Site Update Solutions LLC v. Accor North America Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:11-cv-03306
Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 4:18 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Site Update Solutions LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corby R Vowell +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 vowell@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy Lynn Boone +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1737 wboone@gviplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W Goldstein +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1145 egoldstein@gliplaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alisa Anne Lipski +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1145 alipski@gliplaw.com
Adobe Systems, Inc. Adobe Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Adobe Systems Incorporated"
Unknown Role, Salon Internet, Inc.
Unknown Role, OMNITURE Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/14/2010 John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Ou +1 650 815 7400 +1 650 815 7401 pou@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
Amazon.com, Inc. Amazon.com, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Drugstore.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, Audible, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Ou +1 650 815 7400 +1 650 815 7401 pou@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
No Logo American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Michael Caracappa +1 202 429 6267 +1 202 261 0597 jcaracappa@steptoe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Richard Heimbold +1 310 734 3200 +1 310 734 3300 mheimbold@steptoe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tremayne M Norris +1 202 429 5766 +1 202 429 3906 tnorris@steptoe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Whitney Winston +1 202 429 3018 +1 202 429 3902 wwinston@steptoe.com
CBS Interactive, Inc. CBS Interactive, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

CNN Interactive Group, Inc. CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

No Logo Daily News, LP, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Deli Management, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Electronic Arts, Inc. Electronic Arts, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Enterprise Rent ACar Company, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Umar Arshad +1 571 203 2756 +1 202 408 4400 umar.arshad@finnegan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey C. Totten +1 202 408 4000 jeffrey.totten@finnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Lee Stameshkin +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 849 7400 lstameshkin@cooley.com

Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heidi Lyn Keefe +1 650 213 0302 +1 650 213 8158 hkeefe@whitecase.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R. Weinstein +1 650 213 0300 +1 650 213 8158 mweinstein@whitecase.com
No Logo Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Home Box Office, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

No Logo Hsn, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Dwain Mazingo +1 903 525 2266 +1 903 593 0846 jasonmazingo@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Glenn Thames +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 glennthames@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Ronald Lanser +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 jlanser@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Levinson +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 mlevinson@seyfarth.com
Intuit, Inc. Intuit, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Ou +1 650 815 7400 +1 650 815 7401 pou@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
LinkedIn Corporation LinkedIn Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Ou +1 650 815 7400 +1 650 815 7401 pou@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
No Logo Myspace, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
NBC Universal, Inc. NBC Universal, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Newegg, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Ou +1 650 815 7400 +1 650 815 7401 pou@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2011 Debra Elaine Gunter +1 903 595 3111 debby@yw-lawfirm.com
TERMINATED: 02/22/2011 Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
Nissan North America, Inc. Nissan North America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer & Kern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Joseph Cox +1 214 346 3713 +1 214 369 2118 jcox@hdbdk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey Scott Patterson +1 214 369 2100 +1 214 369 2118 jpatterson@hdbdk.com

Represented by Thompson & Wright

Overstock.com, Inc. Overstock.com, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Aaron Shield +1 713 221 1115 +1 713 222 3225 chris.shield@bracewellgiuliani.com
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
Sears, Roebuck & Company Sears, Roebuck & Company, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Sears Roebuck and Co"

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Ou +1 650 815 7400 +1 650 815 7401 pou@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
Staples, Inc. Staples, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
Target Corporation Target Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Ou +1 650 815 7400 +1 650 815 7401 pou@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
Thomson Corporation Thomson Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc"

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2011 R Floyd Walker +1 512 542 8453 +1 512 236 3232 fwalker@velaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
TERMINATED: 01/06/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 01/06/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Ticketmaster LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

No Logo Time Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Green Dot Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

No Logo Wyndham Worldwide Inc, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
v.
No Logo Accor North America, Inc., Defendant
Adobe Systems, Inc. Adobe Systems, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Adobe Systems Incorporated"
Unknown Role, Salon Internet, Inc.
Unknown Role, OMNITURE Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/14/2010 John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Ou +1 650 815 7400 +1 650 815 7401 pou@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
Amazon.com, Inc. Amazon.com, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Drugstore.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, Audible, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Ou +1 650 815 7400 +1 650 815 7401 pou@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
No Logo American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Michael Caracappa +1 202 429 6267 +1 202 261 0597 jcaracappa@steptoe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Richard Heimbold +1 310 734 3200 +1 310 734 3300 mheimbold@steptoe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tremayne M Norris +1 202 429 5766 +1 202 429 3906 tnorris@steptoe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Whitney Winston +1 202 429 3018 +1 202 429 3902 wwinston@steptoe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Aweber Systems Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Rogers, Jr. +2721 272 272 1000

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

CBS Corporation CBS Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "CBS Corp"

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/18/2010 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
CBS Interactive, Inc. CBS Interactive, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Cdw LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall O'Toole Gerstein Murray and Borun

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas L. Duston +1 312 474 6300 tduston@marshallip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin T Horton +1 312 474 6300 bhorton@marshallip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Choice Hotels International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Represented by King & Kelleher LLP

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin P. Anderson +1 202 719 7000 +1 202 719 7049 kanderson@wileyrein.com
CNN Interactive Group, Inc. CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Daily News, LP, Defendant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Deli Management, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Electronic Arts, Inc. Electronic Arts, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Enterprise Rent ACar Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Umar Arshad +1 571 203 2756 +1 202 408 4400 umar.arshad@finnegan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Richard Mosko +1 650 849 6600 +1 650 849 6666 scott.mosko@finnegan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey C. Totten +1 202 408 4000 jeffrey.totten@finnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Graham Rhodes +1 858 550 6000 +1 858 550 6420 rhodesmg@cooley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Lee Stameshkin +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 849 7400 lstameshkin@cooley.com

Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heidi Lyn Keefe +1 650 213 0302 +1 650 213 8158 hkeefe@whitecase.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R. Weinstein +1 650 213 0300 +1 650 213 8158 mweinstein@whitecase.com
No Logo Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Home Box Office, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Hsn, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Dwain Mazingo +1 903 525 2266 +1 903 593 0846 jasonmazingo@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Glenn Thames +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 glennthames@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence E. Butler +1 415 397 2823 +1 415 397 8549 lbutler@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Ronald Lanser +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 jlanser@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Levinson +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 mlevinson@seyfarth.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Intuit, Inc. Intuit, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Ou +1 650 815 7400 +1 650 815 7401 pou@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
No Logo Jasons Deli Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

LinkedIn Corporation LinkedIn Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Ou +1 650 815 7400 +1 650 815 7401 pou@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
No Logo Monster Worldwide, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/25/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven Robert Daniels +1 415 442 1000

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/25/2011 Bryan Donivan Atkinson +1 512 394 3000 +1 512 394 3001 bryan.atkinson@dechert.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin F. Boyce +1 650 813 4800 +1 650 813 4848 justin.boyce@dechert.com
TERMINATED: 05/25/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY William Bryan Farney +1 512 394 3010 +1 512 394 3001 bryan.farney@dechert.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert L. Masterson +1 215 994 2311 +1 215 655 2311 robert.masterson@dechert.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Msnbc Interactive News, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/14/2010 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/14/2010 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
TERMINATED: 10/14/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 10/14/2010 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Myspace, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
NBC Universal, Inc. NBC Universal, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Newegg, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Ou +1 650 815 7400 +1 650 815 7401 pou@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2011 Debra Elaine Gunter +1 903 595 3111 debby@yw-lawfirm.com
TERMINATED: 02/22/2011 Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
Nissan North America, Inc. Nissan North America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer & Kern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Joseph Cox +1 214 346 3713 +1 214 369 2118 jcox@hdbdk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey Scott Patterson +1 214 369 2100 +1 214 369 2118 jpatterson@hdbdk.com

Represented by Thompson & Wright

No Logo OfficeMax, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ccapshaw@capshawlaw.com
Space Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com
Overstock.com, Inc. Overstock.com, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Bracewell LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Lillis Pitha LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Damien Patrick Lillis +1 415 814 0411 +1 415 217 7011 dlillis@slplawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin Lukas Pitha +1 949 209 9020 +1 949 759 1845 mpitha@slplawfirm.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
Salesforce.com, Inc. Salesforce.com, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Exacttarget, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ncino, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aden Martin Allen +1 512 338 5437 +1 512 338 5499 aallen@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Jose Carlos Villarreal +1 512 338 5400 +1 512 338 5499 jvillarreal@wsgr.com
Sears, Roebuck & Company Sears, Roebuck & Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Sears Roebuck and Co"

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Ou +1 650 815 7400 +1 650 815 7401 pou@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
Staples, Inc. Staples, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian K. Erickson +1 512 226 0480 berickson@dl.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Target Corporation Target Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Ou +1 650 815 7400 +1 650 815 7401 pou@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
The Walt Disney Company, Inc. The Walt Disney Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Walt Disney Company"
Unknown Role, Dc Holdco Inc
Unknown Role, TWDC Holdco 613 Corp.
Unknown Role, TFCF America, Inc
Unknown Role, TFCF Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Whitney Winston +1 202 429 3018 +1 202 429 3902 wwinston@steptoe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Thomson Corporation Thomson Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc"

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2011 R Floyd Walker +1 512 542 8453 +1 512 236 3232 fwalker@velaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
TERMINATED: 01/06/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 01/06/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/26/2010 Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/01/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 04/01/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Ticketmaster LLC, Defendant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Time Inc., Defendant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
Time Warner, Inc. Time Warner, Inc., Defendant

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc"

