MDY Industries, LLC v. Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:06-cv-02555
District Judge David G Campbell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 1, 2017 at 11:50 PM EDT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Stephen Genetski +1 404 572 4600

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/02/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Bryant Davidoff +1 202 434 5648 +1 202 434 5029 sdavidoff@wc.com
No Logo Vivendi Games, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Vivendi Games Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Stephen Genetski +1 404 572 4600

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/02/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Bryant Davidoff +1 202 434 5648 +1 202 434 5029 sdavidoff@wc.com
No Logo Mdy Industries LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Christopher Venable +1 602 631 9100 +1 602 631 9796 docketing@vclmlaw.com
No Logo Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Stephen Genetski +1 404 572 4600

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/02/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Bryant Davidoff +1 202 434 5648 +1 202 434 5029 sdavidoff@wc.com
No Logo Vivendi Games, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Vivendi Games Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Stephen Genetski +1 404 572 4600

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/02/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Bryant Davidoff +1 202 434 5648 +1 202 434 5029 sdavidoff@wc.com
No Logo Jonathan Lee Riches, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Lee Riches, r +1 843 387 9400
No Logo Michael Donnelly, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Christopher Venable +1 602 631 9100 +1 602 631 9796 docketing@vclmlaw.com
No Logo Public Knowledge, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Lorona Steiner Ducar Ltd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Connie Jo Mableson +1 602 277 3000 +1 602 277 7478 connie@azlawyers.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (178) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 179 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: 11/9/2011 Order
    LREF
    Blank 178 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: 9/14/2011 Consent Judgment
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: 9/8/2011 ~Motion for Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: 8/12/2011 Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: 8/10/2011 Notice of Settlement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: 7/12/2011 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION AND TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE - Ninth Circuit Mediator Roxane Ashe will hold a mediation on 09/30/11, at 10:00 a.m. in the Sandra Day O'Connor United States Courthouse, 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ, the exact location within the court to be determined. The Circuit Mediator has also scheduled a telephone conference, with counsel only, on 08/10/11, at 3:00 p.m. Arizona Time to plan the mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 07/12/11. (NOTE: see attached pdf for complete details)(ESL) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 Motion for Bond
              MOTION for Bond Distribution by Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated, Vivendi Games Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sommer, Jacob) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 Order
                TEXT ONLY MINUTE ORDER: This case has been referred to the Circuit Mediation Office of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for mediation. An Order scheduling both a conference call between all counsel and the mediator and a mediation session will issue promptly. The mediation proceedings will be conducted at the Sandra Day OConnor United States Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, AZ or at a mutually agreeable location in the Phoenix metro area. All future motions or other pleadings that relate to this mediation are to be copied to ca09_Mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov. Information about the Ninth Circuit Mediation Program can be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov.This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DDL) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: 6/28/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER. Motions in limine due by 8/10/2011; responses to motions in limine due 8/17/2011; no replies permitted. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/10/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/28/2011. (NVO) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
                    ORDER denying 157 Motion to Vacate; denying 159 Motion for Hearing on Motion. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/27/2011.(NVO) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                      ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 168 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jacob Allan Sommer on behalf of Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated. (BAS) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: 5/23/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 157 MOTION to Vacate the DMCA Section of the Permanent Injunction against MDY Industries LLC filed by Michael Donnelly, MDY Industries LLC. (TLJ) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: 5/23/2011 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                            ORDER that the page limit for MDY's reply brief may be enlarged to 17 pages re granting 163 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/23/11.(TLJ) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Notice of Filer of Deficiency
                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 162 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Michael Donnelly, MDY Industries LLC. Description of deficiency: Leave of Court required to file document. (TLJ) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Appearances: Lance Venable and Joseph Meaney for plaintiffs; Christian Genetski for defendant. Status Conference held on 5/13/2011. Pending motions are discussed. Hearing on pending motions to be set by separate order if the Court determines oral argument to be necessary. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Michael Donnelly, MDY Industries LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Venable, Lance) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                    *LODGED PROPOSED DOCUMENT re 163 Motion for Leave re Reply to Response to Motion re 157 MOTION to Vacate the DMCA Section of the Permanent Injunction against MDY Industries LLC filed by Michael Donnelly, MDY Industries LLC. (Venable, Lance) *Modified from Reply to Lodged Proposed Document on 5/16/2011 (TLJ).* (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 161 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: 5/3/2011 Response to Motion
