HRK Holdings, LLC
Bankruptcy Case Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 8:12-bk-09868
District Judge K. Rodney May, presiding

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HRK Holdings, LLC, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott A. Stichter +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A Hart +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811
No Logo United States Trustee - TPA, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise E Barnett +1 813 228 2303
  Entries (212) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: None
Notice of Filing Amended Exhibit A to Amended Memorandum in Opposition to the Objection of Mayo Fertilizer, Inc. and Allied Universal Corp.'s Joinder in Objection to Motion to Approve Compromise Filed by Robert A. Soriano on behalf of Airport and Hillsborough, LLC, J.T. Reeder Partners, LLLP, Snell Investments, LLC (related document(s)689). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Soriano, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: None
    Amended Memorandum in Opposition to the Objection of Mayo Fertilizer, Inc. and Allied Universal Corp.'s Joinder in Objection to Motion to Approve Compromise Filed by Robert A. Soriano on behalf of Airport and Hillsborough, LLC, J.T. Reeder Partners, LLLP, Snell Investments, LLC (related document(s)657). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Soriano, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
      Order Granting Motion for Authority to Obtain Additional Post-Petition Financing Under the Second DIP Facility from Regions Bank, to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status, and to Extend Maturity Under All DIP Loan Facilities Nunc Pro Tunc (Related Doc # 682). Service Instructions: Barbara Hart is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lidia) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
        Memorandum in Opposition to the Objection of Mayo Fertilizer, Inc. and Allied Universal Corp.'s Joinder in Objection to Motion to Approve Compromise Filed by Robert A. Soriano on behalf of Airport and Hillsborough, LLC, J.T. Reeder Partners, LLLP, Snell Investments, LLC (related document(s)657). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Soriano, Robert) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None
          Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Barbara Hart, Nicole Peair, Rick Malchon, Jonathan Alden, Tom Rydberg. RULING: Emergency Motion to Obtain Post Petition Financing Under the Second DIP Facility from Regions Bank, to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status, and to Extend Maturity Under All DIP Loan Facilities Nunc Pro Tunc filed by the Debtor, doc. #682 - Motion granted as orally amended; order by Hart. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 685 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None
            Notice of Withdrawal of Emergency Motion for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear of Liens at Auction and to Assume and Assign Certain Executory Contracts and Leases to Successful Bidder Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)654). (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
              Joinder Allied Universal Corp.'s Joinder in Limited Objection of Mayo Fertilizer, Inc. to Sale Approval Filed by John J Lamoureux on behalf of Interested Party Allied Universal Corp. (related document(s)683). (Lamoureux, John) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                Limited Objection to Sale Approval Filed by John D Emmanuel on behalf of Creditor Mayo Ferlitizer, Inc. (Emmanuel, John). Related document(s) 669. Modified on 10/1/2014 (Laura). (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None
                  Emergency Motion for Authority to Obtain Additional Post-Petition Financing Under the Second DIP Facility from Regions Bank, to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status, and to Extend Maturity Under All DIP Loan Facilities Nunc Pro Tunc and Notice of Hearing on October 2, 2014 at 1:45 p.m. Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                    Financial Reports for the Period August 1, 2014 to August 31, 2014. Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
                      Notice of Change of Address of Creditors Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
                        Notice of Hearing on Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement. Related Case and Parties: 8:12-ap-826. Between HRK Holdings, LLC and J.T. Reeder Partners, LLLP, Snell Investments, LLC, and Airport and Hillsborough, LLC Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)657). Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2014 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                          Financial Reports for the Period August 1, 2013 to August 31, 2013. Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                            Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Scott Stichter, Denise Barnett, Brad Staggs, Robert Soriano, Rick Malchon, Tom Rydberg, Jonathan Alden, and Rusty Graf. RULING: 1 - Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens filed by the Debtor, doc. #349 - Response to and Limited Objection Filed by Richard H Malchon Jr. on behalf of Creditor Regions Bank, Doc #402 - Response to and Limited Objection to Debtors Motion for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear of Liens at Auction Filed by Richard H Malchon Jr. on behalf of Creditor Regions Bank, Doc #404 - Response to Debtors' Expedited Motions for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interests and Encumbrances Filed by Robert A. Soriano on behalf of Airport and Hillsborough, LLC, J.T. Reeder Partners, LLLP, Snell Investments, LLC (related document(s)368, 365, 349), Doc. #401 - Objection to Motions to Sell Real Property Filed by Ryan C Phillips on behalf of Creditor Ardaman & Associates (Related Document(s) #349, 365, 368), Doc #410 - Objection to Motions for Authority to Sell Real Property Filed by Jonathan H Alden on behalf of Creditor Florida Department of Environmental Protection (related document(s)368, 365, 349), Doc #411 - Granted as stated on the record; order by Stichter. 2 - Cont'd Hearing on Expedited Motion for Authority to Obtain Additional Post-Petition Financing from Regions Bank, N.A., on an interim and Final Basis to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status, Filed by Barbara Hart on behalf of the Debtor, Doc. #377 3 - Fourth Motion for Authority to Obtain Post-Petition Financing From Regions Bank, N.A., to Establish a Line of Credit for Long Term Care Issues and to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status Filed by the Debtor, doc. #436 - Items 2 and 3 - Cont'd to 9/26/2013 at 11:00 am; Announced in open court; no further notice given. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                              Order Granting Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement and Solicit Acceptances of their Plan. (Related Doc # 440). Service Instructions: Barbara Hart is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Laura G.) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                Notice of Rescheduled Hearing on Certain Matters Related to the Sale of the Mayo Parcel and the ISCO Parcel (other pending matters will go forward on September 19, 2013 as set forth herein) Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)396, 269, 420, 406, 428, 368, 456, 365, 308, 403, 257, 448, 443, 449, 309, 429). Hearing scheduled for 9/26/2013 at 11:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                  Notice of Rescheduled Hearings On Sale Motions and Other Matters from 9/12/13 at 1:30 p.m. to 9/19/2013 at 10:30 a.m. Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)428, 368, 440, 365, 257, 436, 349, 448, 443, 377, 449, 429). Hearing scheduled for 9/19/2013 at 10:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Hart, Barbara) Modified on 9/12/2013 (Laura G.). (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                    Certificate of Service Re: Final Order Granting Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Obtain Additional Post-Petition Financing from Regions Bank, N.A., on an Interim and Final Basis, to Grant Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status. Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)455). (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                      Objection to Debtor's Motion to Assume Lease Agreement Filed by Noel R Boeke on behalf of Creditor International Salt Company, LLC (related document(s)448). (Boeke, Noel) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                        Final Order Granting Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Obtain Additional Post-Petition Financing from Regions Bank, N.A., on an Interim and Final Basis to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status (related document(s)377). Service Instructions: Barbara Hart is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Laura G.) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 446)). Notice Date 09/05/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Hearing on Debtors' Expedited Motion to Assume Lease Agreements with International Salt Company, LLC and Ramm Transport, Inc., and to Assign Such Leases to Allied Universal Corporation in Connection with Sale of Real Property. Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)448, 449). Hearing scheduled for 9/12/2013 at 01:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Hart, Barbara) Modified on 9/6/2013 (Laura G.). (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                              Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Barbara Hart, Denise Barnett, Rick Malchon, Jim Dixen, John Lamoureux, Noel Boeke, Scott Underwood, Brad Staggs, Robert Soriano, Marsha Reinberg, Jonathan Alden and Doryk Graf. RULING: 1 - Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens filed by the Debtor, doc. #349 - Response to and Limited Objection to Debtors Motion for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear to Thatcher Chemical Filed by Richard H Malchon Jr. on behalf of Creditor Regions Bank, Doc #402 2 - Motion for Adequate Protection and Assurance of Performance as to HRK Holdings, LLC Filed by John D Emmanuel on behalf of Creditor Mayo Ferlitizer, Inc., doc. #257 and Response by Debtor, Doc #269 - Brief in Support of Its Motion For Adequate Protection and Assurance of Performance as to HRK Holdings, LLC Filed by John D Emmanuel, doc. #308 - Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion for Adequate Protection and Assurance of Performance Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor, doc. #309 3 - Cont'd Hearing on Expedited Motion for Authority to Obtain Additional Post-Petition Financing from Regions Bank, N.A., on an interim and Final Basis to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status, Filed by Barbara Hart on behalf of the Debtor, Doc. #377 4 - Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens to Kinder Morgan Port Manatee Terminal, LLC an to Assume and Assign Certain Executory Contracts and Leases by the Debtor, doc. #365 - Response to and Limited Objection to Debtors Motion for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear to Kinder Morgan Filed by Richard H Malchon Jr. on behalf of Creditor Regions Bank, Doc #403 - Objection to Debtor's Proposed Sale of Mayo Parcel to Kinder Morgan, Including Proposed Adequate Assurance and Proposed Cure Filed by John D Emmanuel on behalf of Creditor Mayo Ferlitizer, Inc. (related document(s)365), Doc #406 5 - Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens at Auction and to Assume and Assign Certain Executory Contracts and Leases to Successful Bidder by the Debtor, doc. #368 - Limited Objection filed by Noel R Boeke on behalf of Creditor International Salt Company, LLC, doc. #396 - Response to and Limited Objection to Debtors Motoin for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear of Liens at Auction Filed by Richard H Malchon Jr. on behalf of Creditor Regions Bank, Doc #404 - Response to Debtors' Expedited Motions for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interests and Encumbrances Filed by Robert A. Soriano on behalf of Airport and Hillsborough, LLC, J.T. Reeder Partners, LLLP, Snell Investments, LLC (related document(s)368, 365, 349), Doc. #401 - Objection to Motions to Sell Real Property Filed by Ryan C Phillips on behalf of Creditor Ardaman & Associates (Related Document(s) #349, 365, 368), Doc #410 - Objection to Motions for Authority to Sell Real Property Filed by Jonathan H Alden on behalf of Creditor Florida Department of Environmental Protection (related document(s)368, 365, 349), Doc #411 6 - Expedited Motion to Assume and Assign Executory Contracts to Kinder Morgan Port Manatee Terminal, LLC in Connection With Sale of Real Property Filed by the Debtor, Doc #419, and Objection filed by John Emmanuel on behalf of Mayo Fertilizer, doc. #420 7 - Motion for Authority to Sell Additional Real Property Free and Clear of Liens in Connection With Sale of Mayo Parcel and Adjacent Parcel Filed by the Debtor, doc. #428 8 - Motion for Authority to Sell Additional Real Property Free and Clear of Liens in Connection With Sale of ISCo Parcel Filed by the Debtor, doc. #429 9 - Fourth Motion for Authority to Obtain Post-Petition Financing From Regions Bank, N.A., to Establish a Line of Credit for Long Term Care Issues and to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status Filed by the Debtor, doc. #436 ~10 - Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement and Solicit Acceptances of their Plan Filed by the Debtor, doc. #440 ~11 - Emergency Motion for Authority to Obtain Additional Financing to Second Debtor in Possession Financing Facility and to Extend the Maturity of All Lines of Credit Established Under the Second Financing Orders by the Debtor, doc. #443 - Items, 1,2,4,5,7,8,9 and 11 - Continued to 9/12/2013 at 1:30 p.m.; Announced in open court; no further notice given. Item 3 - Granted. Order by Hart. Item 6 - Withdrawn in Open Court. Item 10 - Granted. Order by Hart. *Note: Doc No.'s 448 and 449 to be heard on 9/12/2013 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel will notice. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Chap, Dkt) Modified on 9/6/2013 (Ariana). (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                Notice of Filing Proposed Amended Four Month Budget and Proposed Amended Six Month Budget Pursuant to Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Obtain Additional Post-Petition Financing from Regions Bank, N.A., on an Interim and Final Basis to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)377). (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Notice of Filing Amended Schedule of Contracts and Cure Costs (ISCO Parcel) Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)382). (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                    Motion to Shorten Time and Schedule Hearing on Motion to Assume Lease Agreements with International Salt Company, LLC and Ramm Transport, Inc. and to Assign Such Leases to Allied Universal Corporation in Connection with Sale of Real Property Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                      Expedited Motion to Assume Unexpired Non-Residential Real Property Lease and Assign Such Leases to Allied Universal Corporation in Connection with Sale of Real Property Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Financial Reports for the Period July 1, 2013 to July 31, 2013. Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript to be filed within 7 calendar days of the date of service of this notice, but an additional three days may be added if the notice is served by U.S. Mail (related document(s)445). (Laura G.) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 9/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                            Transcript Regarding Hearing Held 7-10-13 on Calendar Items as listed in Hearing Proceeding Memo at Doc. #407. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Johnson Transcription Service: 813-920-1466 . Transcript access will be restricted through 12/2/2013. (Johnson Transcription Service) (Entered: 09/01/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                              Certificate of Necessity of Request for Emergency Hearing Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)443). (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Emergency Application/Motion for Authority to Obtain Postpetition Financing Pursuant to Second Debtor in Possession Financing Facility and to Extend the Maturity of All Lines of Credit Established Under the Second Financing Orders. Hearing will be held 9/4/2013 at 1:30 PM. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)135, 305, 73, 286, 163, 389, 181, 436, 44, 377, 214). (Stichter, Scott) Modified on 9/3/2013 (Laura G.). (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Notice of Hearing on Debtors' Motion for Further Extension of Exclusivity and Time to File Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement and Solicit Acceptances of Their Plan Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)440). Hearing scheduled for 9/4/2013 at 01:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Certificate of Service Re: Orders on Debtors' Motions to Shorten Time and Schedule Hearing on Motions for Authority to Sell Additional Real Property Free and Clear in Connection with Sale Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)438, 439). (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement and Solicit Acceptances of their Plan Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time (Related Doc # 432) and Schedule Hearing on Motion for Authority to Sell Additional Real Property Free and Clear of Liens in Connection With Sale of ISCO Parcel. Hearing scheduled 9/04/2013 at 1:30 PM. Service Instructions: Scott Stichter is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Laura G.) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time (Related Doc # 431) and Schedule Hearing on Motion for Authority to Sell Additional Real Property Free and Clear in Connection With Sale of Mayo Parcel and Adjacent Parcel. Hearing scheduled 9/04/2013 at 1:30 PM. Service Instructions: Scott Stichter is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Laura G.) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Notice of Hearing on Fourth Application/Motion for Authority to Obtain Post-Petition Financing From Regions Bank, N.A., to Establish a Line of Credit for Long Term Care Issues and to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)436). Hearing scheduled for 9/4/2013 at 01:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Stichter, Scott) Modified on 8/21/2013 (Laura G.). (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Fourth Application/Motion for Authority to Obtain Post-Petition Financing From Regions Bank, N.A., to Establish a Line of Credit for Long Term Care Issues and to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)163, 44, 377). (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Certificate of Service Re: Amended Final Order Granting Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Obtain Additional Post-Petition Financing from Regions Bank, to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)434). (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Final Amended Order Granting Emergency Motion for Authority to Obtain Additional Post-Petition Financing from Regions Bank, To Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status (Revised to Correct Legal Description Only) (related document(s)305, 286). Service Instructions: Scott Stichter is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Laura G.) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Denise Barnett, Scott Stichter with Barbara Hart, JOhn Emmanuel Rick Malchon, JKhn Lamoureux, Brad Staggs, Noel Boeke, Rusty Graf and Jonathan Alden. RULING: 1 - Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens filed by the Debtor, doc. #349 - Response to and Limited Objection to Debtors Motion for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear to Thatcher Chemical Filed by Richard H Malchon Jr. on behalf of Creditor Regions Bank, Doc #402 2 - Motion for Adequate Protection and Assurance of Performance as to HRK Holdings, LLC Filed by John D Emmanuel on behalf of Creditor Mayo Ferlitizer, Inc., doc. #257 and Response by Debtor, Doc #269 - Brief in Support of Its Motion For Adequate Protection and Assurance of Performance as to HRK Holdings, LLC Filed by John D Emmanuel, doc. #308 - Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion for Adequate Protection and Assurance of Performance Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor, doc. #309 ~3 - Cont'd Hearing on Expedited Motion for Authority to Obtain Additional Post-Petition Financing from Regions Bank, N.A., on an interim and Final Basis to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status, Filed by Barbara Hart on behalf of the Debtor, Doc. #377 4 - Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens to Kinder Morgan Port Manatee Terminal, LLC an to Assume and Assign Certain Executory Contracts and Leases by the Debtor, doc. #365 - Response to and Limited Objection to Debtors Motion for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear to Kinder Morgan Filed by Richard H Malchon Jr. on behalf of Creditor Regions Bank, Doc #403 - Objection to Debtor's Proposed Sale of Mayo Parcel to Kinder Morgan, Including Proposed Adequate Assurance and Proposed Cure Filed by John D Emmanuel on behalf of Creditor Mayo Ferlitizer, Inc. (related document(s)365), Doc #406 5 - Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens at Auction and to Assume and Assign Certain Executory Contracts and Leases to Successful Bidder by the Debtor, doc. #368 - Limited Objection filed by Noel R Boeke on behalf of Creditor International Salt Company, LLC, doc. #396 - Response to and Limited Objection to Debtors Motoin for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear of Liens at Auction Filed by Richard H Malchon Jr. on behalf of Creditor Regions Bank, Doc #404 - Response to Debtors' Expedited Motions for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interests and Encumbrances Filed by Robert A. Soriano on behalf of Airport and Hillsborough, LLC, J.T. Reeder Partners, LLLP, Snell Investments, LLC (related document(s)368, 365, 349), Doc. #401 - Objection to Motions to Sell Real Property Filed by Ryan C Phillips on behalf of Creditor Ardaman & Associates (Related Document(s) #349, 365, 368), Doc #410 - Objection to Motions for Authority to Sell Real Property Filed by Jonathan H Alden on behalf of Creditor Florida Department of Environmental Protection (related document(s)368, 365, 349), Doc #411 6 - Expedited Motion to Assume and Assign Executory Contracts to Kinder Morgan Port Manatee Terminal, LLC in Connection With Sale of Real Property Filed by the Debtor, Doc #419, and Objection filed by John Emmanuel on behalf of Mayo Fertilizer, doc. #420 7 - Motion for Authority to Sell Additional Real Property Free and Clear of Liens in Connection With Sale of Mayo Parcel and Adjacent Parcel Filed by the Debtor, doc. #428 8 - Motion for Authority to Sell Additional Real Property Free and Clear of Liens in Connection With Sale of ISCo Parcel Filed by the Debtor, doc. #429 9 - Motion to Shorten Time and Schedule Hearing on Motion for Authority to Sell Additional Real Property Free and Clear in Connection With Sale of Mayo Parcel and Adjacent Parcel Filed by the Debtor, doc. #431 - Granted; order by Stichter. 10 - Motion to Shorten Time and Schedule Hearing on Motion for Authority to Sell Additional Real Property Free and Clear of Liens in Connection With Sale of ISCo Parcel Filed by the Debtor, doc. #432 - Granted; order by Stichter. Items 1 through 8 - Cont'd to 9/4/2013 at 1:30 pm; Announced in open court; no further notice given. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      Motion to Shorten Time and Schedule Hearing on Motion for Authority to Sell Additional Real Property Free and Clear of Liens in Connection With Sale of ISCo Parcel Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)368, 429). (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Motion to Shorten Time and Schedule Hearing on Motion for Authority to Sell Additional Real Property Free and Clear in Connection With Sale of Mayo Parcel and Adjacent Parcel Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)428, 365). (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          Certificate of Service Re: Orders Approving Second Fee Applications Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)425, 426, 423, 424). (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            Application/Motion for Authority to Sell Additional Real Property Free and Clear of Liens in Connection With Sale of ISCo Parcel, Hearing Scheduled for 8/9/2013 at 9:30 AM. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)368). (Stichter, Scott) Modified on 8/7/2013 (Laura G.). (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Application/Motion for Authority to Sell Additional Real Property Free and Clear of Liens in Connection With Sale of Mayo Parcel and Adjacent Parcel, Hearing Scheduled for 8/9/2013 at 9:30 AM. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)365). (Stichter, Scott) Modified on 8/7/2013 (Laura G.). (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice as Additional Counsel Filed by Marsha G Rydberg on behalf of Creditor Snell Investments, LLC. (Rydberg, Marsha) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc # 393). Fees awarded to James W. Martin, P.A. in the amount of $70810.72, expenses awarded: $250.32 Barbara Hart is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc # 392). Fees awarded to William D. Preston, P.A. in the amount of $87752.04, expenses awarded: $92.04 Barbara Hart is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc # 391). Fees awarded to Gulf Atlantic Capital Corporation in the amount of $224268.00, expenses awarded: $0.00 Barbara Hart is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc # 390). Fees awarded to Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, P.A. in the amount of $261706.50, expenses awarded: $9000.47 Barbara Hart is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Denise Barnett, Barbara Hart and Scott Stichter, Rob Soriano, John Lamoreaux, John Emmanuel, Brad Staggs, Jonathan Alden, Rick Malchon, Noel Boeke, Patti Prewitt, RULING: 1 - Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens filed by the Debtor, doc. #349 - Response to and Limited Objection to Debtors Motion for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear to Thatcher Chemical Filed by Richard H Malchon Jr. on behalf of Creditor Regions Bank, Doc #402 2 - Motion for Adequate Protection and Assurance of Performance as to HRK Holdings, LLC Filed by John D Emmanuel on behalf of Creditor Mayo Ferlitizer, Inc., doc. #257 and Response by Debtor, Doc #269 - Brief in Support of Its Motion For Adequate Protection and Assurance of Performance as to HRK Holdings, LLC Filed by John D Emmanuel, doc. #308 - Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion for Adequate Protection and Assurance of Performance Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor, doc. #309 ~3 - Cont'd Hearing on Expedited Motion for Authority to Obtain Additional Post-Petition Financing from Regions Bank, N.A., on an interim and Final Basis to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status, Filed by Barbara Hart on behalf of the Debtor, Doc. #377 4 - Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens to Kinder Morgan Port Manatee Terminal, LLC an to Assume and Assign Certain Executory Contracts and Leases by the Debtor, doc. #365 - Response to and Limited Objection to Debtors Motion for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear to Kinder Morgan Filed by Richard H Malchon Jr. on behalf of Creditor Regions Bank, Doc #403 - Objection to Debtor's Proposed Sale of Mayo Parcel to Kinder Morgan, Including Proposed Adequate Assurance and Proposed Cure Filed by John D Emmanuel on behalf of Creditor Mayo Ferlitizer, Inc. (related document(s)365), Doc #406 5 - Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens at Auction and to Assume and Assign Certain Executory Contracts and Leases to Successful Bidder by the Debtor, doc. #368 - Limited Objection filed by Noel R Boeke on behalf of Creditor International Salt Company, LLC, doc. #396 - Response to and Limited Objection to Debtors Motoin for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear of Liens at Auction Filed by Richard H Malchon Jr. on behalf of Creditor Regions Bank, Doc #404 - Response to Debtors' Expedited Motions for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interests and Encumbrances Filed by Robert A. Soriano on behalf of Airport and Hillsborough, LLC, J.T. Reeder Partners, LLLP, Snell Investments, LLC (related document(s)368, 365, 349), Doc. #401 - Objection to Motions to Sell Real Property Filed by Ryan C Phillips on behalf of Creditor Ardaman & Associates (Related Document(s) #349, 365, 368), Doc #410 - Objection to Motions for Authority to Sell Real Property Filed by Jonathan H Alden on behalf of Creditor Florida Department of Environmental Protection (related document(s)368, 365, 349), Doc #411 6 - Expedited Motion to Assume and Assign Executory Contracts to Kinder Morgan Port Manatee Terminal, LLC in Connection With Sale of Real Property Filed by the Debtor, Doc #419, and Objection filed by John Emmanuel on behalf of Mayo Fertilizer, doc. #420 All items continued to 8/9/2013 at 9:30 am; Announced in open court; no further notice given. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Notice of Hearing on Debtors' Expedited Motion to Assume Executory Contracts and Assign Such Executory Contracts to Kinder Morgan Port Manatee Terminal, LLC in Connection with Sale of Real Property Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)419). Hearing scheduled for 7/30/2013 at 03:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Objection to Debtor's Expedited Motion To Assume Executory Contracts And Assign Such Executory Contracts To Kinder Morgan Port Manatee Terminal, LLC in Connection With Sale of Real Property Filed by John D Emmanuel on behalf of Creditor Mayo Ferlitizer, Inc. (related document(s)419). (Emmanuel, John) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Expedited Motion to Assume and Assign Executory Contracts to Kinder Morgan Port Manatee Terminal, LLC in Connection With Sale of Real Property Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service Re: Order Granting Debtors' Motion for Further Extension of Exclusivity and Time to File Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement and to Solicit Acceptances of Their Plan Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)413). (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Financial Reports for the Period June 1, 2013 to June 30, 2013. Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing Notice of Proposed Sale or Other Disposition of Certain of the Assets of the Debtors and of Deadline and Procedures for Submission of Competing Bids (Mayo Parcel) Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing Notice of Proposed Sale or Other Disposition of Certain of the Assets of the Debtors and of Deadline and Procedures for Submission of Competing Bids (Thatchter Parcel) Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing Notice of Proposed Sale or Other Disposition of Certain of the Assets of the Debtors and of Deadline and Procedures for Submission of Competing Bids Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement Through August 30, 2013 (Related Doc # 376). Barbara Hart is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Joinder Filed by Benjamin G. Martin on behalf of Creditor Spectrum Underground, Inc. (related document(s)409). (Martin, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Objection to Motions for Authority to Sell Real Property Filed by Jonathan H Alden on behalf of Creditor Florida Department of Environmental Protection (related document(s)368, 365, 349). (Alden, Jonathan) Modified on 7/22/2013 (Ryan). (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Objection to Motions to Sell Real Property Filed by Ryan C Phillips on behalf of Creditor Ardaman & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Response and Objection to Debtors' Motion) (Related Document(s) #349, 365, 368) (Phillips, Ryan) (See the "Corrective Action Taken" entry dated 07/22/2013.) Modified on 07/22/2013 (Ryan). Modified on 7/22/2013 (Ryan). (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Statement of Position and Reservation of Rights of Xylem Regarding Debtors Motions for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear of Claims and Interests Filed by Jason C. Sampson on behalf of Creditor Xylem Dewatering Solutions, Inc., a New Jersey corporation, d/b/a Godwin Pumps of America (related document(s)368, 365, 349). (Sampson, Jason) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Amended Certificate of Service Re: Objection of Mayo Fertilizer, Inc. to Debtor's Proposed Sale of Mayo Parcel To Kinder Morgan, Including Proposed Adequate Assurance and Proposed Cure Filed by John D Emmanuel on behalf of Creditor Mayo Ferlitizer, Inc. (related document(s)406). (Emmanuel, John) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Barbara Hart, Robert Soriano and John Quinlan, Denise Barnett, Rick Malcon, Rusty Graf and Mr. Watts. CORRECTED/REVISED RULING (As to Item 2 only): 1 - Motion to Reject Easement and Agreement With James T. Reeder, Marvis R. Snell, and Graham R. Reeder, Trustee Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC, Doc #147, and Response by Airport and Hillsborough, LLC, J.T. Reeder Partners, LLP, Snell Investments, LLC, doc. #169 (cont'd from 9/18/2012, 10/9/2012, 12/10/2012, 3/6/2013 and 3/19/2013) - Cont'd to 10/24/2013 at 3:00 pm; Announced in open court; no further notice given. 2 - Motion for Adequate Protection and Assurance of Performance as to HRK Holdings, LLC Filed by John D Emmanuel on behalf of Creditor Mayo Ferlitizer, Inc., doc. #257 and Response by Debtor, Doc #269 - Cont'd to 7/30/2013 at 3:00 pm; Announced in open court; no further notice given. 3 - Motion to Extend Time Further Extension of Exclusivity and Time to File Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement and Solicit Acceptances of Their Plan Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC, Doc #376 - Granted; order by Hart. RULING: Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Objection to Debtor's Proposed Sale of Mayo Parcel to Kinder Morgan, Including Proposed Adequate Assurance and Proposed Cure Filed by John D Emmanuel on behalf of Creditor Mayo Ferlitizer, Inc. (related document(s)365). (Emmanuel, John) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Barbara Hart, Robert Soriano and John Quinlan, Denise Barnett, Rick Malcon, Rusty Graf and Mr. Watts. RULING: 1 - Motion to Reject Easement and Agreement With James T. Reeder, Marvis R. Snell, and Graham R. Reeder, Trustee Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC, Doc #147, and Response by Airport and Hillsborough, LLC, J.T. Reeder Partners, LLP, Snell Investments, LLC, doc. #169 (cont'd from 9/18/2012, 10/9/2012, 12/10/2012, 3/6/2013 and 3/19/2013) - Cont'd to 10/24/2013 at 3:00 pm; Announced in open court; no further notice given. 