Lightspeed Media Corporation v. Does 1-9

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:11-cv-02261
District Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Lightspeed Media Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

v.
No Logo Does 1-9, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Timeline
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: 9/27/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lightspeed Media Corporation (Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 9/27/2011) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: 8/10/2011 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by Lightspeed Media Corporation Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Certain Anonymous Doe Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - List of IP Addresses Associated with Anonymous Inidividuals to be Dismissed)(Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 8/10/2011) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: 7/27/2011 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 9 Motion to Continue (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2011) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 Proposed Order
Proposed Order re 9 MOTION to Continue For Leave to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Lightspeed Media Corporation. (Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 7/26/2011) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 Motion to Continue
MOTION to Continue For Leave to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Lightspeed Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Gibbs Declaration)(Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 7/26/2011) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011 Order on Ex Parte ApplicationCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 6 Ex Parte Application (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Proposed Order
Proposed Order re 6 Ex Parte Application For, and Memorandum of Law in Support of, Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference Ex Parte Application For, and Memorandum of Law in Support of, Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Lightspeed Media Corporation. (Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 5/11/2011) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Exparte Application
Ex Parte Application For, and Memorandum of Law in Support of, Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Lightspeed Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Hansmeier Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B - Gibbs Declaration)(Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 5/11/2011) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lightspeed Media Corporation.. (Gibbs, Brett) (Filed on 5/11/2011) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Patent/Trademark Copy
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Certificate of Interested Entities
Certificate of Interested Entities by Lightspeed Media Corporation (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 ADR Scheduling Order
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/11/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2011 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Complaint
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Does 1-9 ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611059623.) filed by Lightspeed Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 138 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?