                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 157 MOTION to Vacate the DMCA Section of the Permanent Injunction against MDY Industries LLC filed by Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated, Vivendi Games Incorporated, Vivendi SA. (Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 160 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: 4/26/2011 Memorandum
                                        MEMORANDUM Joint Memorandum Re Issues to be Addressed at Status Conference by ThirdParty Defendant Michael Donnelly, Plaintiff MDY Industries LLC, Counter Defendant MDY Industries LLC. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 159 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: 4/22/2011 Motion for Hearing on Motion
                                          *MOTION Set Oral Argument for Motion to Vacate the DMCA Section of the Permanent Injunction Against MDY by Michael Donnelly, MDY Industries LLC. (Venable, Lance) *Modified event from Misc Motion to Motion for Hearing on 4/22/2011 (TLJ).* (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: 4/22/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER. Status Conference set for 5/13/2011 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell re petition for en banc rehearing with the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/22/2011. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 157 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: 4/19/2011 Motion to Vacate
                                              MOTION to Vacate the DMCA Section of the Permanent Injunction against MDY Industries LLC by Michael Donnelly, MDY Industries LLC. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 156 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: 4/19/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                NOTICE re Regarding the Status of the Plaintiffs' Petition for En Banc Rehearing with the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals by Michael Donnelly, MDY Industries LLC. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER. The proposal in MDY's status report is accepted. MDY shall promptly notify the Court of the Ninth Circuit's ruling on the petition for rehearing en banc, and the parties shall, within seven business days of the Ninth Circuit's ruling, propose a future course of action for this case. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3-30-11. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: 3/29/2011 Memorandum
                                                    MEMORANDUM re: Status of MDY's Petition for En Banc Rehearing Before the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals by ThirdParty Defendant Michael Donnelly, Plaintiff MDY Industries LLC, Counter Defendant MDY Industries LLC. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 151 Motion to Vacate. The March 31, 2011 status conference is vacated. By March 29, 2011, counsel for MDY will file a memorandum informing the Court of the Ninth Circuit's decision on its petition for rehearing en banc, and will suggest, with Blizzard's concurrence, an expeditious course of action in light of the Ninth Circuit's ruling. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3-24-11. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011 Notice of Change of Address
                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Christian Stephen Genetski (Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 151 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: 3/16/2011 Motion to Vacate
                                                          MOTION to Vacate 150 Order,, by Michael Donnelly, MDY Industries LLC. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: 3/15/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER. The Ninth Circuit has issued its mandate in this case. Doc. 149. By March 25, 2011, the parties shall file a joint memorandum setting forth their recommendations concerning the next steps to be taken in this case. If the parties cannot agree, the joint memorandum shall set forth each side's position. The Court will hold a case management conference on March 31, 2011 at 3:00 p.m. to determine the remaining course of this litigation. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3-15-11. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: 2/28/2011 USCA Mandate
                                                              MANDATE of USCA re 09-15932 and 09-16044 vacating the District Court decision and remanding the case as to 128 Notice of Appeal and 134 Notice of Cross Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion, # 2 NDA). (LSP) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 148 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009 USCA Case Number
                                                                Ninth Circuit Case Number 09-16044 for 134 Notice of Cross Appeal. (LSP) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 147 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/16/2009 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER denying 132 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/16/2009.(NVO) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 146 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Certificate of Record
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF RECORD TRANSMITTED TO 9TH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re 134 Notice of Cross Appeal. (LAD) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 145 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by MDY Industries, LLC for proceedings held on 6/26/08; 1/8/09; 1/9/09 before Judge David G. Campbell. (Meaney, Joseph) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 144 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by MDY Industries, LLC for proceedings held on 6/26/2008; 1/8/2009; 1/9/2009 before Judge David G. Campbell. (Meaney, Joseph) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 143 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: 6/11/2009 Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                          REPLY in Support re 132 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court's March 10, 2009 Order filed by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 142 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 132 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court's March 10, 2009 Order filed by Michael Donnelly, MDY Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Michael Donnelly)(Meaney, Joseph) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 141 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT 139 and 140 (BAS, ) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 140 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Bench Trial Day 2 held on 1/9/09 before Judge David G Campbell. Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2009. (BAS, ) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 139 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Bench Trial Day 1 held on 1/8/09 before Judge David G Campbell. Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2009. (BAS, ) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 138 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT 137 (BAS, ) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 137 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Transcript -AppealCourt Filing
