In Re: Air Crash Near Clarence Center, New York, On February 12, 2009
Federal Court Proceeding New York Western District Court, Case No. 1:09-md-02085
District Judge William M. Skretny, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 2, 2016 at 8:16 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andy Harel, Plaintiff

Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

No Logo Ann M. Danowski, Plaintiff

Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Steel Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul I. Perlman +1 716 848 1479 +1 716 819 4616 pperlman@hodgsonruss.com
No Logo Anna Marie Russo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel O. Rose +1 212 687 8181 +1 212 972 9432 drose@kreindler.com
No Logo Ashley Johnson, Plaintiff

Represented by Nuchereno & Nagel

Represented by Speiser, Krause, Nolan & Granito

No Logo Carole Ann Roberts, Plaintiff

Represented by Lewis & Lewis

No Logo Carrie C. Davidson, Plaintiff

Represented by Clifford Law Offices, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Colucci & Gallaher, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony J. Colucci, III +1 716 854 8671 +1 716 854 4070 ajc3@colucci-gallaher.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul G. Joyce +1 716 853 6509 +1 716 854 4070 pjoyce@colucci-gallaher.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Keane +1 212 416 8550 +1 212 416 6075 michael.keane@ag.ny.gov
No Logo Cheryl Borner, Plaintiff

Represented by Smith Miner O'Shea & Mahoney LLP

No Logo Dana Hartman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Damon A. DeCastro +1 716 282 1242 +1 716 282 5090 damondecastro@aol.com

Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

No Logo Dianne Mossop, Plaintiff

Represented by Gair, Gair, Conason, Steigman, Mackauf, Bloom & Rubinowitz

Toggle Switch Represented by Webster Szanyi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin A. Szanyi +1 716 842 2800 +1 716 845 6709 kszanyi@websterszanyi.com
No Logo Dylan Richardson, Plaintiff

Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Steel Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/12/2011 Paul I. Perlman +1 716 848 1479 +1 716 819 4616 pperlman@hodgsonruss.com
No Logo Gurly Niewood, Plaintiff

Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

No Logo Howard R. Pettys, Plaintiff

Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Steel Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul I. Perlman +1 716 848 1479 +1 716 819 4616 pperlman@hodgsonruss.com
No Logo James L. Neill, Plaintiff

Represented by Clifford Law Offices, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Colucci & Gallaher, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony J. Colucci, III +1 716 854 8671 +1 716 854 4070 ajc3@colucci-gallaher.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul G. Joyce +1 716 853 6509 +1 716 854 4070 pjoyce@colucci-gallaher.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Keane +1 212 416 8550 +1 212 416 6075 michael.keane@ag.ny.gov
No Logo James M. Zuffoletto, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrews, Bernstein & Maranto, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Nicotra +1 716 842 2200 +1 716 847 1134 RNicotra@ABM-Law.com
No Logo Jeanie Bryson, Plaintiff

Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

No Logo Jennifer West, Plaintiff

Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Steel Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul I. Perlman +1 716 848 1479 +1 716 819 4616 pperlman@hodgsonruss.com
No Logo John G. Roberts, Jr., Plaintiff

Represented by Lewis & Lewis

No Logo John Kausner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angelo M. Patacca, Jr. +1 904 632 2424 +1 904 632 0549 apatacca@mac.com

Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Terrell Hogan Ellis Yegelwel, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Wayne Hogan +1 904 632 2424 +1 904 353 4418 hogan@terrellhogan.com
No Logo John Lang, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wolk Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/29/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Genter +1 215 545 4220
No Logo John M Loftus, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel O. Rose +1 212 687 8181 +1 212 972 9432 drose@kreindler.com
No Logo Jonah Mink, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baritz and Colman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/27/2011 John A. Greaves

Represented by Baum Hedlund Aristei & Goldman PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John Eenigenburg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/27/2011 A. Ilyas Akbari +1 310 923 6599

Represented by Rivette & Rivette, PC

No Logo Julius Kushner, Plaintiff

Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Steel Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul I. Perlman +1 716 848 1479 +1 716 819 4616 pperlman@hodgsonruss.com
No Logo Justine M. Krasuski, Plaintiff

Represented by Lipsitz Green Scime Cambria LLP

No Logo Kara Beutel, Plaintiff

Represented by Clifford Law Offices, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Colucci & Gallaher, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony J. Colucci, III +1 716 854 8671 +1 716 854 4070 ajc3@colucci-gallaher.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul G. Joyce +1 716 853 6509 +1 716 854 4070 pjoyce@colucci-gallaher.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Keane +1 212 416 8550 +1 212 416 6075 michael.keane@ag.ny.gov
No Logo Karen A. Kuklewicz, Plaintiff

Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Liptsitz Green Scime Cambria LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James T. Scime +1 716 849 1333 +1 716 849 1314 jscime@lglaw.com
No Logo Karen F. Wielinski, Plaintiff

Represented by Paul William Beltz, PC

No Logo Kathleen Johnston, Plaintiff

Represented by Connors & Vilardo, LLP

Represented by Speiser, Krause, Nolan & Granito

No Logo Kelly C. Ries, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Magavern Magavern Grimm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Grimm, III +1 716 856 3500 +1 716 856 3390 rgrimm@magavern.com
No Logo Lawrence Korczykowski, Plaintiff

Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

No Logo Lisa Richardson, Plaintiff

Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Steel Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/12/2011 Paul I. Perlman +1 716 848 1479 +1 716 819 4616 pperlman@hodgsonruss.com
No Logo Lynn Kushner, Plaintiff

Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Steel Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul I. Perlman +1 716 848 1479 +1 716 819 4616 pperlman@hodgsonruss.com
No Logo Margaret Eckert, Plaintiff

Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by strattonfaxon.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/10/2010 Joel Thomas Faxon +1 203 624 9500 +1 203 624 9100 jfaxon@strattonfaxon.com
No Logo Marilyn A. Marzolf, Plaintiff

Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

No Logo Marilyn Kausner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angelo M. Patacca, Jr. +1 904 632 2424 +1 904 632 0549 apatacca@mac.com

Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Terrell Hogan Ellis Yegelwel, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Wayne Hogan +1 904 632 2424 +1 904 353 4418 hogan@terrellhogan.com
No Logo Michael Monachino, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Murphy +1 212 768 5400 +9847 984 984 7700

Represented by Doran & Murphy, LLP

Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

No Logo Michele Beiter, Plaintiff

Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Steel Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul I. Perlman +1 716 848 1479 +1 716 819 4616 pperlman@hodgsonruss.com
No Logo Neil J. Prisco, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Schiavo +1 843 216 9374

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jim Brauchle +1 843 216 9243 +1 843 216 9450 jbrauchle@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick +4577 457 457 7728 +4577 457 457 7708 ffitzpatrick@motleyrice.com
No Logo Pamela Jones, Plaintiff

Represented by Speiser, Krause, Nolan & Granito

No Logo Paul Beiter, Plaintiff

Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Steel Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul I. Perlman +1 716 848 1479 +1 716 819 4616 pperlman@hodgsonruss.com
No Logo Ping, Wang, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Viking Capital Group Inc

Represented by Connors & Vilardo, LLP

Represented by Speiser, Krause, Nolan & Granito

No Logo Plaintiffs Liaison Hugh M. Russ, III, Plaintiff

Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

No Logo Ramona Figueroa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Podhurst Orseck, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven Craig Marks +1 305 358 2800 +1 305 358 2382 smarks@podhurst.com
No Logo Rana Beth Lang, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wolk Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/29/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard E. Genter +1 215 545 4220
No Logo Rana Lang, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wolk Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Genter +1 215 545 4220
No Logo Robert R. Perry, Plaintiff

Represented by Clifford Law Offices, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson, McAskill & Crosby, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles S. Desmond, II +1 716 856 4200 +1 716 856 4013 cdesmond@gmclaw.com
No Logo Robin Tolsma, Plaintiff

Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Steel Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/14/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul I. Perlman +1 716 848 1479 +1 716 819 4616 pperlman@hodgsonruss.com
No Logo Roger V. Des Forges, Plaintiff

Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Magavern Magavern Grimm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/22/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard A. Grimm, III +1 716 856 3500 +1 716 856 3390 rgrimm@magavern.com
No Logo Russel Safran, Plaintiff

Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wolk Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/07/2010 Richard E. Genter +1 215 545 4220
No Logo Salvatore Poidomani, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Schiavo +1 843 216 9374

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jim Brauchle +1 843 216 9243 +1 843 216 9450 jbrauchle@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick +4577 457 457 7728 +4577 457 457 7708 ffitzpatrick@motleyrice.com
No Logo Scott A. Maurer, Plaintiff

Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

No Logo Sharon M. Green, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kantor and Godwin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/17/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY David Daniel White +1 716 759 1500 +1 716 759 2117 ddw@davidwhitewnylaw.com

Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

No Logo Shawn Ries, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Magavern Magavern Grimm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Grimm, III +1 716 856 3500 +1 716 856 3390 rgrimm@magavern.com
No Logo Theresa A. Maurer, Plaintiff

Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

No Logo Tina Siniscalco, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Manning & Gonzalez, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/03/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Kenneth A. Manning +1 219 865 8376 +1 219 865 4054 Ken@kmmglawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/03/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Timothy W. Hoover +1 716 551 3341 timothy_hoover@fd.org
No Logo Veneita Reid, Plaintiff

Represented by Gair, Gair, Conason, Steigman, Mackauf, Bloom & Rubinowitz

Toggle Switch Represented by Webster Szanyi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin A. Szanyi +1 716 842 2800 +1 716 845 6709 kszanyi@websterszanyi.com
No Logo Xiaojun Pan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm of Jonathan C. Reiter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Charles Reiter +1 212 736 0979 +1 212 268 5297 jcrlaw@hotmail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meryl Iris Schwartz +1 212 736 0979 +1 212 268 5297 meryl6265@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bombardier Aerospace Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by tlblaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Brady +1 901 529 9900 +1 901 529 9910 mbrady@tlblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Treece, Alfrey, Musat & Bosworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Richard Musat +1 303 292 2700 +1 303 295 0414 lrmusat@tamlegal.com
No Logo Bombardier Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by tlblaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Brady +1 901 529 9900 +1 901 529 9910 mbrady@tlblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Treece, Alfrey, Musat & Bosworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Richard Musat +1 303 292 2700 +1 303 295 0414 lrmusat@tamlegal.com
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2009 O'neill, Michael J

Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Toggle Switch Represented by Hiscock & Barclay, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A. Goldberg +1 716 856 5400

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID J. HARRINGTON +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010 david.harrington@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scarinci & Hollenbeck

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/13/2010 PATRICK J. SWEENEY +1 201 392 8900
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson Kill & Olick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010 James M. Andriola +1 212 278 1501 +1 212 278 1733 jandriola@andersonkill.com

Represented by Harris Beach PLLC

Represented by Reed Smith LLP

No Logo Flightsafety International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/03/2011 Charles H. Smith 1 +10 +10 1000

Toggle Switch Represented by Damon Morey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/03/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Hedwig M. Auletta +1 716 858 3707 +1 716 856 5535 hauletta@damonmorey.com
TERMINATED: 01/03/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas J. Drury +1 716 858 3845 +1 716 856 5535 tdrury@damonmorey.com

Represented by Smith Moore LLP

No Logo Flight Safety Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles H. Smith 1 +10 +10 1000

Toggle Switch Represented by Damon Morey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hedwig M. Auletta +1 716 858 3707 +1 716 856 5535 hauletta@damonmorey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Drury +1 716 858 3845 +1 716 856 5535 tdrury@damonmorey.com

