Thrivent Financial for Lutherans et al v. Countrywide Financial Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-07154
District Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 26, 2017 at 12:40 PM EDT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Thrivent Balanced Fund, Plaintiff
No Logo Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Plaintiff
No Logo Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Plaintiff
No Logo Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Plaintiff
No Logo Thrivent Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D Bernstein +1 212 554 1400 bruce@blbglaw.com
Space Jai K Chandrasekhar +1 212 554 1400 jai@blbglaw.com
Space Timothy Alan DeLange +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323 timothyd@blbglaw.com
Space Joseph William Goodman +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323 joseph.goodman@blbglaw.com
Space Lauren Amy McMillen +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444 lauren@blbglaw.com
Space Brett M Middleton +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323 brettm@blbglaw.com
Space Blair Allen Nicholas +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323 blairn@blbglaw.com
Space Gerald Harlan Silk +1 212 554 1282 +1 212 554 1444 jerry@blbglaw.com
Space David L Wales +1 212 554 1409 dwales@blbglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rice Michels & Walther

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karin E Peterson +1 612 676 2300 +1 612 676 2319 kpeterson@ricemichels.com
Space Brian F Rice +1 612 676 2303 +1 612 676 2319 brice@ricemichels.com
No Logo Thrivent Financial for Lutherans Foundation, Plaintiff
No Logo Thrivent Income Fund, Plaintiff
No Logo Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Plaintiff
No Logo Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Plaintiff
No Logo Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio, Plaintiff
No Logo Thrivent Mutual Funds, Plaintiff
No Logo Thrivent Variable Annuity Portfolio Funds, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Ally Bank, Defendant
No Logo Angelo Mozilo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com
Space Erin Sindberg Porter +1 612 373 0380 +1 612 373 0929 esindbergporter@greeneespel.com
Space John W. Ursu +1 612 373 8332 +1 612 373 0929 jursu@gr-espel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space A Matthew Ashley +1 949 760 0991 +1 949 760 5200 mashley@irell.com
Space Holly L Gershow +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 hgershow@irell.com
Space Allison Lauren Libeu +1 949 760 0991 +1 949 760 5200 alibeu@irell.com
Space David Siegel +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 dsiegel@irell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meylan Davitt Jain & Arevian LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benedetto L. Balding +1 213 225 6000 +1 213 225 6098 bbalding@mdjalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mytili Gowri Bala +1 949 760 0991 +1 949 760 5200 mytili@gmail.com
No Logo BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Defendant
Bank of America Corporation Bank of America Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bank of America Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Felhaber Larson Fenlon & Vogt, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L Hashmall +1 612 339 6321 +1 612 338 0535 dhashmall@felhaber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Butwin +1 212 408 2424 bbutwin@omm.com
Space Matthew William Close +1 213 430 6000 mclose@omm.com
Space Jonathan Rosenberg +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 jrosenberg@omm.com
Space William J Sushon +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 wsushon@omm.com
No Logo Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Countrywide Financial Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andre T Hanson +1 612 321 2800 +1 612 321 9600 Andre.hanson@nortonrosefulbright.com
Space Ronn B. Kreps +1 612 321 2800 +1 612 321 2288 rkreps@fulbright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caroline T. Bullerjahn +1 617 570 1359 +1 617 523 1231 cbullerjahn@goodwinprocter.com
Space Brian Charles Devine +1 617 570 1794 +1 617 523 1231 bdevine@goodwinprocter.com
Space Inez H. Friedman-Boyce +1 617 570 1334 +1 617 523 1231 ifriedmanboyce@goodwinprocter.com
Space Brian E. Pastuszenski +1 617 570 1094 +1 617 523 1231 BPastuszenski@goodwinprocter.com
Space Daniel Prugh Roeser +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3333 droeser@goodwinlaw.com
Space Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian G Burke +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 brian.burke@shearman.com
Space Kirsten Nelson Cunha +1 212 848 4320 +1 646 828 4320 kirsten.cunha@shearman.com
Space Adam Selim Hakki +1 212 848 4924 +1 646 848 4924 ahakki@shearman.com
No Logo Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Defendant
Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Countrywide Securities Corporation, Defendant
No Logo CWABS, Inc, Defendant
No Logo CWALT, Inc., Defendant
No Logo CWHEQ, Inc., Defendant
No Logo CWMBS, Inc., Defendant
No Logo David A Sambol, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anthony Ostlund Baer & Louwagie PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brooke D Anthony +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 banthony@aoblaw.com
Space Vincent D Louwagie +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 vlouwagie@aoblaw.com
Space Courtland C Merrill +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 cmerrill@aoblr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank M Scaduto +1 415 773 5700 fscaduto@orrick.com
Space Michael David Torpey +1 415 773 5700 +1 415 773 5759 mtorpey@orrick.com
Space Michael Carl Tu +1 213 629 2020 +1 213 612 2499 mtu@orrick.com
No Logo Gmac Mortgage, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Homecomings Financial, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Nb Holdings Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Residential Funding Company, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carpenter & Lipps LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JENNIFER A. L. BATTLE +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 battle@carpenterlipps.com
Space Jeffrey Alan Lipps +1 614 365 4100 +1 614 365 9145 lipps@carpenterlipps.com
Space Angela Paul Whitfield +1 614 365 4100 paul@carpenterlipps.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly and Hannah, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah E. Bushnell +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 sbushnell@kellyhannahlaw.com
Space Timothy D Kelly +1 612 349 6171 +1 612 349 6416 tkelly@kellyandberens.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terrence J. Fleming +1 612 371 3248 +1 612 371 3207 tfleming@lindquist.com
Space Kim Ruckdaschel-Haley +1 612 371 3946 +1 612 371 3207 kruckdaschel-haley@lindquist.com