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT filed for hearing on Motion Hearing for dates of 6/26/08 before Judge David G Campbell. Court Reporter: Elizabeth A Lemke. Re 134 Notice of Cross Appeal, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2009. (BAS, ) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Appeal Remark
                                                                                        Copy of Electronically Filed CADS Sent re 134 Notice of Cross Appeal: Civil Appeals docketing sent to 9th Circuit on this date. (Counsel to submit on paper). (LAD) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 135 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Appeal Processed to USCA
                                                                                          APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re: 134 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. Filed dates for: Notice of Appeal *5/12/2009*, *Complaint* *10/25/2006*, Appealed Order *4/1/09*, Appealed Judgment *4/1/09*. Court Reporter *Elizabeth Lemke 602-322-7247; Patricia Lyons 602-322-7257* Fee Status: *Paid on 5/12/2009 in the amount of $455.00*.************. Appellant Attorney: *Christian Stephen Genetski, Samuel Bryant Davidoff, Scott Jeremy Stein, Shane M. McGee, Shaun M. Klein* *(ret)* *cgenetski@sonnenschein.com, sdavidoff@sonnenschein.com, sstein@sonnenschein.com, smcgee@sonnenschein.com, sklein@sonnenschein.com*. Appellee Attorney: *Joseph Richard Meaney, Lance Christopher Venable* *(ret)* *docketing@vclmlaw.com, docketing@vclmlaw.com***. Copies sent to all parties and 9th Circuit. (LAD) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 134 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Notice of cross-appeal
                                                                                            NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL to 9th Circuit re judgment 123 by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 09700000000002812911 (Attachments: # 1 Docketing Statement, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Genetski, Christian) Modified on 5/13/2009 to reflect document linkage (LAD). (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 133 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document re 132 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court's March 10, 2009 Order (Proposed Order Text) by Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 132 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court's March 10, 2009 Order by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit S. McGee Letter, # 2 Exhibit Rupprecht Letter, # 3 Exhibit Rupprecht Letter, # 4 Exhibit Rupprecht Letter, # 5 Exhibit Rupprecht Email, # 6 Exhibit 9th Circuit Order, # 7 Exhibit Donnelly Forum Post)(Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 131 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                  MANDATE of 9th Circuit (Certified Copy), granting the parties' motion to dismiss this appeal. The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal re case number 09-15649, as to 121 Notice of Appeal, filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 NDA) (LAD) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 130 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: 5/11/2009 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                    Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 09-15932 for 128 Notice of Appeal. (LAD) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 129 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: 5/1/2009 Appeal Processed to USCA
                                                                                                      APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re: 128 Notice of Appeal,, filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. Filed dates for: Notice of Appeal *4/29/2009*, *Complaint* *10/25/2006*, Appealed Order *4/1/09*, Appealed Judgment *4/1/09*. Court Reporter *Patricia Lyons: 602-322-7257; Elizabeth Lemke: 602-322-7247* Fee Status: *Paid on 4/29/2009 in the amount of $455.00*.************. Appellant Attorney: *Joseph Richard Meaney; Lance Christopher Venable*** *docketing@vclmlaw.com*. Appellee Attorney: *Christian Stephen Genetski; Scott Jeremy Stein; Shane M.McGee; Shaun M. Klein*** *cgenetski@sonnenschein.com; sstein@sonnenschein.com; smcgee@sonnenschein.com; sklein@sonnenschein.com***. Copies sent to all parties and 9th Circuit. (SAT) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 128 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, as to 122 Order on Motion for Judgment, 123 Judgment,, by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 09700000000002779392. (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Information Civil Appeals Docketing Statement - Part 1, # 2 Appeal Information Civil Appeals Docketing Statement - Part 2, # 3 Appeal Information Civil Appeals Docketing Statement - Part 3, # 4 Appeal Information Civil Appeals Docketing Statement - Part 4, # 5 Appeal Information Civil Appeals Docketing Statement - Part 5)(Venable, Lance) Modified on 5/1/2009 (SAT). DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO CORRECT LINKAGE. (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 127 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. for proceedings held on 06/26/2008, 01/08/2009-01/09/2009 before Judge Campbell. (Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 126 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/10/2009 Mail Returned
                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jonathan Lee Riches. Reason for return: Return to Sender: Inmate No Longer at this Facility. Document number #121 and #124. (REK) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 125 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: 4/7/2009 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                              Ninth Circuit Case Number 09-15649 for 121 Notice of Appeal,. (ESL, ) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 124 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Appeal Processed to USCA
