American Civil Liberties Union et al v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-04419
District Judge Richard J. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

American Civil Liberties Union American Civil Liberties Union, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/23/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Melissa Goodman +1 212 549 2500 +1 212 549 2680 mgoodman@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Arterburn +1 206 757 8069
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert D. Balin +1 212 489 8230 +1 212 489 8340 robbalin@dwt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel M Bayard +1 212 603 6489 +1 212 489 8340 samuelbayard@dwt.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce EH Johnson +1 206 757 8069 +1757706 +17 757 7069 brucejohnson@dwt.com
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/23/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Melissa Goodman +1 212 549 2500 +1 212 549 2680 mgoodman@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Arterburn +1 206 757 8069
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert D. Balin +1 212 489 8230 +1 212 489 8340 robbalin@dwt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel M Bayard +1 212 603 6489 +1 212 489 8340 samuelbayard@dwt.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce EH Johnson +1 206 757 8069 +1757706 +17 757 7069 brucejohnson@dwt.com
v.
United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Defense"

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis Anthony Pellegrino +1 212 530 5000 APellegr@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolina A. Fornos +1 212 637 2740 +1 212 637 2702 carolina.fornos@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Justice"

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis Anthony Pellegrino +1 212 530 5000 APellegr@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolina A. Fornos +1 212 637 2740 +1 212 637 2702 carolina.fornos@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
United States National Security Agency United States National Security Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "National Security Agency/Central Security Service"

