COBELL, et al v. SALAZAR , et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-01285
District Judge Thomas F. Hogan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 30, 2021 at 3:37 PM DT (2.8 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALL PLAINTIFFS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis M. Gingold +1 202 824 1448 +1 202 318 2372 dennismgingold@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E. Dorris , +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 bdorris@kilpatricktownsend.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith M. Harper +1 202 508 5844 +1 202 585 0919 kharper@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David Smith, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David S. Smith +1 516 213 0018 +1 917 591 3244 davidsmith@dssesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Native American Rights Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Guest +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 richardg@narf.org
No Logo CAROL EVE GOOD BEAR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grayson, Kubli & Hoffman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Clifton Holmes +1 703 749 0000 holmes@graysonlaw.net
No Logo CHARLES COLOMBE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grayson, Kubli & Hoffman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Clifton Holmes +1 703 749 0000 holmes@graysonlaw.net
No Logo EARL OLD PERSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EARL OLD PERSON

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/22/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Meyer Peregoy +1 406 675 2530

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/23/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Lorna Kay Babby +1 303 447 8760 +1 303 443 7776 babby@narf.org
No Logo ELOUISE PEPION COBELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Kester Brown +1 310 739 3900 +1 775 542 4938 mkesterbrown@gmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis M. Gingold +1 202 824 1448 +1 202 318 2372 dennismgingold@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Matthew Guilder +1 202 408 9169 justin.guilder@snrdenton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith M. Harper +1 202 508 5844 +1 202 585 0919 kharper@kilpatricktownsend.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elliott H. Levitas +1 404 815 6500 elevitas@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Meyer Peregoy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/22/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Meyer Peregoy +1 406 675 2530

Toggle Switch Represented by Native American Rights Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/23/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lorna Kay Babby +1 303 447 8760 +1 303 443 7776 babby@narf.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Guest +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 richardg@narf.org
No Logo JAMES LOUIS LAROSE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Kester Brown +1 310 739 3900 +1 775 542 4938 mkesterbrown@gmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis M. Gingold +1 202 824 1448 +1 202 318 2372 dennismgingold@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Matthew Guilder +1 202 408 9169 justin.guilder@snrdenton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith M. Harper +1 202 508 5844 +1 202 585 0919 kharper@kilpatricktownsend.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elliott H. Levitas +1 404 815 6500 elevitas@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Meyer Peregoy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/22/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Meyer Peregoy +1 406 675 2530

Toggle Switch Represented by Native American Rights Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/23/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lorna Kay Babby +1 303 447 8760 +1 303 443 7776 babby@narf.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Guest +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 richardg@narf.org
No Logo MARY AURELIA JOHNS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grayson, Kubli & Hoffman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Clifton Holmes +1 703 749 0000 holmes@graysonlaw.net
No Logo MILDRED CLEGHORN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Kester Brown +1 310 739 3900 +1 775 542 4938 mkesterbrown@gmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis M. Gingold +1 202 824 1448 +1 202 318 2372 dennismgingold@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Matthew Guilder +1 202 408 9169 justin.guilder@snrdenton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith M. Harper +1 202 508 5844 +1 202 585 0919 kharper@kilpatricktownsend.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elliott H. Levitas +1 404 815 6500 elevitas@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Meyer Peregoy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/22/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Meyer Peregoy +1 406 675 2530

Toggle Switch Represented by Native American Rights Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/23/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lorna Kay Babby +1 303 447 8760 +1 303 443 7776 babby@narf.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Guest +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 richardg@narf.org
No Logo PENNY CLEGHORN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Kester Brown +1 310 739 3900 +1 775 542 4938 mkesterbrown@gmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis M. Gingold +1 202 824 1448 +1 202 318 2372 dennismgingold@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Matthew Guilder +1 202 408 9169 justin.guilder@snrdenton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith M. Harper +1 202 508 5844 +1 202 585 0919 kharper@kilpatricktownsend.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elliott H. Levitas +1 404 815 6500 elevitas@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Meyer Peregoy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/22/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Meyer Peregoy +1 406 675 2530

Toggle Switch Represented by Native American Rights Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/23/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lorna Kay Babby +1 303 447 8760 +1 303 443 7776 babby@narf.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Guest +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 richardg@narf.org
No Logo THOMAS MAULSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Kester Brown +1 310 739 3900 +1 775 542 4938 mkesterbrown@gmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis M. Gingold +1 202 824 1448 +1 202 318 2372 dennismgingold@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Matthew Guilder +1 202 408 9169 justin.guilder@snrdenton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith M. Harper +1 202 508 5844 +1 202 585 0919 kharper@kilpatricktownsend.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elliott H. Levitas +1 404 815 6500 elevitas@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Meyer Peregoy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/22/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Meyer Peregoy +1 406 675 2530

Toggle Switch Represented by Native American Rights Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/23/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lorna Kay Babby +1 303 447 8760 +1 303 443 7776 babby@narf.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Guest +1 202 785 4166 +1 202 822 0068 richardg@narf.org
v.
No Logo ADA E. DEER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah D. Himmelhoch +1 202 633 3446

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edith R. Blackwell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edith R. Blackwell +1 202 208 6474

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis Steven Wiener +1 202 383 0140 +1 202 637 3593 lewis.wiener@sutherland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tom C. Clark +1 202 514 3553 +1 202 514 4180
TERMINATED: 11/23/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Virginia Cook +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 susan.cook@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Charles Cruden +1 202 514 2718 +1 202 514 0057 john.cruden@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Eschen +1 202 616 4027 +1 202 616 4159 andy.eschen@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian L. Ferrell +1 202 305 0428 +1 202 305 0274
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Walter Findlay, III +1 202 305 0447 +1 202 305 0506
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra Marguerite Schraibman +1 202 514 3315 +1 202 616 8202 sandy.schraibman@usdoj.gov
No Logo ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Lisette Alexander
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Thomas Stemplewicz

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Edward Curley +1 202 514 9038 +1 202 514 9163 timothy.curley@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Edward Kirschman, Jr. +1 202 616 0328 +1 202 514 9163 robert.kirschman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Christopher Kohn +1 202 514 7450 +1 202 514 9163 chris.kohn@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Kresse +1 202 616 2238 +1 202 307 0494 john.kresse@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Joseph Siemietkowski +1 202 514 3368 +1 202 514 9163 john.siemietkowski@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra Peavler Spooner +1 202 514 7195 +1 202 514 9163 sandra.spooner@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gino D. Vissicchio +1 202 307 3242 +1 202 307 0494 gino.vissicchio@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 11/25/2008 John Warshawsky +1 202 307 0010 +1 202 514 9163 john.warshawsky@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dodge Wells +1 202 307 0407 +1 202 514 7361
No Logo BRUCE BABBITT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah D. Himmelhoch +1 202 633 3446

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edith R. Blackwell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edith R. Blackwell +1 202 208 6474

