Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation v. RF Micro Devices, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-00911-IEG-WMC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 24, 2016 at 10:19 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan H. Blankenheimer +1 858 678 1800 +1 858 678 1600 ablankenheimer@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher K Eppich +1 858 678 1800 +1 858 678 1600 ceppich@cov.com
TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lesli Rawles Gallagher +1 858 678 1807 lgallagher@cov.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Rene Gioia +1 858 678 1800 +1 858 678 1606 jgioia@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Luce Goldstein +1 415 591 7024 dgoldstein@cov.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Keiller Hampton +1 202 662 5697 +1 202 778 5697 ahampton@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T. Haslam, III +1 650 632 4702 +1 650 632 4800 rhaslam@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Elizabeth Muschamp +1 858 450 5816 +1 858 587 5972 lmuschamp@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Jean O'Connell +1 858 678 1811 +1 858 678 1611 soconnell@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen C. Whittaker +1 858 678 1800 cwhittaker@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ellis & Winters Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JONATHAN ARTHUR BERKELHAMMER +1 336 389 5683 +1 336 217 4198 jon.berkelhammer@elliswinters.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTOPHER W. JACKSON +1 336 389 5686 +1 336 217 4198 chris.jackson@elliswinters.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Hamilton Segars +1 919 865 7000 +1 919 865 7010 tom.segars@elliswinters.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES M. WEISS +1 919 865 7000 james.weiss@elliswinters.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaquez & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/09/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY MARTIN JOSEPH JAQUEZ, ESQ

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of ELIZABETH J BONDURANT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Marsh Prause +1 336 378 5380 marsh.prause@smithmoorelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Peterson, Mike

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Nieberg +1 212 841 1000 gnieberg@cov.gom

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Moore Leatherwood LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/08/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LESLIE COOPER HARRELL +1 336 378 5200 +1 336 378 5400 cooper.harrell@smithmoorelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Tyler Spence +1 704 384 2667 +1 704 384 2928 andy.spence@smithmoorelaw.com
Motorola Mobility, Inc. Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Olavi Dunne LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/26/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian James Dunne +1 213 516 7900 +1 213 516 7910 bdunne@olavidunne.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick Alan Lorig +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 fredericklorig@quinnemanuel.com
Space Christopher A Mathews +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 chrismathews@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Rf Micro Devices, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Olavi Dunne LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian James Dunne +1 213 516 7900 +1 213 516 7910 bdunne@olavidunne.com
TERMINATED: 11/26/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian James Dunne +1 213 516 7900 +1 213 516 7910 bdunne@olavidunne.com
TERMINATED: 11/26/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian James Dunne +1 213 516 7900 +1 213 516 7910 bdunne@olavidunne.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Adam Basinger +1 202 538 8000 +1 202 538 8100 charlesbasinger@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Adam Basinger +1 202 538 8000 +1 202 538 8100 charlesbasinger@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Adam Basinger +1 202 538 8000 +1 202 538 8100 charlesbasinger@quinnemanuel.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul F. Brinkman +1 202 538 8102 +1 202 538 8100 paulbrinkman@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul F. Brinkman +1 202 538 8102 +1 202 538 8100 paulbrinkman@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul F. Brinkman +1 202 538 8102 +1 202 538 8100 paulbrinkman@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Cannon +1 415 875 6412 matthewcannon@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Cannon +1 415 875 6412 matthewcannon@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Cannon +1 415 875 6412 matthewcannon@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Michael Holmes +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 drewholmes@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Michael Holmes +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 drewholmes@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Nai-Shu Kang +1 415 875 6318 robertkang@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aileen Jeeseon Kim +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 aileenkim@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick Alan Lorig +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 fredericklorig@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick Alan Lorig +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 fredericklorig@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick Alan Lorig +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 fredericklorig@quinnemanuel.com
Space Christopher A Mathews +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 chrismathews@quinnemanuel.com
Space Christopher A Mathews +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 chrismathews@quinnemanuel.com
Space Christopher A Mathews +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 chrismathews@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared Weston Newton +1 202 538 8108 jarednewton@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared Weston Newton +1 202 538 8108 jarednewton@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared Weston Newton +1 202 538 8108 jarednewton@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean S. Pak +1 415 875 6320 +1 415 395 8095 seanpak@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean S. Pak +1 415 875 6320 +1 415 395 8095 seanpak@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles McLean Stiernberg, Jr. +1 650 801 5000 charliestiernberg@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amar L. Thakur +1 213 443 3263 amarthakur@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amar L. Thakur +1 213 443 3263 amarthakur@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Yeh-Kai Tung +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 marktung@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Yeh-Kai Tung +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 marktung@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Kramer Verhoeven +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 charlesverhoeven@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Kramer Verhoeven +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 charlesverhoeven@quinnemanuel.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R. Volkmuth +1 202 538 8200 DanielVolkmuth@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R. Volkmuth +1 202 538 8200 DanielVolkmuth@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R. Volkmuth +1 202 538 8200 DanielVolkmuth@quinnemanuel.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brett Nelson Watkins +1 202 538 8000 +1 202 538 8100 brettwatkins@quinnemanuel.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brett Nelson Watkins +1 202 538 8000 +1 202 538 8100 brettwatkins@quinnemanuel.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brett Nelson Watkins +1 202 538 8000 +1 202 538 8100 brettwatkins@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Luke B Weiger +1 650 331 2000 +1 650 331 2060 lukeweiger@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Luke B Weiger +1 650 331 2000 +1 650 331 2060 lukeweiger@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Luke B Weiger +1 650 331 2000 +1 650 331 2060 lukeweiger@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1950

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Laban Singer +1 415 500 6077 +1 415 500 6080 bsinger@singerbea.com
v.
