AMANATULLAH et al v. OBAMA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00536
District Judge Henry H. Kennedy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 2:58 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ABDUL RAZAQ, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by INTERNATIONAL JUSTICE NETWORK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tina M. Foster +1 917 442 9580 tina.foster@ijnetwork.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Valentine +1 917 442 9580
No Logo AMANATULLAH, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by INTERNATIONAL JUSTICE NETWORK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tina M. Foster +1 917 442 9580 tina.foster@ijnetwork.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Valentine +1 917 442 9580
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Respondent
Officially listed as "BARACK OBAMA"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES NOS. 1-5, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 10 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on November 15, 2012. (lcrcl5)
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: 2/6/2012 Reply to Document
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: 2/6/2012 Notice of Appearance/
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: 2/6/2012 Notice of Appearance/
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: 12/20/2011 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011 Reply to opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: 7/12/2011 Memorandum in Opposition
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                    MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ROBERT M. GATES, JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES NOS. 1-5, BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of William K. Lietzau (dated May 9, 2011), # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Vice Admiral Robert S. Harward (dated May 28, 2011))(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: 5/17/2011 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                      Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by AMANATULLAH, ABDUL RAZAQ. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Next Friend Petitioner Abdul Razaq)(znmw, ) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Application for Writ
                        ENTERED IN ERROR.....APPLICATION for Writ of of Habeas Corpus , First Amended Petition by AMANATULLAH, ABDUL RAZAQ. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Next Friend Petitioner Abdul Razaq)(Foster, Tina) Modified on 5/17/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: 5/2/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER adopting the parties' proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on May 2, 2011. (lchhk3) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: 4/28/2011 Notice of Proposed Order
                            NOTICE of Proposed Order re Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule by AMANATULLAH, ABDUL RAZAQ re 5 Order (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Tina) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER requiring the parties to submit a joint proposed scheduling order by no later than May 1, 2011. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 25, 2011. (lchhk3) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Lin on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES NOS. 1-5, BARACK OBAMA (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Tina M. Foster on behalf of AMANATULLAH, ABDUL RAZAQ (Foster, Tina) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                    ENTERED IN ERROR.....Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) Modified on 6/25/2010 (dr). (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: 4/2/2010 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                      PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616028701.) filed by AMANATULLAH, ABDUL RAZAQ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(dr) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?