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert David Luskin +1 202 457 6190 +1 202 457 6315 rluskin@pattonboggs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tom C. Clark +1 202 514 3553 +1 202 514 4180
TERMINATED: 11/23/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Virginia Cook +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 susan.cook@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Charles Cruden +1 202 514 2718 +1 202 514 0057 john.cruden@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Eschen +1 202 616 4027 +1 202 616 4159 andy.eschen@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian L. Ferrell +1 202 305 0428 +1 202 305 0274
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Walter Findlay, III +1 202 305 0447 +1 202 305 0506
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra Marguerite Schraibman +1 202 514 3315 +1 202 616 8202 sandy.schraibman@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of the Interior

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/17/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Connie S. Lundgren +1 202 208 6966
No Logo Department of Interior, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Martin Seligman +1 202 514 7164
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth Brandon Shapiro +1 202 862 2270 +1 202 862 2400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Thomas Stemplewicz

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry A. Azar, Jr. +1 202 616 8475 +1 202 616 8470 henry.azar@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Edward Curley +1 202 514 9038 +1 202 514 9163 timothy.curley@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 06/06/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Fader +1 202 514 3368
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian L. Ferrell +1 202 305 0428 +1 202 305 0274
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Walter Findlay, III +1 202 305 0447 +1 202 305 0506
TERMINATED: 06/07/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Sutherland Harris +1 202 479 3282 +1 202 514 8780 scott.harris@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Christopher Kohn +1 202 514 7450 +1 202 514 9163 chris.kohn@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Kresse +1 202 616 2238 +1 202 307 0494 john.kresse@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Craig Lawrence +1 202 514 7159 +1 202 305 0955 craig.lawrence@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/05/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Blaze Miller +1 202 307 0184
TERMINATED: 10/29/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Shaughnessy Most +1 202 616 3353 +1 202 305 0506 john.most@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark E. Nagle +1 202 514 7566 +1 202 514 8780
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Brian New +1 212 637 1049 +1 212 637 2527 jonathan.new@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Mitchell Petrie +1 202 307 0267 +1 202 305 4933 terry.petrie@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer dawn Ricketts +1 202 514 3671 +1 202 616 8460 jennifer.d.ricketts@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 10/29/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jo-Ann Shyloski +1 202 305 0212 +1 202 305 0267 jo-ann.shyloski@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Joseph Siemietkowski +1 202 514 3368 +1 202 514 9163 john.siemietkowski@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra Peavler Spooner +1 202 514 7195 +1 202 514 9163 sandra.spooner@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gino D. Vissicchio +1 202 307 3242 +1 202 307 0494 gino.vissicchio@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 11/25/2008 John Warshawsky +1 202 307 0010 +1 202 514 9163 john.warshawsky@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dodge Wells +1 202 307 0407 +1 202 514 7361

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

No Logo DIRK KEMPTHORNE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Lisette Alexander
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Thomas Stemplewicz

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Christopher Kohn +1 202 514 7450 +1 202 514 9163 chris.kohn@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Craig Lawrence +1 202 514 7159 +1 202 305 0955 craig.lawrence@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Brian New +1 212 637 1049 +1 212 637 2527 jonathan.new@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra Peavler Spooner +1 202 514 7195 +1 202 514 9163 sandra.spooner@usdoj.gov
No Logo EDWARD B. COHEN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Lisette Alexander
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth Brandon Shapiro +1 202 862 2270 +1 202 862 2400

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert David Luskin +1 202 457 6190 +1 202 457 6315 rluskin@pattonboggs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/06/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Fader +1 202 514 3368
TERMINATED: 06/20/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amalia D. Kessler +1 202 305 1759
TERMINATED: 09/05/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Blaze Miller +1 202 307 0184
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Brian New +1 212 637 1049 +1 212 637 2527 jonathan.new@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer dawn Ricketts +1 202 514 3671 +1 202 616 8460 jennifer.d.ricketts@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

No Logo GALE NORTON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Lisette Alexander
TERMINATED: 05/24/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel G. Jarcho +1 202 789 7786
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth Brandon Shapiro +1 202 862 2270 +1 202 862 2400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Thomas Stemplewicz

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina Marleen Carroll +1 202 496 7500 +1 202 496 7756 ccarroll@mckennalong.com
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert Lawrence Fenster +1 303 634 4000 +1 303 634 4400 hfenster@mckennalong.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge, LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/05/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Bearman +1 202 496 7204 +1 202 496 7756 mbearman@mckennalong.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry A. Azar, Jr. +1 202 616 8475 +1 202 616 8470 henry.azar@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 06/06/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Fader +1 202 514 3368
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Walter Findlay, III +1 202 305 0447 +1 202 305 0506
TERMINATED: 06/07/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Sutherland Harris +1 202 479 3282 +1 202 514 8780 scott.harris@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 06/20/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amalia D. Kessler +1 202 305 1759
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Christopher Kohn +1 202 514 7450 +1 202 514 9163 chris.kohn@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Craig Lawrence +1 202 514 7159 +1 202 305 0955 craig.lawrence@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/05/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Blaze Miller +1 202 307 0184
TERMINATED: 10/29/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Shaughnessy Most +1 202 616 3353 +1 202 305 0506 john.most@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark E. Nagle +1 202 514 7566 +1 202 514 8780
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Brian New +1 212 637 1049 +1 212 637 2527 jonathan.new@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 10/29/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Mitchell Petrie +1 202 307 0267 +1 202 305 4933 terry.petrie@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer dawn Ricketts +1 202 514 3671 +1 202 616 8460 jennifer.d.ricketts@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 10/29/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jo-Ann Shyloski +1 202 305 0212 +1 202 305 0267 jo-ann.shyloski@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra Peavler Spooner +1 202 514 7195 +1 202 514 9163 sandra.spooner@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dodge Wells +1 202 307 0407 +1 202 514 7361

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

No Logo H. TIMOTHY GEITHNER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Lisette Alexander
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Thomas Stemplewicz

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Christopher Kohn +1 202 514 7450 +1 202 514 9163 chris.kohn@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Craig Lawrence +1 202 514 7159 +1 202 305 0955 craig.lawrence@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Brian New +1 212 637 1049 +1 212 637 2527 jonathan.new@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra Peavler Spooner +1 202 514 7195 +1 202 514 9163 sandra.spooner@usdoj.gov
No Logo JOHN D. LESHY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Lisette Alexander
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth Brandon Shapiro +1 202 862 2270 +1 202 862 2400

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert David Luskin +1 202 457 6190 +1 202 457 6315 rluskin@pattonboggs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry A. Azar, Jr. +1 202 616 8475 +1 202 616 8470 henry.azar@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 06/06/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Fader +1 202 514 3368
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amalia D. Kessler +1 202 305 1759
TERMINATED: 09/05/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Blaze Miller +1 202 307 0184
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Brian New +1 212 637 1049 +1 212 637 2527 jonathan.new@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer dawn Ricketts +1 202 514 3671 +1 202 616 8460 jennifer.d.ricketts@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

No Logo KEN SALAZAR, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Lisette Alexander
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Thomas Stemplewicz

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Christopher Kohn +1 202 514 7450 +1 202 514 9163 chris.kohn@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Craig Lawrence +1 202 514 7159 +1 202 305 0955 craig.lawrence@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Brian New +1 212 637 1049 +1 212 637 2527 jonathan.new@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra Peavler Spooner +1 202 514 7195 +1 202 514 9163 sandra.spooner@usdoj.gov
No Logo KEVIN GOVER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Lisette Alexander
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth Brandon Shapiro +1 202 862 2270 +1 202 862 2400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Thomas Stemplewicz