No Logo John Does, Defendant
Motorola Mobility, Inc. Motorola Mobility, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Olavi Dunne LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/26/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian James Dunne +1 213 516 7900 +1 213 516 7910 bdunne@olavidunne.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick Alan Lorig +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 fredericklorig@quinnemanuel.com
Space Christopher A Mathews +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 chrismathews@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Rf Micro Devices, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Olavi Dunne LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(Inactive), TERMINATED: 11/26/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian James Dunne +1 213 516 7900 +1 213 516 7910 bdunne@olavidunne.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Adam Basinger +1 202 538 8000 +1 202 538 8100 charlesbasinger@quinnemanuel.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul F. Brinkman +1 202 538 8102 +1 202 538 8100 paulbrinkman@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Cannon +1 415 875 6412 matthewcannon@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Michael Holmes +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 drewholmes@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Nai-Shu Kang +1 415 875 6318 robertkang@quinnemanuel.com
(Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aileen Jeeseon Kim +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 aileenkim@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick Alan Lorig +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 fredericklorig@quinnemanuel.com
Space Christopher A Mathews +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 chrismathews@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared Weston Newton +1 202 538 8108 jarednewton@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean S. Pak +1 415 875 6320 +1 415 395 8095 seanpak@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles McLean Stiernberg, Jr. +1 650 801 5000 charliestiernberg@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amar L. Thakur +1 213 443 3263 amarthakur@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Yeh-Kai Tung +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 marktung@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Kramer Verhoeven +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 charlesverhoeven@quinnemanuel.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R. Volkmuth +1 202 538 8200 DanielVolkmuth@quinnemanuel.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brett Nelson Watkins +1 202 538 8000 +1 202 538 8100 brettwatkins@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Luke B Weiger +1 650 331 2000 +1 650 331 2060 lukeweiger@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1950

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Laban Singer +1 415 500 6077 +1 415 500 6080 bsinger@singerbea.com
No Logo Robert Benton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Singer / Bea LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter C. Pfeffer +1 415 500 6080 +1 415 500 6080 wpfeffer@singerbea.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1950

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Laban Singer +1 415 500 6077 +1 415 500 6080 bsinger@singerbea.com
No Logo Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan H. Blankenheimer +1 858 678 1800 +1 858 678 1600 ablankenheimer@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan H. Blankenheimer +1 858 678 1800 +1 858 678 1600 ablankenheimer@cov.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan H. Blankenheimer +1 858 678 1800 +1 858 678 1600 ablankenheimer@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher K Eppich +1 858 678 1800 +1 858 678 1600 ceppich@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher K Eppich +1 858 678 1800 +1 858 678 1600 ceppich@cov.com
TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lesli Rawles Gallagher +1 858 678 1807 lgallagher@cov.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Rene Gioia +1 858 678 1800 +1 858 678 1606 jgioia@cov.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Rene Gioia +1 858 678 1800 +1 858 678 1606 jgioia@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Luce Goldstein +1 415 591 7024 dgoldstein@cov.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Keiller Hampton +1 202 662 5697 +1 202 778 5697 ahampton@cov.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Keiller Hampton +1 202 662 5697 +1 202 778 5697 ahampton@cov.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Keiller Hampton +1 202 662 5697 +1 202 778 5697 ahampton@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T. Haslam, III +1 650 632 4702 +1 650 632 4800 rhaslam@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T. Haslam, III +1 650 632 4702 +1 650 632 4800 rhaslam@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Elizabeth Muschamp +1 858 450 5816 +1 858 587 5972 lmuschamp@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Elizabeth Muschamp +1 858 450 5816 +1 858 587 5972 lmuschamp@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Elizabeth Muschamp +1 858 450 5816 +1 858 587 5972 lmuschamp@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Jean O'Connell +1 858 678 1811 +1 858 678 1611 soconnell@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Jean O'Connell +1 858 678 1811 +1 858 678 1611 soconnell@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Jean O'Connell +1 858 678 1811 +1 858 678 1611 soconnell@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen C. Whittaker +1 858 678 1800 cwhittaker@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ellis & Winters Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JONATHAN ARTHUR BERKELHAMMER +1 336 389 5683 +1 336 217 4198 jon.berkelhammer@elliswinters.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JONATHAN ARTHUR BERKELHAMMER +1 336 389 5683 +1 336 217 4198 jon.berkelhammer@elliswinters.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JONATHAN ARTHUR BERKELHAMMER +1 336 389 5683 +1 336 217 4198 jon.berkelhammer@elliswinters.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTOPHER W. JACKSON +1 336 389 5686 +1 336 217 4198 chris.jackson@elliswinters.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTOPHER W. JACKSON +1 336 389 5686 +1 336 217 4198 chris.jackson@elliswinters.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTOPHER W. JACKSON +1 336 389 5686 +1 336 217 4198 chris.jackson@elliswinters.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Hamilton Segars +1 919 865 7000 +1 919 865 7010 tom.segars@elliswinters.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Hamilton Segars +1 919 865 7000 +1 919 865 7010 tom.segars@elliswinters.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Hamilton Segars +1 919 865 7000 +1 919 865 7010 tom.segars@elliswinters.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES M. WEISS +1 919 865 7000 james.weiss@elliswinters.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES M. WEISS +1 919 865 7000 james.weiss@elliswinters.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES M. WEISS +1 919 865 7000 james.weiss@elliswinters.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaquez & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/09/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY MARTIN JOSEPH JAQUEZ, ESQ
TERMINATED: 05/09/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY MARTIN JOSEPH JAQUEZ, ESQ
TERMINATED: 05/09/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY MARTIN JOSEPH JAQUEZ, ESQ

Toggle Switch Represented by Peterson, Mike

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Nieberg +1 212 841 1000 gnieberg@cov.gom
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Nieberg +1 212 841 1000 gnieberg@cov.gom
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Nieberg +1 212 841 1000 gnieberg@cov.gom

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Moore Leatherwood LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/08/2013, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LESLIE COOPER HARRELL +1 336 378 5200 +1 336 378 5400 cooper.harrell@smithmoorelaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/08/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LESLIE COOPER HARRELL +1 336 378 5200 +1 336 378 5400 cooper.harrell@smithmoorelaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/08/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LESLIE COOPER HARRELL +1 336 378 5200 +1 336 378 5400 cooper.harrell@smithmoorelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Marsh Prause +1 336 378 5380 marsh.prause@smithmoorelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Marsh Prause +1 336 378 5380 marsh.prause@smithmoorelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Marsh Prause +1 336 378 5380 marsh.prause@smithmoorelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Tyler Spence +1 704 384 2667 +1 704 384 2928 andy.spence@smithmoorelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Tyler Spence +1 704 384 2667 +1 704 384 2928 andy.spence@smithmoorelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Tyler Spence +1 704 384 2667 +1 704 384 2928 andy.spence@smithmoorelaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (293) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
REPORT of Patent and Trademark Closing, regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 7,910,993, 7,123,898, 7,460,852, 7,796,969, 7,860,499, re 313 Order on Motion to Dismiss. cc:USPTO (ag) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER Granting 312 Joint Motion to Dismiss. It is so ordered The Court, for good cause shown, grants Plaintiff Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation (Peregrine) and Defendant RF Micro Devices, Inc. joint motion, and dismisses the case with prejudice. This order also resolves the consolidated case. (See Case No. 13-cv-00725-H-JLB; Doc. No. 18.) Each party will bear its own attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/23/2014. (yeb)(jrd) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Blankenheimer, Alan)(aef). (Entered: 07/22/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 275 Motion to Amend Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 07/21/2014. (ag) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 307 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/16/2014. (sjt) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
            (Filed as Sealed Document 310 on 7/16/2014) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 307 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Whittaker, Stephen) (rlu). (Main Document 308 replaced on 7/17/2014) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 7/17/2014 (sjt). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
              MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Whittaker, Stephen) (rlu). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                REPLY to Response to Motion re 275 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Infringement Contentions filed by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Declaration of Stephen Christopher Whittaker, # 2 Exhibit 42-46 to Second Declaration of Whittaker)(Whittaker, Stephen) (ag). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER Submitting Plaintiff's 275 MOTION to Amend Invalidity Contentions. The Motion Hearing set for 07/21/2014 is vacated. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 07/11/2014.(ag) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 275 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Infringement Contentions filed by RF Micro Devices, Inc.(a North Carolina corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Weiger Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Weiger Dec, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Weiger Dec, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Weiger Dec, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Weiger Dec)(Neukom, John) (ag). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER Granting 301 Motion to Withdraw Lesli Rawles Gallagher as Attorney of Record. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 06/30/2014. (ag) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER Granting 300 Joint Motion for Stipulation Regarding Use of Declarations of IBM Corporation. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 06/30/2014. (ag) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Lesli Rawles Gallagher by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Eppich, Christopher) (ag). (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                            Joint MOTION for Stipulation Regarding Use of Declarations of IBM Corporation by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Eppich, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER Granting 257 Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 06/19/2014. (ag) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 293 Motion to Withdraw Jessica G. Baldwin as Attorney of Record. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 06/19/2014. (ag) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Joint Motion for Stipulation Regarding Admissibility of Evidence, Depositions, Document Production Reports and ORDER. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 6/18/2014.(kcm) (Main Document 297 replaced on 6/18/2014, for proper redactions) (kcm). (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER Submitting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, Motions Submitted 257 MOTION for Leave to File Amendeded Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 6/18/2014.(kcm) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 291 Motion to File Unredacted Reply and Accompanying Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 6/18/2014. (rlu) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record, Jessica G. Baldwin by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                          [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/18/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 291 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Whittaker, Stephen) (rlu). (Main Document 292 replaced on 6/18/2014) (rlu). Modified on 6/18/2014 to add file date of lodgment (rlu). (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                            MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Whittaker, Stephen) (rlu). (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 257 MOTION for Leave to File Amendeded Infringement Contentions filed by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Decl. of Stephen Christopher Whittaker, # 2 Exhibit 21-27 to Second Whittaker Decl.)(Whittaker, Stephen) (ag). (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER finding as moot 285 Motion to Quash. The telephonic conference set for 9:15 a.m. on 6/16/14 is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 6/16/14. (no document attached) (Burkhardt, Jill) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 6/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation of Withdrawal of Motion to Quash Subpoena to Laura Muschamp (Gallagher, Lesli) (ag). (Entered: 06/15/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 6/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Joint MOTION for Stipulation Regarding Admissibility of Evidence, Depositions, Document Production and Expert Reports by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit D)(Gallagher, Lesli) (ag). Modified on 7/7/2014 to term motion, motion was granted by Order No. 297 (ag). (Entered: 06/15/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 6/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt:Counsel for the parties are directed to meet and confer in person or by telephone no later than 6/16/2014 at 08:30 AM regarding PEREGRINE SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION AND LAURA MUSCHAMPS MOTION TO QUASH THE SUBPOENA TO LAURA MUSCHAMP 285 . The Court further SETS a counsel-only telephonic discovery conference for 6/16/2014 at 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Counsel are directed to place one call into Judge Burkhardt's chambers with all counsel who wish to participate already on the line. (no document attached) (smm) (Entered: 06/15/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Quash the Subpoena to Laura Muschamp by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena to Laura Muschamp, # 2 Declaration of Lesli Rawles Gallagher in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena to Laura Muschamp, # 3 Exhibit 1-3 to the Declaration of Lesli Rawles Gallagher)(Gallagher, Lesli) (ag). (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 276 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 6/12/2014. (sjt) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER Denying 278 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 06/13/2014. (ag) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                              PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: James M. Weiss appearing for Counter Defendants Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Plaintiff Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Receipt # 63432. (jao) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                (Filed as Sealed Document 284 on 6/13/2014) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 276 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Whittaker, Stephen) (rlu). (Main Document 280 replaced on 6/13/2014) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 6/13/2014 (sjt). (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation re 277 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document . (Whittaker, Stephen) qc email re lacking pos on 6/12/2014 (rlu). (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing on Peregrine's Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time, # 2 Declaration of Christopher K. Eppich)(Eppich, Christopher) (ag). (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      ***WITHDRAWN PER 279 Notice of Withdrawal of Document*** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 276 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Whittaker, Stephen) (rlu). Modified on 6/12/2014 to withdraw document (rlu). (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Whittaker, Stephen)(rlu). (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Amended Invalidity Contentions by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions (REDACTED), # 2 Declaration of S. Christopher Whittaker, # 3 Exhibit 1-17 to Whittaker Decl., # 4 Exhibit 18-41 to Whittaker Decl.)(Whittaker, Stephen) (ag). (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Luce Goldstein on behalf of Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation) (Goldstein, Danielle)Attorney Danielle Luce Goldstein added to party Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(pty:cd), Attorney Danielle Luce Goldstein added to party Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(pty:pla) (ag). (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Christopher W. Jackson appearing for Counter Defendants Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Plaintiff Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Receipt # 63401. (jao) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Thomas H. Segars appearing for Counter Defendants Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Plaintiff Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Receipt # 63402. (jao) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Austin Hampton appearing for Counter Defendants Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Plaintiff Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Receipt # 63370. (jao) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER Granting Defendant's 267 Motion to File Unredacted Opposition and Accompanying Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 6/10/2014. (rlu) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/10/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 267 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Neukom, John) (rlu). (Main Document 268 replaced on 6/10/2014) (rlu). Modified on 6/10/2014 to add file date of lodgment (rlu). (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Neukom, John) (rlu). (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 257 MOTION for Leave to File Amendeded Infringement Contentions filed by RF Micro Devices, Inc.(a North Carolina corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Cannon, # 2 Exhibit -- Redacted Exhibits 1-17 to Declaration of Matthew D. Cannon, # 3 Proof of Service of Sealed Documents)(Neukom, John) (ag). (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Laban Singer on behalf of RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Singer, Benjamin)Attorney Benjamin Laban Singer added to party RF Micro Devices, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Laban Singer added to party RF Micro Devices, Inc.(pty:cc) (ag). (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Sara O'Connell on behalf of Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation) (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(O'Connell, Sara)Attorney Sara O'Connell added to party Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(pty:cd), Attorney Sara O'Connell added to party Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(pty:cd), Attorney Sara O'Connell added to party Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Sara O'Connell added to party Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(pty:cd) (ag). (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 258 Motion to File Unredacted Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions and Accompanying Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 05/29/2014. (ag) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE by RF Micro Devices, Inc. of Pending Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. 8,405,147 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cannon, Matthew) (ag). (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation Sealed Version of Peregrine's Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions and Exhibits thereto (Whittaker, Stephen) (rlu). (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 5/29/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 258 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Whittaker, Stephen)(rlu). (Main Document 259 replaced on 5/30/2014) (rlu). Modified on 5/30/2014 to add file date of lodgment (rlu). (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Whittaker, Stephen) (rlu). (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Amendeded Infringement Contentions by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Leave to Amend (PUBLIC), # 2 Declaration Of Stephen Christopher Whittaker, # 3 Exhibit Public Exhibits to Declaration of Stephen Christopher Whittaker)(Whittaker, Stephen) (ag). (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Lesli Rawles Gallagher on behalf of Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation (Gallagher, Lesli)Attorney Lesli Rawles Gallagher added to party Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lesli Rawles Gallagher added to party Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(pty:cd) (ag). (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Luke B. Weiger on behalf of RF Micro Devices, Inc.(a North Carolina corporation) (Weiger, Luke)Attorney Luke B. Weiger added to party RF Micro Devices, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Luke B. Weiger added to party RF Micro Devices, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Luke B. Weiger added to party RF Micro Devices, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Luke B. Weiger added to party RF Micro Devices, Inc.