No Logo Residential Funding Securities, LLC., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1442
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (194) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case,, 193 , (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (pj) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 193 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
    STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio, Thrivent Mutual Funds, Thrivent Variable Annuity Portfolio Funds. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
    ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, 172 JURY DEMAND. filed by defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation.(Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer 190 by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: The Countrywide Defendants shall have until June 29, 2012 to answer the Amended Complaint. (lom) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 190 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
        STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 29, 2012 re Amended Complaint,, 172 filed by Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
        LREF
        Blank 189 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
        IN CHAMBER MINUTE ORDER RE MOTION(S) TO DISMISS. On February 17, 2012, this Court issued an order dismissing without prejudice: (i) fraudulent misrepresentation, reckless misrepresentation, and fraudulent inducement claims that concern title transfer allegations; (ii) aiding and abetting fraud claims against all Defendants; and (iii) negligent misrepresentation claims against all Defendants. February 17, 2012 Order (the Dismissal Order), ECF No. 170. The Court granted leave to amend those claims. Id. Plaintiffs filed an Amended Complaint (AC) on March 9, 2012. ECF No. 172. The AC made no changes to these claims (AC at 1 n.1). The claims identified above are therefore now DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the reasons set out in the Dismissal Order. The AC adds new claims regarding Bank of Americas alleged liability. The Bank of America Defendants moved to dismiss the claims against them based on the Courts decision in Allstate Insurance Company v. Countrywide Financial Corporation. No. 2:11-cv-5236-MRP (MANx), 2012 WL 335730 (C.D. Cal.). As detailed in the Opposition and the Courts April 26, 2012 Minute Order in this case, that motion is unopposed. ECF No. 85. Claims Six, Seven, and Eight of the AC are therefore DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 175 176 179 181 (cs) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
          LREF
          Blank 188 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
          REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case 176 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
            LREF
            Blank 187 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
            REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint 175 filed by Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
              LREF
              Blank 186 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
              REPLY In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss Case 179 filed by Defendant David A Sambol. (Tu, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                LREF
                Blank 185 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. The Court has received Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, ECF No. 183, in which Plaintiffs attempt to incorporate by reference arguments made by different counsel, on behalf of different plaintiffs, in a different case. Response at 2. It is inappropriate to incorporate legal arguments by reference. L.R. 7-9. The deadline for Plaintiffs to oppose the Bank of America Defendants motion has passed, and Plaintiffs have not made any argument aside from seeking to incorporate others work by reference. Those arguments are not properly before the Court. Therefore, the Court treats the Bank of America Defendants motion to dismiss as unopposed with respect to Causes of Action Seven and Eight. (cs) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                  LREF
                  Blank 184 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Defendant Sambol's Minnesota Counsel filed by Defendant David A Sambol. (Scaduto, Frank) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                    LREF
                    Blank 183 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio, Thrivent Mutual Funds, Thrivent Variable Annuity Portfolio Fundsto Memorandum in Support of Motion 177 , MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Causes of Action Six, Seven and Eight / Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Causes of Action Six, Seven and Eight 181 , MOTION to Dismiss Case 179 , MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint 175 THRIVENT'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                    PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation, re MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Causes of Action Six, Seven and Eight / Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Causes of Action Six, Seven and Eight 181 served on March 30, 2012. (Close, Matthew) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Causes of Action Six, Seven and Eight / Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Causes of Action Six, Seven and Eight filed by defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 5/17/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Unopposed Motion, # 2 Proposed Order)(Close, Matthew) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 180 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                        REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case 179 filed by Defendant David A Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tu, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                        LREF
                        Blank 179 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant David A Sambol. Motion set for hearing on 5/17/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Tu, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                        LREF
                        Blank 178 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                        REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case 176 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex1-part1, # 2 Exhibit Ex1-part2, # 3 Exhibit Ex1-part3, # 4 Exhibit Ex2-part1, # 5 Exhibit Ex2-part2, # 6 Exhibit Ex2-part3, # 7 Exhibit Ex2-part4, # 8 Exhibit Ex3-part1, # 9 Exhibit Ex3-part2)(Bala, Mytili) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                        LREF
