Bassani v. Triomphe Restaurant Corp. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00247
District Judge Sidney H. Stein, presiding

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joseph Bassani, Plaintiff

Represented by Vladeck, Waldman, Elias & Engelhard, PC

v.
No Logo Jean-Georges Management, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mercedes Colwin +21220167 77x 269 5500 +2122016 778 269 5505 mcolwin@gordonrees.com
No Logo Jean-Georges Vongerichten, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mercedes Colwin +21220167 77x 269 5500 +2122016 778 269 5505 mcolwin@gordonrees.com
No Logo Triomphe Restaurant Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mercedes Colwin +21220167 77x 269 5500 +2122016 778 269 5505 mcolwin@gordonrees.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: This action is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice and with no reward of attorneys' fees, costs, or disbursements by the Court to any party. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/2/08) (db) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Anne L. Clark dated 12/12/07 re: a request that the Court extend the time set forth in the 11/13/07 order of dismissal through 1/2/2007. ENDORSEMENT: Any request to reopen the matter must be made by 1/2/2007. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/13/07) (kco) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Anne L. Clark dated 11/12/2007 re: request that the Court extend the time set forth in the 10/19/2007 Order of Dismissal through 12/18/2007. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Any requests to reopen the action must be made by 12/18/2007. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 11/13/2007) (jar) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER: The parties having notified the Court that this action has been settled, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs; provided, however, that within 30 days of this Order, any party may reinstate this action if the terms of the settlement are not effectuated within that time. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/19/07) (tro) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Anne L. Clark dated 9/11/07 re: counsel requests that the October 19, 2007 status conference be rescheduled for a later date. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to Oct. 26, 2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/11/07) (djc) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sideney H. Stein from Mercedes Colwin dated 8/31/07 re: Request for an extension of the discovery/pretrial conference deadline. ENDORSEMENT: Last day for discovery extended to 11/30. Status conf adjourned to 10/19 at 11 am.Discovery due by 11/30/2007. Status Conference set for 10/19/2007 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/4/07) (cd) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
              NOTICE SELECTING MEDIATOR - Notice of selection of mediator.(sc) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Mercedes Colwin dated 8/15/2007 re: both parties request an earlier mediation date.. ENDORSEMENT: The mediation office is attempting to schedule an earlier mediation. If the parties do not hear from that office by 9/4/2007, they are to call chambers (805-0192) and seek a telephonic conference. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/17/2007) (jar) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER CASE ELIGIBLE FOR MEDIATION...the above-entitled action is eligible for mediation, pursuant to the Civil Justice Expense and Delay Reduction Plan. This action is eligible for mediation subject to the limitations and restrictions as noted: All issues are eligible. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/8/2007) (jar) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF CONFIDENTIALITY. Regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. The Confidentiality Order may be modified for good cause shown. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/6/2007) (jpo) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER. There will be a pretrial conference on September 20, 2007, at 11:00 a.m. The last day for completion of discovery remains at October 1, 2007 (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/27/07) (djc) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER:Deposition due by 10/1/2007,Discovery due by 10/1/2007, this scheduling order may be altered or amended only by showing of good cause not foreseeable at the date thereof. Counsel should assume that further extensions will not be granted. Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/12/2007) (jmi) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of answer, rule 7.1 statement served on Anne L. Clark, Esq. on 3/29/2007. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Triomphe Restaurant Corp., Jean-Georges Management, LLC, Jean-Georges Vongerichten. (Colwin, Mercedes) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Triomphe Restaurant Corp., Jean-Georges Management, LLC, Jean-Georges Vongerichten.(Colwin, Mercedes) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None
                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Triomphe Restaurant Corp., Jean-Georges Management, LLC.(Colwin, Mercedes) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER: The last day for defts to answer the complaint remains at 3/29/2007. Triomphe Restaurant Corp. answer due 3/29/2007; Jean-Georges Management, LLC answer due 3/29/2007; Jean-Georges Vongerichten answer due 3/29/2007.Discovery due by 7/31/2007. There will be a Status Conference on 7/27/2007 10:00 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/23/2007) (jar) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Mercedes Colwin dated 3/7/07 re: Defendants request the Court grant a three week extension for defendants to file an answer which was originally due 3/8/07 until March 29, 2007. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to March 23, 2007, at 11:30. No further adjournments. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/8/07) (js) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca J. Osborne on behalf of Joseph Bassani (Osborne, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Angela M. Schofield, Human Resources Director. Document filed by Joseph Bassani. (Osborne, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jean-Georges Vongerichten served on 1/17/2007, answer due 2/6/2007. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Joseph Bassani. (Osborne, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jean-Georges Management, LLC served on 1/17/2007, answer due 2/6/2007. Service was accepted by Angela M. Schofield, Human Resources Director. Document filed by Joseph Bassani. (Osborne, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Triomphe Restaurant Corp. served on 1/17/2007, answer due 2/6/2007. Service was accepted by Philipe Vongerichten. Document filed by Joseph Bassani. (Osborne, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER; counsel are directed to appear in Courtroom 23A on 3/9/2007 at 10:00 a.m. for an initial case management conference pursuant to F.R.C.P. 16. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/17/06) (kco) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                COMPLAINT against Triomphe Restaurant Corp., Jean-Georges Management, LLC, Jean-Georges Vongerichten. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 602250)Document filed by Joseph Bassani.(db) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2007 (Becerra, Maribel). (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 685 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?