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis Anthony Pellegrino +1 212 530 5000 APellegr@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolina A. Fornos +1 212 637 2740 +1 212 637 2702 carolina.fornos@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
Office Of The Director Of National Intelligence Office Of The Director Of National Intelligence, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis Anthony Pellegrino +1 212 530 5000 APellegr@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolina A. Fornos +1 212 637 2740 +1 212 637 2702 carolina.fornos@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552(a)
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order dated March 30, 2012, Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is denied, and Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 3/30/12) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 52 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 31 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation; granting 35 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants: Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is HEREBY DENIED, and Defendants' motion for summary judgment is HEREBY GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions located at Doc. Nos. 31 and 35 and close this case. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/30/2012) (ab) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None
      DECLARATION of David M. Hardy (corrected declaration) in Support re: 35 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, National Security Agency/Central Security Service, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None
        DECLARATION of David M. Hardy in Support re: 35 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, National Security Agency/Central Security Service, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Classified Filing re: 35 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, National Security Agency/Central Security Service, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None
            DECLARATION of John F. Hackett in Support re: 35 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, National Security Agency/Central Security Service, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Benjamin H. Torrance and Louis A. Pellegrino dated 1/16/2012 re: Counsel for the Defendant writes to request that the in camera review due on 1/18/2012 be extended until 1/25/2012. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/17/2012) (ab) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Benjamin H. Torrance and Louis A. Pellegrino dated 11/23/2011 re: Counsel for the defendants requests until 1/18/2012, to provide their in camera responses. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/28/2011) (ft) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 45 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  OPINION AND ORDER:#101028 For the reasons stated above, Plaintiffs' motion to strike is HEREBY DENIED; their motion in the alternative for in camera review is Granted in Part and Denied in Part. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion located at Doc. No. 38. The cross motions for summary judgment, located at Doc. Nos. 31 and 35, will remain open pending the additional submissions set forth above. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/15/2011) (js) Modified on 11/21/2011 (jab). (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                    REPLY to Response to Motion re: 38 MOTION to Strike or, In the Alternative, For Complete In Camera Review.. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (London, Ronald) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                      DECLARATION of Diane M. Janosek in Opposition re: 38 MOTION to Strike or, In the Alternative, For Complete In Camera Review., 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, National Security Agency/Central Security Service, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 38 MOTION to Strike or, In the Alternative, For Complete In Camera Review.. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, National Security Agency/Central Security Service, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER, Set Deadline as to 38 MOTION to Strike or, In the Alternative, For Complete In Camera Review. Response due by 8/8/2011, Reply due by 8/17/2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/1/11) (cd) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                            REPLY to Response to Motion re: 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment. and in opposition to 35, defendants' cross motion for summary judgment. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (London, Ronald) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 38 MOTION to Strike or, In the Alternative, For Complete In Camera Review.. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (London, Ronald) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Strike or, In the Alternative, For Complete In Camera Review. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation.(London, Ronald) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 35 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. and in opposition to 31 plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, National Security Agency/Central Security Service, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 35 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. and in opposition to 31 plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, National Security Agency/Central Security Service, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Torrance, Benjamin) Modified on 7/5/2011 (ldi). (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                      CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, National Security Agency/Central Security Service, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Responses due by 7/18/2011(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                        DECLARATION of Robert D. Balin in Support re: 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit)(Balin, Robert) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                          RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Balin, Robert) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Balin, Robert) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation.(Balin, Robert) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER ADJOURNING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: The date for Plaintiffs to file and serve their motion for summary judgment on outstanding issues, currently scheduled for May 20, 2011, shall be adjourned and extended to June 3, 2011. the date for Defendants to file and serve their papers in opposition to the Summary Judgment Motion and in support of any cross-motion for summary judgment, currently scheduled for June 17, 2011, shall be adjourned and extended to July 1, 2011. The date for Plaintiffs to file and serve their reply papers in further support of the Summary Judgment Motion and in opposition to any cross-motion for summary judgment currently scheduled for July 1, 2011, shall be adjourned to July 18, 2011. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/16/2011) (js) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald Gary London on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (London, Ronald) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION, granting 26 Motion for Jennifer Arterburn to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/3/2011) (lnl) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION, granting 25 Motion for Bruce Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/3/2011) (lnl) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Jennifer Arterburn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation.(mbe) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Bruce Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation.(mbe) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Bayard on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (Bayard, Samuel) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert D. Balin on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (Balin, Robert) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Louis A. Pellegrino dated 2/23/2011 re: The parties hereby propose the following schedule: Government's draft Vaughn indexes and/or declarations to be submitted to Plaintiff by 4/25/2011; ACLU will move for summary judgment on outstanding issues due May 20, 2011; Government's opposition to ACLU's motion and cross-motion for summary judgment due June 17, 2011; ACLU's reply brief due July 1, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/23/2011) (jpo) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Alexander A. Abdo dated 2/11/2011 re: The parties respectfully request until 2/23/2011 to submit to the Court a proposed schedule to address Defendants' withholdings. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/14/2011) (ae) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Louis Anthony Pellegrino on behalf of Department of Defense, Department of Justice, National Security Agency/Central Security Service, Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Pellegrino, Louis) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 1/21/2011 re: Counsel for defendant request that the Court permit the parties to file an additional status report by February 11, 2011, in which the parties will either indicate their agreement to dismiss this action or propose a schedule for submission of cross-motions for summary judgment. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/21/11) (js) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' counsel Melissa Goodman's motion to withdraw as counsel, as she is no longer working for the American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, which represents Plaintiffs in this case. Plaintiffs continue to be represented by the Foundation and another attorney from the Foundation has filed a notice of appearance. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the motion is granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to remove Ms. Goodman's appearance from the docket sheet and terminate the motion listed as Docket Number 17 . Attorney Melissa Goodman terminated. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/23/2010) (lnl) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Melissa Goodman to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation.(Goodman, Melissa) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Alexander A. Abdo and Jameel Jaffer, dated 12/17/2010, re: On November 29, 2010, Defendants completed their processing and production of responsive documents. Since that time, Plaintiffs have reviewed the production and conferred with Defendants regarding future proceedings. Plaintiffs will likely raise several challenges to Defendants' withholding of records; however, the parties continue to discuss the scope of those challenges, if any, in the hope of narrowing them. To allow those discussions to continue, the parties respectfully request until January 21, 2011 to submit a joint status report apprising the Court of the status of the parties' negotiations and the need for further litigation if any. Should further litigation be necessary, it will consist of cross-motions for summary judgment as to the propriety of Defendants' withholding of responsive records pursuant to the various exemptions of FOIA. See 5 U.S.C. § 552(b). ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/17/2010) (lnl) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Abraham Abdo on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 11/9/10 re: With the consent of plaintiffs' counsel, the government respectfully requests an extension of time to December 17, 2010 to provide the Court with a joint letter regarding the status of the case. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/10/10) (djc) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER THAT, by December 17,2010, the parties shall submit a joint letter apprising the Court of the status of the parties' negotiations and their views concerning potential motions. SO ORDERED. (Status Report due by 12/17/2010.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/19/2010) (jmi) Modified on 8/20/2010 (jmi). (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding FOIA Request as set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/13/2010) (jmi) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolina A. Fornos on behalf of Department of Defense, Department of Justice, National Security Agency/Central Security Service, Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Fornos, Carolina) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin H. Torrance on behalf of Department of Defense, Department of Justice, National Security Agency/Central Security Service, Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, National Security Agency/Central Security Service, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Fornos, Carolina) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons served on Office of the Director of National Intelligence on June 14, 2010. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Goodman, Melissa) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons served on National Security Agency/Central Security Service on June 9, 2010. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Goodman, Melissa) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons served on Department of Justice on June 15, 2010. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Goodman, Melissa) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons served on Department of Defense on June 11, 2010. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Goodman, Melissa) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by August 5, 2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall appear for a status conference on August 19, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, by August 11, 2010 at 4:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit a letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information set forth within this Order in separate paragraphs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, by August 11, 2010 at 4:00 p.m., the parties shall submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/2/2010) (jfe) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Goodman on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (Goodman, Melissa) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation.(rdz) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, National Security Agency/Central Security Service, Department of Defense. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 905701)Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation.(rdz) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 244 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?