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry A. Azar, Jr. +1 202 616 8475 +1 202 616 8470 henry.azar@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Charles Cruden +1 202 514 2718 +1 202 514 0057 john.cruden@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 06/06/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Fader +1 202 514 3368
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian L. Ferrell +1 202 305 0428 +1 202 305 0274
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Walter Findlay, III +1 202 305 0447 +1 202 305 0506
TERMINATED: 06/07/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Sutherland Harris +1 202 479 3282 +1 202 514 8780 scott.harris@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 06/20/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amalia D. Kessler +1 202 305 1759
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Christopher Kohn +1 202 514 7450 +1 202 514 9163 chris.kohn@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Craig Lawrence +1 202 514 7159 +1 202 305 0955 craig.lawrence@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/05/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Blaze Miller +1 202 307 0184
TERMINATED: 10/29/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Shaughnessy Most +1 202 616 3353 +1 202 305 0506 john.most@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark E. Nagle +1 202 514 7566 +1 202 514 8780
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Brian New +1 212 637 1049 +1 212 637 2527 jonathan.new@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 10/29/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Mitchell Petrie +1 202 307 0267 +1 202 305 4933 terry.petrie@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer dawn Ricketts +1 202 514 3671 +1 202 616 8460 jennifer.d.ricketts@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 10/29/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jo-Ann Shyloski +1 202 305 0212 +1 202 305 0267 jo-ann.shyloski@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra Peavler Spooner +1 202 514 7195 +1 202 514 9163 sandra.spooner@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

No Logo LARRY ECHOHAWK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Lisette Alexander
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Thomas Stemplewicz

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Christopher Kohn +1 202 514 7450 +1 202 514 9163 chris.kohn@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Craig Lawrence +1 202 514 7159 +1 202 305 0955 craig.lawrence@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Brian New +1 212 637 1049 +1 212 637 2527 jonathan.new@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra Peavler Spooner +1 202 514 7195 +1 202 514 9163 sandra.spooner@usdoj.gov
Summers Lawrence Henry Summers Lawrence Henry, Defendant
Officially listed as "LAWRENCE SUMMERS"
Officer/Director, LendingClub CORP
Square, Inc. Officer/Director, Square, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Charles Cruden +1 202 514 2718 +1 202 514 0057 john.cruden@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Walter Findlay, III +1 202 305 0447 +1 202 305 0506
No Logo MICHAEL G. ROSSETTI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Lisette Alexander
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth Brandon Shapiro +1 202 862 2270 +1 202 862 2400

Toggle Switch Represented by TROUT CACHERIS, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/22/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John T. Richards, Jr. +1 202 464 3300 +1 202 464 3300 jrichards@troutcacheris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Army Judge Advocate General Corps

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/28/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Wallace Fleming +1 202 463 1920 +1 202 463 1925 efleming@troutrichards.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry A. Azar, Jr. +1 202 616 8475 +1 202 616 8470 henry.azar@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 06/06/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Fader +1 202 514 3368
TERMINATED: 06/20/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amalia D. Kessler +1 202 305 1759
TERMINATED: 09/05/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Blaze Miller +1 202 307 0184
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Brian New +1 212 637 1049 +1 212 637 2527 jonathan.new@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer dawn Ricketts +1 202 514 3671 +1 202 616 8460 jennifer.d.ricketts@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

No Logo NEAL MCCALEB, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth Brandon Shapiro +1 202 862 2270 +1 202 862 2400

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B. Michael Rauh +1 202 772 5800 rauh@blankrome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry A. Azar, Jr. +1 202 616 8475 +1 202 616 8470 henry.azar@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Brian New +1 212 637 1049 +1 212 637 2527 jonathan.new@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer dawn Ricketts +1 202 514 3671 +1 202 616 8460 jennifer.d.ricketts@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dodge Wells +1 202 307 0407 +1 202 514 7361

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

No Logo P. LYNN SCARLETT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Edward Kirschman, Jr. +1 202 616 0328 +1 202 514 9163 robert.kirschman@usdoj.gov
No Logo ROBERT E. RUBIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah D. Himmelhoch +1 202 633 3446

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis Steven Wiener +1 202 383 0140 +1 202 637 3593 lewis.wiener@sutherland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tom C. Clark +1 202 514 3553 +1 202 514 4180
TERMINATED: 11/23/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Virginia Cook +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 susan.cook@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Charles Cruden +1 202 514 2718 +1 202 514 0057 john.cruden@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Eschen +1 202 616 4027 +1 202 616 4159 andy.eschen@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian L. Ferrell +1 202 305 0428 +1 202 305 0274
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Walter Findlay, III +1 202 305 0447 +1 202 305 0506
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra Marguerite Schraibman +1 202 514 3315 +1 202 616 8202 sandy.schraibman@usdoj.gov
No Logo Accenture LLP, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily M. Yinger +1 703 610 6161 +1 703 610 6200 emily.yinger@hoganlovells.com
No Logo ALBERT LEE BYNUM, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathaniel Davis Owens +1 256 236 0111 +1 256 236 0151 wwlwms@aol.com
No Logo ANNE SHIELDS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baach Robinson & Lewis PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Dwight Phillip Bostwick +1 202 833 8900 +1 202 466 5738 dwight.bostwick@baachrobinson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Georgia-Pacific Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Melissa Heitmann McNiven +1 202 879 8544 +1 202 737 0157
No Logo BEN CARNES, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by CARNES, BEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BEN CARNES +1 580 212 2916
No Logo BERT T. EDWARDS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Allen Baird +1 202 662 5122 +1 202 778 5122 bbaird@cov.com
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Xavier Imbroscio +1 202 662 5694 +1 202 778 5694 mimbroscio@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole Jo Moss +1 202 220 9600 nmoss@cooperkirk.com
No Logo CHARLES W. FINDLAY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gss Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Scott Smith gsmith@gsslawgroup.com
No Logo CHESTER MILLS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/22/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Lou Soller
No Logo DANIEL MAZELLA, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Aaron Dobrovir +1 540 987 9114 +1 540 987 8169 dobrovirpc@aol.com
No Logo DARYL W. WHITE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buckley Sandler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY David Sidney Krakoff +1 202 349 7950 +1 202 349 8080 dkrakoff@buckleysandler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2007 Ilana Z. Sultan +1 202 551 4485 +1 202 772 9236 isultan@mayerbrownrowe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/09/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY Alessio D. Evangelista +1 202 276 7630 alessio.evangelista@usdoj.gov
No Logo DAVID SHILTON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Albert Gibbons +1 202 420 3644 +1 202 420 2201 GibbonsJ@dicksteinshapiro.com
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven John Roman +1 202 420 4759 +1 202 420 2201 romans@dicksteinshapiro.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SCHERTLER & ONORATO, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Freiman Fishberg +1 202 628 4199 +1 202 628 4177 lfishberg@schertlerlaw.com
No Logo DAVID SHUEY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by NATHANS & BIDDLE, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W. Biddle +1 410 783 0272 +1 410 783 0518 biddle@nathanslaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry Allen Nathans +1 410 783 0272 +1 410 783 0518 nathans@nathanslaw.com
No Logo DEBORAH MADDOX, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by ZWERLING, LEIBIG & MOSELEY, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/05/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa B. Kemler +1 703 684 8000 +1 703 684 9700 lisa@zwerling.com
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Movant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian L. Ferrell +1 202 305 0428 +1 202 305 0274
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Mitchell Petrie +1 202 307 0267 +1 202 305 4933 terry.petrie@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Joseph Siemietkowski +1 202 514 3368 +1 202 514 9163 john.siemietkowski@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gino D. Vissicchio +1 202 307 3242 +1 202 307 0494 gino.vissicchio@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 11/25/2008 John Warshawsky +1 202 307 0010 +1 202 514 9163 john.warshawsky@usdoj.gov
No Logo DOMINIC NESSI, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen M. Byers +1 202 624 2878 +1 202 628 5116 sbyers@crowell.com
TERMINATED: 04/21/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fredrick Ryan Keith +1 502 564 5576 frkeith@crowell.com
No Logo DONNELLY R. VILLEGAS, Movant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DONNELLY R. VILLEGAS
No Logo Dow Jones & Company, Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan K. Tycko +1 202 995 8500 +1 202 973 0950