(pty:cc) (ag). (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER Denying Defendant's 222 Motion for Order to Show Cause Regarding Sanctions. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/8/2014. (knb) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Cannon on behalf of RF Micro Devices, Inc.(a North Carolina corporation) (Cannon, Matthew)Attorney Matthew D. Cannon added to party RF Micro Devices, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Matthew D. Cannon added to party RF Micro Devices, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Matthew D. Cannon added to party RF Micro Devices, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew D. Cannon added to party RF Micro Devices, Inc.(pty:cc) (ag). (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting Defendant's 246 Motion to File Unredacted Reply to Motion for Order to Show Cause and Accompanying Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/6/2014. (rlu) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 242 Motion to File Unredacted Opposition to Motion for Order to Show Cause and Accompanying Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/6/2014. (rlu) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER Submitting 222 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Regarding Sanctions. The Motion Hearing set for 05/12/2014 is vacated . Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 05/06/2014.(ag) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 5/6/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 246 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Neukom, John) (rlu). (Main Document 247 replaced on 5/7/2014) (rlu). Modified on 5/7/2014 to add file date of lodgment (rlu). (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Neukom, John) (rlu). (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY - Other re 244 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by RF Micro Devices, Inc.(a North Carolina corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service of Sealed Documents)(Neukom, John) (kcm). (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 222 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of S. Christopher Whittaker, # 2 Exhibit --Public Exhibits to Declaration of S. Christopher Whittaker, # 3 Proof of Service of Sealed Documents)(Underwood-Muschamp, Laura) (ag). (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 5/6/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 242 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Underwood-Muschamp, Laura) (rlu). (Main Document 243 replaced on 5/7/2014) (rlu). Modified on 5/7/2014 to add file date of lodgment (rlu). (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Underwood-Muschamp, Laura) qc email log in name and s/ signature do not match and proposed order should not be filed on 4/29/2014 (rlu). (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Claims Construction Hearing) held on 4/18/2014, before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Echo Reporting. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 5/15/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2014. (akr) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        Claim Construction Charts for Patent Nos. 7,910,993, 8,405,147 and 6,903,426. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 04/22/2014.(ag) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Claim Construction Order for Patent Nos. 7,910,993, 8,405,147 and 6,903,426. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 04/22/2014.(ag) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by RF Micro Devices, Inc.(a North Carolina corporation) '993 and '147 Patent Markman Slides. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement - '426 Patent Markman Slides, # 2 Supplement - Markman Tutorial Slides)(Neukom, John) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation) Peregrine's Tutorial and Claim Construction Presentations. (Underwood-Muschamp, Laura) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Claims Contruction Hearing held on 4/18/2014. Matter taken under submission. Parties may file their powerpoint slides used at the hearing. (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Plaintiff Attorney Laura E. Muschamp; Christopher K. Eppich; Alan H. Blankenheimer). (Defendant Attorney Charles K. Verhoeven; John McMakin Neukom; Mark Tung; Charlie Stiernberg). (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting 234 Joint Motion to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/18/2014. (knb) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom by RF Micro Devices, Inc.(a North Carolina corporation). (Neukom, John) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Minute ORDER: On the Court's own motion and due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the time set for the Claims Construction Hearing is reset for 4/18/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. SO ORDERED on 4/16/2014 by Judge Marilyn L. Huff. (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        TENTATIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER for Patent No. 7,910,933, Patent No. 8,405,147, and Patent No. 6,903,426. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 04/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 worksheet for 933 and 147 patents, # 2 worksheet for 426 patent)(jpp) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by RF Micro Devices, Inc.(a North Carolina corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration -- Declaration of Charles M. Stiernberg, # 2 Exhibit -- Exhibits 6-7 to Declaration of Charles M. Stiernberg)(Neukom, John) (ag). (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration -- Declaration of Jessica G. Baldwin, # 2 Exhibit -- Exhibits Q - S to -- Declaration of Jessica G. Baldwin, # 3 Declaration -- Responsive Declaration of Behzad Razavi)(Underwood-Muschamp, Laura) (ag). (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting Defendant's 223 Motion to File Unredacted Motion for Order to Show Cause and Accompanying Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/10/2014. (rlu) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. The new case number is 12cv911 H (JLB). Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 04/10/14.(jcj) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 4/10/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 223 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Neukom, John) (rlu). (Main Document 225 replaced on 4/11/2014) (rlu). Modified on 4/11/2014 to add file date of lodgment(rlu). (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 4/10/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 223 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Neukom, John) (rlu). (Main Document 224 replaced on 4/11/2014) (rlu). Modified on 4/11/2014 to add file date of lodgment (rlu). (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Neukom, John) (rlu). (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order to Show Cause by RF Micro Devices, Inc.(a North Carolina corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memo of Points and Authorities ISO RFMD Motion, # 2 Declaration Holmes Declaration ISO RFMD Motion, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 1-7 to Holmes Decl., # 4 Proof of Service Proof of Service for Sealed Documents)(Neukom, John) (ag). (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by RF Micro Devices, Inc.(a North Carolina corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Stevenson Kenney, # 2 Exhibit A-D to Declaration of James Stevenson Kenney, # 3 Declaration of Charles M. Stiernberg, # 4 Exhibit 1-5 to Declaration of Charles M. Stiernberg)(Neukom, John) (ag). (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Jessica G. Baldwin, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits L - P to Declaration of Jessica G. Baldwin, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Behzad Razavi, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Behzad Razavi)(Underwood-Muschamp, Laura) (ag). (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan Arthur Berkelhammer (Berkelhammer, Jonathan) (ag). (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 4/1/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 204 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Underwood-Muschamp, Laura)(rlu). (Main Document 217 replaced on 4/1/2014) (rlu). Modified on 4/1/2014 to add file date of lodgment (rlu). (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ronald D. Schrimpf, # 2 Declaration of Jessica G. Baldwin, # 3 Proof of Service)(Underwood-Muschamp, Laura) (ag). (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART by RF Micro Devices, Inc.(a North Carolina corporation). (Tung, Mark) (ag). (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Striking Plaintiff's March 18, 2014 Filings and Granting 209 Motion to File and Seal Substitute Responsive Claim Construction Brief. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 03/20/2014. (ag)(av1). (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 204 Motion to Seal Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibits. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/19/2014. (rlu) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 3/19/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 204 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Underwood-Muschamp, Laura) (rlu). (Main Document 210 replaced on 3/20/2014) (rlu). Modified on 3/20/2014 to add file date of lodgment (rlu). (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Replace Peregrine's Responsive Claim Construction Brief Filed on March 18, 2014 by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proof of Service)(Underwood-Muschamp, Laura) (ag). (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 3/17/2014, before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Echo Reporting. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/9/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2014. (akr) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 175 Claim Construction Brief, RFMD's Responsive Brief on Claim Construction filed by RF Micro Devices, Inc.(a North Carolina corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Mark Tung, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2 to Tung Decl.)