United States v. Abrams
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:08-cr-00252-RMW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 8:39 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L. Denier +1 415 436 6888 +1 415 436 6748 david.denier@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Sharlene P. Abrams, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Patrick Keane +1 415 954 4400 wkeane@fbm.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Jose
Filed 4/17/2008
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
308-mj-70228-MAG
Count 1
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7201.F
Offense Level 4
267201 - Income Tax Evasion
Count 2-3
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206B.F
Offense Level 4
267206(2) Aiding and Assisting in the Preparation of False Tax Returns
Def Custody Status Released
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER 51 to Continue Sentencing Hearing as to Sharlene P. Abrams. Sentencing set for 2/24/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 1/10/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
    PLEA AGREEMENT as to Sharlene P. Abrams. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
      WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Sharlene P. Abrams. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte:Arraigned on Superseding Information as to Sharlene P. Abrams (1) Count 1s held on 9/13/2010, Waiver of Indictment was executed and accepted by the Court as to Sharlene P. Abrams held on 9/13/2010, Change of Plea Hearing as to Sharlene P. Abrams held on 9/13/2010, Plea entered by Sharlene P. Abrams (1) Guilty Count 1s. Sentencing set for 1/10/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. (Court Reporter Christine Bedard.) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
          SUPERSEDING FELONY INFORMATION as to Sharlene P. Abrams (1) count(s) 1s. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            STIPULATION AND ORDER 34 as to Sharlene P. Abrams: Arraignment set for 9/13/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Change of Plea Hearing set for 9/13/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 9/9/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
              STIPULATION to Hearing Datere 33 Stipulation filed by Sharlene P. Abrams (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 8/27/2010) Modified on 8/31/2010 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
                STIPULATION to Hearing Date re 29 by Sharlene P. Abrams (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 8/3/2010) Modified on 8/4/2010 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                  ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR UNITED STATES as to Sharlene P. Abrams (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 1/8/2010)***(This is a Notice of Substitution of Attorney)*** Modified on 1/11/2010 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER 30 Excluding Time to 10/12/2010 as to Sharlene P. Abrams. Signed by Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 12/23/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                      [Proposed] Order Excluding Time Under Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Sharlene P. Abrams (Denier, David) (Filed on 12/16/2009) Modified on 12/17/2009 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte:Motion Hearing as to Sharlene P. Abrams held on 12/14/2009 re 25 MOTION to Produce Brady Material filed by Sharlene P. Abrams & Trial Setting Hearing as to Sharlene P. Abrams held on 12/14/2009. Jury Trial set for 10/12/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          STIPULATION AND ORDER 24 to Continue Motion Hearing as to Sharlene P. Abrams. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Trial Setting Hearing set for 12/14/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 12/11/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE to Defendant's Motion for Production of Brady Material re 25 by USA as to Sharlene P. Abrams (Denier, David) (Filed on 12/8/2009) Modified on 12/9/2009 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                              [Appendix] of Cases not Published in Federal Reporter in Support of Motion for Production of Brady Material re 25 by Sharlene P. Abrams (Keane, William) (Filed on 11/30/2009) Modified on 12/1/2009 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                Notice of Motion and Motion for Production of Brady Material by Sharlene P. Abrams. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Keane, William) (Filed on 11/30/2009) Modified on 12/1/2009 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                                  STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Motion Hearing by Sharlene P. Abrams (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 10/15/2009) Modified on 10/19/2009 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER 22 Continuing Motion Hearing as to Sharlene P. Abrams. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 8/25/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                      Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Motion re 19 by Sharlene P. Abrams (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 7/31/2009) Modified on 8/3/2009 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER 20 Excluding Time to 8/24/2009 as to Sharlene P. Abrams. Signed by Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 5/7/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009) Modified on 5/8/2009 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                          [Proposed] Order Excluding Time Under Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Sharlene P. Abrams (Denier, David) (Filed on 3/25/2009) Modified on 3/26/2009 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/25/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte:Status Conference as to Sharlene P. Abrams held on 3/19/2009. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Trial Setting Hearing set for 11/9/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. (Court Reporter None.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER 17 to Continue Status Hearing as to Sharlene P. Abrams. Status Conference set for 3/19/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 1/29/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Status Conference by Sharlene P. Abrams (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 1/21/2009) Modified on 1/22/2009 (cfe, Court Staff). (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                  *** E-FILED IN ERROR - SEE DOCKET NO. 17 *** STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Status Conference by Sharlene P. Abrams (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 1/13/2009) Modified on 1/29/2009 (jg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER EXCLUDING TIME UNDER SPEEDY TRIAL ACT re 14 Excluding Time to 1/20/2009 as to Sharlene P. Abrams. Signed by Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 9/23/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008) Modified on 9/24/2008 (cfe, Court Staff). (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                      Proposed Order Excluding Time Under Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Sharlene P. Abrams (Denier, David) (Filed on 9/11/2008) Modified on 9/11/2008 (cfe, Court Staff). (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte:Status Conference as to Sharlene P. Abrams held on 9/8/2008. Status Conference set for 1/20/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Receipt for Passport
                                                          Receipt#54611003452 for US Passport# 208381017 as to Sharlene P. Abrams (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 7/1/2008)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER EXCLUDING TIME as to Sharlene P. Abrams re [11] Request for Order filed by USA. Time is excluded through 9/8/08.Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/16/08. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2008) Modified on 6/17/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Proposed Order
                                                              Request for Order Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Sharlene P. Abrams (Denier, David) (Filed on 6/16/2008) Modified on 6/17/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Sharlene P. Abrams (1) $50,000 PR BOND. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/12/208. (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 6/12/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg:Initial Appearance; attorney William Patrick Keane present for Sharlene P. Abrams. Bond $50,000 PR BOND Hearing as to Sharlene P. Abrams held on 6/12/2008, Arraigned NOT GUILTY as to Sharlene P. Abrams (1) Count 1,2-3 held on 6/12/2008.(Court Reporter FTR.) (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 6/12/2008)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William Patrick Keane appearing for Sharlene P. Abrams (Keane, William) (Filed on 6/10/2008)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/11/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Initial Appearance as to Sharlene P. Abrams Initial Appearance set for 6/12/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 5/9/08. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2008)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Stipulation
                                                                        STIPULATION And Order Continuing Initial Appearance by USA as to Sharlene P. Abrams (Denier, David) (Filed on 5/8/2008)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Indictment
                                                                          INDICTMENT as to Sharlene P. Abrams (1) count(s) 1, 2-3. (cfe, Court Staff) (Filed on 4/17/2008) Modified on 4/22/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                                                                            CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT as to Sharlene P. Abrams (1). (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2008)[3:08-mj-70228-MAG]
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 245 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?