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Cys +1 202 973 4217 +1 202 973 4499 rickcys2000@gmail.com
No Logo EDDIE JACOBS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 2322

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDDIE JACOBS +1 405 524 4215 +A REA CODE405
No Logo EDITH R. BLACKWELL, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Bromwich +1 202 639 7297 +1 202 639 7003
No Logo ELENI M. CONSTANTINE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by janisschuelke.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence H. Wechsler +1 202 861 0600 +1 202 223 7230
No Logo Banks, Frederick H., Movant
Officially listed as "FREDERICK H. BANKS"

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space FREDERICK H. BANKS
No Logo GLEN GILLETT, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by 1050 17th Street NW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith Lynne Wheat +1 202 496 4963 +1 202 587 2980 judithlwheat@wheatwulaw.com
No Logo GLENN SCHUMAKER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sydney Jean Hoffmann +1 202 262 8444 sydneyhoffmann@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Army Judge Advocate General Corps

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Plato Cacheris +1 202 464 3303 +1 202 464 3319 pcacheris@troutrichards.com
No Logo HART M. ROSSMAN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan I. Baron +1 202 457 5915 +1 202 955 5564 Alan.Baron@hklaw.com
No Logo HARVEST INSTITUTE FREEDMEN FEDERATION, LLC, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Percy Squire Company, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Percy Squire +1 614 224 6528 +1 614 224 6529 ecf@dcd.uscourts.gov
No Logo HILDA MANUEL, Movant
No Logo INGRID D. FALANGA, Movant
No Logo INTERTRIBAL MONITORING ASSOCIATION FOR INDIAN TRUST FUNDS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by NORDHAUS, HALTOM, TAYLOR, TARADASH & BLADH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/01/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Elise Grant +1 202 530 1270 +1 202 530 1920 jgrant@nordhauslaw.com
No Logo J. STEVEN GRILES, Movant

Represented by Bancroft PLLC

No Logo JAMES A. EICHNER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara Ann Van Gelder +1 202 739 5256 +1 202 739 3001 bvangelder@morganlewis.com
No Logo JAMES DOUGLAS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/21/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Kathleen Elizabeth Voelker +1 202 835 2220 kathleenvoelker@aol.com
No Logo JAMES E. CASON, Movant

Represented by Bancroft PLLC

No Logo JAMES REGAN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David Booth Beers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Booth Beers
No Logo James, Simon, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by FELDESMAN TUCKER LEIFER FIDELL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/22/2007 Eugene R. Fidell +1 202 466 8960 +1 202 293 8103 efidell@feldesmantucker.com
No Logo JOHN A. BRYSON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Albert Gibbons +1 202 420 3644 +1 202 420 2201 GibbonsJ@dicksteinshapiro.com
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven John Roman +1 202 420 4759 +1 202 420 2201 romans@dicksteinshapiro.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SCHERTLER & ONORATO, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Freiman Fishberg +1 202 628 4199 +1 202 628 4177 lfishberg@schertlerlaw.com
No Logo John Berry, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sydney Jean Hoffmann +1 202 262 8444 sydneyhoffmann@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Army Judge Advocate General Corps

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Plato Cacheris +1 202 464 3303 +1 202 464 3319 pcacheris@troutrichards.com
No Logo JOHN S. MOST, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Berliner Corcoran & Rowe, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Edward Wilson +202293 555 5ext340 +1 202 293 9035 twilson@bcr-dc.com
No Logo KENNETH F. ROSSMAN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by London & Mead

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Bowmar Mead +1 202 331 3334 +1 202 785 4280 cmead@londonandmead.com
No Logo KENNETH PAQUIN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/10/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Joe Smith +1 202 639 6000 +1 901 763 2976

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/02/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jefferson McClure Gray +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 3124 jefferson.m.gray@usdoj.gov
No Logo KENNETH RUSSELL, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/10/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Joe Smith +1 202 639 6000 +1 901 763 2976

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/02/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jefferson McClure Gray +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 3124 jefferson.m.gray@usdoj.gov
No Logo KIMBERLY CRAVEN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Frank, Theordore H.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore H. Frank +1 703 203 3848 tfrank@gmail.com
No Logo LEATRICE TANNER-BROWN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Percy Squire Company, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Percy Squire +1 614 224 6528 +1 614 224 6529 ecf@dcd.uscourts.gov
No Logo LOIS J. SCHIFFER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Donell Robinson +1 202 659 7205 +1 202 466 5738

Toggle Switch Represented by Georgia-Pacific Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Melissa Heitmann McNiven +1 202 879 8544 +1 202 737 0157
No Logo M. SHARON BLACKWELL, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Bromwich +1 202 639 7297 +1 202 639 7003
No Logo MICHAEL B. JANDREAU, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by OLSSON, FRANK & WEEDA, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marshall L. Matz +1 202 789 1212
No Logo MICHAEL CARR, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/26/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Christopher Cook +1 202 879 3734 +1 202 626 1700 ccook@jonesday.com
TERMINATED: 03/24/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J. Lovrien +1 202 879 3939
No Logo MICHAEL J. QUINN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Lee Blalack, II +1 202 383 5300 +1 202 383 5414 lblalack@omm.com
No Logo MICHAEL P. BENTZEN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes and Bentzen PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Joseph Hughes +1 202 293 8975 +1 202 293 8973 ghughes@hughesbentzen.com
No Logo National Congress Of American Indians, Movant
No Logo NATIVE AMERICAN INDUSTRIAL DISTRIBUTORS, INC., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil James Ruther +1 410 337 6888 +1 410 583 2437 njruther@aol.com
No Logo PETER D. COPPELMAN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Merovitz, Cedar & Gruber, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley McKennett Brand +1 202 662 9700 +1 202 737 7565 sbrand@brandlawgroup.com
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Dewald Herman +1 202 662 9700 +1 202 737 7565 aherman@brandlawgroup.com
No Logo PHILLIP A. BROOKS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Dixon & Bell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura C. Zimmitti +1 202 662 2072 +1 202 662 2190