(Neukom, John) (ag). (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STRICKEN DOCUMENT (ag). (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 3/19/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 204 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Underwood-Muschamp, Laura) (rlu). (Main Document 205 replaced on 3/20/2014) (rlu). Modified on 3/20/2014 to add file date of lodgment (rlu). Per 211 Order, 205 was filed as 212 ; however, on 3/20/2014, 205 was stricken by 214 Order. Since 205 was filed as 212 , 212 will be stricken by 214 Order (rlu). (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Underwood-Muschamp, Laura) (rlu). (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: (1) Granting in Part and Denying in Part 152 RFMD's Motion to Dismiss (2) Granting 166 Robert Benton's Motion to Dismiss (3) Denying 173 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 03/17/2014. (ag) (av1). (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 197 Plaintiff's Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 03/17/2014. (ag)(av1). (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Motion Hearing held on 3/17/2014 re 152 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by RF Micro Devices, Inc. The Court takes the motion to dismiss under submission and will issue a written decision and order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Plaintiff Attorney Laura E. Muschamp; Christopher K. Eppich). (Defendant Attorney John McMakin Neukom; Mark Tung; Andrew M. Holmes). (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 152 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation's Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Opposition to Robert Benton's Motion to Dismiss filed by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen C. Whittaker, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proof of Service)(Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 3/17/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 197 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Blankenheimer, Alan) (rlu). (Main Document 198 replaced on 3/18/2014) (rlu). Modified on 3/18/2014 to add file date of lodgment (rlu). (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Blankenheimer, Alan) (rlu). (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Supplemental Materials and Denying 193 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 03/13/2014. (ag) (av1). (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STRICKEN DOCUMENT (ag). (ag). (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***STRICKEN PER 196 ORDER*** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 193 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Blankenheimer, Alan) (sjt). (Main Document 194 replaced on 3/14/2014) (rlu). Modified on 3/14/2014 to strike document (rlu). (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***STRICKEN PER 196 ORDER*** MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Blankenheimer, Alan) (sjt). (Main Document 193 replaced on 3/14/2014) (rlu). Modified on 3/14/2014 to strike document (rlu). (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Order: The Joint Motion For Entry Of Discovery Order As To DiscoveryBetween Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation and Robert Benton Doc. # 181 is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 03/11/2014. (ag)(av1). (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting 187 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 03/11/2014. (ag) (av1). (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 169 Joint Motion to Modify the September 30, 2013 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 03/10/2014. (ag)(av1). (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 3/11/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 187 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Neukom, John). (jah). (Main Document 188 replaced on 3/11/2014) (rlu). Modified on 3/11/2014 to add file date of lodgment (rlu). (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Neukom, John). (jah). (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY - Other re 172 Response in Opposition to Motion,, RFMD's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by RF Micro Devices, Inc.(a North Carolina corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Stiernberg Decl., # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Neukom, John) (ag). (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting 179 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 03/10/2014. (ag) (av1). (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 170 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 03/10/2014. (ag)(av1). (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Discovery Joint Motion for Entry of Discovery Order as to Discovery Between Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation and Robert Benton by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baldwin, Jessica) (srm). (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 3/10/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 179 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Tung, Mark) (rlu). (Main Document 180 replaced on 3/10/2014) (jah). Modified on 3/10/2014 - Added file date of lodgment (jah). (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Tung, Mark) (rlu). (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 176 Claim Construction Brief of Brian Floyd by Defendant RF Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B to Declaration of Brian Floyd in Support of RFMD's Opening Claim Construction Brief)(Tung, Mark) (ag). (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 176 Claim Construction Brief of Mark Tung by Defendant RF Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6 to Declaration of Mark Tung in Support of RFMD's Opening Claim Construction Brief)(Tung, Mark) (ag). (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by RF Micro Devices, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (ag). (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ronald D. Schrimpf, # 2 Declaration of Jessica G. Baldwin, # 3 Table of Contents, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K)(Underwood-Muschamp, Laura) (ag). (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation) (Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen Christopher Whittaker in support of Peregrine's Motion to Stay, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Stephen Christopher Whittaker in support of Peregrine's Motion to Stay)(Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 152 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Stephen Christopher Whittaker in support of Peregrine's Oppotion to Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-M to Declaration of Stephen Christopher Whittaker in support of Peregrine's Oppotion to Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Jessica G. Baldwin in support of Peregrine's Oppotion to Motion to Dismiss)(Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 3/10/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 170 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Blankenheimer, Alan) (rlu). (Main Document 171 replaced on 3/10/2014) (jah). Modified on 3/10/2014 - Added file date of lodgment (jah). (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Blankenheimer, Alan) qc email re may be lacking pos on 3/4/2014 (rlu). (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the September 20, 2013 Scheduling Order by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Charles M. Stiernberg on behalf of RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Stiernberg, Charles)Attorney Charles M. Stiernberg added to party RF Micro Devices, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Charles M. Stiernberg added to party RF Micro Devices, Inc.(pty:cc) (ag). (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Christopher Whittaker on behalf of Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation (Whittaker, Stephen)Attorney Stephen Christopher Whittaker added to party Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Christopher Whittaker added to party Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(pty:cd) (knb). (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Joinder by Robert Benton re 152 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Peregrine's First, Second and Third Causes of Action for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Singer, Benjamin) (knb). Modified on 3/18/2014 to create motion (ag). (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Walter C. Pfeffer on behalf of Robert Benton (Pfeffer, Walter)Attorney Walter C. Pfeffer added to party Robert Benton(pty:dft) (knb). (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Gregory Nieberg appearing for Counter Defendants Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Plaintiff Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Receipt # 59633. (jao) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Brett Watkins appearing for Counter Claimants RF Micro Devices, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc., Defendant RF Micro Devices, Inc., Receipt # 59417. (jao) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Status Conference) held on 1/31/2014, before Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cameron P. Kircher. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 2/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2014. (akr) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/31/2014. Order issued. (CD# 1/31/2014 WMC14-2:14-2:39). (Plaintiff Attorney Laura Muschamp). (Defendant Attorney John McMakin Neukom). (no document attached) (rab) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transfer Order. It is hereby ordered that the following listed cases are transferred from the calendar of the Honorable William McCurine, Jr. to the calendar of the Honorable William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 12cv0911-H(WVG). All future conference or hearing dates set before Magistrate Judge McCurine, if any, are vacated and will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Gallo. Counsel will contact the Chambers of Judge Gallo to reschedule any conferences or hearings within five days of the entry of this Order. Any dates set before the District Judge remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 1/31/2014.(jao) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 97 Amended Complaint, WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Robert Benton.(Singer, Benjamin) (ag). (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery Conference. On 01/31/2014 the Court held a telephonic Discovery Conference. Defendants shall produce the design files via secure hard drive in accordance with the parties protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 01/31/2014.(ag) (av1). (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 153 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/31/2014. (sjt) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (Filed as Sealed Document 156 on 1/31/2014) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 153 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Neukom, John) (rlu). (Main Document 154 replaced on 1/31/2014) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 1/31/2014 (sjt). (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Neukom, John) (rlu). (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by RF Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of RFMD's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing, # 2 Declaration of Andrew M. Holmes in Support of RFMD's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing, # 3 Exhibit 1-22 to Declaration of Andrew M. Holmes)(Neukom, John) (ag). (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute ORDER: In light of Magistrate Judge McCurine's retirement, counsel for the parties are directed to first meet and confer regarding any discovery disputes. In the event that the parties are unable to resolve the discovery dispute, counsel is to call the Chambers of Judge Marilyn L. Huff. The Court will then decide on an appropriate course of action. SO ORDERED on 1/29/2014 by Judge Marilyn L. Huff. (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 141 Response - Other, RFMD's Answer to Peregrine's Counterclaims filed by RF Micro Devices, Inc.(a North Carolina corporation). (Tung, Mark) (knb). (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: The Court will hold a further teleconference on 01/31/2014 at 2:00p.m. before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 1/22/2014.(ag)(av1). (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The Amended Infringement Contentions deadline is continued to 02/04/2014. The Joint Claim Construction Chart, Worksheet and Joint HearingStatement deadline is continued to 02/04/2014. The Courts Scheduling Conference Order issued by Judge Huff on 09/13/2013, shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 01/17/2014.(ag)(av1). (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Discovery Conference) held on 1/8/2014, before Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Echo Reporting. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 1/31/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2014. (akr) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 1/8/2014. (CD# 1/8/2014 WMC14-2:23-3:03). (Plaintiff Attorney Laura Muschamp, Jessica Baldwin). (Defendant Attorney John McMakin Neukom, Jaren W. Newton, Andrew Holmes). (no document attached) (rab) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Denying 99 Peregrine's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/8/14. (dlg)(av1). (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting 139 Motion to Seal Peregrine's Answer and Counterclaims to RFMD'S Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 01/07/2014. (ag) (av1). (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Denying 135 Motion for Leave to File Surreply; Denying 138 Motion for Leave to Respond; Denying 133 Motion to Seal as Moot; Denying 136 Motion to Seal as Moot and Submitting 99 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Motion Hearing set for 01/14/2014 is vacated. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/6/2014. (ag (av1). (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 110 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, Redacted Version of Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation's Answer to RF Micro Devices, Inc.'s Counterclaims filed by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 1/7/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 139 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Blankenheimer, Alan) (rlu). (Main Document 140 replaced on 1/7/2014) (rlu). Modified on 1/7/2014 to add file date of lodgment (rlu). (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Blankenheimer, Alan) (rlu). (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Response to RF Micro Devices, Inc's Surreply by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 137 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 136 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Blankenheimer, Alan) (sjt).ECF No. 142 Order Denying 136 Motion to Seal as Moot on 1/7/2014 (rlu). (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Blankenheimer, Alan) (sjt). (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Peregrine's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt.99-1) by RF Micro Devices, Inc.(a North Carolina corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: RFMD's Surreply in Opposition to Peregrine's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt.99-1) [Redacted], # 2 Declaration Holmes Declaration in support of RFMD's Surreply in Opposition to Peregrine's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. 99), # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 29-41 to the Declaration of Andrew Holmes [redacted])(Holmes, Andrew) (ag). (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 134 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 133 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Holmes, Andrew) (sjt). ECF No. 142 Order Denying 133 Motion to Seal as Moot on 1/7/2014 (rlu). (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Holmes, Andrew) (sjt). (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 124 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/30/2013. (sjt) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 129 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File answer or otherwise respond to RFMDs counterclaims. (Doc. No. 129 .) Peregrine shall answer or otherwise respond to RFMDs counterclaims on or before January 6, 2014. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/30/2013. (yeb) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation to Respond to RF Micro Devices, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Blankenheimer, Alan)(yeb). (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion for Preliminary Injunction) held on 12/19/2013, before Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Echo Reporting. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 1/13/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/23/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/24/2014. (akr) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 12/19/2013.(CD# 12/19/2013 WMC13-4:03-4:29). (Plaintiff Attorney Alan H. Blakenheimer, Chris Eppich, Jessica Baldwin). (Defendant Attorney John McMakein Neukom, Andrew Holmes). (no document attached) (rab) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 99 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Redacted Version of Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Declaration of Mark Burgener, # 2 Declaration Second Declaration of Christopher Eppich, # 3 Exhibit)(Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (Filed as Sealed Document 132 ) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 124 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Blankenheimer, Alan) (rlu). (Main Document 125 replaced on 12/30/2013) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 12/30/2013 (sjt). (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Blankenheimer, Alan) (rlu). (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 120 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the First Amended Complaint and Other Discovery Deadlines. Benton must answer or otherwise respond on or before 1/31/2014. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/20/2013. (ag) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Laban Singer on behalf of Robert Benton (Singer, Benjamin)Attorney Benjamin Laban Singer added to party Robert Benton(pty:dft) (ag). (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery Conference. A telephonic Discovery Conference was held on 12/19/2013. A further telephonic Discovery Conference is set for 1/8/2014 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 12/19/2013.(ag) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Robert Benton to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the First Amended Complaint and Other Discovery Deadlines by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, as to Robert Benton. (Blankenheimer, Alan)(ag). (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 114 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/16/2013. (sjt) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Telephonic Discovery Conference. A telephonic Discovery Conference is set for 12/19/2013 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 12/13/2013.(ag) (av1). (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (Filed as Sealed Document 118 on 12/16/2013)SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 114 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Holmes, Andrew) (rlu). (Main Document 115 replaced on 12/16/2013) (sjt). Modified to Seal on 12/16/2013 (sjt). (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Holmes, Andrew) (rlu). (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 99 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by RF Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert H. Benton, # 2 Declaration of Andrew M. Holmes, # 3 Exhibits 1-13, # 4 Exhibit 14 (Part 1 of 2), # 5 Exhibit 14 (Part 2 of 2), # 6 Exhibits 15-22, # 7 Exhibits 23-28, # 8 Proof of Service)(Holmes, Andrew) (ag). (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting Defendant's 108 Motion to Seal. The Court grants Defendant's request to file the document under seal without prejudice to the Court modifying this order at a later time. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/13/2013. (rlu) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 97 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation) by RF Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(Kang, Robert) (ag). (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 12/13/2013] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 108 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Kang, Robert) (rlu). (Main Document 109 replaced on 12/13/2013) (rlu). Modified on 12/13/2013 to add file date of lodgment (rlu). (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Kang, Robert) qc email re atty should file on own behalf on 12/13/2013 (rlu). (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 100 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. The Court grants Plaintiff's request to file the document under seal without prejudice to the Court modifying this order at a later time. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/26/2013. (rlu) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Denying 102 Motion to Shorten Time; and (2) Setting Briefing Schedule for Preliminary Injunction Hearing. A Motion Hearing is set for 1/14/2014 at 9:00 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Responses due by 12/13/2013 and Replies due by 12/20/2013. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/25/2013. (ag) Modified on 12/2/2013 to correct hearing time (ag). (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 102 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing on Peregrine's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 102 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing on Peregrine's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by RF Micro Devices, Inc.. (Holmes, Andrew) (ag). (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing on Peregrine's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 11/26/2013] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 100 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Blankenheimer, Alan) (rlu). (Main Document 101 replaced on 11/26/2013) (rlu). Modified on 11/26/2013 to add file date of lodgment(rlu). (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Blankenheimer, Alan) (rlu). (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Sarah Canfield, # 3 Declaration of Mark Burgener, # 4 Declaration of Paul Denny, # 5 Declaration of Ron Reedy, # 6 Declaration of Christopher Eppich, # 7 Proof of Service)(Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued on First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ag) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against RF Micro Devices, Inc., Robert Benton, filed by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E, # 2 Exhibit F - I)New Summons Requested. (Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 94 Plaintiff's Motion to File First Amended Complaint and Granting 95 Defendant's Motion for Extended Time to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Plaintiff must file the amended complaint on or before 11/26/2013. Additionally, the Court grants Defendants motion for an extension of time to file amended pleadings, including amended defenses and counterclaims. Defendant will have twenty-one (21) days from the date Plaintiff files its amended pleading to file its amended answer and counterclaims. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/19/2013. (ag)(av1). (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File RF Micro Devices, Inc.'s Amended Answer and Counterclaims by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit 1 (Part 2), # 4 Exhibit 1 (Part 3))(Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: D. Marsh Prause appearing for Counter Defendants Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Plaintiff Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Receipt # 56819. (jao) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Robert N. Kang on behalf of RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Kang, Robert)Attorney Robert N. Kang added to party RF Micro Devices, Inc.(pty:dft) (ag). (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: A Claims Construction Hearing is set for 4/18/2014 at 9:00 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law is due by 10/6/2014. The Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 10/27/2014 and the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/3/2014 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Jury Trial is set for 11/12/2014 at 9:00 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 09/30/2013.(ag) (jrl). (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Case Management Conference held on 9/27/2013 in chambers. The Court lifts the stay on discovery and grants the 82 Joint Motion for Discovery. The Court will issue a written order. (Court Reporter/ECR N/A). (Plaintiff Attorney Alan H. Blankenheimer; Christopher K. Eppich; Laure E. Muschamp).