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/18/2010 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 08/18/2010 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Green Dot Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Wyndham Worldwide Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Marc Stein +1 213 254 1240 +1 213 254 1201 dstein@akingump.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
No Logo Site Update Solutions LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corby R Vowell +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 vowell@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy Lynn Boone +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1737 wboone@gviplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W Goldstein +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1145 egoldstein@gliplaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alisa Anne Lipski +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1145 alipski@gliplaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (707) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
    MANDATE of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to 694 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Newegg Inc., 666 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Newegg Inc., 693 Notice of Appeal, filed by Newegg Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016) Modified on 3/9/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Change of Address by Philip Ou (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Change of Address by Yar R. Chaikovsky (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
          Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to 694 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit,. Filing fee $ 505. Appeal Record due by 4/13/2015. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 692 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by Newegg Inc.. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 25K93SBC. Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-9355915 paid Appeal Record due by 4/13/2015. amendment to 693 (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 3/12/2015) Modified on 3/12/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
              *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see corrected 694 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Newegg Inc.. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees 692 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-9355915 paid.) (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 3/12/2015) Modified on 3/12/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/12/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: 2/11/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER DENYING SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR DECLARATION OF EXCEPTIONAL CASE AND AWARD OF FEES by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 673 . (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: 10/10/2014 Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE by Newegg Inc. Newegg Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Authority Relating to its Motion for Fees (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 09/24/14, before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 4:47 - 6:45. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 688 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/22/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2014. (Related documents(s) 688 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014 Unknown Document Type
                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for 9/24/2014 by Site Update Solutions LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Edmonds, John) (Filed on 9/30/2014) TRANSCRIBER: EchoReporting. Modified on 10/2/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Unknown Document Type
                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for 9/24/14 by Newegg Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 9/29/2014) TRANSCRIBER: EchoReporting. Modified on 9/30/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014 Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE / EXHIBITS by Newegg Inc. re 673 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendant Newegg Inc.'s Supplemental Motion for Declaration of Exceptional Case and Award of Fees Newegg's Presentation Slides for Fee Motion Hearing (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 9/25/2014) Modified on 9/25/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).(3)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: 9/24/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/24/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 673 Defendant Newegg Inc.'s Supplemental Motion for Declaration of Exceptional Case and Award of Fees: The court takes matter under submission; written order to be issued. (Court Reporter FTR: (4:47 to 6:45) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/24/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER ON REQUEST TO BRING PRESENTATION EQUIPMENT TO COURT FOR FEE MOTION HEARING (AS MODIFIED) by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 681 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 680 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE (re 680 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief ) in Opposition to Amicus Curiae Motion for Leave to File Brief filed bySite Update Solutions LLC. (Edmonds, John) (Filed on 9/17/2014) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing September 23, 2014 Motions, continuing 673 MOTION for Attorney Fees and 680 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief: 9/23/2014 Motions are continued to 9/24/2014 at 4:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: 9/11/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Parties Joint Request to Bring Presentation Equipment to Court for Fee Motion Hearing filed by Newegg Inc.. (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: 9/3/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Kaspersky Lab ZAO, Limelight Networks, Inc., QVC, Inc., SAS Institute Inc., Xilinx, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 9/17/2014. Replies due by 9/24/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amicus Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Amicus Brief, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Amicus Brief, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Amicus Brief, # 5 Proposed Order)(Samerotte, Darius) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                                              REPLY (re 673 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendant Newegg Inc.'s Supplemental Motion for Declaration of Exceptional Case and Award of Fees ) filed byNewegg Inc.. (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 9/2/2014) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: 8/28/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT'S REPLY REGARDING DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 677 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 8/27/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS REPLY REGARDING DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES filed by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                      RESPONSE (re 673 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendant Newegg Inc.'s Supplemental Motion for Declaration of Exceptional Case and Award of Fees ) filed bySite Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - US Patent RE 40,683, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Markman Transcript, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Newegg's Opening Appellate Brief, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Goldstein Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Lavian Declaration)(Edmonds, John) (Filed on 8/20/2014) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/15/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 674 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 673 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendant Newegg Inc.'s Supplemental Motion for Declaration of Exceptional Case and Award of Fees Responses due by 8/20/2014. Replies due by 8/29/2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 673 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendant Newegg Inc.'s Supplemental Motion for Declaration of Exceptional Case and Award of Fees filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendant Newegg Inc.'s Supplemental Motion for Declaration of Exceptional Case and Award of Fees filed by Newegg Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/18/2014. Replies due by 8/25/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Philip Ou Decl ISO, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 7/21/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: The court sets briefing schedule for Defendant Newegg Inc.'s Motion for Declaration of Exceptional Case & Award of Fees. Motion to be filed by 8/4/2014. Opposition due by 8/18/2014. Reply due by 8/25/2014. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (Court Reporter FTR: (10:04 to 10:08) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/21/2014) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Supplemental filed by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 7/18/2014) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by John J Edmonds for Plaintiff Site Update Solutions LLC (Edmonds, John) (Filed on 6/20/2014) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/15/13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2013. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 6/19/2013) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to 666 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit by Newegg Inc.. Filing fee $ 455. Appeal Record due by 7/18/2013. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 665 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by Newegg Inc.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0971-7783199. Appeal Record due by 7/18/2013. (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 6/18/2013) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 665 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER [REDACTED] DENYING DECLARATION OF EXCEPTIONAL CASE AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 649 Motion for Attorney Fees (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 665 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER [REDACTED] DENYING DECLARATION OF EXCEPTIONAL CASE AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 649 Motion for Attorney Fees (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 655 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 648 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 659 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE by Newegg Inc. re 660 Motion Hearing, Notice and Response to Intervening Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ou, Philip) (Filed on 1/25/2013) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/15/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re 649 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 285 [REDACTED VERSION] filed by Newegg Inc.: The court takes matter under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter (10:55 to 11:46.