IN RE New Millenium Fund, et al v. McLeodUSA Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Iowa Northern District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00001
District Judge Mark W Bennett, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 25, 2017 at 11:13 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chapman Trust Group, Plaintiff

Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowenstein Sandler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Seth Etkin +1 973 597 2312 +1 973 597 2313 metkin@lowenstein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ira M. Levee +1 973 597 2480 +1 973 597 2400 ilevee@lowenstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven H Schulman +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kay E. Sickles +1 610 747 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ksickles@sbclasslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TOM RILEY LAW FIRM PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter C Riley +1 319 363 4040 +3639 363 363 9789 peterr@trlf.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tom J Riley +1 319 363 4040 +3639 363 363 9789 rtom@trlf.com

Represented by Weiss & Lurie

Toggle Switch Represented by WHITFIELD, EDDY LAW FIRM - DES MOINES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Phipps +1 515 288 6041 +2461 246 246 1474 phipps@whitfieldlaw.com
No Logo Jeffrey Brandes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kay E. Sickles +1 610 747 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ksickles@sbclasslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TOM RILEY LAW FIRM PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter C Riley +1 319 363 4040 +3639 363 363 9789 peterr@trlf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss & Lurie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
No Logo New Millenium Growth Fund LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/24/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Trevan Borum +1 610 667 7706 +6677 667 667 7056 tborum@sbclasslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven H Schulman +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229

Toggle Switch Represented by TOM RILEY LAW FIRM PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter C Riley +1 319 363 4040 +3639 363 363 9789 peterr@trlf.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tom J Riley +1 319 363 4040 +3639 363 363 9789 rtom@trlf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WHITFIELD, EDDY LAW FIRM - DES MOINES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Phipps +1 515 288 6041 +2461 246 246 1474 phipps@whitfieldlaw.com
No Logo Richard C. Chapman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kay E. Sickles +1 610 747 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ksickles@sbclasslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TOM RILEY LAW FIRM PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter C Riley +1 319 363 4040 +3639 363 363 9789 peterr@trlf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss & Lurie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
No Logo Water Island Capital, Llc, Plaintiff

Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY Rachel Susan Fleishman +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 rfleishman@tarterkrinsky.com
TERMINATED: 09/14/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carlos F Ramirez +1 212 594 5300 +8681 868 868 1229 cramirez@milbergweiss.com
TERMINATED: 07/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey T Spinazzola +1 212 594 5300 +8681 868 868 1229

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kay E. Sickles +1 610 747 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ksickles@sbclasslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TOM RILEY LAW FIRM PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter C Riley +1 319 363 4040 +3639 363 363 9789 peterr@trlf.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tom J Riley +1 319 363 4040 +3639 363 363 9789 rtom@trlf.com
v.
No Logo Chris Davis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/05/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel A. Gunsburg +1 212 698 3580 +1 212 698 3599 samuel.gunsburg@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/10/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Hennes +1 212 859 8355 david.hennes@friedfrank.com
TERMINATED: 03/10/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherita M. Perry +1 212 859 8764 +8598 859 859 8585 Sherita.Perry@friedfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James C. Nemmers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard S Fry +1 319 365 9461 +1 319 365 8443 rsf@shuttleworthlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane Kutzko +1 319 365 9461 +3658 365 365 8564 dhk@shuttleworthlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nyemaster, Goode, West, Hansell & O'Brien PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin H Collins +1 319 286 7003 +1 319 286 7050 khcollins@nyemaster.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Woodham Bulcao +1 212 455 3712 +4552 455 455 2502 sbulcao@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth E Roxland +1 212 455 3692 +4552 455 455 2502 broxland@stblaw.com
No Logo Clark McLeod, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Esther Lieber +1 212 326 7842 +1 212 755 7306 selieber@jonesday.com
TERMINATED: 08/24/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard I Werder +1 212 326 3939 +7557 755 755 7306 riwerder@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Rue Wittstein +1 212 326 3415

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James C. Nemmers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard S Fry +1 319 365 9461 +1 319 365 8443 rsf@shuttleworthlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane Kutzko +1 319 365 9461 +3658 365 365 8564 dhk@shuttleworthlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nyemaster, Goode, West, Hansell & O'Brien PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin H Collins +1 319 286 7003 +1 319 286 7050 khcollins@nyemaster.com
No Logo J. Lyle Patrick, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Esther Lieber +1 212 326 7842 +1 212 755 7306 selieber@jonesday.com
TERMINATED: 08/24/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard I Werder +1 212 326 3939 +7557 755 755 7306 riwerder@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Rue Wittstein +1 212 326 3415

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James C. Nemmers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard S Fry +1 319 365 9461 +1 319 365 8443 rsf@shuttleworthlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane Kutzko +1 319 365 9461 +3658 365 365 8564 dhk@shuttleworthlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nyemaster, Goode, West, Hansell & O'Brien PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin H Collins +1 319 286 7003 +1 319 286 7050 khcollins@nyemaster.com
No Logo Mcleodusa Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "McLeodUSA Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by BRADLEY & RILEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly R Baier +1 319 363 0101 +3639 363 363 9824 kbaier@bradleyriley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heidman Redmond Fredregill Patterson Plaza Dykstra & Prahl

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan E Fredregill +1 712 255 8838 +2586 258 258 6714 alan.fredregill@heidmanlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C Gray +1 712 255 8838 +2586 258 258 6714 john.gray@heidmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/14/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Good +1 312 407 0950 +4070 407 407 0411 jgood@skadden.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J Gorman +1 312 407 0950 +4070 407 407 0411 egorman@skadden.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy A. Nelsen +1 312 407 0700 +1 312 407 0700 tnelsen@skadden.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Samuel Prohofsky +1 312 407 0591 +4070 407 407 0411 dprohofs@skadden.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Lynn Van Gelder +1 312 407 0903 +1 312 407 0411 avangeld@skadden.com
No Logo Steve Gray, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Esther Lieber +1 212 326 7842 +1 212 755 7306 selieber@jonesday.com
TERMINATED: 08/24/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard I Werder +1 212 326 3939 +7557 755 755 7306 riwerder@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Rue Wittstein +1 212 326 3415

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James C. Nemmers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard S Fry +1 319 365 9461 +1 319 365 8443 rsf@shuttleworthlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane Kutzko +1 319 365 9461 +3658 365 365 8564 dhk@shuttleworthlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nyemaster, Goode, West, Hansell & O'Brien PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin H Collins +1 319 286 7003 +1 319 286 7050 khcollins@nyemaster.com
No Logo Brad Johnson, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Nazette, Marner, Wendt, Knoll & Usher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/08/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L Pazdernik +1 319 364 0124 +3641 364 364 1116 rlpazder@hotmail.com
No Logo Rick Kowelawski, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Cauley Geller Bowman & Coates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/08/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven E Cauley +1 501 312 8500 + 501 312 8505
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (334) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RE: DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS SETTLEMENT FUND. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 03/26/08. (kfs) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None
    Docket Annotation re 344 UNRESISTED MOTION for Class Distribution Order: The attached Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Distribution Order has been attached to the Motion at entry no. 344. (de) Modified on 3/6/2008 - faxed to Kay Sickles (de). (Entered: 03/06/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
      UNRESISTED MOTION for Class Distribution Order by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Richard W. Simmons, # 2 Brief in Support of Motion for Class Distribution Order, # 3 Exhibit A-Deficiency Notice, # 4 Exhibit B-Rejection Notice, # 5 Exhibit C--1-A Claims Recommended for Approval, # 6 Exhibit C-1-B, # 7 Exhibit C-1-C, # 8 Exhibit C-1-D, # 9 Exhibit C-1-E, # 10 Exhibit C-1-F, # 11 Exhibit C-1-G, # 12 Exhibit C-1-H, # 13 Exhibit C-1-I, # 14 Exhibit C-1-J, # 15 Exhibit C-1-K, # 16 Exhibit C-1-L, # 17 Exhibit C-2-A Claims Recommended for Rejection, # 18 Exhibit C-2-B, # 19 Exhibit C-2-C, # 20 Exhibit C-2-D, # 21 Exhibit C-2-E, # 22 Exhibit C-2-F, # 23 Exhibit C-2-G, # 24 Exhibit C-2-H, # 25 Exhibit C-2-I, # 26 Exhibit C-2-J, # 27 Exhibit C-2-K, # 28 Exhibit C-2-L, # 29 Exhibit C-2-M, # 30 Exhibit C-2-N, # 31 Exhibit C-2-O, # 32 Exhibit C-2-P, # 33 Exhibit C-2-Q, # 34 Exhibit C-2-R, # 35 Exhibit C-2-S, # 36 Exhibit C-2-T, # 37 Exhibit D--Analytics Incorporated Fees & Expenses) (Riley, Peter) Modified on 3/6/2008 (de). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2008: # 38 Memorandum in Support of Motion) (de). Modified on 4/3/2008 (des). (Entered: 03/05/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 342 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
        JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs against Defendants: Judgment is entered in accordance with the attached Order and Final Judgment. Approved by Judge Mark W. Bennett and Signed by Clerk on 1/08/07. (des, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2007 (des, ). (Entered: 01/08/2007)
          LREF
          Blank 341 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT. (See Order Text) Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 1/05/07. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One) (des, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2007 (des, ). (Entered: 01/05/2007)
            LREF
            Blank 340 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
            TRANSCRIPT of Fairness Hearing Proceedings held on 11/29/06 before Judge Mark W. Bennett, Chief Judge. Court Reporter: Shelly Semmler. (For a copy of transcript, contact Court Reporter at 320 Sixth Street, Sioux City, IA 51101 (712) 233-3846) (ak, ) (Entered: 12/27/2006)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Mark W Bennett - Settlement Conference and Motion Hearing RE: 332 Motion for Award of Costs and Reimbursement of Expenses to Named Plaintiffs held on 11/29/2006 - Ruling reserved (Court Reporter: Shelly Semmler) (kfs, ) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: None
