Walker v. Corepower Yoga LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-00004-WQH-DHB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2016 at 3:51 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Gillian Walker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Blanchard Krasner & French

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Hawkes dhawkes@bkflaw.com
v.
No Logo Corepower Yoga, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil L. Arney +1 303 297 2400 +1 303 292 7799 neil.arney@kutakrock.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mia K. Della Cava +1 303 297 2400 +1 303 292 7799 mia.dellacava@kutakrock.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher D Glos +1 213 312 4000 christopher.glos@kutakrock.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig C. Corbitt +1 415 693 0700 +1 415 693 0770 ccorbitt@zelle.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rory D Zamansky +1 612 359 4280 +1 612 336 9100 rzamansky@zelle.com
No Logo Does, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 46 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The Motion to Remand is GRANTED. (Doc. 25 ) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1447(c), this action is REMANDED to San Diego County Superior Court, where it was originally filed and assigned case number 37-2011-00101074-CU-OE-CTL. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/24/2013. (Certified copy sent to State Court via US Mail Service.) (mdc)
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 6/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER Granting 15 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 6/1/2012. (leh)
      LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 32 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?