                                                                                                                APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re: 121 Notice of Appeal, filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. Filed dates for: Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory; *3/30/2009*, *Complaint* *10/25/2006*, Appealed Order *3/10/09***. Court Reporter *Patricia Lyons 602-322-7257; Liz Lemke 602-322-7247* Fee Status: *Paid on 3/30/2009 in the amount of $455.00*.************. Appellant Attorney: *Lance Venable; Joseph Meaney* *(Retained)* *docketing@vclmlaw.com*. Appellee Attorney: *Christian Genetski; Scott Stein; Shane McGee; Shaun Klein;* *(Retained)* *cgenetski@sonnenscheins.com;sstein@sonnenschein.com; smcgee@sonnenschein.com; sklein@sonnenschein.com***. Copies sent to all parties and 9th Circuit. (REW, ) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 123 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT: Blizzard shall be entitled to recover the total sum of $6,500,00 as monetary damages for counts I, II, III and IV of its counterclaims and 3rd party complaint related to the sale of Glider. Blizzard should not be entitled to multiple recover for counts I, II, III and IV. That is, Blizzard shall be entitled to receive a total of $6,500,000 for counts I, II, III and IV. Should liability on less than all counts be reversed on appeal, any remaining count shall independently support the $6,500,000 award. Michael Donnelly is personally liable for the $6,500,000 damage award under counts I, II, III and IV. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/1/2009. (LAD) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 122 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Order on Motion for JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 113 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/1/2009.(NVO) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 121 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: 3/30/2009 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, as to 116 Order, Permanent Injunction, by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 09700000000002692521. (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Information Civil Appeals Docketing Statement, # 2 Appeal Information Order Appealed from District Court)(Venable, Lance) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 120 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: 3/25/2009 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 118 Motion for Reconsideration; finding as moot 119 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/25/2009.(NVO) (Entered: 03/25/2009)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 119 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay re the Court's permanent injunction pending disposition of MDY's Motion for Reconsideration by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 118 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re the Court's March 10, 2009 Order by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 117 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Reply
                                                                                                                              REPLY in Support re 113 MOTION for Judgment Damages on DMCA by Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Genetski, Christian) Modified on 3/19/2009 INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM (Reply) to (Reply in Support of Motion) (KMG). (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 116 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: 3/10/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. The permanent injunction set forth in this paragraph (1) shall be stayed pending appeal. Within 30 days after all appeals being exhausted, the parties shall file a joint status report regarding the appropriate disposition of the escrow funds. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to hold proceedings and to enter further orders as may be appropriate to implement or enforce the provisions of this Order and Permanent Injunction (see order for details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/10/09. (TLJ) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 115 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: 3/10/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 113 MOTION for Judgment Damages on DMCA filed by Michael Donnelly, MDY Industries, LLC. (Meaney, Joseph) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 114 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER AND STIPULATED JUDGMENT pursuant to 112 Stipulation: ORDERED: 1. Blizzard shall be entitled to recover the total sum of $6,500,000 as monetary damages for counts I, II and III of its Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint related to the sale of Glider up through and including 2/23/09. 2. Blizzard shall be entitled to double or triple recovery for counts I, II and III. That is, Blizzard shalll be entitled to $6,500,000 in damages for counts I, II and III. However, should liability on any one or two of the counts be reversed on appeal, any remaining count shall independently support the $6,500,000 award. 3. Michael Donnelly is personally liable for the $6,500,000 damage award under counts I, II and III. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/2/2009. (LAD) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 113 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: 2/24/2009 ~Motion for Judgment
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Judgment Damages on DMCA by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION as to Damages by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order and Stipulated Judgment)(Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM re: Memorandum in Support of MDY and Donnelly's Request to Stay the Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff MDY Industries, LLC, ThirdParty Defendant Michael Donnelly, Counter Defendant MDY Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order re Injunction, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michael Donnelly, # 3 Exhibit B1 to Donnelly's Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B2 - to Donnelly's Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C - Patry Blog Articles, # 6 Exhibit D - UNC Law Review, # 7 Exhibit E - Jurimetrics Law Journal, # 8 Exhibit F - McSherry Article, # 9 Exhibit G - Siy Article, # 10 Exhibit H - Ars Technica Article)(Venable, Lance) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                            LODGED Proposed Proposed Order. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 109 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM re: Memorandum Opposing Stay of Permanent Injunction re 108 Order by Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 108 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: 1/28/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER re bench trial. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/28/2009. (NVO) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. At the end of the recent bench trial, the Court informed the parties that it would try to issue a decision this week. The Court has not completed its decision. The decision likely will be issued next week. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1-16-09. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., et al.(TLJ) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List by MDY Industries, LLC.. (TLJ) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                        Witness List by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., et al.(TLJ) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                          Witness List by MDY Industries, LLC. (TLJ) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009 Bench Trial CompletedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for Proceedings (Court Trial) held before Judge David G Campbell: Trial Day #2 - Reconvene. Michael Donnelly examined further. Witness excused. Closing argument. The matter is taken under advisement. Court is adjourned. Dft's exhibits are released to cnsl. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) (SAT) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009 Bench Trial - BegunCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Bench Trial begun on 1/8/2009. (Amended to reflect admission of Exhibit 7). (See document for full details). (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.)(LAD) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009 Bench Trial - BegunCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Bench trial - Day 1 - Bench Trial begun on 1/8/2009. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.)(LMR, ) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying Jonathan Riches' 98 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/21/08.(REW, ) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: 11/4/2008 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs, MOTION for Reconsideration En Banc and Clarification, MOTION for Amicus Brief by Jonathan Lee Riches. (TLJ) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: 10/20/2008 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Findings of Fact by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: 9/29/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Bench Trial set for 1/8/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/29/2008. (NVJ) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: 9/29/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER AND STIPLATED JUDGMENT - Blizzard shall be entitled to recover the total sum of $6,000,000 as monetary damages for counts I, II and III of its Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint related to the sale of Glider up through and including September 1, 2008. Blizzard shall not be entitled to double or triple recovery for counts I, II and III. That is, Blizzard shall be entitled to receive a total of $6,000,000 in damages for counts I, II and III. However, should liability on any one or two of the counts be reversed on appeal, any one of these counts independently supports the $6,000,000 award. In the event that the Court determines that Michael Donnelly is personally liable, either individually or jointly and severally, under counts I, II, or III, this stipulation shall extend to him. The parties shall submit their disputed and undisputed statements of facts and law related to the DMCA claim on September 10, 2008. Counts V and VII of Blizzard's Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint alleging trademark infringement and unjust enrichment are hereby dismissed by stipulation of the parties. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/26/08. (KMG) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: 9/25/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION as to damages by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order and Stipulated Judgment)(Venable, Lance) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/25/2008 Pretrial Conference - FinalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Appearances: Joseph Meaney and Lance Venable for pla; Shane McGee and Christian Genetski for dfts. Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/24/2008. Bench trial set for 1/8/2009 for 2 days. Separate order to issue. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR, ) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: 9/25/2008 Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                LODGED Proposed Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Order. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 91 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 Order on Motion for Permanent InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying without prejudice 84 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/18/2008.(NVJ) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly.. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc... (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Findings of Fact by MDY Industries, LLC, Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re proposed final pretrial order due 9/10/2008. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/2/2008. (NVJ) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support re 84 MOTION for Permanent Injunction or in the Alternative to Amend the Judgment Entered July 14, 2008 filed by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 84 MOTION for Permanent Injunction or in the Alternative to Amend the Judgment Entered July 14, 2008 filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Michael Donnelly, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Deposition Excerpt of Gregory Ashe, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - MDY's Letter of 7-25-08 to Blizzard, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Blizzard Press Release)(Venable, Lance) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Motion for Permanent Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Permanent Injunction or in the Alternative to Amend the Judgment Entered July 14, 2008 by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, Declaration with Attached Exhibits, # 4 Exhibit D, Affidavit, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2008 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Motions in limine due by 9/3/2008; rsponses to motions in limine due by 9/10/2008; no replies permitted. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/3/2008. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/14/2008. (NVJ) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. A final pretrial conference will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/14/2008.(NVJ) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 81 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED EXHIBITS re 57 filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit W)(MAP) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 80 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED EXHIBITS re 45 filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit I)(MAP) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 79 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER granting 56 Motion; granting 59 Motion. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/1/08.(MAP) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Appearances: Joseph Meaney and Lance Venable for pla; Christian Genetski and Shane McGee for dfts. Motion Hearing held on 6/26/2008 re 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly, and 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. IT IS ORDERED taking the matters under advisement. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Lemke.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR, ) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re 75 Brief (Non Appeal) to the Brief of Amicus Curiae Public Knowledge by Defendants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Third Party Plaintiffs Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re additional briefing re amicus curiae brief by Public Knowledge. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/10/2008. (NVJ) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Brief (non-appeal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF in Support of Neither Party, re: 45 , 39 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment by Amicus Public Knowledge filed by Public Knowledge. (REW, ) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Order on Motion to File Amicus CuriaeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Public Knowledge's 63 Motion to File Amicus Curiae in Support of Neither Party on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment; the Clerk is directed to file the 67 lodged brief. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/29/08.(REW, ) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Set Motion HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Order: Oral Argument is set as to 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support :. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2008 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVJ) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 68 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/20/2008.(NVJ) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply re 58 Statement, of Facts by Defendants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Third Party Plaintiffs Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index & Ex. 59, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 60, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 61)(Genetski, Christian) Modified on 5/13/2008 DOCUMENT LINKED INCORRECTLY. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED TO LINK TO #58. (REW, ). (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Support re 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for the parties reply briefs in support of their motions for summary judgment by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Venable, Lance) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LODGED Proposed Public Knowledge Amicus Curiae Brief, re: 63 Motion for Leave to File. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Public Knowledge. (Mableson, Connie) Modified on 5/7/2008 TO ADD TEXT AND LINKAGE TO MOTION (REW, ). (Entered: 05/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Notice of Filer of Deficiency
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 65 Memorandum, filed by Public Knowledge. Description of deficiency: Document not electronically lodged using LODGED PROPOSED DOCUMENT EVENT. ATTORNEY NOTICED TO RE-FILE (OPEN DOCUMENT FOR FULL DETAILS). (REW, ) (Entered: 05/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LODGED Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief of Public Knowledge in Support of Neither Party on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by Amicus Public Knowledge. (Mableson, Connie) Modified on 5/6/2008 INCORRECT DOCUMENT EVENT SELECTED. ATTORNEY NOTICED TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT. (REW, ). (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Notice of Filer of Deficiency
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 63 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Public Knowledge. Description of deficiency: Lodged Proposed Document must not be attached or made a part of the motion. ATTORNEY NOTICED TO RE-FILE. (REW, ) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Motion to File Amicus Curiae
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Neither Party on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by Public Knowledge. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Public Knowledge's Request to File an Amicus Brief)(Mableson, Connie) Modified on 5/5/2008 LODGED PROPOSED DOCUMENT EVENT NOT ENTERED. (REW, ). (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Connie Jo Mableson on behalf of Public Knowledge (Mableson, Connie) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 61 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit W to the Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Response to the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re: 59 SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Exhibits A and W of Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Response to the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 60 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit A to Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re: 59 SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Exhibits A and W of Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Response to the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 59 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Exhibits A and W of Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Response to the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order granting the plaintiffs' motion to files documents under