                MOTION to Determine Allocation of Attorney Fees (Conditional) re 337 MOTION Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Final Certification of Settlement Class, and Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Riley, Peter) Modified on 11/29/2006 to correct typographical error (de). (Entered: 11/28/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 337 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                  Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Final Certification of Settlement Class, and Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sanford P. Dumain, David Kessler and Joseph H. Weiss in Support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses# 2 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Richard W. Simmons RE: (A) Mailing of Settlement Notice and Claim Form; and (B) Report on Exclusion Requests Received# 3 Exhibit 2- Affidavit of Paul J. Andrejkovics RE: Publication of the Summary Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlement of Class Action# 4 Exhibit 3-Affidavit of Sanford P. Dumain in Support of Joint Petition for Attorneys' Fees and Disbursements Filed on Behalf of Milberg Weiss Bershad & Schulman LLP# 5 Exhibit 4- Affidavit of Andrew L. Barroway in Support of Joint Petition for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed on behalf of Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP# 6 Exhibit 5- Affidavit of Joseph H. Weiss on Behalf of Weiss & Lurie in Support of Plaintiffs' Counsel's Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses# 7 Exhibit 6- Affidavit of Peter C. Riley in Support of Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees# 8 Exhibit 7- Unpublished Decisions# 9 Exhibit 8 - Objection of Neuerburg# 10 Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlement, Plan of Allocation, Award of Attorneys' Fess and Reimbursement of Expenses to Plaintiffs' Counsel# 11 Order and Final Judgment) Motion filed pursuant to order at docket no. 336. (src) Modified on 11/29/2006 (de, ). (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 335 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 11/27/06. (src) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Final Certification of Settlement Class, and Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses# 2 Declaration of Sanford P. Dumain, David Kessler and Joseph H. Weiss in Support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses# 3 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Richard W. Simmons RE: (A) Mailing of Settlement Notice and Claim Form; and (B) Report on Exclusion Requests Received# 4 Exhibit 2- Affidavit of Paul J. Andrejkovics RE: Publication of the Summary Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlement of Class Action# 5 Exhibit 3-Affidavit of Sanford P. Dumain in Support of Joint Petition for Attorneys' Fees and Disbursements Filed on Behalf of Milberg Weiss Bershad & Schulman LLP# 6 Exhibit 4- Affidavit of Andrew L. Barroway in Support of Joint Petition for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed on behalf of Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP# 7 Exhibit 5- Affidavit of Joseph H. Weiss on Behalf of Weiss & Lurie in Support of Plaintiffs' Counsel's Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses# 8 Exhibit 6- Affidavit of Peter C. Riley in Support of Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees# 9 Exhibit 7- Unpublished Decisions# 10 Exhibit 8 - Objection of Neuerburg# 11 Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of Settlement, Plan of Allocation, Award of Attorneys' Fess and Reimbursement of Expenses to Plaintiffs' Counsel# 12 Order and Final Judgment. (Riley, Peter) Modified on 11/27/2006 (de). (Entered: 11/22/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 334 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER Setting Hearing on 332 MOTION for Award of Costs and Reimbursement of Expenses to Named Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2006 at 8:30 AM SC 3rd Fl Ct for 332 . The court will take up this motion at the hearing currently set for 11/29/06. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 11/22/06. (src) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None
                          BRIEF in Support re 332 MOTION for Award of Costs and Reimbursement of Expenses to Named Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs New Millenium Growth Fund LLC, Richard C. Chapman, Jeffrey Brandes, Chapman Trust Group. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph D. Cohen# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E)(Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Award of Costs and Reimbursement of Expenses to Named Plaintiffs by Plaintiffs New Millenium Growth Fund LLC, Richard C. Chapman, Jeffrey Brandes, Chapman Trust Group. (Cohen, Joseph) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2006 (kfs, ). (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 331 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 329 Motion for Preliminary Order In Connection With Settlement Proceedings. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 9/19/06. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3) (src) Modified on 10/3/2006 to correct typographical error (de). (Entered: 09/19/2006)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None
                                DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk notified Attorney Peter Riley as to Attachment #2, Exhibit B of the Joint Motion Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement by Plaintiff 329 , as document was incomplete. Clerk has now reattached a complete version of this document to 329 and also to this entry for all parties to view. (ak, ) (Entered: 09/18/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                  Joint MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Stipulation# 2 Exhibit B-Prelim. Order# 3 Exhibit C-Notice of Prop. Sett.# 4 Exhibit D-Summary Notice# 5 Exhibit E-Proof of Claim# 6 Exhibit F-Order & Final Judgment)(Riley, Peter) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2006 (ak, ). Modified on 9/18/2006 to added complete version of Exhibit B,of Attachment #2.(ak, ). (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Carlos Ramirez by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group (Riley, Peter) Modified text on 09/15/2006 (kfs,) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Mark W Bennett - Status Conference held on 09/11/2006 - Parties indicate that the case has settled and will be forwarding papers to the Court by Friday, September 15, 2006 (Court Reporter: Shelly Semmler) (kfs, ) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER RESETTING STATUS CONFERENCE - Telephonic Status Conference reset for 9/11/2006 1:30 PM before Chief Judge Mark W Bennett. The court will initiate the call. All participants are directed to contact the undersigned's secretary, Jennifer, at 712-233-3909, no later than 5:00 PM, on Thursday, September 7, 2006, with a phone number to be reached at for the status conference. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 9/6/06. (src) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER SETTING HEARING - Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/8/2006 4:00 PM before Chief Judge Mark W Bennett. The court will initiate the call. All participants are directed to contact the undersigned's secretary, Jennifer, at 712-233-3909, no later than 5:00 PM, on Thursday, September 7, 2006, with a phone number to be reached at for the status conference. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 8/30/06. (src) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Heather M. Tashman by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 08/24/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Richard I. Werder, Jr. as attorney for Defendants Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, and Lyle Patrick (Sidman, Howard) Modified on 8/24/2006 to edit text and terminate atty (de). (Entered: 08/23/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                Amended Order Granting Kay E Sickles's Amended Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (doc. no. 321) on behalf of plaintiffs Richard C Chapman, Chapman Trust Group and Jeffrey Brandes. Attorney has paid pro hac vice fee, at docket no. 320, receipt #129480. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/06. (src) Modified on 8/17/2006 to link to original motion at docket no. 318 (src). (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                  Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kay Sickles ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 129480) by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Attachments: # 1 CM-ECF Registration Form )(Riley, Peter) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                    Fee Receipt: $ 75.00, receipt number 129480 for Pro Hac Vice Fee for Kay Sickles by Water Island Capital, LLC. (ksy, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                      ORDER granting 318 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Fee due by 8/29/2006. Signed by Clerk on 8/15/06. (Attachments: # 1 PHV Packet) (de) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Attachments: # 1 ECF Attorney Registration Form)(Riley, Peter) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION to Withdraw of Attorney Rachel Fleishman by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Riley, Peter) Modified on 7/20/2006 (de, ). (Entered: 07/19/2006)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                            REPLY BRIEF to re 304 *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED - MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Loss Causation filed by Defendants Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis, J. Lyle Patrick. (Hand, S.) (Entered: 05/05/2006)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER - The parties are directed to file a new Scheduling order and discovery plan, to initiate getting trial scheduled once again on the undersigned's trial docket, on or before, May 22, 2006. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 5/1/06. (src) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 307 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 4/24/06. (de) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  Docket Annotation. The attached brief in opposition has been deleted as an attachment from docket entry #304 and docketed at docket entry #310 with a link to docket entry #304. (de) (Entered: 04/24/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                    BRIEF in Opposition re 304 *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED - MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Loss Causation filed by Plaintiffs New Millenium Growth Fund LLC, Richard C. Chapman, Jeffrey Brandes, Chapman Trust Group, Water Island Capital, LLC. (de) (Entered: 04/24/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 308 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. Signed by Judge Clerk on 4/24/06. (Attachments: #(1) Brief in Opposition to Defts' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on "Loss Causation") Modified on 4/25/2006 (de). (Entered: 04/24/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Mtn for Judgment on Pldgs on "Loss Causation")(Riley, Peter) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION to file under Seal Reply Memorandum and Declaration with attachments by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            BRIEF in Opposition re 302 *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED - MOTION to Certify Class filed by Defendants Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis, J. Lyle Patrick. (Hand, S.) (Entered: 04/14/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 303 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. The brief and all its attachments from docket number 303, are now attached to Motion For Class Certification at docket number 302. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 4/12/06. (src) (Entered: 04/12/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED - MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Loss Causation by Defendants Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis, J. Lyle Patrick. Responses due by 4/17/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B Part 1# 4 Exhibit B Part 2# 5 Exhibit B Part 3# 6 Exhibit C Part 1# 7 Exhibit C - Part 2)(Hand, S.) Modified on 4/24/2006 to delete attachment (de). (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief in Support of Motion for Class Certification by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum of Law-1# 2 Brief Memorandum of Law-2# 3 Exhibit A-1# 4 Exhibit A-2# 5 Exhibit A-3# 6 Exhibit A-4# 7 Exhibit A-5# 8 Exhibit A-6# 9 Exhibit B-1# 10 Exhibit B-2# 11 Exhibit B-3# 12 Exhibit B-4)(Riley, Peter) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                    *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED - MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. Responses due by 4/17/2006 (Riley, Peter) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2006 (src, ). Modified on 4/12/2006 to note that pursuant to order at docket no. 305, all attachments from docket entry no. 303 are now attached to this entry (src). (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 298 UNRESISTED Motion for lifting of bankruptcy stay. Plaintiffs may refile their motion for class certification on or before 3/31/06. Defendants may refile their resistance to that motion on or before 4/14/06. Defendants may refile their motion for judgment on the the pleadings in this case on or before 3/31/06. Plaintiffs shall have 21 days from the filing of defendants' renewed motion for judgment on the pleadings to submit their response to that motion. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 3/16/06. (src) (Entered: 03/16/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal of New Millennium Growth Fund's Securities Claims Against McLeodUSA by New Millenium Growth Fund LLC, McLeodUSA Incorporated, Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis, J. Lyle Patrick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Gorman, Eric) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 295 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jennifer Good terminated as counsel for McLeodUSA Incorporated. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 2/14/06. (Copy faxed to Atty Jennifer Good) (mj) (Entered: 02/14/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                            UNRESISTED MOTION for Lifting Bankruptcy Stay, Refiling Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, and Renewing Defendants' Motion on Loss Causation by Defendants Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, J. Lyle Patrick. (Sidman, Howard) (Entered: 02/10/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER denying without prejudice 259 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by McLeodUSA Incorporated, denying without prejudice 190 MOTION to Certify Class, terminating MOTION for Hearing/Oral Argument filed by Chapman Trust Group, denying without prejudice 204 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings On Loss Causation filed by Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis, J. Lyle Patrick. The court notes McLeodUSA has filed a voluntary petition for bankruptcy. As a result, this action is stayed pursuant to the automatic stay provision of the United States Bankruptcy Code. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 12/19/05. (des, ). (Entered: 12/20/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jennifer N. Good As Counsel For McLeodUSA Incorporated by Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated. (Gorman, Eric) Text modified on 12/27/2005 to reflect copy provided to Judge Shields' chambers (mem). (Entered: 12/19/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER re 277 MOTION to Compel. Plaintiffs shall submit to the court for in camera review an unredacted copy of the entire document which contains notes relating to the interview of Mark Cramer that are at issue. Plaintiffs shall mail a copy of the document to Judge Shields' chambers in Rock Island, Illinois. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 12/15/05. (mem) (Entered: 12/15/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 11/9/05 before Judge Thomas Shields. Court Reporter: Tracy A. H. Lamp. (for a complete copy of transcript please contact Tracy Lamp at (319) 626-7616) (de) (Main Document 292 replaced on 11/8/2011) (pac). (Entered: 12/06/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for status conference and motion hearing held before Judge Thomas J Shields on 11/09/2005. (Court Reporter Tracy Lamp.) (mem) (Entered: 11/10/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                        SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to McLeodUSA Incorporated and Notice of Operation of the Automatic Stay by McLeodUSA Incorporated. (Gorman, Eric) (Entered: 11/01/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                          BRIEF in Opposition re 204 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings On Loss Causation, 259 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Citation of New Authorities filed by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B-1# 3 Exhibit B-2# 4 Exhibit C-1# 5 Exhibit C-2# 6 Exhibit D-1# 7 Exhibit D-2# 8 Exhibit E-1# 9 Exhibit E-2# 10 Exhibit E-3# 11 Exhibit F-1# 12 Exhibit F-2# 13 Exhibit G-1# 14 Exhibit G-2# 15 Exhibit G-3)(Riley, Peter) (Entered: 10/25/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER: At the request of plaintiffs, which is not opposed by defendants, the hearing on defendants' 277 MOTION to Compel shall be rescheduled to11/9/2005 at 01:00 PM in 1st Fl Ct in Cedar Rapids w/Judge Shields. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 10/20/05. (Copy faxed to non-ecf parties and TJS)(mj) Modified on 10/20/2005 (All attys are ecf; faxed only to TJS) (mj). (Entered: 10/20/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 277 MOTION to Compel Cramer Report filed by Defendants Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis, J. Lyle Patrick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 3 to Reply Brief)(Sidman, Howard) (Entered: 10/17/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Hearing on 277 MOTION to Compel Cramer Report: Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2005 at 03:00 PM CR 1st Fl Ct for 277 . The court will hold a status conference thereafter to address discovery matters. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 10/7/05. (de) (Entered: 10/07/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  BRIEF in Opposition re 277 MOTION to Compel Cramer Report filed by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 10/07/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Pltfs' 2nd motion to enlarge time to resist motion to compel Cramer Report. Set Deadlines to 277 MOTION to Compel Cramer Report: Responses due by 10/7/2005. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 10/6/05. (de) (Entered: 10/06/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      UNRESISTED MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Resist Motion to Compel Cramer Report by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 10/05/2005)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER finding as moot 280 UNRESISTED Motion for ext. of time, granting 281 UNRESISTED Motion for ext. of time. Pltf's shall have until 10/5/05 to file a resistance to defts' pending motion to compel (#277). Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 10/4/05. (de) (Entered: 10/04/2005)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          UNRESISTED MOTION for CORRECTED Motion to Enlarge Time to Resist Motion to Compel Cramer Report by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 09/29/2005)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            UNRESISTED MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Resist Motion to Compel Cramer Report by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY BRIEF to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Supplemental Citation of New Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on Loss Causation filed by Defendants Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis, J. Lyle Patrick. (Hand, S.) Modified on 9/20/2005 to create link to motion #204 (de). (Entered: 09/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                BRIEF in Support re 259 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Citation of New Authorities filed by Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated. (Gorman, Eric) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Cramer Report by Defendants Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis, J. Lyle Patrick. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel# 2 Declaration of Howard Sidman in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Cramer Report# 3 Exhibit A to Sidman Declaration# 4 Exhibit B to Sidman Declaration# 5 Exhibit C Part I to Sidman Declaration# 6 Exhibit C Part II to Sidman Declaration# 7 Exhibit D to Sidman Declaration# 8 Exhibit E to Sidman Declaration)(Hand, S.) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Response to Motion re 204 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings On Loss Causation filed by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B-1# 3 Exhibit B-2# 4 Exhibit C)(Riley, Peter) (Entered: 09/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on June 2, 2005 before Judge Thomas Shields. Court Reporter: Tracy A.H. Lamp. (Transcript Housed Separately) (For a complete copy of Transcript, contact Tracy Lamp at (319) 626-7616) (mj) Modified on 9/8/2005 (Original in CR; Copy mailed to MWB) (mj). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2012: # 1 Main Document) (ksy). (Entered: 09/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendants' Supplemental Citation of New Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on "Loss Causation" by Plaintiff New Millenium Growth Fund LLC. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 09/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis, J. Lyle Patrick re 254 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 204 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings On Loss Causation (Supplemental Citation of New Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F Part 1# 7 Exhibit F Part 2# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K)(Sidman, Howard) Modified on 8/30/2005 to edit text (de). (Entered: 08/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER: A telephonic status conference was held on 8/26/2005, to further discuss ongoing discovery matters with the parties. While differences still exist on some issues, the parties appear to be moving forward in the discovery process. The parties shall submit written status reports to the undersigned magistrate judge on 9/26/2005. The court will schedule another status conference after receipt of the reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas J Shields on 8/26/05. (mem) Modified on 8/30/2005 to correct a typographical error (de). (Entered: 08/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas J Shields. Status Conference held on 8/26/2005. Written status reports to be submitted by 9/26/05. Status Conference will be scheduled after recept of the reports. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Linda Egbers.) (de, ) (Entered: 08/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER regarding telephonic status conference held 8/05/2005. The next telephonic status conference is scheduled for 8/26/2005 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas J. Shields. Counsel for plaintiffs shall make the necessary arrangements for the conference call. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 8/5/05. (mem) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for telephonic Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Thomas J Shields on 8/5/2005. Next telephonic status conference scheduled for 8/26/2005 at 10:00 AM. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Linda Egbers.) (mem) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER SETTING Telephone Conference for 8/5/2005 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas J Shields. Counsel for defendants shall make the necessary arrangements for the conference call to the court's chambers at 309-786-8038. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 7/28/05. (mem) Text modified on 7/28/2005 to reflect copy served on non-ecf attorney (mem). Modified (typo) on 7/29/2005 (mj). (Entered: 07/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF to re 259 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on New Millenium Growth Fund's Individual and Putative Class Proofs of Claim filed by Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated. (Gorman, Eric) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        RESISTANCE to Motion re 259 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Part1# 2 Exhibit A-Part2# 3 Exhibit A-Part3)(Riley, Peter) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY BRIEF to re 212 *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED - MOTION to Strike and/or Disallow New Millenium Growth Fund's Putative Class Proof of Claim filed by Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gorman, Eric) Modified on 7/18/2005 to edit name of attachment (de). (Entered: 07/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Submission of Discovery Status Report by McLeodUSA Incorporated re 263 Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gorman, Eric) Modified text on 7/14/2005 (ksy, ). Modified text on 7/15/2005 (ksy, ). (Entered: 07/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: On 6/30/2005, the court received by facsimile a report from McLeodUSA's attorneys. That letter report was in compliance with, and subject to the court's 6/23/2005 order. The court believes that in order to provide continuity in this file, and for the completeness of the record, McLeodUSA should file electronically the letter report made to the court on 6/30/2005. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 7/13/05. (mem) (Entered: 07/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 260 UNRESISTED Motion for ext. of time to file reply brief. McLeodUSA shall have until July 15, 2005 to file its reply brief. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 7/13/05. (copy faxed to Judge Shields) (de) (Entered: 07/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Defendants' Citation of New Authorities by Chapman Trust Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Riley, Peter) Modified on 7/11/2005 to add link to #204 and #254 (de). (Entered: 07/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of 212 Motion to Strike by Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated in response to 255 Brief in Opposition. (Gorman, Eric) Modified text on 7/6/2005 (ksy, ). (Entered: 07/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated. Responses due by 7/18/2005 (Attachments: # 1 McLEODUSA'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS ON NEW MILLENNIUM GROWTH FUND'S INDIVIDUAL AND PUTATIVE CLASS PROOFS OF CLAIM# 2 Exhibit 1 A# 3 Exhibit 1 B)(Gorman, Eric). (Entered: 06/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chapman Trust Group (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 06/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chapman Trust Group (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 06/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Citation of New Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on "Loss Causation" by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 06/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF in Opposition re 212 *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED - MOTION to Strike filed by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Riley, Peter) (Entered: 06/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis, J. Lyle Patrick re 204 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings On Loss Causation Citation of New Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on "Loss Causation" (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Defendants' Citation of New Authorities# 2 Exhibit B to Defendants' Citation of New Authorities# 3 Exhibit C to Defendants' Citation of New Authorities# 4 Exhibit D (pages 1-32) to Defendants' Citation of New Authorities# 5 Exhibit D (pages 33-67) to Defendants' Citation of New Authorities)(Sidman, Howard) (Entered: 06/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 246 Plaintiffs' Third UNRESISTED Motion Extension of Time to Resist McLeodUSA's Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs shall have until 6/29/05 to file a resistance to McLeodUSA's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 6/27/05. (Copy faxed to non-ecf attys.) (mj) (Entered: 06/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: The court held a telephonic status conference on 6/23/05. Counsel for McLeod USA shall submit a written report by 6/30/05. The court will address any remaining issues and schedule another status conference after receiving counsel's report. Status Report due by 6/30/2005. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 6/23/05. (Copy faxed to non-ecf attys)(mj) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas J Shields Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/23/2005. (Order to Follow) (Court Reporter Heidi Weston.) (Copy faxed to non-ecf attys) (mj) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 247 and 248 Motions for Leave to Appear. Check Status of ECF Regiatration Deadline 7/7/2005. Signed by Clerk on 6/24/05. (faxed to non-ecf counsel) (de) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Fee Receipt: $150.00, receipt number 125605 for pro hac vice fee for Attorneys Michael Etkin and Ira Levee by Chapman Trust Group (Original to Tom Riley firm at counter) (Copy faxed to non-ecf attys) (mj) (Entered: 06/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Michael S. Etkin (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Attachments: # 1 ECF Registration Form)(Riley, Peter) (Entered: 06/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Ira M. Levee (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Attachments: # 1 ECF Registration Form)(Riley, Peter) (Entered: 06/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                UNRESISTED MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Resist McLeodUSA's Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 06/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chris Davis of STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT CHRIS DAVIS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES (Stein, Mark) (Entered: 06/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION (CORRECTED) OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR RESPONSE BY DEFENDANT CHRIS DAVIS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES by Chris Davis. (Attachments: # 1)(Stein, Mark) (Entered: 06/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR RESPONSE BY DEFENDANT CHRIS DAVIS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES by Chris Davis. (Stein, Mark) (Entered: 06/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 240 Plaintiffs' Second Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Time to Resist McLeodUSA's Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs shall have until 6/24/05 to file a resistance to McLeodUSA's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 6/17/05. (Copy to non-ecf attys) (mj) (Entered: 06/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard C. Chapman, Chapman Trust Group (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 06/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            UNRESISTED MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Resist McLeodUSA's Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 06/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY BRIEF to filed by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Riley, Peter) Modified on 6/17/2005 linking event to motion at 190 (mj). (Entered: 06/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 235 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Joseph H. Weiss). Signed by Clerk on 6/15/05. (de) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Fee Receipt: $75.00, receipt number 125548 for Pro Hac Vice Fee by Richard C. Chapman, Jeffrey Brandes (faxed to non-ecf cnsl) (de) (Entered: 06/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Joseph H. Weiss by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Registration Form # 2 Credit Card Authorization Form)(Riley, Peter) Modified on 6/14/2005 to delete the credit card authorization form (de). Modified on 6/14/2005 to edit text (de). (Entered: 06/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF to re 204 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings On Loss Causation filed by Defendants Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis, J. Lyle Patrick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on "Loss Causation" (Pages 1 - 40)# 2 Exhibit 1 to Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on "Loss Causation" (Pages 41 - 78)# 3 Exhibit 2 to Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on "Loss Causation")(Sidman, Howard) (Entered: 06/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY is granted. All discovery shall be completed by 9/30/05. The court will hold monthly telephonic status conferences to allow parties to raise and discuss any discovery or scheduling matters, the first of which will be held on 6/23/2005 at 10:00 AM (CST). Plaintiffs' counsel shall be responsible for making the necessary arrangements for the call to the magistrate judge's chambers at 309-786-8038 w/Judge Shields. The subsequent conferences will be scheduled during this conference. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 6/9/05. (Copy faxed to all non-ecf attys) (mj) (Entered: 06/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 224 Plaintiffs' UNRESISTED Motion To Enlarge Time to Resist McLeodUSA's Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs shall have until 6/17/05 to file resistance to McLeodUSA's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 6/9/05. (Copy faxed to non-ecf attys.) (mj) (Entered: 06/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Fee Receipt - $75.00 - Receipt #126277 for pro hac vice filing fee for attorney David Prohofsky by Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated (copy to non-ECF attorneys) (kfs, ) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF IN RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 209 by McLeodUSA Incorporated. (Attachments: #(1) Appendix in Support; #(2) Exhibit A; #(3) Exhibit B; #(4) Exhibit C; #(5) Exhibit D; #(6) Exhibit E; #(7) Exhibit F; #(8) Exhibit G; #(9) Exhibit H; #(10) Exhibit I; #(11) Exhibit J; #(12) Exhibit K; #(13) Exhibit L; #(14) Exhibit M). (Copy of NEF to non-ecf attys)(mj) Modified on 6/2/2005 linking to #209 (mj). (Entered: 06/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 228 Defendant McLeodUSA's Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 6/1/05. (mj) (Entered: 06/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief by Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel# 2 Appendix in Support of Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel# 3 Appendix Exhibit A# 4 Appendix Exhibit B# 5 Appendix Exhibit C# 6 Appendix Exhibit D# 7 Appendix Exhibit E# 8 Appendix Exhibit F# 9 Appendix Exhibit G# 10 Appendix Exhibit H# 11 Appendix Exhibit I# 12 Appendix Exhibit J# 13 Appendix Exhibit K# 14 Appendix Exhibit L# 15 Appendix Exhibit M# 16 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Wolf, Gretchen) (Entered: 06/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF in Opposition re 204 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings On Loss Causation filed by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--Analyst Report# 2 Exhibit B-Stock Price Chart)(Riley, Peter) Modified on 6/1/2005 to edit names of attachments (de). (Entered: 05/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Fee Receipt: $ 225.00, receipt number 125419 for Pro Hac Vice Fees for Sarah Lieber, Samuel Hand and Jane Wittstein by Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, J. Lyle Patrick. (ksy, ) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 221 222 223 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Sarah E. Lieber, Samuel Joseph Hand, and Jane Rue Wittstein). Fees due by 6/30/2005. Signed by Clerk on 5/31/05. (copy faxed to non-ecf cnsl) (de) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          UNRESISTED MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Resist McLeodUSA's Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on condition that counsel pay the required pro hac vice admission fee. Fee due by 6/24/2005. Signed by Clerk on 5/25/05. (faxed to non-ecf cnsl)(de) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 216 UNRESISTED Motion For Extension of time to File Reply Brief; file by 6/16/05. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 5/24/05. (copies faxed to non-ecf atty) (des, ). (Entered: 05/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 ECF Form)(Gray, John) (Entered: 05/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated. (Gray, John) (Entered: 05/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    UNRESISTED MOTION for Approval of Extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Class Certification by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 05/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Water Island Capital, LLC of Subpoenae - Lehman Brothers, Inc. and Daniel Zito (Tashman, Heather) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Hearing on Sealed Motion 209 to Compel for 6/02/2005 at 11:00 AM in first floor courtroom, Cedar Rapids, Iowa. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 5/18/05. (mem) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 208 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 5/18/05. (Copies served on non-ecf participants.) (mem) Modified on 5/19/2005 to add paren (de). (Entered: 05/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED - MOTION to Strike by Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated. Responses due by 6/3/2005 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Strike# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Wolf, Gretchen) (Entered: 05/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF in Opposition re 190 *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED - MOTION to Certify Class MOTION for Hearing/Oral Argument filed by Defendants Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis, J. Lyle Patrick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B to Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification# 2 Exhibit C to Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Sidman, Howard) (Entered: 05/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro hac vice of Benjamin J. Sweet (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 05/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief under seal by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Riley, Peter) Modified to link documents on 5/16/2005 (ksy, ). (Entered: 05/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 206 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file their motion to compel and supporting documents under seal. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 5/13/05. (mem) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to file under Seal Request to File Documents Under Seal by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis, J. Lyle Patrick re 204 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings On Loss Causation and Accompanying Memorandum of Law In Support of Defendants' Motion (Sidman, Howard) (Entered: 05/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings On Loss Causation (ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED) by Defendants Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis, J. Lyle Patrick. Responses due by 5/31/2005 (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Sidman, Howard) Modified on 5/12/2005 to add Oral Argument Requested (de). (Entered: 05/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 202 Motion for Leave for Scott W. Bulcao to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Fee due by 6/6/2005. Signed by Clerk on 5/6/05. (de) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Fee Receipt - $75.00 - Receipt #126245 for pro hac vice admission fee for attorney Amy Van Gelden as to Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated (copy to non-ECF attorneys) (kfs, ) (Entered: 05/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Samuel A. Gunsburg by Defendant Chris Davis. (Kutzko, Diane) (Entered: 05/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott W. Bulcao (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Defendant Chris Davis. (Kutzko, Diane) (Entered: 05/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF in Support re 190 *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED - MOTION to Certify Class MOTION for Hearing/Oral Argument filed by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A #(2) Exhibit A-1 #(3) Exhibit A-2 #(4) Exhibit A-3 #(5) Exhibit A 3.2 #(6) Exhibit A-4 #(7) Exhibit A-5 #(8) Exhibit B)(de) Modified on 5/2/2005 (de, ). (Entered: 05/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 191 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief . Signed by Clerk on 5/2/05. (de) (Entered: 05/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 189 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Fee due by 5/16/2005. Signed by Clerk on 5/2/05. (faxed to non-ecf cnsl) (de) (Entered: 05/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. (SEE TEXT) Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 4/29/05. (faxed to all non-ecf counsel) (orders #192, #193, and #194 faxed to Judge Shields)(de) (Entered: 05/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 135 Motion to Seal. Pltf is granted leave to file its Statement of Interest under seal. Pltf shall produce an unredacted copy of its Statement of Interest to defts but may deem the material confidential under the Confidentiality Order recently entered by the court. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 4/29/05. (copy faxed to all non-ecf cnsl) (de) (Entered: 05/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 137 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 4/29/05. (copy faxed/mailed to non-ecf cnsl) (de) (Entered: 05/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Class Certification# 2 Exhibit A-Part 1--Milberg Weiss Firm Resume# 3 Exhibit A-Part 1.2--Milberg Weiss Firm Resume# 4 Exhibit A-Part 2--Milberg Weiss Firm Resume# 5 Exhibit A-Part 3--Milberg Weiss Firm Resume# 6 Exhibit A-Part 3.2--Milberg Weiss Firm Resume# 7 Exhibit A-Part 4--Milberg Weiss Firm Resume# 8 Exhibit A-Part 5--Milberg Weiss Firm Resume# 9 Exhibit B-Schiffrin & Barroway-Firm Biography)(Riley, Peter) Modified on 5/2/2005 to edit attachment names(de). (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED - MOTION to Certify Class, MOTION for Hearing/Oral Argument by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. Responses due by 5/16/2005 (Riley, Peter). (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated. (Fredregill, Alan) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Fee Receipt - $75.00 - Receipt #126238 for pro hac vice admission fee for attorney Jennifer Good as to Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated (copy to non-ECF attorneys) (kfs, ) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying without prejudice 181 Motion for Leave to Appear . Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 4/14/05. (de) Modified on 4/14/2005-e-mailed Samuel Gunsburg as nef states that he must be notified by means other than ecf (de). Modified on 4/14/2005 - e-mail does not go through, I called and spoke with Mr. Gunsburg. He is no longer w/firm, is no longer involved with this case, and will file a notice of withdrawal (de). (Entered: 04/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 184 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attorney Jennifer Good). Fee due by 4/28/2005. Signed by Clerk on 4/14/05. (de) (Entered: 04/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 180 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly R Baier terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 4/13/05. (faxed to Terminated Cnsl and Judge Shields) (de) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated. (Gray, John) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 126 Defendants Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall answer Interrogatory 10 by providing defendants with name and address of each individual referred to in their complaint. Plaintiffs shall also provide substantive answers to Interrogatories 12 and 13. Plaintiffs shall produce this information to defendants by 4/25/05. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 4/12/05. (mj) (Entered: 04/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New Millenium Growth Fund LLC of Amended Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey T. Spinazzola (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey T. Spinazzola (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Plaintiff New Millenium Growth Fund LLC. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated. (Baier, Kelly) (Entered: 04/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McLeodUSA Incorporated re 177 Subpoena Returned Executed, 178 Subpoena Returned Executed (Kutzko, Diane) (Entered: 04/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Subpoena Returned Executed on 3/17/05. (Kutzko, Diane) (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Subpoena Returned Executed on 3/16/05. (Kutzko, Diane) (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Fee Receipt: $ 150.00, receipt number 126217 for Pro Hac Vice Admission fees for Eric J. Gorman and Timothy A. Nelsen by McLeodUSA Incorporated. (src) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 173 174 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Fee due by 4/28/2005. Signed by Clerk on 3/28/05. (copy faxed to non-ecf cnsl) (de) (Entered: 03/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated. (Gray, John) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Defendant McLeodUSA Incorporated. (Gray, John) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John C Gray on behalf of McLeodUSA Incorporated (Gray, John) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen Maria Wolf on behalf of McLeodUSA Incorporated (Wolf, Gretchen) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Fee Receipt: $ 75.00, receipt number 124848 for Pro Hac Vice Fee for attorney Beth Roxland by Chris Davis (de) Modified on 3/14/2005-copy faxed to non-ecf cnsl (de). (Entered: 03/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 168 Motion for Leave for attorney Beth E. Roxland to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Fee due by 3/28/2005. Signed by Clerk on 3/14/05. (de) Modified on 3/14/2005-copy to Beth E. Roxland (de). (Entered: 03/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Beth E. Roxland (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Defendant Chris Davis. (Kutzko, Diane) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chris Davis re 165 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of FRIED, FRANK, HARRIS, SHRIVER & JACOBSON, LLP and attorneys David B. Hennes and Sherita M. Perry (Kutzko, Diane) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chris Davis re 164 Notice of Change of Address for Attorney Mark Stein (Kutzko, Diane) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of FRIED, FRANK, HARRIS, SHRIVER & JACOBSON, LLP and attorneys David B. Hennes and Sherita M. Perry by Defendant Chris Davis. (Kutzko, Diane) (Entered: 03/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Diane Kutzko (Kutzko, Diane) (Entered: 03/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Jeffrey T. Spinazzola on behalf of Water Island Capital, LLC. $75.00 pro hac vice fee has been paid. Signed by Clerk on 3/8/05. (de) (Entered: 03/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE of Jeffrey T. Spinazzola ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 124816) by Plaintiff New Millenium Growth Fund LLC. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Fee Receipt: $75.00, receipt number 124816 for Pro Hac Vice Fee for attorney Jeffrey T. Spinazzola by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC (copy to non-ecf cnsl) (de) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER AND RESETTING TRIAL AND FPTC: Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 8/19/2005. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 8/19/2005. Completion of Fact Discovery due by 7/15/05. Expert Discovery due by 10/7/2005. Motions due by 10/28/2005. Deadline for responses to expert reports due 9/16/05. Trial set for 6/12/06 before Chief Judge Mark W. Bennett in the 3rd flr courtroom, S.C., Iowa. FPTC set for 6/1/06 at 10:00 a.m. before US Magistrate Judge Thomas J. Shields, S.C., IA. The requirements and respective deadlines set forth in the court's Order Setting Trial, FPTC and Requirements for FPTC (#102) entered on 8/12/04 shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 2/23/05. (de) Modified on 2/23/2005-faxed to Judge Shields Secy and Law Clerk (de). (Entered: 02/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/14/05 before Judge Thomas J. Shields. Court Reporter: Kool & Nygren, Inc. (for complete copy of transcript contact Kool & Nygren, Inc., 422 2nd Avenue SE, Cedar Rapids, IA 52401) (copy to non-ecf cnsl-original transcript mailed to S.C. Clerks office to be kept with file) (de) Modified on 2/18/2005 (de). (Main Document 159 replaced on 11/8/2011) (pac). (Entered: 02/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 157 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 2/18/05. (de) (Entered: 02/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Heather Tashman of Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 124652) by Plaintiff New Millenium Growth Fund LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Receipt for Pro Hac Vice fee# 2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Riley, Peter) (Entered: 02/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Fee Receipt: $75.00, receipt number 124652 for pro hac vice fee for Heather Tashman of Schiffrin & Barroway by Plaintiffs New Millenium Growth Fund LLC, Chapman Trust Group, Water Island Capital, LLC (Copy to non-ECF attys) (mj) (Entered: 02/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan, and Trial Date by Plaintiff New Millenium Growth Fund LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan# 2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Riley, Peter) (Entered: 02/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Motion for Leave of Attorney Trevan Borum to Appear Pro Hac Vice. $75.00 Pro Hac Vice Fee paid (receipt #124637). Signed by Clerk on 2/16/05. (de) (Entered: 02/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Water Island Capital, LLC of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Trevan Borum, Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Trevan Borum of Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 124637) by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Fee Receipt: $75.00, receipt number 124637 for pro hac vice fee for Trevan Borum