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William H. Briggs, Jr. +1 202 662 2063 +1 202 654 5804 bill.briggs@troutmansanders.com
No Logo Randall, Lewis, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pamela J. Marple +1 202 514 1944
No Logo RICHARD J. PIERCE, JR., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by The George Washington University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Turley +1 202 994 7001 +1 202 994 9811 jturley@law.gwu.edu
No Logo ROBERT LAMB, Movant
No Logo ROBERTA MCINERNEY, Movant
No Logo SABRINA MCCARTHY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley S. Lui +1 202 887 8766 +1 202 887 0763 blui@mofo.com
No Logo SARAH HIMMELHOCH, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Salerno +1 202 861 3900
No Logo STEVEN SWANSON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/22/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Lenard Barrett Boss +1 202 912 4800 +1 202 912 4830 bboss@cozen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kerri L. Ruttenberg +1 202 986 8141 +1 202 956 3263 kruttenberg@dl.com
No Logo TERRANCE VIRDEN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Lou Soller
No Logo TERRY PETRIE, Movant

Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

No Logo TERRY STEELE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Kenneth Zwerling +1 703 684 7900
No Logo TIMOTHY S. ELLIOTT, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ober, Kaler, Grimes & Shriver, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2007 Martha Purcell Rogers +1 202 326 5050 +1 202 408 0640 mrogers@ober.com
No Logo TOM C. CLARK, II, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Goodstein +1 202 616 6521 +1 202 686 4843

Toggle Switch Represented by Resolution Law Group, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/06/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie B. Kaplan +1 202 686 4844 +1 202 686 4843 julie.kaplan@reslawgrp.com
United States of America United States of America, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Patrick Garren +1 202 616 4171
No Logo W. HORD TIPTON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/22/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Michael Sullivan, Jr. +1 202 663 8000 +1 202 663 8007 wsullivan@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo WILLA B. PERLMUTTER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Leonard Gardner +1 202 244 4509 +1 202 739 3001 gard7180@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/22/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Michael Privor +1 202 739 5283 +1 202 739 3001 bprivor@morganlewis.com
No Logo WILLIAM A. MONROE, Movant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. MONROE
No Logo WILLIAM G. MYERS, III, Movant
No Logo WILLIAM WARRIOR, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Percy Squire Company, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Percy Squire +1 614 224 6528 +1 614 224 6529 ecf@dcd.uscourts.gov
No Logo Alan Lee Balaran, Special Master

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Lee Balaran +1 202 466 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by HELLER, HURON, CHERTKOF, LERNER, SIMON & SALMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas B. Huron +1 202 293 8090 +1 202 293 7110 huron@hellerhuron.com
No Logo ASSINIBOINE AND SIOUX TRIBES OF THE FORT PECK INDIAN RESERVATION, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Endreson & Perry, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Doris Noto +1 202 682 0240 +1 202 682 0249 anoto@sonosky.com
No Logo QUAPAW TRIBE OF OKLAHOMA, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/02/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry Rose +1 202 887 0467 +1 202 887 6999 henryrose@mac.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CAMERON MCKENNA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/21/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy S. Koch +1 202 466 0060

Toggle Switch Represented by Marzulla Law, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancie Gail Marzulla +1 202 822 6760 +1 202 822 6774 nancie@marzulla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WRIGHTSMAN MANSION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason B. Aamodt +1 918 583 6100
No Logo JOEL HURFORD, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by AVERY DOOLEY POST & AVERY, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/22/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter H. Noone +1 617 489 5300 +1 617 489 0085 pnoone@averydooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Loren W. Hershey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/22/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William W. Nickerson +1 202 349 3877 +1 202 349 3915
No Logo KATHLEEN CLARKE, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by AVERY DOOLEY POST & AVERY, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/22/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter H. Noone +1 617 489 5300 +1 617 489 0085 pnoone@averydooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Loren W. Hershey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/22/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William W. Nickerson +1 202 349 3877 +1 202 349 3915
No Logo RONNIE LEVINE, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by HELLER, HURON, CHERTKOF, LERNER, SIMON & SALMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/22/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas B. Huron +1 202 293 8090 +1 202 293 7110 huron@hellerhuron.com
TERMINATED: 08/22/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tammany Morgan Kramer +1 202 293 8090 +1 202 293 7110 tkramer@hellerhuron.com
TERMINATED: 08/22/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Salzman +1 202 293 8090 +1 202 293 7110 salzman@hellerhuron.com
No Logo VERLITA SUGAR, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Susan Work

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Robert Membrino, Jr. +1 202 973 1200 +1 202 973 1212 jmembrino@hallestill.com
No Logo MARK KESTER BROWN, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall A. Brater
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Kester Brown +1 310 739 3900 +1 775 542 4938 mkesterbrown@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/16/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric S. Baxter +1 202 349 7221 +1 202 955 0090 ebaxter@becketfund.org
No Logo Native American Rights Fund, Intervenor