(Defendant Attorney Charles K. Verhoeven; Mark Tung). (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Aileen Jeeseon Kim on behalf of RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Kim, Aileen)Attorney Aileen Jeeseon Kim added to party RF Micro Devices, Inc.(pty:dft) (ag). (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Scheduling Conference Order: A Case Management Conference is set for 09/27/2013 at 1:30 PM. A Claims Construction Hearing is set for 4/18/2014 at 9:00 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law is due by 10/6/2014. The Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 10/27/2014 and the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/3/2014 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Jury Trial is set for 11/12/2014 at 9:00 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 09/12/2013.(ag) (jrl). (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute ORDER by Judge Marilyn L. Huff: On the District Court's own motion, the Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr. is hereby vacated and the Case Management Conference is reset to 9/27/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. (cc: Hon. William McCurine, Jr., U.S. Magistrate Judge). (no document attached) (smy) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Irma E. Gonzalez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 12CV0911-H(WMC).(no document attached) (nsp) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 8/13/2013. Order issued.(CD# 8/13/2013 n/a). (Plaintiff Attorney Alan H. Blankenheimer). (Defendant Attorney John McMakin Neukom). (no document attached) (rab) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 81 Joint Motion for Protective Order. It is so ordered that the Proposed Protective Order is adopted by Court as the Protective Order for the case and the parties are ordered to comply with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 8/14/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (jah) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Following Patent ENE Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 8/13/2013. Discovery which was propounded by Pla and Dft before the 8/13/3013 ENE is stayed. Said discovery will be deemed served on the date Court issues on order opening discovery. Telephonic, Attorneys-Only Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr.. Any motion to join other parties, to amend the pleadings, or to file additional pleadings shall be filed by 10/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 8/14/2013. (jah) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Discovery Order by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B - [Proposed] Discovery Order)(Blankenheimer, Alan). Modified on 8/13/2013 - Proposed Order submitted as attachment. Proof of Service has s/ of staff. QC Email sent to Atty to email Proposed Order to Chambers and to file Corrected Proof of Service (jah). (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Protective Order)(Blankenheimer, Alan). Modified on 8/13/2013 - Proposed Order submitted as attachment. Proof of Service has s/ of staff. QC Email sent to Atty to Email Proposed Order to Chambers and file Corrected Proof of Service (jah). (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 75 Counterclaim, by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation.(Blankenheimer, Alan). Modified on 5/29/2013 - Removed duplicate text (jah). (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 39 Counterclaim by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Blankenheimer, Alan). Modified on 5/29/2013 - Removed duplicate text (jah). (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 77 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 75 Counterclaim. Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation's answer to RF Micro Devices's Counterclaim due on 5/28/2013. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/23/2013. (jah) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Set Time to Respond to Counterclaims by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Blankenheimer, Alan). Modified on 5/23/2013 - Corrected motion event. (jah). (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER for Compliance with Patent Local Rule 2.1. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/13/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1G before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 5/2/2013. (jah) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand in Case No. 3:13-CV-0725-IEG-WMC (Consolidated), COUNTERCLAIM in Case No. 3:13-CV-0725-IEG-WMC (Consolidated) against Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation by RF Micro Devices, Inc..(Neukom, John) (yeb). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Plaintiff's 73 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases. Pursuant to FRCP 42(a) case numbers 13cv725-IEG(WMC) and 12cv911-IEG(WMC) are consolidated for all purposes. All further proceedings and docketing shall be done under the lead case, case number 12cv911-IEG(WMC). Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/25/2013. (jah) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Table of Contents, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D)(Blankenheimer, Alan). (jah). (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Keith Eppich on behalf of Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation (Eppich, Christopher). (jah). (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica G. Baldwin on behalf of Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation (Baldwin, Jessica). (jah). (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T Haslam on behalf of Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation (Haslam, Robert). (jah). (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Jared Weston Newton appearing for RF Micro Devices, Inc. (cge) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Charles Adam Basinger appearing for Counter Claimant RF Micro Devices, Inc., Defendant RF Micro Devices, Inc. (vam) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Daniel R. Volkmuth appearing for Counter Claimant RF Micro Devices, Inc., Defendant RF Micro Devices, Inc. (vam) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Paul Fredrick Brinkman appearing for Counter Claimant RF Micro Devices, Inc., Defendant RF Micro Devices, Inc. (vam) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney as to L. Cooper Harrell by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Blankenheimer, Alan) Modified on 3/11/2013 atty contacted re: wrong event selected; modified event and text (leh). (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.1(a) Legibility, re 60 Notice of Appearance filed by RF Micro Devices, Inc. (knb) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.1(a) Legibility, re 59 Notice of Appearance filed by RF Micro Devices, Inc. (knb) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.1(a) Legibility, re 58 Notice of Appearance filed by RF Micro Devices, Inc. (knb) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.1(a) Legibility, re 57 Notice of Appearance filed by RF Micro Devices, Inc. (knb) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Michael Holmes on behalf of RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Holmes, Andrew)(knb). (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Tung on behalf of RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Tung, Mark) (knb). (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Sean S. Pak on behalf of RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Pak, Sean) (knb). (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Charles K Verhoeven on behalf of RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Verhoeven, Charles) (knb). (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by John McMakin Neukom on behalf of RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Neukom, John). (jah). (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 54 Joint Motion to Dismiss Claims against Motorola Mobility, Inc.. It is ordered that Peregrine's claims against Motorola Mobility, Inc. are dismissed w/o prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a). Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/6/2013. (jah) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Motorola Mobility, Inc. by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Blankenheimer, Alan). Modified on 2/5/2013 - Removed duplicate text (jah). (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Amardeep Lal Thakur on behalf of RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Thakur, Amardeep) (jpp). (Entered: 11/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Andrew T. Spence appearing for Plaintiff Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Counter Defendant Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Jon Berkelhammer appearing for Plaintiff Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Counter Defendant Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: L. Cooper Harrell appearing for Plaintiff Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation, Counter Defendant Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 46 Motion to Withdraw Brian J. Dunne as Attorney by RF Micro Devices, Inc.; 47 Motion to Withdraw Brian J. Dunne as Attorney by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 11/26/2012. (sjt) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 45 Joint Motion lift the stay. The Court GRANTS the motion and ORDERS that the stay in the above-captioned action is lifted. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 11/21/2012. (sjt) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brian J. Dunne by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Chris Mathews In Support of the Motion to Withdraw Brian J. Dunne as Counsel of Record)(Mathews, Christopher) Modified on 11/21/2012-QC mailer sent to atty re no memorandum of points and authorities; no hearing date and time (aef). (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brian J. Dunne by RF Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Chris Mathews In Support of the Motion to Withdraw Brian J. Dunne as Counsel of Record)(Mathews, Christopher) Modified on 11/21/2012-QC mailer sent to atty re no memorandum of points and authorities; no hearing date and time (aef). (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Lift Stay of Action by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Blankenheimer, Alan) (ag). (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Vacating Early Neutral Evaluation. In accordance with Court's stay, the ENE Conference scheduled for 8/27/2012 is vacated pending further order of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 7/5/2012.(jah) (jcj). (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Continuing Early Neutral Evaluation. Due to a conflict in Court's calendar, The ENE Conference and deadlines attendant to it shall be continued. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/27/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 7/5/2012. (jah) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Defendants' 41 Unopposed Motion to Stay Action. Court enters the following order: 1.) Pursuant to 28 USC 1659(a) and Court's inherent power to control its docket, this civil action shall be stayed until a final determination of the ITC proceeding in In the Matter of Certain Radio Frequency Integrated Circuits and Devices Containing Same, No. 337-TA-858, 2.) All deadlines in this action shall be vacated until such time as the stay is lifted and new deadlines are established, and 3.) Within 10 days of receiving a final determination in the ITC proceedings, parties shall file a joint motion to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/15/2012. (jah) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay Pending Disposition of Related ITC Proceeding (Unopposed) by Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Motion, # 2 Exhibit B to Motion)(Mathews, Christopher). (jah). (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER for Compliance with Patent L.R.2.1. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/13/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 6/11/2012. (jah) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation by Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc.. (Mathews, Christopher). Modified on 6/11/2012 - Removed duplicate text (jah). (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: (1) Denying 13 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case to the Middle District of North Carolina; (2) Denying Plaintiff's 37 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File a Surreply; Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/8/2012.(jah)(jrd) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply to Address New Arguments and New Evidence in Defendants' Reply ISO Their Motion to Transfer Venue by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Declaration of Alan Blankenheimer, # 3 Proof of Service)(Underwood-Muschamp, Laura) Modified on 6/1/2012 - Has s/ of different atty. Email sent to Atty. Edited attachment descriptions (jah). (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation re: 34 Ex Parte Motion to Bring A/V Equipment in Connection with June 4, 2012 Hearing (Underwood-Muschamp, Laura). Modified on 5/31/2012 - Wrong event. Email sent to Atty. Corrected text and added document link (jah). (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Judge Irma E. Gonzalez, Motions Submitted 13 MOTION to Change Venue to Middle District of North Carolina Filed by: Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc., the Court will prepare a written order. Motion Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2012 is vacated.(lsf) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WITHDRAWN BY FILER ON 5/30/3012 PER NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT 36 - Ex Parte MOTION to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom in Connection with June 4, 2012 Hearing by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Underwood-Muschamp, Laura). (jah). Modified on 5/31/2012 - Edited to reflect as withdrawn. Motion and judge association termed (jah). (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 13 MOTION to Change Venue to Middle District of North Carolina filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Reply, # 2 Exhibit B to Reply, # 3 Declaration of Eric Creviston)(Mathews, Christopher). Modified on 5/29/2012 - Edited text (jah). (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION to Change Venue to Middle District of North Carolina CORRECTED filed by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joel Keller, # 2 Exhibit A to Keller Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Keller Decl., # 4 Declaration of Monika Kapuscinska, # 5 Declaration of Alan H. Blankenheimer, # 6 Exhibit A to Blankenheimer Decl., # 7 Exhibit B to Blankenheimer Decl., # 8 Exhibit C to Blankenheimer Decl., # 9 Exhibit D to Blankenheimer Decl., # 10 Exhibit E Blankenheimer Decl., # 11 Exhibit F to Blankenheimer Decl., # 12 Exhibit G to Blankenheimer Decl., # 13 Exhibit H to Blankenheimer Decl., # 14 Exhibit I to Blankenheimer Decl., # 15 Exhibit J to Blankenheimer Decl., # 16 Exhibit K to Blankenheimer Decl., # 17 Exhibit L to Blankenheimer Decl., # 18 Exhibit M to Blankenheimer Decl., # 19 Exhibit N to Blankenheimer Decl., # 20 Exhibit O to Blankenheimer Decl., # 21 Exhibit P to Blankenheimer Decl., # 22 Exhibit Q to Blankenheimer Decl., # 23 Exhibit R to Blankenheimer Decl., # 24 Exhibit S to Blankenheimer Decl., # 25 Exhibit T to Blankenheimer Decl., # 26 Exhibit U to Blankenheimer Decl., # 27 Exhibit V to Blankenheimer Decl., # 28 Proof of Service)(Blankenheimer, Alan)(yeb). (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION to Change Venue to Middle District of North Carolina filed by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joel Keller, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Keller Decl., # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Keller Decl., # 4 Declaration of Monika Kapuscinska, # 5 Declaration of Alan H. Blankenheimer, # 6 Exhibit A to Blankenheimer Decl., # 7 Exhibit B to Blankenheimer Decl., # 8 Exhibit C to Blankenheimer Decl., # 9 Exhibit D to Blankenheimer Decl., # 10 Exhibit E to Blankenheimer Decl., # 11 Exhibit F to Blankenheimer Decl., # 12 Exhibit G to Blankenheimer Decl., # 13 Exhibit H to Blankenheimer Decl., # 14 Exhibit I to Blankenheimer Decl., # 15 Exhibit J to Blankenheimer Decl., # 16 Exhibit K to Blankenheimer Decl., # 17 Exhibit L to Blankenheimer Decl., # 18 Exhibit M to Blankenheimer Decl., # 19 Exhibit N to Blankenheimer Decl., # 20 Exhibit O to Blankenheimer Decl., # 21 Exhibit P to Blankenheimer Decl., # 22 Exhibit Q to Blankenheimer Decl., # 23 Exhibit R to Blankenheimer Decl., # 24 Exhibit S to Blankenheimer Decl., # 25 Exhibit T to Blankenheimer Decl., # 26 Exhibit U to Blankenheimer Decl., # 27 Exhibit V to Blankenheimer Decl., # 28 Proof of Service)(Blankenheimer, Alan) (jpp). (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc. of case(s): 12-cv-1160-CAB(BGS), 12-cv-377 (Middle District of North Carolina). (Dunne, Brian). Modified on 5/16/2012 -Proposed Low Number Transfer Order previously prepared on 5/14/2012 per Related Case Notice (Doc #5) in 12cv1160-CAB(BGS) (jah). (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc. re 27 Notice of Appearance, filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc.. (Dunne, Brian). (jah). (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Brian James Dunne on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Dunne, Brian). (jah). (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WITHDRAWN BY FILER ON 5/15/2012 PER NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT 29 - NOTICE of Appearance by Brian James Dunne on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Dunne, Brian). Modified on 5/15/2012 - Pleading is for case in the Central District of CA. Email sent to Atty to file Withdrawal of Document (jah). Modified on 5/15/2012 - Edited to reflect as withdrawn (jah). (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel for Plaintiff Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation (Jaquez, Martin). Modified on 5/10/2012 - Wrong event, should be filed a Motion. Email sent to Atty to refile as Motion to Substitute Attorney (jah). Modified to correct event per atty on 5/10/2012 (lmt). (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Defendants' 24 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc. and RF Micro Devices, Inc. shall file answer or motion to dismiss (or both) by 6/8/2012. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/7/2012. (jah) (jcj). (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc.. (Mathews, Christopher). (jah). (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc. re 22 Notice of Party With Financial Interest, 21 Notice of Party With Financial Interest (Mathews, Christopher). (jah). (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Mathews, Christopher). (jah). (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Mathews, Christopher). (jah). (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc. re 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Mathews, Christopher). (jah). (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motorola Mobility, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. for Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Mathews, Christopher). (jah). (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by RF Micro Devices, Inc.. (Mathews, Christopher). (jah). (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick A. Lorig on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Lorig, Frederick). (jah). (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc. re 12 Notice of Appearance (Mathews, Christopher). Modified on 5/2/2012 - Corrected text (jah). (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc. re 13 MOTION to Change Venue to Middle District of North Carolina, (Mathews, Christopher). Modified on 5/2/2012 - Corrected text (jah). Modified on 5/2/2012 (jah). (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc. re 13 MOTION to Change Venue to Middle District of North Carolina, 12 Notice of Appearance Certificate of Service. (Mathews, Christopher) Modified on 5/1/2012 to edit text; qc mail sent re correct event, format (kaj). (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Change Venue to Middle District of North Carolina by Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Dunne Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 2 to Dunne Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 3 to Dunne Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 4 to Dunne Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 5 to Dunne Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 6 to Dunne Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 7 to Dunne Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 8 to Dunne Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 9 to Dunne Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 10 to Dunne Declaration)(Mathews, Christopher) Modified on 5/1/2012 - Removed duplicative text; sent qc e-mail re missing service document. (mdc) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Anthony Mathews on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Mathews, Christopher) Modified on 5/1/2012 - Sent qc e-mail re missing service document. (mdc) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Laura E Underwood-Muschamp on behalf of Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation (Underwood-Muschamp, Laura).(jah). (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. Motorola Mobility, Inc. served. (Blankenheimer, Alan). (jah). (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. RF Micro Devices, Inc. served. (Blankenheimer, Alan). (jah). (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Alan H Blankenheimer on behalf of Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation (Blankenheimer, Alan). (jah). (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Order: Judge Anthony J. Battaglia has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Judge Irma E. Gonzalez has been randomly assigned. The new case number is 12cv911-IEG(WMc) (tel) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Martin Joseph Jaquez (Jaquez, Martin) (ATTY MAINT) No POS, QC mailer sent to atty (cge). (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. Proposed Low Number Order not prepared - related case not CASD. (cge) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *7,910,993*, *7,123,898*, *7,460,852*, *7,796,969*, *7,860,499* cc:USPTO (jmd) (av1). (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (jmd) (av1). (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmd) (av1). (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 6/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: (1) Denying 13 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case to the Middle District of North Carolina; (2) Denying Plaintiff's 37 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File a Surreply; Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/8/2012.(jah)(jrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Does, Motorola Mobility, Inc., RF Micro Devices, Inc. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 0974-4640777.) Filed by Peregrine Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)The new case number is 3:12-cv-911-AJB-WMC. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr. are assigned to the case. (Jaquez, Martin)(jmd) (av1). (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 50 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?