by Plaintiffs New Millenium Growth Fund LLC, Chapman Trust Group, Water Island Capital, LLC (Copy of NEF to non-ECF attys) (mj) (Entered: 02/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Fee Receipt: $25.00, receipt number 124611 for sanction fee paid by Schiffrin & Barroway for Attorney Zivitz representing Water Island Capital, LLC (Copy to non-ECF attys) (mj). (Entered: 02/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Bill for Sanctions for Failure to File Electronically: Attorney Andrew Zivitz fined in the amount of $25.00 for filing Notice at #148. Fee due by 2/22/2005. (Original mailed to Mr. Zivitz; copy to Financial; copy to non-ECF attys) (mj) Modified on 2/3/2005 to edit cert. of svc (de). (Entered: 02/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrew Zivitz for Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP to: 280 King of Prussia Road, Radnor, PA 19087 (Copy of NEF to non-ECF attys) (mj) (Entered: 02/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF WITHDRAWAL OF REFERENCE FROM DISTRICT OF DELAWARE BANKRUPTCY COURT with Stipulation and Order granting Request and Transferring Venue. (Attachments: #(1) Docket Sheet from Delaware USBC w/Transfer Letter; #(2) Notice of Objection to Claim of New Millenium Growth Fund (#189 on Delaware Docket - Part 1); #(3) Notice of Objection (#189 - Part 2 - Exhibits); #(4) Notice of Objection Deadline (#200 - Part 1); #(5) Notice of Objection (#200 - Part 2 - Exhibits); #(6) Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion are Core Proceedings (#219); #(7) Motion to Withdraw Reference and Transfer (#221)). (Copy to all non-ECF attys and TJS)(mj) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF in Opposition re 137 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs New Millenium Growth Fund LLC, Chapman Trust Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Declaration of Attorney Fleishman attaching Proposed Protective Order)(Riley, Peter) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying without prejudice 106 Motion to Certify Class . Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 1/20/05. (des, ) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chapman Trust Group of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Joseph Cohen) (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response to Motion re 135 MOTION to file under Seal and to file Statement of Interest Ex Parte filed by Defendants Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis, J. Lyle Patrick. (Sidman, Howard) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 140 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 1/18/05. (de) (Entered: 01/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Fee Receipt: $75.00, receipt number 124406 for Pro Hac Vice Fee for Attorney Joseph D. Cohen by Chapman Trust Group (copy to non-ecf cnsl) (de) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro hac vice of Joseph D. Cohen ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 124406) by Plaintiff Chapman Trust Group. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Chapman Trust Group of Counsel's Change in Firm Name (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas J Shields : Motion Hearing held on 1/14/2005 re 137 MOTION for Protective, order to follow 126 *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED - MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Answers to Interrogatories 10, 12, and 13 order to follow and 135 MOTION to file under Seal, order to follow. (Court Reporter Sara Hyatt.) (ksy, ) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis, J. Lyle Patrick. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Brief In Support of Defendants' Motion to Enter Defendants' Proposed Confidentiality Order# 3 Declaration of Howard F. Sidman In Support of Defendants' Motion to Enter Defendants' Proposed Confidentiality Order)(Sidman, Howard) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Water Island Capital, LLC of Withdrawal as Co-Lead Plaintiff and Proposed Class Representative (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 01/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to file under Seal by Plaintiff New Millenium Growth Fund LLC. (Riley, Peter) Modified on 1/6/2005-copy faxed to Jed Brokaw, Law Clerk for Judge Shields and Debbie Moses, Secretary for Judge Shields (de). (Entered: 01/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3.2 STATEMENT of Interest Chapman Trust by Water Island Capital, LLC. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 01/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 126 to Compel Plaintiffs' Answers to Interrogatories 10, 12 and 13 for 1/14/2005 at 10:30 AM CR 1st Fl Ct. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 12/29/04. (mem) (Entered: 12/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 117 , 121 and 128 UNRESISTED Motions. All depositions relating to class certification shall be completed by 01/28/2005; Defendants' resistance to class certification shall be served and filed by 03/01/2005; Plaintiffs' reply shall be served and filed by 03/31/2005. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 12/29/04. (mem) (Entered: 12/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY BRIEF to re 126 *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED - MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Answers to Interrogatories 10, 12, and 13 in Further Support of Defendants' Motion and In Response to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by Defendants Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis, J. Lyle Patrick. (Sidman, Howard) (Entered: 12/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKET ANNOTATION: Docket Entry #129 contains an incomplete page 9. That page 9 is attached to this notation and has been added to the Docket #129 as well. (This page has been faxed to Judge Shields and copied to non-ecf attorneys.) (ksy, ) Modified on 12/17/2004 (ksy, ). (Entered: 12/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF in Opposition re 126 *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED - MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Answers to Interrogatories 10, 12, and 13 filed by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Riley, Peter) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2004 (ksy, ). (Entered: 12/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              UNRESISTED MOTION for Approval of Discovery Deadlines and Briefing Schedule Related to Class Certification by Defendants Chris Davis, Steve Gray, Clark McLeod, J. Lyle Patrick. (Sidman, Howard) Modified on 12/15/2004-e-mailed to Judge Shields law clerk and secy on 12/11/04 (de). (Entered: 12/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING PARTIES' COMPLIANCE WITH LR3.2'S REQUIRED STATEMENT OF INTEREST - The parties are directed to file statements of interest, as required by LR 3.2, on or before January 5, 2005. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 11/30/04. (src) (Entered: 11/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 126 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED - MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Answers to Interrogatories 10, 12, and 13 by Defendants Chris Davis, Steve Gray, Clark McLeod, J. Lyle Patrick. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Howard F. Sidman# 2 Brief In Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel# 3 Appendix to Defendants' Brief)(Sidman, Howard) Modified on 11/24/2004 (dsr) that copy of this pleading was e-mailed to Judge Shields' chambers on 11/24/04. (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Fee Receipt: $150.00. Receipt number 123987. PHV fees by Chris Davis for S. Perry and D. Hennes. (mem) (Entered: 11/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 122 123 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Fee due by 12/17/2004. Signed by Clerk on 11/17/04. (deve) (Entered: 11/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sherita M. Perry (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Defendant Chris Davis. (Kutzko, Diane) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David B. Hennes (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Defendant Chris Davis. (Kutzko, Diane) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            UNRESISTED MOTION for extension of deadline to amend pleadings and add parties by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 10/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 118 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The $75.00 pro hac vice fee has been paid. Signed by Clerk on 9/24/04. (deve) (Entered: 09/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Fee Receipt: $75.00, receipt number 123577 for Pro Hac Vice by Steve Gray, Clark McLeod, and J. Lyle Patrick (deve) Modified on 9/24/2004 -copy mailed/faxed to non ecf attorneys (deve). (Entered: 09/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Defendants Steve Gray, Clark McLeod. (Kutzko, Diane) (Entered: 09/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    UNRESISTED MOTION for Approval of Discovery Deadlines and Briefing Schedule Related to Class Certification by Defendant Clark McLeod. (Fry, Richard) (Entered: 09/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 106 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Water Island Capital, LLC. This matter comes before the court pursuant to an oral request from individual defendants in this matter on September 2, 2004, to extend the deadline for responding to plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (#106) to September 10, 2004. Responses due by 9/10/2004. Copies faxed/mailed to all non-ecf attorneys. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 9/2/04. (src) (Entered: 09/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 103 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Request for Production. Responses due by 9/3/2004. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 8/20/04. (ksy, ) (Entered: 08/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Certify Class Certificate of Service of Exhibits to Documents #106 and #109 by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. Responses due by 9/7/2004 (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 08/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Annotation: Attached are the exhibits to Plaintiffs' Statement Re: Exhibits to Motion for Class Certification, Doc #106 & 109. They are also being attached to document #106 (Motion for Class Certification) Per phone call to attorney, attorney to file Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits - Part 2)(gcla) (Entered: 08/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response to Motion re 103 MOTION for Extension of Time by Defendant Lyle Patrick, and filed by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 107 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief (FILED CONTEMPORANEOUSLY). Signed by Clerk on 8/18/04. (deve) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER finding as moot 76 Motion for Hearing/Oral Argument, finding as moot 76 Motion for Order Lifting Automatic Stay. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 8/17/04. (copy mailed/faxed to all non-ecf attorneys) (deve) (Entered: 08/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Certify Class Statement Re: Exhibits to Motion for Class Certification by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. Responses due by 9/3/2004 (Riley, Peter) Modified on 8/18/2004 - Statement of Exhibits also added as attachment to #106. (deve). (Entered: 08/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF in Support re 106 MOTION to Certify Class, 107 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief filed by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Riley, Peter) Modified on 8/18/2004 - brief also added as attachment to #106 (deve). (Entered: 08/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 08/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Certify Class (ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED) by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. Responses due by 9/3/2004 (Riley, Peter) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2004 (deve). Modified on 8/18/2004 to edit text adding Oral Argument Requested (deve). Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2004 (gcla, ). (Entered: 08/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 97 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Richard I. Werder, Jr., Jennifer W. Cohen and Howard F. Sidman allowed to withdraw as counsel of record for deft Chris Davis. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 8/17/04. (copy faxed/mailed to all non-ecf attorneys and Judge Shields) (deve) (Entered: 08/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 103 MOTION for Extension of Time by Defendant Lyle Patrick, and:Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2004 at 11:00 AM for 103 . Counsel for defts shall make the arrangements for a telephonic conference call with all counsel to the undersigned's chambers at 309-786-7986. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 8/17/04. (copy faxed/mailed to all non-ecf attorneys and to Judge Shields)(deve) (Entered: 08/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to request for production [EXPEDITED RELIEF REQUESTED]by Defendant Lyle Patrick, and by Defendants Chris Davis, Steve Gray, Clark McLeod. (Kutzko, Diane) Text modified on 8/16/2004 to reflect that a copy of this motion and the docket sheet were e-mailed to D. Moses in Magistrate Judge Shields' chambers on this date (mem). Modified on 8/17/2004 to edit text (deve). (Entered: 08/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) atleast 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 14 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 14 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 11/14/2005; 09:00 AM in SC 3rd Fl Ct before Chief Judge Mark W Bennett. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2005; 03:00 PM in SC 1st Fl Ct before Magistrate Paul A Zoss. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/28/2005. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 08/12/04. (ak, ) (Entered: 08/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel S. Fleishman 100 . Counsel has paid the the required pro hac vice admission fee. Signed by Clerk on 7/12/04. (mj) (Entered: 07/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro hac vice ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 122995) by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 07/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Fee Receipt: $ 75.00, receipt number 122995 for pro hac vice fee for Rachel S. Fleishman by Water Island Capital, LLC (copy faxed to all non-ECF attys) (mj) (Entered: 07/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Peter C Riley (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 06/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Chris Davis. (Kutzko, Diane) (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel A. Gunsburg and Mark J. Stein on behalf of Chris Davis. (mem) Text modified on 6/7/2004 to reflect copies served via facsimile and/or ordinary mail on non-ecf participants (mem). (Entered: 06/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Kutzko on behalf of Chris Davis (Kutzko, Diane) Modified on 6/8/2004 to reflect that this Notice of Appearance should have been filed on behalf of Samuel A. Gunsberg and Mark J. Stein and has been correctly refiled at entry 96 . (mem) (Entered: 06/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 91 92 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 6/1/04. (deve) (Entered: 06/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Fee Receipt #122670: $150.00 for pro hac vice fees for Samuel Gunsburg and Mark Stein appearing for Defendant Chris Davis. (mem) (Entered: 05/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Mark Stein (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Defendant Chris Davis. (Fry, Richard) (Entered: 05/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Samuel Gunsburg (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75) by Defendant Chris Davis. (Fry, Richard) (Entered: 05/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures due date of June 14, 2004 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 10/29/2004. Amended Pleadings due by 10/29/2004. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 2/1/2005. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 3/21/2005. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 4/15/2005. Discovery due by 5/15/2005. Motions due by 6/15/2005. Trial Ready Deadline 10/15/2005. A scheduling and planning conference will not be scheduled at this time.Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 5/4/04. (deve) (Entered: 05/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Water Island Capital, LLC. (Riley, Peter) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2004 (deve, ). (Entered: 05/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendants Clark McLeod, Stephen Gray, Lyle Patrick, Chris Davis' ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Clark McLeod.(Fry, Richard) (Entered: 05/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 58 on 29 Motion to Dismiss filed by McLeodUSA Incorporated, Clark McLeod, Steve Gray and Chris Davis - 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommends 29 Motion to Dismiss DENIED - Motion no longer referred to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Mark W Bennett on 03/31/04. (kfs, ) (Entered: 03/31/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition of 76 Plaintiff's MOTION for an Order Lifting Automatic Stay of Discovery filed by Defendants Chris Davis, Steve Gray and Clark McLeod. (mp) (Entered: 11/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of Deft's Objections to 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Denying 29 the Motion to Dismiss filed by McLeodUSA Incorporated, Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis filed by Defendants Chris Davis, Steve Gray and Clark McLeod. (mp) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 83 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Reply Brief. Signed by Clerk on 11/7/03. (mp) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief by Defendants Chris Davis, Steve Gray and Clark McLeod. (Attachment: #(1) Reply Memorandum in Support of Defts Objections to R&R)(mp) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 29 Motion to Dismiss filed by McLeodUSA Incorporated, Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis. Defendants shall to and including 11/06/03 to file reply to Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Objections to Respondent and Recommendation for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendants shall have to and including 11/21/03, to file their resistance to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 10/31/03. (ak, ) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 80 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Objections to R&R re: Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's have to and including 11/6/03 to file Reply Brief; Plaintiff's have to and including 10/23/03 to respond to Objections to R&R Defendant's Responses due by 11/21/2003 to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 10/30/03. (pkm) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Objections to R&R re: Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Chris Davis, Steve Gray, Clark McLeod, McLeodUSA Incorporated. (pkm) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST for Oral Argument re Plaintiffs' 78 Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Objections to Report and Recommendation for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss RE 63 Objection to Report and Recommendations, 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommend Denied, 29 Motion to Dismiss filed by McLeodUSA Incorporated, Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B, #(3) Exhibit C, #(4) Certificate of Service).(dsr) (Entered: 10/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' BRIEF in Opposition to Defendants' Objections to 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 29 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Oral Argument Requested). (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B, #(3) Exhibit C).(dsr) Additional attachment(s) Certificate of Service added on 10/24/2003 (dsr). (Entered: 10/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to File Response to Defendants' Objections to Report and Recommendation in Excess of Twenty (20) Pages by Plaintiffs Chapman Trust Group, New Millenium Growth Fund LLC, and Water Island Capital, LLC w/Proposed Order. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(dsr) (Entered: 10/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Order Lifting Automatic Stay of Discovery and Allowing Limited Third Party Discovery to Commence and REQUEST for Oral Argument by Plaintiffs Chapman Trust Group, New Millenium Growth Fund LLC, and Water Island Capital, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service# 2 Memorandum in Support# 3 Exhibit A-G# 4 Exhibit H-K).(dsr ) (Entered: 10/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Objections to R&R. Responses due by 10/23/2003. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 10/16/03. (ksy, ) (Entered: 10/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Fee Receipt: $ 75.00, receipt number #120996 for Pro Hac Vice Admission fee for attorney Carlos Ramirez (mp) (Entered: 10/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 70 Motion for Leave for attorney Carlos Ramirez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/03. (mp) (Entered: 10/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chapman Trust Group, New Millenium Growth Fund LLC, Water Island Capital, LLC re 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Time to File Defendants' Objections to R&R for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ksy, ) (Entered: 10/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Objections to R&R for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Chapman Trust Group, New Millenium Growth Fund LLC, Water Island Capital, LLC. (ksy, ) (Entered: 10/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Carlos F Ramirez by Plaintiff Water Island Capital, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(jkh) (Entered: 10/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION and ORDER granting extension of time to October 16, 2003 to respond to Defts' Objections to Report and Recommendation for Defts' Motion to Dismiss consolidated Amended Complaint.Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 10/7/03. (deve) (Entered: 10/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs re 64 Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Defendants' Objections to Report and Recommendation for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (dsr) (Entered: 09/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ORDER Granting 64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Objections to R&R - Responses due by 10/16/03 - Amending 65 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Chief Judge Mark W Bennett on 09/19/03. (kfs, ) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 61 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief filed by McLeodUSA Incorporated, Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis - MOTION ALREADY GRANTED BY 62 Order on Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. Signed by Chief Judge Mark W Bennett on 09/19/03. (kfs, ) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Objections to R&R - Responses due by 10/16/2003. Signed by Chief Judge Mark W Bennett on 09/19/03. (kfs, ) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 63 Defendants' Objections to R&R for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Chapman Trust Group, New Millenium Growth Fund LLC, Water Island Capital, LLC. (ksy, ) (Entered: 09/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS to 58 Report and Recommendation by Defendants Chris Davis, Steve Gray, Clark McLeod, McLeodUSA Incorporated. (mem) (Entered: 09/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 61 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. Signed by Clerk on 9/12/03. (mem) (Entered: 09/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Objections to R&R by Defendants Chris Davis, Steve Gray, Clark McLeod, McLeodUSA Incorporated. (Attachments: (#1) Objections to Report & Recommendation)(mem) (Entered: 09/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to R&R for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 9/12/2003 . Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on 8/26/03. (ksy, ) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to R&R for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated and Amended Complaint by Defendants Chris Davis, Steve Gray, Clark McLeod, McLeodUSA Incorporated. (ksy, ) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommend Denied 29 Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendants' McLeodUSA Incorporated, Clark McLeod, Steve Gray, Chris Davis; Motions no longer referred to Magistrate Judge 29 Motion to Dismiss; Objections to R&R due by 8/28/2003. Signed by Judge Thomas J Shields on August 7, 2003. (dsr) (Entered: 08/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 4/30/03 before Judge Thomas J. Shields. (HOUSED SEPARATELY) For copies of transcript contact Court Reporter: Loretta F. Wilford; Address: 305 10th Avenue, Hiawatha, IA 52233; Telephone No.: 319/393-5050 (deve) Modified on 6/20/2003 (deve). (Main Document 57 replaced on 11/8/2011) (pac). (Entered: 06/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S COURT MINUTES: from Motion Hearing held on 4/30/03 before Magistrate Judge Thomas J. Shields Hearing satisfied on motion to dismiss consolidated amended class action complaint [29-1] ruling reserved on [29-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended class action complaint, Report and Recommendation to follow; Court Reporter Loretta Wilford DGE (pac). (Entered: 04/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE RE: reply [54-1] by plaintiffs GGC (pac). (Entered: 04/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by plaintiff to Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Submission of Authority [#46] (ruled on by TJS on 04/21/03; #50) MEM (pac). (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Clerk granting motion for attorney Andrew Zivitz to appear pro hac vice [51-1] (cc: all counsel) DGE (pac). (Entered: 04/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RECEIPT # 118945 in the amount of $ 75.00 for pro hac vice fee for Attorney Andrew Zivitz DGE (pac). (Entered: 04/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiff Water Island Capital in 1:02-cv-00001 for attorney Andrew Zivitz to appear pro hac vice assigned to Clerk DGE (pac). (Entered: 04/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas J. Shields granting motion for leave to file supplemental submission of authority in support of defendants' motion to dismiss consolidated amended class action complaint [46-1] (cc: all counsel) GGC (pac). (Entered: 04/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RECEIPT # 118920 in the amount of $ 75.00 for pro hac vice fee for Attorney Sanford Dumain GGC (pac). (Entered: 04/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Clerk granting motion for attorney Sanford P. Dumain to appear pro hac vice [47-1] on condition that counsel pay the required pro hac vice admission fee (cc: all counsel) GGC (pac). (Entered: 04/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/18/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiff Water Island Capital for attorney Sanford P. Dumain to appear pro hac vice assigned to Clerk GGC (pac). (Entered: 04/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/21/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant for leave to file supplemental submission of authority in support of defendants' motion to dismiss consolidated amended class action complaint assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas J. Shields (supplement attached) GGC (pac). (Entered: 04/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas J. Shields IN-COURT HEARING on Report and Recommendation set for 10:00 4/30/03 w/Judge Shields Cedar Rapids, IA (cc: all counsel) GGC (pac). (Entered: 03/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas J. Shields STATUS CONFERENCE set for 10:00 3/21/03 w/Judge Shields (cc: all counsel) KSY (pac). (Entered: 03/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Linda R. Reade Case referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas Shields (cc: all counsel) KSY (pac). (Entered: 02/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY brief by defendant re motion to dismiss consolidated amended class action complaint [29-1] GGC (pac). (Entered: 11/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Clerk granting motion to exceed page limitation re brief [40-1] (cc: all counsel) GGC (pac). (Entered: 11/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant to exceed page limitation re brief assigned to Clerk GGC (pac). (Entered: 11/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Chief Mag Judge John A. Jarvey granting motion to extend time to file reply [39-1] to and including 11/22/02 (cc: all counsel) GGC (Entered: 11/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in opposition of motion to dismiss consolidated amended class action complaint [29-1] (Housed Separately) GGC (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2011: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 CoS) (pac). (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Clerk granting motion to exceed page limitation re brief [36-1] (cc: all counsel) GGC (pac). (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/4/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by plaintiff to exceed page limitation re brief assigned to Clerk GGC (pac). (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE RE: motion to extend time to resist motion to dismiss [34-1] by plaintiff GGC (pac). (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting Motion to Enlarge Time to Resist Motion to Dismiss to 11/1/02 by Chief Mag Judge John A. Jarvey (cc: all counsel) MJJ Modified on 10/31/2002 (pac). (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by defendant in support of motion to dismiss consolidated amended class action complaint [29-1] GGC (pac). (Entered: 09/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Clerk granting motion to exceed page limitation [31-1] (cc: all counsel) GGC (pac). (Entered: 09/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/3/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by defendants to exceed page limitation assigned to Clerk GGC (pac). (Entered: 09/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Richard S.Lipman by defendant re motion to dismiss consolidated amended class action complaint [29-1] (Exhibits housed separately) GGC Modified on 09/03/2002 (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2011: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 (part 1), # 5 Exhibit 4 (part 2), # 6 Exhibit 5 (part 1), # 7 Exhibit 5 (part 2), # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17) (pac). (Entered: 09/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant to dismiss consolidated amended class action complaint assigned to Judge unassigned GGC (pac). (Entered: 09/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/8/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Chief Mag Judge John A. Jarvey granting motion to extend time to move to dismiss to 8/30/02 and stipulate briefing schedule (Plaintiffs' resistance 10/30/02; Defendants' reply brief 11/14/02) [28-1] (cc: all counsel) GGC (Entered: 07/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT For Violation of the Federal Securities Laws RE: complaint [1-1] by plaintiffs; jury demand GGC (pac). (Entered: 06/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff's by Tom J Riley DLP (pac). (Entered: 04/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS, APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVING LEAD PLAINTIFFS' SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL AND LIAISON COUNSEL by Chief Mag Judge John A. Jarvey: Motions Granted [23-1] Lead Case 1:02-cv-1 consolidated with member cases 1:02-cv-6, 1:02-cv-7, 1:02-cv-8, 1:02-cv-13, 1:02-cv-16, 1:02-cv-18, 1:02-cv-19, 1:02-cv-20, 1:02-cv-23, 1:02-cv-33, 1:02-cv-38, 1:02-cv-45 (cc: all counsel) MJJ Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2006 (des, ). (Entered: 04/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE RE: motion to consolidate cases, appointing lead plaintiffs and approving lead plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel w/proposed order [23-1] by plaintiff, defendant, movant GGC (pac). (Entered: 03/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STIPULATION jointly by plaintiff, defendant,and movants to consolidate cases, appointing lead plaintiffs and approving lead plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel w/proposed order assigned to Chief Mag Judge John A. Jarvey MJJ (pac). (Entered: 03/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Senior Judge Edward J. McManus: Clerk to reassign case to another Judge; Case reassigned to unassigned Judge (cc: all counsel) MJJ (pac). (Entered: 03/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Clerk granting motion for attorneys Gregory M. Nespole and Katherine B. DuBose to appear pro hac vice representing Market Street Securities [19-1] (cc: all counsel) GGC (pac). (Entered: 03/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RECEIPT # 116246 in the amount of $ 60.00 pro hac vice fees for Gregory M. Nespole and Katherine B. DuBose representing Market Street Securities MJJ (pac). (Entered: 03/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by movant Market Street Sec for attorneys Gregory M. Nespole and Katherine B. DuBose to appear pro hac vice assigned to Clerk MJJ (pac). (Entered: 03/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE RE: motion for approval of lead plaintiff's choice of lead and liason counsel [9-3], RE: motion for appointment of lead plaintiff [9-2], RE: motion to consolidate cases [9-1], RE: memorandum [10-1] by movant Glenn Edmonds GGC (pac). (Entered: 03/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by movant Chapman Trust Group in support of motion to consolidate cases [9-1], of motion for appointment of lead plaintiff [9-2], of motion for approval of lead plaintiff's choice of lead and liason counsel [9-3] GGC (pac). (Entered: 03/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman by movant Chapman Trust Group re motion to consolidate cases [9-1], re motion for appointment of lead plaintiff [9-2], re motion for approval of lead plaintiff's choice of lead and liason counsel [9-3] GGC Modified on 03/13/2002 (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2011: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F) (pac). (Entered: 03/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by movant Chapman Trust Group to consolidate cases , and for Appointment of Chapman Trust Group as lead plaintiff , and for approval of selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel assigned to Chief Mag Judge John A. Jarvey GGC (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2011: # 1 Exhibit A) (pac). (Entered: 03/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by movant Market Street Sec in support of motion to consolidate cases [9-1], of motion for appointment of lead plaintiff [9-2], of motion for approval of lead plaintiff's choice of lead and liason counsel [9-3] GGC (pac). (Entered: 03/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Gregory M. Nespole by movant Market Street Sec re motion to consolidate cases [9-1], re motion for appointment of lead plaintiff [9-2], re motion for approval of lead plaintiff's choice of lead and liason counsel [9-3] GGC (pac). (Entered: 03/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by movant Market Street Sec to consolidate cases , and for appointment of Market Street Sec as lead plaintiff , and for approval of its selection of lead counsel assigned to Chief Mag Judge John A. Jarvey GGC Modified on 03/13/2002 (pac). (Entered: 03/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE RE: memorandum [10-1], RE: motion to consolidate cases [9-1], RE: motion for appointment of lead plaintiff [9-2], RE: motion for approval of lead plaintiff's choice of lead and liason counsel [9-3] by movant Glenn Edmonds GGC (pac). (Entered: 03/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by movant Glenn Edmonds in support of motion to consolidate cases [9-1], of motion for appointment of lead plaintiff [9-2], of motion for approval of lead plaintiff's choice of lead and liason counsel [9-3] GGC (pac). (Entered: 03/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by movant Glenn Edmonds to consolidate cases , and for appointment of lead plaintiff , and for approval of lead plaintiff's choice of lead and liason counsel assigned to Chief Mag Judge John A. Jarvey GGC (pac). (Entered: 03/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for movant Glenn Edmonds by Steven P. Wandro GGC (pac). (Entered: 03/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Chief Mag Judge John A. Jarvey: Defendant has filed a petition for relief in the bankruptcy court [4-1], This action is stayed pursuant to 11 USC 362; , CASE STAYED (cc: all counsel) MJJ (pac). (Entered: 02/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENT by defendant Clark McLeod, defendant Steve Gray, defendant Chris Davis re motion to extend time to answer [5-1] GGC (pac). (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant Clark McLeod, defendant Steve Gray, defendant Chris Davis to extend time to answer assigned to Mag Judge Jarvey GGC Modified on 02/07/2002 (pac). (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by McLeodUSA Inc of filing bankruptcy GGC (pac). (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon defendant McLeodUSA Inc, defendant Clark McLeod, defendant Steve Gray, defendant Chris Davis 1/28/02 answer due on 2/17/02 for Chris Davis, for Steve Gray, for Clark McLeod, for McLeodUSA Inc GGC (pac). (Entered: 01/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RECEIPT # 115774 in the amount of $ 150.00 GGC (pac). (Entered: 01/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT (Summons(es) w/notice,consents,report form, LR16/3.2 to atty for svc) SCHEDULING REPORT DDL 5/31/02 GGC (pac). (Entered: 01/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 237 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?