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

No Logo OSAGE NATION, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Tuite +1 202 887 4000 +1 202 887 4288 jtuite@akingump.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (4368) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4438 Filed: 9/30/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4437 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Motion for Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4436 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4435 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4434 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4433 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4432 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Motion for Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4431 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4430 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Motion for Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4429 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4428 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4427 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: None Motion for Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4426 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4425 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4424 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4423 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4422 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4421 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4420 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Stipulation
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4419 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4418 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4417 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4416 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Special Master Report
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4415 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4414 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4413 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4412 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4411 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4410 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4409 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4408 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4407 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4406 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4405 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4404 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4403 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4402 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4401 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4400 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4399 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4398 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4397 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4396 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4395 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4394 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4393 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4392 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4391 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4390 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4389 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4388 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4387 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4386 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4385 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4384 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4383 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4382 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4381 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4380 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4379 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4378 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4377 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4376 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4375 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4374 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4373 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4372 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4371 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4370 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4369 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4368 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4367 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4366 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4365 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4364 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4363 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4362 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4361 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4360 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4359 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4358 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4357 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4356 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4355 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4354 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4353 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4352 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4351 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4350 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4349 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4348 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4347 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4346 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4345 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4344 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4343 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4342 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4341 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4340 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4339 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4338 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4337 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4336 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4335 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4334 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4333 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4332 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4331 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4330 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4329 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4328 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4327 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4326 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4325 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4324 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4323 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4322 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4321 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4320 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4319 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4318 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Periodic Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4317 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4316 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4315 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4314 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4313 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4312 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4311 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4310 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4309 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4308 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4307 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4306 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4305 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4304 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4303 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4302 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4301 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4300 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4299 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4298 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4297 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4295 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4294 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4293 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4292 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4291 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4290 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4289 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4288 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4287 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Notice of Cross Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4286 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4285 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4284 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4283 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4282 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4281 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4280 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4279 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4278 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4277 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4276 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4275 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Special Master Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4274 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4273 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4272 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4271 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4270 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4269 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4268 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4267 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4266 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4265 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4264 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4263 Filed: 2/25/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4262 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4261 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4260 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4259 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4258 Filed: 2/19/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4257 Filed: 2/19/2017, Entered: None Alter Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4256 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4255 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4254 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4253 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4252 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4251 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4250 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4249 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4248 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4247 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4246 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4245 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Special Master Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4244 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4243 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Special Master Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4242 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Special Master Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4241 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4240 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4239 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4238 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4237 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4236 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4235 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4234 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4233 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4232 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4231 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4191 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4190 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4189 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4188 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4187 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4186 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4185 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4184 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4183 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4182 Filed: 3/19/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4181 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4180 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4179 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4178 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4177 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4176 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4175 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4174 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4173 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4172 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4171 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4170 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Unseal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4169 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4168 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4167 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4166 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4165 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4164 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4163 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4162 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4161 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4160 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4159 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4158 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4157 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4156 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4155 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4154 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Special Master Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4153 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4152 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4151 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4150 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4149 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4148 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4147 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4146 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4145 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4144 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4143 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4142 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4141 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4139 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4138 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4137 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4136 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4135 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4134 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4133 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4132 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4131 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4130 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4129 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4128 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4127 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4126 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4125 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4124 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4123 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4122 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4121 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4120 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4119 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4118 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4117 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4116 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4115 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4114 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4113 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4112 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4111 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4110 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4109 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4107 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4106 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4105 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4104 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4102 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4100 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Special Master Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4092 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4091 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4090 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4089 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4088 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4087 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4086 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4085 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4084 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4083 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations of Special Master