                        Blank 177 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case 176 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Bala, Mytili) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                          LREF
                          Blank 176 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Motion set for hearing on 5/17/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Bala, Mytili) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                            LREF
                            Blank 175 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 5/17/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proof of Service)(Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                            LREF
                            Blank 174 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER Granting Stipulation 173 by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. IT IS HEREBY such ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: 1. Defendants shall file and serve any motions to dismiss the Amended Complaints in the cases in which they are defendants no later than March 30, 2012; 2. Plaintiffs shall file and serve their papers in opposition to the motions to dismiss the Amended Complaints no later than April 23, 2012; 3. Defendants shall serve and file their reply papers in support of the motions to dismiss the Amended Complaints no later than May 4, 2012; and 4. Defendants' answers to the Amended Complaints in the cases in which they are defendants shall be due twenty-one (21) days after the Court decides the motions to dismiss in that case, or twenty-one (21) days after the filing of any further amended complaint in response to order, whichever is later. (lom) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                              LREF
                              Blank 173 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                              STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Amended Complaint,, 172 filed by defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1 ; Jury Demand against Defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation, Angelo Mozilo, NB Holdings Corporation, David A Sambol filed by Plaintiffs Thrivent Financial For Lutherans, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Mutual Funds, Thrivent Variable Annuity Portfolio Funds, Thrivent Defined Benefits Plan Trust. (lom) (lom). (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 171 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Allison Lauren Libeu counsel for Defendant Angelo Mozilo.Holly Gershow is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo (Libeu, Allison) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 170 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT 24 , 28 , 26 , 33 by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer, the Court DISMISSES the transfer of title allegations in Causes of Action One, Two, and Three as inadequately pleaded. The Court DISMISSES Cause of Action Four for failure to plead substantial assistance with particularity. The Court DISMISSES Cause of Action Five for failure to plead that any defendant owed Plaintiffs a duty. The Court DISMISSES Cause of Action Six for failure to plead a de facto merger. Dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to all Causes of Action. Plaintiffs have leave to submit an amended complaint within 21 days of this Order. (jp) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer.The case is called and appearances are made. Court and counsel discuss the pending motion(s). The Court takes the motions under submission and its order will follow. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (cs) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mytili Gowri Bala on behalf of Defendant Angelo Mozilo (Bala, Mytili) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 167 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                        REPLY in support 28 of BAC Defendants Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Request For Judicial Notice, # 2 Declaration of Matthew W. Close in Support of Request For Judicial Notice, # 3 Exhibit A to Close Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Close Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Close Declaration)(Close, Matthew) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                        REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Reply Memorandum in Support of Amended Motion to Strike and to Dismiss 165 filed by Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                        REPLY in Support of 33 ; Countrywide Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Amended Motion to Strike and to Dismiss filed by Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                          REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re 26 Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Gershow, Holly) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                            REPLY in support of 26 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                              REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re 24 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Defendant David A Sambol. (Tu, Michael) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 161 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                REPLY In Support Of 24 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Defendant David A Sambol. (Tu, Michael) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio, re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, 157 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 158 , Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 159 served on 12/15/2011. (DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                    REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re 31 , 24 , 28 , 26 , 33 In Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Strike filed by Plaintiff Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C (part one), # 2 Exhibit C (part two), # 3 Exhibit C (part three), # 4 Exhibit C (part four), # 5 Exhibit G, # 6 Exhibit H (part one), # 7 Exhibit H (part two), # 8 Exhibit H (part three), # 9 Exhibit H (part four), # 10 Exhibit H (part five))(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                      DECLARATION of Timothy A. DeLange In Support Of 31 , 24 , 28 , 26 , 33 Thrivent's Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C (part one), # 4 Exhibit C (part two), # 5 Exhibit C (part three), # 6 Exhibit C (part four), # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H (part one), # 12 Exhibit H (part two), # 13 Exhibit H (part three), # 14 Exhibit H (part four), # 15 Exhibit H (part five))(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 31 , 24 , 28 , 26 , 33 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Strike filed