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/15/2013) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Newegg's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Reply Evidence filed by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Newegg's Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Reply Evidence, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 1/7/2013) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            OBJECTIONS to re 657 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Plaintiff's Objection to Reply Evidence Pursuant to Local Rule 7-3(d)(1)). (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 1/4/2013) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY (re 649 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 285 [REDACTED VERSION] ) Defendant Newegg Inc.'s Reply Brief in Support of its Moton for Declaration of Exceptional Case and Award of Fees filed byNewegg Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Philip Ou Declaration ISO, # 2 Exhibit A to Ou Declaration ISO, # 3 Exhibit B-I to Ou Declaration ISO (Filed Under Seal))(Ou, Philip) (Filed on 12/28/2012) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE by Newegg Inc. Notification of Lodging (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 12/28/2012) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unopposed Administrative Motioin to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Newegg Inc.'s Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Declaration of Exceptional Case and Award of Fees filed by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration Philip Ou Declaration ISO FUS)(Ou, Philip) (Filed on 12/28/2012) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 649 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 285 [REDACTED VERSION] ) Plaintiff's Response In Opposition To Newegg's Motion For Declaration of Exceptional Case And Award Of Fees filed byError: party not known. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 12/17/2012) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 653 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND TO MODIFY BRIEFING DEADLINES FOR NEWEGG'S MOTION FOR DECLARATION OF EXCEPTIONAL CASE AND AWARD OF FEES, granting 652 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time and to Modify Briefing Deadlines for Newegg's Motion for Declaration of Exceptional Case and Award of Fees: Deadline for Plaintiff to file its Response to the Motion is 12/17/2012. Deadline for Newegg to file its Reply is 12/28/2012. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/7/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time and to Modify Briefing Deadlines for Newegg's Motion for Declaration of Exceptional Case and Award of Fees. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2012) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Declaration in Support of 648 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Newegg's Motion for Declaration of Exceptional Case and Award of Fees, Supporting Declarations and Certain Exhibits filed byError: party not known. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 648 ) (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 12/3/2012) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE by Newegg Inc. re 649 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 285 [REDACTED VERSION] NOTIFICATION OF LODGING (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 11/27/2012) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 285 [REDACTED VERSION] filed by Newegg Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 12/10/2012. Replies due by 12/17/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Yar Chaikovsky, # 2 Declaration of Annette Kazmerski, # 3 Exhibit A to Kazmerski Decl, # 4 Declaration of Philip Ou, # 5 Exhibit A to Ou Decl, # 6 Exhibit B to Ou Decl, # 7 Exhibit C to Ou Decl, # 8 Exhibit D to Ou Decl, # 9 Exhibit E to Ou Decl, # 10 Exhibit F to Ou Decl, # 11 Exhibit G to Ou Decl, # 12 Exhibit H to Ou Decl, # 13 Exhibit I to Ou Decl, # 14 Exhibit J to Ou Decl, # 15 Exhibit K to Ou Decl, # 16 Exhibit L to Ou Decl, # 17 Exhibit M to Ou Decl, # 18 Exhibit N to Ou Decl, # 19 Exhibit O to Ou Decl, # 20 Exhibit P to Ou Decl, # 21 Exhibit Q to Ou Decl, # 22 Exhibit R to Ou Decl, # 23 Exhibit S to Ou Decl, # 24 Exhibit T to Ou Decl, # 25 Proposed Order to Motion for Fees)(Ou, Philip) (Filed on 11/26/2012) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Newegg's Motion for Declaration of Exceptional Case and Award of Fees, Supporting Declarations and Certain Exhibits filed by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration)(Ou, Philip) (Filed on 11/26/2012) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS BETWEEN SITE UPDATE SOLUTIONS, LLC AND NEWEGG INC. by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 646 Stipulation (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS BETWEEN SITE UPDATE SOLUTIONS, AND NEWEGG, LLC filed by Newegg Inc., Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 11/8/2012) Modified on 11/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT re 642 filed by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 11/1/2012) Modified on 11/13/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 643 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: Attorney Alisa Anne Lipski withdrawn. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Alisa A. Lipski. Responses due by 11/6/2012. Replies due by 11/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lipski, Alisa) (Filed on 10/23/2012) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) and the Counterclaims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1). Motion Hearing set for 11/27/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 11/1/2012. Replies due by 11/8/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 10/18/2012) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 640 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: Attorney Harry Lee Laxton, Jr withdrawn. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Responses due by 10/12/2012. Replies due by 10/19/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Laxton, Harry) (Filed on 9/28/2012) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Status Conference held. (Date Filed: 9/25/2012). (Court Reporter FTR: (1:15 to 1:18.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/25/2012) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 638 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR SEPTEMBER 25, 2012 FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE, granting 637 Notice (Other): Plaintiffs counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 9/24/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 638 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR SEPTEMBER 25, 2012 FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE, granting 637 Notice (Other): Plaintiffs counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 9/24/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Plaintiff's Request and Proposed Order to Appear Telephonically for the Further Status Conference (Lipski, Alisa) (Filed on 9/21/2012) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Status Conference held. Further Status Conference set for 9/25/2012 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (Date Filed: 9/18/2012).(Court Reporter FTR: (2:02 to 2:07.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/18/2012) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 635 Filed: 9/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE re 634 Notice (Other) Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 14, 2012. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 635 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE re 634 Notice (Other) Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 14, 2012. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/14/2012
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Plaintiff's Request and Proposed Order to Appear Telephonically for the Further Status Conference (Lipski, Alisa) (Filed on 9/11/2012) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Status Conference held. Further Status Conference set for 9/18/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (Date Filed: 9/4/2012)(Court Reporter FTR: (3:36 to 3:39.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/4/2012) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 07-20-12, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/4/2012. (las, ) (Filed on 9/5/2012) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME ON 9/4/2012 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 9/4/2012 2:00 PM Further Case Management Conference reset to 3:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 630 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF SITE UPDATE SOLUTIONS LLC'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR SEPTEMBER 4, 2012 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, granting 629 Notice (Other). Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/29/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 630 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF SITE UPDATE SOLUTIONS LLC'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR SEPTEMBER 4, 2012 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, granting 629 Notice (Other). Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/29/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Plaintiff's Request and Proposed Order to Appear Telephonically for the Further Case Management Conference (Lipski, Alisa) (Filed on 8/28/2012) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 8/21/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 8/21/2012). Further Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter FTR: (3:02 to 3:08.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2012) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME ON 8/21/2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 8/21/2012 2:00 PM Case Management Conference reset to 3:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  PLAINTIFF SITE UPDATE SOLUTIONS LLC'S REQUEST AND ORDER TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 625 Motion to Appear by Telephone: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    PLAINTIFF SITE UPDATE SOLUTIONS LLC'S MOTION AND (PROPOSED ORDER) TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Filed by Lipski, Alisa) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified on 8/21/2012 (tsh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS BETWEEN SITE UPDATE SOLUTIONS LLC AND CERTAIN DEFENDANTS by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 622 Stipulation (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement filed by Newegg Inc., Site Update Solutions LLC. (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 8/14/2012) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Order to Dismiss All Claims Between Site Update Solutions LLC and Certain Defendants filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., Linkedin Corporation, NBC Universal Inc, Overstock.Com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc. (Lipski, Alisa) (Filed on 8/13/2012) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by CDW LLC of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Chung, Frederick) (Filed on 8/13/2012) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by CDW LLC Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Horton, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/6/2012) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Claims Construction hearing held on 7/20/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 7/20/2012). Court issues order as to claims construction from the bench. (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/20/2012) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 7/13/2012 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 7/13/2012). (Court Reporter FTR: (9:53 to 11:47.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/13/2012) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER ON REQUEST TO BRING PRESENTATION EQUIPMENT TO COURT FOR MARKMAN TUTORIAL AND HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 616 Stipulation (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request to Bring Presentation Equipment to Court for Markman Tutorial and Hearing and (Proposed) Order filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation. (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 7/13/2012) Text modified on 7/13/2012 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY HARRY LAXTON JR. PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 613 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME ON 7/20/2012 CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION HEARING: 7/20/2012 10:00 a.m. Claims Construction Hearing reset to 01:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Application for Admission of Attorney Harry Laxton, Jr for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Site Update Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6959787.). (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (Schultz, Matthew) (Filed on 7/11/2012) Text modified on 7/12/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., Linkedin Corporation, NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.Com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 7/6/2012) Text modified on 7/9/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS BETWEEN SITE UPDATE SOLUTIONS LLC AND HSN, INC. WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 610 Stipulation (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS BETWEEN SITE UPDATE SOLUTIONS LLC AND HSN, INC. WITH PREJUDICE filed by HSN Inc. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 7/6/2012) Modified on 7/6/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Louis Perito (Perito, Andrew) (Filed on 7/5/2012) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply Claim Construction Brief re 607 filed by Site Update Solutions LLC's (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5) (Lipski, Alisa) (Filed on 7/2/2012) Modified on 7/2/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Responsive Claim Construction Brief re 605 by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., Linkedin Corporation, NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.Com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Bruce MacDowell Maggs in Support of Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Brief, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Brief, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Brief, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Brief, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Brief, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Brief, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Brief, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Brief) (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 6/22/2012) Text modified on 6/25/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook Inc (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 6/13/2012) TExt modified on 6/14/2012 conforming to posted document caption, incorrect event type used when posting document (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opening Claim Construction Brief by Site Update Solutions LLC's (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - RE 40,683 Patent [SUS000001-16], # 2 Exhibit B - Amendment [SUS000235-241])(Lipski, Alisa) (Filed on 6/8/2012) Text modified on 6/11/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request for Termination of Electronic Notices by Charles John Rogers (Rogers, Charles) (Filed on 5/1/2012) Text modified on 5/2/2012; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT [PATENT L.R. 4-3] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lipski, Alisa) (Filed on 5/1/2012) Modified on 5/2/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SUBMISSION OF JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT AND ORDER, granting 601 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 4/26/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SUBMISSION OF JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT (Lipski, Alisa) (Filed on 4/24/2012) Modified on 4/24/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 599 Motion to Dismiss entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Each party shall be responsible for its own attorneys fees and costs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Modified on 4/25/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss CDW, CDW LLC with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 and (Proposed) Order Responses due by 5/4/2012. Replies due by 5/11/2012. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (Lipski, Alisa) (Filed on 4/20/2012) Modified on 4/20/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Rule 7.1 Disclosure by CDW LLC (Horton, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/4/2012) Modified on 1/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Overstock.Com Inc (Pitha, Martin) (Filed on 1/4/2012) Modified on 1/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Site Update Solutions LLC's Rule 7-1 Disclosures . (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 1/4/2012) Modified on 1/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook Inc. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 1/3/2012) Modified on 1/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 1/3/2012) Modified on 1/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com Inc. (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 1/3/2012) Modified on 1/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intuit Inc. (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 1/3/2012) Modified on 1/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Linkedin Corporation. (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 1/3/2012) Modified on 1/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Newegg Inc. (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 1/3/2012) Modified on 1/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sears Roebuck and Co. (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 1/3/2012) Modified on 1/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation. (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 1/3/2012) Modified on 1/5/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance of Alisa Anne Lipski by Site Update Solutions, LLC (Lipski, Alisa) (Filed on 12/20/2011) Modified on 12/21/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/20/2012,10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2012, 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Close of Fact Discovery set for 11/12/2012. Close of Expert Discovery set for 1/7/2013. Final date for Dispositive Motions hearing set for 2/26/2013, 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2013, 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Trial set for 4/15/2013, 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/15/2011. (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 12/15/2011 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case management scheduling order to be issued. (Date Filed: 12/15/2011). (Court Reporter FTR: (2:00 to 2:30.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2011) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTby American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. (Heimbold, Michael) (Filed on 12/14/2011) Modified on 12/15/2011 Incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by HSN Inc. (Werber, Matthew) (Filed on 12/12/2011) Modified on 12/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 579 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 577 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Benjamin T. Horton for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re 579 by CDW LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Admission of Attorney Benjamin T. Horton for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 54611010958) filed by CDW LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  (Proposed) Order granting Application for Admission of Attorney Thomas L. Duston for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re 577 by CDW LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Admission of Attorney Thomas L. Duston for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 54611010958) filed by CDW LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Case Management Statement and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Report (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 12/8/2011) Modified on 12/9/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance filed by Defendant CDW LLC (Chung, Frederick) (Filed on 12/7/2011) Modified on 12/8/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2011 at 02:00 PM (Special Set) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2011. ***THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Grewal for All Purposes. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/6/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 572 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS BETWEEN SITE UPDATE SOLUTIONS LLC AND WAL-MART STORES, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 571 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/6/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order To Dismiss All Claims Between Site Update Solutions LLC and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Without Prejudice (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 12/5/2011) Modified on 12/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores Inc OF DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE (de Gyarfas, Victor) (Filed on 12/2/2011) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Joint Response Regarding Reassignment to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation. (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 12/2/2011) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 565 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Edward W. Goldstein. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement by Choice Hotels International Inc. (King, Edward) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re Consent to Magistrate Judge Grewal. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/28/2011. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011) Modified on 11/29/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION of Edward W. Goldstein for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611067155.) filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 560 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Tremayne Norris. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 559 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for John Caracappa. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Ou (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 9/30/2011) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 556 Motion to Continue (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION of Tremayne Norris for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007649.) filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION of John Caracappa for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007649.) filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory R Lyons (Lyons, Gregory) (Filed on 9/26/2011) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Elizabeth Stameshkin in Support of 556 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference to December 15, 2011 filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) 556 ) (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 9/21/2011) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference to December 15, 2011 filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 9/21/2011) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 554 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Paul A. Gennari. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Paul A. Gennari (Filing fee $275, receipt number 44611007512) filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(kcS, ) (Filed on 8/29/2011) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 550 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Joseph R. Lanser. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 549 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Matthew A. Werber. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Richard Heimbold (Heimbold, Michael) (Filed on 8/26/2011) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION of Joseph R. Lanser for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007503.) filed by HSN Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION of Matthew A. Werber for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007502.) filed by HSN Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 544 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for John Allen Yates. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 543 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Aaron Shield. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 542 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Schenck. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 541 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for John H. Barr. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION of John Allen Yates for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007480.) filed by Overstock.Com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION of Christopher Aaron Shield for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007480.) filed by Overstock.Com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION of Christopher Schenck for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007480.) filed by Overstock.Com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION of John H. Barr for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007480.) filed by Overstock.Com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011) Modified on 8/23/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 533 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Kevin P. Anderson. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 532 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Gregory Lyons. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS MONSTER WORLDWIDE, INC. WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 510 Motion to Dismiss (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS MYSPACE, INC. WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 509 Motion to Dismiss (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 510 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Monster Worldwide, Inc. with Prejudice. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 509 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion to Dismiss MySpace, Inc.. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/19/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION of Kevin P. Anderson for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007458.) filed by Choice Hotels International Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION of Gregory R. Lyons for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007459.) filed by Choice Hotels International Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Christina Marie Von Der Ahe (Von Der Ahe, Christina) (Filed on 8/16/2011) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/16/11. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Richard Mosko for Enterprise Holdings, Inc. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (de Gyarfas, Victor) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by HSN Inc. (Butler, Lawrence) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence E. Butler (Butler, Lawrence) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by CDW LLC. (Horton, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.. (Winston, R.) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., Linkedin Corporation, MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation. (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Facebook Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Overstock.Com Inc. (Pitha, Martin) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Choice Hotels International Inc. (King, Edward) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by CBS Corp, CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Staples Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Lukas Pitha (Pitha, Martin) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge for Plaintiff Site Update Solutions, LLC.. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 8/2/2011) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE re Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge due by August 12, 2011. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 509 Joint MOTION to Dismiss MySpace, Inc. by MySpace Inc. (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 7/26/2011) Modified on 7/27/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Dirk van Ausdall (van Ausdall, Dirk) (Filed on 7/26/2011) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Vincent King, Jr (King, Edward) (Filed on 7/26/2011) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss Monster Worldwide, Inc. with Prejudice filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Worldwide Inc. Responses due by 8/2/2011. Replies due by 8/9/2011. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 7/19/2011) Modified on 7/20/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Motion to Dismiss MySpace, Inc. with Prejudice filed by MySpace Inc. and Site Update Solutions LLC. Responses due by 8/1/2011. Replies due by 8/8/2011. (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 7/18/2011) Modified on 7/19/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERKS NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer from the Eastern District of Texas, Case No. 10-cv-151. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:10-cv-00151. Case Electronically Transfered, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 7/13/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 502 Motion for Extension of Time to File Their Reply Claim Construction Brief 6/17/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/8/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 373 Motion to Change Venue. Accordingly, the court GRANTS Dfts motion to transfer venue to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/8/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Reply Claim Construction Brief by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INDEFINITENESS AS TO CLAIM 8 OF U.S. PATENT RE40,683 by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Corp, CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, David) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 494 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Corp, CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc,>. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Stein, David) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to 494 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of V. de Gyarfas, # 2 Exhibit 1 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 6 Exhibit 5 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 7 Exhibit 6 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 8 Exhibit 7 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 9 Exhibit 8 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 10 Exhibit 9 to de Gyarfas Decl.)(DeGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores Inc of Service of Second Supplement to P.R. 3-3 Disclosures re Invalidity Contentions (DeGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 496 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William Bryan Farney; Bryan Donivan Atkinson and Steven Robert Daniels terminated as counsel of record for Monster Worldwide, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/25/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Monster Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Atkinson, Bryan) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 493 Motion for Leave to File. Walmart is granted leave to supplement its invalidity contentions and serve its Supplemental Invalidity Contentions on Plaintiff within two weeks of the entry of this Order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/16/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff Site Update Solutions, Inc.'s Opening CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Re40,683 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - Amendment under 37 CRF 1.111, # 3 Exhibit C - '198 Patent, # 4 Exhibit D - 2nd Suppl Amd to Correct Defects in Reissue)(Lipski, Alisa) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 491 Defendant Red Hat, Inc. Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims Against Site Update Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/12/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims Against Site Update Solutions, LLC by Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrews, John) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 490 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, granting 488 MOTION to Dismiss Red Hat, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Red Hat, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/9/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, granting 487 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/6/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Red Hat, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert L Masterson for Monster Worldwide Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-497) (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Justin F Boyce for Monster Worldwide Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-497) (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 483 Motion to Stay Deadlines. D eadlines for Starwood for 30 days, up to 5/18/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/19/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Site Update Solutions LLC Joint Claim Construction and Pre-Hearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael G Rhodes for Facebook Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-2774. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 476 Motion to Vacate Claim Construction Dates Pending Disposition of Transfer Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/12/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 478 Motion to Stay Deadlines. Court GRANTS the Unopposed Motion and stays deadlines for Starwood for 14 days, up to and including 4/18/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/6/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, NBC Universal Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Staples Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc Request To Terminate Electronic Notification Of Filings (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION to Vacate Claim Construction Dates Pending Disposition of Transfer Motion by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores Inc (DeGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc (Defendants' Notice of P.R. 4-2 Disclosure) (Andrews, John) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Site Update Solutions LLC Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 471 Motion to extend Patent Rule 4-2.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/24/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION To Extend Patent Rule 4-2 Deadline by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Corp, CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Site Update Solutions LLC, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrews, John) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 469 Motion to Stay deadlines for Starwood for 14 days, up to and including April 4, 2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/22/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines for Defendant Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - granting 467 Joint Motion to Postpone Claim Construction Related Deadlines. Claim Construction Hearing set for 8/3/2011 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/14/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Continue JOINT MOTION TO POSTPONE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION-RELATED DEADLINES by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Corp, CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Site Update Solutions LLC, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, David) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc re 373 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 464 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Elaine Gunter and Herbert A Yarbrough, III terminated as counsel for Newegg Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/22/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 462 Motion to Withdraw. Defendants CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group Inc., Daily News L.P., Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc., Home Box Office Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Staples, Inc., Time Inc., and Ticketmaster L.L.C., withdraws Patricia Young as counsel of record for these defts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/18/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Counsel of Record by CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Staples Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Site Update Solutions LLC Notice of Compliance (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 459 Motion to Stay Deadlines For Defendant Starwood. Deadlines for Starwood for 30 days, up to and including March 21, 2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/10/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc NOTICE OF SERVICE OF P.R. 4-1 EXCHANGE OF PROPOSED TERMS AND CLAIM ELEMENTS FOR CONSTRUCTION (Stein, David) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Site Update Solutions LLC of Service of Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction. (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores Inc re Service of Supplemental P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (deGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew A Werber for HSN Inc.