Represented by Smith Moore LLP

No Logo Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2009 O'neill, Michael J

Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Toggle Switch Represented by Hiscock & Barclay, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A. Goldberg +1 716 856 5400

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID J. HARRINGTON +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010 david.harrington@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scarinci & Hollenbeck

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/13/2010 PATRICK J. SWEENEY +1 201 392 8900
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1407
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (1337) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 1334 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
    LREF
    Sealed Legal Document 1333 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
    Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
      LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 1332 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
      Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
        LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 1331 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
        Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
          LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 1330 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
          Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
            LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 1329 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
            Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
              LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 1328 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
              Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 1327 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1326 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 4/2/2014. Counsel report that all remaining cases have settled. Counsel further report that they will consult and propose an omnibus order for the Court's review that will resolve all remaining procedural issues and bring this multi-district litigation to a final conclusion. Counsel appearances per attached Attorney Sign-In Sheet. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(JDK) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 1325 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                    Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1324 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Settlement Conference/Hearing held on 4/2/2014 in Wang v. Colgan Air (09-CV-00769S). APPEARANCES: Terrence M. Connors, Lawlor Quinlaw III, Paul A. Woodard for Plaintiff; Plaintiff Ping Wang; Oliver K. Beiersdorf, Terrance P. Flynn, David J. Harrington and Neil A. Goldberg for Defendants. A Global representative also present. (FTR GOLD) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(DAZ) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1323 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (1270 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 337 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM) Joint MOTION to Exclude Proffered Expert Testimony of Camille Wortman PhD, Lynda Geller PhD, Paula Janicki PhD and Theresa Motyka (filed under seal) filed by Ping Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq. (filed under seal), # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1322 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (316 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM, 1232 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM) MOTION Joint Motion to Preclude All Opinions of Dr. Joseph Burton and to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Post-Impact Pain and Suffering Claim (filed under seal) filed by Ping Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq. (filed under seal), # 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts (filed under seal), # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1321 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (1228 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 312 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM) Joint MOTION To Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Maurice Preter (filed under seal) filed by Ping Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq. (filed under seal), # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1320 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (1227 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 311 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Ping Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1319 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                RESPONSE in Opposition re (317 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM, 1233 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM) Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Charles M. Pereira (filed under seal) filed by Ping Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq. (filed under seal), # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1318 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re (1234 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 318 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM) Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Prejudicial Animations (filed under seal) filed by Ping Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq. (filed under seal), # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1317 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (338 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM) Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing Plaintiff's claim for lost income and to limit the proffered expert testimony of Richard A. Wall, PhD (filed under seal) filed by Ping Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq. (filed under seal), # 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts (filed under seal), # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1316 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                      DECLARATION re (336 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM) Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Plaintiff's Claims for Non-pecuniary Damages filed by Ping Wang filed by Ping Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1315 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                        STATUS REPORT by Terrence M. Connors. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1314 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (343 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM, 1279 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM) MOTION (1) to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Steven Roberts, or, in the Alternative, (2) to Compel Defendants to Disclose Additional Information Regarding the Animation Program Used by Roberts and (3) to Exclude Roberts's Animations Number (Filed Under Seal) filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Declaration of Steven Roberts (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(Harrington, David) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1313 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re (300 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS-JJM) MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Thomas M. McNish, M.D., M.P.H., and to Strike His Supplemental Expert Report filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Thomas M. McNish Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibits A to C Filed Under Seal, # 3 Memorandum of Law Filed Under Seal, # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1312 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Compel Compliance with the Court's Prior Discovery Order by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Compliance with Rule 37(a)(1), # 3 Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1311 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Telephonic Settlement Hearing held on 3/27/2014 in the Harel v. Colgan Air, 10-CV-00003S. APPEARANCES: James P. Kreinder for Plaintiff; Plaintiff Andy Harel; Neil Goldberg for Defendants. (FTR GOLD) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS-JJM(DAZ) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1310 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO: ALL CASES      IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the request to extend the briefing schedule for Defendant Colgan/Pinnacle's 1275 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED.      IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendant Colgan/Pinnacle's 1222 Motion in Limine by March 31, 2014. Defendant may file a reply by April 11, 2014.      SO ORDERED.      Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 3/25/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1309 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Settlement Hearing held on 3/24/2014 in Davidson v. Colgan Air (09-CV-00378S), Davidson v. Colgan Air (09-CV-00379S). APPEARANCES: Paul G. Joyce, Michael S. Krzak (via telephone); Plaintiff Carrie Davidson (via telephone); Oliver K. Beiersdorf (via telephone), Neil A. Goldberg for Defendants. (FTR GOLD). Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00378-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00379-WMS-JJM(DAZ) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1308 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Settlement Hearing held on 3/24/2014 in Perry v. Colgan Air (09, CV-440S). APPEARANCES: Brian P. Crosby, Michael S. Krzak (via telephone) for Plaintiff; Plaintiff Robert Perry (via telephone); Oliver Beiersdorf (via telephone), Neil A. Goldberg for Defendants. (FTR GOLD). Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS-JJM(DAZ) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1307 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Settlement Hearing held on 3/24/2014 in Neill v. Colgan Air, (09-CV-294S). APPEARANCES: Paul G. Joyce, Michael S. Krzak (via telephone) for Plaintiff; Plaintiff James L. Neill (via telephone); Oliver K. Beiersdorf (via telephone), Neil A. Goldberg for Defendants. (FTR GOLD) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00294-WMS-JJM(DAZ) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1306 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Sealed Document-Continued from 1305 Sealed Document, Continued from Sealed Document 1304 , continued from 1303 Sealed Document, continued from 1302 Sealed Document, continued from 1301 Sealed Document, continued from 1299 Sealed Document, continued from 1298 Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1305 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Sealed Document-Continued from Sealed Document 1304 , continued from 1303 Sealed Document, continued from 1302 Sealed Document, continued from 1301 Sealed Document, continued from 1299 Sealed Document, continued from 1298 Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued, # 14 document continued, # 15 document continued, # 16 document continued, # 17 document continued, # 18 document continued, # 19 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1304 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Sealed Document-continued from 1303 Sealed Document, continued from 1302 Sealed Document, continued from 1301 Sealed Document, continued from 1299 Sealed Document, continued from 1298 Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued, # 14 document continued, # 15 document continued, # 16 document continued, # 17 document continued, # 18 document continued, # 19 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1303 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Sealed Document-Continued from 1302 Sealed Document, continued from 1301 Sealed Document, Continued from 1299 Sealed Document, continued from 1298 Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1302 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Sealed Document-Continued from 1301 Sealed Document, continued from 1299 Sealed Document, continued from 1298 Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1301 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Sealed Document-Continued from 1299 Sealed Document which was continued from 1298 Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued, # 14 document continued, # 15 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1300 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Settlement Conference held on 3/20/2014 in Davidson v. Colgan Air (09-CV-00378S), Davidson v. Colgan Air (09-CV-00379S) and Beutel v. Colgan Air (09-CV-00514S). APPEARANCES: Anthony J. Colucci, II, Paul G. Joyce, Robert A. Clifford and Michael S. Krzak for Plaintiffs Davidson and Beutel; Oliver K. Beiersdorf, David J. Harrington and Neil A. Goldberg for Defendants. (FTR GOLD on Beutel case). Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00378-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00379-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00514-WMS-JJM(DAZ) (DAZ). (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1299 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Sealed Document-Continued from 1298 Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued, # 14 document continued, # 15 document continued, # 16 document continued, # 17 document continued, # 18 document continued, # 19 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1298 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1297 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1296 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Settlement Conference held on 3/19/2014 in Neill v. Colgan Air (09-CV-00294S), Perry v. Colgan Air (09-CV-00440S) and Harel v. Colgan Air (10-CV-00003S). APPEARANCES: Anthony J. Colucci, II, Michael J. Keane, Robert A. Clifford and Michael S. Krzak for Plaintiffs Neill and Perry; James P. Kreindler and Justin T. Green for Plaintiff Harel; Oliver K. Beiersdorf, David J. Harrington and Neil A. Goldberg for Defendants. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00294-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS-JJM, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS-JJM(DAZ) (DAZ). (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1295 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Settlement Conference held on 3/18/2014 as to Wang v. Colgan Air (09-CV-769S) and Pan v. Colgan Air (09-CV-961S). APPEARANCES: Terrence M. Connors and Lawlor Quinlan III for Plaintiff Wang; Jonathan C. Reiter for Plaintiff Pan; Oliver K. Beiersdorf, David J. Harrington, Neil A. Goldberg for Defendants. (FTR GOLD on Pan case only). Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS-JJM(DAZ) (DAZ). (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1294 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1293 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    Sealed Document Manually Filed-Exhibit B-DVD to Declaration of Terrence M. Connors re 1279 Motion Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1292 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1291 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1290 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1289 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1288 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1287 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1286 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1285 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1284 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1283 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued, # 14 document continued, # 15 document continued, # 16 document continued, # 17 document continued, # 18 document continued, # 19 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1282 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Sealed Document-Continuation of 1281 (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued, # 14 document continued, # 15 document continued, # 16 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1281 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued, # 14 document continued, # 15 document continued, # 16 document continued, # 17 document continued, # 18 document continued, # 19 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1280 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Proposed Testimony of Brian J. Smith by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq. (filed under seal), # 2 Memorandum in Support (filed under seal), # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1279 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION (1) to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Steven Roberts, or, in the Alternative, (2) to Compel Defendants to Disclose Additional Information Regarding the Animation Program Used by Roberts and (3) to Exclude Roberts's Animations Numbered 12, 15, and 18 by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq. (filed under seal), # 2 Memorandum in Support (filed under seal), # 3 Certificate of Compliance with Rule 37(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1278 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Robert A. Nester by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq. (filed under seal), # 2 Memorandum in Support (filed under seal), # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1277 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Thomas M. McNish, M.D., M.P.H., and to Strike His Supplemental Expert Report by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq. (filed under seal), # 2 Memorandum in Support (filed under seal), # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1276 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Julianne M. Fox by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq. (filed under seal), # 2 Memorandum in Support (filed under seal), # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1275 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Plaintiffs' Claims for Punitive Damages by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Filed under seal), # 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts (Filed under seal), # 3 Affidavit of David J. Harrington, # 4 Exhibit (Filed under seal), # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 20, # 14 Exhibit 21, # 15 Exhibit 22, # 16 Exhibit 25, # 17 Exhibit 29, # 18 Exhibit 30, # 19 Exhibit 31, # 20 Exhibit 51, # 21 Exhibit 53, # 22 Exhibit 55, # 23 Exhibit 56, # 24 Exhibit 57, # 25 Exhibit 58, # 26 Exhibit 59, # 27 Exhibit 60, # 28 Exhibit 61, # 29 Exhibit 62, # 30 Exhibit 63, # 31 Exhibit 65, # 32 Exhibit 66, # 33 Exhibit 67, # 34 Exhibit 72, # 35 Exhibit 81, # 36 Exhibit 82, # 37 Exhibit 83, # 38 Exhibit 88, # 39 Exhibit 89, # 40 Exhibit 90, # 41 Exhibit 91, # 42 Exhibit 92, # 43 Exhibit 93, # 44 Exhibit 94, # 45 Exhibit 95, # 46 Exhibit 96, # 47 Exhibit 97, # 48 Exhibit 98, # 49 Exhibit 99, # 50 Exhibit 104, # 51 Exhibit 113, # 52 Exhibit 115, # 53 Exhibit 116, # 54 Exhibit 120, # 55 Exhibit 121, # 56 Exhibit 122, # 57 Exhibit 124, # 58 Exhibit 125, # 59 Exhibit 128, # 60 Exhibit 133, # 61 Exhibit 137, # 62 Exhibit 139, # 63 Exhibit 144, # 64 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1274 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION IN LIMINE to exclude certain opinions and testimony of Patrick F. Kennedy, Ph.D. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Krzak, Michael) Modified on 3/14/2014 to convert to motion (SG). (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1273 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SEALED DOCUMENT , Memorandum in Support re 1274 MOTION in Limine filed by Robert R. Perry. (Krzak, Michael) Modified title on 3/14/2014 (SG). (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1272 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SEALED DOCUMENTS RE 1274 Motion, DECLARATION by Robert R. Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Kennedy Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Kennedy Deposition in Perry Case, # 3 Exhibit C - Kennedy Deposition in Neill Case, # 4 Exhibit D - Spreadsheet, # 5 Exhibit E - Deposition of Robert Perry, Vol. II, # 6 Exhibit F - Deposition f Robert Perry, Vol. I)(Krzak, Michael) Modified on 3/14/2014 to amend title and terminate as a motion(SG). (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1271 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Neil A. Goldberg filed under seal, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibits B to F filed under seal, # 4 Statement of Undisputed Facts filed under seal, # 5 Memorandum in Support filed under seal, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1270 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Exclude Proffered Expert Testimony of Camille Wortman PhD, Lynda Geller PhD, Paula Janicki PhD and Theresa Motyka by Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Neil A. Goldberg filed under seal, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibits B to L filed under seal, # 4 Memorandum in Support filed under seal, # 5 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1269 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Expert Reports and Testimony of David N. Schwartz and David A. Kennett by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Filed Under Seal), # 2 Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 3 Exhibit 1 through 13 (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS-JJM(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1268 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Expert Reports and Testimony of Alan M. Johnson and David A. Kennett by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Filed Under Seal), # 2 Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 3 Exhibit 1, 3 through 6 and 8 through 12 (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS-JJM(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1267 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Thomas G. Rawski and to Preclude David McCann from Testifying as a Fact Witness by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Filed Under Seal), # 2 Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 3 Exhibit 1 - 19 (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS-JJM(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1266 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Plaintiff's Claims for Non-pecuniary Damages (09-cv-769 Wang) by Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Neil A. Goldberg filed under seal, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B filed under seal, # 4 Statement of Undisputed Facts filed under seal, # 5 Memorandum in Support filed under seal, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1265 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO: ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, the briefing deadlines for dispositive motions are extended. Dispositive motions are due by March 13, 2014; responses are due by April 1, 2014; replies are due by April 8, 2014. SO ORDERED Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 3/6/2014. (MEAL) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al. (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1264 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1263 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1262 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00514-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1261 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1260 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1259 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to exclude proffered expert testimony of Brent Longnecker and Richard A. Wall (correction to docket number 1258) by Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Neil A. Goldberg filed under seal, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibits B - H filed under seal, # 4 Memorandum in Support fileder under seal, # 5 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS-JJM(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1258 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Exclude Proffered Expert Testimony of Brent Longnecker and Richard A. Wall by Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Neil A. Goldberg filed under seal, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibits B - H filed under seal, # 4 Memorandum in Support filed under seal, # 5 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS-JJM(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1257 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Claims by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS-JJM(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1256 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO: 09-CV-961S IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendants' 1241 Motion to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. Defendants' memorandum in support of its motion in limine is not to exceed 35 pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 3/6/2014. (MEAL) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS-JJM (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1255 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, the briefing deadlines for motions brought pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc., 509 U.S. 579, 113 S.Ct. 2786, 125 L.Ed.2d 469 (1993), and its progeny, are extended. Daubert motions are due by March 13, 2014; responses are due by April 1, 2014; replies are due by April 8, 2014. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 3/6/2014. (MEAL) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al. (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1254 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendants' 1229 Motion to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. Defendants' memorandum in support of its motion for summary judgment is not to exceed 100 pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 3/6/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1253 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1252 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00294-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1251 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Exclude the Proffered Expert Testimony of Brent Longnecker and to Limit the Proffered Expert Testimony of Richard A. Wall by Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Neil A. Goldberg filed under seal, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibits B - F filed under seal, # 4 Memorandum in Support filed unde seal, # 5 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00514-WMS-JJM(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1250 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 3 Declaration of Oliver Beiersdorf, # 4 Exhibits 1-10 to Beiersdorf Declaration, # 5 Exhibits 11-20 to Beiersdorf Declaration, # 6 Exhibits 21-30 to Beiersdorf Declaration, # 7 Exhibits 31-40 to Beiersdorf Declaration, # 8 Exhibits 41-54 to Beiersdorf Declaration, # 9 Declaration of John Marshall, # 10 Exhibit A to Marshall Declaration, # 11 Declaration of Stuart Schofield, # 12 Exhibit A to Schofield Declaration, # 13 Certificate of Service)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1249 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Captain Brian A. Schiff by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Filed Under Seal), # 2 Affidavit of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A and B (Filed Under Seal, # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1248 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1247 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document Manually Filed Exhibit B-Disk of Animations re 1234 Motion in Limine Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1246 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1245 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Limit the Proffered Expert Testimony of Patricia A. Pacey by Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Neil A. Goldberg filed under seal, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibits B - E filed under seal, # 4 Memorandum in Support filed under seal, # 5 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS-JJM(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1244 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Exclude Proffered Expert Testimony of Richard A. Wall by Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Neil A. Goldberg filed under seal, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibits B - G filed under seal, # 4 Memorandum in Support filed under seal, # 5 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00294-WMS-JJM(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1243 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document manually filed Exhibit B-Disk of Animations re 1233 Motion in Limine Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1242 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1241 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Pinnacle Airlines Corp..Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS-JJM(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1240 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document Continuation of 1239 (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued, # 14 document continued, # 15 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1239 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued, # 14 document continued, # 15 document continued, # 16 document continued, # 17 document continued, # 18 document continued, # 19 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1238 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1237 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1236 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude in Part the Opinions and Testimony of Gregory A. Feith by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Filed Under Seal, # 2 Affidavit of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A, B, C (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1235 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Exclude in Part the Opinions & Testimony of Captain Barry Schiff by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Filed under seal), # 2 Affidavit of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A & B (Filed under seal), # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E (Filed under seal), # 7 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1234 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Prejudicial Animations by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Filed under seal), # 2 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A (Filed under seal), # 4 Exhibit B (Filed under seal), # 5 Exhibit C (Filed under seal), # 6 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1233 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Charles M. Pereira by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Filed under seal), # 2 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A (Filed under seal), # 4 Exhibit B (Filed under seal), # 5 Exhibit C (Filed under seal), # 6 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1232 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Joint Motion to Preclude All Opinions of Dr. Joseph Burton and to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Post-Impact Pain and Suffering Claim by Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Neil A. Goldberg filed under seal, # 2 Exhibit A-Z, AA-FF, HH, II, MM filed under seal, # 3 Statement of Undisputed Facts filed under seal, # 4 Memorandum in Support filed under seal, # 5 Exhibit GG, # 6 Exhibit JJ, # 7 Exhibit KK, # 8 Exhibit LL, # 9 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1231 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1230 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendant's 1220 Motion to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. Defendant's memorandum of law in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' responsive memorandum of law are not to exceed 45 pages. Defendant's reply memorandum of law is not to exceed 20 pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 2/26/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1229 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Pinnacle Airlines Corp..Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1228 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION To Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Maurice Preter by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration in Support, # 3 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), # 6 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1227 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit of Marissa N. Lefland, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS-JJM(Lefland, Marissa) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1226 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Marissa N. Lefland on behalf of Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Lefland, Marissa) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1225 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 sealed document continued, # 2 sealed document continued, # 3 sealed document continued, # 4 sealed document continued, # 5 sealed document continued, # 6 sealed document continued, # 7 sealed document continued, # 8 sealed document continued, # 9 sealed document continued, # 10 sealed document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1224 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RE-ENTERED TEXT ORDER FOR DOCKETING PURPOSES ONLY - Dkt. 1215 from 09-MD-2085 - TEXT ORDER : As agreed to by the parties at yesterday's chambers conference, by March 7, 2014, each party shall submit to me their previous mediation submissions along with any updated information, and confidential settlement statements containing their "best and final" settlement positions. The parties shall also copy me on any settlement submissions they exchange. Individual settlement conferences will be conducted in half-day (morning/afternoon) sessions during the week of March 17 - 21, 2014. The parties shall attempt to agree among themselves as to the dates for individual conferences during that week, and shall submit their proposals to me by February 26, 2014. For planning purposes, the parties should assume that they must appear in person; however, I may waive this requirement in particular instances for good cause shown, in writing, no later than February 26, 2014. The parties have also agreed that I may conduct ex parte settlement discussions. Notwithstanding these settlement discussions, any deadlines set by Chief Judge Skretny will remain in effect. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 2/7/14. (DAZ) (Entered: 02/07/2014) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(DAZ) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1223 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Opinions and Testimony of Maurice Preter by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Oliver Beiersdorf, # 3 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), # 6 Certificate of Service)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1222 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of the Post-Accident Sabatini Assessments and Underlying Materials by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Under Seal), # 2 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A-J (Under Seal), # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1221 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendants' 1219 Motion to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. Defendants' memorandum is not to exceed 50 pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 2/21/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1220 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1219 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp..Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1218 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re (251 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS-JJM) MOTION for Reconsideration re (247 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS) Order on Motion to Compel, filed by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1217 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION -- This Document Relates To: 09-CV-961. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 02/14/2014. (MEAL) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS-JJM (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1216 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/29/14, before Judge Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2014. (SG) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1215 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER : As agreed to by the parties at yesterday's chambers conference, by March 7, 2014, each party shall submit to me their previous mediation submissions along with any updated information, and confidential settlement statements containing their "best and final" settlement positions. The parties shall also copy me on any settlement submissions they exchange. Individual settlement conferences will be conducted in half-day (morning/afternoon) sessions during the week of March 17 - 21, 2014. The parties shall attempt to agree among themselves as to the dates for individual conferences during that week, and shall submit their proposals to me by February 26, 2014. For planning purposes, the parties should assume that they must appear in person; however, I may waive this requirement in particular instances for good cause shown, in writing, no later than February 26, 2014. The parties have also agreed that I may conduct ex parte settlement discussions. Notwithstanding these settlement discussions, any deadlines set by Chief Judge Skretny will remain in effect. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 2/7/14. (DAZ) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1214 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 1/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Order Attachment (Civil-Jury)) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1213 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER This document relates to ALL CASES. Based on the discussion in court on January 29, 2014, concerning the parties' desire to engage in additional mediation, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the remaining individual cases are each REFERRED to the Honorable Jeremiah J. McCarthy, United States Magistrate Judge, for mediation proceedings. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 1/31/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1212 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 1/29/2014. Counsel report that an additional state case has settled and that trial in the state case is scheduled for August 2014. Discussion of the parties proposed Pretrial Order held. Court advises that it will grant the same. Discussion of additional mediation held. Court will issue Order concerning whether additional mediation will be with a court mediator or a Magistrate Judge. Court schedules a further status conference for April 2, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel appearances per attached Attorney Sign-In Sheet. (Electronic Court Recorder - FTR Gold.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (JDK) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1211 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Joint Status Memorandum by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pretrial Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1210 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Sara K. Kornbluh on behalf of Continental Airlines, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kornbluh, Sara) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1209 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING TIME CHANGE NOTICE. The TIME of the Status Conference scheduled for 1/29/2014 before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge has been MOVED UP to 11:00 AM. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the 1173 briefing deadlines for dispositive motions are likewise applicable to any motions brought pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc., 509 U.S. 579, 113 S.Ct. 2786, 125 L.Ed.2d 469 (1993), and its progeny. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 1/19/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re (338 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 1196 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 325 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 287 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 251 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 356 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 334 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 310 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 334 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS) MOTION for Reconsideration re (247 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS) Order on Motion to Compel, filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1206 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal 09cv929 Johnson by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1205 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECISION AND ORDER -- This relates to 09-CV-769S DENYING Plaintiff's 1195 Motion to Prevent Defendants From Restricting Plaintiff's Experts From Interviewing Plaintiff and Her Son Before Those Experts Are Deposed. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 12/13/2013. (MEAL) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1204 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re (286 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS) MOTION for an Order Preventing the Defendants from Restricting Plaintiff's Experts from Interviewing Plaintiff and Her Son Before Those Experts Are Deposed filed by Ping Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(Quinlan, Lawlor) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1203 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document. Affidavit in opposition to 1195 Motion for an Order Preventing the Defendants from Restricting the Plaintiffs' Experts (Attachments: # 1 exhibit A-1, # 2 exhibit A-2, # 3 exhibit B-1, # 4 exhibit B-2, # 5 exhibit C, # 6 exhibit D, # 7 exhibit E, # 8 exhibit F, # 9 exhibit G, # 10 exhibit H)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(DZ) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1202 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' 1196 Motion for Reconsideration of this Court's 1181 Decision and Order is due by January 17, 2014. Plaintiffs' reply is due by February 14, 2014. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 12/10/2013. (MEAL) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1201 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (286 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS) MOTION for an Order Preventing the Defendants from Restricting Plaintiff's Experts from Interviewing Plaintiff and Her Son Before Those Experts Are Deposed filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Affidavit in Opposition (filed under seal with exhibits A to H))Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1200 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/20/13, before Judge William M. Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, Telephone number (716) 332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/30/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(DZ) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1199 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/23/13, before Judge William M. Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, Telephone number (716) 332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/30/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(DZ) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1198 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. Affidavit in support of 1195 Motion for an Order Preventing the Defendants from Restricting the Plaintiffs' Experts (Attachments: # 1 exhibit A, # 2 exhibit B, # 3 exhibit C, # 4 exhibits D - H)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(DZ) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1197 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. Affidavit in support of 1193 Motion to Expedite (Attachments: # 1 exhibit A, # 2 exhibit B, # 3 exhibit C, # 4 exhibit D-H)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(DZ) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1196 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re (247 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS) Order on Motion to Compel, by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq., # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1195 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for an Order Preventing the Defendants from Restricting Plaintiff's Experts from Interviewing Plaintiff and Her Son Before Those Experts Are Deposed by Ping Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq., with Exhibits A-H (filed under seal), # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Certificate of Compliance with Rule 37(a)(1), # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1194 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER RELATES TO 09-CV-769S IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Plaintiff's 1193 Consent Motion to Expedite her [1193-2] Motion to Prevent Defendants from Restricting Plaintiff's Experts from Conducting Interviews is GRANTED. Plaintiff must file and serve the [1193-2] motion and supporting declaration on or before Friday, December 6, 2013. Defendants must file and serve their response to Plaintiff's motion on or before Monday, December 9, 2013. Plaintiff may file and serve a reply by Wednesday, December 11, 2013. Oral argument will be scheduled, if necessary, by separate order. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 12/6/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(MEAL) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1193 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Preventing the Defendants from Restricting Plaintiff's Experts from Interviewing Plaintiff and Her Son Before Those Experts Are Deposed by Ping Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq., # 2 Notice of Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Preventing the Defendants from Restricting Plaintiff's Experts from Interviewing Plaintiff and Her Son Before Those Experts Are Deposed, # 3 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq., with Exhibits A-H (filed under seal), # 4 Memorandum in Support, # 5 Certificate of Compliance with Rule 37(a)(1), # 6 Text of Proposed Order, # 7 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1192 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER regarding Trial -- Relates to all cases. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 11/26/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1191 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 11/20/2013. Discussion of the parties' 1190 trial proposals held. Court is inclined to accept Plaintiffs' proposal, but reserves decision. Court will issue an Order. Counsel report that discovery is on track and deadlines in CMO should be met. Counsel report that they have reached agreement on producing expert discovery before expert depositions are conducted. Court schedules a further status conference for January 29, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel appearances per attached Attorney Sign-In Sheet. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(JDK) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1190 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Joint Status Memorandum by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1189 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 288 Motion for a declaration that New York law applies to the issue of compensatory damages; DENYING Defendants' Cross-Motion for the application of Chinese law to the issue of damages. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 11/19/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1188 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECISION AND ORDER -- This document relates to 09-CV-769S GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Colgan's 1167 Motion to Compel Discovery; DIRECTING Plaintiff to provide responsive documents as ordered herein by 12/1/2013. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 11/17/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1187 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00929-WMS(SG) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1186 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document-Affidavit in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00929-WMS(SG) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1185 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document-Attorney's Affirmation in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00929-WMS(SG) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1184 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document-Attorney's Affirmation in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00929-WMS(SG) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1183 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document-Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00929-WMS(SG) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1182 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Settlement with Certificate of Service, filed Under Seal by Ashley Johnson.(Nolan, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1181 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECISION AND ORDER -- Relates to all cases GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Plaintiffs' 842 Motion for an Order Overruling Objections to their Second Request for the Production of Documents and Things; DIRECTING Defendants to provide responsive documents as ordered herein by December 1, 2013. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 11/6/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1180 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 sealed document continued, # 2 sealed document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(SG) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1179 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY/RESPONSE to re (269 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 1167 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Ping Wang, as Administrator ad prosequendum of the Estate of Zhaofang Guo, to Produce Documents and Answer Interrogatories (Under Seal) filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Reply Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F (Under Seal), # 8 Reply Declaration of Peter R. Coons, # 9 Reply Declaration of Dr. David L. Holmes, Ed.D., # 10 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1178 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECISION AND ORDER This case relates to: 09-CV-440S, 09-CV-379S, 09-CV-378S, 09-CV-294S GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery in Perry (Civil (09-CV-440S) Docket Nos. 275, 337; MDL (09-md-2085) Docket Nos. 933, 1143); GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery in Davidson (Civil (09-CV-378S, 09-CV-379S) Docket No. 262; MDL (09-md-2085) Docket No. 936); GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery in Neill (Civil (09-CV-294S) Docket No. 270; MDL (09-md-2085) Docket No. 952); DIRECTING Plaintiffs to provide responsive documents as ordered herein within 20 days of the entry date of this decision. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 11/3/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS(MEAL) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1177 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECISION AND ORDER This Document relates to 09-CV-294S, 09-CV-378S, 09-CV-379S, 09-CV-440S, 09-CV-514S GRANTING Defendants' 788 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 11/3/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1176 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re (269 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Ping Wang, as Administrator ad prosequendum of the Estate of Zhaofang Guo, to Produce Documents and Answer Interrogatories Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq., filed by Ping Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Memorandum in Support, # 11 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1175 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY/RESPONSE to re (295 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 1163 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) Cross MOTION for the Application of Chinese Law to Compensatory Damages and in Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for the Application of New York Law to Compensatory Damages filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C (Part 1 of 2), # 5 Exhibit C (Part 2 of 2), # 6 Affidavit of Professor Richard A. Boswell, # 7 Exhibit A, # 8 Affidavit of Xiaolin Zhou, # 9 Affidavit of Cui Jianyuan, # 10 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1174 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY/RESPONSE to re (295 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 1163 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) Cross MOTION for the Application of Chinese Law to Compensatory Damages and in Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for the Application of New York Law to Compensatory Damages filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1173 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -- AMENDED -- RELATES TO ALL CASES. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 10/24/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1172 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny U.S.D.J: Status Conference held on 10/23/2013. Discussion on March 2014 trial date held. Plaintiffs' position is that the March 2014 trial date should not be adjourned. Defendants' position is that an adjustment to the trial date is required to complete outstanding discovery and anticipated dispositive motions. Court directs counsel to meet and confer about how trial in these cases will likely proceed, including estimate of length. Court advises that it will resolve pending motions forthwith. Court adjourns trial from March 4, 2013, to May 28, 2014, and advises that no further extensions will be granted. Court announces new case management deadlines and advises that a new Case Management Order will be issued. Court denies Defendants' suggestion that Pan matter be placed on a separate track. Court advises that next status on November 20, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. will remain as scheduled. Counsel appearances per attached Attorney Sign-In Sheet. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (MEAL). (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1171 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Joint Status Memorandum by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1170 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(SG) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1169 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER - RELATES TO: 09-CV-769S IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, responses to Defendants' 1167 Motion to Compel are due by October 30, 2013, and replies are due by November 6, 2013. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 10/17/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1168 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING NOTICE -- THIS RELATES TO ALL CASES Counsel shall appear before this Court for a status conference on Wednesday, October 23, 2013, at 1:15 p.m. The parties shall file a Joint Status Memorandum by Monday, October 21, 2013, detailing the parties' positions and the issues to be discussed at the conference. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1167 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Ping Wang, as Administrator ad prosequendum of the Estate of Zhaofang Guo, to Produce Documents and Answer Interrogatories by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Filed Under Seal), # 2 Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G (Filed Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M-T (Filed Under Seal), # 16 Exhibit U, # 17 Exhibit V, # 18 Exhibit W (Filed Under Seal), # 19 Exhibit X, # 20 Exhibit Y (Filed Under Seal), # 21 Certificate of Compliance with Rule 37(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P., # 22 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1166 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY/RESPONSE to re 1154 MOTION Declaring that New York Law Applies to Compensatory Damages in this Case , 1163 Cross MOTION for the Application of Chinese Law to Compensatory Damages and in Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for the Application of New York Law to Compensatory Damages filed by Xiaojun Pan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in reply)(Schwartz, Meryl) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1165 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: 09-CV-961S IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Plaintiff's response to Defendants' 1163 Cross Motion for the Application of Chinese Law is due by October 11, 2013, and shall not exceed 25 pages. Defendants' reply is due by October 25, 2013. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/27/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1164 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 sealed exhibits)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS(SG) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1163 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Cross MOTION for the Application of Chinese Law to Compensatory Damages and in Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for the Application of New York Law to Compensatory Damages by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Opposition and Cross-Motion, # 2 Declaration of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B-K (Filed Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit L, # 6 Exhibit M, # 7 Exhibit N, # 8 Exhibit O-W (Filed Under Seal), # 9 Declaration of Cui Jianyuan, # 10 Appendix 1, # 11 Appendix 2, # 12 Appendix 3, # 13 Appendix 4, # 14 Declaration of Xiaolin Zhou, # 15 Declaration of Patrick F. Kennedy, Ph.D., # 16 Exhibit A, # 17 Exhibit B, # 18 Exhibit C, # 19 Exhibit D, # 20 Exhibit E, # 21 Exhibit F, # 22 Exhibit G, # 23 Exhibit H, # 24 Exhibit I, # 25 Exhibit J, # 26 Exhibit K, # 27 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1162 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO: 09-CV-961S IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' 1154 Motion to Declare that NY Law Applies to Compensatory Damages shall be filed by September 20, 2013, and Plaintiffs' reply, if any, shall be filed by October 11, 2013. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/12/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS(MEAL) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1161 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal Beiter 09cv488 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00488-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1160 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal Kuklewicz 09cv423 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1159 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -- This Document Relates to ALL CASES. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/6/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1158 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECISION AND ORDER -- Relates to ALL CASES DENYING Defendants' 835 Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 8/23/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1157 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document manually filed due to size. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS(SG) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1156 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that in light of this Court's 1148 decision resolving 949 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order, Plaintiffs' 1101 Motion for Leave to Make Additional Submission is MOOT. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate 1101 as a pending motion. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 08/20/13. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1155 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 8/21/2013. Counsel report that there are eight cases remaining in the MDL action and six cases in state court, four of which are wrongful death actions. Court directs counsel in Pan to consult and propose a scheduling order relative to Plaintiff's motion filed on August 19, 2013. Court advises that it is working through motions and will have decision by the end of the week on the motion pending at docket number 835 . Counsel reports that mediation efforts are ongoing and that they are actively engaged in discovery and will meet the deadlines in the new Case Management Order. Court confirms that trial is on track for March 2014. Courtroom Technology meeting between the court and counsel to take place at the beginning of next year. Counsel directed to notify the court of their IT requirements. Court schedules further status conference for November 20, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. For the plts. - Terrence Connors; Robert Clifford; Meryl Schwartz. For the defts. - David Harrington (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(JDK) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1154 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Declaring that New York Law Applies to Compensatory Damages in this Case by Xiaojun Pan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support, # 2 Expert Declaration, # 3 Expert Declaration, # 4 Expert Declaration, # 5 Memorandum in Support, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Reiter, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1153 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc. re 1152 Stipulation of Dismissal (Voluntary as to Bombardier only) (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1152 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary as to Bombardier only) by Bombardier, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:11-cv-00377-WMS(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1151 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier, Inc. re 1150 Stipulation of Dismissal (Voluntary as to Bombardier only) (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1150 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary as to Bombardier only) by Bombardier, Inc.. (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1149 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT Joint Status Memorandum by Air Crash Near Clarence Center, New York, On February 12, 2009. (Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1148 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RELATES TO ALL CASES. DECISION AND ORDER DENYING Defendants' 949 Motion for Protective Order Prohibiting the Deposition of Christopher Monteleon. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 8/15/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1147 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal 09cv266 West by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1146 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY/RESPONSE to re (275 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 933 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Robert R. Perry to Produce Documents filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1145 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS(SG) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1144 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 933 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Robert R. Perry to Produce Documents filed by Robert R. Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Michael S. Krzak, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Affidavit of Michael S. Krzak, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Affidavit of Michael S Krzak, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Affidavit of Michael S. Krzak)(Krzak, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1143 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re (275 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 933 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Robert R. Perry to Produce Documents filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1142 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER - RELATES TO: Perry, 09-CV-440S IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendants' unopposed 1138 Motion to File a Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Further Support of its 933 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their [1138-2] through [1138-8] Supplemental Memorandum of Law and exhibits by August 2, 2013. Plaintiff shall file a response by August 5, 2013. Defendants may file a reply by August 9, 2013. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 8/1/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1141 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION for Substitution of Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel by Ping Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1140 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS(SG) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1139 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary - as to Bombardier only) by Bombardier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1138 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Plaintiff Robert R. Perry, as Administrator of the Estate of Johnathan R. Perry, to Produce Documents by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Supplement, # 3 Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1137 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal (Wang - Voluntary, as to Bombardier only) by Bombardier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1136 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECISION AND ORDER -- This Document relates to 09-CV-769S GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Take In Excess of 12 Damages-Related Depositions (MDL (09-md-2085) Docket No. 1092; Civil (09-CV-769S) Docket No. 247); GRANTING Defendants leave to take 20 damages-related depositions in this action, including the two that they have already taken; GRANTING Defendants leave to reopen the deposition of Kevin Guo.Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 7/22/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(MEAL) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1135 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier, Inc. re 1134 Stipulation of Dismissal (Voluntary--as to Bombardier only) (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1134 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary--as to Bombardier only) by Bombardier, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00488-WMS(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1133 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier, Inc. re 1132 Stipulation of Dismissal (Voluntary-as to Bombardier only) (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1132 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Voluntary-as to Bombardier only) by Bombardier, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00488-WMS(Brady, Michael) Modified title on 7/23/2013 (SG). (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1131 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier, Inc. re 1130 Stipulation of Dismissal (Voluntary-as to Bombardier only) (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1130 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary--as to Bombardier only) by Bombardier, Inc.. (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1129 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier, Inc. re 1128 Stipulation of Dismissal (Voluntary-as to Bombardier only) (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1128 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary-as to Bombardier only) by Bombardier, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1127 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc. re 1126 Stipulation of Dismissal (Voluntary--as to Bombardier only) (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1126 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary--as to Bombardier only) by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1125 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc. re 1124 Stipulation of Dismissal (Voluntary-as to Bombardier only) (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1124 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary as to Bombardier only) by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00378-WMS(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1123 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc. re 1122 Stipulation of Dismissal (Voluntary as to Bombardier only) (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1122 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary-as to Bombardier only) by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00379-WMS(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1121 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc. re 1120 Stipulation of Dismissal (Voluntary-as to Bombardier only) (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1120 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary-on behalf of Bombardier only) by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1119 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc. re 1118 Stipulation of Dismissal (Voluntary as to Bombardier only) (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1118 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary-as to Bombardier only) by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00514-WMS(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1117 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc. re 1116 Stipulation of Dismissal (Voluntary-as to Bombardier only) (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1116 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary--as to Bombardier only) by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc.. (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1115 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING 1112 Motion to Resign as Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel; RELIEVING Hugh M. Russ, III, of his Liaison Counsel duties, effective July 31, 2013; DIRECTING Plaintiffs to select a new lawyer to serve as Liaison Counsel and file notice of the same by July 31, 2013. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 7/12/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1114 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY/RESPONSE to re (247 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 1092 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION for Discovery for an Order to Take In Excess Of Twelve Damages-Related Depositions filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1113 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIRMATION signed by Hugh M. Russ, III re (255 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 257 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 280 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 328 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 125 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 317 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 313 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 232 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 305 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 281 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 1112 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 141 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 313 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS) MOTION to Withdraw / Resign as Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel filed by Hugh M. Russ, III filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1112 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw / Resign as Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel by Hugh M. Russ, III.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1111 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIRMATION re (228 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 277 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 312 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 308 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 1101 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 308 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 121 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 249 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 276 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 251 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 301 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 323 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 137 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS) MOTION Leave to Make Additional Submission re (101 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 282 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 269 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 234 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 215 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 265 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 267 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 239 in 1:09-cv-00488 filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. Affirmation of David J. Harrington in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Make an Additional Submission filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1110 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re (262 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 936 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 262 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Carrie C. Davidson to Produce Documents filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 1:09-cv-00379-WMS(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re (952 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 270 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff James L. Neill to Produce Documents filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00294-WMS(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1108 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re (275 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 933 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Robert R. Perry to Produce Documents filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1107 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER as to 1092 Defendants' Motion to Take in Excess of 12 Damages Related Depositions RELATES TO 09-CV-769S IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, responses are due by July 5, 2013, and replies are due by July 12, 2013. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 6/28/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) Modified on 7/1/2013 to correct the case relationship. (MEAL). Modified on 7/1/2013 (MEAL). (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1106 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -- This Document Relates to ALL CASES. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 6/27/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1105 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1104 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1103 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1102 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00423-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1101 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Leave to Make Additional Submission re (101 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 282 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 269 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 234 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 215 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 265 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 267 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 239 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 949 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 85 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 192 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 269 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 212 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 239 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting the Deposition of Christopher Monteleon by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affirmation, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1100 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document-Attorney's Affidavit in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00423-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1099 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document-Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00423-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1098 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Settlement /COMPROMISE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(c) by Karen A. Kuklewicz.(Scime, James) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1097 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00266-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1096 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that the 1090 Stipulation in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, and the 320 Stipulation in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS are SO ORDERED. FURTHER that the claims asserted by Plaintiff Robert R. Perry on behalf of Adam Perry, Alicia Perry and Erin Perry are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) fo the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, without interests or costs to any party. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 6/24/13. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1095 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document-Attorney's Affirmation in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00266-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1094 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document-Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00266-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1093 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Plaintiffs 1086 Motion to Withdraw their 962 Motion to Compel Continental Airlines, Inc. is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the 962 motion as a pending motion on the docket. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 6/24/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1092 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Discovery for an Order to Take In Excess Of Twelve Damages-Related Depositions by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Under Seal), # 2 Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay (Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit A-K (Under Seal), # 4 Declaration of David L. Holmes (Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit A (Under Seal), # 6 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00769-WMS(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1091 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Approval of Settlement Under Seal by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00266-WMS(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1090 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Perry 09-cv-440 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1089 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document Exhibits B, C, D, E and L re 1087 Response (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00294-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1088 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James L. Neill re 1087 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Krzak, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1087 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 952 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff James L. Neill to Produce Documents filed by James L. Neill. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Michael S. Krzak, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 15 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Krzak, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1086 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw (962 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) First MOTION to Compel Continental to Produce Deposition Witnesses by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1085 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: Davidson, 09-CV-378S and 09-CV-379S IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, Defendants' replies are due by July 1, 2013. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 6/13/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 1:09-cv-00379-WMS(MEAL) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1084 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER RELATES TO Perry, 09-CV-440S IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, Defendants' replies are due by July 1, 2013. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 6/13/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1083 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER RELATES TO 09-CV-294S IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that upon agreement of counsel, Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' 952 Motion to Compel is due by June 14, 2013, and Defendants replies, if any, are due by July 1, 2013. Oral argument will be scheduled by this Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 6/13/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00294-WMS(MEAL) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1082 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 5/29/2013. Counsel report that bankruptcy stay has been lifted. Kuklewicz case has settled and 947 motion is moot. Court reinstates the 788 835 842 874 933 936 949 952 962 motions and directs the Clerk of Court to designate them as pending motions on the docket. Counsel report that settlement discussions are ongoing in all pending cases, which include 5 wrongful death actions in state court, 10 wrongful death actions in the MDL, and 1 property action in the MDL. Counsel report that discovery is completed with Defendant Bombardier and remains ongoing with the remaining defendants. Court strongly encourages the parties to resolve outstanding discovery disputes without further judicial intervention and directs counsel to file a submission concerning a proposed briefing schedule on pending motions and an update on mediation efforts by June 12, 2013. Court schedules Jury Selection and Jury Trial to commence on March 4, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. A final status conference will be held on March 3, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. Counsel report that trial will take approximately 6 weeks. Court schedules further status conference for August 21, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. For pltfs. Hugh Russ. For the defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady, Oliver Beiersdorf. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. CLERK'S OFFICE TO FOLLOW UP. (CMD) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1081 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that the 272 Stipulation ( in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS) and at 1078 in 09-md-2085 is SO ORDERED; FURTHER that the wrongful death claims for pecuniary and non-pecuniary losses asserted by Plaintiff Xiaojun Pan on behalf of Kaide Yao, YiYi Pang and Shihui Yao are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, without interests or costs to any party. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 6/5/13. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1080 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that the 303 Stipulation (in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS), and filed at 1079 in 09-md-2085 is SO ORDERED; FURTHER that the claims asserted by Plaintiff James Neill on behalf of Brendan Neill and Patrick Neill are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, without interests or costs to any party. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 6/5/13. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00294-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1079 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Claims and Proposed Order (09cv294) by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00294-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1078 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and Proposed Order Relating to Certain Claims (09cv961) by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1077 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc. re 1076 Status Report (Amended Joint) (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1076 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT (Amended Joint) by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1075 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT Joint Memorandum by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1074 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. Notice of Lift of the Bankruptcy Stay (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1073 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for May 1, 2013, at 11:30 a.m., is ADJOURNED to May 29, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel must file a joint status report by May 27, 2013, identifying the issues to be discussed at the status conference and the parties' respective positions on those issues. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 4/24/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1072 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal Kausner 10cv619 & 11cv309 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1071 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER -- This document relates to: 09-CV-432S -- GRANTING 1069 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; GRANTING 263 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:09-cv-423S-WMS; FURTHER, that this Court's Order staying this case (MDL Docket No. 983) is hereby vacated for the sole purpose of permitting the parties to complete settlement and final dismissal of this individual action with prejudice, FURTHER, that for all other purposes, this Court's Order staying this case remains in effect. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/7/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00423-WMS(MEAL) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1070 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT Joint Status Memorandum by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1069 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00423-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1068 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 1:11-cv-00309-WMS(SG) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1067 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for March 6, 2013 at 11:30 a.m. is ADJOURNED to May 1, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiffs and the non-debtor defendants must file a written joint status report by March 6, 2013, updating this Court on the status of the ongoing discovery between them. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/27/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1066 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document-Attorney's Affidavit In Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 1:11-cv-00309-WMS(SG) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1065 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document-Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 1:11-cv-00309-WMS(SG) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1064 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPROMISE by John Kausner, Marilyn Kausner.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 1:11-cv-00309-WMS(Green, Justin) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1063 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER -- This document relates to: 10-CV-619S -- GRANTING 1062 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; GRANTING 203 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:10-cv-619S-WMS; FURTHER, that this Court's Order staying this case (MDL Docket No. 983) is hereby vacated for the sole purpose of permitting the parties to complete settlement and final dismissal of this individual action with prejudice, FURTHER, that for all other purposes, this Court's Order staying this case remains in effect. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/7/2013. (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1062 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00619-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1061 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT , Joint Status Memorandum by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1060 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for January 16, 2013 at 11:30 a.m. is ADJOURNED to March 6, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiffs and the non-debtor defendants must file a written joint status report by January 16, 2013, updating this Court on the status of the ongoing discovery between them. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/7/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1059 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal Green 11cv105 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1058 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal Prisco 10cv1007 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1057 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Joint Status Memorandum by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1056 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:11-cv-00105-WMS(SG) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1055 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for October 31, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. is ADJOURNED to January 16, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiffs and the non-debtor defendants must file a written joint status report by October 31, 2012, updating this Court on the status of the ongoing discovery between them. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/19/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1054 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal Kushner 09cv632 & 11cv115 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1053 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document-Attorney's Affidavit in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:11-cv-00105-WMS(SG) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1052 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document-Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:11-cv-00105-WMS(SG) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1051 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Settlement by Sharon M. Green(Individually and as Executrix of the Estate of Bradley S. Green, and on behalf of all heirs and next-of-kin of Bradley S. Green).Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:11-cv-00105-WMS(Green, Justin) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1050 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER -- This document relates to: 11-CV-105S; GRANTING 1049 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; GRANTING 147 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:11-CV-105-WMS; FURTHER, that this Court's Order staying this case (MDL Docket No. 893) is hereby vacated for the sole purpose of permitting the parties to complete settlement and final dismissal of this individual action with prejudice, FURTHER, that for all other purposes, this Court's Order staying this case remains in effect. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/26/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:11-cv-00105-WMS(MEAL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1049 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Green 11cv105 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:11-cv-00105-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1048 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the Clerk of Court is directed to administratively terminate the motions filed at docket numbers 788 835 842 933 936 947 949 952 962 , subject to full reinstatement without prejudice and without service or costs upon the lifting of the stay. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/14/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1047 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal Monachino 09cv436 & 11cv116 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1046 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal Marzolf (Srnecz) 09cv1043 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1045 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 1:11-cv-00115-WMS(SG) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1044 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 1:11-cv-00116-WMS(SG) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1043 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document-Attorney's Affidavit in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 1:11-cv-00115-WMS(SG) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1042 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document-Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 1:11-cv-00115-WMS(SG) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1041 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Settlement by Julius Kushner, Lynn Kushner.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 1:11-cv-00115-WMS(Rose, Daniel) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1040 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document-Attorney's Affidavit in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 1:11-cv-00116-WMS(SG) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1039 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document-Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 1:11-cv-00116-WMS(SG) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1038 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc. re 1037 Status Report (Joint) by Colgan, Pinnacle, Continental, Flight Safety, all Plaintiffs, Bombardier Aerospace Corp. and Bombardier, Inc. (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1037 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Colgan, Pinnacle, Continental, Flight Safety, all Plaintiffs and by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1036 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Settlement by Michael Monachino.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 1:11-cv-00116-WMS(Rose, Daniel) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1035 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal Ries 09cv432 & 11cv124 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1034 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORRECTED TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for August 15, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. is ADJOURNED to October 31, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiffs and the non-debtor defendants must file a written joint status report by August 15, 2012 updating this Court on the status of the ongoing discovery between them. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. 8/4/2012 Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1033 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for August 15, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. is ADJOURNED to October 31, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiffs and the non-debtor defendants must file a written joint status report by May 30, 2012, updating this Court on the status of the ongoing discovery between them. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 8/4/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1032 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 1:11-cv-00777-WMS(SG) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1031 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document-Attorney's Affidavit in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 1:11-cv-00777-WMS(SG) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1030 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document-Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 1:11-cv-00777-WMS(SG) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1029 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 1:11-cv-00124-WMS(SG) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1028 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Settlement by Marilyn A. Marzolf.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 1:11-cv-00777-WMS(Green, Justin) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1027 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document-Consent to Distribution of Settlement Proceeds Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 1:11-cv-00124-WMS(SG) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1026 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document-Attorney's Affidavit in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 1:11-cv-00124-WMS(SG) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1025 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document-Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 1:11-cv-00124-WMS(SG) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1024 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal Pettys 09cv487 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1023 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Settlement by Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Shawn Ries.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 1:11-cv-00124-WMS(Spragg, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1022 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal Niewood 09cv980 & 11cv694 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1021 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal Poidomani (Quintero) 11cv118 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1020 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER -- This document relates to: 11-CV-118S -- GRANTING 1017 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; GRANTING 150 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:11-cv-118-WMS; FURTHER, that this Court's Order staying this case (MDL Docket No. 983; is hereby vacated for the sole purpose of permitting the parties to complete settlement and final dismissal of this individual action with prejudice, FURTHER, that for all other purposes, this Court's Order staying this case remains in effect. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 6/24/2012. (MEAL) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1019 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER -- This document relates to: 09-CV-632S -- GRANTING 1016 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; GRANTING 234 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:09-cv-00632-WMS; FURTHER, that this Court's Order staying this case (MDL Docket No. 983; Civil Docket No. 227) is hereby vacated for the sole purpose of permitting the parties to complete settlement and final dismissal of this individual action with prejudice, FURTHER, that for all other purposes, this Court's Order staying this case remains in effect. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 6/24/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00632-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1018 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal Bryson (Mellett) 09cv979 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1017 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Poidomani (Quintero) 11cv118 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1016 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION Kushner 09cv632 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00632-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1015 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00487-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1014 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER -- This document relates to: 09-CV-436S -- GRANTING 1010 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; GRANTING 251 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:09-cv-00436-WMS; FURTHER, that this Court's Order staying this case (MDL Docket No. 983; Civil Docket No. 244) is hereby vacated for the sole purpose of permitting the parties to complete settlement and final dismissal of this individual action with prejudice, FURTHER, that for all other purposes, this Court's Order staying this case remains in effect. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 6/19/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00436-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1013 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER -- This document relates to: 09-CV-432S -- GRANTING 1009 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; GRANTING 251 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:09-cv-00432-WMS; FURTHER, that this Court's Order staying this case (MDL Docket No. 983; Civil Docket No. 244) is hereby vacated for the sole purpose of permitting the parties to complete settlement and final dismissal of this individual action with prejudice, FURTHER, that for all other purposes, this Court's Order staying this case remains in effect. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 6/19/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00432-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1012 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER -- This document relates to: 09-CV-487S -- GRANTING 1008 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; GRANTING 260 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:09-cv-00487-WMS; FURTHER, that this Court's Order staying this case (MDL Docket No. 983; Civil Docket No. 249) is hereby vacated for the sole purpose of permitting the parties to complete settlement and final dismissal of this individual action with prejudice, FURTHER, that for all other purposes, this Court's Order staying this case remains in effect. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 6/19/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00487-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1011 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER -- This document relates to: 09-CV-1043S -- GRANTING 1007 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; GRANTING 217 Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:10-cv-01043-WMS; FURTHER, that this Court's Order staying this case (MDL Docket No. 983; Civil Docket No. 210) is hereby vacated for the sole purpose of permitting the parties to complete settlement and final dismissal of this individual action with prejudice, FURTHER, that for all other purposes, this Court's Order staying this case remains in effect. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 6/19/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-01043-WMS (MEAL) Modified on 6/19/2012 to correct the signature date. (MEAL). (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1010 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Monachino 09cv436 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00436-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Ries 09cv432 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00432-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1008 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION Pettys 09cv487 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00487-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1007 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Marzolf (Srnecz) 09cv1043 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01043-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1006 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 1:11-cv-00694-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1005 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document-Attorney's Affidavit Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 1:11-cv-00694-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1004 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document-Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 1:11-cv-00694-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1003 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Settlement by Gurly Niewood.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 1:11-cv-00694-WMS(Kushlefsky, Noah) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1002 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-01007-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1001 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING (997) Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; GRANTING (177) Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:10-cv-01007-WMS; FURTHER, that this Court's Order staying this case (MDL Docket No. 983; Civil Docket No. 168) is hereby vacated for the sole purpose of permitting the parties to complete settlement and final dismissal of this individual action with prejudice, FURTHER, that for all other purposes, this Court's Order staying this case remains in effect. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 6/5/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-01007-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1000 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING (995) Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; GRANTING (232) Motion to Vacate Stay in case 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, FURTHER, that this Court's Order staying this case (MDL Docket No. 983; Civil Docket No. 226) is hereby vacated for the sole purpose of permitting the parties to complete settlement and final dismissal of this individual action with prejudice, FURTHER, that for all other purposes, this Court's Order staying this case remains in effect. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 6/5/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00980-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 999 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER--RELATES TO 09-CV-979, GRANTING 996 Motion to Vacate the Stay; FURTHER, that this Court's Order staying the case (MDL Docket No. 983) is hereby vacated for the sole purpose of permitting the parties to complete settlement and final dismissal of this individual action with prejudice, FURTHER, that for all other purposes, this Court's Order staying this case remains in effect. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 6/5/12. (SG) Modified on 6/12/2012 (SG). (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 998 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM/BRIEF Filed Jointly by Non-Debtor Defendants and All Plaintiffs by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., FlightSafety, Inc., Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 997 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Prisco (10cv1007) by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-01007-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 996 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Bryson (09cv979) by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 995 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Niewood (09cv980) by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00980-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 994 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document-Attorney's Declaration in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00487-WMS(SG) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 993 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document-Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00487-WMS(SG) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 992 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for May 30, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. is ADJOURNED to August 15, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiffs and the non-debtor defendants shall file a written joint status report by May 30, 2012, updating this Court on the status of the ongoing discovery between them. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 5/22/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 991 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Settlement Compromise by Ann M. Danowski, Howard R. Pettys. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00487-WMS(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 990 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document-Attorney's Affidavit in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-01007-WMS(SG) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 989 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document-Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-01007-WMS(SG) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 988 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Settlement Compromise by Neil J. Prisco, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-01007-WMS(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 987 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER FINDING that the bankruptcy stay extends to all proceedings involving the debtors, which includes motion practice and the scheduling and taking of depositions; EXEMPTING from the stay document discovery, including ESI discovery, between Plaintiffs and the non-debtor defendants; STAYING all other aspects of this litigation pending further order of this Court. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 5/11/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 986 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM/BRIEF Filed Jointly by Non-Debtor Defendants Regarding Scope of Bankruptcy Stay by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., FlightSafety, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 985 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support of 962 Motion to Compel by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified on 4/30/2012 to correct title and terminate as a motion (SG). (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 984 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM/BRIEF re (86 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 86 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS) Order, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 983 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES STAYING case as to Defendants Pinnacle Airlines Corp. and Colgan Air, Inc.; DIRECTING Plaintiffs to file their brief as specified by April 25, 2012; DIRECTING the remaining defendants to file their briefs (or one collective brief) by May 2, 2012. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 4/17/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 982 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/28/12, before Judge Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/4/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 981 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 3/28/2012. Counsel update Court on mediation. Plaintiffs' counsel reports that 18 passenger cases remain in this court and 5 in state court. Court grants Bombardier's request to withdraw its 956 Motion to Compel in Prisco based on the settlement of that action, effective upon the Courts approval of the settlement. Mediation is ongoing and more settlements are expected. Counsel updated Court on discovery. Progress is being made with Colgan and Bombardier, slower with Continental. Depositions and document discovery continues but there may be some issues that will require Court intervention. Court strongly encourages counsel to work out discovery disputes in reasonable manner. Court directs Plaintiffs to update their 962 Motion to Compel Continental. Plaintiffs' updated motion due April 17, 2012; Continental's response due May 4, 2012. Plaintiffs will provide additional RFPs to defendants as soon as possible. Plaintiffs may dismiss Bombardier at end of discovery. Counsel for Plaintiffs and Bombardier to meet and confer concerning the disposal of the wreckage. An additional status conference is scheduled for May 30, 2012 at 11:30 a.m. For pltfs. Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) Modified on 4/4/2012to include the date and time of the next status conference. (MEAL). (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 980 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Pinnacle Airlines Corp. and Colgan Air, Inc. by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 979 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 1:11-cv-00693-WMS(SG) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 978 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECISION AND ORDER - RELATES TO ALL CASES DENYING Colgan's 824 Motion for a Protective Order; DENYING Plaintiffs' 874 Cross Motion for Protective Order. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/31/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 977 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document-Attorney's Affidavit in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 1:11-cv-00693-WMS(SG) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 976 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document-Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 1:11-cv-00693-WMS(SG) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 975 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Settlement Compromise by Jeanie Bryson, Jeanie Bryson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 1:11-cv-00693-WMS(Kushlefsky, Noah) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 974 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 1:09-cv-00379-WMS(SG) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 973 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mediation Certification by Krista GottliebAssociated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-01007-WMS(Gottlieb, Krista) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 972 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY/RESPONSE to re (74 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 101 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 282 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 232 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 269 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 213 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 102 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 74 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 77 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS, 232 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 215 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 234 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 215 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 101 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 176 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 243 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 265 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 124 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 267 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 239 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 237 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 949 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 85 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 192 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 210 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 269 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 150 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 198 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 212 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 102 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 94 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 239 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting the Deposition of Christopher Monteleon filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 971 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 936 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Carrie C. Davidson to Produce Documents filed by Carrie C. Davidson(as Administrator of the Estate of Linda L. Davidson, Deceased). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Michael S. Krzak, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C Filed Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D Filed Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E Filed Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 12 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Krzak, Michael) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 970 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECISION AND ORDER - RELATES TO: 10-CV-1007S DENYING Colgan's 53 Motion to Dismiss in case 1:10-cv-01007-WMS; ( 657 in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS) Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 3/25/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-01007-WMS(MEAL) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 969 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECISION AND ORDER - RELATES TO: 09-CV-4888S GRANTING Defendants' 112 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Infliction of Emotional Distress claims in case 1:09-cv-00488-WMS; ( 528 in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS) Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 3/25/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00488-WMS(MEAL) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 968 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Joint Memorandum by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 967 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mediation Certification by Douglas S. CoppolaAssociated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00980-WMS(Coppola, Douglas) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 966 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mediation Certification by Douglas S. CoppolaAssociated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00979-WMS(Coppola, Douglas) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 965 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO: 09-CV-294S IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that upon agreement of counsel, Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' 952 Motion to Compel is due by April 17, 2012, and Defendants' reply, if any, is due by May 1, 2012. Oral argument will be scheduled by this Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/22/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00294-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 964 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO: 10-CV-1007S IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that upon agreement of counsel, Plaintiff's response to Defendants' 956 Motion to Compel is due by April 12, 2012, and Defendants' reply, if any, is due by April 20, 2012. Oral argument will be scheduled by this Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/22/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-01007-WMS(MEAL) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 963 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS(SG) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 962 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION to Compel Continental to Produce Deposition Witnesses by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit A-B, # 4 Exhibit C-F, # 5 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 961 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 sealed)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-01007-WMS(SG) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 960 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 933 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Robert R. Perry to Produce Documents filed by Robert R. Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Michael S. Krzak, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 14 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Krzak, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 959 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re (74 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting the Deposition of Christopher Monteleon filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1-3, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 958 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc. re 956 MOTION to Compel Exhibits M and N filed under seal (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 957 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO: 09-CV-423SIT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that upon agreement of counsel, Plaintiff's response to Defendants' 947 Motion to Compel is due by April 20, 2012, and Defendants' reply, if any, is due by May 4, 2012. Oral argument will be scheduled by this Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/14/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00423-WMS(MEAL) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 956 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Thomas V. Hagerty, Esq., # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M (under seal), # 15 Exhibit N (under seal), # 16 Memorandum in Support, # 17 Certificate of Compliance with Rule 37(a)(1), # 18 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-01007-WMS(Hagerty, Thomas) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 955 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00294-WMS(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 954 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal 09cv727 (Zuffoletto) by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 953 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that upon agreement of counsel, Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' 949 Motion for Protective Order is due by March 19, 2012, and Defendants' reply, if any, is due by March 26, 2012. Oral argument will be scheduled by this Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/11/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 952 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Plaintiff James L. Neill to Produce Documents by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Compliance with Rule 37(a)(1), # 3 Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F (Filed Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K (Filed Under Seal), # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M (Filed Under Seal), # 17 Exhibit N (Filed Under Seal), # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00294-WMS(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 951 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO: ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that until such time as Defendants' 949 Motion for Protective Order is briefed by the parties and resolved by this Court, the deposition of Christopher Monteleon is STAYED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/9/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 950 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(DZ) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 949 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting the Deposition of Christopher Monteleon by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F (Filed Under Seal), # 9 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 948 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00423-WMS(DZ) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 947 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Karen A. Kuklewicz to Produce Documents & Answer Interrogatories by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Filed Under Seal), # 2 Certificate of Compliance with Rule 37(a)(1), # 3 Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G (Filed Under Seal), # 11 Exhibit H (Filed Under Seal), # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J (Filed Under Seal), # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit R, # 22 Exhibit S, # 23 Exhibit T, # 24 Exhibit U (Filed Under Seal), # 25 Exhibit V (Filed Under Seal), # 26 Exhibit W, # 27 Exhibit X, # 28 Exhibit Y (Filed Under Seal), # 29 Exhibit Z, # 30 Exhibit AA, # 31 Exhibit BB, # 32 Exhibit CC, # 33 Exhibit DD, # 34 Exhibit EE (Filed Under Seal), # 35 Exhibit FF (Filed Under Seal), # 36 Exhibit GG, # 37 Exhibit HH, # 38 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00423-WMS(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 946 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document-Decision and Order: Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:11-cv-00118-WMS(DZ) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 945 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(DZ) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 944 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - RELATES to: ALL CASES GRANTING Defendants' Colgan Air Inc. and Pinnacle Airlines Corp's 924 Motion for Protective Order as unopposed; PRECLUDING the taking of Charles J. Colgan, Jr's deposition. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/27/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.,p>(MEAL) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 943 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER on Defendants' 933 Motion to CompelRELATES TO: Perry, 09-CV-440S IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, responses are due by March 19, 2012, and replies are due by April 2, 2012. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/27/2012.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 942 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER on Defendants' 936 Motion to CompelRELATES TO: Davidson, 09-CV-378S, Davidson, 09-CV-379S IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, responses are due by March 26, 2012, and replies are due by April 9, 2012. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/27/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 1:09-cv-00379-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 941 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: All cases IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that there being no opposition thereto, the Air Transport Association of America, Inc.'s 892 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file the unredacted amicus brief under seal. Any party wishing to respond to the amicus brief must do so by March 16, 2012. SO ORDERED. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/27/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 940 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document-Attorney's Affidavit in Support of Application for Compromise: Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:11-cv-00118-WMS(DZ) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 939 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document-Application for Compromise: Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:11-cv-00118-WMS(DZ) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 938 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION signed by Hugh M. Russ, III re (65 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting the Deposition of Charles J. Colgan, Jr. filed by Hugh M. Russ, III filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 937 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 1:09-cv-00379-WMS(DZ) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 936 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Carrie C. Davidson to Produce Documents by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Compliance with Rule 37(a)(1), # 3 Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I (Filed Under Seal), # 13 Exhibit J (Filed Under Seal), # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M (Filed Under Seal), # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Q (Filed Under Seal), # 21 Exhibit R (Filed Under Seal), # 22 Exhibit S, # 23 Exhibit T, # 24 Exhibit U, # 25 Exhibit V, # 26 Exhibit W, # 27 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 1:09-cv-00379-WMS(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 935 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS(DZ) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 934 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Settlement Compromise by Salvatore Poidomani. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:11-cv-00118-WMS(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 933 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Robert R. Perry to Produce Documents by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G Under Seal, # 10 Exhibit H Under Seal, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Certificate of Compliance with Rule 37(a)(1), # 15 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 932 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00727-WMS(SG) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 931 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Settlement Compromise by Salvatore Poidomani. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:11-cv-00118-WMS(Fitzpatrick, Fidelma) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 930 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER--RELATES TO ALL CASES; IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' 924 Motion for Protective Order shall be filed by February 24, 2012, and Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed by March 2, 2012. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/13/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 929 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 928 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 927 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 926 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document-Attorney's Affidavit in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00727-WMS(SG) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 925 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document-Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00727-WMS(SG) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 924 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting the Deposition of Charles J. Colgan, Jr. by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Under Seal, # 2 Affidavit of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit C Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit D Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit E Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit F Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit G Under Seal, # 10 Exhibit H Under Seal, # 11 Exhibit I Under Seal, # 12 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 923 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re (232 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 186 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 29 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS, 156 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 142 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 154 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 137 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 67 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 209 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 210 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 209 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 180 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 159 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 842 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 93 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 88 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 162 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 53 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 53 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 37 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 165 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 53 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 26 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 208 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 120 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 26 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS) MOTION to Compel document production and overruling defendants' objections filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 922 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Settlement Compromise by James M. Zuffoletto. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00727-WMS(Nicotra, Richard) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 921 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Settlement Compromise by James M. Zuffoletto.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00727-WMS(Nicotra, Richard) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 920 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Support re (175 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 19 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 39 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 81 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 147 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 179 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 221 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 130 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 175 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 19 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 30 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 202 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 173 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 135 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 152 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 201 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 148 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 47 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 155 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 151 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 113 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 824 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 200 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 60 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 201 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 86 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 22 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order Plaintiff's Cross-Motion to Compel Compliance with the Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 919 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 918 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Air Transport Association of America, Inc., d/b/a Airlines for America re 893 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 892 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae (McGrath, Mark) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 916 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER--RELATES TO ALL CASES; IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' 842 Motion to Compel is extended from January 27, 2012, to January 30, 2012. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/27/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY/RESPONSE to re (172 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 50 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 154 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 225 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 150 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 116 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 204 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 84 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 49 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 89 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 42 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 25 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 22 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 155 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 205 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 63 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 204 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 49 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 172 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 49 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 133 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 203 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 138 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 22 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 33 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 161 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 152 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 835 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 172 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order (Under Seal) filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B (Under Seal), # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to Neil Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 913 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to Beutel Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00514-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 912 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to Bryson Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00979-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 911 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to Harel Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 910 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ANSWER to Johnson Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00929-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ANSWER to Kaunser Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00619-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to Kuklewicz Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00423-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to Kushner Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00632-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 906 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to Marzolf Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01043-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 905 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to Monachino Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00436-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to Niewood Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00980-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 903 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to Pettys Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00487-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 902 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ANSWER to Ries Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00432-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 901 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ANSWER to West Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00266-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to Prisco Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-01007-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to Green Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:11-cv-00105-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to Ronald Davidson Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00379-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 897 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to Linda Davidson Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00378-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to Beiter Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00488-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to Pan Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 894 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (232 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 186 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 29 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS, 156 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 142 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 154 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 137 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 67 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 209 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 210 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 209 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 180 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 159 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 842 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 93 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 88 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 162 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 53 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 53 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 37 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 165 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 53 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 26 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 208 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 120 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 26 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS) MOTION to Compel document production and overruling defendants' objections filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David J. Harrington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D (Under Seal), # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K (Under Seal), # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air Transport Association of America, Inc., d/b/a Airlines for America identifying Other Affiliate Southwest Airlines, Other Affiliate Alaska Air Group, Inc, Other Affiliate AMR Corp., Other Affiliate US Airways Group, Inc. for Air Transport Association of America, Inc., d/b/a Airlines for America.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(McGrath, Mark) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae by Air Transport Association of America, Inc., d/b/a Airlines for America. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of unopposed Motion for Leave to file Brief of Amicus Curiae, # 2 Declaration of Mark E. McGrath in Support of unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae, # 3 Exhibit A Redacted Version of the Amicus Brief, # 4 Exhibit 1 to the Brief, # 5 Exhibit 2 to the Brief, # 6 Exhibit 3 to the Brief)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(McGrath, Mark) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY/RESPONSE to re (175 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 19 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 39 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 81 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 147 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 179 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 221 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 130 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 175 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 19 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 30 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 202 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 173 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 135 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 152 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 148 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 201 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 47 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 155 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 151 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 113 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 824 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 200 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 60 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 201 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 86 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 22 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order Reply in Further Support & Opposition to Cross-Motion filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 2 Exhibit JJ, # 3 Exhibit KK, # 4 Affidavit of Joe F. Williams, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER--RELATES TO ALL CASES; IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, Defendants' joint response is further support of their 824 Motion for Protective Order and in opposition to Plaintiffs' 874 Cross Motion for Protective Order is due January 27, 2012. FURTHER, that Plaintiffs' reply in further support of their 874 Cross Motion for Protective Order, if any, is due by February 3, 2012. Issued by Hon. William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 1/21/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part, consistent with this Decision and Order, Plaintiffs' 810 Motion to Amend the Case Management Order to Remove RFP Limitations. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 1/21/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 888 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECISION AND ORDER granting Continental's 844 Motion to Amend its Answers; Answer due within seven days of the entry of this Decision and Order. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 1/21/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the parties' 886 Joint Proposal for Modification of the CMO is under advisement. The parties are hereby directed to abide by the Joint Proposal unless and until otherwise directed by this Court. If necessary, the proposal will be discussed at the March 28, 2012 status conference. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 1/18/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 886 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT Joint Request for a Modification of the Case Management Order by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 885 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re (212 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 144 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 156 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 211 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 844 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 69 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 184 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 95 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 161 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 184 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 160 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 210 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 122 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 211 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers in Certain Actions filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re (212 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 188 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 144 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 156 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 211 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 844 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 69 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 184 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 95 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 139 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 161 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 184 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 160 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 210 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 122 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 211 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers in Certain Actions filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 883 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY/RESPONSE to re (184 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 95 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 212 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 139 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 161 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 184 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 188 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 160 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 144 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 210 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 122 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 156 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 211 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 211 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 844 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 69 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers in Certain Actions, (184 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS) Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, (92 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS) MOTION to Amend/Correct (90) Declaration,, (91) Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 882 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal Mossop/ Reid 09cv424 by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 881 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re (95 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 212 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 184 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 188 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 160 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 210 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 55 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 211 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 211 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 844 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 69 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers in Certain Actions filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 880 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Sealed Documents 877 , 878 and 879 Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 879 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document Exhibits continued from 878 Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17, # 2 Exhibit 18, # 3 Exhibit 19, # 4 Exhibit 20, # 5 Exhibit 21, # 6 Exhibit 22, # 7 Exhibit 23, # 8 Exhibit 24, # 9 Exhibit 25, # 10 Exhibit 26 Part 1, # 11 Exhibit 26 Part 2, # 12 Exhibit 26 Part 3, # 13 Exhibit 26 Part 4, # 14 Exhibit 27, # 15 Exhibit 28, # 16 Exhibit 29, # 17 Exhibit 30, # 18 Exhibit 31)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 878 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 877 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION signed by Terrence M. Connors re (175 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 19 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 39 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 81 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 147 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 179 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 221 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 130 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 175 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 19 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 30 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 202 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 173 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 135 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 152 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 148 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 201 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 47 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 155 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 151 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 113 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 824 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 200 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 60 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 201 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 86 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 22 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order, (874 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) Cross MOTION for Protective Order filed by Ping Wang filed by Ping Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Rule 3.6, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION signed by Terrence M. Connors re 874 Cross MOTION for Protective Order, 824 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Ping Wang filed by Ping Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Rule 3.6, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 874 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Cross MOTION for Protective Order by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Hugh M. Russ, III, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of James P. Kreindler, # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 873 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER Relates to ALL CASES on Plaintiffs' 842 Motion to Compel. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, responses are due by 1/27/2012 and replies are due by 2/10/2012. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 1/7/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 872 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal Safran (10cv755) (11cv220) by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 871 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal Maurer (10cv78)(11cv219) by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (139 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers in Certain Actions filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 869 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00424-WMS(SG) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 868 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECISION AND ORDER -- Relates to 09-CV-961; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendants' 668 Motion to Compel Discovery (Docket No. 144 in 09-CV-961S); DIRECTING Plaintiff to provide responsive documents as ordered herein within 30 days of the entry date of this decision; DENYING Defendant's request for fees and costs. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/17/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00961-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING NOTICE Relates to ALL CASES on 842 Motion to Compel. By agreement of counsel, responses are due by 1/13/2012 and replies are due by 1/27/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 866 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING NOTICE Relates to ALL CASES on 835 Motion for Protective Order. By agreement of counsel, responses are due by 1/13/2012 and replies are due by 1/30/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 865 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING NOTICE Relates to ALL CASES on 824 Motion for Protective Order. By agreement of counsel, responses are due by 1/9/2012 and replies are due by 1/23/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 864 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document-Affidavit of Dianne Mossop in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00424-WMS(SG) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 863 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document-Affidavit of Veneita Reid in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00424-WMS(SG) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 862 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document-Attorney's Affirmation in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00424-WMS(SG) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 861 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO: All cases. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for December 19, 2011 at 11:30 a.m. is ADJOURNED to March 28, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 12/16/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re (199 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS) MOTION Amend Case Management Order to Remove RFP Limitations re (2 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MDL Case Management Order filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION signed by David Harrington re (150 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 199 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 18 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 171 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 20 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 38 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 134 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 810 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 79 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 112 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 151 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 58 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 18 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 29 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 146 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 219 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 200 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 157 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 145 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 84 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 168 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 168 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 174 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 199 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 174 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 129 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 154 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 168 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 187 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 198 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS) MOTION Amend Case Management Order to Remove RFP Limitations re (2 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MDL Case Management Order filed by Continental Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc. filed by Continental Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (150 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 199 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 18 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 171 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 20 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 38 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 134 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 810 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 79 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 112 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 151 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 58 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 18 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 29 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 146 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 219 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 200 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 157 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 145 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 84 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 168 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 168 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 174 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 199 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 174 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 129 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 154 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 187 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 168 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 198 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS) MOTION Amend Case Management Order to Remove RFP Limitations re (2 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MDL Case Management Order filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION for Settlement/Compromise Settlement by Dianne Mossop.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00424-WMS(Hershenhorn, Howard) Modified title on 12/13/2011 (SG). (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING NOTICE Relates to ALL CASES on 844 Motion to Amend/Correct Answers in Certain Actions. By agreement of counsel, responses are due by 12/23/2011 and replies are due by 1/13/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) Modified on 12/12/2011 (MEAL). (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              **DISREGARD, TO BE REFILED** MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 810 MOTION Amend Case Management Order to Remove RFP Limitations re (2 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MDL Case Management Order filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) Modified on 12/13/2011 (SG). (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                **DISREGARD, TO BE REFILED**DECLARATION signed by David J. Harrington re 810 MOTION Amend Case Management Order to Remove RFP Limitations re (2 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MDL Case Management Order filed by Continental Airlines, Inc. filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Certificate of Service)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) Modified on 12/13/2011 (SG). (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 853 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 10, # 10 Exhibit 11, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 14, # 14 Exhibit 15, # 15 Exhibit 16, # 16 Exhibit 17, # 17 Exhibit 18, # 18 Exhibit 19, # 19 Exhibit 20, # 20 Exhibit 21, # 21 Exhibit 22, # 22 Exhibit 23)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 852 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 851 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) Modified filed date on 12/9/2011 (SG). (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re (175 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 19 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 39 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 81 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 147 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 221 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 188 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 130 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 175 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 19 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 30 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 202 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 173 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 135 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 152 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 148 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 201 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 47 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 155 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 151 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 113 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 824 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 200 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 60 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 201 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 86 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 22 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order, (172 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 50 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 154 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 225 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 150 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 116 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 204 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 84 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 49 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 89 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 191 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 42 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 25 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 22 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 155 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 205 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 63 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 204 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 49 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 172 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 49 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 133 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 203 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 138 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 22 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 33 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 161 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 152 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 835 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 172 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL AMENDED TRANSCRIPT Correcting the Proceedings Date to 10/5/11 re 848 Transcript, before Judge Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/27/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/13/10, before Judge Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/27/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 847 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc. of Firm Name Change (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Musat, L.) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re (184 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 95 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 212 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 139 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 161 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 184 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 188 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 160 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 144 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 210 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 122 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 156 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 211 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 211 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 844 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 69 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers in Certain Actions filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 845 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION signed by Oliver Beiersdorf re (844 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers in Certain Actions filed by Continental Airlines, Inc. filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit B, # 25 Exhibit C, # 26 Exhibit D, # 27 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 844 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers in Certain Actions by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 843 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re (195 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 232 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 186 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 29 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS, 156 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 142 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 154 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 137 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 67 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 209 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 210 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 209 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-