by Plaintiffs Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting 154 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lauren A. McMillen on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Timothy A. DeLange as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting 153 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David L. Wales on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Timothy A. DeLange as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 154 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                              APPLICATION for attorney Lauren A. McMillen to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-9551185 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Service)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                              APPLICATION for attorney David L. Wales to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-9551058 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Service)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 152 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                              STIPULATION for Order Regarding Modification of Page Limits for Motion to Dismiss Briefing filed by Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 151 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jonathan Rosenberg counsel for Defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. Adding Jonathan Rosenberg as attorney as counsel of record for Bank of America Corporation, BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, and NB Holdings Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Bank of America Corporation, BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, and NB Holdings Corporation (Rosenberg, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 150 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                SUPPLEMENT to 28 / Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities Under the Court's October 25, 2011 Order filed by Defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation (Close, Matthew) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 149 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Supplemental Memorandum in Support of the Amended Motion to Strike and to Dismiss 148 filed by Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 148 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  SUPPLEMENT to 76 ; Supplemental Memorandum in Support of the Countrywide Defendants' Amended Motion to Strike and to Dismiss filed by Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 147 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/29/11 (mw) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on September 29, 2011 at 1:39pm. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Leandra Amber, CSR, phone number (213) 894-6603. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/24/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2012. (mw) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER regarding Schedule for Motions to Dismiss Pending cases by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (See attached document for requirements.) (lom) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting 139 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Inez H. Friedman-Boyce on behalf of Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation., designating Lloyd Winawer as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting 141 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel P. Roeser on behalf of Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation, designating Lloyd Winawer as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting 140 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Caroline H. Bullerjahn on behalf of Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation., designating Lloyd Winawer as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 141 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                APPLICATION for attorney Daniel P. Roeser to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-9405331 paid.) filed by Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Winawer, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 140 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                APPLICATION for attorney Caroline H. Bullerjahn to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-9405282 paid.) filed by Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Winawer, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 139 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                APPLICATION for attorney Inez H. Friedman-Boyce to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-9405121 paid.) filed by Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Winawer, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 138 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                STIPULATION to Reschedule Schedule for Motions to Dismiss Pending Cases filed by Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Regarding Schedule for Motions to Dismiss Pending Cases)(Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 137 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 136 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brian Charles Devine on behalf of Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation (Devine, Brian) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 135 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brian E Pastuszenski on behalf of Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation (Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 134 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lloyd Winawer on behalf of Defendants CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation (Winawer, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        STATEMENT - Joint Statement Regarding Scheduling for Motions to Dismiss Pending Cases filed by Defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., CWABS, Inc., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation, Angelo Mozilo, NB Holdings Corporation, David A Sambol, Plaintiffs Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio (Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE:(held and completed) before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. Court and counsel discuss the status of the various cases. The Court orders the parties to meet and confer and submit a new schedule by October 5, 2011. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (lom) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant David A Sambol, (Tu, Michael) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney A Matthew Ashley counsel for Defendant Angelo Mozilo.Benedetto L. Balding is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo (Ashley, A) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney William J Sushon counsel for Defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. Adding William J. Sushon as attorney as counsel of record for Bank of America Corporation, BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, and NB Holdings Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Bank of America Corporation, BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, and NB Holdings Corporation (Sushon, William) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 128 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Matthew W Close counsel for Defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. Adding Matthew W. Close as attorney as counsel of record for Bank of America Corporation, BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, and NB Holdings Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants Bank of America Corporation, BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, NB Holdings Corporation (Close, Matthew) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo, (Libeu, Allison) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 126 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer.The Court hereby Orders the parties to appear on Thursday, September 29, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. for a Status Conference in the matters of LA11CV07152-MRP (MANx) Bankers Insurance Company et al., v. Countrywide Financial Corporation, et al, LA11CV07154-MRP (MANx) Thrivent Financial for Lutherans v. Countrywide Financial Corporation, et al, LA11CV07163-MRP (MANx) Sterling Federal Bank, F.S.B. v. Countrywide Financial Corporation, et al, LA11CV07165-MRP (MANx) Dexia Holdings, Inc., et al, v. Countrywide Financial Corporation, et al, LA11CV07166-MRP (MANx) Western and Southern Life Insurance Company et al, v. Countrywide Financial Corporation, et al, LA11CV07167-MRP (MANx) American Fidelity Assurance Company v. Countrywide Financial Corporation, et al (cs) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Letter to Counsel issued on case number 2:11-cv-07154 MRP (MANx).. (et) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          LETTER Requesting Transfer of MDL case to this District sent to District of Minnesota re transfer of their case number 0:11-01111-SRN-TNL for consolidation with 2:11-ml-2265 MRP (MANx). (et) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 8/15/2011 regarding transfer of Case No. 0:11-01111-SRN-TNL from District of Minnesota (DMN). Case assigned to Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:11-ml-02265 MRP (MANx). (et) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Minnesota (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2), transferring case to the Central District of California per MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (akl) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT: The Countrywide Defendants' Motion to Sever and to Transfer (ECF No. 80), and the Bank of America Defendants' Motion to Sever and to Transfer (ECF. No. 84) are hereby withdrawn without prejudice; The briefing schedule set forth in the July 22, 2011 Order (ECF No. 59) is vacated and the hearing scheduled for September 30, 2011 is cancelled. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/29/11. (jam) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER in re: severance and remand of the "GMAC" defendant-related claims to State Court. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/26/11. (jam) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION with attached Exhibit A Between Plaintiffs and The Countrywide Defendants, The Bank of America Defendants, Angelo Mozilo and David A. Sambol by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation, Angelo Mozilo, NB Holdings Corporation, David A Sambol, Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio, CWABS, Inc.. (Wales, David) Modified text on 8/29/2011 (akl). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Between Plaintiffs and The "GMAC" Defendants Regarding Severance of Claims and Remand of The "GMAC" Defendant-Related Claims to State Court by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC., Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Wales, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment)(Kreps, Ronn) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit G by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 28 MOTION to Dismiss/General Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit V by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit U by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit T by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit S by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit R by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit Q by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit P by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit O by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit N by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit M by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit L by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit K by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit J by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit I by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit H by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit F by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit E (part 3) by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit E (part 2) by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit E (part 1) by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit D by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT re 92 Exhibit Exhibit C by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT re 91 Exhibit, Exhibit B by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT re 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion Exhibit A by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of David L. Hashmall in SUPPORT OF 28 MOTION to Dismiss/General Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of David L. Hashmall in SUPPORT OF 84 MOTION to Sever Under Fed. Rule Civ. P. 42(b) and to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 84 MOTION to Sever Under Fed. Rule Civ. P. 42(b) and to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation re 80 Final MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue (Hanson, Andre) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 84 MOTION to Sever Under Fed. Rule Civ. P. 42(b) and to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) : Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Support of 80 Final MOTION to Sever, MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hanson, Andre) Modified link and text on 8/3/2011 (akl). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Sever Under Fed. Rule Civ. P. 42(b) and to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 80 Final MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue : Countrywide Defendants' Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Hanson, Andre) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Andre Hanson in Support of 80 Final MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Exhibit(s) I, # 10 Exhibit(s) J, # 11 Exhibit(s) K, # 12 Exhibit(s) L, # 13 Exhibit(s) M, # 14 Exhibit(s) N, # 15 Exhibit(s) O, # 16 Exhibit(s) P, # 17 Exhibit(s) Q, # 18 Exhibit(s) R, # 19 Exhibit(s) S, # 20 Exhibit(s) T, # 21 Exhibit(s) U, # 22 Exhibit(s) V, # 23 Exhibit(s) W, # 24 Exhibit(s) X, # 25 Exhibit(s) Y)(Hanson, Andre) Modified text on 8/3/2011 (akl). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Paul T. Liu in Support of 80 Final MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Hanson, Andre) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Final MOTION to Sever, MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Hanson, Andre) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation re 76 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Hanson, Andre) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Andre Hanson in Support of 77 Memorandum in Support filed by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E)(Hanson, Andre) Modified text on 8/3/2011 (akl). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Support of 33 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint filed by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hanson, Andre) Modified link and text on 8/3/2011 (akl). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss/General by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Hanson, Andre) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. Notice of Merger and Name Change (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC. re 70 Declaration in Support,,, 68 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 71 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Bushnell, Sarah) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of David Sambol in SUPPORT OF 24 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint filed by David A Sambol. (Louwagie, Vincent) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 24 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint filed by David A Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Louwagie, Vincent) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 60 MOTION to Sever Claims filed by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bushnell, Sarah) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Jeffrey A. Lipps in Support of 31 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5, part 1, # 6 Exhibit(s) 5, part 2, # 7 Exhibit(s) 5, part 3, # 8 Exhibit(s) 5, part 4, # 9 Exhibit(s) 6, part 1, # 10 Exhibit(s) 6, part 2, # 11 Exhibit(s) 6, part 3, # 12 Exhibit(s) 6, part 4, # 13 Exhibit(s) 7, part 1, # 14 Exhibit(s) 7, part 2, # 15 Exhibit(s) 7, part 3, # 16 Exhibit(s) 7, part 4, # 17 Exhibit(s) 7, part 5, # 18 Exhibit(s) 8)(Bushnell, Sarah) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that Countrywide's request for a word count enlargement [Doc. 63] is GRANTED and that the Countrywide Defendants may submit opening and reply memoranda in support of their motion to strike and to dismiss that shall not exceed 16,000 words in the aggregate. Plaintiffs likewise may submit a memorandum in opposition to the Countrywide Defendants' motion to strike and to dismiss that shall not exceed 16,000 words. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/2/11. (jam) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 31 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bushnell, Sarah) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Angelo Mozilo re 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure To State A Claim Against Angelo Mozilo Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted (Luger, Andrew) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Angelo R. Mozilo in Support of 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure To State A Claim Against Angelo Mozilo Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Angelo Mozilo. (Luger, Andrew) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Erin Sindberg Porter in SUPPORT OF 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure To State A Claim Against Angelo Mozilo Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5)(Luger, Andrew) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure To State A Claim Against Angelo Mozilo Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Luger, Andrew) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation in Support of Unopposed Request for Word Count Extension. (Hanson, Andre) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC. re 61 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 60 MOTION to Sever Claims (Kelly, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 60 MOTION to Sever Claims : Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Kelly, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Sever Claims by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Kelly, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT: 1) Defendants' Memoranda of Law and any other supporting papers are due on August 2, 2011; 2) Plaintiffs' Opposition Memorandum of Law and any other supporting papers are due on September 6, 2011, and 3) Defendants' Reply Memoranda of Law and any other supporting papers are due on September 16, 2011. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/22/11. (jam) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule by all parties. (Wales, David) Modified filers and text on 7/22/2011 (akl). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER : The hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [Doc.24, 26, 28, 33, & 31] scheduled for September 15, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby rescheduled to Friday, September 30, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Susan Richard Nelson in Courtroom 7B, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul Minnesota. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/21/11. (jam) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [Doc.24, 26, 28, 33, & 31] scheduled for September 2, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby rescheduled to Thursday, September 15, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Susan Richard Nelson in Courtroom 7B, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul Minnesota. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/19/11. (jam) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that: The Countrywide Defendants' informal request for a stay (Doc. No. 53) is DENIED.