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4082 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4081 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4080 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Special Master Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4079 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4078 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4077 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4076 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Report and Recommendation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4074 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4073 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4072 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4071 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4071 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to Judge Thomas F. Hogan from Blanca Marie Gomez "Let this be filed in case #96cv1285 Cobell v. Jewell" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan (Attachments: # 1 Names and Dates of Births of Claimants) (zrdj) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4070 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4070 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection to Special Master determination by Blanca Marie Gomez "Let this be filed in case #96cv1285 Cobell v. Jewell" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan (Attachments: # 1 Names and Dates of Births of Claimants)(rdj) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4069 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4068 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4067 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4066 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4065 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4064 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4063 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4062 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4061 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4060 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4059 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4058 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4057 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4056 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4056 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION under 28 U.S.C. Statute l346(b) questioning distribution of settlement based upon formula or the Midwest Land Royalties Earnings by CLAYTON S. CREEK "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan (rdj) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4055 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order to Approve Payment to Special Master for June 2014 Invoice by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JAMS June 2014 Invoice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4054 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT Regarding Progress on Efforts to Commence Trust Administration Class Payments by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Dorris, William) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4053 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS. Attorney J. Christopher Kohn terminated. (Quinn, Michael) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4052 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 4039 MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS MOTION REQUESTING THE SPECIAL MASTER TO AUTHORIZE THE DEPOSIT OF HISTORICAL ACCOUNTING AND TRUST ADMINISTRATION CLASS PAYMENTS OWED TO THE HEIRS OF A DECEASED CLASS MEMBER INTO AN IIM ACCOUNT FOR THAT MEMBER WHERE THERE filed by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL. (Smith, David) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4051 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPROVE PAYMENT TO THE SPECIAL MASTER by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JAMS May Invoice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4050 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 4039 MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS MOTION REQUESTING THE SPECIAL MASTER TO AUTHORIZE THE DEPOSIT OF HISTORICAL ACCOUNTING AND TRUST ADMINISTRATION CLASS PAYMENTS OWED TO THE HEIRS OF A DECEASED CLASS MEMBER INTO AN IIM ACCOUNT FOR THAT MEMBER WHERE THERE , Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion Seeking to Authorize the Deposit of Settlement Payments into IIM Accounts for Certain Deceased Class Members filed by ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - E-Mail (11/05/2012))(Quinn, Michael) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4049 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ELOUISE PEPION COBELL. Attorney Keith M. Harper terminated. (Harper, Keith) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4048 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT PLAINTIFFS' MAY 30, 2014 STATUS REPORT TO THE COURT by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL. (Smith, David) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4047 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 4042 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on 5/29/14. (Levie, Richard) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4046 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER granting 4039 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Levie (Ret.) on 5/29/14. (Levie, Richard) Modified on 5/30/2014 to enter in error per the filer.(ztnr, ) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4045 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 4041 MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPROVE PAYMENT TO THE SPECIAL MASTER; Upon consideration of Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to approve payment to the Special Master of his invoice for work performed and expenses incurred in April 2014 [Dkt. No. ], it is hereby ordered, adjudged, and decreed as follows: In accordance with the Settlement Agreement and the Order of this Court appointing the Honorable Richard Levie (ret.) as Special Master, Plaintiffs unopposed motion to authorize payment to JAMS, Inc. from the Accounting/Trust Administration Fund in the sum of $28,076.00 for worked performed and expenses incurred in this matter in April 2014 is herebyGRANTED. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/28/2014. (tcb) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4044 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 4043 MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS MOTION, WITHOUT OPPOSITION FROM DEFENDANTS, TO ALLOW COMMENCEMENT OF TRUST ADMINISTRATION CLASS DISTRIBUTIONS PRIOR TO EXPIRATION OF APPEALS; it is hereby ORDERED that the Claims Administrator shall be permitted to commence distribution of Trust Administration Class payments before final decisions on appeals by claimants seeking review of adverse determinations of the Claims Administrator regarding eligibility for participation in the settlement. Prior to commencement of Trust Administration payments, the Plaintiffs shall present to the Court a proposed order setting forth the amount of the distribution, and all amounts being withheld from distribution including projected expenses, claims subject to pending appeals, and the Reserve Fund set forth in the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/28/2014. (tcb) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4043 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS MOTION, WITHOUT OPPOSITION FROM DEFENDANTS, TO ALLOW COMMENCEMENT OF TRUST ADMINISTRATION CLASS DISTRIBUTIONS PRIOR TO EXPIRATION OF APPEALS by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4042 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS MOTION, WITHOUT OPPOSITION FROM DEFENDANTS, TO USE OTHER APPROVED MEANS TO DISTRIBUTE FUNDS DUE HEIRS OF DECEASED CLASS MEMBERS WHERE THE CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR HAS RECEIVED WRITTEN NOTICE THAT SETTLEMENT FUNDS MAY NOT HAVE BEEN PROPERLY DISTRIBUTED THROUGH SMALL ESTATE PROCEDURES by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4041 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPROVE PAYMENT TO THE SPECIAL MASTER by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JAMS April Invoice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4040 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 4038 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (jf, ) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4039 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS MOTION REQUESTING THE SPECIAL MASTER TO AUTHORIZE THE DEPOSIT OF HISTORICAL ACCOUNTING AND TRUST ADMINISTRATION CLASS PAYMENTS OWED TO THE HEIRS OF A DECEASED CLASS MEMBER INTO AN IIM ACCOUNT FOR THAT MEMBER WHERE THERE IS A FEDERAL ESTATE OPEN AND PENDING FOR THAT CLASS MEMBER OR WHERE A FEDERAL ESTATE WILL IN THE FUTURE BE OPEN FOR THAT CLASS MEMBER, AND NO PROBATE ORDER OR OTHER DISTRIBUTION DOCUMENTATION HAS BEEN RECEIVED by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4038 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 4034 Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-3718815. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Smith, David) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4037 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPROVE PAYMENT TO SPECIAL MASTER by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JAMS Invoice - March 2014, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4036 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPROVE PAYMENT TO THE SPECIAL MASTER by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JAMS Invoice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4035 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER attached denying without prejudice 3931 Plaintiffs' Motion to Release Escrowed Funds and granting 3967 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Unauthorized Supplemental Brief of Petitioner Mark Kester Brown. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on March 20, 2013. (lctfh2) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4034 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 3839 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Class Representatives' Expense Application. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on March 20, 2014. (lctfh2) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4033 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on March 20, 2014. (lctfh2) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4032 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS. Attorney Robert E. Kirschman, Jr terminated. (Quinn, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4031 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order Plaintiffs' Motion to Approve Payment to Special Master by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JAMS Invoice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4030 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER attached granting 4014 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Include and Authorize Payment to Additional Individuals in the Historical Accounting Class. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on January 23, 2014. (lctfh2) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4029 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APPROVE PAYMENT TO SPECIAL MASTER by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 11/27/2013 Invoice, # 2 Exhibit B - 12/31/2013 Invoice, # 3 Exhibit C - 12/31/2013 Credit, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4028 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CLARIFICATION REGARDING THEIR MOTION TO APPROVE AN INTERIM PAYMENT TO CLASS COUNSEL FOR POST SETTLEMENT FEES by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL re 3975 MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO APPROVE AN INTERIM PAYMENT TO CLASS COUNSEL FOR POST-SETTLEMENT FEES AND EXPENSES, 3979 Affidavit,, (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit William E. Dorris)(Dorris, William) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4027 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 03/18/13; Page Numbers: 1-51. Date of Issuance:12/30/13. Court Reporter/Transcriber Crystal M. Pilgrim, Telephone number 202.354.3127, Court Reporter Email Address : crystalpilgrim@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/30/2014.(Pilgrim, Crystal) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4026 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 4016 MOTION to Intervene filed by INDIAN LAND TENURE FOUNDATION. (Rosario, Iris) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4025 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE re 4016 MOTION to Intervene PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO THE MOTION OF THE INDIAN LAND TENURE FOUNDATION TO INTERVENE filed by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL. (Smith, David) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4024 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 4016 MOTION to Intervene filed by ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS. (Quinn, Michael) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4023 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 4020 Motion for Order signed by Hon. Richard A. Levie (Ret.), Special Master, on 12/10/2013. (Levie, Richard) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4022 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 4019 Motion for Order signed by Hon. Richard A. Levie (Ret.), Special Master, on 12/10/2013. (Levie, Richard) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4021 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 4018 Motion signed by Hon. Richard A. Levie (Ret.), Special Master, on 12/10/2013. (Levie, Richard) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4020 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO AUTHORIZE THE CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR TO MAKE PAYMENTS DIRECTLY TO CLASS MEMBERS DEEMED WHEREABOUTS UNKNOWN BY THE DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR FOR WHOM IT HAS CONTACT INFORMATION by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4019 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Order Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion Permitting Identification of Heirs by a Tribal Government in the Distribution of Settlement Funds to Estates and Heirs of Deceased Class Members by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Example of documentation from tribal govts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4018 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed Motion Permitting The Use In Certain Circumstances Of Information Set Forth In Form OHA-7 In The Distribution Of Settlement Funds To Heirs Of Deceased Class Members by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted Form OHA-7, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) Modified on 12/8/2013 (jf, ). (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4017 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Iris Figueroa Rosario, V on behalf of Indian Land Tenure Foundation (Rosario, Iris) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4016 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene by Indian Land Tenure Foundation (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosario, Iris) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4015 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING THE QUALIFIED BANK TO PAY THE CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Invoice No. 14677, # 2 Exhibit Invoice No. 14840, # 3 Exhibit Invoice No. 15355, # 4 Exhibit Invoice No. 15356, # 5 Exhibit Invoice No. 15357, # 6 Exhibit Invoice No. 15358, # 7 Exhibit Invoice No. 15463, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4014 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION TO INCLUDE AND AUTHORIZE PAYMENTS TO ADDITIONAL HISTORICAL ACCOUNTING CLASS MEMBERS by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Herman Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Long Form Notice to Class Members, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) Modified on 11/30/2013 (jf, ). (Entered: 11/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4013 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CLARIFY AUTHORITY TO PAY VALID CLAIMS OF THIRD PARTIES by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4012 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 3975 MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO APPROVE AN INTERIM PAYMENT TO CLASS COUNSEL FOR POST-SETTLEMENT FEES AND EXPENSES PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO THEIR MOTION TO APPROVE AN INTERIM PAYMENT TO CLASS COUNSEL filed by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Jennifer M. Keough)(Smith, David) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4011 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Kimberly Craven. " Let This Be Filed" signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 10/28/13. (ldc, ) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4010 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 3980 MOTION to Intervene filed by LANNAN FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Goeke, Reginald) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4009 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO APROVE PAYMENT TO THE NOTICE CONTRACTOR by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Invoice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4008 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 3987 MOTION for Hearing re 3975 MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO APPROVE AN INTERIM PAYMENT TO CLASS COUNSEL FOR POST-SETTLEMENT FEES AND EXPENSES PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO INTERVENOR MARK BROWN'S MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE filed by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4007 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Gail Williams; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4006 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Alan Owens; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4005 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Lisa Kay Harjo-Wesley; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4004 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Tana Renee' Waters; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4003 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Serenity Alexander; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4002 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from James A. BigHorn; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4001 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Louella Patterson; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4000 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Tim Chalepah; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3999 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Chastity Alexander; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3998 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Eternity Alexander; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3997 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Princeton Alexander, II; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3996 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Barbara C. Johnson; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3995 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Waylon Bishop; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3994 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTERED IN ERROR.....Letter from Leigh Ann Spears; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) Modified on 10/21/13 (kk). (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3993 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....Letter from Chris Leith, Jr.; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) Modified on 10/21/13 (kk). (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3992 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letters (3) from Robert Spears, Chris Leith, Jr. and Leigh Ann Spears; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) (Main Document 3992 replaced and modified on 10/21/13) (kk). (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3991 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Marilyn Gipson; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3990 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Georgette Long Abrahamson; "Let this be filed" by Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (kk) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3989 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3988 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3987 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3986 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3985 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: 10/8/2013 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3984 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: 9/25/2013 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3983 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3982 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3981 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3980 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3979 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT re 3975 MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO APPROVE AN INTERIM PAYMENT TO CLASS COUNSEL FOR POST-SETTLEMENT FEES AND EXPENSES AFFIDAVIT OF WILLIAM E. DORRIS by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Hourly Billing Rates, # 2 Exhibit Post-Settlement Fee Details, # 3 Exhibit Post-Settlement Expense Details, # 4 Exhibit Post-Settlement Expense Support (1 of 4), # 5 Exhibit Post-Settlement Expense Support (2 of 4), # 6 Exhibit Post-Settlement Expense Support (3 of 4), # 7 Exhibit Post-Settlement Expense Support (4 of 4))(Dorris, William) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3978 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT re 3975 MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO APPROVE AN INTERIM PAYMENT TO CLASS COUNSEL FOR POST-SETTLEMENT FEES AND EXPENSES AFFIDAVIT OF GEOFFREY REMPEL by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL. (Dorris, William) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3977 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT re 3975 MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO APPROVE AN INTERIM PAYMENT TO CLASS COUNSEL FOR POST-SETTLEMENT FEES AND EXPENSES DECLARATION OF PAUL F. BRINKMAN by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL. (Dorris, William) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3976 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT re 3975 MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO APPROVE AN INTERIM PAYMENT TO CLASS COUNSEL FOR POST-SETTLEMENT FEES AND EXPENSES AFFIDAVIT OF DENNIS M. GINGOLD by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL. (Dorris, William) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3975 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO APPROVE AN INTERIM PAYMENT TO CLASS COUNSEL FOR POST-SETTLEMENT FEES AND EXPENSES by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summary, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorris, William) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3974 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 9/7/2013 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3973 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3972 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3971 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: 8/13/2013 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3970 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: 8/9/2013 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3969 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 7/31/2013 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER attached granting 3966 Motion for Order Permitting the Use of Probate Orders Entered Pursuant to 25 CFR 11.700. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 29, 2013. (lctfh2) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3968 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013 Reply to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY re 3965 Supplemental Memorandum, Corrected Declaration of Mark Brown with Exhibits filed by MARK KESTER BROWN. (Brater, Randall) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3967 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Unauthorized Supplemental Brief of Petitioner Mark Brown by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3966 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: 7/25/2013 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Order to Permit the Use of Probate Orders Entered Pursuant to 25 C.F.R. § 11.700 et seq. for the Distribution of Settlement Funds to Heirs of Deceased Class Members by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 25 C.F.R. § 11.700 et seq, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3965 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: 7/19/2013 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 3699 Response to Document, Petitioner Mark Kester Brown's Supplemental Brief in Support of His Attorneys' Fees Application filed by MARK KESTER BROWN. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Brown with Exhibits, # 2 Declaration of Steven Haskins with Exhibits, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Brater, Randall) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3964 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SPECIAL MASTER ORDER NO. 2 permitting the use of federal probate orders in the distribution of settlement funds to estates and heirs of deceased class members re 3962 motion to permit the use of federal probate orders signed on 7/16/13 by Hon. Richard A. Levie (Ret.), Special Master; please see order for full details.(ztnr, ) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3963 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SPECIAL MASTER ORDER NO. 1 permitting the use of small estate procedures for the distribution of settlement proceeds to estates and heirs of deceased class members re 3960 & 3961 motions to permit the use of small estate procedures signed on 7/16/13 by Hon. Richard A. Levie (Ret.), Special Master; please see order for full details. (ztnr, ) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3962 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order Motion to Permit the Use of Federal Probate Orders in the Distribution of Settlment Funds to Estates and Heirs of Deceased Class Members by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 25 U.S.C. § 2206)(Smith, David) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3961 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order Second Motion to Permit the Use of Small Estate Procedures for the Distribution of Settlement Proceeds to Estates and Heirs of Deceased Class Members by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Alaska, # 2 Exhibit Idaho, # 3 Exhibit Indiana, # 4 Exhibit Kansas, # 5 Exhibit Louisiana, # 6 Exhibit Michigan, # 7 Exhibit New Mexico, # 8 Exhibit Virginia)(Smith, David) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3960 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Permit the Use of Small Estate Procedures for the Distribution of Settlement Proceeds to Estates and Heirs of Deceased Class Members by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Arizona, # 2 Exhibit Arkansas, # 3 Exhibit California, # 4 Exhibit Colorado, # 5 Exhibit Minnesota, # 6 Exhibit Montana, # 7 Exhibit Nebraska, # 8 Exhibit Nevada, # 9 Exhibit North Dakota, # 10 Exhibit Oklahoma, # 11 Exhibit Oregon, # 12 Exhibit South Dakota, # 13 Exhibit Texas, # 14 Exhibit Utah, # 15 Exhibit Washington, # 16 Exhibit Wisconsin)(Smith, David) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3959 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: 6/24/2013 Reply to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY re 3956 Notice of Supplemental Information and Correction filed by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL. (Smith, David) Modified on 6/25/2013 to correct linkage (rdj). (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3958 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 3955 Unopposed Motion to Modify Distribution of Settlement Proceeds to Estates and Heirs of Deceased Class Members; signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/18/13. (kk) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3957 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re 3956 Notice (Other), Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Informaton and Correction Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Class Representatives' Expense Application filed by ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS. (Quinn, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3956 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Information and Correction Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Class Representatives' Expense Application by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Stainbrook, # 2 Affidavit Johnson)(Smith, David) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3955 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Order to Modify Distribution of Settlement Proceeds to Estates and Heirs of Deceased Class Members by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3954 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: 5/20/2013 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order Plaintiffs' Unooposed Motion to Approve Payment to Claims Administrator by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit GCG Invoices, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3953 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard de Bodo (de Bodo, Richard) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3952 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 03/18/13; Page Numbers: 1-51. Date of Issuance:04/26/13. Court Reporter/Transcriber Crystal M. Pilgrim, Telephone number 202.354.3127, Court Reporter Email Address : crystalpilgrim@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/17/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2013.(Pilgrim, Crystal) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3951 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Approve Payment to Special Master by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JAMS, Inc. Invoice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3950 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: 4/10/2013 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 3949 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Modify Aspects of Class Action Administration, signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/9/13. (kk) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3949 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: 4/5/2013 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Modify Aspects of Class Action Administration by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3948 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013 Case Referred to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE DIRECTLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for mediation of attorneys' fees for Intervenors Mark Brown and NARF. (kb) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3947 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/18/2013 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT TO SPECIAL MASTER : granting 3944 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Approve Payment to Special Master from the Accounting/Trust Administration Fund in the sum of $11,390.00 for work performed and expenses incurred in this matter in January 2013; signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/18/13. (kk) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3946 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/18/2013 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 3943 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Pay the Claims Administrator; directing that J.P. Morgan, the qualifying bank, shall pay to the Garden City Group, Inc., the claims administrator, $8,593,099.52 from the Accounting/Trust Administration Fund for work that the Garden City Group, Inc. has performed under the Settlement Agreement through 12/31/12; signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/18/13. (kk) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3945 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable : Type of Document Returned: Order Appointing Special Master 3928 , filed 12/19/12, addressed to The Honorable Richard A. Levie. Document not re-mailed as no forwarding address was provided. (kk) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3944 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: 2/19/2013 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Approve Payment to Special Master by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - JAMS Invoice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3943 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: 2/8/2013 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order Unopposed Motion to Pay the Claims Administrator by ELOUISE PEPION COBELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - GCC Invoice 14007, # 2 Exhibit 2 - GCC Invoice 14008, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, David) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace