Mosaid Technologies Inc. v. Adobe Systems Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00698
District Judge Gregory M. Sleet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 11:01 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mosaid Technologies, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bayard, PA

Represented by Hill Kertscher & Pixley LLP

v.
Adobe Systems, Inc. Adobe Systems, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Salon Internet, Inc.
Unknown Role, OMNITURE Inc.

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/07/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Denise Seastone Kraft +1 302 425 7106 +1 888 325 9741 dkraft@eapdlaw.com
Alcatel-Lucent, Inc. Alcatel-Lucent, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Alcatel Lucent USA Inc."

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

International Business Machines Corporation International Business Machines Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/07/2012, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth R. Adamo +1 216 586 7120 +1 216 579 0212 kradamo@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/01/2011, PRO HAC VICE Jon Todd Hohenthaner +1 212 446 4832 +1 212 446 4900 jhohenthaner@kirkland.com
TERMINATED: 05/07/2012, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Marina +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jmarina@kirkland.com

Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

No Logo Juniper Networks, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/07/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tara D. Elliott
VMware, Inc. VMware, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.

Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (109) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s). (mdb) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    SO ORDERED - re 107 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/8/2014. (mdb) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal /Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal With Prejudice by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
        DECLARATION re 105 Reply Brief, 100 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California - Reply Declaration of Jason Yu - by VMware Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
          REPLY BRIEF re 100 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by VMware Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
            ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 100 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/17/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
              DECLARATION re 101 Opening Brief in Support, 100 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California - Declaration of Jason Yu - by VMware Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Exhibit F-U)(Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                DECLARATION re 101 Opening Brief in Support, 100 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California - Declaration of Daniel Lin - by VMware Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 101 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                  OPENING BRIEF in Support re 100 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by VMware Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/7/2013. (Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                    MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California - filed by VMware Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Local Rule 7.1.1 Certification, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 99 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER denying as moot 87 Motion to Sever. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/3/12. (mmm) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 97 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                          Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Pending Motions. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nathan Hamstra and Laura L. Norris - filed by Alcatel Lucent USA Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 95 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                              Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Stephen B. Brauerman, Esquire regarding Settlement and Dismissal of Four (4) out of Six (6) Defendants. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Pilar G. Kraman regarding enclosing copy of the recent Federal Circuit Mandamus decision. (Attachments: # 1 Enclosure)(Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 93 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                SO ORDERED, re 92 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/7/2012. (asw) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 92 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
                                    Joint REPLY BRIEF re 87 MOTION to Sever or Dismiss for Improper Joinder Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 20(a)(2) and 21 MOTION to Sever or Dismiss for Improper Joinder Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 20(a)(2) and 21 filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Booker, Gregory) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 90 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 87 MOTION to Sever or Dismiss for Improper Joinder Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 20(a)(2) and 21 MOTION to Sever or Dismiss for Improper Joinder Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 20(a)(2) and 21 filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/9/2012. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by Mosaid Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 87 MOTION to Sever or Dismiss for Improper Joinder Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 20(a)(2) and 21 MOTION to Sever or Dismiss for Improper Joinder Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 20(a)(2) and 21 filed by Adobe Systems Inc., Alcatel Lucent USA Inc., Juniper Networks Inc., Red Hat Inc., VMware Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/29/2012. (Booker, Gregory) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                            MOTION to Sever or Dismiss for Improper Joinder Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 20(a)(2) and 21 - filed by Adobe Systems Inc., Alcatel Lucent USA Inc., Juniper Networks Inc., Red Hat Inc., VMware Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Booker, Gregory) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Elliott, Tara) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Adam Wyatt Poff (Poff, Adam) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                DECLARATION re 83 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing - Declaration of Monte M.F. Cooper - by VMware Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K and L)(Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                  REPLY BRIEF re 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by VMware Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                    DECLARATION re 81 Reply Brief Declaration of Nima Hefazi in Support of Defendant Juniper Networks, Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion To Dismiss Mosaid's First Amended Complaint And To Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Juniper Networks Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through C, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F through