(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/18/11. (jam) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Status Conference held on 7/14/2011. Status Conference held before Susan Richard Nelson, United States Magistrate Judge, at St. Paul, Minnesota. The request by the Countrywide defendants to stay this matter pending the resolution of the MDL motion is taken under advisement. An order will issue. (Court Reporter Ron Moen) (jam) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Kreps, Ronn) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT (Status Conference Submission of the "GMAC" Defendants by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kelly, Timothy) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio re 49 Letter to District Judge )Plaintiffs' Submission in Opposition to Defendants' Request for a Stay of Proceedings) filed by Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C)(Wales, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Angelo Mozilo Pursuant to Order Dated June 29, 2011 [Docket 47]. (Luger, Andrew) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by David A Sambol. (Louwagie, Vincent) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/14/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. Parties are to file on ECF simultaneous submissions on or before July 12, 20011 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/29/11. (jam) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Blair A. Nicholas. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2845106 by Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Blair A. Nicholas)(Peterson, Karin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Bradley J. Butwin by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Frank M. Scaduto by David A Sambol. (Anthony, Brooke) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC. re 42 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution, (Bushnell, Sarah) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Bushnell, Sarah) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Plaintiff Thrivent Financial for Lutherans ("Thrivent Financial") is a not-for-profit fraternal benefit society. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of its stock. Plaintiff Thrivent Life Insurance Company is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Thrivent Financial. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of its stock. Plaintiff Thrivent Financial for Lutherans Foundation is a private 501(c)(3) foundation funded by Thrivent Financial and its subsidiaries. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of its stock. Plaintiffs Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Income Fund, and Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund (the "Funds") are each a series of Thrivent Mutual Funds. Thrivent Mutual Funds is organized as a Massachusetts business trust and is registered as an open-end management investment company under the Investment Company Act of 1940. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of the stock of any of the Funds. Plaintiffs Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, and Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio (the "Portfolios") are each a series of Thrivent Series Fund, Inc. Thrivent Series Fund, Inc. is a Minnesota corporation registered as an open-end management investment company under the Investment Company Act of 1940. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of the stock of any of the Portfolios. Plaintiff Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust is an individual pension account plan funded by Thrivent Financial. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of its stock. (Wales, David) Modified text on 6/7/2011 (akl). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael D. Torpey by David A Sambol. (Anthony, Brooke) Modified on 6/6/2011 (MMC). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael C. Tu by David A Sambol. (Anthony, Brooke) Modified on 6/6/2011 (MMC). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - replaced by doc. #39. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael C. Tu by David A Sambol. (Anthony, Brooke) Modified on 6/6/2011 (MMC). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - replaced by doc. #40. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael D. Torpey by David A Sambol. (Anthony, Brooke) Modified on 6/6/2011 (MMC). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: 1. Within 30 days of the Motion to Dismiss being denied or granted in part, Plaintiff shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by letter or e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling a pretrial conference. 2. Failure to comply with this Order or any other prior consistent Order shall subject the non-complying party, non-complying counsel and/or the party such counsel represents to any and all appropriate remedies, sanctions and the like, including without limitation: assessment of costs, fines and attorneys fees and disbursements; waiver of rights to object; exclusion or limitation of witnesses, testimony, exhibits and other evidence; striking of pleadings; complete or partial dismissal with prejudice; entry of whole or partial default judgment; and/or any other relief that this Court may from time to time deem appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/1/11. (akl) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., GMAC Mortgage LLC, Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., and Ally Bank are wholly-owned indirect subsidiaries of Ally Financial Inc. f/k/a GMAC Inc. ("Ally"). Residential Funding Securities, LLC is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Ally, Ally is not publicly held. No publicly held corporation owns more than 10% of the common stock of Ally. (Ruckdaschel-Haley, Kim) Modified text on 6/7/2011 (akl). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 33 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Hanson, Andre) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Hanson, Andre) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 31 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Complaint : by GMAC Defendants Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Ruckdaschel-Haley, Kim) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Complaint by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Ruckdaschel-Haley, Kim) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. 1. BAC is a publicly-held corporation whose shares are traded on the New York Stock Exchange. It has no parent company and no publicly-held company owns more than 10% of BACs shares. 2. NB is a wholly-owned direct BAC subsidiary. 3. Servicing is a wholly-owned indirect BAC subsidiary. BAC GP, LLC and BANA LP, LLC are Servicings general and limited partners and own 100% of Servicing. GP and for LP are wholly owned direct subsidiaries of Bank of America, N.A. Bank of America, N.A. is a wholly owned subsidiary of BANA Holding Corporation, which is wholly-owned by BAC North America Holding Company. NB wholly owns BAC North America Holding Company. (Hashmall, David) Modified text on 5/31/2011 (lmb). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 28 MOTION to Dismiss/General Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss/General Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure To State A Claim Against Angelo Mozilo Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted : Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Luger, Andrew) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure To State A Claim Against Angelo Mozilo Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Angelo Mozilo. (Luger, Andrew) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 24 MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Anthony, Brooke) Modified text on 6/1/2011 (akl). [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss/General the Complaint by David A Sambol. (Anthony, Brooke) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Bank of America Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendants CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Hanson, Andre) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan Rosenberg by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William J. Sushon by BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., NB Holdings Corporation. (Hashmall, David) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Adam S. Hakki. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2806976 by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Hanson, Andre) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Kirsten N. Cunha. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2806966 by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Hanson, Andre) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Brian G. Burke. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2806949 by CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Hanson, Andre) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Ally Bank answer due 5/31/2011; BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P. answer due 5/31/2011; Bank of America Corp. answer due 5/31/2011; CWALT, Inc. answer due 5/31/2011; CWHEQ, Inc. answer due 5/31/2011; CWMBS, Inc. answer due 5/31/2011; Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC answer due 5/31/2011; Countrywide Financial Corporation answer due 5/31/2011; Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP answer due 5/31/2011; Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. answer due 5/31/2011; Countrywide Securities Corporation answer due 5/31/2011; GMAC Mortgage LLC answer due 5/31/2011; Homecomings Financial, LLC answer due 5/31/2011; Angelo Mozilo answer due 5/31/2011; NB Holdings Corporation answer due 5/31/2011; Residential Accredit Loans, Inc. answer due 5/31/2011; Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc. answer due 5/31/2011; Residential Funding Company, LLC answer due 5/31/2011; Residential Funding Securities, LLC. answer due 5/31/2011; David A Sambol answer due 5/31/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/10/11. (akl) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David Siegel by Angelo Mozilo. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Allison Libeu by Angelo Mozilo. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Holly Gershow by Angelo Mozilo. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Benedetto Balding by Angelo Mozilo. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for A. Matthew Ashley by Angelo Mozilo. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Ally Bank, BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America Corp., CWALT, Inc., CWHEQ, Inc., CWMBS, Inc., Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Securities Corporation, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Angelo Mozilo, NB Holdings Corporation, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC., David A Sambol, Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Hanson, Andre) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Angela Paul Whitfield by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Ruckdaschel-Haley, Kim) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer A.L. Battle by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Ruckdaschel-Haley, Kim) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey A. Lipps by Ally Bank, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Residential Funding Securities, LLC.. (Ruckdaschel-Haley, Kim) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Lauren A. McMillen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2791860 by Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Pro Hac Vice)(Rice, Brian) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jai K. Chandrasekhar. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2791844 by Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Rice, Brian) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David L. Wales. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2791832 by Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Rice, Brian) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Gerald H. Silk. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2791819 by Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Rice, Brian) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Bruce D. Bernstein. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2791768 by Thrivent Balanced Fund, Thrivent Balanced Portfolio, Thrivent Bond Index Portfolio, Thrivent Core Bond Fund, Thrivent Financial Defined Benefits Plan Trust, Thrivent Financial For Lutherans Foundation, Thrivent Financial for Lutherans, Thrivent Income Fund, Thrivent Life Insurance Company, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Fund, Thrivent Limited Maturity Bond Portfolio. (Rice, Brian) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 11cv1111 SRN/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 4/29/2011. (JME) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County by Countrywide Capital Markets, LLC, Homecomings Financial, LLC, Ally Bank, CWALT, Inc., NB Holdings Corporation, CWHEQ, Inc., David A Sambol, Countrywide Securities Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Residential Funding Securities, LLC., Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Angelo Mozilo, GMAC Mortgage LLC, Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Bank of America Corp., CWMBS, Inc. from Hennepin County, Fourth Judicial District, their case number 27-cv-11-5830 ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4-54011). Case assigned to Judge Susan R. Nelson per Master List, referred to Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Exhibits & Summons, # 3 Notice of Filing Removal, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Certificate of Service, # 6 Certificate of Service) (jam) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/7/2011.] (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 395 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?