Beachbody LLC v. Prashant Vira et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:11-cv-00219
District Judge Josephine Staton Tucker, presiding

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Beachbody, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by attorney.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Q Pham +1 310 895 1188 +1 310 895 1180 cpham@spattorney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson & Pham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcus F Chaney +1 818 888 7540 +1 818 888 7544 mchaney@johnsonpham.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Dain Johnson +1 818 888 7540 +1 818 888 7544 cjohnson@johnsonpham.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: 8/5/2011 Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 trademark close) (twdb) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: 8/5/2011 Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
    REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 order) (twdb) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: 8/5/2011 Permanent InjunctionCourt Filing
      PERMANENT INJUNCTION filed by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker against defendant Prashant Vira. No Fees and Costs. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs incurred in this matter. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (twdb) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Stipulation for Permanent Injunction
        STIPULATION for Permanent Injunction as to AGAINST DEFENDANT PRASHANT VIRA filed by Plaintiff Beachbody LLC. (Attachments: # 1 [PROPOSED] Permanent Injunction)(Pham, Christopher) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker( Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/1/2011.) Counsel is advised that the Court will consider either the filing of a responsive pleading to the complaint by defendant in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and theLocal Rules, and/or an application by plaintiff for entry of clerks default as to defendant, on or before the date upon which the response is due, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. (twdb) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 Order Extending Answer Due DeadlineCourt Filing
            ORDER granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) 10 , by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker (twdb) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: 6/9/2011 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
              Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Prashant Vira answer now due 6/24/2011, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Plaintiff Beachbody LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pham, Christopher) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: 5/24/2011 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
                STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Prashant Vira answer now due 6/10/2011, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Plaintiff Beachbody LLC.(Pham, Christopher) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed
                  NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Beachbody LLC, upon Defendant Prashant Vira acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/28/2011, answer due 5/27/2011. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Kenneth A. Ohashi, Attorney. (Pham, Christopher) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                    INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE STATON TUCKER by Judge Josephine Staton Tucker. Please read this order carefully. It Governs this case and differs in some respects from the local rules. (twdb) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification)
                      REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Beachbody LLC. (twdb) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
                        REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Beachbody LLC. (twdb) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Notice of Related Cases
                          NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Beachbody LLC. Related Case(s): none (twdb) (lwag). (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by plaintiff Beachbody LLC (twdb) (lwag). (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                              CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Beachbody LLC (twdb) (lwag). (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Complaint - (Discovery)Court Filing
                                COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Prashant Vira. Case assigned to Judge Josephine Staton Tucker for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block.(Filing fee $ 350 paid) Jury Demand., filed by plaintiff Beachbody LLC.(twdb) (lwag). (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 24,222 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?