothy Bell, John Bell, Robert Bennett, Sandra Bennett, Jerry Blocker, David Booth, Paula Booth, Jacqueline Boston, Barbara Botkin, Charles Botkin, Thomas Bourrette, Elvin Bowman, Ernest Brantley, Maggie Brewer, Charles Broderick, Colene Broderick, Earline Brown, Emily Brown, Robert Brown, Ronnie Brown, Wilbur Brown, Philip Bryan, Joanne Bryant, Virginia Burke, Willie Butler, Jr, Marvinette Callahan, Betty Cantor, James Caouette, Bonnie Carpenter, Loney Carpenter, Donna Carrop, Eugene Carter, Linda Carter, Pam Carter, Denise Casey, Carlton Cash, Tina Cash, Betty Cate, Mary L. Cauthen, Louis Cayia, Louise Cerpa, Raphael Cerpa, Emily Cervantes, Jesus Cervantes, Ellis Charles, Bernard Clark, Patrick Clark, Patti Clark, Odell E. Clements, Linda Cody, Ruth Coffey, Donald Cole, Betty Cole, Carl Collins, Delores Cook, Robert Cook, Sally Cooksey, Vertus Corkerin, Donald Dade, Luis Davila, Marcia Davis, Thomas Davis, Howard Diamond, Rebecca Diamond, David Dixon, Keith Dominguez, Roger Dove, James Dowdell, Victoria Edge, Toni Edwards, David Egan, Jerry Eidson, Andrew Evans, Martha Fair, Frank Fambrough, Roy Fitch, Angela Flowers, Mary Foster, Charles Frazer, Delia Gaitan, Lindy Garcia, Dorothy Gibson, Evelyn L. Gillespie, Betty Ruth Gragg, Betty Greenburg, Ronald Griffin Sr., Larry Haas, Paula Hague, Cecil Hale, Sr, Otis Hall, Sam Hall, Shirley J. Hampton, Robert A. Hanson, Andrew Harris, James Harwood, Clara Hatcher, Ronald Heilman, Benjamin Hellard, Lois Hembree, Lacey Holton, Hal Horton, Claudine Hurtt, Terry Hurtt, James Hutchens, Wilma Hutchens, Zora Jackson, Steven Jacobson, Darlene Johnson, Demetrius Johnson, Endonell Jones, Gloria Keppard, Barbara King, Ronald Kramer, Roseann Kramer, Joyce Layne, Mi Lee, Debra Leggett, Willie Leggett, John M. Lemoine, Jacalyn Longino, William Longino, Stanley Looney, Thera Looney, Barbara Lowry, Criag Lynn, Francisco Lynnoel, Geraldine MacLeroy, Robert MacLeroy, Brenda Maddox-Dolan, Veryl Manion, George Marcin, Alfred Massotti, Loreen V. Mathias, Charlotte Matousek, James Matousek, Aubrey McBride, Becky McBride, Gregory McDaniel, Imogene McFatridge, Claire McNeely, Marilyn McQuiniff, Vernon Medlock, Michael Middleton, Danny Miller, Margaret Miller, David M. Mintzer, Carolyn Mitchell, Myra S. Moglowski, Emmitt E. Montgomery, Debbie Ann Moon, Wesley Thomas Moon, James Moore, Jimmy Morris, Philip Moss, Edward Murnane, Dan Myers, Jeffrey Noble, Paul O'Neal, Dennis Oster, Felisha Owens, Joan Pawlik, Roger Pearman, Judy Pendley, William Pendley, Jimmy D. Phillips, John Pineau, W. A. Postell, Clyde Reece, Beverly Renne, Deloris Rising, Gary Roberts, Carl Romano, Phyllis Rosenthal, Cannatella Rosie, Barbara Ross, Daniel Ross, Mary Schawb, Laura Shaffer, Cecil Shaw, Readie Shelton, Jerry Sloan, William Smallwood, Diane Smith, Ethel Smith, Noel Smith, Adolf Stehle, Linda Stewart(individually, and as successor-in-interest on behalf of the Estate of Myrtle Cooper), Linda Stewart, Susan Stewart, Andrew Sutor, Pearlie Sykes, Elizabeth Taylor, Jewel I. Taylor, Donna Thatcher, Theresa Thomas, Herman Turner, Frank Ungerland, Neil Vader, Ravy Vanny, Gilbert Vega, Nancy Wade, Bernard Walker, Kay Webb, Margaret Webb, James Wegscheider, Delmer White, Lynn Williams, Susan Willis, Patricia Wilson, Paul Woods, Clarence Zaborowski. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kelly McMeekin, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Proposed Order, # 9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Langhoff, Marissa) (Filed on 4/9/2013) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
ORDER of USCA denying the petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 USC § 1453(c). (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 72 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/4/2013) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Relate Case filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/4/2013) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 70 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. (McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 12/20/2012) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Relate Case filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 12/20/2012) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Relate Case filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anna K. Thompson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Baker, Michael) (Filed on 12/10/2012) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Relate Case filed by Denise Amspough, Mary Ann Andrukaitis, Anne Beasley, Thomas Bourrette, Robert Brown, Joanne Bryant, Mary L. Cauthen, Odell E. Clements, Sally