2 - Motion for Adequate Protection and Assurance of Performance as to HRK Holdings, LLC Filed by John D Emmanuel on behalf of Creditor Mayo Ferlitizer, Inc., doc. #257 and Response by Debtor, Doc #269 - Cont'd to 10/24/2013 at 3:00 pm; Announced in open court; no further notice given. 3 - Motion to Extend Time Further Extension of Exclusivity and Time to File Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement and Solicit Acceptances of Their Plan Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC, Doc #376 - Granted; order by Hart. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Response to and Limited Objection to Debtors Motoin for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear of Liens at Auction Filed by Richard H Malchon Jr. on behalf of Creditor Regions Bank (related document(s)368). (Malchon, Richard) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Response to and Limited Objection to Debtors Motion for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear to Kinder Morgan Filed by Richard H Malchon Jr. on behalf of Creditor Regions Bank (related document(s)365). (Malchon, Richard) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Response to and Limited Objection to Debtors Motion for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear to Thatcher Chemical Filed by Richard H Malchon Jr. on behalf of Creditor Regions Bank (related document(s)349). (Malchon, Richard) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Response to Debtors' Expedited Motions for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interests and Encumbrances Filed by Robert A. Soriano on behalf of Airport and Hillsborough, LLC, J.T. Reeder Partners, LLLP, Snell Investments, LLC (related document(s)368, 365, 349). (Soriano, Robert) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service Re: Interim Order Granting Debtors' Emergency Motion for authority to Obtain Additional Post-Petition Financing from Regions Bank, N.A. on an interim and Final Basis, to Grant Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)389). (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing (related document(s) (Related Doc # 395)). Notice Date 07/10/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing (related document(s) (Related Doc # 394)). Notice Date 07/10/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Withdrawal of Stipulation and Debtors' Motion to Approve HRK Holdings, LLC's Stipulation to Secured Claim of Ardaman & Associates, Inc. and to Confirm Further Litigation in the Manatee County Action is Subject to the Automatic Stay Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)361). (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Limited Objection to Debtor's Motion for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear of Liens at Auction and to Assume and Assign Certain Executory Contracts and Leases to Successful Bidder (ISCO Parcel) Filed by Noel R Boeke on behalf of Creditor International Salt Company, LLC (related document(s)368). (Boeke, Noel) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing on Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens at Auction (related document(s)368). Hearing scheduled for 7/30/2013 at 03:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Ryan) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Hearing on Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens (related document(s)365). Hearing scheduled for 7/30/2013 at 03:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Ryan) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Second Application for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for James W. Martin, P.A., Special Counsel, Fee: $70,810.72, Expenses: $250.32. For the period: October 16, 2012 through May 31, 2013 Contains negative notice. Filed by Spec. Counsel James W. Martin, P.A. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Second Application for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for William D. Preston, P.A., Special Counsel, Fee: $87,752.04, Expenses: $92.04. For the period: October 26, 2012 through May 31, 2013 Contains negative notice. Filed by Spec. Counsel William D. Preston, P.A. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Second Application for Compensation for Gulf Atlantic Capital Corporation, Financial Advisor, Fee: $224,268.00, Expenses: $0.00. For the period: January 1, 2013 through May 31, 2013 Contains negative notice. Filed by Financial Advisor Gulf Atlantic Capital Corporation (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Second Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, P.A., Debtor's Attorney, Fee: $261,706.50, Expenses: $9,000.47. For the period: October 16, 2012 through May 31, 2013 Contains negative notice. Filed by Attorney Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, P.A. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Interim Order Granting Application for Authority to Obtain Additional Post-Petition Financing from Regions Bank, N.A., on an Interim and Final Basis to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status (Related Doc 377). Barbara Hart is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service Re: Orders on Bid Procedures and related documents Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)382, 380, 381). (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Scott Stichter, Rick Malchon and Denise Barnett. RULING: Expedited Motion for Authority to Obtain Additional Post-Petition Financing from Regions Bank, N.A., on an interim and Final Basis to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status, Filed by Barbara Hart on behalf of the debtor, Doc. #377 - Granted on a further interim basis; cont'd hearing set for 7/30/2013 at 3:00 pm; order by Stichter. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing (related document(s) (Related Doc # 379)). Notice Date 06/26/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing Schedule of Contracts and Cure Costs (Thatcher Parcel) Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing Schedule of Contracts and Cure Costs (Mayo Parcel) Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing Schedule of Contracts and Cure Costs (ISCO Parcel) Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Motion for Approval of (A) Approving Bidding Procedures for the Sale of Parcel of Real Property, (B) Approving Bidding Protections, (C) Scheduling a Final Sale Hearing and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof, and (D) Granting Related Relief (ISCO Parcel) Sale Hearing Set for July 30, 2013 at 3:00 PM (Related Doc # 366). Barbara Hart is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Motion for Approval of (A) Approving Bidding Procedures for the Sale of Parcel of Real Property, (B) Approving Bidding Protections, (C) Scheduling a Final Sale Hearing and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof, and (D) Granting Related Relief (Mayo Parcel) Sale Hearing Set for July 30, 2013 at 3:00 PM (Related Doc # 363). Barbara Hart is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Motion for Approval of (A) Approving Bidding Procedures for the Sale of Parcel of Real Property, (B) Approving Bidding Protections, (C) Scheduling a Final Sale Hearing and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof, and (D) Granting Related Relief (Thatcher Parcel) Sale Hearing Set for July 30, 2013 at 3:00 PM (Related Doc 348). Barbara Hart is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing on Motion to Extend Time Further Extension of Exclusivity and Time to File Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement and Solicit Acceptances of The Plan (related document(s)376). Hearing scheduled for 7/10/2013 at 03:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Ryan) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Necessity for Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Obtain Additional Post-Petition Financing from Regions Bank, N.A., on an Interim and Final Basis to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status and Notice of Hearing on June 27, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)377). (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Emergency Application/Motion for Authority to Obtain Additional Post-Petition Financing from Regions Bank, N.A., on an Interim and Final Basis to Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status and Notice of Hearing on June 27, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Extend Time Further Extension of Exclusivity and Time to File Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement and Solicit Acceptances of Their Plan Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service Re: Order Granting Debtors' Motion for Further Extension of Exclusivity and Time to File Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement and to Solicit Acceptances of Their Plan Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)371). (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Financial Reports for the Period May 1, 2013 to May 31, 2013. Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing (related document(s) (Related Doc # 362)). Notice Date 06/20/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Barbara Hart, Denise Barnett, Rick Malchon, John Emmanuel, Adam Lawton Alpert, Rusty Graf, John Lamoureux, Robert Soriano and Patty Prewitt. RULING: 1 - Cont'd Hearing on Emergency Motion for Approval of Bidding Procedures, of Form of Notice, and Setting Hearing Date and Objection Deadline Filed by the Debtor, doc. #348 - Granted as revised on the record in open court; order by Hart. 2 - Emergency Motion for Approval (I) Bidding Procedures Related to the Solicitation of Offers for Sale of Real Property to Kinder Morgan Port Manatee Terminal, LLC Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 363 Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances, (II) Approving Form of Notice and (III) Setting Hearing Date and Objection Deadline by the Debtor, doc. #363 - Granted as revised on the record in open court; order by Hart. 3 - Emergency Motion for Approval of (I) Bidding Procedures Related to the Solicitation of Offers for Sale of Real Property Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 363 Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances, (II) Approving Form of Notice and (III) Setting Hearing Date and Objection Deadline by the Debtor, doc. #366 - Granted as revised on the record in open court; order by Hart. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion to Extend Time of Exclusivity and time to File Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement and Solicit Acceptances of Their Plan (Related Doc # 343). Attorney Scott A. Stichter is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Certificate of Service Re: Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)368, 363, 369, 366, 365). (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing Proposed Form of Order Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)366). (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens at Auction and to Assume and Assign Certain Executory Contracts and Leases to Successful Bidder. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B Part 1 # 3 Exhibit B Part 2) (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Necessity Debtors' Emergency Motion for Order (I) Approving Bidding Procedures Related to the Solicitation of Offers for Sale of Real Property Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 363 Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances, (II) Approving Form of Notice and (III) Setting Hearing Date and Objection Deadline Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)366). (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Emergency Motion for Approval of (I) Bidding Procedures Related to the Solicitation of Offers for Sale of Real Property Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 363 Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances, (II) Approving Form of Notice and (III) Setting Hearing Date and Objection to Deadline with Notice of Emergency Hearing on June 20, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens to Kinder Morgan Port Manatee Terminal, LLC an to Assume and Assign Certain Executory Contracts and Leases. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - APA Part 1 # 2 Exhibit A - APA Part 2 # 3 APA - Exhibit A # 4 APA Exb B # 5 APA Exb C # 6 APA Exb D # 7 APA Exb E # 8 APA Exb F # 9 APA Exb G # 10 APA Exb H # 11 APA Exb I # 12 APA Exb J) (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Necessity for Debtors' Emergency Motion for Order (I) Approving Bidding Procedures Related to the Solicitation of Offers for Sale of Real Property to Kinder Morgan Port Manatee Terminal, LLC Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 363 Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and encumbrances, (II) Approving Form of Notice and (III) Setting Hearing Date and Objection Deadline Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)363). (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Emergency Motion for Approval (I) Bidding Procedures Related to the Solicitation of Offers for Sale of Real Property to Kinder Morgan Port Manatee Terminal, LLC Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 363 Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances, (II) Approving Form of Notice and (III) Setting Hearing Date and Objection Deadline with Notice of Emergency Hearing on June 20, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Hearing on Motion to Approve HRK Holdings, LLC's Stipulation to Secured Claim of Ardaman & Associates, Inc. and to Confirm Further Litigation in the Manatee County Action is Subject to the Automatic Stay (related document(s)361). Hearing scheduled for 7/11/2013 at 02:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Ryan) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Approve HRK Holdings, LLC's Stipulation to Secured Claim of Ardaman & Associates, Inc. and to Confirm Further Litigation in the Manatee County Action is Subject to the Automatic Stay Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Scott Stichter, Denise Barnett, Jonathan Alden, Rich Malchon, Robert Soriano, John Lamoureux, Rusty Graff, Dana Watts, Brad Staggs, Patty Prewitt. RULING: Emergency Motion for Approval of Bidding Procedures, of Form of Notice, and Setting Hearing Date and Objection Deadline Filed by the Debtor, doc. #348 - Granted as outlined; order by Stichter (blackline and redline versions to be submitted). Hearing set for 6/20/2013 at 9:00 am if additional court time needed for this or other Emergency Bid Procedures Motions that may be filled. Hearing to approve sale(s) set for 7/30/2013 at 3:00 pm Notes - Hearing set for 6/27/2013 at 1:30 pm cancelled; notice by Stichter. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Patricia Willams Prewitt for Kinder Morgan Port Manatee Terminal LLC and Designation of Mechanik Nuccio Hearne & Wester, P.A., as Local Counsel Filed by Alfred A Colby on behalf of unknown Kinder Morgan Port Manatee Terminal LLC. (Colby, Alfred) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing (related document(s) (Related Doc # 356)). Notice Date 06/06/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing (related document(s) (Related Doc # 354)). Notice Date 06/05/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Regarding Motion to Reject Easement and Agreement With James T. Reeder, Marvis R. Snell, and Graham R. Reeder and Motion for Adequate Protection and Assurance of Performance as to HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)147, 257). Hearing scheduled for 7/10/2013 at 03:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Ryan) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Notice of Hearing Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)352, 348). Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2013 at 01:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Hearing on Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens (related document(s)349). Hearing scheduled for 6/27/2013 at 01:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Ryan) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Change of Address of Creditor Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing on Debtors' Application for Authorization to Employ Graf Repetti & Co., LLP as Accountants Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)83). Hearing scheduled for 8/8/2012 at 03:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2016(b) Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 84)). Notice Date 07/29/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 78)). Notice Date 07/28/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing (related document(s) (Related Doc # 79)). Notice Date 07/28/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service Re: Notice on Additional Creditors Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information (Related Doc # 72) Signed on 7/27/2012. (Cornell, Sheryl ) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application to Employ Graf Repetti & Co., LLP as Accountants Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 74)). Notice Date 07/26/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 73)). Notice Date 07/26/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response to Debtor's Expedited Motion for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear Filed by Robert A. Soriano on behalf of Airport and Hillsborough, LLC, J.T. Reeder Partners, LLLP, Snell Investments, LLC (related document(s)36). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Soriano, Robert) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Application to Employ Kynes Markman & Felman, P.A. as Special Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (related document(s)68). Hearing scheduled for 8/8/2012 at 03:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Sheryl) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript to be filed within 7 calendar days of the date of service of this notice, but an additional three days may be added if the notice is served by U.S. Mail (related document(s)75). (Sheryl) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc # 71)). Notice Date 07/25/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summary of Schedules , Schedules A - H, Filing Fee Paid., Statement of Financial Affairs , List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Barbara) Modified on 7/26/2012 (Sheryl). (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript Regarding Hearing Held 7-19-12 on Calendar Items Listed in Hearing Proceeding Memo at Doc. #66. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Johnson Transcription Service: 813-920-1466 . Transcript access will be restricted through 10/23/2012. (Johnson Transcription Service) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Continuing and Rescheduling Hearing on Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral (Second Interim Order) (related document(s)15). Hearing scheduled for 8/8/2012 at 03:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Signed on 7/24/2012 (Sheryl) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Continuing and Rescheduling Hearing on Emergency Application/Motion for Authority to Obtain Post-Petition Financing, To Grant Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense (Interim Order) (related document(s)44). Hearing scheduled for 8/8/2012 at 03:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Signed on 7/24/2012 (Sheryl) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Establishing Deadline for Filing Plan and Disclosure Statement . Chapter 11 Plan & Disclosure Statement due by 9/17/2012. Signed on 7/23/2012 (Sheryl) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 63)). Notice Date 07/21/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 62)). Notice Date 07/21/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Employ Kynes Markman & Felman, P.A. as Special Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Change of Address of Creditor Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Scott Stichter, Denise Barnett, Rick Malchon, Rob Soriano, Robert Crabel, Keith Appleby, Brad Staggs, John Lamoureux, Jason Sampson, Dana Watts, Michael Maguire, Jonathan Alden, Sacha Ross and Kimberly Ashby. RULING: 1 - New Chapter 11 Status Conference - Fast track, plan/disclosure due 9/17/2012. Order by Case Manager. 2 - Application to Employ Stichter Riedel Blain & Prosser, P.A. as Attorneys for the Debtor in Possession, Nunc Pro Tunc to Petition Date, doc. #4 - Approved; order by Stichter. 3 - Amended Motion to Shorten Time and Schedule Hearing on Expedited Motion for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear to Air Products and Chemicals, Inc. and to Authorize Debtors to Use a Portion of Sale Proceeds by the Debtor, doc. #41- Withdrawn at prior hearing; no ruling. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Dana J. Watts on behalf of Creditor Spectrum Underground, Inc.. (Watts, Dana) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Maggie D Mooney-Portale on behalf of Creditor Port Manatee. (Mooney-Portale, Maggie) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Approving Application to Employ/Retain James W. Martin, P.A. as Special Counsel for Debtor (Related Doc # 24). Signed on 7/19/2012. (Cornell, Sheryl ) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Approving Application to Employ/Retain William D. Preston, P.A. as Special Counsel for Debtor (Related Doc # 26). Signed on 7/19/2012. (Cornell, Sheryl ) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Notice of Appearance and Demand for Service of Papers Filed by H. Bradley Staggs on behalf of Creditor Port Manatee. (Staggs, H.) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Susan Profant. (Manatee County Tax Collector (SP)) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Special Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Notice of Special Appearance of Ronald S. Gellert for Creditor International Salt Company, LLC and Designation of Holland & Knight LLP as Local Counsel Filed by Noel R Boeke on behalf of Creditor International Salt Company, LLC. (Boeke, Noel) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 55)). Notice Date 07/15/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing (related document(s) (Related Doc # 54)). Notice Date 07/15/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Hearing Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)36). Hearing scheduled for 8/8/2012 at 03:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information (Until July 23, 2012) (Related Doc # 43) Signed on 7/13/2012. (Cornell, Sheryl ) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Expedited Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens (related document(s)36). Hearing scheduled for 8/8/2012 at 03:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Sheryl) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Scott Stichter, Rick Malchon (Regions), John Lamoureux (Comanco), Keith Appleby (Mayo Fertilizer), Sacha Ross (Air Products and Chemicals), Robert Crabill and Jonathan Alden (FL Dept of Environmental Protection). RULING: 1 - Cont'd hearing on Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral by the Debtor, doc. #15 (cont'd from 7/3/2012) - Granted on a further interim basis; cont'd hearing set for 8/8/2012 at 3:00 pm; order by Stichter. 2 - Application to Employ James W. Martin, P.A. as Special Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC, Doc #24 - Approved; order by Stichter. 3 - Application to Employ William D. Preston, P.A. as Special Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC, Doc #26 - Approved; order by Stichter. 4 - Emergency Motion for Authority to Obtain Post Petition Financing, to Grant Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status by the Debtor, doc. #44 - Granted on an interim basis; cont'd hearing set for 8/8/2012 at 3:00 pm; order by Stichter. Note 1- Amended Motion to Shorten Time, doc. #41, Withdrawn in Open Court. Note 2 -Expedited Motion to Sell, doc. #36, set for 8/8/2012 at 3:00 pm; notice by Case Manager. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Change of Address of Creditor Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Change of Address of Creditors Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc # 40)). Notice Date 07/11/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Robert A. Soriano on behalf of Airport and Hillsborough, LLC, J.T. Reeder Partners, LLLP, Snell Investments, LLC. (Soriano, Robert) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Change of Address of Creditor Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Sacha Ross on behalf of Creditor Air Products and Chemicals, Inc.. (Ross, Sacha) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Change of Address of Creditor Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Necessity of Request for Emergency Hearing Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)44). (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Emergency Application/Motion for Authority to Obtain Post-Petition Financing, To Grant Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status (Hearing Set July 12, 2012 at 10:00 am) Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Stichter, Scott) Modified on 7/11/2012 (Sheryl). (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC, Interested Party HRK Industries, LLC (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Phillip R Semenick on behalf of Creditor I-Corp International, Inc. (Semenick, Phillip) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Motion to Shorten Time and Schedule Hearing on Expedited Motion for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear to Air Products and Chemicals, Inc. and to Authorize Debtors to Use a Portion of Sale Proceeds. A hearing is scheduled for July 19, 2012 at 10:30 am. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC, Interested Party HRK Industries, LLC (related document(s)39, 36). (Stichter, Scott) Modified on 7/10/2012 (DELORES). Modified on 7/10/2012 (DELORES). (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Interim Order Granting Debtors Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Replacement Liens Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 361, 363, 541, and 552 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (related document(s)15). Signed on 7/9/2012 (Laura G.) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Shorten Time and Schedule Hearing on Expedited Motion for Authority to Sell Real Property Free and Clear to Air Products and Chemicals, Inc. and to Authorize Debtors to Use a Portion of Sale Proceeds. A hearing is scheduled for Thursday, July 19, 2012 at 10:30 am. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC, Interested Party HRK Industries, LLC (related document(s)36). (Stichter, Scott) Modified on 7/10/2012 (DELORES). (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Certificate of Service Re: Debtor, HRK Holdings, LLC's Motion for Expedited Order Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 366 of the Bankruptcy Code (i) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Service on Account of Prepetition Invoices; (ii) Approving the Debtor's Proposed Adequate Assurance of Payment; and (iii) Establishing Procedures for Determining Additional Requests for Adequate Assurance of Payment and Order Granting same Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)25, 12). (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc # 25)). Notice Date 07/07/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Expedited Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens to Air Products and Chemicals, Inc. and to Authorize Debtors to Use a Portion of Sale Proceeds. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jason C. Sampson on behalf of Creditor Xylem Dewatering Solutions, Inc., a New Jersey corporation, d/b/a Godwin Pumps of America. (Sampson, Jason) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC, Interested Party HRK Industries, LLC (related document(s)24, 26). Hearing scheduled for 7/12/2012 at 10:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 22)). Notice Date 07/05/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc # 20)). Notice Date 07/05/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc # 21)). Notice Date 07/05/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Barbara Hart, Scott Stichter, Rick Malchon (Regions Bank), Keith Appleby (Mayo Fertilizer), Jordan Levy (CEO), Lionel Singh (CFO), and Denise Barnett. RULING: 1 - Emergency Motion to Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, and Other Employee Benefits by the Debtor, doc. #7 - Granted; order by Hart submitted and signed. 2 - Motion for Expedited Order Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 366 of the Bankruptcy Code (i) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Service on Account of Prepetition Invoices; (ii) Approving the Debtor's Proposed Adequate Assurance of Payment; and (iii) Establishing Procedures for Determining Additional Requests for Adequate Assurance of Payment by the Debtor, doc. #12 - Granted; order by Hart. 3 - Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral by the Debtor, doc. #15 - Granted on an interim basis; cont'd hearing set for 7/12/2012 at 10:00 am; order by Stichter. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Robert C Schermer on behalf of Creditor Airport and Hillsborough, LLC. (Schermer, Robert) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Robert C Schermer on behalf of Creditor J.T. Reeder Partners, LLLP. (Schermer, Robert) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Robert C Schermer on behalf of Creditor Snell Investments, LLC. (Schermer, Robert) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application to Employ William D. Preston, P.A. as Special Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Motion for Order Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 366 of the Bankruptcy Code (i) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Service on Account of Prepetition Invoices; (ii) Approving the Debtor's Proposed Adequate Assurance of Payment; and (iii) Establishing Procedures for Determining Additional Requests for Adequate Assurance of Payment (Related Doc # 12). Signed on 7/5/2012. (Grammel, Laura ) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application to Employ James W. Martin, P.A. as Special Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - Operating Order (related document(s) (Related Doc # 17)). Notice Date 07/04/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Motion To Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries and Other Employee Benefits (Related Doc # 7). Signed on 7/3/2012. (CHURCH, DELORES ) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Scheduling Final Hearing on Application to Employ Attorney. Application approved on interim basis. (related document(s)4). Hearing scheduled for 7/19/2012 at 10:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Signed on 7/3/2012 (DELORES) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Scheduling Status Conference. Hearing scheduled for 7/19/2012 at 10:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Signed on 7/3/2012 (DELORES) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 14)). Notice Date 07/01/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 11)). Notice Date 07/01/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order to File All State and Federal Tax Returns and Pay Taxes When Due . (ADIclerk) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Necessity re Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC, Interested Party HRK Industries, LLC (related document(s)15). (Stichter, Scott) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC, Interested Party HRK Industries, LLC. A hearing on this motion will be held on July 3, 2012 at 2:00 p.m.(Stichter, Scott) Modified on 7/3/2012 (DELORES). (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration (Related Doc # 6). Signed on 6/29/2012. (CHURCH, DELORES ) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Expedited Order Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 366 of the Bankruptcy Code (i) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Service on Account of Prepetition Invoices; (ii) Approving the Debtor's Proposed Adequate Assurance of Payment; and (iii) Establishing Procedures for Determining Additional Requests for Adequate Assurance of Payment. A hearing is scheduled for July 3, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Hart, Barbara) Modified on 7/3/2012 (DELORES). (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/30/2012 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL (861) - Room 100-B, Timberlake Annex, 501 E. Polk Street. Proofs of Claims due by 9/10/2012. (DELORES) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Keith T Appleby on behalf of Creditor Mayo Ferlitizer, Inc.. (Appleby, Keith) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard H Malchon Jr. on behalf of Creditor Regions Bank. (Malchon, Richard) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Necessity for Debtors' Emergency Motion fo Authorization to Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, and Other Employee Benefits Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (related document(s)7). (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Emergency Motion/Application to Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, and Other Employee Benefits. A hearing is scheduled for July 3, 2012 at 2:00 PM. Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Hart, Barbara) Modified on 6/29/2012 (DELORES). (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Expedited Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 12-9868 with 12-9869 Pursuant to Bankruptcy rule 1015(b) Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Demand for Service of Papers Filed by John J Lamoureux on behalf of Comanco Construction Corporation, The Comanco Group, Inc., Comanco Environmental Corporation. (Lamoureux, John) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Employ Stichter Riedel Blain & Prosser, P.A. as Attorneys for the Debtor in Possession, Nunc Pro Tunc to Petition Date Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of Debtor HRK Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Barbara) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Fee Paid.) Schedules and Statements Not Filed or Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation Not Filed Filed by Barbara A Hart on behalf of HRK Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Barbara) Modified on 6/28/2012 (DELORES). (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 938 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?