seal)(Venable, Lance) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF FACTS and Disputed Facts and Exhibits A to Z and Exhibits AA to CC re 57 Response to 39 Motion by Plaintiff MDY Industries, LLC, ThirdParty Defendant Michael Donnelly, Counter Defendant MDY Industries, LLC filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P, # 16 Exhibit Q, # 17 Exhibit S, # 18 Exhibit T, # 19 Exhibit U, # 20 Exhibit V, # 21***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER #79, FILED 7/2/08***Exhibit W # 22 Exhibit X, # 23 Exhibit Y, # 24 Exhibit Z, # 25 Exhibit AA, # 26 Exhibit BB, # 27 Exhibit CC)(Venable, Lance) Modified on 4/25/2008 INCORRECT DOCUMENT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM (Declaration) TO (Statement of Facts); LINKAGE ADDED. (REW). MODIFIED ON 7/2/08 TO STRIKE EXHIBIT W ON (MAP). (Entered: 04/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 04/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Third SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Exhibits B & I of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Greg Ashe)(Venable, Lance) (Entered: 04/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO 46 Statement of Facts, RE: 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index & Ex. 50, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 51, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 52, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 53, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 54, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 55, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 56, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 57, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 58)(Genetski, Christian) Modified on 4/24/2008 INCORRECT DOCUMENT EVENT SELECTED; DOCUMENT NOT LINKED CORRECTLY. LINKAGE ADDED AND TEXT CORRECTED TO REFLECT CORRECT DOCUMENT DESCRIPTION. (REW, ). (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 52 Motion to Seal Document. Plaintiff's second motion to seal documents asserts that the Court should grant the request to seal because the parties agreed that the documents in question are confidential and the Court entered a protective order. Dkt. #52 at 1. This argument misreads the Ninth Circuit's Kamakana decision. The Ninth Circuit said in Kamakana that the entry of a protective ordered justifies the sealing of documents only when filed in connection with a non-dispositive motion. 447 F.3d at 1179-1180. Plaintiff seeks to seal documents in connection with a dispositive motion -- a motion for summary judgment. For this, Kamakana makes clear that Plaintiff must satisfy the compelling reasons test, and that the test is not satisfied merely by the previous entry of a protective order. Id. Although Plaintiff asserts that the documents to be sealed include trade secrets, it provides the Court with nothing to support that assertion and certainly does not enable the Court to "base its decision on a compelling reason and articulate the factual basis for its ruling, without relying on hypothesis or conjecture." Kamakana, 447 F.3d at 1179. Plaintiff's motion is denied one final time without prejudice to Plaintiff making the showing required by the compelling reasons test. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4-9-08. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Exhibits B and I to Plaintiff and Third-Party Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order granting motion to file documents under seal)(Venable, Lance) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 48 Motion to Seal Document. The Ninth Circuit has held that parties must show "compelling reasons" to seal documents submitted in connection with dispositive motions. Kamakana v. City of Honolulu, 447 F.3d 1172, 1179 (9th Cir. 2006). The motion of Plaintiff and Third-Party Defendant asks the Court to permit the filing of motion for summary judgment exhibits under seal because the parties have stipulated to their confidentiality. The motion does not address the Ninth Circuit test and a mere stipulation does not satisfy it. The motion will be denied without prejudice to Plaintiff and Third-Party Defendant filing a motion that satisfies the Ninth Circuit standard. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3-26-08. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 50 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit I to Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment re: 48 SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Exhibits B and I of Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 49 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit B to Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment re: 48 SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Exhibits B and I of Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 48 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Exhibits B and I of Plaintiff's and Third-Party Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order granting the plaintiffs' motion to file documents under seal)(Venable, Lance) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Additional Attachments to Main Document re 46 Additional Attachments to Main Document,, Exhibits L and N to Plaintiff's and Third Party Defendant's Statement of Facts in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff MDY Industries, LLC, ThirdParty Defendant Michael Donnelly, Counter Defendant MDY Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit N)(Venable, Lance) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document re 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Statement of Facts and Supporting Exhibits (Excluding Exhibits B, I, L, and N) by Plaintiff MDY Industries, LLC, ThirdParty Defendant Michael Donnelly, Counter Defendant MDY Industries, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit M)(Venable, Lance) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Third Party Plaintiffs Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 42, # 2 Exhibit 43, # 3 Exhibit 44, # 4 Exhibit 45, # 5 Exhibit 46, # 6 Exhibit 47, # 7 Exhibit 48, # 8 Exhibit 49)(Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Additional Attachments to Main Document Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Third Party Plaintiffs Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 32, # 2 Exhibit 33, # 3 Exhibit 34, # 4 Exhibit 35, # 5 Exhibit 36, # 6 Exhibit 37, # 7 Exhibit 38, # 8 Exhibit 39, # 9 Exhibit 40)(Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Third Party Plaintiffs Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 22, # 2 Exhibit 23, # 3 Exhibit 24, # 4 Exhibit 25, # 5 Exhibit 26, # 6 Exhibit 27, # 7 Exhibit 28, # 8 Exhibit 29, # 9 Exhibit 30)(Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Third Party Plaintiffs Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12, # 2 Exhibit 13, # 3 Exhibit 14, # 4 Exhibit 15, # 5 Exhibit 16, # 6 Exhibit 17, # 7 Exhibit 18, # 8 Exhibit 19, # 9 Exhibit 20)(Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT of of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Defendants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Third Party Plaintiffs Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/21/2008.