(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-263) (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 453 Motion for Leave to To Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions. Walmart is granted leave to supplement its invalidity contentions and serve its Supplemental Invalidity Contentions on Plaintiff within a week of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/27/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement Its Invalidity Contention by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(deGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by HSN Inc -- Notice of Disclosure of P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions and P.R. 3-4 Documentation -- (Thames, Earl) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, granting 450 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Deli Management, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, and Deli Management, Inc. Deli Management, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/20/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss Deli Management, Inc. by Deli Management, Inc., Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Choice Hotels International Inc Pursuant to PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores Inc Notice of Service of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (deGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by CDW LLC (Notice of Service of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures) (Horton, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 438 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey G. Homrig terminated as counsel for Defendants CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group Inc., Daily News L.P., Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc., Home Box Office Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Staples, Inc., Time Inc., and Ticketmaster L.L.C.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/18/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 1/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation (Notice of Service of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures) (Stein, David) (Entered: 01/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 1/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Staples Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc (Notice of Service of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures) (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Facebook Inc. Pursuant to PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Stameshkin, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Overstock.com Inc Pursuant to PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Schenck, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Caracappa, John) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Monster Worldwide Inc Pursuant to PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Counsel of Record) by CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Staples Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bret Bocchieri for HSN Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-221 (ch, ) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 434 Motion for Defendants to comply with P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4. Deadline extended to 1/14/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/11/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 431 Motion Stay Deadlines for Defendant Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on January 10, 2011. (jml) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Comply with P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Aweber Systems Inc, CBS Corp, CBS Interactive Inc., CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Deli Management, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., Jasons Deli Corp, LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc, Target Corporation, The Walt Disney Company, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Time Warner, Inc.,, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, granting 430 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Nissan North America, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Nissan North America Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/7/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, granting 427 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Thomson Reuters Holdings, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC; Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/6/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss Nissan North America, Inc. by Nissan North America Inc, Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, granting 428 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Wyndham Worldwide Corporation filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Wyndham Worldwide Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Inc terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/5/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Dismiss Wyndham Worldwide Corporation by Site Update Solutions LLC, Wyndham Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Dismiss Thomson Reuters Holdings, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Site Update Solutions LLC Notice of Firm Name Change for Edward W. Goldstein, Corby R. Vowell, Alisa A. Lipski and Wendy L. Boone (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Serve Initial Disclosures by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 418 Motion for Joinder. Defendant Overstock.com, Inc. is joined in Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (Dkt. 373).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/15/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 422 Motion for Extension of Time seeking an extension of time to serve its Initial Disclosures. Deadline extended to 12/27/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/14/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Serve Initial Disclosures by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Monster Worldwide Inc of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Choice Hotels International Inc of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 373 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc. (Stein, David) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Overstock.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, John) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 416 Motion for Joinder to Join in Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California, dkt # 373 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/7/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (Dkt. 373) by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, granting 413 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Office Max, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Office Max Inc., Office Max Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/3/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/2/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss Office Max, Inc. by Office Max Inc, Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher Schenck for Overstock.com Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-146(ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2010: # 1 Confidential Information) (ch, ). (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Protective Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 373 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Reply / ANSWER to 374 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of HSN, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 407 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit protective Order. The parties shall have until December 1, 2010 to submit an agreed Protective Order or the portions agreed and in dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/29/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Protective Order by Wyndham Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, David) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 403 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Response due by 11/29/2010. Reply due by 12/8/2010.Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on November 24, 2010. (jml) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 402 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Deadline. OfficeMax, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures due December 10, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on November 24, 2010. (jml) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Site Update Solutions LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Amended Initial Disclosures (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 373 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Initial Disclosures by Office Max Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. (Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. James W. Knowles, 909 ESE Loop 323, Suit 410, Tyler, Texas 75701, telephone number 903.534.3800 and fax number 903.534.3806, is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Mediation shall be completed by December 4, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/18/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Site Update Solutions LLC Parties Notice of Agreement To A Mediator (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 396 Motion for extention of time to Submit Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/17/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time of Submit Protective Order by Wyndham Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lance) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 390 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Defendant Adobe Systems Incorporated will have through November 19, 2010 to serve its Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/15/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 383 Motion to serve its initial disclosures. Deadline extended to 11/26/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/15/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 382 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Defendant Monster Worldwide, Inc. will have through December 13, 2010 to serve its Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/15/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 11/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Adobe Systems Incorporated Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Stein, David) (Entered: 11/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Stein, David) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery To Serve Initial Disclosures by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, David) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores Inc of Service of Initial Disclosures (deGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Site Update Solutions LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance with Initial Disclosures (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by CDW LLC Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Horton, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Overstock.com Inc /Defendant Overstock.Com, Inc.'s Notice of Initial Disclosures (Barr, John) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Staples Inc, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc (Notice of Compliance With Local Rule 26(c)) (Andrews, John) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Facebook Inc. Regarding Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Stameshkin, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Deadline re Initial Disclosures by Office Max Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Rule 26(a)(1)) Initial Disclosures by Monster Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, granting 377 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Accor North America, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Accor North America Inc. Accor North America Inc terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/12/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 376 Motion for Extension of Time seeking an extension of time to serve its Initial Disclosures. Defendant Starwood Hotels &Resorts Worldwide, Inc. will have through December 13, 2010 to serve its Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/12/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 375 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Choice Hotels International, Inc. has to service its Initial Disclosures to Plaintiff up to and including December 3, 2010.Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/12/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Dismiss Accor North America, Inc. by Accor North America Inc, Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Serve Initial Disclosures by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Choice Hotels International Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First Amended ANSWER to 182 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by HSN Inc.(Lanser, Joseph) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, granting 369 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Salesforce.com, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Salesforce.com Inc. Salesforce.com Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/29/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's ANSWER to 321 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Red Hat, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's ANSWER to 319 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Dismiss Salesforce.com, Inc. by Salesforce.com Inc, Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 367 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Salesforce.com Inc deadline is extended to 11/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/25/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond (Fourth) to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Salesforce.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. (jml) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing:Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. (jml) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/10, time to be set at a later date. Joinder of Parties due by 3/18/2011., Markman Hearing set for 7/13/2011 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/20/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - The Court adopts the parties discovery provisions as outlined in the Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Conference (Dkt. No. 357).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/20/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2010. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney sign-in sheet) (jml) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 358 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant salesforce.com, inc. will have throughOctober 22, 2010 to answer,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/18/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aden Martin Allen on behalf of Salesforce.com Inc (Allen, Aden) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Repond (Third) to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Salesforce.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Docket Control Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2010: # 2 Exhibit A - REVISED REMOVED THE PROPOSED OFF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER) (ch, ). (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Gabriel Fountain on behalf of Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc (Fountain, Aaron) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 351 Motion to Dismiss Dft MSNBC Interactive News. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/14/2010. (sm, ) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Dwain Mazingo on behalf of HSN Inc (Mazingo, Jason) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl Glenn Thames, Jr on behalf of HSN Inc (Thames, Earl) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wendy Lynn Boone on behalf of Site Update Solutions LLC (Boone, Wendy) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION to Dismiss MSNBC Interactive News, LLC by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's ANSWER to 302 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Wyndham Worldwide Corporation by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's ANSWER to 242 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's ANSWER to 262 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Time, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's ANSWER to 261 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Ticketmaster L.L.C. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's ANSWER to 260 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Thomson Reuters Holdings, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's ANSWER to 300 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Target Corporation by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's ANSWER to 259 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Staples, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's ANSWER to 298 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Sears, Roebuck and Co. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's ANSWER to 243 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Overstock.com, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's ANSWER to 267 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Nissan North America, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's ANSWER to 278 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Deli Management, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's ANSWER to 296 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Newegg, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's ANSWER to 258 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim NBC Universal, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's ANSWER to 294 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Myspace, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's ANSWER to 292 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Linkedin Corporation by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's ANSWER to 290 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Intuit, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's ANSWER to 255 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Home Box Office, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's ANSWER to 253 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's ANSWER to 254 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Facebook, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's ANSWER to 241 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's ANSWER to 251 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Electronic Arts, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint 209 Amended Complaint,,, First Amended Answer by Monster Worldwide Inc. (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's ANSWER to 250 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Daily News L.P. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's ANSWER to 249 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim CNN Interactive Group, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's ANSWER to 248 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim CBS Interactive Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's ANSWER to 288 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Amazon.com, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's ANSWER to 286 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Adobe Systems Incorporated by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE -- Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2010 02:40 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on October 7, 2010. (jml) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Red Hat, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant Red Hat, Inc.'s ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Red Hat, Inc..(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Walt Disney Company, Corporate Parent ABC Holding Company Inc. for American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.. (Caracappa, John) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc..(Caracappa, John) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Scott Andrews on behalf of Red Hat, Inc. (Andrews, John) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Red Hat, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CDW LLC identifying Corporate Parent CDW Corporation of Delaware for CDW LLC. (Horton, Benjamin) Modified on 10/5/2010 to add Supplemental to docket entry per attorney (ehs, ). (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 314 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant salesforce.com, inc. will have through October 15, 2010 to answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/4/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Salesforce.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey G. Homrig on behalf of CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (Homrig, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina Marie Von der Ahe on behalf of CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (Von der Ahe, Christina) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patricia Young on behalf of CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (Young, Patricia) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Reines on behalf of CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (Reines, Edward) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's ANSWER to 228 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim HSN, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Allen Yates on behalf of Overstock.com Inc (Yates, John) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2010 02:40 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Choice Hotels International Inc identifying Corporate Parent None for Choice Hotels International Inc. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nissan North America Inc identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. for Nissan North America Inc. (Patterson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 265 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant salesforce.com, inc.s Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant salesforce.com, inc. will have through October 1, 2010 to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/22/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wyndham Worldwide Inc identifying Other Affiliate Vanguard Windsor Funds for Wyndham Worldwide Inc. (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Wyndham Worldwide Inc.(Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Target Corporation (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Target Corporation.(Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sears Roebuck and Co identifying Corporate Parent Sears Holdings Corporation for Sears Roebuck and Co. (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Sears Roebuck and Co.(Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Newegg Inc. (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Newegg Inc..(Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MySpace Inc. identifying Corporate Parent News Corporation, Corporate Parent Fox Interactive Media for MySpace Inc.. (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by MySpace Inc..(Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LinkedIn Corporation (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by LinkedIn Corporation.(Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intuit Inc. (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Intuit Inc..(Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon.com Inc (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace