Beriont v. GTE Laboratories,Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-11145

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 1:24 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Walter J. Beriont, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Walter J. Beriont

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter J. Beriont
v.
No Logo Alfred H. Bellows, Defendant
GTE Communications Corporation GTE Communications Corporation, Defendant
GTE Laboratories, Inc. GTE Laboratories, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melanie L. Bostwick +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999 mbostwick@khhte.com
Space Michael E. Joffre +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999 mjoffre@khhte.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald W. Schroeder +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 Dschroeder@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur G. Telegen +1 617 946 4800 +1 617 946 4801 atelegen@seyfarth.com
Space Erik W. Weibust +1 617 946 4848 +1 617 790 5339 eweibust@seyfarth.com
GTE Service Corporation GTE Service Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (113) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation re 111 Order,,,,,,,, (Notice of Fulfillment of Elements of Settlement Set Forth in Dkt. No. 111) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Joffre, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Copy of the court's Order on his letter for Writ of Execution mailed to Walter Beriont on October 24, 2016. (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered, treating Beriont's letter as a motion for Writ of Execution and denying it in part and allowing in in part. After more than a decade of litigating this case, on October 5, 2015, the United States Supreme Court denied plaintiff Walter Beriont's request for certiorari. See Beriont v. GTE Labs., Inc., 136 S. Ct. 148 (2015). Thereafter Beriont made a demand for payment of the original $50,000 settlement, plus approximately $68,000 in interest. Defendants agreed to pay the original $50,000 (found by the court to be a term of the parties' original settlement), and to engage a patent attorney to obtain a correction of the assignment record at the Patent and Trademark Office (PTO). At Beriont's request, defendants provided him with a draft letter with respect to the settlement of his defamation claim, but informed him that they would not pay the requested interest. The court agrees. Beriont cannot refuse to accept the $50,000, continue to litigate the settlement ordered by the court, taxing defendants with additional legal fees, and then demand $117,939.73, to include interest over the six years' delay he precipitated.Defendants will comply with the courts June 27, 2012 Order (Dkt #59) -- Verizon will pay Beriont the $50,000 in settlement of the defamation claim; Verizon will provide a written acknowledgment to Beriont that there is no evidence that the allegations of theft made against him are true and that Verizon has in fact determined them to be false; and Verizon will correct the record at the PTO to reflect the joint ownership of the patent, all to be done within 60 days of the date of this Order (no later than December 22, 2016). Once defendants provide evidence to the court of the fulfillment of these elements of the settlement, in the absence of the parties exchange of mutual releases, the court finds that the parties are mutually hereafter absolved of all claims in the state court litigation.(Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Response by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation to 108 Letter/request (non-motion) . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Joffre, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Michael E. Joffre (Withdrawing Appearance of Melanie L. Bostwick) (Joffre, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Letter/request (non-motion) from Walter Beriont to Clerk dated 10/13/16, FILED. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
              MANDATE of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to 98 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Walter J. Beriont. Appeal 98 Terminated (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                OPINION and JUDGMENT of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to 98 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Walter J. Beriont. AFFIRMED... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Transcript of Motion Hearing on Remand from Federal Circuit held on February 13, 2014, before Judge Richard G. Stearns. COA Case No. 12-2079. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: James Gibbons at jmsgibbons@yahoo.com Redaction Request due 8/1/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2014. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Walter J. Beriont for proceedings held on 2/13/14 before Judge Richard G. Stearns, (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE by Walter J. Beriont of order for the trancript of the 2/13/14 hearing, FILED and forwarded to Court Reporter. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2014: # 1 Supplement) (Flaherty, Elaine). (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                          USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 14-1424 for 98 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Walter J. Beriont. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                            USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 1BST043150 re 98 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Walter J. Beriont (Diaz, Carmen) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                              Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 98 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 95 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 90 Judgment by Walter J. Beriont US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 5/6/2014. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                  Appeal Record Returned: 61 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                    Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: 3/27/14 order corrected because: to reflect correct date copy to Mr. Beriont oon 4/3/14 (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, ENTERED.denying 91 Motion for Reconsideration copy to Mr. Beriont on 3/27/14. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Main Document 95 replaced on 4/3/2014) (Flaherty, Elaine). (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                        Voluminous AFFIDAVIT in Support re 91 MOTION for Reconsideration re 90 Judgment unable to scan. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                          AFFIDAVIT in Support re 91 MOTION for Reconsideration re 90 Judgment. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 91 MOTION for Reconsideration re 90 Judgment filed by Walter J. Beriont. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Reconsideration re 90 Judgment and submit all remaining issues to the Jury by Walter J. Beriont.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Judge Richard G. Stearns: JUDGMENT entered.(Seelye, Terri) cm to Walter J. Beriont, 30 Durant Ave., Maynard, MA 01754-1036 on 2/20/2014 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Supplemental Exhibit filed by Plaintiff in Open Court on 2/13/14, FILED. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Copy re 87 Memorandum & ORDER mailed to Mr. Beriont on 2/18/14. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (ON REMAND) ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 83 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns: Motion Hearing held on 2/13/2014 re: remand of case from Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. After a hearing on the outstanding issues on remand, the matter was taken UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter: James Gibbons at jmsgibbons@yahoo.com.)(Attorneys present: Plaintiff Walter Beriont representing himself; Michael Joffre and Arthur Telegen for defendants.) (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Plaintiff's REPLY to Defendants; Reply re: issues on remand and in support of their 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Walter J. Beriont, FILED. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Leave to File reply to Defendants' Reply regarding issues on remand and in support of their motion for Summary Judgment by Walter J. Beriont, FILED.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Hearing regarding issues set out by the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals for remand RESET for 2/13/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling the 2/5/14 hearing regarding issues set out by the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals for remand. Parties to contact the court to reschedule. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    (Leave To File Granted 1/22/14) Response by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation to 73 Opposition to Motion . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Melanie L. Bostwick, # 2 Exhibit A)(Joffre, Michael) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 78 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Summary Judgment by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Proposed Reply Brief and Attachments)(Joffre, Michael) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Joffre on behalf of Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation (Joffre, Michael) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie L. Bostwick on behalf of Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation (Bostwick, Melanie) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Hearing set, regarding issues set out by the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals for remand, for 2/4/2014 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri) cm to Walter J. Beriont, 30 Durant Ave., Maynard, MA 01754-1036 on 12/12/2013. (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of W. Beriont in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, FILED.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Opposition re 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Walter J. Beriont. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation re 70 Response, 71 Affidavit in Support,, . (Telegen, Arthur) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re 70 Response, (Declaration of Michael E. Joffre Supporting Defendants' Memorandum Regarding Issues on Remand and in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - A, # 2 Exhibit - B, # 3 Exhibit - C, # 4 Exhibit - D, # 5 Exhibit - E, # 6 Exhibit - F, # 7 Exhibit - G, # 8 Exhibit - H, # 9 Exhibit - I, # 10 Exhibit - J, # 11 Exhibit - K, # 12 Exhibit - L, # 13 Exhibit - M, # 14 Exhibit - N, # 15 Exhibit - O, # 16 Exhibit - P, # 17 Exhibit - Q, # 18 Exhibit - S)(Telegen, Arthur) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        (Defendants' Memorandum Regarding Issues on Remand and in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment) Response by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation . (Telegen, Arthur) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered setting briefing schedule. The parties each shall file a brief with the court by November 15, 2013, addressing the issues set out by the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals for remand -- GTE's infringement prior to June 13, 2005, including but not limited to, GTE's contention that the joint ownership agreement covered the entire life of the patent; the impact of the June 13, 1983 Assignment Agreement; and the Beriont assignment recorded on February 25, 2002 (as executed on January 23, 2002), with the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. The briefs may be no more than 25 pages in length. SO ORDERED.(Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            MANDATE of USCA as to 61 Notice of Appeal filed by Walter J. Beriont. Appeal 61 Terminated (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              OPINION of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to 61 Notice of Appeal filed by Walter J. Beriont. AFFIRMED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, AND REMANDED... (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                USCA Case Number 13-1109 for 61 Notice of Appeal, filed by Walter J. Beriont. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  USCA Judgment as to 61 Notice of Appeal, filed by Walter J. Beriont. For the reasons stated in this court's October 25, 2012 order, this appeal is transferred to the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. Judgment issued in the USCA 12/4/2012 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Filing fee/payment: $ 455.00, receipt number 1BST032269, received 07/25/2012 for 61 Notice of Appeal,,, (Adam, Lucien) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      USCA Case Number 12-2079 for 61 Notice of Appeal, filed by Walter J. Beriont. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Certified and Transmitted Full Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 61 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 Docket Sheet)(Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 60 Judgment by Walter J. Beriont NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 8/14/2012. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Judge Richard G. Stearns: JUDGMENT, ENTERED. Copy of Memorandum and Order and Judgment mailed to Mr. Beriont on 6/27/12.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Court Ordered AFFIDAVIT of Mr. Beriont by Walter J. Beriont, FILED. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION to Reschedule Final Pre-Trial Conference by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation.(Weibust, Erik) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Walter J. Beriont re 52 Order on Motion for Order Governing The Conduct And Scope Of Direct Testimony by Walter J. Beriont. (Telegen, Arthur) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Arthur G. Telegen re 52 Order on Motion for Order Governing The Conduct And Scope Of Direct Testimony by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation. (Telegen, Arthur) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns: AMENDED PROCEDURAL ORDER, due to a court conflict, re pretrial/trial. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 6/14/2012 at 3:00 PM and Jury Trial RESET for 6/18/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. PLEASE NOTE: Trial will be held from 9:00 AM - 4:00 PM on Monday & 9:00 AM - 1:00 PM Tuesday - Friday. (Seelye, Terri) cm to Walter J. Beriont on 3/26/2012. (Entered: 03/25/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Objection to 50 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation (Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's Pretrial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3)(A). (Weibust, Erik) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 51 Motion for Order copy to Mr. Beriont this day. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order to Govern the Conduct and Scope of Direct Testimony by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weibust, Erik) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Pretrial Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Walter J. Beriont, FILED.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                AMENDED DOCUMENT by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation. Amendment to 48 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 . (Weibust, Erik) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation.(Weibust, Erik) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Judge Richard G. Stearns: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered re pretrial/trial. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/29/2012 at 3:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 4/2/2012 at 9:00 AM both in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri) CM to plaintiff on 2/2/2012 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Walter J. Beriont, filed. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's AFFIDAVIT 43 in Opposition to Motion for summary judgment, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's STATEMENT of facts re 37 in opposition MOTION for Summary Judgment, FILED. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Walter J. Beriont, filed. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Walter J. Beriont.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Telegen, Arthur) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Proposed JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Weibust, Erik) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - A: Affidavit of Arthur Telegen, # 2 - Exhibits to Affidavit of Arthur Telegen, # 3 Exhibit - B: Affidavit of Margaret Lesesne, # 4 Exhibit - C: Affidavit of Erik Weibust, # 5 - Exhibits to Affidavit of Erik Weibust)(Weibust, Erik) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation. (Weibust, Erik) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation.(Weibust, Erik) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation.(Weibust, Erik) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 18, 2011 to File a Responsive Pleading by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation.(Weibust, Erik) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2011 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri)cm to Walter J. Beriont, 30 Durant Ave., Maynard, MA 01754-1036 on 10/25/11. (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Walter J. Beriont. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - A, # 2 Exhibit - B, # 3 Exhibit - C, # 4 Exhibit - D, # 5 Exhibit - E, # 6 Exhibit - F, # 7 Exhibit - G)(Weibust, Erik) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Late Dispositive Motion by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - A)(Weibust, Erik) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Erik W. Weibust on behalf of Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation (Weibust, Erik) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION to Continue Hearing on Dispositive Motions to any date during the week of October 10, 2011, that is convenient for the Court by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation.(Telegen, Arthur) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (Joint Memorandum Regarding Status of Stay) by Alfred H. Bellows, Walter J. Beriont, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation. (Telegen, Arthur) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - A, # 2 Exhibit - B, # 3 Exhibit - C, # 4 Exhibit - D, # 5 Exhibit - E, # 6 Exhibit - F, # 7 Exhibit - G)(Telegen, Arthur) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff Beriont's input to STATUS REPORT (date stamped 4/26/10, wrong Judge initials on document, misdirected, received for docketing today). FILED.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Donald W. Schroeder with Certificate of Service (Schroeder, Donald) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT of Defendants by Alfred H. Bellows, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation. (Telegen, Arthur) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to April 26, 2010 to File Status Report by Alfred H. Bellows, Walter J. Beriont, GTE Communications Corporation, GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation.(Telegen, Arthur) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Arthur G. Telegen (Telegen, Arthur) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to defendants' opposition re 17 MOTION to remove stay filed by Walter J. Beriont. (Howarth, George) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 17 MOTION to remove stay filed by GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corporation, GTE Communications Corporation, Alfred H. Bellows. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Telegen, Arthur) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walter J. Beriont re 18 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 17 MOTION to remove stay. (Howarth, George) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 17 MOTION to remove stay filed by Walter J. Beriont. (Howarth, George) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to remove stay by Walter J. Beriont.(Howarth, George) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of the Court to counsel regarding the status of the case (Howarth, George) (Entered: 05/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 6/23/2003 02:15 PM in Courtroom 8 before Morris E. Lasker. cc/cl(Howarth, George) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Morris E. Lasker . Clerk's Notes: re: status conference. Defendants agree to draft a stipulation to dismiss allowing renewal withou prejudice; After parties consider document, the Court will approve it if appropriate; Court Reporter: n/a (seh) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Morris E. Lasker. Notice of Hearing/conference: RESET status conference for 11:00 10/22/02 . cc/cl. (sat) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Morris E. Lasker . Notice of Hearing/conference: RESET status conference for 11:00 10/16/02 . cc/cl (seh) (Entered: 09/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Morris E. Lasker. Notice of Hearing/conference: RESET status conference for 2:15 10/3/02 . cc/cl. (sat) (Entered: 09/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Morris E. Lasker . Notice of Hearing/conference: RESET status conference for 2:30 8/27/02 . cc/cl (seh) (Entered: 08/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Morris E. Lasker . Notice of Hearing/conference: set status conference for 11:30 8/21/02 . issued (jdj) (Entered: 07/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Morris E. Lasker. Notice of Hearing/conference: set status conference for 2:30 6/26/02 . cc/cl. (sat) (Entered: 06/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Morris E. Lasker . Notice of Hearing/conference: SET status conference for 2:45 6/10/02 . cc/cl (seh) (Entered: 05/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter by Arthur G. Telegen dated: 1/18/01 to: Judge Lasker re: status of case filed. (jdj) (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Richard G. Stearns: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Declaring the Parties' Rights and Obligations Under the Prior Settlement Agreement, ENTERED. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Waiver of service returned executed as to GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corp., GTE Communications, Alfred H. Bellows . Mailed on 9/26/00 . Answer due on 11/25/00 for Alfred H. Bellows, for GTE Communications, for GTE Service Corp., for GTE Laboratories,Inc (jdj) (Entered: 10/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of change of address filed by Walter J. Beriont . (jdj) (Entered: 09/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum by GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corp., GTE Communications, Alfred H. Bellows in support of [2-1] motion to stay , filed cs. (jdj) (Entered: 08/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion by GTE Laboratories,Inc, GTE Service Corp., GTE Communications, Alfred H. Bellows to stay , filed. (jdj) (Entered: 08/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Complaint filed. Case assigned to Judge: Lasker. Receipt #: 23002 Amount:$ 150.00. Fee Status: pd (jdj) (Entered: 06/13/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 128 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?