J)(Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                      REPLY BRIEF Defendant Juniper Networks, Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Motion To Dismiss Mosaid's First Amended Complaint And To Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Juniper Networks Inc.. (Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                        REPLY BRIEF Defendants' Consolidated Reply Brief in Support of Their Motions to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) (D.I. Nos. 48, 50, 56, 60) filed by Adobe Systems Inc., Alcatel Lucent USA Inc., International Business Machines Corporation, Juniper Networks Inc., Red Hat Inc., VMware Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 78 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Joint STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to File Various Reply Briefs by Adobe Systems Inc., Alcatel Lucent USA Inc., International Business Machines Corporation, Juniper Networks Inc., Mosaid Technologies Inc., Red Hat Inc., VMware Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                              DECLARATION re 76 Answering Brief in Opposition, /Declaration of William Pitts by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/30/2012. (Attachments: # 1 A, # 2 B, # 3 C, # 4 D, # 5 E, # 6 F (Part I), # 7 F (Part II))(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 70 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/17/2012. (asw) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  DECLARATION re 73 Answering Brief in Opposition,, Declaration of Jiri Smetana in Support of Plaintiff's Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendant Juniper Networks' Motion to Dismiss MOSAID's First Amended Complaint and to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mosaid's First Amended Complaint And To Transfer Venue To The Northern District of California Plaintiff's Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendant Juniper Networks' Motion to Dismiss MOSAID's First Amended Complaint and to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/23/2012. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim International Business Machines Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Indirect and Willful Infringement Claims, 48 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mosaid's First Amended Complaint And To Transfer Venue To The Northern District of California, 60 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6) and Motion to Strike, 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike, 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter, 70 MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for MOSAID to file Answering Briefs in Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and for Leave to Extend Page Limits on Omnibus Answering Brief, 39 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint Plaintiff's Consolidated Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/23/2012. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        REPLY BRIEF re 39 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint /PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for MOSAID to file Answering Briefs in Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and for Leave to Extend Page Limits on Omnibus Answering Brief - filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Juniper Networks Inc.. (Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by VMware Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EMC Corporation for VMware Inc... (Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by Adobe Systems Inc., Alcatel Lucent USA Inc., International Business Machines Corporation, Juniper Networks Inc., Red Hat Inc., VMware Inc. re 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to MOSAID's First Amended Complaint (Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 39 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint filed by Adobe Systems Inc., Alcatel Lucent USA Inc., International Business Machines Corporation, Red Hat Inc., VMware Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 39 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint and Motion To Transfer Venue To The Northern District of California filed by Juniper Networks Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      AMENDED DOCUMENT by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. Amendment to 39 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint /Amendment to Rule 7.1.1 Certification of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Alcatel Lucent USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alcatel Lucent for Alcatel Lucent USA Inc... (Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        OPENING BRIEF in Support re 60 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Alcatel Lucent USA Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Alcatel Lucent USA Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Adobe Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              DECLARATION re 57 Opening Brief in Support, 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6) and Motion to Strike by Adobe Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6) and Motion to Strike filed by Adobe Systems Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6) and Motion to Strike - filed by Adobe Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mosaid's First Amended Complaint And To Transfer Venue To The Northern District of California, 54 Opening Brief in Support, Declaration of Archana Bhuta by Juniper Networks Inc.. (Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      OPENING BRIEF in Support re 53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mosaid's First Amended Complaint And To Transfer Venue To The Northern District of California filed by Juniper Networks Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mosaid's First Amended Complaint And To Transfer Venue To The Northern District of California - filed by Juniper Networks Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim International Business Machines Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Indirect and Willful Infringement Claims filed by International Business Machines Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/9/2012. (Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            PROPOSED ORDER regarding International Business Machines Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Indirect and Willful Infringement Claims re 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim International Business Machines Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Indirect and Willful Infringement Claims by International Business Machines Corporation. (Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim International Business Machines Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Indirect and Willful Infringement Claims - filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 48 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Red Hat Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/9/2012. (Booker, Gregory) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Booker, Gregory) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 46 Opening Brief in Support, 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - Declaration of Monte M.F. Cooper - by VMware Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Exhibit E-J)(Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    OPENING BRIEF in Support re 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by VMware Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/9/2012. (Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by VMware Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 43 Opening Brief in Support, 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike - Declaration of Stacey E. Stillman - by VMware Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike filed by VMware Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/9/2012. (Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike - filed by VMware Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to MOSAID's First Amended Complaint - filed by Adobe Systems Inc., Alcatel Lucent USA Inc., International Business Machines Corporation, Juniper Networks Inc., Red Hat Inc., VMware Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 39 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/30/2011. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint - filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Second Amended Complaint), # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Local Rule 7.1.1 Certification, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven G. Hill, Douglas R. Kertscher, Blake H. Frye, and Martha L. Decker of Hill, Kertscher & Wharton, LLP - filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Steven G. Hill, # 2 Cerftification of Douglas R. Kertscher, # 3 Certification of Blake H. Frye, # 4 Certification of Martha L. Decker)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re SO ORDERED, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s),, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s), SO ORDERED, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s),, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s), 16 Amended Complaint, SO ORDERED, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s),, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s), SO ORDERED, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s) for Defendants Adobe Systems, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc., International Business Machines Corp., Juniper Networks, Inc., Red Hat, Inc. and VMare, Inc. to answer First Amended Complaint to December 23, 2011 - filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Booker, Gregory) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathi Kelly Lutton and Shelley K. Mack - filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Booker, Gregory) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew Valentine - filed by Adobe Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certification of Counsel, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher Freeman, James E. Marina and David Rokach of Kirkland & Ellis LLP - filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                            Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Adobe Systems Inc., Alcatel Lucent USA Inc., International Business Machines Corporation, Juniper Networks Inc., Red Hat Inc., VMware Inc.- filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit 1 (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Patent/Trademark Report)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Patent Infringement to November 23, 2011 - filed by Adobe Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Aleine Michelle Porterfield on behalf of Adobe Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Porterfield, Aleine) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Seastone Kraft on behalf of Adobe Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard Birnholz and Jonathan Kagan - filed by Juniper Networks Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Richard Birnholz, # 2 Certification of Jonathan Kagan)(Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer A. Bauer - filed by Alcatel Lucent USA Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to Complaint to November 23, 2011 - filed by Juniper Networks Inc.. (Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Jon T. Hohenthaner by International Business Machines Corporation (Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney I. Neel Chatterjee - filed by VMware Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant VMware, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint to November 23, 2011 - filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc., VMware Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karen G. Johnson-McKewan and Attorney Jason K. Yu - filed by VMware Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Monte M.F. Cooper - filed by VMware Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Amended Complaint to November 23, 2011 - filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Revised Extend time to Answer Complaint to First Amended Complaint by Red Hat Inc.. (Elliott, Tara) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint (D.I. 16) to November 23, 2011 - filed by Red Hat Inc.. (Elliott, Tara) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR ALCATEL-LUCENT USA, INC. TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT to November 23, 2011 - filed by Alcatel Lucent USA Inc., Mosaid Technologies Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mosaid Technologies Inc. as to NetApp Inc. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                            First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Adobe Systems Inc., Alcatel Lucent USA Inc., International Business Machines Corporation, Juniper Networks Inc., Red Hat Inc., VMware Inc.- filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc..(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Juniper Networks, Inc. to Respond to Complaint until October 17, 2011 - filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendants Adobe Systems, Inc.; Net App., Inc.; Red Hat, Inc.; and VMWare, Inc. to Respond to the Complaint until October 17, 2011 - filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth R. Adamo and Attorney Jon T. Hohenthaner - filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR ALCATEL-LUCENT TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT to October 17, 2011 - filed by Alcatel Lucent USA Inc., Mosaid Technologies Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant's Answer to October 17, 2011 - filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. Adobe Systems Inc. served on 8/11/2011, answer due 9/1/2011. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. Alcatel Lucent USA Inc. served on 8/11/2011, answer due 9/1/2011. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. International Business Machines Corporation served on 8/11/2011, answer due 9/1/2011. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. Juniper Networks Inc. served on 8/11/2011, answer due 9/1/2011. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. Netapp Inc. served on 8/11/2011, answer due 9/1/2011. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. Red Hat Inc. served on 8/11/2011, answer due 9/1/2011. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. VMware Inc. served on 8/11/2011, answer due 9/1/2011. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,505,241; 5,892,914;. (els) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Adobe Systems Inc., Alcatel Lucent USA Inc., International Business Machines Corporation, Juniper Networks Inc., Netapp Inc., Red Hat Inc., VMware Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-928915.) - filed by Mosaid Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1, # 2 Exhibit A part 2, # 3 Exhibit A part 3, # 4 Exhibit B part 1, # 5 Exhibit B part 2, # 6 Exhibit B part 3, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 311 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?