(NVJ) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Lodged Proposed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LODGED Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend the Page Limit for Motions for Summary Judgment and Responses re: 35 Joint MOTION filed by Vivendi Games, Inc., MDY Industries, LLC, Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Michael Donnelly. (Genetski, Christian) Modified on 3/24/2008 INCORRECT DOCUMENT EVENT SELECTED, EXCESS TEXT REMOVED. DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED. (REW, ). (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun M Klein on behalf of Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Klein, Shaun) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion for Summary Judgment and Responses by Vivendi Games, Inc., MDY Industries, LLC, Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Michael Donnelly, Vivendi, SA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time. Dispositive motions due by 3/21/2008. The parties are advised that the Court will not grant additional extensions absent truly extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/08. (NVJ) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to file dispositive motions by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Venable, Lance) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 31 Amended Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Samuel Bryant Davidoff terminated for Defendants, Counter-Claim Plaintiffs, and Third Party Plaintiffs Blizzard Entertainment Inc and Vivendi Games Inc. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/2/08.(REW, ) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/24/2007, Entered: 12/24/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davidoff, Samuel) (Entered: 12/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion does not comply with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 83.3(b). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/18/07.(NVJ) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Davidoff, Samuel) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice re Joint Report on Settlement Talks As Required Under The Court's April 6, 2007 Order by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/18/07. (NVJ) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION for Protective Order by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Davidoff, Samuel) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Shane M McGee on behalf of Vivendi Games, Inc., and Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Samuel Bryant Davidoff on behalf of Vivendi Games, Inc., and Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice re service of document requests and interrogatories by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 05/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 1/25/2008. Dispositive motions due by 2/29/2008. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/6/07. (LMR, ) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Appearances: Lance Venable for plas; Christian Genetski for dfts. Scheduling Conference held on 4/4/2007. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR, ) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice re Initial Disclosures by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Genetski, Christian) (Entered: 04/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice re Initial Disclosure by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 04/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Vivendi Games, Inc., MDY Industries, LLC, Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Michael Donnelly. (Venable, Lance) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Christian S Genetski on behalf of Vivendi Games, Inc., and Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (BAS, ) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Counterclaim, ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by MDY Industries, LLC, Michael Donnelly.(Venable, Lance) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Michael Donnelly. (PEM) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2007 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/20/07. (NVJ) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Michael Donnelly, COUNTERCLAIM against MDY Industries, LLC by Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Stein, Scott) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8(a), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned to by random draw to Judge David G. Campbell. All further pleadings should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CIV-06-2555-PHX-DGC FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause hearing scheduled for 1/16/07 is hereby vacated (MAP) (Entered: 01/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 1/4/2007 Election to Assign Case to District JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. TEXT ONLY ENTRY, NO PDF DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (MAP) (Entered: 01/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Ordered that MDY Industries, LLC show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.8(a) before Judge Stephen M McNamee; Show Cause Hearing set for 1/16/2007 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen M McNamee. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(MAP) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Vivendi Games)(ESL) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vivendi Games, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. ; Party Vivendi, SA terminated, filed by MDY Industries, LLC.(Venable, Lance) (Entered: 12/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. and Vivendi, SA. (Attachments: # 1 Vivendi)(entered by HIH) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 New Case Opened
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filing fee paid 10/26/2006, receipt number PHX049754. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Virgina A. Mathis. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV06-2555-PHX-VAM. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Instructions) (entered by HIH) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT, filed by MDY Industries, LLC.(Meaney, Joseph) (Entered: 10/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 139 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?