Cooksey, Roger Dove, James Dowdell, Jerry Eidson, Frank Fambrough, Delia Gaitan, Evelyn L. Gillespie, Betty Greenburg, Ronald Griffin Sr., Larry Haas, Shirley J. Hampton, Robert A. Hanson, Ronald Heilman, Benjamin Hellard, Lois Hembree, Zora Jackson, Joyce Layne, Criag Lynn, Brenda Maddox-Dolan, Veryl Manion, Alfred Massotti, Loreen V. Mathias, Marilyn McQuiniff, David M. Mintzer, Myra S. Moglowski, Emmitt E. Montgomery, Paul O'Neal, Roger Pearman, Jimmy D. Phillips, Clyde Reece, Deloris Rising, Gary Roberts, Phyllis Rosenthal, Cannatella Rosie, Barbara Ross, Cecil Shaw, Jerry Sloan, Adolf Stehle, Elizabeth Taylor, Jewel I. Taylor, Theresa Thomas, Neil Vader, Ravy Vanny, Nancy Wade, Bernard Walker, Kay Webb, Lynn Williams, Paul Woods. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Burton, Mark) (Filed on 11/16/2012) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RELATING CASES: C 12-01814 EMC, C 12-04615 MEJ, C 12-04616 JSC, C 12-04617 EDL, C 12-04619 MEJ, C 12-04633 NC, C 12-04641 NC, C 12-04642 KAW, C 12-04803 JCS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on October 11, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
*** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 67 *** ORDER RELATING CASES C 12-01814 EMC, C 12-04615 MEJ, C 12-04617 EDL, C 12-04619 MEJ, C 12-04633 NC, C 12-04641 NC, C 12-04642 KAW, C 12-04803 JCS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/11/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012) Modified on 10/11/2012 (cl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/11/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Relate Case filed by Vertus Corkerin, Andrew Harris, Susan Stewart, Betty Cate, Felisha Owens, John M. Lemoine, Mary Schawb, Susan Willis, Keith Dominguez, John Pineau, Louis Cayia, Lacey Holton, Linda Stewart, Linda Stewart, Betty Ruth Gragg, Paula Hague, Willie Butler, Jr, Charles Allard, Clarence Zaborowski, Vernon Medlock, Gregory McDaniel, Dennis Oster, Maggie Brewer, Steven Jacobson, Dan Myers, Pearlie Sykes, Daniel Ross, Donald Dade, Diane Smith, Elvin Bowman, Earline Brown, Sam Hall, Charles Frazer, Ruth Coffey, Barbara King, Herman Turner, Ellis Charles, Jimmy Morris, Francisco Lynnoel, Bernard Clark, Hal Horton, James Wegscheider, Beverly Renne, James Harwood, Carl Romano, Andrew Sutor, Edward Murnane, Donna Thatcher, William Smallwood, Mary Foster, Readie Shelton, Dorothy Gibson, Laura Shaffer, Margaret Webb, Clara Hatcher, Frank Ungerland, Claire McNeely, George Marcin, Martha Fair, Ethel Smith, Luis Davila, Gilbert Vega, Imogene McFatridge, Andrew Evans, Jerry Blocker, Cecil Hale, Sr, Otis Hall, Virginia Burke, James Moore, David Dixon, Delmer White, Joan Pawlik, Noel Smith, Patricia Wilson, Dorothy Bell, Pam Carter, Barbara Lowry, Delbert Amos, Jeffrey Noble. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Burton, Mark) (Filed on 10/3/2012) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
Receipt from San Francisco Superior Court re remand order. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RELATING CASE. (C12-4477 and C12-4478). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/6/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 62 Filed: 8/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 60 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
LREF
Blank 62 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 60 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE (re 60 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Court's August 10, 2012 Remand Order ) filed byPhilip Bryan. (Ezrin, Joshua) (Filed on 8/15/2012) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Court's August 10, 2012 Remand Order filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Baker, Michael) (Filed on 8/13/2012) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
Certified copy of docket sheet and remand order mailed to San Francisco Superior Court. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 45 Motion to Relate Case (not related) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/10/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 56 Filed: 8/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Docket No. 25 in case 3:12-cv-01814-EMC). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
LREF
Blank 56 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Docket No. 25 in case 3:12-cv-01814-EMC). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE (re 45 MOTION to Relate Case ) OPPOSITION TO ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 8/6/2012) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 54 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Case Management Conference Dates filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/31/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Case Management Conference Dates filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 7/30/2012) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Baker, Michael) (Filed on 7/27/2012) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Beverly Adams, Theodore Adams, George Allen, Marie Alvin, Michael Alvin, Thomas Badell, Charlie Baker, Faye Baker, Brenda Beach, Beverly Bell, John Bell, Robert Bennett, Sandra Bennett, David Booth, Paula Booth, Jacqueline Boston, Barbara Botkin, Charles Botkin, Ernest Brantley, Charles Broderick, Colene Broderick, Emily Brown, Ronnie Brown, Wilbur Brown, Philip Bryan, Marvinette Callahan, Betty Cantor, James Caouette, Bonnie Carpenter, Loney Carpenter, Donna Carrop, Eugene Carter, Linda Carter, Denise Casey, Carlton Cash, Tina Cash, Louise Cerpa, Raphael Cerpa, Emily Cervantes, Jesus Cervantes, Patrick Clark, Patti Clark, Linda Cody, Donald Cole, Betty Cole, Carl Collins, Delores Cook, Robert Cook, Marcia Davis, Thomas Davis, Howard Diamond, Rebecca Diamond, Victoria Edge, Toni Edwards, David Egan, Roy Fitch, Angela Flowers, Lindy Garcia, Claudine Hurtt, Terry Hurtt, James Hutchens, Wilma Hutchens, Darlene Johnson, Demetrius Johnson, Endonell Jones, Gloria Keppard, Ronald Kramer, Roseann Kramer, Mi Lee, Debra Leggett, Willie Leggett, Jacalyn Longino, William Longino, Stanley Looney, Thera Looney, Geraldine MacLeroy, Robert MacLeroy, Charlotte Matousek, James Matousek, Aubrey McBride, Becky McBride, Michael Middleton, Danny Miller, Margaret Miller, Carolyn Mitchell, Debbie Ann Moon, Wesley Thomas Moon, Philip Moss, Judy Pendley, William Pendley, W. A. Postell (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McMeekin, Kelly) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified on 8/6/2012 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 49 Brief, Exhibit A to Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company's Omnibus Supplemental Brief In Response To Court's June 26, 2012 Order filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Related document(s) 49 ) (Baker, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2012) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
Brief re 41 Order on Motion for Leave to File Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company's Omnibus Supplemental Brief In Response To Court's June 26, 2012 Order filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) 41 ) (Baker, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2012) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company re 46 Declaration in Support, 47 Certificate of Service, 45 MOTION to Relate Case (Amended) (Baker, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2012) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company re 46 Declaration in Support, 45 MOTION to Relate Case (Baker, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2012) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
Declaration of Anna K. Thompson in Support of 45 MOTION to Relate Case filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 45 ) (Baker, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2012) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Relate Case filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Baker, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2012) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
Brief Omnibus Supplemental in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to State Court filed byBeverly Adams, Theodore Adams, George Allen, Marie Alvin, Michael Alvin, Thomas Badell, Charlie Baker, Faye Baker, Brenda Beach, Beverly Bell, John Bell, Robert Bennett, Sandra Bennett, David Booth, Paula Booth, Jacqueline Boston, Barbara Botkin, Charles Botkin, Ernest Brantley, Charles Broderick, Colene Broderick, Emily Brown, Ronnie Brown, Wilbur Brown, Philip Bryan, Marvinette Callahan, Betty Cantor, James Caouette, Bonnie Carpenter, Loney Carpenter, Donna Carrop, Eugene Carter, Linda Carter, Denise Casey, Carlton Cash, Tina Cash, Louise Cerpa, Raphael Cerpa, Emily Cervantes, Jesus Cervantes, Patrick Clark, Patti Clark, Linda Cody, Donald Cole, Betty Cole, Carl Collins, Delores Cook, Robert Cook, Marcia Davis, Thomas Davis, Howard Diamond, Rebecca Diamond, Victoria Edge, Toni Edwards, David Egan, Roy Fitch, Angela Flowers, Lindy Garcia, Claudine Hurtt, Terry Hurtt, James Hutchens, Wilma Hutchens, Darlene Johnson, Demetrius Johnson, Endonell Jones, Gloria Keppard, Ronald Kramer, Roseann Kramer, Mi Lee, Debra Leggett, Willie Leggett, Jacalyn Longino, William Longino, Stanley Looney, Thera Looney, Geraldine MacLeroy, Robert MacLeroy, Charlotte Matousek, James Matousek, Aubrey McBride, Becky McBride, Michael Middleton, Danny Miller, Margaret Miller, Carolyn Mitchell, Debbie Ann Moon, Wesley Thomas Moon, Philip Moss, Judy Pendley, William Pendley, W. A. Postell. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hunter J. Shkolnik, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McMeekin, Kelly) (Filed on 7/13/2012) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen in case 3:12-cv-01814-EMC; granting (42) Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief in support of motion for remand. Order resetting CMC from 7/31/12 to 8/21/12 at 9:30 a.m. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Remand filed by Beverly Adams, Theodore Adams, George Allen, Marie Alvin, Michael Alvin, Thomas Badell, Charlie Baker, Faye Baker, Brenda Beach, Beverly Bell, John Bell, Robert Bennett, Sandra Bennett, David Booth, Paula Booth, Jacqueline Boston, Barbara Botkin, Charles Botkin, Ernest Brantley, Charles Broderick, Colene Broderick, Emily Brown, Ronnie Brown, Wilbur Brown, Philip Bryan, Marvinette Callahan, Betty Cantor, James Caouette, Bonnie Carpenter, Loney Carpenter, Donna Carrop, Eugene Carter, Linda Carter, Denise Casey, Carlton Cash, Tina Cash, Louise Cerpa, Raphael Cerpa, Emily Cervantes, Jesus Cervantes, Patrick Clark, Patti Clark, Linda Cody, Donald Cole, Betty Cole, Carl Collins, Delores Cook, Robert Cook, Marcia Davis, Thomas Davis, Howard Diamond, Rebecca Diamond, Victoria Edge, Toni Edwards, David Egan, Roy Fitch, Angela Flowers, Lindy Garcia, Claudine Hurtt, Terry Hurtt, James Hutchens, Wilma Hutchens, Darlene Johnson, Demetrius Johnson, Endonell Jones, Gloria Keppard, Ronald Kramer, Roseann Kramer, Mi Lee, Debra Leggett, Willie Leggett, Jacalyn Longino, William Longino, Stanley Looney, Thera Looney, Geraldine MacLeroy, Robert MacLeroy, Charlotte Matousek, James Matousek, Aubrey McBride, Becky McBride, Michael Middleton, Danny Miller, Margaret Miller, Carolyn Mitchell, Debbie Ann Moon, Wesley Thomas Moon, Philip Moss, Judy Pendley, William Pendley, W. A. Postell. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hunter Shkolnik, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McMeekin, Kelly) (Filed on 6/28/2012) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 41 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen in case 3:12-cv-01820-EMC; granting (39) Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; and requiring supplemental briefing (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
Minute Entry: Plaintiffs' Motion to remand held on 6/22/2012 before Edward M. Chen. Court took matter under submission and will issue order. A case management conference has already been set for 7/31/12 at 9:00 a.m. A joint CMC Statement shall be filed by 7/24/12.(Date Filed: 6/26/2012). (Court Reporter Kelly Shainline.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2012) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and to File a Statement of Recent Decision filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company's Omnibus Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Remand & Exs. A-B thereto, # 2 Exhibit 2: Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company's Statement of Recent Decision & Ex. A thereto, # 3 Proposed Order)(Baker, Michael) (Filed on 6/25/2012) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Beverly Adams, Theodore Adams, George Allen, Marie Alvin, Michael Alvin, Thomas Badell, Charlie Baker, Faye Baker, Brenda Beach, Beverly Bell, John Bell, Robert Bennett, Sandra Bennett, David Booth, Paula Booth, Jacqueline Boston, Barbara Botkin, Charles Botkin, Ernest Brantley, Charles Broderick, Colene Broderick, Emily Brown, Ronnie Brown, Wilbur Brown, Philip Bryan, Marvinette Callahan, Betty Cantor, James Caouette, Bonnie Carpenter, Loney Carpenter, Donna Carrop, Eugene Carter, Linda Carter, Denise Casey, Carlton Cash, Tina Cash, Louise Cerpa, Raphael Cerpa, Emily Cervantes, Jesus Cervantes, Patrick Clark, Patti Clark, Linda Cody, Donald Cole, Betty Cole, Carl Collins, Delores Cook, Robert Cook, Marcia Davis, Thomas Davis, Howard Diamond, Rebecca Diamond, Victoria Edge, Toni Edwards, David Egan, Roy Fitch, Angela Flowers, Lindy Garcia, Claudine Hurtt, Terry Hurtt, James Hutchens, Wilma Hutchens, Darlene Johnson, Demetrius Johnson, Endonell Jones, Gloria Keppard, Ronald Kramer, Roseann Kramer, Mi Lee, Debra Leggett, Willie Leggett, Jacalyn Longino, William Longino, Stanley Looney, Thera Looney, Geraldine MacLeroy, Robert MacLeroy, Charlotte Matousek, James Matousek, Aubrey McBride, Becky McBride, Michael Middleton, Danny Miller, Margaret Miller, Carolyn Mitchell, Debbie Ann Moon, Wesley Thomas Moon, Philip Moss, Judy Pendley, William Pendley, W. A. Postell (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McMeekin, Kelly) (Filed on 6/19/2012) Modified on 6/20/2012 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Reade) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Thompson) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Shkolnik) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Steven G. Reade ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6879546.) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Michael) (Filed on 6/7/2012) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Anna K. Thompson ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6879524.) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Michael) (Filed on 6/7/2012) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6871670.) filed by Beverly Adams, Theodore Adams, George Allen, Marie Alvin, Michael Alvin, Thomas Badell, Charlie Baker, Faye Baker, Brenda Beach, Beverly Bell, John Bell, Robert Bennett, Sandra Bennett, David Booth, Paula Booth, Jacqueline Boston, Barbara Botkin, Charles Botkin, Ernest Brantley, Charles Broderick, Colene Broderick, Emily Brown, Ronnie Brown, Wilbur Brown, Philip Bryan, Marvinette Callahan, Betty Cantor, James Caouette, Bonnie Carpenter, Loney Carpenter, Donna Carrop, Eugene Carter, Linda Carter, Denise Casey, Carlton Cash, Tina Cash, Louise Cerpa, Raphael Cerpa, Emily Cervantes, Jesus Cervantes, Patrick Clark, Patti Clark, Linda Cody, Donald Cole, Betty Cole, Carl Collins, Delores Cook, Robert Cook, Marcia Davis, Thomas Davis, Howard Diamond, Rebecca Diamond, Victoria Edge, Toni Edwards, David Egan, Roy Fitch, Angela Flowers, Lindy Garcia, Claudine Hurtt, Terry Hurtt, James Hutchens, Wilma Hutchens, Darlene Johnson, Demetrius Johnson, Endonell Jones, Gloria Keppard, Ronald Kramer, Roseann Kramer, Mi Lee, Debra Leggett, Willie Leggett, Jacalyn Longino, William Longino, Stanley Looney, Thera Looney, Geraldine MacLeroy, Robert MacLeroy, Charlotte Matousek, James Matousek, Aubrey McBride, Becky McBride, Michael Middleton, Danny Miller, Margaret Miller, Carolyn Mitchell, Debbie Ann Moon, Wesley Thomas Moon, Philip Moss, Judy Pendley, William Pendley, W. A. Postell. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McMeekin, Kelly) (Filed on 6/5/2012) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
REPLY (re 25 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court and Amended Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byBeverly Adams, Theodore Adams, George Allen, Marie Alvin, Michael Alvin, Thomas Badell, Charlie Baker, Faye Baker, Brenda Beach, Beverly Bell, John Bell, Robert Bennett, Sandra Bennett, David Booth, Paula Booth, Jacqueline Boston, Barbara Botkin, Charles Botkin, Ernest Brantley, Charles Broderick, Colene Broderick, Emily Brown, Ronnie Brown, Wilbur Brown, Marvinette Callahan, Betty Cantor, James Caouette, Bonnie Carpenter, Loney Carpenter, Donna Carrop, Eugene Carter, Linda Carter, Denise Casey, Carlton Cash, Tina Cash, Louise Cerpa, Raphael Cerpa, Emily Cervantes, Jesus Cervantes, Patrick Clark, Patti Clark, Linda Cody, Donald Cole, Betty Cole, Carl Collins, Delores Cook, Robert Cook, Marcia Davis, Thomas Davis, Howard Diamond, Rebecca Diamond, Victoria Edge, Toni Edwards, David Egan, Roy Fitch, Angela Flowers, Lindy Garcia, Claudine Hurtt, Terry Hurtt, James Hutchens, Wilma Hutchens, Darlene Johnson, Demetrius Johnson, Endonell Jones, Gloria Keppard, Ronald Kramer, Roseann Kramer, Mi Lee, Debra Leggett, Willie Leggett, Jacalyn Longino, William Longino, Stanley Looney, Thera Looney, Geraldine MacLeroy, Robert MacLeroy, Charlotte Matousek, James Matousek, Aubrey McBride, Becky McBride, Michael Middleton, Danny Miller, Margaret Miller, Carolyn Mitchell, Debbie Ann Moon, Wesley Thomas Moon, Philip Moss, Judy Pendley, William Pendley, W. A. Postell. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kelly McMeekin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McMeekin, Kelly) (Filed on 6/1/2012) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael J. Baker (Baker, Michael) (Filed on 5/24/2012) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE (re 25 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court and Amended Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company's Omnibus Brief In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Remand To State Court filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Proposed Order)(McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 5/21/2012) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference reset from 7/27/2012 to 7/31/2012 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Joint CMC statement shall be filed by 7/20/2012. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 27 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER Re Omnibus Motions and Amended Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 5/21/2012. Replies due by 6/1/2012. Hearing remains on 6/22/12 at 1:30 p.m. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (25 in 3:12-cv-01814-EMC) Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court and Amended Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, (17 in 3:12-cv-01815-EMC) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof CORRECTION OF DOCKET #(16), (14 in 3:12-cv-01816-EMC) MOTION to Remand , (20 in 3:12-cv-01818-EMC) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, (16 in 3:12-cv-01819-EMC) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, (12 in 3:12-cv-01820-EMC) MOTION to Relate Case , (16 in 3:12-cv-01820-EMC) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, (16 in 3:12-cv-01821-EMC) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, (16 in 3:12-cv-01822-EMC) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/9/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Omnibus Motions And Amended Briefing Schedule filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (McLaughlin, Jeremy) (Filed on 5/9/2012) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court and Amended Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Beverly Adams, Theodore Adams, George Allen, Marie Alvin, Michael Alvin, Thomas Badell, Charlie Baker, Faye Baker, Brenda Beach, Beverly Bell, John Bell, Robert Bennett, Sandra Bennett, David Booth, Paula Booth, Jacqueline Boston, Barbara Botkin, Charles Botkin, Ernest Brantley, Charles Broderick, Colene Broderick, Emily Brown, Ronnie Brown, Wilbur Brown, Marvinette Callahan, Betty Cantor, James Caouette, Bonnie Carpenter, Loney Carpenter, Donna Carrop, Eugene Carter, Linda Carter, Denise Casey, Carlton Cash, Tina Cash, Louise Cerpa, Raphael Cerpa, Emily Cervantes, Jesus Cervantes, Patrick Clark, Patti Clark, Linda Cody, Donald Cole, Betty Cole, Carl Collins, Delores Cook, Robert Cook, Marcia Davis, Thomas Davis, Howard Diamond, Rebecca Diamond, Victoria Edge, Toni Edwards, David Egan, Roy Fitch, Angela Flowers, Lindy Garcia, Claudine Hurtt, Terry Hurtt, James Hutchens, Wilma Hutchens, Darlene Johnson, Demetrius Johnson, Endonell Jones, Gloria Keppard, Ronald Kramer, Roseann Kramer, Mi Lee, Debra Leggett, Willie Leggett, Jacalyn Longino, William Longino, Stanley Looney, Thera Looney, Geraldine MacLeroy, Robert MacLeroy, Charlotte Matousek, James Matousek, Aubrey McBride, Becky McBride, Michael Middleton, Danny Miller, Margaret Miller, Carolyn Mitchell, Debbie Ann Moon, Wesley Thomas Moon, Philip Moss, Judy Pendley, William Pendley, W. A. Postell. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/17/2012. Replies due by 5/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McMeekin, Kelly) (Filed on 5/3/2012) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 15 Motion to Relate Case; granting 17 Motion to Relate Case; granting 23 Motion to Relate Case (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Relate Case filed by Beverly Adams, Theodore Adams, George Allen, Marie Alvin, Michael Alvin, Thomas Badell, Charlie Baker, Faye Baker, Brenda Beach, Beverly Bell, John Bell, Robert Bennett, Sandra Bennett, David Booth, Paula Booth, Jacqueline Boston, Barbara Botkin, Charles Botkin, Ernest Brantley, Charles Broderick, Colene Broderick, Emily Brown, Ronnie Brown, Wilbur Brown, Philip Bryan, Marvinette Callahan, Betty Cantor, James Caouette, Bonnie Carpenter, Loney Carpenter, Donna Carrop, Eugene Carter, Linda Carter, Denise Casey, Carlton Cash, Tina Cash, Louise Cerpa, Raphael Cerpa, Emily Cervantes, Jesus Cervantes, Patrick Clark, Patti Clark, Linda Cody, Donald Cole, Betty Cole, Carl Collins, Delores Cook, Robert Cook, Marcia Davis, Thomas Davis, Howard Diamond, Rebecca Diamond, Victoria Edge, Toni Edwards, David Egan, Roy Fitch, Angela Flowers, Lindy Garcia, Claudine Hurtt, Terry Hurtt, James Hutchens, Wilma Hutchens, Darlene Johnson, Demetrius Johnson, Endonell Jones, Gloria Keppard, Ronald Kramer, Roseann Kramer, Mi Lee, Debra Leggett, Willie Leggett, Jacalyn Longino, William Longino, Stanley Looney, Thera Looney, Geraldine MacLeroy, Robert MacLeroy, Charlotte Matousek, James Matousek, Aubrey McBride, Becky McBride, Michael Middleton, Danny Miller, Margaret Miller, Carolyn Mitchell, Debbie Ann Moon, Wesley Thomas Moon, Philip Moss, Judy Pendley, William Pendley, W. A. Postell. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McMeekin, Kelly) (Filed on 5/1/2012) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
ERRATA re 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Beverly Adams, Theodore Adams, George Allen, Marie Alvin, Michael Alvin, Thomas Badell, Charlie Baker, Faye Baker, Brenda Beach, Beverly Bell, John Bell, Robert Bennett, Sandra Bennett, David Booth, Paula Booth, Jacqueline Boston, Barbara Botkin, Charles Botkin, Ernest Brantley, Charles Broderick, Colene Broderick, Emily Brown, Ronnie Brown, Wilbur Brown, Philip Bryan, Marvinette Callahan, Betty Cantor, James Caouette, Bonnie Carpenter, Loney Carpenter, Donna Carrop, Eugene Carter, Linda Carter, Denise Casey, Carlton Cash, Tina Cash, Louise Cerpa, Raphael Cerpa, Emily Cervantes, Jesus Cervantes, Patrick Clark, Patti Clark, Linda Cody, Donald Cole, Betty Cole, Carl Collins, Delores Cook, Robert Cook, Marcia Davis, Thomas Davis, Howard Diamond, Rebecca Diamond, Victoria Edge, Toni Edwards, David Egan, Roy Fitch, Angela Flowers, Lindy Garcia, Claudine Hurtt, Terry Hurtt, James Hutchens, Wilma Hutchens, Darlene Johnson, Demetrius Johnson, Endonell Jones, Gloria Keppard, Ronald Kramer, Roseann Kramer, Mi Lee, Debra Leggett, Willie Leggett, Jacalyn Longino, William Longino, Stanley Looney, Thera Looney, Geraldine MacLeroy, Robert MacLeroy, Charlotte Matousek, James Matousek, Aubrey McBride, Becky McBride, Michael Middleton, Danny Miller, Margaret Miller, Carolyn Mitchell, Debbie Ann Moon, Wesley Thomas Moon, Philip Moss, Judy Pendley, William Pendley, W. A. Postell. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McMeekin, Kelly) (Filed on 5/1/2012) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kelly Ann McMeekin (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McMeekin, Kelly) (Filed on 5/1/2012) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/30/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/30/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 17 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion Of Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Good, Sarah) (Filed on 4/27/2012) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion Of Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Good, Sarah) (Filed on 4/27/2012) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Remand filed by Beverly Adams, Theodore Adams, George Allen, Marie Alvin, Michael Alvin, Thomas Badell, Charlie Baker, Faye Baker, Brenda Beach, Beverly Bell, John Bell, Robert Bennett, Sandra Bennett, David Booth, Paula Booth, Jacqueline Boston, Barbara Botkin, Charles Botkin, Ernest Brantley, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Charles Broderick, Colene Broderick, Emily Brown, Ronnie Brown, Wilbur Brown, Philip Bryan, Marvinette Callahan, Betty Cantor, James Caouette, Bonnie Carpenter, Loney Carpenter, Donna Carrop, Eugene Carter, Linda Carter, Denise Casey, Carlton Cash, Tina Cash, Louise Cerpa, Raphael Cerpa, Emily Cervantes, Jesus Cervantes, Patrick Clark, Patti Clark, Linda Cody, Donald Cole, Betty Cole, Carl Collins, Delores Cook, Robert Cook, Marcia Davis, Thomas Davis, Howard Diamond, Rebecca Diamond, Victoria Edge, Toni Edwards, David Egan, Roy Fitch, Angela Flowers, Lindy Garcia, Claudine Hurtt, Terry Hurtt, James Hutchens, Wilma Hutchens, Darlene Johnson, Demetrius Johnson, Endonell Jones, Gloria Keppard, Ronald Kramer, Roseann Kramer, Mi Lee, Debra Leggett, Willie Leggett, Jacalyn Longino, William Longino, Stanley Looney, Thera Looney, Geraldine MacLeroy, Robert MacLeroy, Charlotte Matousek, James Matousek, Aubrey McBride, Becky McBride, McKesson Corporation, Michael Middleton, Danny Miller, Margaret Miller, Carolyn Mitchell, Debbie Ann Moon, Wesley Thomas Moon, Philip Moss, Judy Pendley, William Pendley, W. A. Postell. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/11/2012. Replies due by 5/18/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration with Exhibits, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McMeekin, Kelly) (Filed on 4/27/2012) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Relate Case NOTICE OF RELATED CASE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-12; ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Philip Bryan. (Ezrin, Joshua) (Filed on 4/26/2012) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/25/12. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company re 8 Notice (Other) (Good, Sarah) (Filed on 4/24/2012) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Good, Sarah) (Filed on 4/24/2012) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Beverly Adams, Theodore Adams, George Allen, Marie Alvin, Michael Alvin, Thomas Badell, Charlie Baker, Faye Baker, Brenda Beach, Beverly Bell, John Bell, Robert Bennett, Sandra Bennett, David Booth, Paula Booth, Jacqueline Boston, Barbara Botkin, Charles Botkin, Ernest Brantley, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Charles Broderick, Colene Broderick, Emily Brown, Ronnie Brown, Wilbur Brown, Marvinette Callahan, Betty Cantor, James Caouette, Bonnie Carpenter, Loney Carpenter, Donna Carrop, Eugene Carter, Linda Carter, Denise Casey, Carlton Cash, Tina Cash, Louise Cerpa, Raphael Cerpa, Emily Cervantes, Jesus Cervantes, Patrick Clark, Patti Clark, Linda Cody, Donald Cole, Betty Cole, Carl Collins, Delores Cook, Robert Cook, Marcia Davis, Thomas Davis, Howard Diamond, Rebecca Diamond, Victoria Edge, Toni Edwards, David Egan, Roy Fitch, Angela Flowers, Lindy Garcia, Claudine Hurtt, Terry Hurtt, James Hutchens, Wilma Hutchens, Darlene Johnson, Demetrius Johnson, Endonell Jones, Gloria Keppard, Ronald Kramer, Roseann Kramer, Mi Lee, Debra Leggett, Willie Leggett, Jacalyn Longino, William Longino, Stanley Looney, Thera Looney, Geraldine MacLeroy, Robert MacLeroy, Charlotte Matousek, James Matousek, Aubrey McBride, Becky McBride, McKesson Corporation, Michael Middleton, Danny Miller, Margaret Miller, Carolyn Mitchell, Debbie Ann Moon, Wesley Thomas Moon, Philip Moss, Judy Pendley, William Pendley, W. A. Postell . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(McMeekin, Kelly) (Filed on 4/24/2012) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
CLERKS NOTICE REQUESTING ALL PARTIES FILE CONSENT OR DECLINATION. Admissions due by 5/4/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Good, Sarah) (Filed on 4/17/2012) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company of re 6 Answer to Complaint & re 5 Suppelement to Notice of Removal. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial filed by DefendantBristol-Myers Squibb Company. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENT filed by Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company of re 1 Notice of Removal. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company of re 1 Notice of Removal, re 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement & Civil Cover Sheet. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 7/17/2012 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 7/24/2012 at 10:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL - [No Process] from San Francisco County Superioer Court. Their Case Number is CGC-12-519100. [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611072860] Filed by Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2012: # 1 Exhibits A-B, # 2 Exhibits C-D, # 3 Exhibits E-F, # 4 Exhibits G-H, # 5 Exhibits I-L) (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/13/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 54 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Case Management Conference Dates filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/31/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
LREF
Blank 41 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen in case 3:12-cv-01820-EMC; granting (39) Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; and requiring supplemental briefing (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
LREF
Blank 27 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER Re Omnibus Motions and Amended Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 5/21/2012. Replies due by 6/1/2012. Hearing remains on 6/22/12 at 1:30 p.m. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (25 in 3:12-cv-01814-EMC) Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court and Amended Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, (17 in 3:12-cv-01815-EMC) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof CORRECTION OF DOCKET #(16), (14 i n 3:12-cv-01816-EMC) MOTION to Remand , (20 in 3:12-cv-01818-EMC) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, (16 in 3:12-cv-01819-EMC) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Mem orandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, (12 in 3:12-cv-01820-EMC) MOTION to Relate Case , (16 in 3:12-cv-01820-EMC) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, (16 in 3:12-cv-01821-EMC) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, (16 in 3:12-cv-01822-EMC) MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/9/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/30/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 283 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?